Navy Seal 1 et al v. Austin et al
Plaintiff: Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, EOD Officer, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Chaplain, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Second Lieutenant, Captain, Army Ranger, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Air Force Major, National Guardsman, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Technical Sergeant, Defense Department Contractor, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, Colonel, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Captain 2, Captain 3, First Lieutenant, Chief Warrant Officer 3, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, Cadet, Pilot, LCDR Pilot, Management and Program Analyst and State Department Employee 1
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr., Lloyd Austin, Alejandro Mayorkas, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth, Carlos Del Toro, David H. Berger, Frank Kendall, Robin Carnahan, Kiran Ahuja, Lesley A. Field and Mathew C. Blum
Petitioner: Thomas More Macik
Interested Party: Andrew L. Guthart
Not Classified By Court: Anthony E. Porcelli
Case Number: 8:2021cv02429
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Filing 196 TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on 4/28/22 before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Sabo,Telephone number 14068556410. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 7/7/2022 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2022 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2022. (RMS)
June 16, 2022 Filing 195 TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on 4/11/22 before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Sabo,Telephone number 14068556410. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 7/7/2022 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2022 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2022. (RMS)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER on the status of the action and other matters. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/2/2022. (DAS)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ENDORSED ORDER granting #192 the plaintiffs' "motion for leave nunc pro tunc to file response out of time." Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/1/2022.
May 24, 2022 Filing 192 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave, Nunc Pro Tunc, to File Response Out of Time (Doc. 191) by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
May 24, 2022 Filing 191 RESPONSE in Opposition re #139 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Venue Exhibit)(Gannam, Roger)
May 23, 2022 Filing 190 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #35 Motion to Certify Class Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Class Certification and a Classwide Preliminary Injunction filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Mathew C. Blum, Robin Carnahan, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Holland, Liam)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #187--motion for leave to respond. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/16/2022. (GG)
May 13, 2022 Filing 188 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #187 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum Re Class Certification and a Classwide Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Local Rule 3.01(g)(3) Certificate by Liam Holland on behalf of Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Mathew C. Blum, Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, Lesley A. Field, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth (Holland, Liam)
May 13, 2022 Filing 187 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Response to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum Re Class Certification and a Classwide Preliminary Injunction by All Defendants. (Holland, Liam)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #185--motion to extend; extending until May 23, 2022, the time within which to respond to the motion to dismiss (no further extension available absent an acute circumstance); extending interim injunctive relief for USAFA Cadet through June 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/9/2022. (DAS)
May 9, 2022 Filing 185 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Schmid, Daniel)
May 6, 2022 Filing 184 ***TERMINATED-COUNSEL TO REFILE USING THE CORRECT CASE NUMBER ON THE DOCUMENT***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Opposing Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Schmid, Daniel) Modified on 5/9/2022 (CTR).
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER extending the present injunctive relief for USAFA Cadet; directing the plaintiffs to provide specified information about venue in response to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/5/2022. (DAS)
April 28, 2022 Filing 182 Plaintiff's Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 36)(DAY)
April 28, 2022 Filing 181 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Merryday: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 4/28/2022. Court Reporter: Rebecca Sabo (DAY)
April 27, 2022 Filing 180 MEMORANDUM in support re #157 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Cadet. (Schmid, Daniel)
April 27, 2022 Filing 179 Exhibit List for April 28, 2022 Hearing by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
April 27, 2022 Filing 178 Witness List by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
April 27, 2022 Filing 177 NOTICE by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth re #174 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Regarding Defendants' Witnesses and Exhibits (Powell, Amy)
April 26, 2022 Filing 176 MEMORANDUM in support re #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #35 Motion to Certify Class (Supplemental) filed by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
April 25, 2022 Filing 175 NOTICE of supplemental authority re: Short v. Berger (D. Ariz.) by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Powell, Amy)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting-in-part #157--granting temporary injunctive relief through May 6, 2022, at 11:59 p.m.; scheduling a hearing by videoconference for April 28, 2022, at 10:30 a.m.; witness and exhibit list due April 27, 2022, at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/25/2022. (DAS)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER resolving motions (Docs. #121, #147) by USMC Captain. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/21/2022. (GG)
April 20, 2022 Filing 172 NOTICE of supplemental authority re: Supreme Court order in Dunn v. Austin by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Attachments: #1 SCOTUS Order in Dunn v. Austin)(Powell, Amy)
April 19, 2022 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by USCA of receiving Record on appeal on 8/14/2022 re #115 Notice of Appeal. USCA number: 22-10645-DD. (CTR)
