MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA et al v. PAXTON
Plaintiff: MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA and Eric Hananoki
Defendant: WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00147
Filed: January 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2024 Filing 35 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,, filed by ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA. (Branch, Aria)
February 22, 2024 Filing 34 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,, for Supplemental Briefing on Ex Parte Young filed by WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR. (Schaerr, Gene)
February 20, 2024 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on February 15, 2024; Page Numbers: 1-74. Date of Issuance: February 20, 2024. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/12/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2024.(Zaremba, William)
February 16, 2024 Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplemental Brief due by 2/22/2024. (smc)
February 15, 2024 Minute Entry for proceeding held on 2/15/2024 before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Motion Hearing re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Oral arguments heard from both parties. (Court Reporter William Zaremba.) (zed)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Before resolving the pending motion for preliminary injunction, the court wishes to receive additional briefing on the question of whether, because Defendant Paxton is treated as sued in his individual capacity under Ex Parte Young for sovereign immunity purposes, the court should similarly treat him as sued in his individual capacity for purposes of applying the District of Columbia long-arm statute, D.C. Code 13-423. Cf. United States v. Ferrara, 54 F.3d 825, 831 (D.C. Cir. 1995) (treating an out-of-state person sued in her official capacity as a "State" for purposes of the D.C. long-arm statute and holding that a "'State' is not a 'person' for its purposes"). The parties shall submit a supplemental brief of no longer than ten, double-spaced pages on or before February 22, 2024. The court also stays further briefing on the pending Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 31. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/15/2024. (lcapm1)
February 13, 2024 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Reuben William Blum on behalf of WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR (Blum, Reuben)
February 9, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaerr, Gene)
February 9, 2024 Filing 30 SURREPLY to re Order,, filed by WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR. (Schaerr, Gene)
February 9, 2024 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Lavorato on behalf of WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR (Lavorato, Christopher)
February 9, 2024 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendant W. Kenneth Paxton Jr. shall file, by 5:00 p.m. on February 9, 2024, a surreply of no more than five, double-spaced pages that addresses Plaintiff Media Matters for America's argument that Defendant's hiring of a process server to physically serve the Civil Investigative Demand in the District of Columbia supports finding personal jurisdiction under subsections (a)(1) and (a)(3) of the D.C. long-arm statute. See Pl.'s Reply in Support of Mot. for Prelim. Inj., ECF No. 28, at 2-8. Moreover, the parties shall appear for a hearing on Plaintiff's motion on February 15, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/07/2024. (lcapm1)
February 1, 2024 Filing 28 REPLY to opposition to motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Hananoki, #2 Declaration of Ezra W. Reese, #3 Declaration of Christopher D. Dodge)(Branch, Aria)
January 30, 2024 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Abha Khanna on behalf of ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA (Khanna, Abha)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Christopher Dooley Dodge is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/29/2024. (lcapm1)
January 25, 2024 Filing 26 RESPONSE re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Assistant Attorney General Levi Fuller with Exhibits)(Schaerr, Gene)
January 25, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher Dooley Dodge, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10644668. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Dooley Dodge)(Branch, Aria)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Reuben W. Blum is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/25/2024. (lcapm1)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Christopher Lavorato is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/25/2024. (lcapm1)
January 24, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Reuben W. Blum, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10642620. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Reuben W. Blum)(Schaerr, Gene)
January 24, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher Lavorato, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10642619. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Christopher Lavorato)(Schaerr, Gene)
January 24, 2024 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR served on 1/22/2024, answer due 2/12/2024 (Branch, Aria)
January 24, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Abha Khanna, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10640367. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abha Khanna)(Branch, Aria)
January 24, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elena Rodriguez Armenta, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10640337. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elena Rodriguez Armenta)(Branch, Aria)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Elena Rodriguez Armenta is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/24/2024. (lcapm1)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Abha Khanna is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/24/2024. (lcapm1)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. To cure the application, the non-member attorney must submit a declaration which sets forth the attorney's telephone number. See LCvR 83.2(c)(2). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/24/2024. (lcapm1)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. To cure the application, the non-member attorney must submit a declaration which sets forth the attorney's telephone number. See LCvR 83.2(c)(2). Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/24/2024. (lcapm1)
January 23, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Samuel Ward-Packard, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10639523. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel Ward-Packard)(Branch, Aria)
January 23, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jacob Douglas Shelly, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10639518. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jacob Douglas Shelly)(Branch, Aria)
January 23, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elena Rodriguez Armenta, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10639512. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elena Rodriguez Armenta)(Branch, Aria)
January 23, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniela Lorenzo, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10639501. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniela Lorenzo)(Branch, Aria)
January 23, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Omeed Alerasool, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10639490. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Omeed Alerasool)(Branch, Aria)
January 23, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Abha Khanna, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10639478. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abha Khanna)(Branch, Aria)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Omeed Alerasool is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/23/2024. (lcapm1)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Samuel Ward-Packard is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/23/2024. (lcapm1)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jacob Douglas Shelly is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/23/2024. (lcapm1)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniela Lorenzo is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/23/2024. (lcapm1)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations made by Defendant Warren Kenneth Paxton, Jr. in his response of January 22, 2024, Plaintiffs' motion insofar as it seeks a temporary restraining order, ECF No. 4, is denied. This matter shall proceed with briefing on the motion for preliminary injunction consistent with Local Civil Rule 65.1(c). Any reply brief from Plaintiffs shall be filed within seven days of Defendants opposition brief. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/23/2024. (lcapm1)
January 22, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Amer S. Ahmed on behalf of ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA (Ahmed, Amer)
January 22, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr on behalf of ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA (Boutrous, Theodore)
January 22, 2024 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, filed by WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR. (Schaerr, Gene)
January 22, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth C. Frost on behalf of ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA (Frost, Elisabeth)
January 20, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendant shall advise by 5:00 p.m. on January 22, 2024, whether he will agree not to enforce the CID until this court rules on the motion for preliminary injunction. If Defendant is prepared to do so, and consistent with Plaintiffs representations, the court will treat as moot the motion for temporary restraining order, and the parties shall brief the preliminary injunction motion consistent with the deadlines set forth in the Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/20/2024. (lcapm1)
January 19, 2024 Filing 9 REPLY re #7 Response to motion filed by ERIC HANANOKI, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Branch, Aria)
January 19, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Klukowski on behalf of WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR (Klukowski, Kenneth)
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR. (Schaerr, Gene)
January 19, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gene C. Schaerr on behalf of WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR (Schaerr, Gene)
January 19, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl)
January 19, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsl)
January 18, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Eric Hananoki, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Cynthia Padera, #3 Declaration of Eric Hananoki, #4 Declaration of Benjamin Dimiero, #5 Declaration of Aria C. Branch, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(Branch, Aria). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 1/19/2024 (zsl).
January 17, 2024 Filing 3 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by Eric Hananoki, MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 LCvR 5.1(c)(1) Notice of Address)(Branch, Aria)
January 17, 2024 Filing 2 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA (Branch, Aria)
January 17, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10624073) filed by MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA, Eric Hananoki. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Branch, Aria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA et al v. PAXTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDIA MATTERS FOR AMERICA
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Amer S. Ahmed
Represented By: Elisabeth C. Frost
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hananoki
Represented By: Aria C. Branch
Represented By: Abha Khanna
Represented By: Amer S. Ahmed
Represented By: Elisabeth C. Frost
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN KENNETH PAXTON, JR.
Represented By: Christopher Lavorato
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Kenneth A. Klukowski
Represented By: Reuben William Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?