BMO Harris Bank v. Time Definite Services, Inc. et al
Defendant: Time Definite Services, Inc. and Michael Suarez
Appellant: BMO Harris Bank
Case Number: 8:2020cv00600
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of compliance re 11 Order no pdf by BMO Harris Bank. (Frost, Scott)
May 1, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of compliance by BMO Harris Bank. (Rubin, Daniel)
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by BMO Harris Bank. (Attachments: #1 2 Notice of appeal, #2 3 Order on appealed, #3 4 Appellant designation, #4 5 Appellee designation, #5 6 Docket 19-6564, #6 6 Docket 20-ap-90, #7 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_11, #8 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000002_Application_to_Employ_Buddy_D_Ford_PA_as_Attorney, #9 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000003_Affidavit_in_Support_of_Application_to_Employ_Attorney_for_Debtor_Filed_by_Buddy_D_Ford_on, #10 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000004_Part_1_Motion_for_an_Order_Confirming_No_Automatic_Stay_is_in_Effect_Filed_by_Buddy_D_Ford_on_beh, #11 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000004_Part_2_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors, #12 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000005_Part_1_Application_for_Authorization_to_Retain_and_Compensate_Professionals_used_in_the_Ordinary, #13 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000005_Part_2_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors, #14 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000006_Part_1_Emergency_Motion_to_Use_Cash_Collateral_Filed_by_Buddy_D_Ford_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Time_Def, #15 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000006_Part_2_Mailing_Matrix, #16 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000007_Part_1_Motion_for_Joint_Administration_of_Lead_Case_819-06564_with_819-06565_Filed_by_Buddy_D_F, #17 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000007_Part_2_Mailing_Matrix_TDS, #18 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000007_Part_3_Mailing_Matrix_TDL, #19 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000008_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Appraisal_Filed_by_Buddy_D_Ford_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Time_Definite_Service, #20 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000008_Part_2_Appraisal, #21 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000009_Order_Authorizing_Debtor-In-Possession_to_Operate_Business, #22 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000010_Part_1_Chapter_11_Case_Management_Summary_Filed_by_Buddy_D_Ford_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Time_Definite, #23 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000010_Part_2_Exhibit, #24 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000011_Notice_of_Commencement_of_Case_Section_341_Meeting_of_Creditors_and_Fixing_Deadlines__S, #25 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000012_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_John_B_Hutton_on_behalf_of_VFS_Leasin, #26 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000013_Part_1_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Comfort_Order_Authorizing_Debtor_to_Continue_Pre-petition, #27 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000013_Part_2_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors, #28 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000014_Part_1_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Application_for_Authorization_to_Retain_and_Compensate_Professionals, #29 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000014_Part_2_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors, #30 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000015_Part_1_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Emergency_Motion_to_Use_Cash_Collateral_Filed_by_Buddy_D_Ford_on_beha, #31 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000015_Part_2_Mailing_Matrix, #32 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000016_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_PDF_Document, #33 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000017_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Declaration_of_Legal_Ordinary_Course_Professional, #34 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000017_Part_2_Exhibit, #35 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000017_Part_3_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors, #36 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000018_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Robert_M_Quinn_on_behalf_of_Creditor, #37 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000020_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Joint_Administration_with_case_819-bk-06565-MGW_the_following, #38 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000021_Part_1_Proof_of_Service_of_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Order_Authorizing_Joint_Administration_Pursu, #39 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000021_Part_2_Mailing_Matrix, #40 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000022_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Creditor_TCF_National_Bank, #41 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000023_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Meeting_of_Creditors, #42 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000024_Part_1_Motion_for_Authority_to_Pay_Critical_Vendors_and_Request_for_Expedited_Hearing_Filed_by_Bu, #43 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000024_Part_2_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors, #44 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000025_Part_1_Application_to_Set_Officers_Salary_of_Michael_Suarez_as_President_Filed_by_Buddy_D_Ford, #45 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000025_Part_2_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors, #46 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000026_Part_1_Application_to_Set_Officers_Salary__Insider_Employee_Anna_Suarez_Filed_by_Buddy_D_Ford, #47 