Soares Cardoso et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Aline Dameto and Gabriel Soares Cardoso
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna, Field Office Directo Kimberly D Dean, Christopher Wray, Matthew G. Whitaker, Kirstjen Nielsen, Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations, U.S. Attorney General, Director, Orlando Field Office, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services and Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 6:2018cv02161
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John Antoon
Referring Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 12/31/2018 by Gabriel Soares Cardoso, Aline Dameto as to Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Director, Orlando Field Office, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Executed Summons, #2 Executed Summons, #3 Executed Summons, #4 Executed Summons, #5 Executed Summons)(Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco)
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations, Director, Orlando Field Office, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JET)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Aline Dameto, Gabriel Soares Cardoso. (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related Case Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Aline Dameto, Gabriel Soares Cardoso. Related case(s): no (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 12/21/2018 (JET). Document says YES there is a related case. Certificate of Interested Persons is incorporated into this filing.
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John Antoon II on 12/19/2018. (copies mailed/emailed)(AKC)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John Antoon II and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:18-cv-2161-Orl-28DCI. (SJB)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE by Aline Dameto, Gabriel Soares Cardoso re #1 Complaint (Proposed Summons for Nielsen) (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 12/19/2018 (JET). Attorney will re-file all proposed summonses.
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement filed by Aline Dameto, Gabriel Soares Cardoso. (Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113A-14938513) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1-6, #3 Proposed Summons Mitnick, #4 Proposed Summons Cissna, #5 Proposed Summons Dean, #6 Proposed Summons Whitaker, #7 Exhibit Wray, #8 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Process Clerk)(Symphorien-Saavedra, Francisco) Modified on 12/19/2018 (JET). (Summonses will need to be re-submitted.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soares Cardoso et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Field Office Directo Kimberly D Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew G. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Orlando Field Office, Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aline Dameto
Represented By: Francisco Fraerly Symphorien-Saavedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Soares Cardoso
Represented By: Francisco Fraerly Symphorien-Saavedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?