FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE DC LODGE 1 NAVEL DISTRICT et al. v. SIMMS et al.
Plaintiff: Fraternal Order of Police DC Lodge 1 Naval District Washington Labor Committee, PHILLIP GRIFFIN, Jennifer Smith, Sydney B Woods, FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, D.C. LODGE ONE, NAVAL DISTRICT LABOR COMMITTEE, INC. and SYDNEY B. WOODS
Defendant: Happy Simms, Sherman Benton, David Mann, Michael Richards, Morris K Scruggs, Kevin Wiggins, John Branscomb and MORRIS K. SCRUGGS
Case Number: 1:2024cv00582
Filed: February 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel S. Crowley (Crowley, Daniel)
March 28, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Hanan B. Kolko on behalf of FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, D.C. LODGE ONE, NAVAL DISTRICT LABOR COMMITTEE, INC., PHILLIP GRIFFIN, JENNIFER SMITH, SYDNEY B. WOODS (Kolko, Hanan)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Hanan B. Kolko. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/27/2024. (lclp)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall respond to the complaint by May 28, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/27/2024. (lccrc1)
March 26, 2024 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint,,, #1 Complaint,,, by SHERMAN BENTON, JOHN BRANSCOMB, DAVID MANN, MICHAEL RICHARDS, MORRIS K. SCRUGGS, HAPPY SIMMS, KEVIN WIGGINS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crowley, Daniel)
March 26, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel S. Crowley on behalf of All Defendants (Crowley, Daniel)
March 26, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Hanan B. Kolko, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10781216. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, D.C. LODGE ONE, NAVAL DISTRICT LABOR COMMITTEE, INC., PHILLIP GRIFFIN, JENNIFER SMITH, SYDNEY B. WOODS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certification of Counsel in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Hanan B Kolko Esq. in Support of Pro Hac Vice Motion)(DeNigris, Stephen)
March 26, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE. DAVID MANN waiver sent on 3/26/2024, answer due 5/25/2024. (DeNigris, Stephen)
March 19, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SHERMAN BENTON, JOHN BRANSCOMB, MICHAEL RICHARDS, MORRIS K. SCRUGGS, HAPPY SIMMS, KEVIN WIGGINS filed by JENNIFER SMITH, PHILLIP GRIFFIN, FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, D.C. LODGE ONE, NAVAL DISTRICT LABOR COMMITTEE, INC., SYDNEY B. WOODS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -NDW Bylaws, #2 Exhibit B-AAA Notice of Election, #3 Exhibit C-AAA Election results and Certification, #4 Exhibit D-AAA Secret Ballot Election, #5 Exhibit E-Defendants Letter to Navy, #6 Exhibit F-Defendants Letter to Labor Committee, #7 Exhibit G-Defendants False E-Mail Address to Labor Committee, #8 Exhibit H-Defendants Fraudulent Notice of General Membership Meeting, #9 Exhibit I-Plaintiffs' Cease and Desist Demand to Defendants, #10 Exhibit J-Unauthorized Unfair Labor Practice Charge)(DeNigris, Stephen)
March 18, 2024 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. SHERMAN BENTON served on 3/17/2024 (DeNigris, Stephen)
March 18, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MORRIS K. SCRUGGS served on 3/15/2024 (DeNigris, Stephen)
March 18, 2024 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOHN BRANSCOMB served on 3/15/2024 (DeNigris, Stephen)
March 12, 2024 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KEVIN WIGGINS served on 3/11/2024 (DeNigris, Stephen)
March 12, 2024 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MICHAEL RICHARDS served on 3/11/2024 (DeNigris, Stephen)
March 12, 2024 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HAPPY SIMMS served on 3/8/2024 (DeNigris, Stephen)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zcb)
March 1, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zcb)
February 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10723391) filed by Sydney B Woods, Fraternal Order of Police DC Lodge 1 Naval District Washington Labor Committee, Jennifer Smith, PHILLIP GRIFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Certified Election Results, #3 Exhibit B-AAA Voting Documents, #4 Exhibit C-Effort to Engage in Collective Bargaining, #5 Exhibit D-Unauthorized Use of FOP NDW Logo, #6 Exhibit E-Alternate Unauthorized Email Account, #7 Exhibit F-Unauthorized General Membership Notice, #8 Exhibit G-Cease and Desist Letter, #9 Exhibit H-Unfair Labor Practice Charge, #10 Summons Happy Simms, #11 Summons Sherman Benton, #12 Summons David Mann, #13 Summons Michael Richards, #14 Summons Morris K Scruggs, #15 Summons Kevin Wiggins, #16 Summons John Branscomb)(DeNigris, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE DC LODGE 1 NAVEL DISTRICT et al. v. SIMMS et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fraternal Order of Police DC Lodge 1 Naval District Washington Labor Committee
Represented By: Stephen Girard DeNigris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP GRIFFIN
Represented By: Stephen Girard DeNigris
Represented By: Hanan B. Kolko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Smith
Represented By: Stephen Girard DeNigris
Represented By: Hanan B. Kolko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sydney B Woods
Represented By: Stephen Girard DeNigris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRATERNAL ORDER OF POLICE, D.C. LODGE ONE, NAVAL DISTRICT LABOR COMMITTEE, INC.
Represented By: Hanan B. Kolko
Represented By: Stephen Girard DeNigris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYDNEY B. WOODS
Represented By: Stephen Girard DeNigris
Represented By: Hanan B. Kolko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Happy Simms
Represented By: Daniel S. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman Benton
Represented By: Daniel S. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Mann
Represented By: Daniel S. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Richards
Represented By: Daniel S. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris K Scruggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wiggins
Represented By: Daniel S. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Branscomb
Represented By: Daniel S. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORRIS K. SCRUGGS
Represented By: Daniel S. Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?