Sea Star Line, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sea Star Line, LLC and Tote Services, Inc.
Defendant: BASF Corporation (Puerto Rico), Crawford, ABF Freight System, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corp., Patrick John Smith, Lamex Foods, Inc., Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412719000, Bemis Company, Inc., Industrial Fire Products Corporation, Roche Operations, Limited, Mars Pet Care US Inc., Lloyds Syndicate 2623 a/s/o Interra International, Inc., Caterpillar Americas, Carlos A. Tuche Funicia and Puerto Rico Green Transportation, Reyes Holdings, LLC, Mamo Transportation, Inc., Tote Shipholdings Inc., AJC Logistics, Inc., Eaton Corporation, PLC, Claimant Ace American Insurance Company, Lynden Air Freight, Inc., Hubbell Caribe Limited, Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc., 3M Company, Excel Cargo Services, Inc. d/b/a Caribex Worldwide, BMW of North America, LLC., Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Rochelle Hamm as Personal Representative of Frank Hamm, III, Bemis Healthcare Packaging, Inc., Tote Inc., Cargo Claimants Who Did Not File An Answer or Claim, Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company a/s/o Nexeo Solutions Holdings, LLC, Mars Chocolate North America, LLC, Jennifer Mathias, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jeffrey Mathias, Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc., Federal Insurance Company as subrogee of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Kimberly-Clark Trading & Services, Ltda, Marlena Porter, as Personal Representative for the Estate of James Phillip Porter, Jr., TMM Marine American Insurance Companies a/s/o Dunkin Brands International, DMCC, Truck Brokers, Inc., Save Logistics Incorporated, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America a/s/o Bunzl USA Holding, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America a/s/o A.M. Capen's Co., Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Continental Insurance Company as subrogee of Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc., Foot Locker Incorporated, BASF Corporation, Kraft Food Group Incorporated, Alexis Parker, as Personal Representative of Roosevelt Clark, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America a/s/o Dawn Foods Products, Bemis Healthcare Packaging de Puerto Rico, Inc. and Vicky Green, as the Personal Representative of LaShawn Rivera
Claimant: Joanna Johnson, Kenneth W. Randolph, Ingersoll Rand Company, Aqua Gulf Transport, Inc., BMW of North America, Inc., Claudia Aparecida Shultz, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Wink Shultz, deceased, Those Certain Underwriters Subscribing to Policy # 019341836, Willa Crawford, EFOODS INC., Personal Representat Dena Ann Lightfoot, Cardinal Health, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412443000, ArcBest Corporation, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500194000, SAIA Motor Freight Line, LLC, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500466000, Terri Hargrove, Tracey Hatch, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC151592500, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1516397000, Estes Express Lines, The Hanover Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1515422000, Able Sales Company, Inc., Universal Insurance Company of North America, Gargiulo, Inc., Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tina Riehm, Kimberly-Clark Global Sales LLC, ADDREISHA SHIRLIEA JONES, Kimberly-Clark Puerto Rico, Inc., Suarez and Company, Puerto Rico Supplies Group, Inc., Tinisha Renee Thomas, Karen Schoenly, Katie Griffin, Century Packaging Corp., Great American Insurance Company of New York, Claudette Riley, Deborah Roberts, Starr Indemnity and Liability Co. a/s/o Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., ITL International Inc. d/b/a Mars Caribbean and Central America, a division of Mars, Inc., Elaine Meklin, Mendez & Company, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Karl Meklin, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1516254000, Starr Indemnity and Liability Co., Dade Paper & Bag Co., Supermercados Econo, Inc., AGCS Marine Insurance Company a/s/o Walgreen Co., The Continental Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Plaza Provision Company, Quirch Foods Co., Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1515551000, Mars Masterfoods USA, Inc., Jill Jackson-d'Entremont, Linde Gas of Puerto Rico, Inc., Pet Plastics LLC, RLI Insurance Company, Maverick C&P, Inc., Cheryl Crawford-Glenn, QBE Seguros, Laurie D. Bobillot and Ruben Aquino
3Rd Party Plaintiff: AGNIESZKA ZDOBYCH, as Personal Representative of the Estate of RAFAL ZDOBYCH, deceased, BOZENA TRUSZKOWSKA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of ANDRZEJ TRUSZKOWSKI, deceased, AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co., Seguros Universal, S.A., Donna Griffin, AGNIESZKA NITA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of MARCIN NITA, deceased, ANNA KRAUSE, as Personal Representative of the Estate of PIOTR KRAUSE, deceased, MALGORZATA PODGORSKA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of JAN PODGORSKI, deceased, ACE Insurance Company and Patricia Quammie, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Theodore Quammie, deceased
Intervenor: TRIVONDA PORTER
Cross Claimant: The Gap, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., FM Global, Inc., Mutchler Inc. and Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC
Cross Defendant: Fedex Freight, Inc. and UPS Ground Freight, Inc.
Counter Claimant: CHAMPA, VALMA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Champa, Jr., deceased, JARVON WHIGHAM, Claimant Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, PUSATERE, EMILY, as Personal Representative of the Estate of RICHARD PUSATERE, deceased and Terri C. Davis
Counter Defendant: THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS (SYNDICATE 1955, SYNDICATE 2987, SYNDICATE 1183 AND SYNDICATE 0457) SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY # B0180 PC1422840 AS SUBROGEE OF DEL VALLE BRANDS, INC. AND f/u/b/o DEL VALLE
3Rd Party Defendant: Goodnight International Inc., Navigators Insurance Company, INTEC MARITIME OFFSHORE SERVICE CORP., SHIP OR LAND OPERATIONS AGENCY, INC., Econocaribe Consolidators, inc., MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON, Arrowpac Inc., Caribbean Shipping Services, Inc. and Allied Logistics Corp.
Consolidated Plaintiff: W.W. Grainger, Inc., Citrus World, Inc. and Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Consolidated Defendant: Aqua Gulf Corporation
Case Number: 3:2015cv01297
Filed: October 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Jacksonville Office
County: Duval
Presiding Judge: Monte C Richardson
Referring Judge: Harvey E Schlesinger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 46:31301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2017 Filing 696 FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT that pursuant to this Court's Order, filed November 03, 2017, that a Final Default Judgment for Exoneration from Liability be and the same is hereby entered in favor Petitioners, Sea Star Line, LLC d/b/a/ TOTE Maritime Puerto Rico, as Owner, and TOTE Services, Inc., as Owner pro hac vice of the S.S. "EL FARO," against all persons, corporations, and entities who did not file either an answer or a claim in this action and all claims not resolved in this action. It is further ordered and adjudged that a Judgment for Exoneration from Liability be and the same is hereby entered in favor of Petitioner, Sea Star Line, LLC d/b/a/ TOTE Maritime Puerto Rico, as Owner and TOTE Services, Inc., as Owner pro hac vice of the S.S. "EL FARO," exonerating them from any liability to all persons, corporations or entities who did not file either an answer or a claim and all claims not resolved in this action arising from the incident on or about October 1, 2015 as more particularly described in the Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. It is further ordered and adjudged that those persons, corporations, and entities who did not file a claim or answer in the action and all claims not resolved in this action, shall recover nothing from the Petitioners. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/17/2017. (AEJ)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER that a Final Default Judgment for Exoneration from Liability and a Judgment for Exoneration from Liability be entered as set forth in the Order; directing the Clerk to terminate all pending motions and close this case; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 11/2/2017. (MGG)
September 26, 2017 Filing 694 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. re #692 MOTION for default judgment against Cargo Claimants Who Did Not File An Answer or Claim - TO THE COURT OF PENDING MOTION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelley, Allan)
August 10, 2017 Filing 693 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Final Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for April 4, 2018 at 10:00 AM is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2018 at 10:30 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger (MGG)
July 27, 2017 Filing 692 MOTION for default judgment against Cargo Claimants Who Did Not File An Answer or Claim by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Final Default Judgment)(Kelley, Allan) Modified on 7/28/2017 - notified counsel regarding proposed orders. (AEJ)
July 25, 2017 Filing 691 STIPULATION of Dismissal - Petitioners and Cargo Claimants, FM Global, Inc., Aqua Gulf Transport, Inc. and Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc. - by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Kelley, Allan)
July 25, 2017 Filing 690 STIPULATION of Dismissal - Petitioner and Cargo Claimant, Hanover Insurance Company - by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Kelley, Allan)
July 25, 2017 Filing 689 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Fedex Freight, Inc.. (Rubin, Marc)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 688 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice to re-filing if necessary #686 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/13/2017. (ADM)
July 12, 2017 Filing 687 RESPONSE to Motion re #686 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion to Extend Expert Discovery to align with the Court's Grant of an Extension of Fact Discovery filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Kelley, Allan)
June 28, 2017 Filing 686 MOTION to Amend the Court's Order Granting an Extension of Fact Discovery by FM Global, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company. (Lillis, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified text on 6/29/2017. (AEJ)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 685 ENDORSED ORDER granting #679 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The fact discovery deadline is extended to August 30, 2017. All other case management deadlines shall remain intact. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/13/2017. (ADM)
June 13, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney John T. Lillis, Jr., appearing on behalf of FM Global, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX024357.) Related document: #680 Unopposed MOTION for John T. Lillis, Jr. to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
June 12, 2017 Filing 684 RESPONSE in Opposition re #679 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery up to and including 30 August 2017 filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Kelley, Allan)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ENDORSED ORDER: Petitioners shall respond to #679 Claimants' Motion to Extend Discovery no later than June 12, 2017, or the Motion will be deemed unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/7/2017. (ADM)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 682 ENDORSED ORDER granting #680 motion to appear pro hac vice. If John Lillis, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/6/2017. (ADM)
June 5, 2017 Filing 681 NOTICE of change of address by Christoph M. Wahner (Wahner, Christoph)
June 5, 2017 Filing 680 Unopposed MOTION for John T. Lillis, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by FM Global, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company. (Janssen, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
June 3, 2017 Filing 679 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery up to and including 30 August 2017 by FM Global, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company. (Williams, Nathan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORDER dismissing as moot #310 Motion to modify the Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims; dismissing as moot #661 motion to dismiss Intervening Claim of Trivonda Porter, as Mother and Next Best Friend of A.T. (minor child); dismissing as moot #661 Motion for summary judgment ; dismissing as moot #667 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Petitioners' Motion to Dismiss Intervening Claim of Trivonda Porter, as Mother and Next Best Friend of A.T. (Minor Child); SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 4/19/2017. (MGG)
April 18, 2017 Filing 677 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 4/18/2017. (Digital) (SHS)
April 13, 2017 Filing 676 NOTICE of settlement as to the Estates of Anthony Shawn Thomas, German Solar-Cortes and Joe Hargrove, by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry)
April 12, 2017 Filing 675 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 4/12/2017. (Digital) (SHS)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 674 ENDORSED ORDER granting #670 Aqua Gulf Transport, Inc. and Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc.'s Motion to Be Excused from Settlement Conference on April 18, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/10/2017. (ADM)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 673 ENDORSED ORDER granting #672 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Hanover Insurance Company and Affiliated FM Insurance Company shall have until April 10, 2017 to submit their memoranda for the April 18, 2017 settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/10/2017. (ADM)
April 6, 2017 Filing 672 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Mediation Memoranda by FM Global, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company. (Williams, Nathan)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 671 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference for 4/12/2017 at 09:30 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 5C before Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/5/2017. (ADM)
April 4, 2017 Filing 670 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to be Excused from Settlement Conference by Aqua Gulf Transport, Inc., Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc.. (Brock, Lindsey)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER granting #668 Joint Motion to Continue Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 4/3/2017. (MGG)
April 4, 2017 Filing 668 Joint MOTION for settlement conference Joint Motion to Continue Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge by Terri Hargrove, TRIVONDA PORTER, Sea Star Line, LLC, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas, Tote Services, Inc.. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina) Modified on 4/6/2017 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct case caption on all pleadings(TSW).
April 3, 2017 Filing 667 MOTION for leave to file Reply in Further Support of Petitioners' Motion to Dismiss Intervening Claim of Trivonda Porter, Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 661) by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina) Modified on 4/6/2017 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct case caption on all pleadings(TSW).
March 29, 2017 Filing 666 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #661 Motion to dismissMotion for summary judgment filed by TRIVONDA PORTER. (Woodlief, Mitchel)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ENDORSED ORDER denying #664 Joint Motion to Reschedule Cargo Claim Settlement Conference. The settlement conference remains scheduled for April 18, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/28/2017. (ADM)
March 27, 2017 Filing 664 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Reschedule Cargo Claim Settlement Conference by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Kelley, Allan)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 663 ORDER granting #662 Motion to reschedule settlement conference. The cargo claim settlement conference shall take place on April 18, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. The parties' memoranda must be submitted, not filed, no later than April 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/17/2017. (ADM)
March 16, 2017 Filing 662 JOINT MOTION to Reschedule Settlement Conference re #656 ORDER setting settlement conference, by Tote Services, Inc. (Kelley, Allan) Modified on 3/17/2017 to edit text and create docket entry relationship. (TMC)
March 15, 2017 Filing 661 MOTION to Dismiss Intervening Claim of Trivonda Porter, as Mother and Next Best Friend of A.T. (minor child), Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina) Modified on 3/16/2017 to edit docket text. (AMM)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER directing Cargo Claimants to submit their memoranda for the settlement conference scheduled for March 23, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/14/2017. (ADM)
March 6, 2017 Filing 659 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal re #330 Third Party Complaint and Counterclaim by Arrowpac Inc. (Reid, Deborah) Modified on 3/7/2017 to create docket entry relationship. (AEJ)
March 3, 2017 Filing 658 NOTICE of settlement as to the Estate of Lonnie Jordan, by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry) Modified on 3/6/2017 - Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
March 2, 2017 Filing 657 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 3/2/2017. (Digital) (SHS)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER setting settlement conference for 3/23/2017 at 11:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 5C before Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/2/2017. (ADM)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER granting #578 Motion to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Preside Over Settlement Conferences; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 3/1/2017. (MGG)
February 28, 2017 Filing 654 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. re #622 Order on motion to modifyOrder on motion for discoveryOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #578 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Preside Over Settlement Conferences (Kelley, Allan)
February 23, 2017 Filing 653 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 2/23/2017. (Digital) (SHS) (SHS).
February 23, 2017 Filing 652 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 2/23/2017. (Digital) (SHS) (SHS).
February 23, 2017 Filing 651 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held on 2/23/2017. (Digital) (SHS) (SHS).