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000026_Part_2_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors, #48 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000027_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Michael_A_Tessitore_on_behalf_of_Cred, #49 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000028_Motion_of_William_W_Thorsness_to_Appear_pro_hac_vice__Designation_of_Local_Counsel_and, #50 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000029_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_of_William_W_Thorsness_Filed_by_Katie_Brinson, #51 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000030_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_of_Katie_Brinson_Hinton_Filed_by_Katie_Brinson, #52 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000031_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Matthew_F_Kye_on_behalf_of_Creditor_S, #53 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000032_Notice_of_Initial_Status_Conference__Hearing_scheduled_for_8212019_at_0930_AM_at_Tampa, #54 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000033_Part_1_Amended_Chapter_11_Case_Management_Summary_Filed_by_Buddy_D_Ford_on_behalf_of_Debtor_Time, #55 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000033_Part_2_Exhibit, #56 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000034_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Appear_pro_hac_vice_of_William_W_Thorsness_for_Signature_Financia, #57 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000035_Part_1_Proof_of_Service_of_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Appear_pro_hac_vice_of_William_W_Thorsness_f, #58 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000035_Part_2_Mailing_Matrix, #59 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000036_Part_1_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Authority_to_Pay_Critical_Vendors_and_Request_for_Expedite, #60 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000036_Part_2_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors, #61 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000037_Part_1_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Application_to_Set_Officers_Salary_of_Michael_Suarez_as_President, #62 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000037_Part_2_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors, #63 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000038_Part_1_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Application_to_Set_Officers_Salary__Insider_Employee_Anna_Suarez_F, #64 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000038_Part_2_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors, #65 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000039_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Buddy_Ford_Heather_Reel__Jonathan_S, #66 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000040_BNC_Certificate_of_Mailing_-_Notice_of_Hearing, #67 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000041_Amended_Schedule_AB_and_Amended_Summary_of_Schedules_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Required, #68 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000042_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Amended_Schedule_AB_Filed_by_Buddy_D_Ford_on_behalf_of_Debtor, #69 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000043_First_Interim_Order_granting_Debtors_Motion_to_use_cash_collateral_of_JPMorgan_Chase_Bank, #70 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000044_Part_1_Proof_of_Service_of_Interim_Order_Granting_Debtors_Motion_to_Use_Cash_Collateral_of_JPMorg, #71 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000044_Part_2_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors, #72 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000045_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Leanne_McKnight_Prendergast_on_behalf, #73 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000046_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Confirm_Termination_or_Absence_of_Stay_Comfort_Order_authorizing, #74 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000047_Proof_of_Service_of_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Comfort_Order_Authorizing_Debtor_to_Continue, #75 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000048_Notice_of_Appearance_and_Request_for_Notice_Filed_by_Robert_A_Stok_on_behalf_of_Creditor_N, #76 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000049_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_the_Debtors_Initial_Weekly_Financial_Report_Filed_by_Buddy_D_Ford_on_beh, #77 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000049_Part_2_Attachment, #78 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000050_Motion_of_TCF_National_Bank_for_Relief_from_Stay, #79 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000051_Notice_and_Order_Scheduling_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Relief_from_the_Stay_filed_b, #80 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000052_Part_1_Corrective_Motion_Motion_for_an_Order_Confirming_No_Automatic_Stay_is_in_Effect_Filed_by_J, #81 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000052_Part_2_List_of_20_Largest_Unsecured_Creditors, #82 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000053_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Notice_and_Order_Scheduling_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_for_R, #83 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000054_Motion_of_Daniel_S_Rubin_of_Howard_and_Howard_Attorneys_PLLC_to_Appear_pro_hac_vice_Filed, #84 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000055_Motion_of_Scott_C_Frost_of_Howard_and_Howard_Attorneys_PLLC_to_Appear_pro_hac_vice_Filed, #85 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000056_Notice_of_Filing_Debtors_Updated_2019_Revenue_Projection_Filed_by_Buddy_D_Ford_on_behalf, #86 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000057_Order_Approving_Application_to_EmployRetain_Buddy_D_Ford_Esq_as_counsel_for_Debtor, #87 