April 18, 2022 Filing 171 NOTICE by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth re #167 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table, #2 Exhibit 1 - Cadet RAR Package)(Snyder, Cassie)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER striking attachment (Doc. 169-2). Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/18/2022. (GG)
April 15, 2022 Filing 169 NOTICE by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth re #167 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Cadet RAR Package)(Snyder, Cassie)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER extending interim injunctive relief (Doc. #150) through April 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/15/2022. (GG)
April 15, 2022 Filing 167 RESPONSE in Opposition re #157 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order for USAFA Cadet filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Mathew C. Blum, Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, Lesley A. Field, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table, #2 Exhibit 1 - Tetrault Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 - Rans Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 - Robinson Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 - DMED Info. Paper)(Snyder, Cassie)
April 15, 2022 Filing 166 DECLARATION of RICHARD L. MAST re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #35 MOTION to Certify Class by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Service Member Final Denial List, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Navy Chaplain 3)(Gannam, Roger)
April 12, 2022 Filing 165 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Middle District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for the purposes of this appeal re: #115 Notice of Appeal. The following documents will be forwarded in paper format upon the request for the record on appeal by the USCA in addition to the electronic record. Volume of SEALED pleadings: 6 Volume of SEALED transcripts: 1 (2 Box of copies of Sealed Documents) USCA number: 22-10645-DD (CTR)
April 11, 2022 Filing 163 Plaintiff's exhibit list during 4/11/2022 Preliminary Injunction hearing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23, #2 Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit 25, #4 Exhibit 26, #5 Exhibit 27, #6 Exhibit 28)(DAY)
April 11, 2022 Filing 162 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Merryday: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 4/11/2022. Court Reporter: Rebecca Sabo (DAY)
April 8, 2022 Filing 161 NOTICE by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth re #157 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order for USAFA Cadet of Intent to Respond (Powell, Amy)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #159--motion for an extension of time; extending through 5/9/2022 the time within which the plaintiffs must respond to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/8/2022. (GG)
April 8, 2022 Filing 159 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #139 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
April 8, 2022 Filing 158 RESPONSE re #150 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyOrder on Motion to File Excess PagesOrder on Motion for Temporary Restraining OrderOrder on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Defendants' Supplemental Brief Regarding Supreme Court Stay Order filed by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Powell, Amy)
April 8, 2022 Filing 157 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order for USAFA Cadet by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of USAFA Cadet)(Gannam, Roger)
April 6, 2022 Filing 156 RESPONSE in Opposition re #141 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (for 22 Service Members) Pending Decision on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Mathew C. Blum, Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, Lesley A. Field, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table, #2 Exhibit 1 - Erickson Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 - Schrecengost Decl.)(Snyder, Cassie)
April 6, 2022 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Cassie Snyder on behalf of Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Mathew C. Blum, Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, Lesley A. Field, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth (Snyder, Cassie)
April 6, 2022 Filing 154 NOTICE by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth Regarding Witness/Exhibit Lists (Powell, Amy)
April 6, 2022 Filing 153 Exhibit List for April 11, 2022 Hearing by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
April 6, 2022 Filing 152 Witness List by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
April 4, 2022 Filing 151 NOTICE OF HEARING: re: #150 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Injunction Hearing set for 4/11/2022 at 09:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before Judge Steven D. Merryday. (DAY)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #121, #147 motion for injunctive relief; scheduling hearing by videoconference for April 11, 2022; injunctive relief expires April 15, 2022; see order for other details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/1/2022. (DAS)
April 1, 2022 Filing 149 TRANSCRIPT of preliminary injunction held on 3/10/22 before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Sabo,Telephone number 14068556410. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 4/22/2022 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/2/2022 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2022. (RMS)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER of USCA: This matter comes to us on a motion to stay a district court's preliminary injunction compelling the Navy and Marine Corps to provide two officers a religious exemption to the military's COVID-19 vaccine mandate. The defendants argue that we should stay the preliminary injunction during the pendency of the appeal because the district court's injunction improperly intrudes in internal military affairs. This is not the only pending matter in which servicemembers are seeking a religious exemption to the Navy's vaccination mandate. In U.S. Navy Seals 1-26, et al. v. Biden, et al., No. 22-10077 (5th Cir. Feb. 28, 2022), the Fifth Circuit declined to stay a comparable preliminary injunction against the enforcement of the mandate. The Supreme Court, however, stayed the injunction pending appeal "insofar as it precludes the Navy from considering respondents' vaccination status in making deployment, assignment, and other operational decisions." Austin, et al. v. U.S. Navy Seals 1-26, et al., No. 21A477 (March 25, 2022). Accordingly, following the Supreme Court's lead, we grant the defendants' motion to stay in part and deny it in part. The district court's injunction is stayed insofar as it precludes the Navy from considering the plaintiffs' vaccination status in making deployment, assignment, and other operational decisions until disposition of this appeal, including the denial of a petition for panel re-hearing or rehearing en banc if timely filed. The motion for oral argument is denied as to #115 Notice of Appeal filed by Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Kiran Ahuja, Christine Wormuth. EOD: 3/30/22; USCA number: 22-10645-DD. (JNB)