February 21, 2017 Filing 650 NOTICE by Aqua Gulf Transport, Inc., Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc. of Outcome of Scheduled Mediation or Negotiations re #622 Order on motion to modify, Order on motion for discovery, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 649 JOINT STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal by Tracey Hatch. (Slater, Thomas) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 648 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal by Tina Riehm. (Slater, Thomas) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 647 NOTICE of settlement Petitioners' Eleventh Notice of Settlement by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry) Modified on 2/22/2017 - Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 646 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Caterpillar Americas C.V.'s Claim (DE 210) by Caterpillar Americas. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 645 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Industrial Fire Products Corporation's Claim (DE 214) by Industrial Fire Products Corporation. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 644 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Roche Operations, Limited's Claim (DE 226) by Roche Operations, Limited. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 643 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Tyson Foods, Inc.'s Claim (DE 233) by Tyson Foods, Inc. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 642 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Lamex Foods, Inc.'s Claim (DE 234) by Lamex Foods, Inc. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 641 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Foot Locker Incorporated's Claim (DE 208, 238) by Foot Locker Incorporated. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 640 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Mead Johnson & Company's Claim (DE 205, 230) by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 639 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Save Logistics Incorporated's Claim (DE 203) by Save Logistics Incorporated. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 638 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Hubbell Caribe Limited's Claim (DE 202) by Hubbell Caribe Limited. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 637 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Reyes Holdings, LLC's Claim (DE 201) by Reyes Holdings, LLC. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 636 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to 3M Company's Claim (DE 198) by 3M Company. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 635 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Kraft Food Group Incorporated's Claim (DE 199) by Kraft Food Group Incorporated. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 634 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Eaton Corporation, PLC's Claim (DE 197) by Eaton Corporation, PLC. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 633 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Del Valle Brands, Inc.'s Claim (DE 52) by THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS (SYNDICATE 1955, SYNDICATE 2987, SYNDICATE 1183 AND SYNDICATE 0457) SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY # B0180 PC1422840 AS SUBROGEE OF DEL VALLE BRANDS, INC. AND f/u/b/o DEL VALLE. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified Counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 21, 2017 Filing 632 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to BASF's Claim (DE 219, 228) by BASF Corporation (Puerto Rico). (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 2/22/2017 to edit text. Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER: The settlement conference pursuant to #630 Order shall take place on March 2, 2017 at 9:30 a.m.. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/16/2017. (ADM)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER granting #560 Renewed Motion to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Preside Over Settlement Conferences; granting #624 Motion for settlement conference; directing the Parties to contact Magistrate Judge Richardson and schedule a settlement conference. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 2/15/2017. (MGG)
February 16, 2017 Filing 629 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Janet M. Beason/Cornerstone (904) 647-4723. (AEJ)
February 16, 2017 Filing 628 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 02/08/2017 before Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janet M. Beason/Cornerstone,Telephone number (904) 647-4723. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 3/9/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2017. (AEJ)
February 14, 2017 Filing 627 STIPULATION of Dismissal (i) CARLOS A. TUCHE FUNICIA and PUERTO RICO GREEN TRANSPORTATION; (ii) CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY as subrogee of GOODNIGHT ACQUISITIONS LLC a/k/a GOODNIGHT INTERNATIONAL INC.; (iii) GOODNIGHT ACQUISITIONS LLC a/k/a GOODNIGHT INTERNATIONAL INC. and (iv) FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY as subrogee of J.C. PENNEY CORPORATION, INC. [D.E. 212] by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Kelley, Allan)
February 14, 2017 Filing 626 NOTICE of Outcome of Settlement Conference with the Estate of Lonnie Jordan by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. re #622 Order on motion to modify, Order on motion for discovery, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #560 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Renewed Motion to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Preside Over Settlement Conferences (Cerda-Collazo, Karina) Modified on 2/15/2017 to edit text, Notified counsel about proper case caption. (AEJ)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 625 ENDORSED ORDER granting #623 Carlos A. Tuche Funicia and Puerto Rico Green Transportation's Unopposed Motion to Be Excused from the Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/13/2017. (ADM)
February 13, 2017 Filing 624 Unopposed MOTION for settlement conference by Joanna Johnson. (Gary, Willie)
February 10, 2017 Filing 623 UNOPPOSED MOTION to be excused from the settlement conference by Carlos A. Tuche Funicia and Puerto Rico Green Transportation. (Loh, David) Modified on 2/13/2017 to edit text. (AEJ)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 622 SECOND OMNIBUS ORDER: taking under advisement #310 Motion to modify the Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims; denying #392 motion to limit discovery; taking under advisement in part and granting in part #560 Renewed Motion to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Preside Over Settlement Conferences; taking under advisement #578 Motion to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Preside Over Settlement Conferences; Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2017 at 2:00 PM, if motion for summary judgment is filed; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 2/8/2017. (MGG)
February 8, 2017 Filing 621 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/8/2017. Court Reporter: Janet Beason/Cornerstone (MGG)
February 8, 2017 Filing 620 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by UPS Ground Freight, Inc. (Wahner, Christoph)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDERED: The settlement conference shall take place on February 23 and 24, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 5C. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/8/2017. (ADM)
February 8, 2017 Filing 618 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. re #548 Notice (Other), #392 MOTION for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery Notice of Filing Letter from National Transportation Safety Board (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NTSB Letter dated February 6, 2017)(Cerda-Collazo, Karina) Modified on 2/9/2017 - Notified counsel about proper caption. (AEJ)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ENDORSED ORDER granting #612 Motion to be excused from the February 8, 2017 Status Conference, filed by Valma Champa, Emily Pusatere, and Jarvon Whigham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/7/2017. (ADM)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ENDORSED ORDER granting #615 Motion to allow electronic equipment. The parties are reminded that although cellular telephones and laptop computers are generally prohibited in the Courthouse, counsel only may bring personal electronic devices into the Courthouse as provided for in the General Order (Doc. 1), entered on October 2, 2013, in Case No. 6:13-mc-94-Orl-22. The device(s) must be on silent mode while in the courtroom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/7/2017. (ADM)
February 7, 2017 Filing 615 MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically Laptop Computers by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina) Modified on 2/8/2017 - Notified counsel about proper caption. (AEJ)
February 7, 2017 Filing 614 NOTICE of stipulated voluntary dismissal by Seguros Universal, S.A. (Glynn, Lawrence) Modified on 2/7/2017 to edit text.(AEJ)
February 7, 2017 Filing 613 NOTICE of stipulated voluntary dismissal by ACE Insurance Company (Glynn, Lawrence) Modified on 2/7/2017 to edit text. (AEJ)
February 6, 2017 Filing 612 UNOPPOSED MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Wrongful Death Claimants Valma Champa, Emily Pusatere, Jarvon Whigham, to be Excused from the February 8, 2017 Status Conference by CHAMPA, VALMA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Champa, Jr., deceased, PUSATERE, EMILY, as Personal Representative of the Estate of RICHARD PUSATERE, deceased, JARVON WHIGHAM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hickey, John) Modified on 2/7/2017 - Notified counsel in regards to proper caption and rules on proposed orders. (AEJ)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER denying #551 Motion to Disqualify Counsel.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/6/2017. (ADM)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ENDORSED ORDER granting #607 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Counsel for Joanna Johnson as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lonnie Jordan may appear telephonically at the February 8, 2017 Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/6/2017. (ADM)
February 6, 2017 Filing 609 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal by Donna Griffin. (Auger, Matthew) Modified on 2/7/2017 to edit text, also Notified counsel in regards to proper caption. (AEJ)
February 6, 2017 Filing 608 NOTICE of Instructions to appear telephonically (MGG)
February 3, 2017 Filing 607 MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Joanna Johnson. (Gary, Willie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
February 3, 2017 Filing 606 RESPONSE in Opposition re #578 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Preside Over Settlement Conferences filed by FM Global, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company. (Williams, Nathan)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER granting #604 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/3/2017. (ADM)
February 2, 2017 Filing 604 MOTION to Appear Telephonically at the 8 February 2017 Status Conference by FM Global, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company. (Williams, Nathan) Motions no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified on 2/3/2017 to edit text. (AEJ)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ENDORSED ORDER granting #595 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Brian T. Scarry, Horr Novak & Skipp P.A., Thomas M. Eagan, David T. Maloof, and Maloof Brown & Eagan, LLC are relieved of any further responsibility as counsel for Claimant in this matter, but they shall comply with all applicable obligations on withdrawing counsel, including any applicable Bar rules. The Clerk shall add Lindsey C. Brock, III and Rumrell, McLeod & Brock, PLLC as counsel of record for Claimant Aqua Gulf Transport, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/2/2017. (ADM)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #563 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/2/2017. (ADM)
February 1, 2017 Sealed Document. S-601 (AEJ)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER granting #596 Motion to be excused from the status conference. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 2/1/2017. (MGG)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER granting #594 Motion To Be Excused from February 8, 2017 Status Conference. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 2/1/2017. (MGG)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER granting #593 Motion To Be Excused from February 8, 2017 Status Conference. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 2/1/2017. (MGG)
February 1, 2017 Sealed Document. S-597 (AEJ)
January 31, 2017 Filing 596 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to be excused from the status conference by Carlos A. Tuche Funicia and Puerto Rico Green Transportation. (Loh, David)
January 31, 2017 Filing 595 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Aqua Gulf Transport, Inc.. (Brock, Lindsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
January 30, 2017 Filing 594 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Be Excused from February 8, 2017 Status Conference by UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Rubin, Marc)
January 30, 2017 Filing 593 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Be Excused from February 8, 2017 Status Conference by Fedex Freight, Inc.. (Rubin, Marc)
January 27, 2017 Filing 592 REPLY to Response to Motion re #551 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Motion to Disqualify Arnold & Itkin, LLP from Representing Multiple Claimants (Hargrove, Solar-Cortes & Thomas) SUR-REPLY filed by Terri Hargrove, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Arnold, Kurt)
January 27, 2017 Filing 591 STIPULATION of Dismissal dockets 185, 186, 225 and 334 by AGCS Marine Insurance Company. (Rouffet, Carole)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER granting #583 Motion To Be Excused from February 8, 2017 Hearing. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 1/25/2017. (MGG)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #149 Motion TO Approve Disbursement of Settlement Funds; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 1/25/2017. (MGG)
January 25, 2017 Sealed Document. S-588 (AEJ)
January 25, 2017 Sealed Document. S-587 (AEJ)
January 24, 2017 Filing 586 REPLY to Response to Motion re #551 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Motion to Disqualify Arnold & Itkin, LLP from Representing Multiple Claimants (Hargrove, Solar-Cortes & Thomas) Reply in further support of Motion to Disqualify Arnold & Itkin, LLP from Representing Multiple Claimants filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B")(Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
January 24, 2017 Filing 585 NOTICE filed erroneously canceling hearing re 584 Notice; THE IN CAMERA HEARING set for Wednesday, January 25, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. before Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger REMAINS SCHEDULED; please contact the Courtroom Deputy for any further information; THE HEARING REMAINS SCHEDULED. (MGG)
January 24, 2017 Filing 584 NOTICE canceling In Camera Hearing hearing scheduled for Wednesday, January 25, 2017 at 10:30 AM (MGG)
January 24, 2017 Filing 583 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Be Excused from February 8, 2017 Hearing by Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc.. (Brock, Lindsey)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER taking under advisement #563 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/23/2017. (ADM)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ENDORSED ORDER granting #576 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Adam Lewis, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/23/2017. (ADM)
January 23, 2017 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Adam Lewis, appearing on behalf of Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX022784.) Related document: #576 MOTION for Adam Lewis to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
January 20, 2017 Filing 580 RESPONSE in Opposition re #563 MOTION for protective order Petitioners' Motion for Protective Order on 13 Unilateral Notices of Deposition filed by Terri Hargrove, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Arnold, Kurt)
January 20, 2017 Filing 579 RESPONSE in Opposition re #560 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Renewed Motion to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Preside Over Settlement Conferences filed by Terri Hargrove, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Arnold, Kurt)
January 20, 2017 Filing 578 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Preside Over Settlement Conferences by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Kelley, Allan)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER Setting Hearing on pending matters in the case as set forth in the Order; Status Conference set for 2/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 1/20/2017. (MGG)
January 20, 2017 Filing 576 MOTION for Adam Lewis to appear pro hac vice by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Atty Cert.)(Hamaway, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified on 1/26/2017 to notify counsel about including correct division. (AEJ).
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ENDORSED ORDER granting #573 Motion for Leave to File. Petitioners' reply, limited to five pages, is due January 24, 2017. Any sur-reply, limited to five pages, is due within three business days of filing the reply. The Motion to disqualify is under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/19/2017. (ADM)
January 19, 2017 Filing 574 RESPONSE to Motion re #573 MOTION for leave to file Motion for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of #551 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Motion to Disqualify Arnold & Itkin, LLP from Representing Multiple Claimants filed by Terri Hargrove, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Arnold, Kurt)
January 18, 2017 Filing 573 MOTION for leave to file Motion for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of #551 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Motion to Disqualify Arnold & Itkin, LLP from Representing Multiple Claimants by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina) Modified on 1/19/2017 to add docket entry relationship (AEJ).
January 17, 2017 Filing 572 NOTICE of settlement Petitioners' Tenth Notice of Settlement by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry)
January 17, 2017 Filing 571 NOTICE of settlement Petitioners' Ninth Notice of Settlement by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry)
January 17, 2017 Filing 570 NOTICE of settlement Petitioners' Eighth Notice of Settlement by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry)
January 17, 2017 Filing 569 NOTICE of settlement Petitioners' Seventh Notice of Settlement by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry)
January 17, 2017 Filing 568 RESPONSE in Opposition re #551 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Motion to Disqualify Arnold & Itkin, LLP from Representing Multiple Claimants (Hargrove, Solar-Cortes & Thomas) filed by Terri Hargrove, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Kurt) Modified on 1/19/2017 to notify attys of proper procedure regarding proposed orders (TMC).
January 12, 2017 Filing 567 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Mutchler Inc., Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Pfizer, Inc. (Sweeney, James)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ENDORSED ORDER: Any party opposing #563 Petitioners' Motion for Protective Order on 13 Unilateral Notices of Depositions, shall respond to the Motion no later than January 20, 2017, or the Motion will be deemed unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/11/2017. (ADM)
January 10, 2017 Filing 565 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by ABF Freight System, Inc. (Scarry, Brian)
January 10, 2017 Filing 564 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by ABF Freight System, Inc. (Scarry, Brian)
January 10, 2017 Filing 563 MOTION for protective order Petitioners' Motion for Protective Order on 13 Unilateral Notices of Deposition by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - July 6 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - July 12 Response, #3 Exhibit C - Sept 9 Email, #4 Exhibit D - Sept 19 Response, #5 Exhibit E - Sept 21 and 30 Emails, #6 Exhibit F - Dec 14 Email, #7 Exhibit G - Dec 22 and 24 Emails, #8 Exhibit H - Unilateral Notices of 13 Depos, #9 Exhibit I - Jan 2 Email Chain)(Cerda-Collazo, Karina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #525 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/9/2017. (ADM)
January 6, 2017 Filing 561 RESPONSE re #548 Notice (Other), #540 Order pdf filed by Terri Hargrove, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Itkin, Cory)
January 6, 2017 Filing 560 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Renewed Motion to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Preside Over Settlement Conferences by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Selig ADR Confirmation of Mediation Letter))(Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER granting #547 Motion to Seal; the duration of the seal will extend until 1/25/2026, the date upon which the minor child reaches majority; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 1/4/2017. (MGG)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER dismissing as moot #375 Motion to Dismiss AGCS MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY'S THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 1/4/2017. (MGG)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER striking #553 Motion to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Preside over Settlement Conferences for failure to comply with Middle District of Florida Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 1/4/2017. (MGG)
January 4, 2017 Filing 556 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Carlos A. Tuche Funicia and Puerto Rico Green Transportation. (Phelan, Robert)
January 4, 2017 Filing 555 NOTICE by Aqua Gulf Transport, Inc. of Partial Withdrawal of Claims (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Notice of Partial Withdrawal)(Eagan, Thomas)
January 3, 2017 Filing 554 REQUEST for oral argument re #553 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Preside over Settlement Conferences by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
January 3, 2017 Filing 553 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Motion to Appoint Magistrate Judge to Preside over Settlement Conferences by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Selig ADR Confirmation of Mediation Letter))(Cerda-Collazo, Karina)(STRICKEN PER ORDER DOC #557) Modified on 1/6/2017 (RH).
January 3, 2017 Filing 552 REQUEST for oral argument re #551 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Motion to Disqualify Arnold & Itkin, LLP from Representing Multiple Claimants (Hargrove, Solar-Cortes & Thomas) by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
January 3, 2017 Filing 551 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Motion to Disqualify Arnold & Itkin, LLP from Representing Multiple Claimants (Hargrove, Solar-Cortes & Thomas) by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
January 3, 2017 Filing 550 NOTICE by Great American Insurance Company of New York of Withdrawal of Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Eagan, Thomas)
January 3, 2017 Filing 549 NOTICE by Able Sales Company, Inc., Century Packaging Corp., Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500194000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500466000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1515422000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1515551000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC151592500, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1516254000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1516397000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412443000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412719000, Dade Paper & Bag Co., Mendez & Company, Inc., Pet Plastics LLC, Plaza Provision Company, Puerto Rico Supplies Group, Inc., QBE Seguros, Quirch Foods Co., Suarez and Company, Supermercados Econo, Inc., Universal Insurance Company of North America of Withdrawal of Claim (Eagan, Thomas)
December 23, 2016 Filing 548 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. re #392 MOTION for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery, #540 Order pdf Petitioners' Notice to Court in Compliance with Court Order Dated December 9, 2016 (Doc. 540) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Claimants)(Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
December 22, 2016 Filing 547 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under seal Motion for Approval and Disbursement of Settlement Funds by Willa Crawford. (Sullivan, G.J.)
