McCrimmon et al v. Centurion of Florida, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Caron Dettmann and Sarah McCrimmon
Defendant: K. MCCARTER, L. SWANSON, Tamara Taylor, G. Pedroza, Timothy Whalen, PRISCILLA ROBERTS, MHM Services, Inc., K. NIELSON, Thomas Reimers, David Allen, T. MAHONEY, CENTURION, LLC, Erich Hummel, E. MORTON, S. COOPER, Julie Jones, S. Jackson, LPN A.R., DAVID RODRIGUEZ, Centene Corporation, MAURICE RADFORD, L. ROBERTS, ROBERT E. SMITH, JR., A. Harvey, L. Brown, NURSE L.C., RAKESH SHARMA, MARINETTE GONZALEZ, T. ADKINS, B. PURVIS, NIKKI RICHARDSON, J. QUINTINO, M. ROTH, NURSE [SIGNATURE], A. MASON, C. Smith, LPN C.S., C. MOODY, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Centurion Managed Care of Florida, LLC, K. McCarther, Gerardo Pedroza, Sharon Cooper, Tanesha Adkins, Elizabeth Morton, Clarissa Moody, Tabitha Mahoney, Julie L. Jones, Alex Renelus, Kayla McCarter and Stacy Cooper
Case Number: 3:2020cv00036
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Brian J Davis
Referring Judge: James R Klindt
2 Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 203 JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/13/2022. (JDR)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/12/2022. (CAW)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE and Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Sarah McCrimmon (Wilkison, Jesse) (Modified on 5/12/2022 to edit docket text) (JDR).
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #199 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time; the parties shall have until 5/11/2022 to file a joint motion for dismissal or other appropriate documents to close out the file. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 4/12/2022. (CAW)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Dismiss or Other Documents to Close File by All Plaintiffs. (Wilkison, Jesse) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER directing the parties to file a joint motion for dismissal or other appropriate documents to close out the file by 4/11/2022; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 2/15/2022. (CAW)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEDIATION report Hearing held on February 8, 2022. Hearing outcome: Settled.. (Silverman, Terry)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 NOTICE of settlement by Caron Dettmann (Wilkison, Jesse)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #132 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike or to Compel; directing the Centurion Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' interrogatory number 6 within seven days; denying #139 Centurion's Motion to Confess Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #147 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery; directing Centurion to respond to discovery requests as stated in the Order; denying as moot #149 the Centurion Defendants' Motion for Protective Order; denying #155 Centurion's Motion to Quash or for Protective Order; directing Plaintiffs to modify their non-party subpoenas as stated in the Order; granting in part #171 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery; directing Centurion to respond to or supplement responses to Plaintiffs' second set of interrogatories and second request for production of documents, as narrowed by the Court, within twenty-one days; granting #172 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery; directing Centurion to comply within seven days; denying #188 the Centurion Defendants' Motion to Strike; see Order for details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 2/7/2022. (KLC)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on February 8, 2022 10:00 a.m. before Terry N Silverman.(Silverman, Terry)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 THIRD CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. The following deadlines and settings shall apply: Fact Discovery due by 4/7/2022; Expert Discovery due by 6/17/2022; Dispositive motions due by 7/22/2022; Pretrial statement due by 12/14/2022; Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 1/3/2023 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 1/20/2022. (AMP)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 RESPONSE in Opposition re #188 MOTION to Strike #186 Reply to Response to Motion and/or Motion For Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Sarah McCrimmon. (Wilkison, Jesse)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #190 Plaintiffs' Agreed Motion for Extension of Deadlines to the extent the Court will enter an amended Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 1/10/2022. (CAW)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Grady, Sarah) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER denying #183 the Centurion Defendants' Emergency Motion to Stay; denying as moot #184 the Centurion Defendants' request for oral argument. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 1/6/2022. (KLC)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MOTION to Strike #186 Reply to Response to Motion and/or Motion For Leave to File Sur-Reply by Tanesha Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Stacy Cooper, Marinette Gonzalez, Kayla McCarter, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Alex Renelus, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Wahl, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 RESPONSE to Motion re #183 Emergency MOTION to Stay Case, Discovery, and Protective Order filed by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Grady, Sarah)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 REPLY to Response to Motion re #172 MOTION to Compel Production filed by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Weil, Stephen)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an expedited response to #183 Defendants' Emergency Motion for Stay, Discovery, and Protective Order and #184 request for oral argument by Monday, January 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 12/27/2021. (LDO)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 REQUEST for oral argument re #183 Emergency MOTION to Stay Case, Discovery, and Protective Order by Tanesha Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Stacy Cooper, Marinette Gonzalez, Kayla McCarter, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Alex Renelus, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Wahl, Brian)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Emergency MOTION to Stay Case, Discovery, and Protective Order by Tanesha Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Stacy Cooper, Marinette Gonzalez, Kayla McCarter, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Alex Renelus, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Wahl, Brian)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #167 Amended Complaint by Tabitha Mahoney.