Taser International, Inc. v. Phazzer Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Taser International, Inc.
Defendant: Phazzer Electronics, Inc, Steven Abboud, Phazzer Global LLC, Sang Min International Co., Ltd., Double Dragon Development and Trading Corporation, Phazzer Electronics, Inc. and Phazzer IP, LLC
Petitioner: Diana Robinson, Adam R. Stephenson and Steve Abboud
Case Number: 6:2016cv00366
Filed: March 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Orlando Office
County: Osceola
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
2 Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER re #404 Notice (Other) filed by Taser International, Inc. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #2 Exhibit Notice to Appear, #3 Exhibit Notice to Appear)(MDH)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. of Filing Amended Notices to Appear (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Petersen, Pamela)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER to strike #401 Notice filed by Taser International, Inc. On or before September 1, 2020, the Plaintiff shall file amended proposed Notices to Appear that are consistent with Florida Rule of Civil Procedure Form 1.914(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/25/2020. (MDH)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 402 SUMMONS issued as to Steven Abboud, Phazzer Global LLC, Phazzer IP, LLC. (ARJ)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 401 (STRICKEN BY #403 ORDER) NOTICE of Filing Notices to Appear by Taser International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Petersen, Pamela) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ARJ). Modified on 8/26/2020 (RDO).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Supplemental COMPLAINT against Steven Abboud, Phazzer Global LLC, Phazzer IP, LLC filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Steven Abboud, #2 Proposed Summons Phazzer IP, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Phazzer Global LLC)(Petersen, Pamela) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ARJ).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 OBJECTION re #398 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document . (Davidow, Joseph)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER granting #376 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint. See Order for deadlines and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 8/10/2020. (MDH)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 397 NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. of Second Bankruptcy Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Petersen, Pamela)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #357 Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Phazzer Electronics, Inc., Steven Abboud, and Diana Robinson Should Not be Held in Criminal Contempt. A notice and order requiring Phazzer Electronics, Inc., Steven Abboud, and Diana Robinson to SHOW CAUSE why they should not be punished for criminal contempt will be filed separately as a new cause of action. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/11/2020. (SCM)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER overruling #371 Objection; denying #373 Motion for Recusal; denying in part and deferring in part #374 Motion for Reconsideration and Renewed Application for Stay; overruling #375 Objection. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/11/2020. (SCM)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 394 PRO PER NOTICE regarding Issuance of Reexamination Certificate for US Patent by Diana Robinson (RDO)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 393 SUGGESTION of of Bankruptcy by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Luna, Justin)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 392 CORRECTED RESPONSE in Opposition re #376 MOTION for leave to file Judgment Creditor's Proceedings Supplemental Complaint CORRECTED filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph) Modified on 1/14/2020 (RDO).
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 391 RESPONSE in Opposition re #376 MOTION for leave to file Judgment Creditor's Proceedings Supplemental Complaint filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 390 NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. of Bankruptcy Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Petersen, Pamela)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 389 NOTICE regarding Taser's Admission of PTAB Holding of invalidity of all 262 Patent Claims by Diana Robinson (RDO)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 388 Pro Per NOTICE Regarding Automatic Bankruptcy Stay by Steve Abboud. (MEJ) (Corrected filed date) Modified on 11/21/2019 (LDJ).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 Pro Per NOTICE Regarding Issuance of US Design Patent No.D866,702 by Steve Abboud. (MEJ) (Corrected filed date) Modified on 11/21/2019 (LDJ).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 Pro Per NOTICE Regarding Automatic Bankruptcy Stay filed by Diana Robinson. (MEJ) (Corrected filed date) Modified on 11/21/2019 (LDJ).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Pro Per NOTICE Regarding Issuance of US Design Patent No.D866,702 filed by Diana Robinson. (MEJ) (Corrected filed date) Modified on 11/21/2019 (LDJ).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 384 SUPPLEMENTAL PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re 382 Order no pdf filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Petersen, Pamela) Modified on 11/20/2019 (RDO).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 383 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in support re 382 Order no pdf filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph) Modified on 11/20/2019 (RDO).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ENDORSED ORDER directing supplemental briefing. Plaintiff Taser International Inc., and Defendant Phazzer Electronics, Inc., are directed to advise the Court whether the #378 Suggestion of Bankruptcy moots any of the pending motions [357, 373, 374, 376]. Responses are not to exceed ten (10) pages and are due on November 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/5/2019. (SCM)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 381 RESPONSE to Motion re #373 MOTION to Recuse Judge Byron filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Petersen, Pamela)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 380 RESPONSE to Motion re #374 MOTION for Reconsideration or Clarify Permanent Injunction Order and Damages Order with Renewed Stay Application filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Petersen, Pamela)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 379 RESPONSE re #375 Objection re AMEX Subpoena filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Petersen, Pamela)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 378 SUGGESTION of Bankruptcy by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice Of Chp 7 Bankruptcy Case Filing)(Davidow, Joseph) Modified on 10/28/2019 (RDO).
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 377 RESPONSE re #371 Appeal of magistrate judge ruling to district court filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Petersen, Pamela)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MOTION for leave to file Judgment Creditor's Proceedings Supplemental Complaint by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Proceedings Supplemental Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Oden)(Santurri, Ryan)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 375 OBJECTION re #372 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationOrder on motion for clarificationOrder on Motion to Quash . (Davidow, Joseph)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 374 MOTION for Reconsideration or Clarify #183 Permanent Injunction Order and #267 Damages Order with Renewed Stay Application by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion To Reconsider-Clarify, #2 Exhibit B to Motion To Reconsider-Clarify)(Davidow, Joseph) Modified on 10/18/2019 (RDO).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MOTION to Recuse Judge Byron by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion To Recuse)(Davidow, Joseph) Modified on 10/18/2019 (RDO).
