Patrick v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Teresa D Patrick
Defendant: Target Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Peter J. Grilli and Mark Hanley
Case Number: 8:2020cv01921
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware that the parties have requested a May 12, 2021, mediation to be held via videoconference. (Doc. #22). This request is premature and so it is denied without prejudice. Therefore, the parties should plan to mediate in person. In April 2021, the parties may renew their request if circumstances dictate. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/7/2020. (AR)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli, Esq. as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for May 12, 2021, at 1:30 PM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/7/2020. (AR)
October 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on May 12, 2021 before Peter J. Grilli. (Malatesta, Frank)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court has reviewed Mark Hanley's notice of a conflict of interest. Accordingly, the Court assigns Peter Grilli as mediator in this case. The parties are still directed to conduct a mediation hearing by May 17, 2021. Lead counsel shall contact opposing counsel and the mediator to reserve a conference date and shall file a notice with the Court within twenty-one days of the date of this order advising of the date and time of the mediation conference. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/30/2020. (LEA)
September 29, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Mark Hanley. Notice Declining Court-Appointed Mediation Due to Conflict. (Hanley, Mark)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/28/2020. (TWL)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #17), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/28/2020. (TWL)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2021 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the February 2022 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Conduct mediation hearing by 5/17/2021. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/28/2020. (TWL)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Malatesta, Frank)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Target Corporation. Related case(s): No (Lee, Jaclyn)
September 14, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Amended by Target Corporation. (Lee, Jaclyn)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Lee on behalf of Target Corporation. (Lee, Jaclyn)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation. (Hays, Dee Anna)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Target Corporation.(Hays, Dee Anna)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by September 25, 2020, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/28/2020. (AR)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF of service by Teresa D Patrick (Malatesta, Frank)
August 24, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice by Teresa D Patrick. (Malatesta, Frank)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Teresa D Patrick. Related case(s): no (Malatesta, Frank)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Entered in error. (TWL)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/21/2020. (TWL)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/21/2020. (TWL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Target Corporation. (CRH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-1921-T-33SPF. (SJB)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Target Corporation with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-17195426) filed by Teresa D Patrick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination Packet to EEOC, #2 Exhibit Right To Sue Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Malatesta, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Jaclyn Lee
Represented By: Dee Anna D. Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa D Patrick
Represented By: Frank Michael Malatesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mark Hanley
Represented By: Mark A. Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?