(Hurley, Claire)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting #179 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file reply; reply of no longer than 7 pages due by 12/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 12/14/2021. (CAW)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 RESPONSE in Opposition re #179 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of Plaintifffs' Motion to Compel (Doc. 172) filed by Tanesha Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Stacy Cooper, Marinette Gonzalez, Kayla McCarter, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Alex Renelus, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Conferral Emails)(Wahl, Brian)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of Plaintifffs' Motion to Compel (Doc. 172) by All Plaintiffs. (Wilkison, Jesse)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ENDORSED ORDER granting #177 defendant Mahoney's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file a response to the plaintiffs' third amended complaint. Defendant Mahoney shall have up to and including December 20, 2021 to file her response to plaintiffs' third amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 11/30/2021. (CAW) .
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to third amended complaint by Tabitha Mahoney. (Hurley, Claire) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 RESPONSE to Motion re #172 MOTION to Compel Production filed by Centurion of Florida, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sept. 27, 2021 Email (with redactions))(Wahl, Brian)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 RESPONSE to Motion re #171 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Centurion of Florida, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FDC Email Requiring Release, #2 Exhibit B - Letter Requesting Signed Release)(Wahl, Brian)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ANSWER with Jury Demand to #167 Amended Complaint by Tanesha Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Stacy Cooper, Marinette Gonzalez, Kayla McCarter, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Alex Renelus, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor.(Wahl, Brian)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:20-cv-36-BJD-LLL. Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #147 MOTION to Compel Discovery , #132 MOTION to Strike #127 Answer to amended complaint and/or Motion to Compel, #155 MOTION for Protective Order and/or Motion to Quash, #149 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #171 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses , #172 MOTION to Compel Production . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. (KKH)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION to Compel Production by All Plaintiffs. (Weil, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Weil, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 SUMMONS issued as to Stacy Cooper. (AEP)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Caron Dettmann. (Wilkison, Jesse)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 JUDGMENT that pursuant to the Court's order all claims against Defendant Sharon Cooper are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 11/4/2021. (KEM)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tanesha Adkins, David Allen, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, Erich Hummel, Julie Jones, Tabitha Mahoney, Kayla McCarter, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Maurice Radford, Thomas Reimers, Alex Renelus, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Robert E. Smith, Jr, Tamara Taylor, Timothy Whalen, Stacy Cooper with Jury Demand. Terminating Sharon Cooper filed by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon.(KEM)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #165 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Voluntarily Dismiss Defendant Sharon Cooper and to File a Third Amended Complaint; responses to the Third Amended Complaint due by 11/30/2021; dismissing with prejudice the claims against Defendant Sharon Cooper; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/3/2021. (CAW)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Unopposed MOTION to Amend #123 Amended Complaint and Voluntarily Dismiss Defendant Sharon Cooper by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Propoesed Third Amended Complaint)(Wilkison, Jesse) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER striking #157, #158, #159, #160, #161, #162, #163 Defendants' Notices of Offer of Judgment to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 10/19/2021. (CAW)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment by Erich Hummel (Glass, Michael) Modified text on 10/14/2021. (AEP) Modified on 10/21/2021 - STRICKEN, per Court Order, doc. 164. (AEP)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment to Plaintiff by Julie Jones (Glass, Michael) Modified text on 10/14/2021. (AEP) Modified on 10/21/2021 - STRICKEN, per Court Order, doc. 164. (AEP)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment to Plaintiff by David Allen (Glass, Michael) Modified text on 10/14/2021. (AEP) Modified on 10/21/2021 - STRICKEN, per Court Order, doc. 164. (AEP)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment to Plaintiff by Maurice Radford (Glass, Michael) Modified text on 10/14/2021. (AEP) Modified on 10/21/2021 - STRICKEN, per Court Order, doc. 164. (AEP)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment to Plaintiff by Robert E. Smith, Jr (Glass, Michael) Modified text on 10/14/2021. (AEP) Modified on 10/21/2021 - STRICKEN, per Court Order, doc. 164. (AEP)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment to Plaintiff by Thomas Reimers (Glass, Michael) Modified text on 10/14/2021. (AEP) Modified