AFFORDABLE BOATING OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC, as owner of the motor vessel Off the Hook IV, a 2018 23' Key West vessel bearing Hull Identification No. KWEEF148G718 and Florida Registration FL0782RL,
Plaintiff: AFFORDABLE BOATING OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC, as owner of the motor vessel Off the Hook IV, a 2018 23' Key West vessel bearing Hull Identification No. KWEEF148G718 and Florida Registration FL0782RL,
Petitioner: In the Matter of Affordable Boating of North Florida, LLC, as owner of the motor vessel Off the Hook IV
Claimant: Zoe Williams, Melanie Williams, Joan F. Williams, Steven Williams and Logann Williams
Case Number: 3:2018cv01498
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: Monte C Richardson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 MONITION AND INJUNCTION Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/28/2018. (AEJ)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for entry of order approving the ad interim stipulation and issuing the monition and injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 12/27/2018. (MM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Entry of Order Approving the Ad Interim Stipulation and Issuing the Monition and Injunction by AFFORDABLE BOATING OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC, as owner of the motor vessel Off the Hook IV, a 2018 23' Key West vessel bearing Hull Identification No. KWEEF148G718 and Florida Registration FL0782RL,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Monition, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order approving Ad Interim Stipulation, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Monition and Injunction)(Gutwein, Evan)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:18-cv-1498-J-39MCR. (SJB)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 STIPULATION Ad Interim Stipulation for Costs and Value by AFFORDABLE BOATING OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC, as owner of the motor vessel Off the Hook IV, a 2018 23' Key West vessel bearing Hull Identification No. KWEEF148G718 and Florida Registration FL0782RL,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ad Interim Stipulation)(Gutwein, Evan)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AFFORDABLE BOATING OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC, as owner of the motor vessel Off the Hook IV, a 2018 23' Key West vessel bearing Hull Identification No. KWEEF148G718 and Florida Registration FL0782RL, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14945053) filed by AFFORDABLE BOATING OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC, as owner of the motor vessel Off the Hook IV, a 2018 23' Key West vessel bearing Hull Identification No. KWEEF148G718 and Florida Registration FL0782RL,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gambach, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AFFORDABLE BOATING OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC, as owner of the motor vessel Off the Hook IV, a 2018 23' Key West vessel bearing Hull Identification No. KWEEF148G718 and Florida Registration FL0782RL,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFFORDABLE BOATING OF NORTH FLORIDA, LLC, as owner of the motor vessel Off the Hook IV, a 2018 23' Key West vessel bearing Hull Identification No. KWEEF148G718 and Florida Registration FL0782RL,
Represented By: Evan Seth Gutwein
Represented By: David Neal Gambach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Zoe Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Melanie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Joan F. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steven Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Logann Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In the Matter of Affordable Boating of North Florida, LLC, as owner of the motor vessel Off the Hook IV
Represented By: Evan Seth Gutwein
Represented By: David Neal Gambach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?