CROSBY v. UNITED STATES
Petitioner: JAMES B.V. CROSBY
Respondent: UNITED STATES
Case Number: 1:2024cv01428
Filed: May 13, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Filing 6 Case transferred to the USDC for the Middle District of Florida pursuant to #5 Order Transferring Pro Se Case ; Sent to Court via extraction. (znmw)
May 31, 2024 Receipt on 5/31/2024 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 3:24-cv-00550 sent by USDC for the Middle District of Florida. (znmw)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the USDC for the Middle District of Florida FORTHWITH. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/30/2024. (znmw)
May 13, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES B.V. CROSBY. (mg)
May 13, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JAMES B.V. CROSBY. (See docket entry #2 to view document). (mg)
May 13, 2024 Filing 2 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JAMES B.V. CROSBY.(mg)
May 13, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JAMES B.V. CROSBY.(mg)
May 13, 2024 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 5/13/2024. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROSBY v. UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMES B.V. CROSBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?