on 10/21/2021 - STRICKEN, per Court Order, doc. 164. (AEP)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment to Plaintiff by Timothy Whalen (Glass, Michael) Modified text on 10/14/2021. (AEP) Modified on 10/21/2021 - STRICKEN, per Court Order, doc. 164. (AEP)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 RESPONSE in Opposition re #155 MOTION for Protective Order and/or Motion to Quash filed by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Weil, Stephen)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION for Protective Order and/or Motion to Quash by Centurion of Florida, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Subpoena to FDC, #2 Exhibit Proposed Subpoena to CMA)(Hanson, Jacob) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 SECOND CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. The following settings and deadlines shall apply: Fact Discovery due by 1/7/2022; Expert Discovery due by 3/18/2022; Dispositive motions due by 4/22/2022; Pretrial statement due by 9/14/2022; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 10/3/2022 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/21/2021. (AMP)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines and Trial Continuance to the extent the Court will enter an amended Case Management and Scheduling Order in consideration of the parties' requested dates as the Court's calendar permits. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 9/14/2021. (CAW)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and for Extension of Deadlines and Trial Continuance by All Plaintiffs. (Weil, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition re #149 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weil, Stephen)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 RESPONSE in Opposition re #147 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Tanesha Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, Kayla McCarter, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Alex Renelus, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Hanson, Jacob)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Tanesha Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, Kayla McCarter, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Alex Renelus, L. Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Declaration of Rory Griffin, #2 Exhibit "B" - Proposed ESI Protocol, #3 Exhibit "C" - June 4, 2021 Email)(Wahl, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying #138 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 8/18/2021. (CAW)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION to Compel Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Weil, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 RESPONSE to Motion re #139 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Confess Judgment and Pay Funds into Court Registry filed by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Wilkison, Jesse)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #137 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 7/9/2021. (CAW)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #123 Amended Complaint by David Allen.(Glass, Michael)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #123 Amended Complaint by Maurice Radford.(Glass, Michael)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #123 Amended Complaint by Timothy Whalen.(Glass, Michael)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #123 Amended Complaint by Thomas Reimers.(Glass, Michael)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 RESPONSE in Opposition re #138 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :reply in support of ECF 132 filed by Tanesha Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, Kayla McCarter, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Alex Renelus, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Wahl, Brian)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to Confess Judgment and Pay Funds into Court Registry by Centurion of Florida, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wahl, Brian)
June 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :reply in support of ECF 132 by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply)(Weil, Stephen)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MOTION for James William Manuel to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-18339669 for $150 by Tanesha Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, Kayla McCarter, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Alex Renelus, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - Certificate of Good Standing)(Wahl, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 RESPONSE in Opposition re #132 MOTION to Strike #127 Answer to amended complaint and/or Motion to Compel filed by Tanesha Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, Kayla McCarter, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Alex Renelus, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Wahl, Brian)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #123 Amended Complaint by Robert E. Smith, Jr.(Glass, Michael)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #123 Amended Complaint by Julie Jones.(Glass, Michael)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #123 Amended Complaint by Erich Hummel.(Glass, Michael)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION to Strike #127 Answer to amended complaint and/or Motion to Compel by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Centurion Defendants Answers To Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Correspondence Re: Amended Answer)(Wilkison, Jesse) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Protective Order with exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 5/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(KLC)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #126 the Centurion Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 5/10/2021. (KLC)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #123 Amended Complaint by Tabitha Mahoney.(Hurley, Claire)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #123 Amended Complaint by Sharon Cooper.(Hurley, Claire)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #123 Amended Complaint by Tanesha Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, Kayla McCarter, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Alex Renelus, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor.(Wahl, Brian)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Tanesha Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, Kayla McCarter, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Alex Renelus, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wahl, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying without prejudice #114 the Centurion Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 4/27/2021. (KLC)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon re #114 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PROTECTIVE ORDER (Wilkison, Jesse)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tanesha Adkins, David Allen, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Sharon Cooper, Marinette Gonzalez, Erich Hummel, Julie Jones, Tabitha Mahoney, Clarissa Moody, Elizabeth Morton, Gerardo Pedroza, Maurice Radford, Thomas Reimers, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Robert E. Smith, Jr, Tamara Taylor, Timothy Whalen, Alex Renelus, Kayla McCarter with Jury Demand. Terminating S. Jackson, LPN A.R., LPN C.S., A. Mason, K. McCarther, NURSE [SIGNATURE], K. Nielson, Nurse L.C., B. Purvis, J. Quintino, Nikki Richardson, L. Roberts, M. Roth, C. Smith, L. Swanson, L. Brown and A. Harvey filed by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Sarah McCrimmon, Caron Dettmann, #12 Amended Complaint filed by Sarah McCrimmon, Caron Dettmann.(AEJ)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER denying without prejudice #97 Centurion's Motion for Reconsideration; denying #106 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment; granting #109 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend and directing the Clerk to docket [109-1] the proposed amended complaint as Plaintiffs' second amended complaint; directing Defendants to answer the second amended complaint within twenty days; directing Plaintiffs to respond to #114 Centurion's motion for protective order. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 4/14/2021. (KLC)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. The following settings and deadlines now apply: Fact Discovery due by 9/13/2021; Dispositive motions due by 1/13/2022; Pretrial statement due by 6/15/2022; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 7/5/2022 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 4/12/2021. (AMP)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 REPLY to Response to Motion re #109 MOTION to Amend #12 Amended Complaint filed by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence re: Meet and Confer, #2 Exhibit Excerpt of Sarah McCrimmon Deposition, #3 Exhibit Centurion Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs, #4 Exhibit Centurion Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs)(Wilkison, Jesse)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #118 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Their Motion to File an Amended Complaint; reply of no more than 8 pages due by 4/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 4/2/2021. (CAW)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion for Leave to File Reply In Support of Motion to File Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Weil, Stephen)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #112 Motion for Extension of Deadlines and Trial Continuance to the extent the Court will enter an amended Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 3/31/2021. (CAW)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RESPONSE in Opposition re #109 MOTION to Amend #12 Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, E. Morton, G. Pedroza, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Hanson, Jacob)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM in support re #97 Motion for Reconsideration / Clarification filed by Centurion of Florida, LLC. (Hanson, Jacob)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, E. Morton, G. Pedroza, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Proposed Protective Order)(Wahl, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #110 Defendant Centurion of Florida's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply; reply of no more than 6 pages due by 3/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/11/2021. (CAW)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION to Continue TRIAL AND EXTEND DEADLINES by All Plaintiffs. (Wilkison, Jesse)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #99 Centurion Defendants' Motion for Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 3/10/2021. (CAW)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File Reply and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Centurion of Florida, LLC. (Hanson, Jacob)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Amend #12 Amended Complaint by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Plaintiffs' Proposed Second Amended Complaint))(Weil, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re #97 MOTION for Reconsideration re #95 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Wilkison, Jesse)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Defendants ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #12 Amended Complaint by Maurice Radford.(Glass, Michael)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MOTION for Default Judgment against Maurice Radford by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Weil, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEDIATION report Hearing held on 03.03.2021. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Stoler, Robert)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #103 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Reconsideration; response to #97 Motion due by 3/9/2021. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 3/3/2021. (CAW)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by All Plaintiffs. (Wilkison, Jesse) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #12 Amended Complaint by Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, E. Morton, G. Pedroza, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor.(Wahl, Brian)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 3/03/2021 9:30 a.m. before Robert M. Stoler. (Wilkison, Jesse)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #12 Amended Complaint by T. Mahoney.