December 16, 2016 Filing 546 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Pfizer, Inc.. (Sweeney, James)
December 16, 2016 Filing 545 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Linde Gas of Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Sweeney, James)
December 16, 2016 Filing 544 STIPULATION of Dismissal dockets 187, 188 and 213 by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.. (Sweeney, James)
December 16, 2016 Filing 543 STIPULATION of Dismissal dockets 242 and 373 by Mutchler Inc.. (Sweeney, James)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER Setting Hearing: In Camera Hearing set for 1/25/2017 at 10:30 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 12/14/2016. (MGG)
December 13, 2016 Filing 541 STIPULATION of Dismissal of claims [docket 212 and 285] by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc.. (Sweeney, James)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER directing Petitioners to file a notice with the Court concerning the status of Petitioners' "Motion to Limit Discovery" (Dkt 392) within 14 days from the date of this Order; and All wrongful death claimants who previously objected to Petitoners' "Motion to Limit Discovery" shall have 14 days from the date Petitioners file the required notice to respond or reply to Petitioners' notice. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 12/9/2016. (RH)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER denying #534 Motion for extension of time deadline for the reinstated mediation deadline. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 12/9/2016. (RH)
December 9, 2016 Filing 538 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Third Party Complaint against Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc. [docket 333] by AGCS Marine Insurance Company. (Rouffet, Carole)
December 8, 2016 Filing 537 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. Petitioners' Notice of Scrivener's Error contained within Petitioners' "Response to Valma Champa's Motion for Extension of Time for the Reinstated Mediation Deadline Set in Court Order" at Doc. 535 (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
December 8, 2016 Filing 536 MEDIATION report Hearing held on 12/8/16. Hearing outcome: Continued.. (Cole, Robert)
December 8, 2016 Filing 535 RESPONSE to Motion re #534 MOTION to extend time to Mediate Claim of Valma Champa filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit December 5, 2016 Email)(Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
December 6, 2016 Filing 534 MOTION to extend time to Mediate Claim of Valma Champa by CHAMPA, VALMA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Champa, Jr., deceased. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NTSB Press Release, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hickey, John)
December 1, 2016 Filing 533 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by BMW of North America, LLC. (Boyd, Thomas)
November 22, 2016 Filing 532 RESPONSE re #531 Supplement to Motion to Compel filed by ADDREISHA SHIRLIEA JONES. (Wagner, Scott)
November 21, 2016 Filing 531 SUPPLEMENT re #525 MOTION to Compel Certain Items and Documents and Response to Motion to Approve Settlement [S-528] by JARVON WHIGHAM. (Hickey, John) Modified on 11/22/2016 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct case number on all pleadings(TSW).
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER granting #529 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/21/2016. (ADM)
November 18, 2016 Filing 529 Amended MOTION for protective order Unopposed Amended Motion for Entry of Stipulated Confidentiality Protective Order by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Confidentiality Protective Order, #2 Exhibit "B" - NTSB Letter)(Cerda-Collazo, Karina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
November 18, 2016 Sealed Document S-528(RH)
November 18, 2016 Filing 527 NOTICE of settlement Petitioners' Sixth Notice of Settlement by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry)
November 17, 2016 Filing 526 RESPONSE to Motion re #525 MOTION to Compel Certain Items and Documents Petitioners' Response to Jarvon Whigham's Motion to Compel filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
November 14, 2016 Filing 525 MOTION to Compel Certain Items and Documents by JARVON WHIGHAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hickey, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER finding as moot #483 Motion to Quash, and directing the Clerk to close 3:16-mc-52-J-20MCR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/14/2016. (ADM)
November 10, 2016 Filing 523 NOTICE by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Linde Gas of Puerto Rico, Inc., Mutchler Inc., Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Starr Indemnity and Liability Co. a/s/o Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., The Gap, Inc. of Withdrawal of Subpoena on Navigators Ins Co (Craven, Robert)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER denying without prejudice #521 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/9/2016. (ADM)
November 7, 2016 Filing 521 Unopposed MOTION for protective order Unopposed Motion for Entry of Stipulated Confidentiality Protective Order by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Confidentiality Protective Order, #2 Exhibit "B"(1) - Jackson, #3 Exhibit "B"(2-3) - Hatch and Riehm, #4 Exhibit "B"(4-6) - Hargrove, Solar-Cortes and Thomas, #5 Exhibit "B"(7) - Champa, #6 Exhibit "B"(8) - Jordan, #7 Exhibit "B"(9) - Crawford, #8 Exhibit "B"(10) - Kuflik, #9 Exhibit "B"(11) - Porter, #10 Exhibit "B"(12) - Century Packing, etc., #11 Exhibit "B"(13) - BMW, #12 Exhibit "B"(14) - ABF Freight, #13 Exhibit "B"(15) - Hanover Ins and FM Global, #14 Exhibit "C" - July 22, 2016 NTSB Letter)(Cerda-Collazo, Karina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER granting #519 Motion for Reconsideration; reinstating #437 Amended Case Management Report's deadline of 12/15/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 11/3/2016. (MGG)
October 28, 2016 Filing 519 MOTION for Reconsideration re #508 Order on motion to extend timeOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefOrder on motion to compel Petitioners' Motion for Reconsideration on Order Granting in Part "Wrongful Death Claimants' Motion to Compel Compliance with Discovery Obligations and for Order Cancelling All Scheduled Mediations Pending Production of the Overdue Initial Discovery" (Doc. 473) by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Confidentiality Protective Order)(Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
October 27, 2016 Filing 518 ANSWER to #494 Crossclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc..(Brock, Lindsey)
October 26, 2016 Filing 517 STIPULATION of Dismissal by TMM Marine American Insurance Companies a/s/o Dunkin Brands International, DMCC. (Sitler, Martin)
October 26, 2016 Filing 516 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company a/s/o Nexeo Solutions Holdings, LLC. (Sitler, Martin)
October 26, 2016 Filing 515 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America a/s/o A.M. Capen's Co., Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America a/s/o Bunzl USA Holding, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America a/s/o Dawn Foods Products. (Sitler, Martin)
October 24, 2016 Filing 514 RESPONSE re #167 Response in Opposition to Motion to Patrick Smith's "Supplemental Brief" Regarding Disbursement of Settlement Funds filed by Karen Schoenly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Orrick, Judson)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ENDORSED ORDER granting #511 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc. shall have until October 28, 2016 to respond to #494 Crossclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/24/2016. (ADM)
October 24, 2016 Filing 512 NOTICE by Cardinal Health re #362 Notice (Other) Requesting Court to Withdraw Cardinal Health's Attorney from Filing Notices (Zaltsberg, Michelle)
October 21, 2016 Filing 511 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #494 Crossclaim by Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc.. (Brock, Lindsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
October 21, 2016 Filing 510 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Katharine M. Healey/Cornerstone. (RH)
October 21, 2016 Filing 509 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 10/13/16 before Judge Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katharine M. Healey. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 11/14/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2017. (RH)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER denying #466 Motion to extend time; denying #471 Motion for Entry of Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part #473 Motion to Compel Compliance with Discovery Obligations and for Order Canceling All Scheduled Mediation Pending Production of the Overdue Initial Discovery; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 10/20/2016. (MGG)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER to strike re: #505 Notice (Other) filed by BMW of North America, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/20/2016. (ADM)
October 19, 2016 Filing 506 RESPONSE re #501 Amended document, #167 Response in Opposition to Motion, #504 Response, #149 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds with Memorandum of Law filed by Patrick John Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Itkin, Cory)
October 19, 2016 Filing 505 NOTICE by BMW of North America, Inc. of Serving Subpoena to Jacksonville Machine, Inc. (Boyd, Thomas) (STRICKEN PER ORDER doc #507) Modified on 10/24/2016 (RH).
October 18, 2016 Filing 504 RESPONSE re #501 Amended document, #167 Response in Opposition to Motion, #149 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds with Memorandum of Law filed by Patrick John Smith. (Itkin, Cory)
October 18, 2016 Filing 503 STIPULATION of Dismissal PARTIAL DISMISSAL by FM Global, Inc.. (Williams, Nathan)
October 17, 2016 Filing 502 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/15/2017, Dispositive motions due by 1/5/2018, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger, Trial set for trial term commencing 5/7/2018 at 9:30 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/17/2016. (MGG)
October 14, 2016 Filing 500 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Lynden Air Freight, Inc. (Boyd, Thomas)
October 14, 2016 Filing 499 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by AGCS Marine Insurance Company (Sweeney, James)
October 14, 2016 Filing 498 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/15/2017, Dispositive motions due by 1/5/2018, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2018 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger, Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 5/7/2018 at 9:30 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger; See Document: #436 Scheduling Conference minutes for all additional dates set by the Court. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/14/2016. (MGG)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER denying #64 Motion for summary judgment on Shipowners Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability; denying without prejudice #159 Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 10/13/2016. (MGG)
October 13, 2016 Filing 501 Minute Entry (AMENDED). Proceedings held before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger: MOTION HEARING held on 10/13/2016; taking under advisement #149 Motion for Disbursement of Funds Court Reporter: Katherine Healey/Cornerstone. (MGG)
October 13, 2016 Filing 496 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger: MOTION HEARING held on 10/13/2016; taking under advisement #149 Motion for Disbursement of Funds Court Reporter: Katherine Healey/Cornerstone (MGG)
October 3, 2016 Filing 495 NOTICE by ITL International Inc. d/b/a Mars Caribbean and Central America, a division of Mars, Inc., Mars Chocolate North America, LLC, Mars Masterfoods USA, Inc., Mars Pet Care US Inc. re #232 Claim Mars Cargo Claimants' Notice of Dismissal of Claim [D.E. 211, 232] (Mazaroli, David)
September 30, 2016 Filing 494 CROSSCLAIM against Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc. filed by FM Global, Inc..(Williams, Nathan) Modified on 10/3/2016 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct case number on all pleadings(TSW).
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER granting #467 Motion to Seal; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 9/30/2016. (MGG)
September 28, 2016 Filing 492 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Ryan Eslinger on behalf of Navigators Insurance Company (Eslinger, C.)
September 26, 2016 Filing 491 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #149 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds with Memorandum of Law. Motion Hearing set for Thursday, 10/13/2016 at 1:30 PM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. (MGG)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER denying #323 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Issue of Unseaworthiness. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 9/23/16. (MGG)
September 20, 2016 Filing 489 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. re #473 Memorandum in opposition, #477 Memorandum in support, #471 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Entry of Protective Order Petitioners' Notice Regarding Motion for Entry of Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Confidentiality Protective Order)(Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
September 19, 2016 Filing 488 NOTICE of settlement of Claims with Estate of Steven Shultz and Estate of Theodore Quammie, by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry)
September 16, 2016 Filing 487 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #480 Amended Complaint (Third Party by MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON.(Bennett, William)
September 16, 2016 Filing 486 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #479 Amended Complaint (Third Party) by MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON.(Bennett, William)
September 7, 2016 Filing 485 DECLARATION of Keith W. Heard re #483 MOTION to quash Subpoena by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. Originally filed in NYSD on 8/1/16. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena, #2 Transcript)(NAS)
September 7, 2016 Filing 484 MEMORANDUM in support re #483 Motion to Quash filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (NAS) Modified on 9/7/2016 (NAS) - Originally filed in SDNY on 8/1/16.
September 7, 2016 Filing 483 MOTION to quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. Originally filed in NYSD on 8/1/16. (Attachments: #1 NYSD Docket Sheet)(NAS)
September 6, 2016 Filing 482 RESPONSE re #470 Notice (Other) Petitioners' and Third-Party Defendant Estate of Captain Michael C. Davidson's Proposed Stipulations Regarding Dissolving the Limitation Injunction filed by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Itkin, Cory)
September 6, 2016 Filing 481 NOTICE by Karen Schoenly (Orrick, Judson)
August 31, 2016 Filing 480 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Party against MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON with Jury Demand. filed by Donna Griffin.(Auger, Matthew)
August 30, 2016 Filing 479 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third Party) CORRECTED against MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON with Jury Demand. filed by Patricia Quammie, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Theodore Quammie, deceased.(Margulies, Jason)
August 30, 2016 Filing 478 AMENDED COMPLAINT (THIRD PARTY) against MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON with Jury Demand. filed by Patricia Quammie, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Theodore Quammie, deceased.(Margulies, Jason)
August 24, 2016 Filing 477 MEMORANDUM in support re #473 Memorandum in opposition, #471 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Petitioners' Response to "Wrongful Death Claimants' Motion to Compel Compliance with Discovery Obligations and for Order Cancelling All Scheduled Mediations pending Production of the Overdue Initial Discovery" filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Aug 4, 2016 Email to Claimants))(Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
August 24, 2016 Filing 476 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. re #471 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Entry of Protective Order OF SCRIVENER'S ERROR, (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
August 23, 2016 Filing 475 NOTICE by Katie Griffin of Withdrawal of Claim (Leonard, Michael)
August 22, 2016 Filing 474 MEMORANDUM in support re #470 Notice (Other) of Filing Proposed Stipulation, filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
August 22, 2016 Filing 473 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #466 Motion to extend time, #471 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief and MOTION to Compel Compliance filed by Tina Riehm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Burns, William) Modified on 10/20/2016 to correct docket entry(MGG).
August 19, 2016 Filing 472 MEMORANDUM in support re #310 Motion to modify, #458 Order Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, Directing filed by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Itkin, Cory)
August 19, 2016 Filing 471 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Entry of Protective Order by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NTSB Correspondence of 7/22/2016, #2 Exhibit B - Protective Order, #3 Exhibit C - Protective Orders Executed)(Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
August 19, 2016 Filing 470 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. and Estate of Captain Michael C. Davidson's, of FILING PROPOSED STIPULATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH GUILLOT V. CENAC TOWING CO., (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Stipulation)(Hamilton, Jerry)
August 19, 2016 Filing 469 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. of Scheduled Mediations, (Hamilton, Jerry)
August 19, 2016 Filing 468 NOTICE by CHAMPA, VALMA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Champa, Jr., deceased, JARVON WHIGHAM of Removal (Hickey, John)
August 18, 2016 Filing 467 MOTION for leave to file under seal by ADDREISHA SHIRLIEA JONES. (Wagner, Scott)
August 17, 2016 Filing 466 MOTION to extend time to Produce Documents - Motion for Enlargement of Time on the August 17, 2016 Document Production by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence from Spohrer and Dodd P.L. dated August 16, 2016, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence from Hamilton, Miller & Birthisel, LLP dated August 17, 2016)(Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
August 11, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney MATTHEW D. SHAFFER, appearing on behalf of Willa Crawford (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX021220.). (AEJ)
August 11, 2016 Filing 465 NOTICE by Mamo Transportation, Inc. re #176 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim Claimant Mamo Transportation, Inc.'s Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Cotter, Christopher)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER granting #154 MOTION to Dismiss all Wrongful Death Claims Asserted Against Defendant Michael Davidson and/or the Estate of Michael Davidson to the Extent They Seek Relief Beyond the Death on the High Seas Act, 46 U.S.C. Section 30301 et seq.; Claimants shall have 21 days from the date of this Order to file amended third-party complaints against Defendant Davidson in accordance with this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 8/10/2016. (MGG)
August 10, 2016 Sealed Document S-463 (RH)
August 10, 2016 Filing 462 NOTICE by Truck Brokers, Inc. re #241 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim (Parrish, Joseph)
August 10, 2016 Filing 461 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Shannon Bishop, RDR, CRR; dsmabishop@yahoo.com; (904)549-1307. (SB)
August 10, 2016 Filing 460 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on August 3, 2016 before Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. Court Reporter/Transcriber Shannon M. Bishop, RDR, CRR; dsmabishop@yahoo.com,Telephone number (904)549-1307. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 8/31/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/8/2016. (SB)
August 8, 2016 Filing 459 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER: the parties have until 8/19/2016 to agree on Stipulations, if possible, before the Court will determine the merits of the underlying motion re #310 MOTION to modify the Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 8/4/2016. (MGG)
August 3, 2016 Filing 457 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger: MOTION HEARING held on 8/3/2016 re #310 MOTION to modify the Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims and #154 MOTION to Dismiss all Wrongful Death Claims Asserted Against Defendant Michael Davidson and/or the Estate of Michael Davidson to the Extent They Seek Relief Beyond the Death on the High Seas Act, 46 U.S.C. Section 30301 et seq. . Court Reporter: Shannon Bishop (MGG)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ENDORSED ORDER granting #455 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/3/2016. (ADM)
August 3, 2016 Filing 455 MOTION to Appear Telephonically for August 3, 2016 hearing by Econocaribe Consolidators, inc.. (Martinez-Tristani, Gustavo) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER denying #371 Motion for Default Judgment; finding as moot #45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 8/3/2016. (MGG)
August 3, 2016 Filing 453 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #154 MOTION to Dismiss all Wrongful Death Claims Asserted Against Defendant Michael Davidson and/or the Estate of Michael Davidson to the Extent They Seek Relief Beyond the Death on the High Seas Act, 46 U.S.C. Section 30301 et seq. by Patricia Quammie, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Theodore Quammie, deceased. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Conti- Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Conti - Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Conti - Motion to Dismiss)(Margulies, Jason)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ENDORSED ORDER granting #449 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/3/2016. (ADM)
August 3, 2016 Filing 451 Duplicate MEDIATION report Hearing held on 4/4/2016. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Max, Rodney) Modified on 8/3/2016 to edit text(TSW).
