POWELL v. O'MALLEY
Plaintiff: ANGELA DENISE POWELL
Defendant: MARTIN O'MALLEY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2024cv00827
Filed: March 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Amit P Mehta
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall assign this action randomly to a judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/1/2024. (znmw)
May 1, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (znmw)
May 1, 2024 SUMMONS Not Issued as to MARTIN O'MALLEY Electronic notice has been provided to the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and to the U.S. Attorney's Office pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405g. Answer due by 7/3/2024. (znmw)
April 9, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Elliott on behalf of MARTIN O'MALLEY (Elliott, Scott)
March 20, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANGELA DENISE POWELL. (zcb)
March 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARTIN O'MALLEY filed by ANGELA DENISE POWELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(zcb)
March 20, 2024 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 03/20/2024. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zcb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POWELL v. O'MALLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA DENISE POWELL
Represented By: Joseph Ira Frydman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN O'MALLEY
Represented By: Scott Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?