TRAVELERS UNITED, INC. v. HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC. et al
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS UNITED, INC.
Defendant: HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC. and HILTON DOMESTIC OPERATING COMPANY INC.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03584
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Beryl A Howell
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 16 REPLY to opposition to motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by TRAVELERS UNITED, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Zavareei, Hassan)
January 18, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Reply In Support Of Its #11 Motion To Remand due by 1/26/2024. (mac)
January 17, 2024 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by TRAVELERS UNITED, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zavareei, Hassan)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff's #15 Consent Motion to Extend Deadline for Reply, and DIRECTING plaintiff to file any reply in support of its #11 Motion to Remand by January 26, 2024. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 17, 2024. (lcbah4)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Antonio F. Dias may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing defendants in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 16, 2024. (lcbah4)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Courtney L. Snyder may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing defendants in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 16, 2024. (lcbah4)
January 12, 2024 Filing 14 Memorandum in opposition to re #11 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by HILTON DOMESTIC OPERATING COMPANY INC., HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC.. (O'Connor, Bridget)
January 12, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Courtney L. Snyder, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10616037. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HILTON DOMESTIC OPERATING COMPANY INC., HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Bridget)
January 12, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Antonio F. Dias, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10615945. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HILTON DOMESTIC OPERATING COMPANY INC., HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Bridget)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' #8 Consent Motion to Continue Responsive Pleading and Class Certification Deadlines, and DIRECTING defendants to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's [1-2] Complaint within 30 days of a ruling on plaintiff's #11 motion to remand, and plaintiff to file any motion for class certification within six months of such ruling. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 2, 2024. (lcbah4)
December 29, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by TRAVELERS UNITED, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zavareei, Hassan)
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by F. Peter Silva, II on behalf of TRAVELERS UNITED, INC. (Silva, F.)
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by TRAVELERS UNITED, INC. (Silva, F.)
December 22, 2023 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Continue REPSONSIVE PLEADING AND CLASS CERTIFICATION DEADLINES by HILTON DOMESTIC OPERATING COMPANY INC., HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC.. (O'Connor, Bridget)
December 18, 2023 Filing 7 Receipt on 12/18/2023 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2023-CAB-005813. (znmw)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 7, 2023. (lcbah4)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants' #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, and DIRECTING defendants to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's [1-2] Complaint by January 11, 2024. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 7, 2023. (lcbah4)
December 7, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/11/2024. (zalh)
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by HILTON DOMESTIC OPERATING COMPANY INC., HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Bridget)
December 6, 2023 Filing 4 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HILTON DOMESTIC OPERATING COMPANY INC., HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC. (O'Connor, Bridget)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget Kathleen O'Connor on behalf of HILTON DOMESTIC OPERATING COMPANY INC., HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC. (O'Connor, Bridget)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of DC, case number 2023-CAB-005813 Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADCDC-10532138 filed by HILTON DOMESTIC OPERATING COMPANY INC., HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit A-8, #10 Declaration of Bridget K. O'Connor, #11 Exhibit B-1, #12 Exhibit B-2, #13 Exhibit B-3, #14 Exhibit B-4, #15 Exhibit B-5)(O'Connor, Bridget)
December 1, 2023 Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zrtw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRAVELERS UNITED, INC. v. HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVELERS UNITED, INC.
Represented By: Hassan A. Zavareei
Represented By: F. Peter Silva, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS INC.
Represented By: Bridget Kathleen O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILTON DOMESTIC OPERATING COMPANY INC.
Represented By: Bridget Kathleen O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?