August 3, 2016 Filing 450 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 4/4/2016 before Rodney Max.(Max, Rodney)
August 3, 2016 Filing 449 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically August 3, 2016 Hearing by Jill Jackson-d'Entremont. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ENDORSED ORDER granting #447 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/3/2016. (ADM)
August 2, 2016 Filing 447 MOTION to Appear Telephonically at August 3, 2016 Hearing by CHAMPA, VALMA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Champa, Jr., deceased, JARVON WHIGHAM. (Hickey, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ENDORSED ORDER granting #443 Motion to Appear Telephonically; granting #444 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/2/2016. (ADM)
August 2, 2016 Filing 445 NOTICE OF INSTRUCTIONS to Appear Telephonically at Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2016 at 1:30 PM; SEE NOTICE FOR DETAILS; CELL PHONES ARE REQUESTED NOT TO BE USED FOR THIS CALL. (MGG)
August 2, 2016 Filing 444 MOTION to Appear Telephonically at the August 3 Hearing by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Kelley, Allan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
August 2, 2016 Filing 443 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically for August 3, 2016 Hearing by Willa Crawford, Cheryl Crawford-Glenn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaffer, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified on 8/3/2016 contacted counsel in regards to having the complete case number on all pleadings. (TSW).
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ENDORSED ORDER granting #441 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Claimant Quammie is allowed to appear telephonically at the August 3, 2016 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 8/1/2016. (ADM)
July 29, 2016 Filing 441 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at the Hearing Scheduled for August 3, 2016 by Patricia Quammie, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Theodore Quammie, deceased. (Margulies, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
July 28, 2016 Filing 440 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel. cpackevicz@comcast.net (CLP)
July 28, 2016 Filing 439 TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on 7-27-16 before Judge Harvey Schlesinger. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cindy Packevicz Jarriel, RPR, FCRR,Telephone number 904.301.6843; cpackevicz@comcast.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 8/18/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2016. (CLP)
July 27, 2016 Filing 438 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #310 MOTION and #154 MOTION. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2016 at 1:30 PM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. (MGG)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 437 OMNIBUS ORDER: Amended Case Management Report due within 7 days from the date of this Order; finding as moot #395 MOTION, #396 MOTION, and #406 MOTION; taking under advisement #392 MOTION; Motion Hearing set for set for 8/3/2016 at 1:30 PM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger(3 hours has been scheduled for this hearing) re #310 MOTION and #154 MOTION; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DEADLINES, DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 7/27/2016. (MGG)
July 27, 2016 Filing 436 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/27/2016. Court Reporter: Cindy Packevicz Jarriel (MGG)
July 27, 2016 Filing 435 NOTICE by RLI Insurance Company re #165 Claim Withdrawal of Its Claim (Eagan, Thomas)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER granting #432 Motion to allow electronic equipment. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on behalf of Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 7/26/2016. (RH)
July 25, 2016 Filing 433 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. re #382 Case Management Report ( Second Addendum) (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
July 25, 2016 Filing 432 Joint MOTION to allow electronic equipment, specifically Electronic Devices such as laptop computers and cell phones Joint Motion by Claimants and Petitioners by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
July 22, 2016 Filing 431 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. re #392 MOTION for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery Petitioners' Notice and Addendum to their Motion to Limit Discovery (Doc. 392) (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER granting #427 Motion to be excused from Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on behalf of United States District Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 7/22/2016. (RH)
July 22, 2016 Filing 429 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Ari Smith on behalf of Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas (Smith, Jason)
July 22, 2016 Filing 428 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Burns, Jr on behalf of Tina Riehm (Burns, William)
July 20, 2016 Filing 427 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically To Be Excused from Attending Case Management Conference on July 27, 2016 by Katie Griffin. (Leonard, Michael)
July 19, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney PATRICIA M. O'NEILL, appearing on behalf of MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX020964.) Related document: #425 MOTION for Patricia M. O'Neill to appear pro hac vice. (AEJ)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ENDORSED ORDER granting #425 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Patricia O'Neill, Esq. has not already done so, she shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/19/2016. (ADM)
July 18, 2016 Filing 425 MOTION for Patricia M. O'Neill to appear pro hac vice by MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON. (Berman, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER denying #422 Motion to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Conference on July 27, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/14/2016. (MGG)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER granting #421 Motion to be excused from case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 7/14/2016. (MGG)
July 13, 2016 Filing 422 MOTION to Appear Telephonically at the Case Management Conference on July 27, 2016 by Able Sales Company, Inc., Aqua Gulf Transport, Inc., Century Packaging Corp., Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500194000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500466000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1515422000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1515551000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC151592500, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1516254000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1516397000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412443000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412719000, Dade Paper & Bag Co., Great American Insurance Company of New York, Mendez & Company, Inc., Pet Plastics LLC, Plaza Provision Company, Puerto Rico Supplies Group, Inc., QBE Seguros, Quirch Foods Co., Suarez and Company, Supermercados Econo, Inc., Universal Insurance Company of North America. (Eagan, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
July 7, 2016 Filing 421 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically TO BE EXCUSED FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Karen Schoenly. (Orrick, Judson) Modified on 7/7/2016 contacted counsel in regards to using the correct case number on all pleadings(TSW).
July 7, 2016 Sealed Document S-420. (AMM)
July 6, 2016 Filing 419 ANSWER to #330 Third Party Complaint with Counterclaim by Arrowpac Inc..(Reid, Deborah)
July 6, 2016 Filing 418 RESPONSE in Opposition re #392 MOTION for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery filed by JARVON WHIGHAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PETITIONERS RESPONSES TO WRONGFUL DEATH CLAIMANTS 1ST SET OF RFP OF DOCUMENTS, #2 Exhibit NTSB LETTER)(Sager, Brett)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER granting #399 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under seal as set forth in the Order; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 6/27/2016. (MGG)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER granting #404 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #392 MOTION for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery; Responses due by 7/11/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 6/27/2016. (MGG)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting #407 Motion to Join and Incorporate Cargo Claims' Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 6/27/2016. (MGG)
June 27, 2016 Filing 414 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #392 Motion for Discovery filed by FM Global, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company. (Williams, Nathan)
June 27, 2016 Filing 413 RESPONSE in Opposition re #396 MOTION to extend time to respond to written discovery filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Mutchler Inc., Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Starr Indemnity & Liability Co., The Gap, Inc.. (Sweeney, James)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER Setting Hearing re #382 Case Management Report: Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2016 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 10 C before Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger; (4 hours has been scheduled for this hearing). Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 6/27/2016. (MGG)
June 27, 2016 Filing 411 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #392 Motion for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery filed by ACE Insurance Company, Seguros Universal, S.A.. (Glynn, Lawrence)
June 27, 2016 Filing 410 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #392 Motion for Discovery filed by BMW of North America, LLC.. (Casey, Martin)
June 24, 2016 Filing 409 RESPONSE in Opposition re #392 MOTION for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery filed by ITL International Inc. d/b/a Mars Caribbean and Central America, a division of Mars, Inc., Mars Chocolate North America, LLC, Mars Masterfoods USA, Inc., Mars Pet Care US Inc.. (Mazaroli, David)
June 24, 2016 Filing 408 RESPONSE in Opposition re #392 MOTION for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Mutchler Inc., Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Starr Indemnity & Liability Co., The Gap, Inc.. (Sweeney, James)
June 24, 2016 Filing 407 MOTION for Joinder by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company a/s/o Nexeo Solutions Holdings, LLC. (Sitler, Martin)
June 24, 2016 Filing 406 MOTION for leave to file REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS' MOTION TO LIMIT DISCOVERY [CM/ECF NO. 392] by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Hamilton, Jerry)
June 24, 2016 Filing 405 RESPONSE to Motion re #392 MOTION for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery filed by Able Sales Company, Inc., Aqua Gulf Transport, Inc., Century Packaging Corp., Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500194000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500466000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1515422000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1515551000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC151592500, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1516254000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1516397000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412443000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412719000, Dade Paper & Bag Co., Great American Insurance Company of New York, Mendez & Company, Inc., Pet Plastics LLC, Plaza Provision Company, Puerto Rico Supplies Group, Inc., QBE Seguros, Quirch Foods Co., Suarez and Company, Supermercados Econo, Inc., Universal Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Eagan, Thomas)
June 24, 2016 Filing 404 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #392 MOTION for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery by CHAMPA, VALMA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Champa, Jr., deceased, JARVON WHIGHAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sager, Brett) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ENDORSED ORDER granting #397 motion to appear pro hac vice. If J. Benjamin Bireley, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/24/2016. (ADM)
June 23, 2016 Filing 402 RESPONSE to Motion re #392 MOTION for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery, #395 MOTION to extend time to RESPOND TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY filed by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Arnold, Kurt)
June 23, 2016 Filing 401 STIPULATION of Dismissal Partial dismissal by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Pfizer, Inc.. (Sweeney, James)
June 22, 2016 Filing 400 RESPONSE to Motion re #392 MOTION for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery filed by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Arnold, Kurt)
June 22, 2016 Filing 399 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file under seal by Katie Griffin. (Leonard, Michael)
June 21, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Ben Bireley, appearing on behalf of Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA037502.) Related document: #397 Unopposed MOTION for Ben Bireley to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
June 21, 2016 Filing 398 RESPONSE in Opposition re #392 MOTION for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery filed by 3M Company, AJC Logistics, Inc., BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation (Puerto Rico), Caterpillar Americas, Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc., Eaton Corporation, PLC, Foot Locker Incorporated, Hubbell Caribe Limited, Industrial Fire Products Corporation, Kraft Food Group Incorporated, Lamex Foods, Inc., Mead Johnson & Company, LLC, Reyes Holdings, LLC, Roche Operations, Limited, Save Logistics Incorporated, THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS (SYNDICATE 1955, SYNDICATE 2987, SYNDICATE 1183 AND SYNDICATE 0457) SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY # B0180 PC1422840 AS SUBROGEE OF DEL VALLE BRANDS, INC. AND f/u/b/o DEL VALLE, Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Brock, Lindsey) Modified on 6/22/2016 contacted counsel regarding case number(TSW).
June 20, 2016 Filing 397 Unopposed MOTION for Ben Bireley to appear pro hac vice by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification & Cert. of Good Standing)(Hamaway, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
June 20, 2016 Filing 396 MOTION to extend time to respond to written discovery by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Kelley, Allan)
June 17, 2016 Filing 395 MOTION to extend time to RESPOND TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDER striking #391 Motion for Leave to File Reply for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 6/15/2016. (MGG) Modified on 6/16/2016 to edit text (MGG).
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER denying #379 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 6/15/2016. (MGG)
June 12, 2016 Filing 392 MOTION for Discovery Petitioners' Motion to Limit Discovery by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Hamilton, Jerry) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
June 10, 2016 Filing 391 MOTION for leave to file REPLY to AGCS's Opposition to Econocaribe's Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complaint by Econocaribe Consolidators, inc.. (Martinez-Tristani, Gustavo) (STRICKEN PER ORDER DOC #394)Modified on 6/20/2016 to edit text (RH).
June 8, 2016 Filing 390 RESPONSE in Opposition re #379 MOTION for leave to file a Reply in Support of Their Motion to Modify Order Restraining Claims filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Hamilton, Jerry)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #388 Motion to Substitute Attorney, for failure to comply with Local Rule 2.03(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/7/2016. (ADM)
June 7, 2016 Filing 388 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney by BMW of North America, Inc.. (Marston, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
June 7, 2016 Filing 387 RESPONSE in Opposition re #375 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim AGCS MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY'S THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT [DE 333] filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company. (Sweeney, James)
June 2, 2016 Filing 386 STIPULATION of Dismissal of cross claim against FEDEX FREIGHT INC. [docket 262] by AGCS Marine Insurance Company. (Sweeney, James)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ENDORSED ORDER granting #381 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Bridgette Blitch is relieved of any further responsibility as counsel for TBI in this matter, but she shall comply with all applicable obligations on withdrawing counsel, including any applicable Bar rules. The Clerk of Court shall add Joseph A. Parrish, Esq. as counsel of record for TBI. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 6/2/2016. (ADM)
June 2, 2016 Filing 384 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Anderson on behalf of Econocaribe Consolidators, inc. (Anderson, Andrew)
June 2, 2016 Filing 383 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. re #382 Case Management Report (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
June 1, 2016 Filing 382 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - NTSB Letter)(Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
June 1, 2016 Filing 381 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Bridgette M. Blitch by Truck Brokers, Inc.. (Parrish, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
May 31, 2016 Filing 380 NOTICE of settlement Petitioners' Fourth Notice of Settlement by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry)
May 31, 2016 Filing 379 MOTION for leave to file a Reply in Support of Their Motion to Modify Order Restraining Claims by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Itkin, Cory)
May 27, 2016 Filing 378 ANSWER to #374 Crossclaim of Mutchler Inc. by UPS Ground Freight, Inc..(Wahner, Christoph)
May 26, 2016 Filing 377 CLAIM ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Linde Gas of Puerto Rico, Inc..(Sweeney, James)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting #343 Motion for Leave to File a Claim Nunc Pro Tunc; Claimant Linde Gas of Puerto Rico, Inc. shall have 10 days from the date of this Order to file its claim. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 5/25/2016. (MGG)
May 24, 2016 Filing 375 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim AGCS MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY'S THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT [DE 333] by Econocaribe Consolidators, inc.. (Martinez-Tristani, Gustavo)
May 23, 2016 Filing 374 CROSSCLAIM against UPS Ground Freight, Inc. filed by Mutchler Inc..(Sweeney, James)
May 23, 2016 Filing 373 AMENDED CLAIM and Answer to the Complaint by Mutchler Inc.. (Sweeney, James) Modified on 5/24/2016 to edit text(TSW).
