BRYSON v. O'MALLEY
Plaintiff: RICHARD BRYSON
Defendant: MARTIN J. O'MALLEY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2024cv00951
Filed: April 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Moxila A Upadhyaya
Referring Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Elliott on behalf of MARTIN J. O'MALLEY (Elliott, Scott)
April 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall be referred to a Magistrate Judge for full case management up to, and excluding, trial, unless the parties agree otherwise, commencing immediately, and any future filings related to this case shall have the initials of this District Judge and the Magistrate Judge following the case number in the caption. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 16, 2024. (lcrbw1)
April 16, 2024 CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Moxila A. Upadhyaya for full case management. (zcb)
April 15, 2024 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zcb)
April 15, 2024 SUMMONS Not Issued as to MARTIN J. O'MALLEY Electronic notice has been provided to the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and to the U.S. Attorney's Office pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405g.Answer due by 6/17/2024, (zcb)
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall assign this case to a district judge for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/11/2024. (psu1)
April 3, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICHARD BRYSON. (Shea, Stephen)
April 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARTIN J. O'MALLEY (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by RICHARD BRYSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shea, Stephen)
April 3, 2024 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 4/3/2024. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (znmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRYSON v. O'MALLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BRYSON
Represented By: Stephen F. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN J. O'MALLEY
Represented By: Scott Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?