Rigdon et al v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Joy Rigdon and John Rigdon
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00915
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Patricia D Barksdale
Referring Judge: Marcia Morales Howard
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 the defendant's motion asking that Dana Jacobs, Esquire, be permitted to withdraw as counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 10/4/2019. (ASL)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate Plaintiff Joy Rigdon from the docket. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 10/4/2019. (JW)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Joseph Miller's unopposed motion asking the Court to allow James Fater to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 9/27/2019. (ASL)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT re #7 NOTICE to Remove Attorney From Service List by Target Corporation. (Stone, William)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for James Fater to withdraw as attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Bonner, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale.
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER directing the defendant to supplement #7 its notice to remove attorney from service list, which the Court construes as a motion to withdraw as counsel, with information required by Local Rules 2.03(b) and 3.01(g). The supplemental information must be provided by September 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia Barksdale on September 13, 2019.(ASL)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to remand to State Court and Memorandum of Law filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stone, William)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Bonner, Robert)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to Remove Attorney From Service List by Target Corporation (Stone, William) Modified text on 9/12/2019 and converted to a motion (BD).
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(JW)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel James J. Fater of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #3 Complaint by Target Corporation. (Originally filed in State Court) (BD)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Target Corporation with Jury Demand filed by John Rigdon, Joy Rigdon. (Originally filed in State Court) (BD)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale. New case number: 3:19-cv-915-J-34PDB. (SJB)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-3259 filed in State Court on 05/01/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15780523 filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 State Court COMPLAINT, #12 State Court ANSWER, #13 State Court Docket Sheet, #14 State Court Other Documents, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stone, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigdon et al v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Rigdon
Represented By: Joseph Scott Miller
Represented By: James J. Fater
Represented By: Robert Alan Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rigdon
Represented By: Joseph Scott Miller
Represented By: James J. Fater
Represented By: Robert Alan Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Dana Aubrey Jacobs
Represented By: William T. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?