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting #337 Motion for Clarification; granting in part and denying in part #339 Motion to Quash. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 10/15/2019. (MDH)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 371 OBJECTION/APPEAL of Magistrate Judge ruling to District Court by Diana Robinson re #362 Order on Motion for Reconsideration (RDO)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 NOTICE regarding US Patent No. 7,444,939 assignments by Diana Robinson (RDO)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ENDORSED ORDER denying #367 Motion to Strike; denying #367 Motion to Stay; denying #368 Motion to Strike; denying #368 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff Taser properly filed a reply after receiving leave from the Court to do so 364. Furthermore, the Court finds that the parties have not stated an adequate basis for staying the action. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/8/2019. (SCM)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MOTION to Strike #366 Reply to Response to Motion, MOTION to stay Motion to Show Cause by Diana Robinson. (RDO) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 367 MOTION to Strike #366 Reply to Response to Motion, MOTION to stay Motion to Show Cause by Steve Abboud. (RDO) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 REPLY to Response to Motion re #357 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Order to Show Cause Why Phazzer Electronics, Inc., Steven Abboud, and Diana Robinson Should Not Be Held in Criminal Contempt filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Petersen, Pamela)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 RESPONSE to #363 MOTION for leave to file Consolidated Reply to Responses to Order to Show Cause filed by Diana Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RDO)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ENDORSED ORDER granting #363 Motion for Leave to File Consolidated Reply. Defendant shall file a reply not to exceed seven pages on or by Friday, October 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/30/2019. (SCM)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MOTION for leave to file Consolidated Reply to Responses to Order to Show Cause by Taser International, Inc.. (Petersen, Pamela)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER denying #342 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 9/27/2019. (MDH)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 361 NOTICE of Errata by Steve Abboud re #360 Response to motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RDO)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 RESPONSE to #357 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Order to Show Cause Why Phazzer Electronics, Inc., Steven Abboud, and Diana Robinson Should Not Be Held in Criminal Contempt filed by Steve Abboud. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D part 1, #5 Exhibit D part 2, #6 Exhibit D part 3, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(RDO)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 359 RESPONSE to #357 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Order to Show Cause Why Phazzer Electronics, Inc., Steven Abboud, and Diana Robinson Should Not Be Held in Criminal Contempt filed by Diana Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G part 1, #8 Exhibit G part 2, #9 Exhibit G part 3, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(RDO)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 358 RESPONSE in Opposition re #357 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Order to Show Cause Why Phazzer Electronics, Inc., Steven Abboud, and Diana Robinson Should Not Be Held in Criminal Contempt filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 357 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Order to Show Cause Why Phazzer Electronics, Inc., Steven Abboud, and Diana Robinson Should Not Be Held in Criminal Contempt by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Santurri, Ryan)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 MANDATE of USCA as to #282 Notice of appeal filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 08/30/19 USCA number: 2018-2059. AFFIRMED. (JP)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 MANDATE of USCA as to #269 Notice of appeal filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 08/30/19 USCA number: 2018-1914. AFFIRMED. (JP)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MANDATE of USCA as to #283 Notice of appeal filed by Steve Abboud Issued as Mandate: 08/29/19 USCA number: 2018-2057. DISMISSED. (JP)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MANDATE of USCA as to #343 Notice of appeal filed by Diana Robinson Issued as Mandate: 08/27/19 USCA number: 19-2115. DISMISSED. (JP)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER of USCA as to Notice of appeal filed by Steve Abboud. EOD: 08/23/19; USCA number: 18-1914. See Order for details. (JP)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 JUDGMENT from USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #269 Notice of appeal filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. EOD: 07/23/19; USCA number: 18-1914. AFFIRMED. (JP)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 JUDGMENT from USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #282 Notice of appeal filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. EOD: 07/23/19; USCA number: 18-2059. AFFIRMED. (JP)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 JUDGMENT from USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #283 Notice of appeal filed by Steve Abboud. EOD: 07/23/19; USCA number: 18-2057. DISMISSED. (JP)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 OPINION of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #283 Notice of appeal filed by Steve Abboud. EOD: 07/23/19; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 18-2057. DISMISSED. (JP)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 RESPONSE in Opposition re #339 Amended MOTION to quash Subpoena to AMEX and renewed objection filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Santurri, Ryan)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 RESPONSE in Opposition re #342 MOTION for Reconsideration re #340 Order on Motion to Quash filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Notice of Appeal package submitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit via email re #343 Notice of Appeal. (JP)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 NOTICE of compliance with #341 Order dated June 28, 2019 by Taser International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oden, Jon) Modified on 7/2/2019 (RDO).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ENTERED IN ERROR.
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #340 Order on Motion to Quash by Diana Robinson. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ORL083684. (JP)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MOTION for Reconsideration re #340 Order on Motion to Quash by Diana Robinson. (RDO)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER re #337 Motion for clarification and #339 Amended Motion to Quash Subpoena. American Express's response to the Subpoena (Doc. 339 at 15-20) is STAYED pending the Court's ruling on the Motions (Docs. 337; 339). See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/28/2019. (MDH)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #323 Motion to Quash; denying without prejudice #324 Motion to Quash. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/28/2019. (MDH)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Amended MOTION to quash Subpoena to AMEX and renewed objection by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 338 CERTIFICATE of compliance re #337 MOTION for Reconsideration re 334 Order on Motion to Quash and Objection to Non-party Subpoena MOTION for clarification re 334 Order on Motion to Quash by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MOTION for Reconsideration re 334 Order on Motion to Quash and Objection to Non-party Subpoena, MOTION for clarification re 334 Order on Motion to Quash by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER denying #335 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/25/2019. (MDH)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MOTION for Reconsideration re #332 Order to strike by Diana Robinson. (RDO) Text modified on 6/25/2019 (RDO).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ENDORSED ORDER denying #333 Motion to Quash. The motion does not comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/25/2019. (MDH)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MOTION to quash non-party subpoena to American Express by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1Exhibit A)(Davidow, Joseph) Modified on 6/25/2019 (RDO).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER to strike #329 Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Quash. The Plaintiff's motion to strike the reply (Doc. 330) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/24/2019. (MDH)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:16-cv-366-Orl-40LRH. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #330 MOTION to Strike #329 REPLY to MOTION to quash Taking Deposition Duces Tecum of Diana Robinson, #329 REPLY to MOTION to quash Taking Deposition Duces Tecum, #324 RENEWED MOTION to quash Taking Deposition Duces Tecum , #323 MOTION to quash Taking Deposition Duces Tecum. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (MAA)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MOTION to Strike #329 REPLY to MOTION to quash Taking Deposition Duces Tecum of Diana Robinson by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 (STRICKEN BY #332 ORDER) REPLY to MOTION to quash Taking Deposition Duces Tecum by Diana Robinson. (RDO) Modified on 6/24/2019 (RDO). Modified on 6/25/2019 (RDO).
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 RESPONSE to Motion re #324 RENEWED MOTION to quash Taking Deposition Duces Tecum , #323 MOTION to quash Taking Deposition Duces Tecum filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Petersen, Pamela)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #325 Motion to Quash. The deposition scheduled for June 12, 2019 is CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/11/2019. (MDH)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 RESPONSE to #325 Motion to Quash filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Abboud, #2 Exhibit B - Kirk French Depo Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Jeffrey Thacker Depo Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D - Deirdra French Depo Excerpts)(Santurri, Ryan) Modified on 6/11/2019 (RDO).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 RENEWED MOTION to quash 2nd AM Notice Of Taking Deposition by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davidow, Joseph) Modified on 6/10/2019 (RDO).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 RENEWED MOTION to quash Taking Deposition Duces Tecum by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davidow, Joseph) Modified on 6/10/2019 (RDO).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MOTION to quash Taking Deposition Duces Tecum by Diana Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RDO)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER denying without prejudice #320 Motion to Quash; denying without prejudice #321 Motion to Quash. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 6/6/2019. (MKH)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MOTION to quash Subpoena Duces Tecum for Deposition to Diana Wiggs by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MOTION to quash Subpoena for Deposition to Steven Abboud and Phazzer Global, Inc. by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER DENYING without prejudice (312-1) RENEWED THIRD MOTION seeking Issuance of Post Judgment Writs of Garnishment filed by Taser International, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/25/2019. (RDO)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #317 Motion to Compel production of documents due to failure to comply with Local Rule 3.04. This rule requires the movant to quote the discovery requests and the responses thereto in the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/17/2019. (Spaulding, Karla)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 SECOND MOTION to Compel, for Sanctions and combined supporting Memorandum of Law by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Oden, Jon) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 1/17/2019 (RDO).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 316 MANDATE of USCA as to #192 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. Issued as Mandate: 01/11/19 USCA number: 17-2637. (JP)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER denying without prejudice #314 Second Motion to Compel Deposition of Steven Michael Abboud and for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/10/2019. (ECJ)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Second MOTION to Compel Deposition Duces Tecum by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Oden, Jon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 1/10/2019 (RDO).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER denying as moot #312 Motion to Seal Ex Parte Application seeking the issuance of Post-Judgment Writs of Garnishment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/4/2019. (RDO)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MOTION for leave to file under seal by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Judgment Creditor's Renewed Third Ex Parte Motion Seeking Issuance of Post Judgment Writs of Garnishment Filed Under Seal and Combined Legal Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Composite Exhibit F)(Oden, Jon)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #309 Motion to Compel appearance at a deposition. The Court requires counsel and unrepresented parties to speak to each other, in person or by telephone, in a good faith effort to resolve most motions, including all discovery disputes. Corresponding by email or otherwise does not satisfy the requirements of Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/3/2019. (Spaulding, Karla)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #308 Motion to Compel discovery. The Court requires counsel and unrepresented parties to speak to each other, in person or by telephone, in a good faith effort to resolve most motions, including all discovery disputes. Corresponding by email or otherwise does not satisfy the requirements of Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/3/2019. (Spaulding, Karla)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 MOTION to Compel Deposition Duces Tecum by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Oden, Jon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 1/4/2019 (RDO).