(Hurley, Claire)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION for Molly Mitchell Walker to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17919401 for $150 by Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, E. Morton, G. Pedroza, L. Roberts, David Rodriguez, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - Certificate of Good Standing)(Wahl, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #96 Unopposed Motion to Change Selection of Mediator; appointing Robert M. Stoler as mediator; Terrance Schmidt is relieved of all further responsibility. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 2/19/2021. (CAW)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION for Reconsideration re #95 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Centurion of Florida, LLC. (Hanson, Jacob)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Unopposed Motion to Change Selection of Mediator by All Plaintiffs. (Wilkison, Jesse)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #63 the Centurion Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; granting #64 Defendant Cooper's Motion to Dismiss; granting #68 Defendants Brown, Purvis, and Swanson's Motion to Dismiss; directing Defendants Centurion, Sharma, Gonzalez, Rodriguez, Pedroza, Morton, Mahoney, P. Roberts, and Taylor to answer the amended complaint within twenty days; directing Plaintiffs to notify the Court by March 8, 2021, whether they intend to proceed against Defendant Radford; see Order for details. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 2/8/2021. (KLC)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire R. Hurley on behalf of S. Cooper (Hurley, Claire)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Craig Mayfield on behalf of T. Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, A. Harvey, S. Jackson, LPN A.R., A. Mason, K. McCarther, C. Moody, E. Morton, K. Nielson, Nurse L.C., G. Pedroza, J. Quintino, Nikki Richardson, L. Roberts, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, M. Roth, Rakesh Sharma, C. Smith, Tamara Taylor (Mayfield, Robert)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 SUGGESTION of Death of Defendant Nikki Richardson by Centurion of Florida, LLC. (Hanson, Jacob)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel for Defendant Tabatha Mahoney. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 12/1/2020. (CAW)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney by T. Mahoney. (Hanson, Jacob) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #88 Amended Motion to Withdraw; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 11/23/2020. (CAW)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Amended MOTION for Eliot B. Peace to Withdraw as Attorney by T. Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, A. Harvey, S. Jackson, LPN A.R., T. Mahoney, A. Mason, K. McCarther, C. Moody, E. Morton, K. Nielson, Nurse L.C., G. Pedroza, J. Quintino, Nikki Richardson, L. Roberts, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, M. Roth, Rakesh Sharma, C. Smith, Tamara Taylor. (Hanson, Jacob) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER striking #84 counsel's Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 10/28/2020. (CAW)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Appointing Terrance E. Schmidt, Esq. as mediator in this action. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 10/26/2020. (AMP)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying #75 Defendants' Joint Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 10/27/2020. (KLC)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for Eliot B. Peace to Withdraw as Attorney by T. Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, A. Harvey, S. Jackson, LPN A.R., LPN C.S., T. Mahoney, A. Mason, K. McCarther, C. Moody, E. Morton, K. Nielson, Nurse L.C., G. Pedroza, J. Quintino, Nikki Richardson, L. Roberts, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, M. Roth, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Peace, Eliot) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. Modified on 10/29/2020 - STRICKEN, per Court Order, doc. 87. (AEJ)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Brandon Hanson on behalf of T. Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, A. Harvey, S. Jackson, LPN A.R., A. Mason, K. McCarther, C. Moody, E. Morton, K. Nielson, Nurse L.C., G. Pedroza, J. Quintino, Nikki Richardson, L. Roberts, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, M. Roth, Rakesh Sharma, C. Smith, Tamara Taylor (Hanson, Jacob)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Terrance Edward Schmidt as mediator by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Wilkison, Jesse)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 HIPAA qualified protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 9/18/2020. (KLC)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 9/18/2020. (KLC)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weil, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Plaintiffs' Sealed Application for Order Approving Division of Attorney Fees and Contingent Fee; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 8/17/2020. (KLC) Modified security on 8/18/2020. (AEJ)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Sealed Document. S-77. (KKH)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadlines and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Weil, Stephen)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadlines and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by T. Adkins, L. Brown, Centurion of Florida, LLC, S. Cooper, Marinette Gonzalez, A. Harvey, S. Jackson, LPN A.R., LPN C.S., T. Mahoney, A. Mason, K. McCarther, C. Moody, E. Morton, K. Nielson, Nurse L.C., G. Pedroza, B. Purvis, J. Quintino, Nikki Richardson, L. Roberts, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, M. Roth, Rakesh Sharma, L. Swanson, Tamara Taylor. (Peace, Eliot)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint by Robert E. Smith, Jr.