May 20, 2016 Filing 372 NOTICE of Appearance by Raul J. Chacon, Jr on behalf of Econocaribe Consolidators, inc. (Chacon, Raul)
May 19, 2016 Filing 371 MOTION for default judgment against Cargo Claimants Who Did Not File An Answer or Claim by Tote Services, Inc., Sea Star Line, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - proof of 2nd publication, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kelley, Allan)
May 18, 2016 Filing 370 ANSWER to #333 Third Party Complaint by Econocaribe Consolidators, inc..(Martinez-Tristani, Gustavo)
May 16, 2016 Filing 369 ANSWER to #329 Crossclaim by Lynden Air Freight, Inc..(Boyd, Thomas)
May 13, 2016 Filing 368 RESPONSE to Motion re #343 MOTION for leave to file a claim nunc pro tunc filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX. A - Bills of Lading.pdf, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - signed return receipt.pdf, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - letter returned as undeliverable.pdf, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - letter re notice of the claims bar date.pdf)(Kelley, Allan)
May 13, 2016 Filing 367 ANSWER to #334 Third Party Complaint by Caribbean Shipping Services, Inc..(Brock, Lindsey)
May 12, 2016 Filing 366 MEDIATION report Hearing held on May 9, 2016. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (White, Terrence)
May 11, 2016 Filing 365 MEDIATION report Hearing held on May 9, 2016. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (White, Terrence)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting #361 Motion to extend time to Answer Cross-Claim; Answer due no later than 5/16/16. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 5/11/2016. (MGG)
May 11, 2016 Filing 363 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America (Boyd, Thomas)
May 10, 2016 Filing 362 NOTICE by Cardinal Health re #122 Claim Notice of Dismissal of Claim (Zaltsberg, Michelle)
May 6, 2016 Filing 361 MOTION to extend time to Answer Cross-Claim filed by The Gap, Inc. by Lynden Air Freight, Inc.. (Boyd, Thomas)
May 2, 2016 Filing 360 RESPONSE in Opposition re #323 MOTION for partial summary judgment on the Issue of Unseaworthiness with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Hamilton, Jerry)
May 2, 2016 Filing 359 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by EFOODS INC. (Rotella, Raymond)
May 2, 2016 Filing 358 PROOF of service by AGCS Marine Insurance Company (Rouffet, Carole)
May 2, 2016 Filing 357 PROOF of service by AGCS Marine Insurance Company (Rouffet, Carole)
May 2, 2016 Filing 356 PROOF of service by AGCS Marine Insurance Company (Rouffet, Carole)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting #353 Notice of Joinder in Petitioners' Motion for Leave to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically and Motion to Appear at Case Management Conference Telephonically; ALL PARTIES IN THIS ACTION MAY PARTICIPATE IN THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WITHOUT REQUESTING INDIVIDUAL LEAVE OF COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/29/2016. (MGG)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ENDORSED ORDER granting #344 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Nathan T. Williams, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/28/2016. (ADM)
April 27, 2016 Filing 353 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Notice of Joinder in Petitioners' Motion for Leave to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically and Motion to Appear at Case Management Conference Telephonically by Katie Griffin. (Leonard, Michael)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting #346 Motion for leave to conduct case management conference telephonically. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 4/27/2016. (MGG)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER granting #342 Motion to be excused from Case Management Conference. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 4/27/2016. (MGG)
April 27, 2016 Filing 350 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Seguros Universal, S.A. (Glynn, Lawrence)
April 27, 2016 Filing 349 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Seguros Universal, S.A. (Glynn, Lawrence)
April 27, 2016 Filing 348 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by ACE Insurance Company (Glynn, Lawrence)
April 27, 2016 Filing 347 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by ACE Insurance Company (Glynn, Lawrence)
April 26, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Nathan T. Williams, appearing on behalf of FM Global, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX020080.) Related document: #344 Unopposed MOTION for Nathan T. Williams to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
April 25, 2016 Filing 346 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Hamilton, Jerry)
April 25, 2016 Filing 344 Unopposed MOTION for Nathan T. Williams to appear pro hac vice by FM Global, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company. (Janssen, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 22, 2016 Filing 343 MOTION for leave to file a claim nunc pro tunc by Linde Gas of Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Sweeney, James)
April 22, 2016 Filing 342 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically TO BE EXCUSED FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Karen Schoenly. (Orrick, Judson)
April 22, 2016 Filing 341 PROOF of service by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. (Rouffet, Carole)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #335 motion to appear pro hac vice, for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/21/2016. (ADM)
April 21, 2016 Filing 339 PROOF of service by Seguros Universal, S.A. (Glynn, Lawrence)
April 21, 2016 Filing 338 PROOF of service by Seguros Universal, S.A. (Glynn, Lawrence)
April 21, 2016 Filing 337 PROOF of service by ACE Insurance Company (Glynn, Lawrence)
April 21, 2016 Filing 336 PROOF of service by ACE Insurance Company (Glynn, Lawrence)
April 20, 2016 Filing 345 SUMMONS issued as to Allied Logistics Corp., Arrowpac Inc., Caribbean Shipping Services, Inc., Econocaribe Consolidators, inc.. (RH)
April 20, 2016 Filing 335 MOTION for Nathan T. Williams, Esq. to appear pro hac vice by FM Global, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company. (Janssen, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
April 18, 2016 Filing 334 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Caribbean Shipping Services, Inc. filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co..(Sweeney, James)
April 18, 2016 Filing 333 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Econocaribe Consolidators, inc. filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company.(Sweeney, James)
April 18, 2016 Filing 332 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Goodnight International Inc. filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company.(Sweeney, James)
April 18, 2016 Filing 331 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Allied Logistics Corp. filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company.(Sweeney, James)
April 18, 2016 Filing 330 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Arrowpac Inc. filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company.(Sweeney, James)
April 15, 2016 Filing 329 CROSSCLAIM against Lynden Air Freight, Inc. filed by The Gap, Inc..(Sweeney, James)
April 14, 2016 Filing 328 CLAIM and ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by The Gap, Inc..(Sweeney, James)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #301 Motion for leave to file third-party complaints. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/14/2016. (MGG)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #278 Motion for Leave to File a claim nunc pro tunc; denying as moot #307 Motion for Leave to File reply brief; GAP shall have 14 days to file its claim in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/14/2016. (MGG)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER denying #276 Motion to extend time; denying #309 Motion for Leave to File. See Order for details Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 4/13/2016. (CKS)
April 13, 2016 Filing 324 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Dena Ann Lightfoot (Pederson, Brian)
April 13, 2016 Filing 323 MOTION for partial summary judgment on the Issue of Unseaworthiness with Supporting Memorandum of Law by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Itkin, Cory)
April 13, 2016 Filing 322 NOTICE of settlement as to Estates of Mariette Wright, Brookie Davis, Jeffrey Mathias and LaShawn Rivera, by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry)
April 11, 2016 Filing 321 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #310 Motion to modify the Court's Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims filed by MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON. (Berman, Richard)
April 11, 2016 Filing 320 RESPONSE in Opposition re #310 MOTION to modify the Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Hamilton, Jerry)
April 7, 2016 Filing 319 RESPONSE in Opposition re #301 Amended MOTION for leave to file third-party complaints filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Kelley, Allan)
April 7, 2016 Sealed Document S-318 (BD)
April 6, 2016 Filing 317 NOTICE of inquiry by Dena Ann Lightfoot (Pederson, Brian)
April 5, 2016 Filing 316 NOTICE of settlement by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Kelley, Allan)
April 4, 2016 Filing 315 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by SAIA Motor Freight Line, LLC (Sarber, Lloyd)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting #308 Unopposed Motion to Disburse Settlement Funds to Karen Schoenly. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 3/30/2016. (MGG)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER denying as moot #182 Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 3/30/2016. (MGG)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ENDORSED ORDER granting #303 Motion to Withdraw. Benjamin R. Gideon and Dov Sacks of the law firm Berman & Simmons, P.A. are relieved of any further responsibility as counsel for Claimants Randolph and Meklin in this matter, but they shall comply with all applicable obligations on withdrawing counsel, including any applicable Bar rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/29/2016. (ADM)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ENDORSED ORDER: To the extent #306 Stipulation and Order of Substitution of Counsel on Behalf of BMW of North America LLC includes a request for relief from the Court, such request is DENIED without prejudice to filing a proper motion complying with all applicable rules, including Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/29/2016. (ADM)
March 28, 2016 Filing 310 MOTION to modify the Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation, Directing Issuance of Notice and Restraining Prosecution of Claims by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Itkin, Cory)
March 28, 2016 Filing 309 First MOTION for leave to file REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO CONDUCT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TO FILE CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT [DE 276] by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NTSB Correspondence dated March 25, 2016)(Hamilton, Jerry)
March 28, 2016 Filing 308 Unopposed MOTION Disburse Settlement Funds by Karen Schoenly. (Orrick, Judson) Modified on 3/29/2016 contacted counsel regarding correct case number (TSW). Modified on 3/31/2016 to edit text per chambers(TSW). Modified on 3/31/2016 to correct event (NAS).
March 28, 2016 Filing 307 MOTION for leave to file Reply Brief in support of motion for leave to file a claim nunc pro tunc [Docket 278] by The Gap, Inc.. (Sweeney, James)
March 28, 2016 Filing 306 STIPULATION re #119 Notice of appearance, #190 Claim Substitution of Counsel on behalf of BMW of North America LLC by BMW of North America, Inc.. (Casey, Martin)
March 25, 2016 Filing 305 RESPONSE in Opposition re #276 Second MOTION to extend time to Conduct Case Management Conference and to file Case Management Report - Joint Response filed by Terri C. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hazelip, Christopher)
March 25, 2016 Filing 304 ANSWER to #262 Crossclaim by Fedex Freight, Inc..(Rubin, Marc)
March 25, 2016 Filing 303 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw by Laurie D. Bobillot, Elaine Meklin, Karl Meklin, Kenneth W. Randolph. (Gideon, Benjamin)
March 25, 2016 Filing 302 NOTICE of settlement of Claim [D. E. 12] by Estes Express Lines (Roberts, Lawrence)
March 24, 2016 Filing 301 Amended MOTION for leave to file third-party complaints by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.. (Sweeney, James)
March 24, 2016 Filing 300 RESPONSE in Opposition re #278 MOTION for leave to file claim nunc pro tunc filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Kelley, Allan) Modified on 3/24/2016 contacted counsel regarding case number(TSW).
March 24, 2016 Filing 299 ANSWER to #263 Crossclaim by Excel Cargo Services, Inc. d/b/a Caribex Worldwide. Related document: #263 Crossclaim filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Pfizer, Inc..(Liszt, Craig)
March 23, 2016 Filing 298 REPLY to Response to Motion re #154 MOTION to Dismiss all Wrongful Death Claims Asserted Against Defendant Michael Davidson and/or the Estate of Michael Davidson to the Extent They Seek Relief Beyond the Death on the High Seas Act, 46 U.S.C. Section 30301 et seq. filed by MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON. (Berman, Richard)
March 22, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney David Y. Loh, appearing on behalf of Carlos A. Tuche Funicia and Puerto Rico Green Transportation, Continental Insurance Company as subrogee of Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX019761.) Related document: #283 Unopposed MOTION for David Y. Loh to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
March 22, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Stephanie S. Penninger, appearing on behalf of Truck Brokers, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX019769.) Related document: #254 Unopposed MOTION for Stephanie S. Penninger to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
March 22, 2016 Filing 297 RESPONSE in Opposition re #276 Second MOTION to extend time to Conduct Case Management Conference and to file Case Management Report filed by ITL International Inc. d/b/a Mars Caribbean and Central America, a division of Mars, Inc., Mars Chocolate North America, LLC, Mars Masterfoods USA, Inc., Mars Pet Care US Inc.. (Mazaroli, David)
March 21, 2016 Filing 296 RESPONSE in Opposition re #276 Second MOTION to extend time to Conduct Case Management Conference and to file Case Management Report filed by ACE Insurance Company, Seguros Universal, S.A.. (Glynn, Lawrence)
March 21, 2016 Filing 295 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #276 Motion to extend time filed by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Itkin, Cory)
March 18, 2016 Filing 294 RESPONSE in Opposition re #276 Second MOTION to extend time to Conduct Case Management Conference and to file Case Management Report filed by Able Sales Company, Inc., Aqua Gulf Transport, Inc., Century Packaging Corp., Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500194000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500466000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1515422000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1515551000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC151592500, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1516254000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1516397000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412443000, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412719000, Dade Paper & Bag Co., Great American Insurance Company of New York, Mendez & Company, Inc., Pet Plastics LLC, Plaza Provision Company, Puerto Rico Supplies Group, Inc., QBE Seguros, Quirch Foods Co., RLI Insurance Company, Suarez and Company, Supermercados Econo, Inc., Universal Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Eagan, Thomas)
March 17, 2016 Filing 293 NOTICE by Katie Griffin Change of Firm Name (Leonard, Michael)
March 17, 2016 Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Leonard on behalf of Katie Griffin (Leonard, Michael)
March 17, 2016 Filing 291 SUPPLEMENT re #278 MOTION for leave to file claim nunc pro tunc by The Gap, Inc.. (Sweeney, James)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER striking #267 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaints for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g).. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 3/16/2016. (MGG)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER terminating #252 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond; granting #284 Notice of withdrawal of motion.. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 3/16/2016. (MGG)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting #245 Motion for Leave to file Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 3/16/2016. (MGG)
March 16, 2016 Filing 287 RESPONSE in Opposition re #276 Second MOTION to extend time to Conduct Case Management Conference and to file Case Management Report filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Starr Indemnity & Liability Co., Zurich American Insurance Company. (Sweeney, James)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ENDORSED ORDER granting #283 motion to appear pro hac vice. If David Y. Loh, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/16/2016. (ADM)
March 15, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Carole A.R. Rouffet, appearing on behalf of AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity and Liability Co., Zurich American Insurance Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX019573.) Related document: #270 MOTION for Carole Rouffet to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
March 15, 2016 Filing 285 CROSSCLAIM against Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc. filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company.(Sweeney, James)
March 15, 2016 Filing 284 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Kimberly-Clark Global Sales LLC, Kimberly-Clark Puerto Rico, Inc., Kimberly-Clark Trading & Services, Ltda re #252 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Kimberly-Clark Global Sales LLC, Kimberly-Clark Puerto Rico, Inc., Kimberly-Clark Trading & Services, Ltda, Those Certain Underwriters Subscribing to Policy # 019341836 (Brock, Lindsey)
March 15, 2016 Filing 283 Unopposed MOTION for David Y. Loh to appear pro hac vice by Carlos A. Tuche Funicia and Puerto Rico Green Transportation, Continental Insurance Company as subrogee of Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc., Federal Insurance Company as subrogee of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc.. (Rich, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
March 14, 2016 Filing 282 SUPPLEMENT re #276 Second MOTION to extend time to Conduct Case Management Conference and to file Case Management Report by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Kelley, Allan)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER denying without prejudice #259 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/14/2016. (ADM)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ENDORSED ORDER construing as a motion and granting #275 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. The law firm of Steven M. Parrish, P.A. is relieved of any further responsibility as counsel for Claimants, the Hanover Insurance Company and FM Global, Inc., in this matter, but counsel shall comply with all applicable obligations on withdrawing counsel, including any applicable Bar rules. The Clerk shall add Joseph W. Janssen, III and the law firm of Janssen & Siracusa, P.A. as counsel of record for the above Claimants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/14/2016. (ADM)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ENDORSED ORDER granting #272 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Joshua A. Woolsey is relieved of any further responsibility as counsel for Claimant Terri C. Davis in this matter, but counsel shall comply with all applicable obligations on withdrawing counsel, including any applicable Bar rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/14/2016. (ADM)
March 11, 2016 Filing 278 MOTION for leave to file claim nunc pro tunc by The Gap, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Alexander Torrez)(Sweeney, James)
March 11, 2016 Filing 277 RESPONSE in Opposition re #252 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Memorandum of Law filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - list of bills of lading and container numbers, #2 Exhibit B - front of the bills of lading, #3 Exhibit C - settlement offers, acceptances and releases)(Kelley, Allan)
March 11, 2016 Filing 276 Second MOTION to extend time to Conduct Case Management Conference and to file Case Management Report by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Hamilton, Jerry)
March 11, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Robert W. Phelan, appearing on behalf of Carlos A. Tuche Funicia and Puerto Rico Green Transportation, Continental Insurance Company as subrogee of Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX019543.) Related document: #268 Unopposed MOTION for Robert W. Phelan to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
March 11, 2016 Filing 275 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by FM Global, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel)(Janssen, Joseph)
March 11, 2016 Filing 274 ANSWER to #264 Crossclaim by UPS Ground Freight, Inc..(Wahner, Christoph)
March 11, 2016 Filing 273 CLAIM Intervening Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Intervening Claim in response to Plaintiff/Petitioners, Sea Star Line, LLC,, d/b/a Tote Maritime Puerto Rico and Tote Services, Inc's Verified Complaint for Exoneration From Limitation of Liability by TRIVONDA PORTER. (Woodlief, Mitchel)
March 11, 2016 Filing 272 Unopposed MOTION for Joshua A. Woolsey to withdraw as attorney by Terri C. Davis. (Woolsey, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ENDORSED ORDER granting #270 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Carole A.R. Rouffet, Esq. has not already done so, she shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/10/2016. (ADM)
March 9, 2016 Filing 270 MOTION for Carole Rouffet to appear pro hac vice by Starr Indemnity and Liability Co.. (Craven, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ENDORSED ORDER granting #209 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #268 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Christopher E. Cotter and Robert W. Phelan have not already done so, they shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/9/2016. (ADM)
March 8, 2016 Filing 268 Unopposed MOTION for Robert W. Phelan to appear pro hac vice by Carlos A. Tuche Funicia and Puerto Rico Green Transportation, Continental Insurance Company as subrogee of Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc., Federal Insurance Company as subrogee of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc.. (Rich, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
March 4, 2016 Filing 267 MOTION for leave to file third-party complaints against Arrowpac Inc., Goodnight International, Inc., Allied Logistics Corp., Econocaribe Consolidators, Inc., Action Cargo Transport, Inc. and Caribbean Shipping Services, Inc. by AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.. (Sweeney, James) (STRICKEN PER ORDER DOC #290) Modified on 3/21/2016 (RH).