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Oden, Jon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 1/4/2019 (RDO).
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 301 JUDGMENT from USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #192 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. EOD: 10/26/18; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 17-2637. AFFIRMED (JP)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 OPINION/ORDER of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to #192 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. EOD: 10/26/18; Mandate to issue at a later date. USCA number: 17-2637. AFFIRMED (JP)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #297 Motion Seeking to Commence Proceedings Supplemental to Judgment and Combined Memorandum of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/5/2018. (ECJ)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 298 RESPONSE in Opposition re #297 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Judgment Creditor's Motion Seeking To Commence Proceedings Supplemental to Judgment and Combined Memorandum of Law filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Judgment Creditor's Motion Seeking To Commence Proceedings Supplemental to Judgment and Combined Memorandum of Law by Taser International, Inc.. (Oden, Jon)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 296 WRIT of Execution issued. (RDO) (Original mailed to counsel on 9/19/2018) (RDO).
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ENDORSED ORDER granting #294 Motion for clarification. If the writ submitted is in the proper form, the Clerk of Court is directed to issue it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/4/2018. (Spaulding, Karla)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 294 MOTION for clarification re #293 Order and Combined Supporting Memorandum of Law by Taser International, Inc.. (Oden, Jon) Modified on 9/4/2018 (RDO).
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting in part #289 Motion for Issuance of Writ of Execution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/16/2018. (RDO)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER to Strike re: #290 Notice of Taking Deposition in Aid of Execution filed by Taser International, Inc., #291 Notice of Taking Deposition in Aid of Execution filed by Taser International, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/3/2018. (ECJ)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 291 (STRICKEN BY #292 ORDER) NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum in Aid of Execution (Oden, Jon) Modified on 8/6/2018 (RDO).
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 290 (STRICKEN BY #292 ORDER) NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum in Aid of Execution (Oden, Jon) Modified on 8/6/2018 (RDO).
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 289 MOTION for Writ of Execution by Taser International, Inc.. (Oden, Jon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #287 Motion for Writ of Execution because it not supported by a memorandum of law supporting the relief sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/1/2018. (Spaulding, Karla)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 287 MOTION for Writ of Execution by Taser International, Inc.. (Oden, Jon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Marshall Oden on behalf of Taser International, Inc. (Oden, Jon)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number ORL074362 re #282 Notice of appeal filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. (JP)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER denying #278 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/7/2018. (ALJ)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 284 NOTICE (of Appeal) forwarded from U.S. Court of Appeals by Steve Abboud, see #283 Notice of appeal for originally docketed Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Letter from USCA)(ALL)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Notice of Appeal package submitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit via emails re #282 Notice of Appeal and #283 Notice of Appeal. (ALL)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #271 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Steve Abboud. Filing fee paid $505, receipt #ORL074122. (ALL)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #271 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. Filing fee not paid. (Davidow, Joseph)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number ORL074122 re #283 Notice of appeal filed by Stephen Abboud. (RCN) Modified on 6/5/2018 (ALL).
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 281 RESPONSE in Opposition re #278 MOTION for Reconsideration Of Default Judgment In A Civil Case filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Petersen, Pamela)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 280 RESPONSE re #279 Response by Phazzer Electronics to the Order to Show Cause filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 279 RESPONSE re 274 Order to show cause by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MOTION for Reconsideration Of Default Judgment In A Civil Case by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #276 motion for discovery. Plaintiff should follow the applicable federal and state procedures for discovery in aid of execution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 5/16/2018. (Spaulding, Karla)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 276 MOTION for Discovery in Aid of Execution and to Engage in Other Actions Necessary to Enforce Final Judgment by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Default Judgment) (RDO)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Show Cause Response due by 5/25/2018 (RDO)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ENDORSED Order to Show Cause: Defendant Phazzer Electronics, Inc. shall show cause as to why a shipment of infringing products in violation of the permanent injunction at Doc. 183--intended to be exported to the Kenya Probation Department--which are being held by the US Customs and Border Protection in Houston, should not be seized pursuant to 22 U.S.C. 401. Written response due on or before May 25, 2018. Failure to timely respond will result in the forfeiture of the infringing products without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/11/2018. (MMW)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 273 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff Taser International, Inc. against Phazzer Electronics, Inc. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RDO)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ENDORSED ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to enter default judgment in favor of Plaintiff Taser International, Inc. and against Phazzer Electronics, Inc. in the amount of $7,869,578.74 and thereafter close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/10/2018. (ALJ) Modified on 5/10/2018 (GNB).
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #202 Motion for Contempt. The Court holds Defendant Phazzer Electronics, Inc. and Mr. Stephen Abboud in CIVIL CONTEMPT. No further sanctions are issued at this time. However, Defendant Phazzer Electronics, Inc., and all of its officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys are NOTIFIED by way of this Order that any continued violations of this Court's injunction will result in the initiation of criminal contempt proceedings. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/4/2018. (ALJ)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number ORL073287 re #269 Notice of appeal filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. (ALL)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 270 FILED IN ERROR (ALL).
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Notice of Appeal package submitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit via email re #269 Notice of Appeal. (ALL)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #267 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. Filing fee not paid. (Davidow, Joseph)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 268 SUPPLEMENT re #202 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Contempt and Request for Expedited Relief by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2-02-18 Fed Cir. Order Deny MStay, #2 Exhibit B - 4-19-18 Fed Cir. Order Denying MStay, #3 Exhibit C - 4-18-19 TASER Fed. Cir. Op to MStay, #4 Exhibit D - Email)(Santurri, Ryan)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #255 Motion for Leave to File Response to Motion for Damages; granting #242 Motion for Damages and Reasonable Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/4/2018. (ALJ) Text modified on 4/4/2018 (RDO).
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER denying #210 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/21/2018. (ALJ)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 RESPONSE re #264 Notice to take judicial notice filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
January 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 SECOND REQUEST for the Courts to take judicial notice regarding Plaintiff Taser's Explanation Of Amended Drawing by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davidow, Joseph) Modified on 1/16/2018 (RDO).
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ENDORSED ORDER denying #261 Motion to Vacate #261 Second MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 12/12/2017. (MMW)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 262 CERTIFICATE of compliance Supplemental Certificate Under Local Rule 3.01(G) by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Second MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE to the Courts to take judicial notice regarding US Patent & Trademark Office Ex Parte Reexamination Communication by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Davidow, Joseph)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 259 RESPONSE in Opposition re #255 MOTION for leave to file Response to #242 Motion for Damages filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Petersen, Pamela)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ENDORSED ORDER granting #254 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Benjamin Lee Bedrava and Andrew Scott Rapacke withdraw. Defendant is represented by other counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/21/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #235 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/21/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 256 SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE of compliance Under Rule 3.01(G) by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph) Text modified on 11/22/2017 (RDO).
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MOTION for leave to file Response to #242 Motion for Damages by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Davidow, Joseph) Modified on 11/21/2017 (RDO).
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 254 SECOND RENEWED MOTION for Andrew S. Rapacke and Benjamin Lee Bedrava to withdraw as attorney by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rapacke, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 11/21/2017 (RDO).
