Synergy Real Estate of SW Florida, Inc. et al v. Premier Property Management of SW Florida, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Synergy Real Estate of SW Florida, Inc., Gulf Coast Managment Group, LLC and Louis Pfaff |
Defendant: |
Premier Property Management of SW Florida, LLC, Naples New Ventures, LLC, Deborah McCabe, Michael Depaola, Kristin Depaola, Cynthia Jones and James Jones |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv00707 |
Filed: |
July 6, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Florida |
Office: |
Ft. Myers Office |
County: |
Collier |
Presiding Judge: |
Sheri Polster Chappell |
Presiding Judge: |
John E. Steele |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1125 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 11, 2013 |
Filing
56
OPINION AND ORDER granting 52 Joint Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Counts I and II of the Second Amended Complaint are dismissed. The Court declines to retain jurisdiction over the state law claims and those counts are also dismissed . No further amendments will be allowed. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close the file. The Clerk is further directed to terminate all previously scheduled deadlines and pending motions. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 10/11/2013. (AAA)
|
June 10, 2013 |
Filing
50
OPINION AND ORDER granting 38 Joint Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. The 37 Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs may file a Second Amended Complaint within twenty-one days of this Opinion and Order. Failure to file a Second Amended Complaint within the allotted time will result in the closing of the file without further notice. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 6/10/2013. (AAA)
|
March 6, 2013 |
Filing
47
ORDER granting 46 the Joint Motion to Abate Pending Resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. After the disposition of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, the Parties shall file a joint revised Case Management Report within fourteen (14) days of the Court's ruling, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/6/2013. (LMF)
|
September 12, 2012 |
Filing
35
OPINION AND ORDER granting 8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file an Amended Complaint within twenty-one days. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/12/2012. (AAA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Synergy Real Estate of SW Florida, Inc. et al v. Premier Property Management of SW Florida, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Synergy Real Estate of SW Florida, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Kellie Elizabeth Tomeo |
Represented By: |
R. Paul Roecker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Gulf Coast Managment Group, LLC |
Represented By: |
Kellie Elizabeth Tomeo |
Represented By: |
R. Paul Roecker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Louis Pfaff |
Represented By: |
Kellie Elizabeth Tomeo |
Represented By: |
R. Paul Roecker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Premier Property Management of SW Florida, LLC |
Represented By: |
Roger H. Miller, III |
Represented By: |
Daniel W. Anderson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Naples New Ventures, LLC |
Represented By: |
Roger H. Miller, III |
Represented By: |
Daniel W. Anderson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Deborah McCabe |
Represented By: |
Daniel W. Anderson |
Represented By: |
Roger H. Miller, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Michael Depaola |
Represented By: |
Daniel W. Anderson |
Represented By: |
Roger H. Miller, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Kristin Depaola |
Represented By: |
Daniel W. Anderson |
Represented By: |
Roger H. Miller, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Cynthia Jones |
Represented By: |
Daniel W. Anderson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: James Jones |
Represented By: |
Daniel W. Anderson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?