Marano v. Target Corporation

Plaintiff: Denise Marano
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00604
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Brian J Davis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Target Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Target Corporation, Other Affiliate Jeffrey Green, Esquire, Other Affiliate Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Other Affiliate William T. Stone, Esquire, Other Affiliate Denise Marano for Target Corporation.. (Stone, William)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Denise Marano (Green, Jeffrey)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Case management and scheduling order by Denise Marano. (Green, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (AEJ)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Conduct mediation hearing by 1/17/2020; Discovery due by 4/2/2020; Dispositive motions due by 5/4/2020; Pretrial statement due by 8/19/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 9/8/2020 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Docket Sheets)(AMP)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Stone, William)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (filed in State Court on 04/09/2019) against Target Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Denise Marano.(AEJ)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-604-J-39PDB. (SJB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Flagler County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-247 filed in State Court on 4/9/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15493708 filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 State Court COMPLAINT, #4 State Court ANSWER, #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 State Court Other Documents, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stone, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marano v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Marano
Represented By: Jeffrey Kurtz Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: William T. Stone
Represented By: Dana Aubrey Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?