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ENDORSED ORDER re #252 Motion for Clarification. Defendant's Motion to Stay or Alternatively Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Damages #250 was denied in its entirety. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/20/2017. (MMW)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MOTION for clarification of Court's 251 Order by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph) Modified on 11/20/2017 (RDO).
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ENDORSED ORDER denying #248 Motion for Relief from Judgment; denying #250 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/17/2017. (MMW)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION to stay or Alternatively Extend Tim To Respond To Plaintiff's #242 Motion For Damages by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph) Modified on 11/17/2017 (RDO).
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 249 SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE Under Rule 3.01(G) by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph) Text modified on 11/17/2017 (RDO).
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION for relief from judgment by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kirk French Affidavit)(Davidow, Joseph)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #240 Motion to Strike closing statement filed by Defendant. The District Judge who presided over the hearing will be able to determine the extent to which the information filed by Defendant is credible and whether it violated the Court's instructions regarding presentation of evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/14/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 246 RESPONSE in Opposition re #240 MOTION to Strike #238 Notice (Other) Phazzer Contempt "Closing" and New Declaration of Kirk French filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Davidow, Joseph)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A. Davidow on behalf of Phazzer Electronics, Inc. (Davidow, Joseph) Text modified on 11/14/2017 (RDO).
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ENDORSED ORDER vacating the order at Doc. No. 243 as improvidently granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/7/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 243 (VACATED AT 244) - ENDORSED ORDER granting #240 Motion to Strike #238 Notice (Other) as unopposed. The Court required a response to the motion to be filed by November 13, 2017. As of the writing of this Order, no response has been filed. Therefore, the Clerk of Court is directed to strike the documents filed at docket number 238 and 238-1.Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/7/2017. (Spaulding, Karla) Modified on 11/7/2017 (MAA).
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/reset deadlines as to #240 MOTION to Strike #238 Notice (Other) Phazzer Contempt "Closing" and New Declaration of Kirk French. Responses due by 11/13/2017 (RDO)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 242 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Damages, Reasonable Fees, and Costs by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Davis Decl., #2 Exhibit B - Sankey Decl., #3 Exhibit C - Klint Decl., #4 Exhibit D - Santurri Dec., #5 Exhibit E -Petersen Decl., #6 Exhibit F - Bill of Costs and backup)(Santurri, Ryan)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER re #240 MOTION to Strike #238 Notice (Other) Phazzer Contempt "Closing" and New Declaration of Kirk French filed by Taser International, Inc. It is ORDERED that counsel for Defendant shall file a response to the motion to strike on or before November 13, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/2/2017. (ECJ)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MOTION to Strike #238 Notice (Other) Phazzer Contempt "Closing" and New Declaration of Kirk French by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE by Steve Abboud re #202 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Contempt and Request for Expedited Relief of Filing Closing Statement (Rhodes, Spencer)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. re #202 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Contempt and Request for Expedited Relief of Filing Closing Statement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kirk French)(Rapacke, Andrew)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. re #202 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Contempt and Request for Expedited Relief -- of Filing Closing Statement in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Requested Corrective Statement)(Santurri, Ryan)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE by Adam R. Stephenson of Filing Closing Statement regarding #202 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Contempt and Request for Expedited Relief. (RDO)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 RENEWED MOTION for Andrew S. Rapacke and Benjamin Lee Bedrava to withdraw as attorney and Request for In Camera Ex Parte Hearing by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Rapacke, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 10/25/2017 (RDO).
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 234 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT, Doc. 233. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Koretta Stanford. (KS)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 TRANSCRIPT of Show Cause Hearing held on 10/12/17 before Judge Paul G. Byron. Court Reporter/Transcriber Koretta Stanford, stanarm2014@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 11/13/2017, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/24/2017, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2018. (KS)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 232 Exhibit List (Show Cause Hearing) by Adam R. Stephenson. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2017: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (GNB).
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Exhibit List (Show Cause Hearing) by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. (GNB) copies e-mailed (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2017: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9) (GNB). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2017: #8 Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9) (GNB).
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Exhibit List (Show Cause Hearing) by Taser International, Inc.(GNB) copies e-mailed (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2017: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17 Part 1, #19 Exhibit 17 Part 2, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31, #35 Exhibit 32, #36 Exhibit 33, #37 Exhibit 34, #38 Exhibit 35, #39 Exhibit 39) (GNB).
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Byron: SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 10/12/2017. Court Reporter: Koretta Stanford (GNB) copies e-mailed
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 NOTICE of LIMITED Appearance by Spencer Rhodes on behalf of Steve Abboud (Rhodes, Spencer)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Lee Bedrava on behalf of Phazzer Electronics, Inc. (Bedrava, Benjamin)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER denying #221 Steven Abboud's Motion for Partial Relief from the Court's Order granting Taser International, Inc.'s Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 10/11/2017. (JRJ)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 225 RESPONSE to #202 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Contempt and Request for Expedited Relief filed by Steve Abboud. (Doc. not signed) (RDO)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 224 RESPONSE in Opposition re #202 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Contempt and Request for Expedited Relief filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Kirk French, #2 Exhibit Phazzer Invoice, #3 Exhibit Statement of Jake Brainard)(Rapacke, Andrew)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #222 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Under the Local Rules of this Court, a corporation can only appear and be heard through counsel of record. The motion can be renewed at such time as substitute counsel, who is a member of the bar of this Court, enters an appearance on behalf of Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/29/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MOTION for Andrew S. Rapacke to withdraw as attorney by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Rapacke, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MOTION to Amend/Correct 213 MOTION for for partial relief from Order 183 under rule 60 (b) by Steve Abboud. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(JP)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ENDORSED ORDER granting #214 Motion to Strike CM/ECF pages 4 through 24 of Document No. 210-1. To the extent possible, the Clerk of Court is directed to delete these pages from CM/ECF, retaining only CM/ECF pages 1 through 3 in CM/ECF as Document No 210-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/29/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ENDORSED ORDER granting #217 Motion to Strike 213 MOTION for miscellaneous relief. The Clerk of Court is directed to delete document number 213 from CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/29/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ENDORSED ORDER granting #215 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #205 Order pdf. Defendant's response must be filed with the Clerk of Court on or before October 2, 2017. No other deadlines are extended by this Order, including the deadline to provide exhibit lists. It is unlikely that this deadline will be further extended. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/29/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Unopposed MOTION to Strike 213 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Andrew Rapacke)(Rapacke, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 216 RESPONSE to Motion re #202 (per #205 order) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Contempt and Request for Expedited Relief filed by Adam R. Stephenson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(JP) Modified on 9/29/2017 (MAA).
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MOTION to extend time to respond to Plaintiff's #202 Motion for Contempt until October 2, 2017. by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Rapacke, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 9/29/2017 (JP)&(MAA).
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MOTION to Strike #210 MOTION for Reconsideration re #183 Order on motion to dismissOrder on Motion for Sanctions by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Andrew Rapacke)(Rapacke, Andrew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 213 (STRICKEN AND DELETED PER #219 ENDORSED ORDER) MOTION for Partial Relief from Order 183 under Rule 60(b) by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (JP) Modified on 10/2/2017 (RDO).
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ENDORSED ORDER granting #209 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to #205 Order pdf. Mr. Abboud's response must be filed with the Clerk of Court on or before October 2, 2017. (Merely mailing the response by October 2, 2017 is insufficient.) No other deadlines are extended by this Order, including the deadline to provide exhibit lists. It is unlikely that this deadline will be further extended. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/28/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER of USCA as to #192 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. EOD: 9/27/2017; USCA number: 17-13684-D. The appeal is transferred, sua sponte, to the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. (JEV)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION for Reconsideration re #183 Order on motion to dismissOrder on Motion for Sanctions by Steve Abboud. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F Part 1, #8 Exhibit F Part 2, #9 Exhibit F Part 3, #10 Exhibit F Part 4, #11 Exhibit F Part 5, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I Part 1, #15 Exhibit I Part 2)(JP) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2017: #16 Exhibit 1) (RDO).
