Anderson v. Groveland Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Geoffrey H. Anderson
Defendant: Groveland Police Department, John Moore, Charles W. Russell, John Flynn, Andy Auld, Scott Penvose, Terry Neal, Brad King, Gary S. Borders and Lake County Jail
Case Number: 5:2015cv00026
Filed: January 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ocala Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Philip R. Lammens
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER denying as moot 139 Plaintiff's Motion to appoint counsel and granting 140 Plaintiff's Motion for transcripts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 12/12/2016. (CAB)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 127 Plaintiff's Motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis and vacating 136 the Report and Recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 11/22/2016. (CAB)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 127 MOTION for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 11/21/2016. (CAB)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER: Defendant Sheriff Gary S. Border's Motion for Entry of Judgment 124 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to enter final judgment in favor of Defendants Sheriff Gary S. Borders, John Moore, and Charles W. Russell, and against Plaintiff Geoffrey H. Anderson. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 10/27/2016. (LN)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER: Defendant Sheriff Gary S. Border's Motion for Summary Judgment 83 is GRANTED. Defendants Officer John Moore, Officer Charles Russell, and Officer Scott Penvose's Motion for Summary Judgment 110 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as described herein. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 8/16/2016. (LN)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying 113 Plaintiff's Motion for Replacement of Assigned Judges and Motion for Change of Venue. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/26/2016. (LN)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 106 is DENIED. Officer John Moore, Officer Charles Russell, and Officer Scott Penvose's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions 108 is DENIED. Plaintiff's request for sanctions 107 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/25/2016. (LN)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER: Magistrate Judge Lammens's order awarding sanctions against Plaintiff in the amount of $337.37 95 is AFFIRMED. Plaintiff's Motion for Stay of Proceedings to Enforce Judgment and Motion for Reconsideration 100 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/9/2016. (LN)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 97 Plaintiff's Motion to extend time. Plaintiff may file a dispositive motion on or before June 22, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 5/31/2016. (CAB)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying as moot 77 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; the named Officers, on or before May 31, 2016, shall update all of their responses as set forth in this Order. The Officer's Motion to Compel 79 is granted; on or before May 31, 2016 Plaintiff shall respond to the Officers' discovery requests as set forth in this Order and the Officers may file a dispositive motion on or before June 22, 2016. Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 90 is denied. Plaintiff is directed to pay Sheriff Borders's counsel, John Green, attorney's fees and costs as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 5/19/2016. (CAB)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 71 Defendant Gary S. Border's second Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/22/2016. (CAB)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER: Lake County's Motion to Dismiss 53 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to terminate Lake County as a Defendant in this case. The City of Groveland (the "City"), Officer John Moore, Officer Charles Russell, Officer John "Flinn" (Flynn), Officer Andy Auld, and Officer Scott Penvose's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint with Prejudice 56 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Counts I, IV, VIII, X, XI, XIII are DISMISSED with p rejudice. Counts II, III, V, VII, and IX will proceed. Officer John Moore, Officer Charles Russell, and Officer Scott Penvose shall file an answer to the remaining claims (Counts II, III, and IX) of Plaintiff's complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff's request for sanctions against counsel for the Officer Defendants (Doc. 64 at 8) is DENIED. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 3/8/2016. (LN)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER terminating as moot 65 Defendant's first Motion to Compel and deferring ruling on 71 Defendant's second Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is directed to respond to Defendant's second motion to compel on or before March 21, 2016. See the Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/3/2016. (CAB)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Lake County's Corrected Motion to Dismiss 25 is GRANTED. The City of Groveland, Officer John Moore, Officer Charles Russell, Officer John "Flinn" (Flynn), Officer Any Auld, and Officer Scott Penvose's Motion to Dis miss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint with Prejudice 22 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Sheriff Gary S. Borders's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint 23 is GRANTED. Count III is the only count of the amended complaint that is not dismissed. The following claims of Plaintiff's amended complaint are dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Counts I, II, IV, V, VII, VIII, IX, X, XI, and XIII. The following claims are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE: Counts VI and XII. Plaintiff's req uest to add a claim for negligence against Sheriff Borders and Lake County is DENIED. Plaintiff's claims for punitive damages against Sheriff Borders, the City, and Lake County are STRICKEN. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, P laintiff may file a second amended complaint correcting the deficiencies noted above, if possible, as to Counts I, II, IV, V, VII, VIII, IX, X, XI, and XIII. If Plaintiff does not file a second amended complaint within thirty (30) days, this case wi ll proceed as to Count III only and Officers Moore and Russell shall file an answer to Count III of the amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the expiration of Plaintiff's deadline for filing a second amended complaint. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 11/2/2015. (LN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Groveland Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey H. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groveland Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Auld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Penvose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary S. Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?