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000058_Proof_of_Service_of_Order_Authorizing_Appointment_of_Attorney_for_Debtor_Filed_by_Buddy_D, #88 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000059_Notice_of_Filing_Debtors_Weekly_Financial_Report_-_July_29_2019_to_August_4_2019_Filed, #89 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000060_Part_1_Motion_for_Relief_from_Stay, #90 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000060_Part_2_Exhibit_1, #91 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000060_Part_3_Exhibit_2, #92 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000060_Part_4_Exhibit_3, #93 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000060_Part_5_Exhibit_4, #94 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000060_Part_6_Exhibit_5, #95 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000060_Part_7_Exhibit_6, #96 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000060_Part_8_Exhibit_7, #97 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000060_Part_9_Exhibit_8, #98 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000060_Part_10_Exhibit_9, #99 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000060_Part_11_Exhibit_10, #100 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000060_Part_12_Exhibit_11_-_part_A, #101 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000060_Part_13_Exhibit_11_-_part_B, #102 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000061_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Appear_pro_hac_vice_of_Daniel_Sean_Rubin_for_BMO_Harris_Bank_NA, #103 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000062_Order_Granting_Motion_To_Appear_pro_hac_vice_of_Scott_C_Frost_for_BMO_Harris_Bank_NA_Up, #104 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000063_Notice_and_Order_Scheduling_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Relief_from_the_Stay_filed_b, #105 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000064_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Appear_Pro_Hac_Vice_and_Directing_Paym, #106 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000065_Certificate_of_Service_Re_Notice_and_Order_Scheduling_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_for_R, #107 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000066_Notice_of_Filing_Weekly_Report, #108 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000067_Notice_of_Filing_Weekly_Report, #109 8-19-bk-6564_Docket_000068_Part_1_Motion_for_Relief_
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Daniel S. Rubin to appear pro hac vice by BMO Harris Bank. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 4/21/2020. (DMB)
April 21, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Daniel S. Rubin to appear pro hac vice by BMO Harris Bank. (Redmond, Patricia)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Scott C. Frost on behalf of BMO Harris Bank. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 4/15/2020. (DMB)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Scott C. Frost to appear pro hac vice by BMO Harris Bank. (CRH)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER directing Attorney Scott C. Frost to to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in his CM/ECF account, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by May 15, 2020. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to him after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 4/15/2020. (DMB)
April 15, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Scott C. Frost, appearing on behalf of BMO Harris Bank (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA060691.). (ARC)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 SECOND NOTICE to counsel Scott C. Frost of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER that Attorney Daniel S. Rubin for BMO Harris Bank is directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in his CM/ECF account, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by May 7, 2020. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to him after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 4/7/2020. (DMB)
April 7, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Daniel S. Rubin, appearing on behalf of BMO Harris Bank (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA068637.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Daniel S. Rubin to appear pro hac vice . (AG)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 the Motion for Extension of Time to File Designation. The time within which the Plaintiffs/Appellees must file their designation is extended to April 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 4/7/2020. (DMB)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Appeal by Michael Suarez, Time Definite Services, Inc.. (Ford, Buddy)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to pay required fees. Counsel is directed to contact Clerk's office regarding payment. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 3/30/2020. (DMB)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Daniel S. Rubin to appear pro hac vice by BMO Harris Bank. (Redmond, Patricia)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of service by BMO Harris Bank re #3 Notice of designation of track . (Redmond, Patricia)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1 (CAB)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to counsel Daniel S. Rubin and Scott C. Frost of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by BMO Harris Bank. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:20-ap-00090-MGW / 8:19-bk-06564-MGW. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transmittal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank v. Time Definite Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Definite Services, Inc.
Represented By: Buddy Dwight Ford
Represented By: Jonathan A Semach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Suarez
Represented By: Buddy Dwight Ford
Represented By: Jonathan A Semach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BMO Harris Bank
Represented By: Daniel S. Rubin
Represented By: Scott C. Frost
Represented By: Patricia Ann Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?