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #205 Order pdf by Steve Abboud. (JP) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ENDORSED ORDER granting #207 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Damages and Sanction Briefing. Plaintiff's brief is due on or before November 2, 2017. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/22/2017. (ALJ)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Extend Deadline for Damages and Sanctions Briefing (pursuant to Doc. 188) by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 NOTICE of Rescheduling Hearing re: #202 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Contempt and Request for Expedited Relief. Show Cause Hearing is rescheduled for 10/12/2017 at 9:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4B before Judge Paul G. Byron, U.S. District Court, 401 West Central Blvd, Orlando, Florida. (GNB) copies e-mailed
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER re #202 Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt. Defendant Phazzer and Messrs. Abboud and Stephenson are directed to file their response to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt, on or before September 28, 2017. This matter is SET for a HEARING on October 11, 2017, before the undersigned in Courtroom 4B, at which Defendants shall show cause why they should not be held in civil contempt for failing to comply with the requirements of the Court's Order for Permanent Injunction. On or before October 5, 2017, the parties, including Messrs. Abboud and Stephenson, shall exchange all exhibits they intend to rely upon at the hearing. The failure to provide the opposing party with an exhibit shall result in its exclusion from consideration by the Court.Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/20/2017. (ALJ)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MEMORANDUM for fees awarded in #203 Order on Motion to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ryan T. Santurri)(Santurri, Ryan) Modified on 9/21/2017 (RDO).
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER denying #199 Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Plaintiff's request for sanction consisting of an award of attorney's fees is granted. Plaintiff shall submit a memorandum setting forth its amount of fees incurred in responding to Defendant's motion to stay without fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/15/2017. (ALJ)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order TRANSMITTAL to USCA forwarding copy of #201 Order re #192 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. USCA number: 17-13684-D. (RDO)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Contempt and Request for Expedited Relief) by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 9/15/2017 (RDO).
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER AND DIRECTION TO THE CLERK. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Robert Creager, Esq., as counsel for Defendant. The Clerk of Court is also directed to provide a copy of this Order to the Clerk of Court for the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit for consideration in Case Number 17-13684-D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 9/14/2017. (ECJ)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #199 Motion to stay and Request for Sanctions filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Santurri, Ryan)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION to stay #183 Order Pending Appeal by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Rapacke, Andrew) Text modified on 8/31/2017 (RDO).
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. of Action by U.S. Patent & Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPTO Reexamination 8/9/17)(Rapacke, Andrew) Text modified on 8/31/2017 (RDO).
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Scott Rapacke on behalf of Phazzer Electronics, Inc. (Rapacke, Andrew)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER denying without prejudice #194 Motion for Order to Show Cause. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/21/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 195 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #194 MOTION for Expedited Order to Show Cause to Phazzer and its Representatives for Interfering with Third-Party Subpoena Compliance) -- Certification Under 3.01(g) by Ryan Thomas Santurri on behalf of Taser International, Inc. (Santurri, Ryan)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MOTION for Expedited Order to Show Cause to Phazzer and its Representatives for Interfering with Third-Party Subpoena Compliance) by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Aegis, #2 Exhibit B - Email from Counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Mutual Nondisclosure & Confidentiality Agreement)(Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Text modified on 8/21/2017 (RDO).
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #192 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (JEV)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #183 Order on motion to dismiss Order on Motion for Sanctions by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. Filing fee not paid. (Creager, Robert)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order USCA appeal fees received $ 505 receipt number Orl-066091 re #192 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. (JEV)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ENDORSED ORDER granting #185 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William B. Pringle, III withdraws as counsel for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/9/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #189 motion for temporary permission to appear pro hac vice. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(d), Robert Creager, Esq., is temporarily admitted to appear in this case for a period not to exceed 30 days. Before expiration of the temporary admission, Attorney Creager must file a renewed motion for special admission that contains all of the information required by Local Rule 2.20(a), including the number of cases in which Attorney Creager has appeared in any court in Florida in the 365-days before the present motion was filed. The renewed motion must also be supported by a designation of and consent by local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/9/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 EMERGENCY MOTION for Robert B. Creager for Temporary Special Admission to Practice by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (RDO) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ENDORSED ORDER granting #187 Motion to conduct third-party discovery. The Court will permit Plaintiff to conduct third-party discovery for a period of 45 days from the date of this order. Within 14 days after the conclusion of that period, Plaintiff shall either file a motion for an award of damages, supported by evidence, or a motion asking the Court to establish another briefing schedule, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/3/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Third Party Discovery by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER denying as moot #184 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 7/27/2017. (ECJ)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Amended MOTION for William B. Pringle III to withdraw as attorney by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Pringle, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MOTION for William B. Pringle III to withdraw as attorney by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Pringle, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #174 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions. Based upon the Defendant's egregious conduct, which was undertaken in bad faith, the Court ORDERS the following sanctions: (1) the Court strikes Defendant's pending Motion to Dismiss #104; (2) the Court enters default judgment in favor of Taser and against Phazzer on all claims set forth in the Amended Complaint;(3) the Court awards compensatory damages in an amount to be determined in accordance with an expedited briefing and hearing schedule; (4) the Court will award treble damages for Defendant's willful infringement of the '262 patent; (5) the Court awards Taser International, Inc. its attorneys' fees and costs, in an amount to be determined in accordance with an expedited briefing and hearing schedule, and (6) the Court enters an immediate permanent injunction in accordance with the terms of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/21/2017. (ALJ)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ENDORSED ORDER granting #181 Motion to Expedite Consideration of Motion for Sanctions #174 in Light of Phazzer Dumping Infringing Products. The Court will turn its attention to the Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/20/2017. (MMW)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of #174 Motion for Sanctions in Light of Phazzer Dumping Infringing Products by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Sam Phillips)(Santurri, Ryan) Modified on 7/20/2017 (RDO).
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. of filing Exhibit E to #174 MOTION for sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E to Motion for Sanctions (Doc. 174))(Santurri, Ryan) Text modified on 7/13/2017 (RDO).
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #166 Motion to de-designate documents identified as confidential. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 7/11/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 RESPONSE in Opposition re #174 MOTION for sanctions to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Pringle, William)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Pringle, III on behalf of Phazzer Electronics, Inc. (Pringle, William)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ENDORSED ORDER granting #175 Motion to Vacate Current Case Deadlines Pending Resolution of Taser's Motion for Sanctions. The deadlines established in the Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order #91 are VACATED. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/7/2017. (MMW)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Vacate Current Case Deadlines Pending Resolution of TASER's Motion for Sanctions by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION for sanctions by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Santurri, Ryan)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER AND DIRECTION TO THE CLERK granting #163 Renewed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Attorney William Cleveland Acree, II terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/26/2017. (ECJ)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding: STATUS OF COUNSEL/MOTION HEARING held on 6/26/2017 re #163 MOTION for W. Cleveland Acree, II to withdraw as attorney (Renewed) filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. (DIGITAL) (ECJ)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 NOTICE by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. re #170 Order of Service (Acree, William)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER (And Direction to Clerk of Court) re #166 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to De-Designate Confidential Documents or Alternatively to File Phazzer Documents Under Seal filed by Taser International, Inc. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/23/2017. (ECJ) Modified on 6/23/2017 (ECJ).