(Eza, Paul)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #71 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion Instanter to Exceed Page Limit; accepting as filed #72 Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 7/22/2020. (CAW)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re #68 MOTION to Dismiss Counts against Defendants in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint , #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law filed by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Weil, Stephen)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages by All Plaintiffs. (Weil, Stephen)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER striking #69 Defendant Cooper's Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 7/14/2020. (CAW)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE by S. Cooper Initial Disclosures (Furman, Chelsea) Modified on 7/14/2020 - STRICKEN, per Court Order, doc. 70. (AEJ)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss Counts against Defendants in Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by L. Brown, B. Purvis, L. Swanson. (Murphy, Niels)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #66 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiffs' responses to #63, #64 Motions to Dismiss are due by 7/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 7/7/2020. (CAW)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Grady, Sarah)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE to counsel Chelsea L. Furman of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AEJ)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum of Law by S. Cooper. (Postman, Barry)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by T. Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, A. Harvey, S. Jackson, LPN A.R., LPN C.S., T. Mahoney, A. Mason, K. McCarther, C. Moody, E. Morton, K. Nielson, Nurse L.C., G. Pedroza, J. Quintino, Nikki Richardson, L. Roberts, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, M. Roth, Rakesh Sharma, Tamara Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Peace, Eliot)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Defendants Brown, Purvis, and Swanson's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint; Defendants Brown, Purvis, and Swanson's response is due by 7/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 6/19/2020. (CAW)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by L. Brown, B. Purvis, L. Swanson. (Murphy, Niels) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 RETURN of service executed on 6/12/20 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to C. Smith. (Wilkison, Jesse)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by LPN C.S.. (Postman, Barry)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Wilkison, Jesse)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Centurion of Florida, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Centene Corporation for Centurion of Florida, LLC.. (Peace, Eliot)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RETURN of service executed on 6/10/10 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to L. Swanson. (Wilkison, Jesse)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Niels P. Murphy on behalf of L. Brown, B. Purvis, L. Swanson (Murphy, Niels)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Alexander Wahl on behalf of S. Jackson (Wahl, Brian)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Eliot Bradford Peace on behalf of S. Jackson (Peace, Eliot)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RETURN of service executed on 6/2/2020 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to S. Jackson. (Wilkison, Jesse)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RETURN of service executed on 6/3/2020 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to L. Brown. (Wilkison, Jesse)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/29/2020 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to S. Cooper. (Grady, Sarah)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (AEJ)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediator selection due by 10/19/2020; Fact Discovery due by 3/12/2021; Conduct mediation hearing by 3/15/2021; Expert discovery due by 6/1/2021; Dispositive motions due by 6/30/2021; Pretrial statement due by 11/10/2021; Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis; Jury Trial set for trial term commencing on 12/6/2021 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Mediation Report Form, #2 Docket Sheets)(AMP)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Alexander Wahl on behalf of T. Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, A. Harvey, LPN A.R., LPN C.S., T. Mahoney, A. Mason, K. McCarther, C. Moody, E. Morton, NURSE [SIGNATURE], K. Nielson, Nurse L.C., G. Pedroza, J. Quintino, Nikki Richardson, L. Roberts, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, M. Roth, Rakesh Sharma, C. Smith, Tamara Taylor (Wahl, Brian)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Eliot Bradford Peace on behalf of T. Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, A. Harvey, LPN A.R., LPN C.S., T. Mahoney, A. Mason, K. McCarther, C. Moody, E. Morton, NURSE [SIGNATURE], K. Nielson, Nurse L.C., G. Pedroza, J. Quintino, Nikki Richardson, L. Roberts, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, M. Roth, Rakesh Sharma, C. Smith, Tamara Taylor (Peace, Eliot)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Grady, Sarah)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants to the extent that Plaintiffs shall serve all Defendants and provide the Court with certification of service by 6/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 5/18/2020. (CAW)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Service on Defendants (Unopposed) by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Grady, Sarah) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/24/2020 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to Nikki Richardson. (Grady, Sarah)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/24/2020 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to Nurse L.C.. (Grady, Sarah)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 WAIVER of service returned executed on 5/1/2020 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to Robert E. Smith, Jr. (Grady, Sarah)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/29/2020 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to B. Purvis. (Grady, Sarah)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/24/2020 by Caron