Sierra Club et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Environmental Confederation of Southwest Florida and Sierra Club
Defendant: U.S. Army Corp of Engineers, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Florida Department of Transportation, Aurelia Skipworth, Todd T. Semonite and Kevin J. Thibault
Case Number: 2:2020cv00013
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Recognition of Deadline to Respond to Complaint or, in the Alternative, for Extension of Time. The Florida Department of Transportation shall file a response to the Complaint by March 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 2/21/2020. (brh)
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Florida Department of Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gonzalez, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
January 29, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF of service by Environmental Confederation of Southwest Florida, Sierra Club as to Aurelia Skipworth (Malloy, Bonnie) Modified on 1/30/2020 (drn).
January 29, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Environmental Confederation of Southwest Florida, Sierra Club as to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service (Malloy, Bonnie) Modified on 1/30/2020 (drn).
January 29, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Environmental Confederation of Southwest Florida, Sierra Club as to Todd T. Semonite (Malloy, Bonnie) Modified on 1/30/2020 (drn).
January 29, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Environmental Confederation of Southwest Florida, Sierra Club as to U.S. Army Corp of Engineers (Malloy, Bonnie) Modified on 1/30/2020 (drn).
January 29, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF of service by Environmental Confederation of Southwest Florida, Sierra Club as to Florida Department of Transportation (Malloy, Bonnie) Modified on 1/30/2020 (drn).
January 29, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF of service by Environmental Confederation of Southwest Florida, Sierra Club as to Kevin J. Thibault (Malloy, Bonnie) Modified on 1/30/2020 (drn).
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Environmental Confederation of Southwest Florida, Sierra Club. Related case(s): no. (Malloy, Bonnie)
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Sierra Club. (Malloy, Bonnie) Modified on 1/17/2020 as to applicable party (drn).
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Environmental Confederation of Southwest Florida. (Malloy, Bonnie) Modified on 1/17/2020 as to applicable party (drn).
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/29/2020. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/15/2020. (WRW)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Florida Department of Transportation, Todd T. Semonite, Aurelia Skipworth, Kevin J. Thibault, U.S. Army Corp of Engineers, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. (drn)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:20-cv-13-FtM-38NPM. (SJB)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Florida Department of Transportation, Todd T. Semonite, Aurelia Skipworth, Kevin J. Thibault, U.S. Army Corp of Engineers, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16333650) filed by Sierra Club, Environmental Confederation of Southwest Florida. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Malloy, Bonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sierra Club et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corp of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Transportation
Represented By: Daniel Elden Nordby
Represented By: Jason Brent Gonzalez
Represented By: Meredith Sackett Delcamp
Represented By: Rachel Catherine Procaccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurelia Skipworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd T. Semonite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin J. Thibault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Confederation of Southwest Florida
Represented By: Bonnie Ann Malloy
Represented By: Tania Galloni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Bonnie Ann Malloy
Represented By: Tania Galloni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?