Stanley v. MFREV Lofts at SODO, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Richard Stanley
Defendant: Stephanie Seginot, Trea 100 West Grant St. LLC, Melissa Brown and MFREV Lofts at SODO, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv01819
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Carlos E Mendoza
2 Judge: Thomas B Smith
3 Judge: Karla R Spaulding
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Mail returned as Undeliverable ("Refused") re: #17 Order dismissing case. Mail NOT resent to Richard Stanley. (SPM)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER dismissing case and directing the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/18/2018. (DJD)
December 17, 2018 Mail returned as Undeliverable ("Refused, unable to forward,") re: #15 Order. Mail NOT resent to Richard Stanley. (JET)
December 13, 2018 Mail returned as Undeliverable ("Not Deliverable as Addressed") re: #9 Interested persons order, #8 Related case order and track 2 notice. Mail NOT resent to Richard Stanley. (JET)
December 12, 2018 Filing 16 Amended NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Richard Stanley. Related case(s): yes (JET)
December 11, 2018 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 6 Case Assigned/Reassigned, #5 Order, #7 Order to show cause; also copies of #10 Notice of change of address, #13 Notice of pendency of related cases, #12 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement, #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report. Filer had sent copies and requested Receive stamped copies to be returned to him. All of this mail was returned marked, "Refused, RTS". (JET)
December 4, 2018 Set/reset deadline: Amended Complaint due by 12/17/2018 (JET)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency; denying #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #14 motion to amend/correct; granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Plaintiff shall have until December 17, 2018 in which to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff's Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Doc. 13) is STRICKEN. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 12/3/2018. (JP)
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint and MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re #1 Complaint by Richard Stanley. (JET)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 ***STRICKEN*** NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Richard Stanley. Related case(s): no (JET) Modified on 12/5/2018 (JET). STRICKEN PER ORDER #15 .
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Richard Stanley. (JET)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Richard Stanley. (JET)
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of change of address by Richard Stanley (JET)
November 21, 2018 Mail returned as Undeliverable ("Refused") re: 6 Case Assigned/Reassigned, #5 Order, #7 Order to show cause. Mail NOT resent to Richard Stanley. (JET)
November 21, 2018 Mail returned as Undeliverable (Refused) re: #5 Order, #3 Order pdf. Mail resent to Richard Stanley. (LMM)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/23/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/9/2018. (DJD) ctp
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/23/2018. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 11/9/2018. (DJD) ctp
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction as to Richard Stanley. Show Cause Response due by 11/26/2018. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/8/2018. (DJD)
November 7, 2018 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. New case number: 6:18-cv-1819-Orl-37TBS. Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith. (MAA)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to reassign this case to the Honorable Thomas B. Smith as the presiding Magistrate Judge, with his permission, for consideration with a related case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/7/2018. (ECJ)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Case Reassigned to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. New case number: 6:18-cv-1819-Orl-41KRS. Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (MAA)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court hereby orders this case to be transferred to U.S. District Judge Carlos E. Mendoza, with his consent, for consideration with Case No. 6:18-cv-1419-Orl-41TBS. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 11/6/2018. (JLC)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Richard Stanley. (LMM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Melissa Brown, MFREV Lofts at SODO, LLC, Stephanie Seginot, Trea 100 West Grant St. LLC with Jury Demand filed by Richard Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Part 1), #2 Exhibit (Part 2), #3 Exhibit (Part 3), #4 Exhibit (Part 4))(LMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. MFREV Lofts at SODO, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Seginot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trea 100 West Grant St. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MFREV Lofts at SODO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?