Dettmann as to L. Roberts. (Grady, Sarah)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/24/2020 by Caron Dettmann as to G. Pedroza. (Grady, Sarah)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #32 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants; Plaintiffs shall serve all Defendants and provide the Court with certification of service by 5/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 4/30/2020. (CAW)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/24/2020 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to Tamara Taylor. (Grady, Sarah)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/24/2020 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to NURSE [SIGNATURE]. (Grady, Sarah)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 WAIVER of service returned executed on 4/24/2020 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to T. Adkins, Centurion of Florida, LLC, Marinette Gonzalez, A. Harvey, T. Mahoney, A. Mason, K. McCarther, C. Moody, E. Morton, K. Nielson, J. Quintino, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, M. Roth, Rakesh Sharma. (Grady, Sarah) Modified on 4/28/2020 - also waived: Alex Renelus (not a listed defendant) and Tamara Taylor. (AEJ)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Service on Defendants by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Grady, Sarah) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #12 Amended Complaint by Thomas Reimers.(Glass, Michael)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Report Form, #2 Consent Letter and Form)(CKS)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RETURN of service executed on 3/26/20 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to Maurice Radford. (Wilkison, Jesse)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #12 Amended Complaint by Timothy Whalen.(Glass, Michael)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #12 Amended Complaint by Erich Hummel.(Glass, Michael)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 David Allen's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #12 Amended Complaint by David Allen.(Glass, Michael)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Defendant Julie Jones ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #12 Amended Complaint by Julie Jones.(Glass, Michael)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting [S-18] Plaintiffs' Sealed Motion to file their Application for Order Approving Division of Attorney Fees and Contingent Fee under seal. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 3/25/2020. (KLC) (Modified on 3/25/2020 to edit security settings)(SJW).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RETURN of service executed on 3/5/20 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to Julie Jones. (Wilkison, Jesse)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RETURN of service executed on 3/9/20 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to Erich Hummel. (Wilkison, Jesse)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RETURN of service executed on 3/14/20 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to Timothy Whalen. (Wilkison, Jesse)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on 3/11/20 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to David Allen. (Wilkison, Jesse)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on 3/10/20 by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon as to Thomas Reimers. (Wilkison, Jesse)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Sealed Document. S-18 (PAM)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 APPEARANCE of non-resident counsel and designation of local counsel by Arthur R. Loevy on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Local Counsel: no. Non-Resident Counsel: yes. (Loevy, Arthur)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 APPEARANCE of non-resident counsel and designation of local counsel by Sarah Grady on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Local Counsel: no. Non-Resident Counsel: yes. (Grady, Sarah)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS issued as to NURSE [SIGNATURE]. (AEJ)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS issued as to T. Adkins, David Allen, L. Brown, Centurion of Florida, LLC, S. Cooper, Marinette Gonzalez, A. Harvey, Erich Hummel, S. Jackson, Julie Jones, LPN A.R., LPN C.S., T. Mahoney, A. Mason, K. McCarther, C. Moody, E. Morton, K. Nielson, Nurse L.C., G. Pedroza, B. Purvis, J. Quintino, Maurice Radford, Thomas Reimers, Nikki Richardson, L. Roberts, Priscilla Roberts, David Rodriguez, M. Roth, Rakesh Sharma, C. Smith, Robert E. Smith, Jr, L. Swanson, Tamara Taylor, Timothy Whalen. (AEJ)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs' Motion for Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice. Sarah Grady, Steve Weil, and Arthur Loevy are permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs with Jesse B. Wilkinson and the law firm of Sheppard, White, Kachergus & DeMaggio, P.A. as local counsel. Ms. Grady, Mr. Weil, and Mr. Loevy shall expeditiously ensure mandatory registration with the Court's electronic case filing (ECF) system, if they have not already done so.Signed by Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt on 2/10/2020. (MDC)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Sarah Grady, appearing on behalf of Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032576.) Related document: #11 MOTION for Sarah Grady, Steve Weil and Arthur Loevy to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Arthur Loevy, appearing on behalf of Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032577.) Related document: #11 MOTION for Sarah Grady, Steve Weil and Arthur Loevy to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Stephen Weil, appearing on behalf of Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon (Filing fee $150 receipt number JAX032578.) Related document: #11 MOTION for Sarah Grady, Steve Weil and Arthur Loevy to appear pro hac vice. (AFC)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Wilkison, Jesse)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Sarah Grady, Steve Weil and Arthur Loevy to appear pro hac vice by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certificates of Good Standing)(Wilkison, Jesse) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt.
