Rothenberg v. Knight Swift Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Rothenberg
Defendant: Knight Swift Transportation, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation and Target Corporation
Case Number: 3:2021cv01213
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Henry Lee Adams
Referring Judge: Laura Lothman Lambert
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROOF of Service Redux by Aaron Rothenberg (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2)(BGR)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying Requests for Default as Moot. Because defendants Costco and Wal-Mart have now filed responsive pleadings, plaintiff's requests for default, #12 and #13, are denied as moot. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 2/1/2022. (KAS)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Ziegler, Allison)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Ziegler, Allison)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Clerk's Default against Costco Wholesale Corporation filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Jakab, Kevin)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Jakab, Kevin)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Wal-Mart Stores Inc. by Aaron Rothenberg. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Mailing Envelope)(BGR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert.
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST for Entry of Default as to Costco Wholesale Corporation by Aaron Rothenberg. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Mailing Envelope)(BGR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. (BGR)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROOF of Service and Original Summons by Aaron Rothenberg (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BGR)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Hard Drive Containing Body Cam Footage by Aaron Rothenberg. (Hard drive received and filed separately.) (BGR)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Strike filed by Aaron Rothenberg. (BGR)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Aaron Rothenberg. (KEM)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Motion to Strike by Target Corporation. (Stokes, Joseph)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:21-cv-1213-HLA-LLL. Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey no longer assigned to the case. (SJW)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of recusal. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 12/13/2021. (AJS)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Knight Swift Transportation. (Sausaman, Alison)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation, Knight Swift Transportation, Target Corporation, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. filed by Aaron Rothenberg.(KEM)(Originally filed in State Court 11/8/2021)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Henry Lee Adams, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. New case number: 3:21-cv-1213-HLA-JBT. (SJB)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Duval County Circuit Court, case number 2021-CA-5937 filed in State Court on 11/05/2021. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19008091 filed by Knight Swift Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 State Court COMPLAINT, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 State Court Other Documents, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sausaman, Alison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothenberg v. Knight Swift Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Rothenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Swift Transportation
Represented By: Alison H. Sausaman
Represented By: Hunter Winston Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Beth Ziegler
Represented By: Todd T. Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Kevin Edward Jakab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Amanda N. Rumker
Represented By: Joseph B. Stokes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?