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding status of counsel/motion hearing scheduled on June 26, 2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Attorney Petersen shall call five minutes before the scheduled hearing: 1-888-684-8852, Access Code 7105584, Security Code 062617 (ECJ) Modified on 6/23/2017 (ECJ).
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #167 Motion for Leave to Allow Telephone Appearance by Plaintiff's Out-of-State Counsel at June 26, 2017 Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/23/2017. (ECJ)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave to Allow Telephone Appearance by Plaintiff's Out-of-State Counsel at June 26, 2017 Hearing (Doc. 164) by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to De-Designate Confidential Documents or Alternatively to File Phazzer Documents Under Seal by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidentiality Agreement)(Santurri, Ryan)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. re #164 Order pdf of Service (Acree, William)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Amended Order and Notice of Hearing. See document for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/22/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MOTION for W. Cleveland Acree, II to withdraw as attorney (Renewed) by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Acree, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #161 Motion to Suspend further Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/21/2017. (RDO)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Suspend Further Depositions of Phazzer Representatives and Notice of Phazzer's Non-Compliance with Order (Doc. 152) by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Certificates/Declaration of non-attendance, #2 Exhibit B - Acree Notice of Termination of Legal Representation)(Santurri, Ryan)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. re #159 Order Setting Hearing of Service (Acree, William)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING (And Direction to the Clerk of Court). Status of Counsel Hearing set for 6/26/2017 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/20/2017. (ECJ)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Byron: TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL held on 6/19/2017. Court Reporter: Koretta Stanford (GNB)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER to strike re: #156 Notice of Termination of Legal Representation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/16/2017. (ECJ)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 (STRICKEN BY #157 ORDER) NOTICE by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. of Termination of Legal Representation (Acree, William) Modified on 6/19/2017 (RDO).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER denying without prejudice #153 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/15/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #146 Taser International, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Bring Functional Tasers to Court for Technology Tutorial. Counsel for Taser is DIRECTED to surrender the functional Taser weapon to a United States Deputy Marshal at the front entrance security checkpoint of the courthouse. The United States Deputy Marshal will maintain control of the functional Taser and demonstrate on a paper target, if requested by the Court. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/15/2017. (MMW)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION for W. Cleveland Acree, II to withdraw as attorney by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Acree, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER regarding discovery depositions and appearance at the Technology Tutorial. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/15/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER denying Defendant's request that the undersigned recommend that the litigation be stayed pending proposed settlement discussions. The timing of this request supports a finding that Defendant, through its counsel, is again attempting to delay the litigation and prevent Plaintiff from taking discovery necessary to establish its damages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/15/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/15/2017. (DIGITAL) (ECJ)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE regarding Telephone Conference scheduled for 6/15/2017 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Counsel shall call five (5) minutes before the scheduled hearing time: 1-888-684-8852; Access Code: 7105584; Security Code: 061517 (ECJ)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ENDORSED ORDER granting #147 Motion for a conference before the undersigned. The Court will hold a telephone conference at 9:30 a.m. on June 15, 2017. Counsel for the parties shall appear by telephone from landline rather than cellular telephones to ensure adequate reception. My courtroom deputy clerk will issue call-in instructions by separate docket entry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/14/2017. (Spaulding, Karla) Modified on 6/14/2017 (Spaulding, Karla).
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically judicial conference before Judge Spaulding by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Acree, William) Text modified on 6/14/2017 (RDO).
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Bring Functional TASERs to Court for Technology Tutorial (currently scheduled for 6/19/2017 at 9:30 a.m.) by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Technology Tutorial previously scheduled for 6/20/2017 is rescheduled for 6/19/2017 at 9:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4B before Judge Paul G. Byron, U.S. District Court, 401 West Central Blvd, Orlando, Florida. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Technology Tutorial previously scheduled for 6/16/2017 is rescheduled for 6/20/2017 at 9:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4B before Judge Paul G. Byron, U.S. District Court, 401 West Central Blvd, Orlando, Florida. (GNB) copies e-mailed
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding: Discovery Hearing held on 5/26/2017.. (DIGITAL) (ECJ)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 The Court required counsel for the parties to provide a chart with the availability of counsel of record and each proposed deponent during a specified time frame. Doc. No. 137. Counsel have provided the Court with a chart showing only the availability of counsel, which chart does not clearly reflect the availability of all counsel of record for Plaintiff on each date (availability of counsel will be presumed in the absence of a statement why an attorney of record is unavailable on a specific date). Counsel have not provided the Court with a chart identifying any deponents. Accordingly, it is ORDERED as follows: The Court will assume that there are no depositions to be scheduled unless, at or before the commencement of the hearing, counsel jointly provide the Court with a chart identifying each deponent each party wishes to depose. For each party, party representative or nonparty represented by an attorney of record to be deposed, counsel for the party or nonparty shall state in the chart the availability of each deponent (including party representatives) during the discovery period (with availability being presumed in the absence of a statement why a deponent is unavailable on a specific date). For each non-party deponent who is not represented by counsel for a party, counsel for the party requesting the deposition shall provide the non-party's availability after consultation with the nonparty. Sanctions may be imposed on any counsel or party who does not comply with the Court's orders. Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f)(1)(B), (C), 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 5/26/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ENDORSED ORDER denying #139 Emergency Motion to Stay. The Court has determined that this motion does not rise to the level of an emergency. Defendant is reminded that the unwarranted designation of a motion as an emergency may result in the imposition of sanctions pursuant to Local Rule 3.01(e). The Court does not require a response from Plaintiff on this matter. A review before the United States Patent and Trademark Office is insufficient to stay this case.. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/25/2017. (MMW)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ENDORSED ORDER requiring counsel for the parties to appear at the discovery conference scheduled for 1:30 p.m. on May 26, 2017, despite the pending motion to stay the litigation. It is further ORDERED that counsel shall promptly deliver to the chambers email address of the undersigned (flmd_Chambers_Spaulding@flmd.uscourts.gov) a copy of the spreadsheet or chart that I required be prepared in the Order and Notice of Hearing #137 and counsel shall bring a paper printout of the spreadsheet or chart to the hearing for the Court's review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 5/25/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Emergency MOTION to stay by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Acree, William)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 RESPONSE to Motion re #135 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Discovery Conference filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Acree, William)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER and NOTICE of hearing: Discovery Conference set for 5/26/2017 at 01:30 PM in Orlando Courtroom 5 D before Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Counsel for the parties shall attend the conference in person.(RDO)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #135 Motion for a discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 5/22/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Discovery Conference by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re #133 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to San Min International Co., Inc. filed by Taser International, Inc. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate pending motions (Docs. 76 and 107) and terminate Defendant San Min International Co., Ltd ONLY. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/17/2017. (MMW)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Sang Min International Co., Ltd. (Santurri, Ryan)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER re #131 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Double Dragon Development and Trading Corporation filed by Taser International, Inc. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate Double Dragon Development and Trading Corporation ONLY. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/15/2017. (MMW)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Double Dragon Development and Trading Corporation Only (Santurri, Ryan)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. of Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate for U.S. Patent 7,234,262 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Ex Parte Reexamination Certificate - U.S. Patent 7,234,262)(Santurri, Ryan)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. of Change of Corporate Name and Contact Information (Santurri, Ryan)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. of Firm Name Change (Santurri, Ryan)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 SUMMONS issued as to Double Dragon Development and Trading Corporation. (sent to Defendant via Fed Ex International) (RDO) Modified on 3/29/2017 (RDO).
