C.H. v. Kingbury Capital, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: C.H. Proceeding Under a pseudonyn and C.H.
Defendant: Kingbury Capital, Inc., Pamela Johnson, Jean A Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Jean A. Johnson and Thomas W. Johnson
Case Number: 6:2021cv00621
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul G Byron
Referring Judge: Gregory J Kelly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #12 Order to show cause by C.H.. (Agnello, Nicholas) Modified text on 6/3/2021 (MEJ).
June 2, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to File Plaintiff's Name Under Seal and Proceed Under a Fictitious Name by C.H.. (Agnello, Nicholas) Modified event on 6/3/2021 (MEJ).
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by C.H.. Related case(s): No (Agnello, Nicholas)
June 2, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Order by C.H.. (Agnello, Nicholas)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to C.H. Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Court's Order #11. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE and file a response to said Order within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal without prejudice or other appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/24/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/12/2021. (GNB) copies e-mailed
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Jean A. Johnson, Thomas W. Johnson. (MEJ)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by C.H.. (Agnello, Nicholas)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued by C.H.. (Agnello, Nicholas)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Pamela Johnson, Kingbury Capital, Inc. (MEJ)
April 7, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued by C.H. Proceeding Under a pseudonyn. (Agnello, Nicholas)
April 7, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by C.H. Proceeding Under a pseudonyn. (Agnello, Nicholas)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by C.H. Proceeding Under a pseudonyn. (Agnello, Nicholas)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by C.H. Proceeding Under a pseudonyn. (Agnello, Nicholas)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. New case number: 6:21-cv-0621-PGB-GJK. (SJB)
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against C.H. Proceeding Under a pseudonyn (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18105031) filed by C.H. Proceeding Under a pseudonyn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Agnello, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.H. v. Kingbury Capital, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingbury Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.H. Proceeding Under a pseudonyn
Represented By: Nicholas Steven Agnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.H.
Represented By: Nicholas Steven Agnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?