S.K. et al v. School Board of Orange County, Florida et al
Plaintiff: Brian King, Roxanne King, S.K. a Minor, Roxanne J. King and S.K.
Defendant: School Board of Orange County, Florida, Aspire Health Partners, Inc. f/k/a Lakeside Behavioral Healthcare, Inc., Robert Cline, John W. Mina, in his official capacity as Sheriff of Orange County, Florida, Aspire Health Partners, Inc., John W. Mina and Lakeside Behavioral Healthcare, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2020cv02167
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hosley, Kimberly)
January 20, 2021 Filing 36 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #24 Amended Complaint by John W. Mina.(Palmer, Bobby)
January 20, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Counts X and XI of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint with Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim by Aspire Health Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Leach, Terry)
January 20, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by School Board of Orange County, Florida. (Osborne, Ruth)
January 20, 2021 Filing 33 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #24 Amended Complaint by School Board of Orange County, Florida.(Osborne, Ruth)
January 7, 2021 Filing 32 Remark: Docs. #28 and #30 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/7/21. (EBU)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/7/2021. (BIA)
January 6, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Aspire Health Partners, Inc.. (Leach, Terry)
January 6, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related Case Order and Notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Aspire Health Partners, Inc. Related case(s): No (Leach, Terry) Modified on 1/7/2021 (linked Order to entry) (KNC).
January 6, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by John W. Mina. (Palmer, Bobby)
January 6, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by John W. Mina. Related case(s): no (Palmer, Bobby)
January 6, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Brian King, Roxanne King, S.K.. (Hosley, Kimberly)
January 6, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of the Complaint filed by Brian King, Roxanne King, S.K.. (Hosley, Kimberly)
January 6, 2021 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by S.K., Brian King, Roxanne King.(Hosley, Kimberly)
December 29, 2020 Filing 23 Remark: Doc. #22 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 12/29/20. (EBU)
December 28, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by School Board of Orange County, Florida identifying Corporate Parent School Board of Orange County for School Board of Orange County, Florida.. (Osborne, Ruth)
December 28, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by School Board of Orange County, Florida. (Osborne, Ruth)
December 28, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by School Board of Orange County, Florida. Related case(s): No (Osborne, Ruth) Modified text on 12/29/2020 (LDJ).
December 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth C. Osborne on behalf of School Board of Orange County, Florida (Osborne, Ruth)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Aspire Health Partners, Inc. shall respond to the Complaint on or before January 15, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 12/28/2020. (MDH)
December 24, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Aspire Health Partners, Inc.. (Leach, Terry) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
December 23, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of the Complaint by John W. Mina. (Palmer, Bobby)
December 23, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by John W. Mina.(Palmer, Bobby)
December 15, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Brian King, Roxanne King, S.K.. (Hosley, Kimberly)
December 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brian King, Roxanne King, S.K.. Related case(s): No (Hosley, Kimberly)
December 15, 2020 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 12-9-2020 by S.K., Brian King, Roxanne King as to John W. Mina. (Hosley, Kimberly)
December 11, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 12-4-2020 by S.K., Brian King, Roxanne King as to School Board of Orange County, Florida. (Hosley, Kimberly)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 12-9-2020 by S.K., Brian King, Roxanne King as to Aspire Health Partners, Inc.. (Hosley, Kimberly)
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 (INCORRECT EVENT. ATTORNEY TO REFILE.) NOTICE by Brian King, Roxanne King, S.K. of Filing Affidavit of Service on Aspire Health Partners (Hosley, Kimberly) Modified text on 12/10/2020 (LDJ).
December 10, 2020 Filing 8 (INCORRECT EVENT. ATTORNEY TO REFILE.) NOTICE by Brian King, Roxanne King, S.K. of Filing Affidavit of Service on School Board of Orange County (Hosley, Kimberly) Modified text on 12/10/2020 (LDJ).
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER on Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 1/6/2020. (MKH)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/16/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/2/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/16/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 12/2/2020. (BIA) (ctp)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Aspire Health Partners, Inc., Robert Cline, John W. Mina, School Board of Orange County, Florida. (LDJ)
November 25, 2020 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-2167-Orl-37LRH. (SJB)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Brian King, Roxanne King, S.K. a Minor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hosley, Kimberly)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17594123) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Hosley, Kimberly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.K. et al v. School Board of Orange County, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School Board of Orange County, Florida
Represented By: Ruth C. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspire Health Partners, Inc. f/k/a Lakeside Behavioral Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Mina, in his official capacity as Sheriff of Orange County, Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspire Health Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome William Webb, Jr.
Represented By: Terry Everlee Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Mina
Represented By: Bobby G. Palmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeside Behavioral Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Jerome William Webb, Jr.
Represented By: Terry Everlee Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian King
Represented By: Kimberly E. Hosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne King
Represented By: Kimberly E. Hosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.K. a Minor
Represented By: Kimberly E. Hosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne J. King
Represented By: Kimberly E. Hosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.K.
Represented By: Kimberly E. Hosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?