Wardingly v. Inch et al
Plaintiff: Edward Wardingly
Defendant: FNU McCain, Mark Inch, FNU Holm, Chris Lane, FNU Alamanzar-Contrara, Alexis Figueroa, M.D., Joseph Edwards, Thomas Winters and Mark Jones
Case Number: 2:2020cv00323
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against FNU Alamanzar-Contrara, Joseph Edwards, Alexis Figueroa, M.D., FNU Holm, Mark Inch, Mark Jones, Chris Lane, FNU McCain, Thomas Winters filed by Edward Wardingly. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Edward Wardingly. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (no copies provided)(SLU)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 PRISONER financial certificate by Edward Wardingly. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to file amended complaint. Amended Complaint due by 6/26/2020. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of this Order and a blank civil rights complaint form for confined litigants bearing the above-captioned case number and the title "Amended Complaint." The Court warns Plaintiff that failure to comply with this Order or failure to respond fully and accurately to each of the questions in the civil rights complaint form will result in a dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 6/8/2020. (SLU)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING PRISONER CONSENT FORM AND FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/21/2020. (SLU)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Edward Wardingly. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(SLU) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/5/2020. (SLU)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/5/2020. (SLU)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FNU Alamanzar-Contrara, Joseph Edwards, Alexis Figueroa, M.D., FNU Holm, Mark Inch, Mark Jones, Chris Lane, FNU McCain, Thomas Winters filed by Edward Wardingly. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (no fee/ifp)(SLU)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wardingly v. Inch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Wardingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU McCain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Holm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Alamanzar-Contrara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Figueroa, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?