Axon Enterprise, Inc. v. Phazzer Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Axon Enterprise, Inc.
Defendant: Steven Abboud, Diana Robinson, Phazzer Federal Supply, Less Lethal Safety Supply, Inc., PhaZZer Holdings, Inc., Phazzer-USA LLC, Phazzer Electronics, Inc. and Does 1-20
Case Number: 6:2019cv01721
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Roy B Dalton
2 Judge: Daniel C Irick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 25 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Order of Dismissal) (RDO)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #23 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Plaintiff's claims against all Defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/27/2019. (JBS)
September 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Axon Enterprise, Inc. (Petersen, Pamela)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER striking #21 Motion to Dismiss. A corporation must be represented by counsel. See Order 18. Defendant shall not re-file this document with the Court without retaining counsel. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/24/2019. (JBS)
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 **STRICKEN PER ORDER 22** MOTION to Dismiss for Fraud on the Court by Phazzer Federal Supply. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A & 2)(SPM) Modified on 9/25/2019 (BIA).
September 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Petersen, Pamela)
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. (Petersen, Pamela)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER striking #16 Motion to Dismiss. A corporation must be represented by counsel. See Palazzo v. Gulf Oil Corp., 764 F.2d 1381, 1385 (11th Cir. 1985) ("The rule is well established that a corporation is an artificial entity that... cannot appear pro se, and must be represented by counsel."). Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/19/2019. (JBS)
September 18, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 9/13/2019 by Axon Enterprise, Inc. as to Phazzer Federal Supply. (Santurri, Ryan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 **STRICKEN PER ORDER 18** MOTION to Dismiss case by Phazzer Federal Supply. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(JP) Modified on 9/20/2019 (BIA).
September 13, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 9/09/2019 by Axon Enterprise, Inc. as to Phazzer Holdings, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 9/09/2019 by Axon Enterprise, Inc. as to Less Lethal Safety Supply, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 9/09/2019 by Axon Enterprise, Inc. as to Phazzer-USA LLC. (Santurri, Ryan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 9/09/2019 by Axon Enterprise, Inc. as to Phazzer Electronics, Inc.. (Santurri, Ryan)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/9/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/9/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
September 6, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Pamela B. Petersen, appearing on behalf of Axon Enterprise, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL-085287.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Pamela B. Petersen to appear pro hac vice. (BIA)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/5/2019. (RN)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pamela B. Petersen to appear pro hac vice by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court Admissions)(Santurri, Ryan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick.
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to Judge Paul G. Byron. New case number: 6:19-cv-01721-Orl-40DCI. Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (ALL)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER transferring case to U.S. District Judge Paul G. Byron, with his consent, for consideration with related case 6:16-cv-366-Orl-40LRH. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/5/2019. (GNB) copies e-mailed
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Pamela B. Peterson of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk).ctp (SPM)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Steven Abboud, Less Lethal Safety Supply, Inc., Phazzer Electronics, Inc., Phazzer Federal Supply, Phazzer Holdings, Inc., Phazzer-USA LLC, Diana Robinson. (SPM)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint with exhibits) (SPM)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:19-cv-1721-Orl-37DCI. (SJB)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Steven Abboud, Does 1-20, Less Lethal Safety Supply, Inc., PhaZZer Holdings, Inc., Phazzer Electronics, Inc., Phazzer Federal Supply, Phazzer-USA LLC, Diana Robinson with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15878639) filed by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent 7,444,939, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment, #3 Exhibit C - PhaZZer IP, LLC Launches Licensed U.S. Suppliers, #4 Exhibit D - Claim Chart Phazzer 1-DC15 (enjoined) cartridge, #5 Exhibit E - Phazzer's New 1-NDC15 (new) cartridge, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons to Phazzer Electronics, Inc., #8 Proposed Summons to Steven Abboud, #9 Proposed Summons to Diana Robinson, #10 Proposed Summons to Phazzer-USA LLC, #11 Proposed Summons to Less Lethal Safety Supply, Inc., #12 Proposed Summons to PhaZZer Holdings, Inc., #13 Proposed Summons to Phazzer Federal Supply)(Santurri, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axon Enterprise, Inc. v. Phazzer Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Abboud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phazzer Federal Supply
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Less Lethal Safety Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PhaZZer Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phazzer-USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phazzer Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axon Enterprise, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Santurri
Represented By: Pamela B. Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?