March 4, 2016 Filing 266 RESPONSE in Opposition re #154 MOTION to Dismiss all Wrongful Death Claims Asserted Against Defendant Michael Davidson and/or the Estate of Michael Davidson to the Extent They Seek Relief Beyond the Death on the High Seas Act, 46 U.S.C. Section 30301 et seq. filed by Vicky Green, as the Personal Representative of LaShawn Rivera. (Boyd, Thomas)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ENDORSED ORDER granting #192 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Martin F. Casey, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/4/2016. (ADM)
March 4, 2016 Filing 264 CROSSCLAIM against UPS Ground Freight, Inc. filed by Pfizer, Inc., AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Sweeney, James)
March 4, 2016 Filing 263 CROSSCLAIM against Excel Cargo Services, Inc. d/b/a Caribex Worldwide filed by Pfizer, Inc., AGCS Marine Insurance Company, Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC.(Sweeney, James)
March 4, 2016 Filing 262 CROSSCLAIM against Fedex Freight, Inc. filed by AGCS Marine Insurance Company.(Sweeney, James)
March 4, 2016 Filing 261 RESPONSE to Motion re #154 MOTION to Dismiss all Wrongful Death Claims Asserted Against Defendant Michael Davidson and/or the Estate of Michael Davidson to the Extent They Seek Relief Beyond the Death on the High Seas Act, 46 U.S.C. Section 30301 et seq. filed by Donna Griffin. (Auger, Matthew)
March 3, 2016 Filing 260 NOTICE by Maverick C&P, Inc. re #63 Claim (Green, Marlin)
March 2, 2016 Filing 259 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw of Dennis M. Campbell by Gargiulo, Inc.. (Campbell, Dennis)
March 1, 2016 Filing 258 NOTICE of settlement as to the Estates of Jackie Robert Jones,Jr., Dylan O. Meklin, Danielle Randolph and Michael L. Holland (Corrected Second Notice) by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry)
March 1, 2016 Filing 257 NOTICE of settlement as to the Estates of Jackie Robert Jones,Jr., Dylan O. Meklin, Danielle Randolph and Michael L. Holland (Second Notice) by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ENDORSED ORDER granting #254 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Stephanie S. Penninger, Esq. has not already done so, she shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/1/2016. (ADM)
March 1, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Ronald J. Cullenberg, appearing on behalf of Deborah Roberts (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX019409.) Related document: #248 Unopposed MOTION for Ronald J. Cullenberg to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
March 1, 2016 Filing 255 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Excel Cargo Services, Inc. d/b/a Caribex Worldwide identifying Corporate Parent Caribex Worldwide, Inc. for Excel Cargo Services, Inc. d/b/a Caribex Worldwide.. (Liszt, Craig)
February 29, 2016 Filing 254 Unopposed MOTION for Stephanie S. Penninger to appear pro hac vice by Truck Brokers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blitch, Bridgette) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ENDORSED ORDER granting #251 motion to appear pro hac vice. If David H. Sump, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/29/2016. (ADM)
February 26, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney David H. Sump, appearing on behalf of Excel Cargo Services, Inc. d/b/a Caribex Worldwide (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX019370.) Related document: #251 Unopposed MOTION for David H. Sump to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
February 26, 2016 Filing 252 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kimberly-Clark Global Sales LLC, Kimberly-Clark Trading & Services, Ltda, Kimberly-Clark Puerto Rico, Inc., Those Certain Underwriters Subscribing to Policy # 019341836. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brock, Lindsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
February 26, 2016 Filing 251 Unopposed MOTION for David H. Sump to appear pro hac vice by Excel Cargo Services, Inc. d/b/a Caribex Worldwide. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David Sump, #2 Exhibit Designation and Consent to Act)(Liszt, Craig) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ENDORSED ORDER granting #248 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Ronald J. Cullenberg, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/26/2016. (ADM)
February 25, 2016 Filing 249 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand ,and Claim of Deborah Roberts, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Michael L. Holland, Deceased by Deborah Roberts.(Barnett, Michelle)
February 25, 2016 Filing 248 Unopposed MOTION for Ronald J. Cullenberg to appear pro hac vice by Deborah Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Barnett, Michelle) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
February 25, 2016 Filing 247 NOTICE by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co. re #213 Claim and Answer to the Verified Complaint (Sweeney, James)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER adopting in full #168 Report and Recommendations; granting #236 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #88 Motion to Intervene; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 2/24/2016. (MGG)
February 23, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Christopher E. Cotter, appearing on behalf of Mamo Transportation, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX019328.) Related document: #209 MOTION for CHRISTOPHER E. COTTER to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
February 23, 2016 Filing 245 MOTION for leave to file to file Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss DE 154 by MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON. (Berman, Richard)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ENDORSED ORDER granting #171 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Christoph M. Wahner, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/22/2016. (ADM)
February 22, 2016 Filing 243 NOTICE by Truck Brokers, Inc. re #241 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim To Include Exhibit B (Blitch, Bridgette)
February 19, 2016 Filing 241 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. by Truck Brokers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Blitch, Bridgette)
February 19, 2016 Filing 240 CLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by FM Global, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Cargo Shipment Info)(Parrish, Steven)
February 19, 2016 Filing 239 CLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A - Cargo Shipment Info)(Parrish, Steven)
February 19, 2016 Filing 238 Amended Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Foot Locker Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 19, 2016 Filing 237 Claim and ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Excel Cargo Services, Inc. d/b/a Caribex Worldwide. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liszt, Craig)
February 19, 2016 Filing 236 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Intervening Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Intervening Claim by TRIVONDA PORTER. (Woodlief, Mitchel)
February 19, 2016 Filing 235 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Liszt on behalf of Excel Cargo Services, Inc. d/b/a Caribex Worldwide (Liszt, Craig)
February 19, 2016 Filing 234 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Lamex Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 19, 2016 Filing 233 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 19, 2016 Filing 232 CLAIM Amended Claim, Answer and affirmative defenses, with Certificate of Service, to Verified Complaint of Sea Star Line, LLC, d/b/a TOTE Maritime Puerto Rico, as Owners, et al of the S.S. EL FARO for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability by ITL International Inc. d/b/a Mars Caribbean and Central America, a division of Mars, Inc., Mars Chocolate North America, LLC, Mars Masterfoods USA, Inc., Mars Pet Care US Inc.. (Mazaroli, David)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ENDORSED ORDER construing as a motion and granting #216 Former Claimant Nissan North America, Inc.'s Notice Requesting Court to Withdraw Its Attorney from CM/ECF Filing Notices. The Clerk shall remove Donald E. Christopher, Esq. from the service list in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/19/2016. (ADM)
February 19, 2016 Filing 230 Amended Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 19, 2016 Filing 229 NOTICE by AJC Logistics, Inc. re #195 Answer to Complaint of Withdrawal of Claim (D.E. #195) (Brock, Lindsey)
February 19, 2016 Filing 228 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by BASF Corporation (Puerto Rico). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sales Invoice)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 19, 2016 Filing 227 Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Amended Claim, Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Tote Shipholdings Inc. and against Tote Inc., Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Tote Services, Inc. and against Sea Star Line, LLC by ACE Insurance Company.(Glynn, Lawrence)
February 19, 2016 Filing 226 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Roche Operations, Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 19, 2016 Filing 225 CLAIM Amended Claim and Answer to the Complaint by AGCS Marine Insurance Company. (Sweeney, James)
February 18, 2016 Filing 224 Amended Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 18, 2016 Filing 223 CLAIM, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint and Third Party Complaint against the Estate of Michael Davidson by Vicky Green, as the Personal Representative of LaShawn Rivera. (Boyd, Thomas)
February 18, 2016 Filing 222 CLAIM, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint, and Third Party Complaint against the Estate of Michael Davidson by Marlena Porter, as Personal Representative for the Estate of James Phillip Porter, Jr.. (Boyd, Thomas)
February 18, 2016 Filing 221 CLAIM, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint, and Third Party Complaint against the Estate of Michael Davidson by Rochelle Hamm as Personal Representative of Frank Hamm, III. (Boyd, Thomas)
February 18, 2016 Filing 220 CLAIM, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint, and Third Party Complaint against the Estate of Michael Davidson by Alexis Parker, as Personal Representative of Roosevelt Clark. (Boyd, Thomas)
February 18, 2016 Filing 219 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 18, 2016 Filing 218 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint [DE 1] filed by Sea Star Lines, LLC d/b/a Tote Maritime Puerto Rico, Tote Services, Inc., and, COUNTERCLAIM against Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. by Fedex Freight, Inc..(Rubin, Marc)
February 18, 2016 Filing 217 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Fedex Freight, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FedEx Corporation for Fedex Freight, Inc... (Rubin, Marc)
February 18, 2016 Filing 216 NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. Requesting Court to Withdraw Its Attorney from CM/ECF Filing Notices (Christopher, Donald)
February 18, 2016 Filing 215 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 18, 2016 Filing 214 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Industrial Fire Products Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 18, 2016 Filing 213 CLAIM Amended Claim and Answer to the Complaint by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.. (Sweeney, James)
February 18, 2016 Filing 212 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand with affirmative defenses against the imposition of either Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability and Claims by Continental Insurance Company as subrogee of Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc., Federal Insurance Company as subrogee of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc., Carlos A. Tuche Funicia and Puerto Rico Green Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Rich, Joseph)
February 18, 2016 Filing 211 CLAIM, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint of Sea Star Line, LLC, d/b/a TOTE Maritime Puerto Rico, as Owners, et al, of the S.S. El FARO for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability by Mars Chocolate North America, LLC, Mars Pet Care US Inc., Mars Masterfoods USA, Inc., ITL International Inc. d/b/a Mars Caribbean and Central America, a division of Mars, Inc..(Mazaroli, David)
February 18, 2016 Filing 210 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Caterpillar Americas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 17, 2016 Filing 242 CLAIM by Mutchler Inc.. (RH)
February 17, 2016 Filing 209 MOTION for CHRISTOPHER E. COTTER to appear pro hac vice by Mamo Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Giordano, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
February 17, 2016 Filing 208 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Foot Locker Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 16, 2016 Sealed Document S-207 (RH)
February 16, 2016 Filing 206 CLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Lynden Air Freight, Inc.. (Boyd, Thomas)
February 16, 2016 Filing 205 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Mead Johnson & Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 16, 2016 Filing 204 CLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Jill Jackson-d'Entremont. (Rose, Daniel)
February 16, 2016 Filing 203 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Save Logistics Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 16, 2016 Filing 202 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Hubbell Caribe Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 16, 2016 Filing 201 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Reyes Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ENDORSED ORDER: Any party opposing #192 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Martin F. Casey shall file a response to the Motion no later than March 1, 2016, or the Motion will be deemed unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/16/2016. (ADM)
February 15, 2016 Filing 199 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Kraft Food Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 15, 2016 Filing 198 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 15, 2016 Filing 197 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Eaton Corporation, PLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 15, 2016 Filing 196 First Amended Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Katie Griffin.(Thomas, Justin)
February 15, 2016 Filing 195 Claim, ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by AJC Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Spreadsheet, #2 Exhibit Bills of Lading)(Brock, Lindsey)
February 15, 2016 Filing 194 CLAIM of Addreisha Shirliea Jones, Personal Representative of the Estate of Jackie Jones, Jr. by ADDREISHA SHIRLIEA JONES. (Wagner, Scott)
February 12, 2016 Filing 193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #182 MOTION to Strike filed by Terri C. Davis. (Hazelip, Christopher)
February 12, 2016 Filing 192 MOTION for Martin F. Casey to appear pro hac vice by BMW of North America, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Proc Hac Vice)(Boyd, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
February 12, 2016 Filing 191 CLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Lloyds Syndicate 2623 a/s/o Interra International, Inc.. (Boyd, Thomas)
February 12, 2016 Filing 190 CLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses by BMW of North America, LLC.. (Boyd, Thomas)
February 12, 2016 Filing 189 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. re #178 Response in Opposition to Motion TO THE COURT REGARDING CLAIM SETTLEMENTS, (Hamilton, Jerry)
February 12, 2016 Filing 188 CLAIM Claim and Answer to the Complaint by Starr Indemnity and Liability Co. a/s/o Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Sweeney, James)
February 11, 2016 Filing 187 CLAIM Claim and Answer to the Complaint by Starr Indemnity & Liability Co.. (Sweeney, James)
February 11, 2016 Filing 186 CLAIM Claim and Answer to the Complaint by AGCS Marine Insurance Company a/s/o Walgreen Co.. (Sweeney, James)
February 11, 2016 Filing 185 CLAIM Claim and Answer to the Complaint by AGCS Marine Insurance Company. (Sweeney, James)
February 11, 2016 Filing 184 CLAIM Claim and Answer to the Complaint by Pfizer Pharmaceuticals LLC, Pfizer, Inc.. (Sweeney, James)
February 11, 2016 Filing 183 CLAIM Claim and Answer to the Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company, Ingersoll Rand Company. (Sweeney, James)
February 11, 2016 Filing 182 MOTION to Strike by Karen Schoenly. (Orrick, Judson) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. Modified on 2/12/2016 contacted counsel regarding correct case number(TSW).
February 11, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Martin F. Casey, appearing on behalf of BMW of North America, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX019215.). (DLC)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #169 Unopposed Motion to Seal Pursuant to Fla. Stat. 744.3701; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 2/10/2016. (MGG)
February 10, 2016 Filing 180 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. re #159 MOTION to Strike #64 MOTION for summary judgment on Shipowners Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability With Supporting Memorandum of Law Petitioners' Supplemental Notice to Motion to Strike Affidavits of John Soutar and Captain John Becker (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ENDORSED ORDER granting #155 motion to appear pro hac vice. If William R. Bennett, III, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/9/2016. (ADM)
February 8, 2016 Filing 178 RESPONSE in Opposition re #149 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds with Memorandum of Law - Response in Limited Opposition to Motion to Approve Disbursement of Settlement Funds filed by Terri C. Davis. (Hazelip, Christopher)
February 8, 2016 Filing 177 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #159 Motion to Strike Affidavits of John Soutar & Captain John Becker filed by Tracey Hatch, Tina Riehm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit John Soutar CV, #2 Exhibit Captain Becker CV)(Richard, Benjamin)
February 8, 2016 Filing 176 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Sea Star Line, LLC by Mamo Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Claim Detail)(Giordano, Paul)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting #163 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Objection to Defendants', Michael Davidson and/or the Estate of Michael Davidson, Motion to Dismiss; All claimants shall have up to and including 3/4/16 to file their respective responses; SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS AND INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 2/5/2016. (MGG)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ENDORSED ORDER: Any party opposing #171 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Christoph M. Wahner shall file a response to the Motion no later than February 19, 2016, or the Motion will be deemed unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/5/2016. (ADM)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ENDORSED ORDER granting #170 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Daniel O. Rose, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/5/2016. (ADM)
February 5, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Christoph M. Wahner, appearing on behalf of UPS Ground Freight, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX019156.) Related document: #171 MOTION for Christoph M. Wahner to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
February 5, 2016 Filing 172 RESPONSE in Opposition re #154 MOTION to Dismiss all Wrongful Death Claims Asserted Against Defendant Michael Davidson and/or the Estate of Michael Davidson to the Extent They Seek Relief Beyond the Death on the High Seas Act, 46 U.S.C. Section 30301 et seq. filed by Patricia Quammie, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Theodore Quammie, deceased. (Margulies, Jason)
February 4, 2016 Filing 171 MOTION for Christoph M. Wahner to appear pro hac vice by UPS Ground Freight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Special Admission Attorney Certificate)(Rubin, Marc) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
February 4, 2016 Filing 170 Unopposed MOTION for Daniel O Rose to appear pro hac vice by Jill Jackson-d'Entremont. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rose's Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Verified Petition for Admission of Rose, #3 Exhibit Designation and Consent to Act, #4 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Spohrer, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
February 4, 2016 Filing 169 MOTION for leave to file under seal by Dena Ann Lightfoot. (Pederson, Brian)
February 4, 2016 Filing 168 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #88 MOTION to intervene Intervening Claimant filed by TRIVONDA PORTER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 2/4/2016. (ADM)
February 3, 2016 Filing 167 RESPONSE in Opposition re #149 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds with Memorandum of Law filed by Patrick John Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Itkin, Cory)
February 2, 2016 Filing 166 CLAIM pursuant to Rule F of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty and Claims by Century Packaging Corp., QBE Seguros, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412719000, Pet Plastics LLC, Able Sales Company,Inc. Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC151592500, Mendez and Company, Inc., Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1516254000, Puerto Rico Supplies Group, Inc., Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412443000, Suarez and Company, Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1515551000, Dade Paper & Bag Co., Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500194000, Quirch Foods Co., Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500466000, Plaza Provision Company, Universal Insurance Company and Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1515422000, Supermercados Econo Inc., Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1516397000. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Eagan, Thomas) Modified on 2/3/2016 to edit text(RH).
