Kurapati et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Service et al

Plaintiff: Sunil Kumar Kurapati and Bharathi Mallidi
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Service, Janet Napolitano, Eric Holder, Alejandro Mayorkas, Perry Rhew, Mark Hazuda and Robert S. Mueller, III
Case Number: 8:2013cv00068
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Tampa Office
County: Pinellas
Referring Judge: Anthony E. Porcelli
Presiding Judge: James S. Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1182 Defend. Denial of Pla. Appl. Alien Employment Cert
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 8/12/2016. (LN)
June 15, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Report and Recommendation 65 of the Magistrate Judge is adopted, confirmed, and approved in all respects. Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 55 is GRANTED. Sunil Kumar Kurapati's I-140 petitions and Sunil Kumar Ku rapati and Bharathi Mallidi's I-485 petitions shall be immediately reinstated. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 57 is DENIED. Plaintiffs' Motion for Prelim inary Injunction 45 is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. The Court reserves jurisdiction to the extent that further action is needed from this Court related to the reinstatement of the petitions. Any motion for attorney's fees and costs shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/15/2016. (LN)
June 3, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 32) is denied. Defendants shall file an answer to the amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/3/2015. (LN)
June 10, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 5 is granted to the extent stated herein. This action is dismissed for lack of standing and lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and terminate any pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 6/10/2013. (LN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kurapati et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunil Kumar Kurapati
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bharathi Mallidi
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Devore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Rhew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hazuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Mueller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?