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE in Opposition re #104 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Santurri, Ryan)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re #107 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Santurri, Ryan)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying without prejudice #101 Motion to Compel Defendant Sang Min's Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/22/2017. (LMM)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #101 MOTION to Compel Defendant Sang Min's Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories filed by Sang Min International Co., Ltd.. (Fifner, David)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER (And Direction to Clerk of Court) granting in part and denying in part #96 Motion for Service of Process Abroad. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/21/2017. (ECJ)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying #117 Motion to Quash Discovery or Protective Order as to Plaintiff's Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/21/2017. (ECJ)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #99 Third Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/21/2017. (ECJ)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying #116 Motion for Leave to File Sur Reply to Plaintiff's Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/21/2017. (ECJ)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ENDORSED ORDER denying #100 motion to stay discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/21/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MOTION to quash discovery or, MOTION for protective order as to Plaintiff's Discovery by Sang Min International Co., Ltd.. (Fifner, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION for leave to file Sur Reply to Plaintiff's Reply by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Acree, William)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 RESPONSE to Motion re #99 Third MOTION to Compel Documents filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Acree, William)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion re #96 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Plaintiff's Motion for Service of Process Abroad re Double Dragon Development and Trading Corporation filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #109 Emergency Motion for Protective Order. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Phazzer shall not proceed on March 17, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/16/2017. (LMM)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #94 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/16/2017. (ECJ)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #109 Motion for protective order filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email, #2 Exhibit B - Email, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Deposition)(Santurri, Ryan)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to respond to the emergency motion for a protective order on or before noon on March 16, 2017. The response shall attach the notice of deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/15/2017. (Spaulding, Karla)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Emergency MOTION for protective order by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Acree, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER re #96 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Plaintiff's Motion for Service of Process Abroad re Double Dragon Development and Trading Corporation filed by Taser International, Inc. It is ORDERED that, on or before March 17, 2017, Plaintiff shall file a reply brief responding to Phazzer's arguments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/10/2017. (ECJ) Modified on 3/13/2017 (ECJ).
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 AMENDED MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Sang Min International Co., Ltd.. (Fifner, David) Modified on 3/13/2017 (RDO).
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. of Filing Declaration of Brandon Womack re #98 Order on motion to compel, #94 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents , #100 RESPONSE to #72 Motion to Compel Documents with alternative Request for Stay (Attachments: #1 Main Document)(Acree, William) Modified on 3/13/2017 (RDO).
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RESPONSE to Motion re #96 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Plaintiff's Motion for Service of Process Abroad re Double Dragon Development and Trading Corporation filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Acree, William)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, or, alternatively, for More Definite Statement with Stay Application by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Acree, William) Modified on 3/13/2017 (RDO).
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER vacating #102 Order on Motion to Compel production of documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/9/2017. (ECJ)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 **VACATED PER #103 ORDER** ORDER granting #94 Motion to Compel production of documents. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/9/2017. (Spaulding, Karla) Modified on 3/9/2017 (LMM).
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION to Compel Defendant Sang Min's Production of Documents and Responses to Interrogatories by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- First Request for Production, #2 Exhibit B - First Set of Interrogatories)(Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 RESPONSE to #94 SECOND MOTION to Compel Documents with alternative Request for Stay filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Acree, William) Modified on 3/7/2017 (RDO). Modified on 3/9/2017 - see Order #103 (LMM).
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Third MOTION to Compel Documents by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #72 Motion to Compel Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 2/28/2017. (ECJ)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #57 Motion to supplement; denying as moot #73 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; denying as moot #20 motion to dismiss. The motions are rendered moot by the Amended Complaint #95. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/24/2017. (ALJ)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Plaintiff's Motion for Service of Process Abroad re Double Dragon Development and Trading Corporation by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Santurri, Ryan)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Double Dragon, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Santurri, Ryan)
February 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 SECOND MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 2/21/2017 (RDO).
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: (Pursuant to the Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order, Doc. No. 91) The Claim Construction hearing previously set for 3/24/2017 is rescheduled for 8/25/2017 at 9:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. (GNB) copies e-mailed
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: (Pursuant to the Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order, Doc. No. 91) The Technology Tutorial hearing previously scheduled for 3/3/2017 is rescheduled for 6/16/2017 at 9:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. (GNB) copies e-mailed
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Dispositive motions due by 10/13/2017, Pretrial statement due by 11/30/2017, All other motions due by 12/27/2017, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2018 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Jury Trial set for trial term beginning on 2/5/2018 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron., Conduct mediation hearing by 9/19/2017. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. (RDO)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/13/2017. (MMW)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Amended complaint due by 2/24/2017 (RDO)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ENDORSED ORDER granting #85 Joint Motion to Extend Case Deadlines and Amend the Pleading. Plaintiff shall filed it's Amended Complaint on or before February 24, 2017. And amended case management and scheduling order will follow. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 2/10/2017. (MMW)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEDIATION report Hearing held on February 8, 2017. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Santurri, Ryan)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Santurri, Ryan)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. Related to the Technology Tutorial Hearing (Santurri, Ryan)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Technology Tutorial Conference by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. re #62 Case management and scheduling order (Acree, William) Text modified on 2/1/2017 (RDO).
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 JOINT MOTION to extend Case Deadlines and Amend Pleadings by Taser International, Inc. and Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 1/31/2017 (RDO).
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: Technical Tutorial Hearing previously scheduled for 2/10/17 at 9:30 AM has been rescheduled to 3/3/2017 at 9:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. (GNB) copies e-mailed
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 DECLARATION of Raymond Yu re #73 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by Sang Min International Co., Ltd.. (Fifner, David)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #76 MOTION to stay case filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT re #62 Case management and scheduling order filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Acree, William) Modified on 1/23/2017 (RDO).
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SUPPLEMENT to #74 RESPONSE to #72 MOTION to Compel Documents Supplement filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Acree, William) Modified on 1/23/2017 (RDO).
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE by Taser International, Inc. of filing Claim Construction Statement. (Santurri, Ryan) Modified on 1/23/2017 (RDO).
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #77 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #73 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction ( Responses due by 2/7/2017); denying as moot #77 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/17/2017. (RDO)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #73 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or Alternative, MOTION to Strike #73 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION to stay case by Sang Min International Co., Ltd.. (Fifner, David)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ORDER re #72 MOTION to Compel Documents filed by Taser International, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 1/12/2017. (RDO)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RESPONSE to Motion re #72 MOTION to Compel Documents filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Acree, William)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by Sang Min International Co., Ltd.. (Fifner, David)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MOTION to Compel Documents by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/30/2017, Joinder of Parties due by 1/30/2017 (LMM)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ENDORSED ORDER granting #70 Motion to extend the deadline to move to add parties and amend pleadings. New deadline: January 30, 2017. Going forward, discovery disputes should be promptly presented to the Court and failure to do so will likely not constitute good cause to extend deadlines. This order shall not be cited or relied upon as a basis to extend other deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/23/2016. (Spaulding, Karla)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Extend Deadline to Amend Pleadings and Add Parties by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Santurri, Ryan)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER to strike re: 66 Notice of exparte filing filed by Taser International, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/19/2016. (RDO)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER to strike re: #65 Disclosure filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/19/2016. (RDO)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PROOF of service by Taser International, Inc. (Santurri, Ryan)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 (STRICKEN BY #68 ORDER) DISCLOSURE of Preliminary Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production filed by Phazzer by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Acree, William) Modified on 12/19/2016 (RDO). Modified on 12/19/2016 (RDO).