February 1, 2016 Filing 165 CLAIM pursuant to Rule F of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims, Affirmative Defenses and Answer by RLI Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Eagan, Thomas)
February 1, 2016 Filing 164 CLAIM pursuant to Rule F of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims, Affirmative Defenses and Answer by Great American Insurance Company of New York, Aqua Gulf Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachments A&B)(Eagan, Thomas)
January 29, 2016 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney William R. Bennett, III., appearing on behalf of MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX019048.) Related document: #155 MOTION for William R. Bennett, III to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
January 29, 2016 Filing 163 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objection to Defendants', Michael Davidson and/or the Estate of Michael Davidson, Motion to Dismiss by Donna Griffin. (Auger, Matthew)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ENDORSED ORDER granting #137 motion to appear pro hac vice. If James F. Sweeney, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/28/2016. (ADM)
January 26, 2016 Filing 161 NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. re #102 Claim (Withdrawal of Claim) (Christopher, Donald)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ENDORSED ORDER: Any party opposing #155 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of William R. Bennett, III shall file a response to the Motion no later than February 8, 2016, or the Motion will be deemed unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/25/2016. (ADM)
January 25, 2016 Filing 159 MOTION to Strike #64 MOTION for summary judgment on Shipowners Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability With Supporting Memorandum of Law by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Hamilton, Jerry) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
January 25, 2016 Filing 158 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION for summary judgment on Shipowners Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability With Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Affidavit of Captain DiNapoli, #2 Exhibit "B" Declaration of Dr. Dooley)(Hamilton, Jerry)
January 22, 2016 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Karina Cerda-Collazo, Esq. of Hamilton, Miller & Birthisel, LLP Appearance by Karina Cerda-Collazo on behalf of Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Cerda-Collazo, Karina)
January 22, 2016 Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E. Berman on behalf of MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON (Berman, Richard)
January 22, 2016 Filing 155 MOTION for William R. Bennett, III to appear pro hac vice by MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Berman, Richard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
January 22, 2016 Filing 154 MOTION to Dismiss all Wrongful Death Claims Asserted Against Defendant Michael Davidson and/or the Estate of Michael Davidson to the Extent They Seek Relief Beyond the Death on the High Seas Act, 46 U.S.C. Section 30301 et seq. by MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON. (Berman, Richard)
January 22, 2016 Filing 153 NOTICE by MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON of Consolidated Motion to Dismiss all Wrongful Death Claims Against Defendant Michael Davidson and/or the Estate of Michael Davidson Other than Those Wrongful Death Claims Brought Under the Death on the high Seas Act, 46 U.S.C. Section 30301 et seq. (Berman, Richard)
January 22, 2016 Filing 152 NOTICE of settlement as to the Estates of Keith Griffin, Piotr Krause, Roan Ronald Lightfoot, Marcin Nita, Jan Podgorski, Richard Pusatere, Howard Schoenly, Andrzej Truszkowski, Rafal Zdobych and Michael Davidson by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Hamilton, Jerry)
January 20, 2016 Filing 151 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Boyle, Sr on behalf of Katie Griffin (Boyle, Mark)
January 20, 2016 Filing 150 Presumptive Personal Representative of the Estate of Keith W. Griffin ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand and Claim by Katie Griffin.(Boyle, Mark)
January 20, 2016 Filing 149 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds with Memorandum of Law by Karen Schoenly. (Equels, Thomas) Modified on 1/22/2016 to edit text (RH).
January 19, 2016 Filing 148 CLAIM AND ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by ABF Freight System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tote Maritime Bill of Lading, #2 Exhibit 2 - Schedule of Cargo Claims)(Scarry, Brian)
January 19, 2016 Filing 147 NOTICE by Gargiulo, Inc. Withdrawal of Its Claim (Campbell, Dennis)
January 18, 2016 Filing 146 CLAIM by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America a/s/o Dawn Foods Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sitler, Martin)
January 18, 2016 Filing 145 CLAIM by Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company a/s/o Nexeo Solutions Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sitler, Martin)
January 18, 2016 Filing 144 CLAIM by TMM Marine American Insurance Companies a/s/o Dunkin Brands International, DMCC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sitler, Martin)
January 18, 2016 Filing 143 CLAIM by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America a/s/o Dawn Foods Products. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sitler, Martin)
January 18, 2016 Filing 142 CLAIM by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America a/s/o A.M. Capen's Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sitler, Martin)
January 18, 2016 Filing 141 CLAIM by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America a/s/o Bunzl USA Holding. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sitler, Martin)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER denying as moot #95 Motion to extend time; denying as moot #99 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 1/13/2016. (MGG)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ENDORSED ORDER: Any party opposing #137 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of James F. Sweeney shall file a response to the Motion no later than January 26, 2016, or the Motion will be deemed unopposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 1/11/2016. (ADM)
January 8, 2016 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Craven on behalf of Starr Indemnity and Liability Co. (Craven, Robert)
January 8, 2016 Filing 137 MOTION for James F. Sweeney to appear pro hac vice by Starr Indemnity and Liability Co.. (Craven, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
January 7, 2016 Filing 135 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. by JARVON WHIGHAM.(Hickey, John)
January 7, 2016 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Scarry on behalf of ArcBest Corporation (Scarry, Brian)
January 6, 2016 Filing 136 SUMMONS issued as to Tote Inc., Tote Shipholdings Inc.. (RH)
December 30, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Marlin K. Green, appearing on behalf of Maverick C&P, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018727.). (CKS)
December 23, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Dov Sacks, appearing on behalf of Elaine Meklin, Karl Meklin (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018691.) Related document: #126 Unopposed MOTION for Dov Sacks to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
December 23, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Ben Gideon, appearing on behalf of Elaine Meklin, Karl Meklin (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018690.) Related document: #125 Unopposed MOTION for Benjamin R. Gideon to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
December 23, 2015 Filing 133 CLAIM pursuant to Rule F(5) by Ruben Aquino. (NAS) (No Exhibit A received).
December 23, 2015 Filing 132 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Tote Inc., Tote Shipholdings Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Sea Star Line, LLC, Those certain underwriters (Syndicate 1955, Syndicate 2987, Syndicate 1183 and Syndicate 0457) subscribing to Policy # B0180 PC1422840 as subrogee of Del Valle Brands, Inc, and f/b/u/o Del Valle, Tote Services, Inc., (as Owner pro hac vice of the S.S. El Faro for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability) by Seguros Universal, S.A.(Cassidy, William) Modified on 12/24/2015 (PAM).
December 23, 2015 Filing 131 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Tote Shipholdings Inc., Tote Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Tote Shipholdings Inc., Tote Inc. by ACE Insurance Company.(Cassidy, William)
December 22, 2015 Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement and Motion to Strike filed by ANNA KRAUSE, as Personal Representative of the Estate of PIOTR KRAUSE, deceased. (Villarreal, David)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ENDORSED ORDER granting #118 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #125 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #126 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #127 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Matthew Shaffer, Benjamin Gideon, Dov Sacks, and Lawrence Glynn have not already done so, they shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/22/2015. (ADM)
December 22, 2015 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Dean Hamilton on behalf of Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.(as Owner pro hac vice of the S.S. El Faro for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability) (Hamilton, Jerry)
December 22, 2015 Filing 127 Unopposed MOTION for Lawrence C. Glynn to appear pro hac vice by ACE Insurance Company, Seguros Universal, S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassidy, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 22, 2015 Filing 126 Unopposed MOTION for Dov Sacks to appear pro hac vice by Laurie D. Bobillot, Elaine Meklin, Karl Meklin, Kenneth W. Randolph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Hamaway, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 22, 2015 Filing 125 Unopposed MOTION for Benjamin R. Gideon to appear pro hac vice by Karl Meklin, Kenneth W. Randolph. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Hamaway, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 21, 2015 Filing 124 Claimant Terri C. Davis, individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Brookie Larry Davis's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. by Terri C. Davis.(Woolsey, Joshua) Modified on 12/22/2015 contacted counsel regarding case number (TSW).
December 21, 2015 Filing 123 Claim ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dena Ann Lightfoot.(Hester, Linda)
December 21, 2015 Filing 122 CLAIM Cargo Loss and Answer by Cardinal Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sea Star Line Bill Of Lading - SSL000226533, #2 Exhibit B - Sea Star Line Bill Of Lading - SSL000229031, #3 Exhibit C - Commercial Invoices)(Zaltsberg, Michelle)
December 21, 2015 Filing 121 CLAIM AND ANSWER to Complaint by Gargiulo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Campbell, Dennis)
December 21, 2015 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Kimbrough Smith on behalf of BMW of North America, Inc. (Smith, Christopher)
December 21, 2015 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by David Weese Marston, Jr on behalf of BMW of North America, Inc. (Marston, David)
December 21, 2015 Filing 118 Unopposed MOTION for Matthew Shaffer to appear pro hac vice by Willa Crawford, Cheryl Crawford-Glenn. (Sullivan, G.J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 21, 2015 Filing 117 Answer and Affirmative Defenses, and Claim of Karen Schoenly, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Howard P. Schoenly, Deceased ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Karen Schoenly.(Equels, Thomas)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER regarding #108 Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/21/2015. (ADM)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ENDORSED ORDER granting #105 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #106 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #113 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Jason Itkin, Cory Itkin, and David Mazaroli have not already done so, they shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/21/2015. (ADM)
December 21, 2015 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan R. Kelley on behalf of Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.(as Owner pro hac vice of the S.S. El Faro for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability) (Kelley, Allan) Modified on 12/22/2015 contacted counsel regarding case number(TSW).
December 18, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Matthew E. Auger, appearing on behalf of Donna Griffin (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018614.) Related document: #103 MOTION for Matthew E. Auger to appear pro hac vice. (RH)
December 18, 2015 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for David L. Mazaroli to appear pro hac vice by Bemis Company, Inc., Bemis Healthcare Packaging de Puerto Rico, Inc., Bemis Healthcare Packaging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassidy, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 18, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Lawrence C. Glynn, appearing on behalf of Ace Insurance Company and Seguros Universal, S.A.(Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018601.). (DLC) Modified on 12/21/2015 to edit text(TSW).
December 18, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Ralph J. Mellusi, appearing on behalf of Claudia Aparecida Shultz, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Wink Shultz, deceased (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018602.) Related document: #90 MOTION for Ralph J. Mellusi to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
December 18, 2015 Filing 112 NOTICE of Notice of Appearance Appearance by William E. Cassidy on behalf of Bemis Healthcare Packaging, Inc., Bemis Healthcare Packaging de Puerto Rico, Inc., Bemis Company, Inc., Mars Chocolate North America, LLC, Mars Pet Care US Inc., Costco Wholesale Corp. (Cassidy, William)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ENDORSED ORDER granting #103 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Matthew E. Auger, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/18/2015. (ADM)
December 18, 2015 Filing 110 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cheryl Crawford-Glenn.(Sullivan, G.J.) Modified on 12/21/2015 contacted counsel regarding case number(TSW).
December 18, 2015 Filing 109 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Willa Crawford.(Sullivan, G.J.) Modified on 12/21/2015 contacted counsel regarding case number(TSW).
December 18, 2015 Filing 108 NOTICE by Willa Crawford, Cheryl Crawford-Glenn of Written Designation and Consent to Act (Sullivan, G.J.)
December 18, 2015 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by G.J. Rod Sullivan, Jr on behalf of Cheryl Crawford-Glenn (Sullivan, G.J.)
December 18, 2015 Filing 106 Amended MOTION for Cory Itkin to appear pro hac vice by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Hamaway, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 18, 2015 Filing 105 Amended MOTION for Jason Itkin to appear pro hac vice by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Hamaway, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying without prejudice #100 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/17/2015. (ADM)
December 18, 2015 Filing 103 MOTION for Matthew E. Auger to appear pro hac vice by donna griffin. (Decunto, Catherine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 17, 2015 Filing 102 CLAIM Cargo Loss and Answer by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Christopher, Donald)
December 17, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney David L. Mazaroli. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018598.). (DLC)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ENDORSED ORDER granting #92 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. On or before January 25, 2016, Sea Star and Tote shall respond to Claimants Riehm and Hatch's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/17/2015. (ADM)
December 17, 2015 Filing 100 MOTION for Matthew Shaffer to appear pro hac vice by Willa Crawford. (Sullivan, G.J.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 17, 2015 Filing 99 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Intervening Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Intervening Claim by TRIVONDA PORTER. (Woodlief, Mitchel)
December 17, 2015 Filing 98 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand and Claim by Claudette Riley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Munch, Jacob)
December 17, 2015 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by G.J. Rod Sullivan, Jr on behalf of Willa Crawford, Crawford (Sullivan, G.J.)
December 17, 2015 Filing 96 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint [DE 1] filed by Sea Star Lines, LLC d/b/a Tote Maritime Puerto Rico, Tote Services, Inc., and, COUNTERCLAIM against Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. by UPS Ground Freight, Inc..(Rubin, Marc)
December 17, 2015 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to file Intervening Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Intervening Claim by TRIVONDA PORTER. (Woodlief, Mitchel)
December 17, 2015 Filing 94 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by UPS Ground Freight, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. for UPS Ground Freight, Inc... (Rubin, Marc)
December 17, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Matthew D. Shaffer, (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018589.). (CKS)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ENDORSED ORDER granting #90 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Ralph J. Mellusi, Esq. has not already done so, he shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/17/2015. (ADM)
December 17, 2015 Filing 92 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #64 MOTION for summary judgment on Shipowners Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability With Supporting Memorandum of Law by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.(as Owner pro hac vice of the S.S. El Faro for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability). (Gropper, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying without prejudice #83 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/17/2015. (ADM)
December 17, 2015 Filing 90 MOTION for Ralph J. Mellusi to appear pro hac vice by Claudia Aparecida Shultz, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Wink Shultz, deceased. (Margulies, Jason) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 17, 2015 Filing 89 Answer and Contest to Exoneration or Limitation of Liability ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Joanna Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial)(Gary, Willie)
December 16, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Cory Itkin, appearing on behalf of Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018581.) Related document: #60 Unopposed MOTION for Cory Itkin to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
December 16, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Jason Itkin, appearing on behalf of Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018581.) Related document: #59 Unopposed MOTION for Jason Itkin to appear pro hac vice. To Edit Text. (DLC) Modified on 12/17/2015 (DLC).
