Llamas et al v. U.S. Army et al
Plaintiff: Noelle Llamas and Ken Klippenstein
Defendant: U.S. Army, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Office of Intelligence and Analysis, National Guard, Office of the Director of National Intelligence and U.S. Secret Service
Case Number: 6:2021cv01168
Filed: July 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy B Dalton
Referring Judge: Leslie R Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Case Management Report by Ken Klippenstein, Noelle Llamas. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman.
October 7, 2021 Filing 19 Remark: Doc. #18 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 10/6/2021. (LLM)
October 4, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Guard, Office of Intelligence and Analysis, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Army, U.S. Secret Service. (Newman, Lisa)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing compliance to #12 Initial Order. On or before October 4, 2021, the Defendants are DIRECTED to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement that comply with the Court's order. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/20/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Guard, Office of Intelligence and Analysis, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, U.S. Army, U.S. Secret Service.(Newman, Lisa)
August 10, 2021 Filing 15 Remark: Doc. #14 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 8/9/2021. (LLM)
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #12 Order pdf by Ken Klippenstein, Noelle Llamas identifying Corporate Parent The Intercept for Ken Klippenstein, Noelle Llamas. (Bourdon, Elizabeth)
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ken Klippenstein, Noelle Llamas. Related case(s): No (Bourdon, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER re Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/23/2021. (BIA) (ctp)
July 19, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (KNC)
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:21-cv-1168-RBD-LRH. (SJB)
July 18, 2021 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to U.S. Secret Service by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/19/2021 (KNC).
July 18, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/19/2021 (KNC).
July 18, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to National Guard by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/19/2021 (KNC).
July 18, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to Office of Intelligence and Analysis by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/19/2021 (KNC).
July 18, 2021 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to Attorney General by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/19/2021 (KNC).
July 18, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/19/2021 (KNC).
July 18, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/19/2021 (KNC).
July 18, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued as to U.S. Army by KEN KLIPPENSTEIN, NOELLE LLAMAS. (Bourdon, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/19/2021 (KNC).
July 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18487206) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bourdon, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Llamas et al v. U.S. Army et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noelle Llamas
Represented By: Elizabeth E. Bourdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Klippenstein
Represented By: Elizabeth E. Bourdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army
Represented By: Lisa Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Lisa Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Intelligence and Analysis
Represented By: Lisa Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Guard
Represented By: Lisa Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Lisa Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Secret Service
Represented By: Lisa Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?