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 02/08/2017 @ 10:00 a.m. before Jay M. Cohen. (Santurri, Ryan)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/reset deadlines/hearings: (Pursuant to the Case Management and Scheduling Order, Doc. No. 62) Claim Construction Hearing is set for 3/24/2017 at 9:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. Technical Tutorial Hearing is set for 2/10/2017 at 9:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron. (NBL)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. Jay Cohen appointed as mediator. (RDO)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/30/2016, Discovery due by 4/27/2017, Dispositive motions due by 5/11/2017, Pretrial statement due by 7/25/2017, All other motions due by 8/1/2017, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2017 at 03:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron, Jury Trial set for trial term beginning on 9/5/2017 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 4 B before Judge Paul G. Byron., Conduct mediation hearing by 4/17/2017. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. (RDO)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/29/2016. (MMW)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. re #59 Case Management Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Acree, William)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #49 Motion for an Order directing service of process abroad. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/29/2016. (RDO)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Santurri, Ryan) Modified on 11/29/2016 (RDO).
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Supplemental to #49 Motion for Service of Process Abroad per #55 Order by Taser International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Santurri, Ryan) Modified on 11/23/2016 (LMM).
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SUPPLEMENT to #20 Motion to Dismiss With Alternative Request for Stay Given Patent Claim Rejections by PTO by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Acree, William) Modified on 11/16/2016 (RDO). Modified on 11/23/2016 (LMM).
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re #45 Case Management Report. The parties are DIRECTED to submit an amended Case Management Report on or before November 28, 2016. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/10/2016. (MMW)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re #49 Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Service of Process Abroad directing filing of a supplement to the motion on or before 11/22/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/8/16. (RDO)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Certified Mail returned as Undeliverable re: #31 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #14 Summons issued, #1 Complaint. Mail had been sent via certified mail (tracking #7014 2870 000 3068 1337). Envelope indicates the box is terminated. Mail not resent to Sang Min International Co. Ltd.. (RDO) (RDO).
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying as moot #44 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/3/2016. (MMW)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SUPPLEMENT to Opposition to #44 Amended MOTION to stay case pending examination (Supplemental) filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Santurri, Ryan) Text modified on 11/3/2016 (RDO).
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #48 Motion to extend time. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/24/16. (RDO)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION to extend time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Request filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Third MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Service of Process Abroad by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Santurri, Ryan)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to extend time to Respond to Plaintiff's Discovery Request by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Acree, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying without prejudice #40 Motion for Entry of an Order Directing Services of Process Abroad. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 10/5/2016. (RDO)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 Amended MOTION to stay case pending examination filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Santurri, Ryan)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Amended MOTION to stay case pending examination by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Acree, William)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #41 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/14/2016. (MMW)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of compliance with Local Rule 3.01(g) certification re #41 MOTION to stay case pending examination by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. (Acree, William) Modified on 9/14/2016 (RDO).
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to stay case pending examination by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Acree, William)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Entry of an Order Directing Service of Process Abroad by Taser International, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michael J. Roper terminated and Ryan T. Santurri added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 8/29/16. (RDO)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Gilchrist on behalf of Taser International, Inc. (Gilchrist, Brian)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Taser International, Inc.. (Roper, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Thomas Santurri on behalf of Taser International, Inc. (Santurri, Ryan)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 The service documents sent via Fed Ex to Defendant Sang Min International Co., Ltd. (#1 Complaint, Summons and #31 Order) have been sent back to the Clerk's Office with no other documents or notification as to whether the Defendant intends to respond. (RDO)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order SHIPPING FEES paid by Taser International, Inc. (Total shipping fee $30.64 - receipt number ORL055615) These fees cover the shipping fees to mail service forms, re #31 Order to the Defendant Sing Min International, a Chinese corporation. The docs. were sent via certified mail (tracking #7014 2870 0000 3068 1337) and Federal Express (tracking #7768 3149 7774). (RDO) Text modified on 8/2/2016 (RDO).
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part #32 Motion to extend Case Management Deadlines. The deadline for the Case Management Conference is extended up to and including 8/31/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 7/19/2016. (RDO)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Roper, Michael)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Case management report due by 8/31/2016 (RDO)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Joint MOTION to extend case management deadlines by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Acree, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 7/19/2016 (RDO).
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #15 Motion for an Order directing service of process abroad. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 7/14/2016. (RDO)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 7/13/2016. (RDO)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference by Taser International, Inc.. (Roper, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (IMPPROPER PDF ATTACHED. DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REFILED AT DOC. #29)Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference by Taser International, Inc.. (Roper, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding. Modified on 7/13/2016 (RDO).
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #21 Interested persons order by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Acree, William)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER to strike re: #22 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement filed by Phazzer Electronics, Inc. for failure to comply with the Interested Persons Order #21. Defendant is DIRECTED to refile their certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement and include the following certification: I hereby certify that, except as disclosed above, I am unaware of any actual or potential conflict of interest involving the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to this case, and will immediately notify the Court in writing on learning of any such conflict. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/11/2016. (MMW)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Responses due by 7/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 7/11/2016. (RDO)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Taser International, Inc.. (Roper, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Acree, William)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (STRICKEN BY 26 ORDER) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #21 Interested persons order by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Acree, William) Modified on 7/11/2016 (RDO).
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Defendant PHAZZER ELECTRONICS, INC. shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/28/2016. (NBL) copies e-mailed
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or alternatively for More Definite Statement and Redesignation as Track Three Case by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Acree, William) Modified on 6/29/2016 (RDO).
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond re #1 Complaint. Phazzer Electronics, Inc. answer or response due 6/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 6/14/2016. (RDO)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Acree, William) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 05/26/16 by Taser International, Inc. as to Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Roper, Michael)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (WRONG CODE USED. ATTORNEY NOTIFIED) PROOF of service by Taser International, Inc. (Roper, Michael) Modified on 6/2/2016 (RDO).
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Entry of Order Directing Service of Process Abroad by Taser International, Inc.. (Roper, Michael)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS issued as to Sang Min International Co., Ltd.. (RDO)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS issued as to Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (RDO)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Taser International, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Roper, Michael)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Taser International, Inc.. (Roper, Michael)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice as to D. Lawrence Letham; denying as moot #8 motion to appear pro hac vice as to Pamela B. Petersen; granting #9 motion to appear pro hac vice as to Pamela B. Petersen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 3/10/2016. (RDO)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Amended MOTION for Pamela B. Petersen to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Roper, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Pamela B. Petersen to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Roper, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for D. Lawrence Letham to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Roper, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney D. Lawrence Letham, appearing on behalf of Taser International, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL051785.) Related document: #7 MOTION for D. Lawrence Letham to appear pro hac vice. (RDO)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Pamela B. Petersen, appearing on behalf of Taser International, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL051786.) Related document: #9 Amended MOTION for Pamela B. Petersen to appear pro hac vice. (RDO)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/4/2016. (NBL) copies e-mailed
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/4/2016. (NBL) copies e-mailed
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel Pam Petersen of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (RDO)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel D. Lawrence Letham of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (RDO) Text modified on 3/2/2016 (RDO).
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (RDO)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 - receipt number ORL051558) filed by Taser International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taser International, Inc. v. Phazzer Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phazzer Electronics, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Abboud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phazzer Global LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sang Min International Co., Ltd.
Represented By: David Alan Fifner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double Dragon Development and Trading Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phazzer Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Scott Rapacke
Represented By: William B. Pringle, III
Represented By: William Cleveland Acree, II
Represented By: Benjamin Lee Bedrava
Represented By: Joseph A. Davidow
Represented By: Justin Luna
Represented By: Robert B. Creager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phazzer IP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taser International, Inc.
Represented By: Brian R. Gilchrist
Represented By: Michael J. Roper
Represented By: D. Lawrence Letham
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Santurri
Represented By: Pamela B. Petersen
Represented By: Jon Marshall Oden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Diana Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adam R. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steve Abboud
Represented By: Spencer Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?