December 16, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney David T. Maloof, appearing on behalf of Great American Insurance Company of New York, RLI Insurance Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018580.) Related document: #62 MOTION for David T. Maloof to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
December 16, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Thomas M. Eagan, appearing on behalf of Great American Insurance Company of New York, RLI Insurance Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018579.) Related document: #61 MOTION for Thomas M. Eagan to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
December 16, 2015 Filing 88 MOTION to intervene Intervening Claimant by TRIVONDA PORTER. (Woodlief, Mitchel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 16, 2015 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Douglas Sager on behalf of PUSATERE, EMILY, as Personal Representative of the Estate of RICHARD PUSATERE, deceased (Sager, Brett)
December 16, 2015 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Douglas Sager on behalf of CHAMPA, VALMA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Champa, Jr., deceased (Sager, Brett)
December 16, 2015 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth P. Kagan on behalf of ADDREISHA SHIRLIEA JONES (Kagan, Elizabeth)
December 16, 2015 Filing 84 Claimants Donna Griffin and Gregory Kuflik ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON, COUNTERCLAIM against Sea Star Lines, LLC d/b/a Tote Maritime Puerto Rico and against Tote Services, Inc. by donna griffin.(Decunto, Catherine)
December 16, 2015 Filing 83 MOTION for Matthew E. Auger to appear pro hac vice by donna griffin. (Decunto, Catherine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #68 Motion to extend time. The parties shall conduct the case management meeting on or before April 19, 2016. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 12/16/2015. (RH)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Extension of Time to File. All persons asserting claims for any and all losses in this proceeding shall have up to and including February 19, 2016 to submit their claims. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 12/16/2015. (RH)
December 16, 2015 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Frank Rich on behalf of Federal Insurance Company as subrogee of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc., Continental Insurance Company as subrogee of Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc., Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc. (Rich, Joseph)
December 16, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Kurt B. Arnold, appearing on behalf of Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018581.) Related document: #58 Unopposed MOTION for Kurt B. Arnold to appear pro hac vice. (DLC)
December 15, 2015 Filing 79 NOTICE by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA re #53 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claims, Answers and Affirmative Defenses of Joinder (Brock, Lindsey)
December 15, 2015 Filing 78 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. by CHAMPA, VALMA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Champa, Jr., deceased.(Hickey, John)
December 15, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney James F. Sweeney, appearing on behalf of (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018558.). (DLC)
December 15, 2015 Filing 77 CLAIM First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Claims of Mildred Solar-Cortes, individually and as Personal Representative for the Estate of German Solar-Cortes and on behalf of all heirs by Mildred Solar-Cortes. (Hamaway, Michael)
December 15, 2015 Filing 76 Claim ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON by Patricia Quammie, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Theodore Quammie, deceased.(Margulies, Jason)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ENDORSED ORDER granting #58 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #61 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #62 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Kurt B. Arnold, Thomas M. Eagan, and David T. Maloof have not already done so, they shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/15/2015. (ADM)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying without prejudice #59 motion to appear pro hac vice; #60 motion to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/15/2015. (ADM)
December 15, 2015 Filing 73 CLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Elaine Meklin and Karl Meklin, individually and as Personal Representatives of the Estate of Dylan O. Meklim by Elaine Meklin, Karl Meklin. (Hamaway, Michael)
December 15, 2015 Filing 72 CLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Laurie D. Bobillot and Kenneth W. Randolph, individually and as Personal Representatives for the Estate of Danielle L. Randolph by Laurie D. Bobillot, Kenneth W. Randolph. (Hamaway, Michael)
December 15, 2015 Filing 71 CLAIM by Jennifer Mathias, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jeffrey Mathias. (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
December 15, 2015 Filing 70 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Jennifer Mathias, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jeffrey Mathias.(Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
December 15, 2015 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Allen K. Von Spiegelfeld on behalf of Jennifer Mathias, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jeffrey Mathias (Von Spiegelfeld, Allen)
December 15, 2015 Filing 68 MOTION to extend time to hold case management meeting and to file case management report form by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.(as Owner pro hac vice of the S.S. El Faro for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability). (Gropper, Michael)
December 14, 2015 Filing 67 CORRECTED ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. by PUSATERE, EMILY, as Personal Representative of the Estate of RICHARD PUSATERE, deceased.(Hickey, John)
December 14, 2015 Filing 66 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. by PUSATERE, EMILY, as Personal Representative of the Estate of RICHARD PUSATERE, deceased.(Hickey, John)
December 14, 2015 Filing 65 REQUEST for oral argument re #64 MOTION for summary judgment on Shipowners Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability With Supporting Memorandum of Law by Tracey Hatch, Tina Riehm. (Richard, Benjamin)
December 14, 2015 Filing 64 MOTION for summary judgment on Shipowners Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability With Supporting Memorandum of Law by Tracey Hatch, Tina Riehm. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit John Soutar, #2 Affidavit John Becker, #3 Exhibit Transcript of 10-6-15 Press Conference)(Richard, Benjamin)
December 14, 2015 Filing 63 CLAIM by Maverick C&P, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Green, Marlin)
December 14, 2015 Filing 62 MOTION for David T. Maloof to appear pro hac vice by Great American Insurance Company of New York, RLI Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of David T. Maloof, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification, #4 Exhibit Designation and Consent to Act)(Scarry, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 14, 2015 Filing 61 MOTION for Thomas M. Eagan to appear pro hac vice by Great American Insurance Company of New York, RLI Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Thomas M. Eagan, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Exhibit Special Admission Attorney Certification, #4 Exhibit Designation and Consent to Act)(Scarry, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 14, 2015 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Cory Itkin to appear pro hac vice by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Atty. Cert.)(Hamaway, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 14, 2015 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Jason Itkin to appear pro hac vice by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Atty. Cert.)(Hamaway, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 14, 2015 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Kurt B. Arnold to appear pro hac vice by Terri Hargrove, Patrick John Smith, Mildred Solar-Cortes, Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Special Admission Atty. Cert.)(Hamaway, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
December 14, 2015 Filing 57 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Tina Riehm.(Slater, Thomas)
December 14, 2015 Filing 56 CLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Terri Hargrove, individually and as Personal Representative for the Estate of Joe Hargrove by Terri Hargrove. (Hamaway, Michael)
December 14, 2015 Filing 55 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Tracey Hatch.(Pajcic, Michael)
December 14, 2015 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Scarry on behalf of The Continental Insurance Company (Scarry, Brian)
December 14, 2015 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claims, Answers and Affirmative Defenses by Great American Insurance Company of New York, RLI Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Claims, Answers and Affirmative Defenses)(Scarry, Brian)
December 14, 2015 Filing 52 CLAIM by THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS (SYNDICATE 1955, SYNDICATE 2987, SYNDICATE 1183 AND SYNDICATE 0457) SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY # B0180 PC1422840 AS SUBROGEE OF DEL VALLE BRANDS, INC. AND f/u/b/o DEL VALLE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brock, Lindsey)
December 14, 2015 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey C. Brock, III on behalf of THOSE CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS (SYNDICATE 1955, SYNDICATE 2987, SYNDICATE 1183 AND SYNDICATE 0457) SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY # B0180 PC1422840 AS SUBROGEE OF DEL VALLE BRANDS, INC. AND f/u/b/o DEL VALLE BRANDS, INC. (Brock, Lindsey)
December 11, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Wagner on behalf of ADDREISHA SHIRLIEA JONES (Wagner, Scott)
December 10, 2015 Filing 49 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Tote Services, Inc.(as Owner pro hac vice of the S.S. El Faro for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability) by Ace American Insurance Company.(Boyd, Thomas)
December 10, 2015 Filing 48 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Tote Services, Inc. by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America.(Boyd, Thomas)
December 10, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Scarry on behalf of Great American Insurance Company of New York, RLI Insurance Company (Scarry, Brian)
December 9, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. of Filing Proof of Publication (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Judas, Suzanne)
December 8, 2015 Filing 45 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement and Motion to Strike by INTEC MARITIME OFFSHORE SERVICE CORP., SHIP OR LAND OPERATIONS AGENCY, INC.. (Matlow, Daniel) Modified on 8/3/2016 Moot per doc #454 (TSW).
December 8, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Daniel O. Rose, appearing on behalf of Jill Jackson-d'Entremont (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018510.). (DLC)
December 7, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE by EFOODS INC. of Proof of Claim (Rotella, Raymond)
December 7, 2015 Filing 43 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint of Sea Star Lines LLC and Tote Services Inc. by EFOODS INC..(Rotella, Raymond)
December 7, 2015 Filing 42 CLAIM ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Claudia Aparecida Shultz, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Wink Shultz, deceased. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Margulies, Jason)
December 7, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Spohrer on behalf of Jill Jackson-d'Entremont (Spohrer, Robert)
December 4, 2015 Filing 40 CLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Patrick John Smith. (Hamaway, Michael)
December 1, 2015 Filing 39 CLAIM Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Tinisha Renee Thomas. (Hamaway, Michael)
November 30, 2015 Filing 38 CLAIM Answer and Aff. Defenses by Mildred Solar-Cortes. (Hamaway, Michael)
November 24, 2015 Filing 37 CLAIM by SAIA Motor Freight Line, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Sarber, Lloyd)
November 24, 2015 Filing 36 STIPULATION re #7 Answer to ComplaintThird Party ComplaintCounterclaim as Their Claim and Suspend Time to Respond by Sea Star Line, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Gabel, George)
November 23, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Hickey on behalf of CHAMPA, VALMA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Louis Champa, Jr., deceased (Hickey, John)
November 23, 2015 Filing 34 RETURN of service executed on 11/17/2015 by ANNA KRAUSE, as Personal Representative of the Estate of PIOTR KRAUSE, deceased, BOZENA TRUSZKOWSKA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of ANDRZEJ TRUSZKOWSKI, deceased, AGNIESZKA ZDOBYCH, as Personal Representative of the Estate of RAFAL ZDOBYCH, deceased, MALGORZATA PODGORSKA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of JAN PODGORSKI, deceased, AGNIESZKA NITA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of MARCIN NITA, deceased as to INTEC MARITIME OFFSHORE SERVICE CORP.. (Margulies, Jason)
November 23, 2015 Filing 33 RETURN of service executed on 11/17/2015 by ANNA KRAUSE, as Personal Representative of the Estate of PIOTR KRAUSE, deceased, BOZENA TRUSZKOWSKA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of ANDRZEJ TRUSZKOWSKI, deceased, AGNIESZKA ZDOBYCH, as Personal Representative of the Estate of RAFAL ZDOBYCH, deceased, MALGORZATA PODGORSKA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of JAN PODGORSKI, deceased, AGNIESZKA NITA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of MARCIN NITA, deceased as to SHIP OR LAND OPERATIONS AGENCY, INC.. (Margulies, Jason)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference to the extent stated in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/20/2015. (MEH)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #20 motion to Correct Scrivener's Error in Case Style; the case caption shall hereafter be corrected to reflect the correct spelling of the Plaintiff's name. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 11/19/2015. (MGG)
November 19, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Fitzpatrick Slater on behalf of Tina Riehm (Slater, Thomas)
November 19, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Sather Pajcic on behalf of Tracey Hatch (Pajcic, Michael)
November 19, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Edward Richard on behalf of Tina Riehm (Richard, Benjamin)
November 18, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 3 (MGG)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 11/18/2015. (MGG)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #14 motion to amend the Order; the Court will file an Amended Order separately. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 11/18/2015. (MGG)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #17 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #18 motion to appear pro hac vice. If Michael A. Delulis, Chester D. Hooper, and Vincent J. Foley have not already done so, they shall immediately register for a login and password for electronic filing at the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/18/2015. (ADM)
November 18, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Judson H. Orrick on behalf of Karen Schoenly (Orrick, Judson)
November 18, 2015 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas K. Equels on behalf of Karen Schoenly (Equels, Thomas)
November 18, 2015 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to file Serve Third Party Subpoena by Sea Star Lines, LLC. (Kifer, Jennifer)
November 18, 2015 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scrivener's Error in Case Style by Sea Star Lines, LLC. (Kifer, Jennifer)
November 16, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Hickey on behalf of PUSATERE, EMILY, as Personal Representative of the Estate of RICHARD PUSATERE, deceased (Hickey, John)
November 13, 2015 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Order by Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Kifer, Jennifer)
November 12, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Deiulis as additional counsel of Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (RH)
November 12, 2015 Filing 18 MOTION for Vincent J. Foley to appear pro hac vice by Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (RH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
November 12, 2015 Filing 17 MOTION for Chester D. Hooper to appear pro hac vice by Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (RH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
November 12, 2015 Filing 16 MOTION for Michael A. DeIulis to appear pro hac vice by Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (RH) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson.
November 12, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Chester D. Hooper, appearing on behalf of Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018268.). (DLC)
November 12, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Michael A. Delulis, appearing on behalf of Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018267.). (DLC)
November 12, 2015 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Vincent J. Foley, appearing on behalf of Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX018266.). (DLC)
November 12, 2015 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued as to INTEC MARITIME OFFSHORE SERVICE CORP., SHIP OR LAND OPERATIONS AGENCY, INC.. (RH)
November 10, 2015 Filing 12 CLAIM Cargo Loss by Estes Express Lines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Roberts, Lawrence)
November 4, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE to claimants of complaint for exoneration from or limitation of liability (TSW)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING AD INTERIM STIPULATION, DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND RESTRAINING PROSECUTION OF CLAIMS. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 11/4/2015. (MGG)
November 3, 2015 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger. New case number: 3:15-cv-1297-J-20MCR. Judge Brian J. Davis no longer assigned to the case. (PAM)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable Harvey E. Schlesinger with his consent. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/2/2015. (AMP)
November 2, 2015 Filing 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against SHIP OR LAND OPERATIONS AGENCY, INC., MICHAEL DAVIDSON and/or the ESTATE OF MICHAEL DAVIDSON, INTEC MARITIME OFFSHORE SERVICE CORP., COUNTERCLAIM against Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. by ANNA KRAUSE, as Personal Representative of the Estate of PIOTR KRAUSE, deceased, BOZENA TRUSZKOWSKA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of ANDRZEJ TRUSZKOWSKI, deceased, AGNIESZKA ZDOBYCH, as Personal Representative of the Estate of RAFAL ZDOBYCH, deceased, AGNIESZKA NITA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of MARCIN NITA, deceased, MALGORZATA PODGORSKA, as Personal Representative of the Estate of JAN PODGORSKI, deceased.(Margulies, Jason)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for leave to serve third-party subpoenas prior to a Rule 26(F) conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/30/2015. (ADM)
October 30, 2015 Filing 5 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas Prior to a Rule 26(F) Conference and Accompanying Memorandum of Law by Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Proposed Order not scanned)(BD)
October 30, 2015 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Becky Roberts re #2 Stipulation for costs by Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (BD)
October 30, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Declaration of Becky Roberts in Support of #2 Stipulation for costs by Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (BD)
October 30, 2015 Filing 2 AD INTERIM STIPULATION of Value and Stipulation for Costs by Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc.. (Proposed Order not scanned) (BD)
October 30, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number JAX18078) filed by by Sea Star Lines, LLC, Tote Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sea Star Line, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation (Puerto Rico)
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford
Represented By: G.J. Rod Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABF Freight System, Inc.
Represented By: Brian T. Scarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corp.
Represented By: David L. Mazaroli
Represented By: William E. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick John Smith
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold
Represented By: Jason A. Itkin
Represented By: Jason Ari Smith
Represented By: Adam D. Lewis
Represented By: John Benjamin Bireley
Represented By: Michael P. Hamaway
Represented By: Cory D. Itkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamex Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412719000
Represented By: Thomas M. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bemis Company, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Mazaroli
Represented By: William E. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Fire Products Corporation
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roche Operations, Limited
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars Pet Care US Inc.
Represented By: David L. Mazaroli
Represented By: William E. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds Syndicate 2623 a/s/o Interra International, Inc.
Represented By: Martin F. Casey
Represented By: Thomas Albert Boyd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Americas
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos A. Tuche Funicia and Puerto Rico Green Transportation
Represented By: Robert W Phelan
Represented By: David Y. Loh
Represented By: Joseph Frank Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reyes Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamo Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher E. Cotter
Represented By: Paul Anthony Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tote Shipholdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJC Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation, PLC
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claimant Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Albert Boyd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynden Air Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Albert Boyd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbell Caribe Limited
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Logistics Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Cargo Services, Inc. d/b/a Caribex Worldwide
Represented By: David Harlen Sump
Represented By: Craig Liszt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC.
Represented By: Martin F. Casey
Represented By: Thomas Albert Boyd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mead Johnson & Company, LLC
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Hamm as Personal Representative of Frank Hamm, III
Represented By: Thomas Albert Boyd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bemis Healthcare Packaging, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Mazaroli
Represented By: William E. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tote Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargo Claimants Who Did Not File An Answer or Claim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company a/s/o Nexeo Solutions Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Martin Hayes Sitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars Chocolate North America, LLC
Represented By: David L. Mazaroli
Represented By: William E. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Mathias, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Jeffrey Mathias
Represented By: Allen K. Von Spiegelfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc.
Represented By: Robert W Phelan
Represented By: David Y. Loh
Represented By: Joseph Frank Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company as subrogee of J.C. Penney Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Robert W Phelan
Represented By: David Y. Loh
Represented By: Joseph Frank Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly-Clark Trading & Services, Ltda
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlena Porter, as Personal Representative for the Estate of James Phillip Porter, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Albert Boyd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMM Marine American Insurance Companies a/s/o Dunkin Brands International, DMCC
Represented By: Martin Hayes Sitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck Brokers, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie S. Penninger
Represented By: Bridgette Mannino Blitch
Represented By: Joseph A. Parrish, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Save Logistics Incorporated
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America a/s/o Bunzl USA Holding
Represented By: Martin Hayes Sitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America a/s/o A.M. Capen's Co., Inc.
Represented By: Martin Hayes Sitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Insurance Company as subrogee of Goodnight Acquisitions LLC a/k/a Goodnight International Inc.
Represented By: Robert W Phelan
Represented By: David Y. Loh
Represented By: Joseph Frank Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foot Locker Incorporated
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Food Group Incorporated
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Parker, as Personal Representative of Roosevelt Clark
Represented By: Thomas Albert Boyd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America a/s/o Dawn Foods Products
Represented By: Martin Hayes Sitler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bemis Healthcare Packaging de Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Mazaroli
Represented By: William E. Cassidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky Green, as the Personal Representative of LaShawn Rivera
Represented By: Thomas Albert Boyd, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joanna Johnson
Represented By: Willie Edward Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kenneth W. Randolph
Represented By: Dov Sacks
Represented By: Benjamin R. Gideon
Represented By: Michael P. Hamaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Represented By: James F. Sweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Aqua Gulf Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Eagan
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Represented By: David T. Maloof
Represented By: Brian T. Scarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: BMW of North America, Inc.
Represented By: Martin F. Casey
Represented By: David Weese Marston, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Kimbrough Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Claudia Aparecida Shultz, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Steven Wink Shultz, deceased
Represented By: Ralph Joseph Mellusi
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Those Certain Underwriters Subscribing to Policy # 019341836
Represented By: Lindsey C. Brock, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Willa Crawford
Represented By: Matthew D. Shaffer
Represented By: G.J. Rod Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: EFOODS INC.
Represented By: Raymond John Rotella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Personal Representat Dena Ann Lightfoot
Represented By: Wade Douglas Childs
Represented By: Linda Marie Hester
Represented By: Brian Mark Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Cardinal Health
Represented By: Michelle F. Zaltsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance PC1412443000
Represented By: Thomas M. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: ArcBest Corporation
Represented By: Brian T. Scarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500194000
Represented By: Thomas M. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: SAIA Motor Freight Line, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance DC1500466000
Represented By: Thomas M. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Terri Hargrove
Represented By: Kurt B. Arnold
Represented By: Jason A. Itkin
Represented By: Jason Ari Smith
Represented By: Adam D. Lewis
Represented By: John Benjamin Bireley
Represented By: Michael P. Hamaway
Represented By: Cory D. Itkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tracey Hatch
Represented By: Michael Sather Pajcic
Represented By: Benjamin Edward Richard
Represented By: Stephen J. Pajcic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC151592500
Represented By: Thomas M. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1516397000
Represented By: Thomas M. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Estes Express Lines
Represented By: Lawrence J. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: The Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: John T. Lillis, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan T. Williams
Represented By: John M. Siracusa
Represented By: Steven M. Parrish
Represented By: Joseph W. Janssen, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Certain Underwriters and Insurers at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy of Insurance LC1515422000
Represented By: Thomas M. Eagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance |