CAMPBELL v. O'MALLEY
Plaintiff: JOANN S. CAMPBELL
Defendant: MARTIN J. O'MALLEY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2024cv00845
Filed: March 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall assign this action to a judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/6/2024. (znmw)
May 6, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (znmw)
May 6, 2024 SUMMONS Not Issued as to MARTIN J. O'MALLEY Electronic notice has been provided to the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and to the U.S. Attorney's Office pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405g. Answer due by 7/8/2024. (znmw)
March 25, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Elliott on behalf of MARTIN J. O'MALLEY (Elliott, Scott)
March 24, 2024 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 3/24/2024. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (znmw)
March 24, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOANN S. CAMPBELL. (Shea, Stephen)
March 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARTIN J. O'MALLEY (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by JOANN S. CAMPBELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shea, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAMPBELL v. O'MALLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANN S. CAMPBELL
Represented By: Stephen F. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN J. O'MALLEY
Represented By: Scott Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?