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STRIKING #1 Complaint. No later than February 3, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint consistent with the directives of this Order. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 1/17/2020. (AMP)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Caron Dettmann. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Proposed Summons, #15 Proposed Summons, #16 Proposed Summons, #17 Proposed Summons, #18 Proposed Summons, #19 Proposed Summons, #20 Proposed Summons, #21 Proposed Summons, #22 Proposed Summons, #23 Proposed Summons, #24 Proposed Summons, #25 Proposed Summons, #26 Proposed Summons, #27 Proposed Summons, #28 Proposed Summons, #29 Proposed Summons, #30 Proposed Summons, #31 Proposed Summons, #32 Proposed Summons, #33 Proposed Summons, #34 Proposed Summons, #35 Proposed Summons)(Wilkison, Jesse)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Wilkison, Jesse)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Wilkison, Jesse)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Wilkison, Jesse)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Wilkison, Jesse)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Wilkison, Jesse)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Wilkison, Jesse)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:20-cv-36-J-39JRK. (SJB)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16363657) filed by Caron Dettmann, Sarah McCrimmon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilkison, Jesse) Modified on 1/21/2020 - STRICKEN, per Court Order, doc. 10. (AEJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCrimmon et al v. Centurion of Florida, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. MCCARTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. SWANSON
Represented By: Jordan Janoski
Represented By: Niels P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamara Taylor
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Molly M. Walker
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Represented By: James William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Pedroza
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Whalen
Represented By: Christine Nicole Gargano
Represented By: Mark Edward Pionessa
Represented By: Michael Lee Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRISCILLA ROBERTS
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Represented By: James William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. NIELSON
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Reimers
Represented By: Christine Nicole Gargano
Represented By: Mark Edward Pionessa
Represented By: Michael Lee Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Allen
Represented By: Christine Nicole Gargano
Represented By: Mark Edward Pionessa
Represented By: Michael Lee Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. MAHONEY
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURION, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erich Hummel
Represented By: Christine Nicole Gargano
Represented By: Mark Edward Pionessa
Represented By: Michael Lee Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. MORTON
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. COOPER
Represented By: Barry A. Postman
Represented By: Chelsea L. Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Jones
Represented By: Christine Nicole Gargano
Represented By: Mark Edward Pionessa
Represented By: Michael Lee Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Jackson
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN A.R.
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Molly M. Walker
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Represented By: James William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAURICE RADFORD
Represented By: Michael Lee Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. ROBERTS
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Molly M. Walker
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT E. SMITH, JR.
Represented By: Michael Lee Glass
Represented By: Paul Michael Eza
Represented By: Christine Nicole Gargano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Harvey
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Brown
Represented By: Jordan Janoski
Represented By: Niels P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE L.C.
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAKESH SHARMA
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Molly M. Walker
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Represented By: James William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINETTE GONZALEZ
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Molly M. Walker
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Represented By: James William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. ADKINS
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. PURVIS
Represented By: Jordan Janoski
Represented By: Niels P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIKKI RICHARDSON
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. QUINTINO
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. ROTH
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE [SIGNATURE]
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. MASON
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Smith
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPN C.S.
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Barry A. Postman
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. MOODY
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Florida, LLC
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Molly M. Walker
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Represented By: James William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion Managed Care of Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. McCarther
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerardo Pedroza
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Molly M. Walker
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Represented By: James William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Cooper
Represented By: Barry A. Postman
Represented By: Claire R. Hurley
Represented By: Samuel J. Levine
Represented By: Chelsea L. Furman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanesha Adkins
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Represented By: James William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Morton
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Molly M. Walker
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Represented By: James William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarissa Moody
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Represented By: James William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabitha Mahoney
Represented By: Barry A. Postman
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Chelsea L. Furman
Represented By: Eliot Bradford Peace
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: Samuel J. Levine
Represented By: Claire R. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie L. Jones
Represented By: Michael Lee Glass
Represented By: Christine Nicole Gargano
Represented By: Mark Edward Pionessa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Renelus
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: James William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kayla McCarter
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Represented By: Jacob Brandon Hanson
Represented By: James William Manuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Cooper
Represented By: Brian Alexander Wahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caron Dettmann
Represented By: Jesse B. Wilkison
Represented By: Elizabeth Louise White
Represented By: Sarah Grady
Represented By: Camille Elizabeth Sheppard
Represented By: William J. Sheppard
Represented By: Bryan E. DeMaggio
Represented By: Matthew R. Kachergus
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah McCrimmon
Represented By: Jesse B. Wilkison
Represented By: Elizabeth Louise White
Represented By: Sarah Grady
Represented By: Camille Elizabeth Sheppard
Represented By: William J. Sheppard
Represented By: Bryan E. DeMaggio
Represented By: Matthew R. Kachergus
Represented By: Stephen H. Weil
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?