March 30, 2022 Filing 147 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewal of Emergency TRO Motion #121 -- Relief Requested by April 1, 2022) by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 28 Vaccination Order, #2 Exhibit B - Counsel E-mail Correspondence)(Gannam, Roger)
March 30, 2022 Filing 146 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #121 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Decision on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #141 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (for 22 Service Members) Pending Decision on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #35 MOTION to Certify Class , #130 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Decision on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
March 30, 2022 Filing 145 Unopposed MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Supreme Court Stay Order in Austin v. U.S. Navy Seals 1-26 by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Supplemental Memorandum)(Gannam, Roger)
March 29, 2022 Filing 144 NOTICE of supplemental authority by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Powell, Amy)
March 24, 2022 Filing 143 NOTICE by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, Andrew L. Guthart, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Thomas More Macik, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant of Supplemental Authority in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supreme Court Opinion in Ramirez v. Collier)(Schmid, Daniel)
March 24, 2022 Filing 142 RESPONSE in Opposition re #141 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (for 22 Service Members) Pending Decision on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Notice of Intent to Respond Further filed by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Powell, Amy)
March 23, 2022 Filing 141 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (for 22 Service Members) Pending Decision on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USMC LCpl RA Packet, #2 Exhibit B - USMC Capt RA Packet, #3 Exhibit C - USMC SSgt RA Packet, #4 Exhibit D - USMC Col RA Packet, #5 Exhibit E - USAF Capt RA Packet, #6 Exhibit F - USAF Maj1 RA Packet, #7 Exhibit G - USAF Maj2 RA Packet, #8 Exhibit H - USAF SSgt RA Packet, #9 Exhibit I - USAF TSgt RA Packet, #10 Exhibit J - USAFR LtCol1 RA Packet, #11 Exhibit K - USAFR LtCol2 RA Packet, #12 Exhibit L - USAFR Maj RA Packet, #13 Exhibit M - USAFR SSgt RA Packet, #14 Exhibit N - USN Lt RA Packet, #15 Exhibit O - USN LtCdr1 RA Packet, #16 Exhibit P - USN LtCdr2 RA Packet, #17 Exhibit Q - USN HC RA Packet, #18 Exhibit R - USSF LtCol RA Packet, #19 Exhibit S - USNR LtCdr RA Packet, #20 Exhibit T - USAF LtCol RA Packet, #21 Exhibit U - USN ROTC MIDN RA Packet, #22 Exhibit V - USAF MSgt RA Packet)(Gannam, Roger)
March 22, 2022 Filing 140 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #130 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Col. Jeremy Beaven)(Powell, Amy)
March 18, 2022 Filing 139 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Major Alyssa S. Tetrault, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Colonel Michael B. Parks, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Colonel Kevin J. Mahoney, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Second Lieutenant Eugene Byrl McCarthy IV, #6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Captain Mery-Angela Sanabria Katson, #7 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Commander Kelly C. Blackburn, #8 Exhibit 7 - Order, Crosby v. Austin, No. 8:21-cv-02730 (M.D. Fla. Feb. 22, 2022), ECF No. 44)(Enlow, Courtney)
March 18, 2022 Filing 137 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Major (Schmid, Daniel)
March 14, 2022 Filing 136 NOTICE by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant re #134 Evidentiary Hearing (Notice of Filing Transcript of Hearing Testimony of Navy Commander) (Attachments: #1 Hearing Transcript)(Gannam, Roger)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying #118--motion to stay pending appeal. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/11/2022. (DAS)
March 11, 2022 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re #121 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Decision on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Weaver Declaration, #3 SECNAVINST 1920.6D, #4 Marine Corps Order 5800.16 Vol. 15, #5 Order, Short v. Berger, No. 2:22-cv-1151 (C.D. Cal. Mar. 3, 2022), ECF No. 25, #6 Transcript of Order, Dunn v. Austin, No. 22-cv-0028 (E.D. Cal. Feb. 22, 2022), ECF No. 22)(Enlow, Courtney)
March 10, 2022 Filing 135 Plaintiff's exhibit list during evidentiary hearing on 3/10/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 18, #11 Exhibit 19)(DAY)
March 10, 2022 Filing 134 Minute Entry. In-Person Proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Merryday: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/10/2022. Court Reporter: Rebecca Sabo (DAY)
March 9, 2022 Filing 131 RESPONSE in Opposition re #118 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #111 Order filed by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USSPACECOM E-mail)(Gannam, Roger)
March 8, 2022 Filing 130 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Decision on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Thomas More Macik, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
March 8, 2022 Filing 129 NOTICE by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant re #122 Order (NOTICE OF FILING WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Witness List, #2 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List)(Gannam, Roger)
March 8, 2022 Filing 128 NOTICE by Lloyd J. Austin, III re #122 Order Regarding Witnesses and Exhibits for March 10 Hearing (Powell, Amy)
March 8, 2022 Filing 127 NOTICE of a related action (Supplement to ECF No. 22) per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lloyd J. Austin, III. Related case(s): Yes (Powell, Amy)
March 7, 2022 Filing 126 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION in Support of the #93 Motion to Intervene by Thomas More Macik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibis K - Q)(BD)
March 4, 2022 Filing 125 RESPONSE re #113 Notice (Other) filed by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Blackburn declaration)(Enlow, Courtney)
March 3, 2022 Filing 124 RESPONSE re #123 Notice (Other) filed by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
March 3, 2022 Filing 123 NOTICE by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth re #121 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Decision on Motion for Preliminary Injunction of Extension of USMC Captain's Compliance Deadline (Powell, Amy)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER denying request for an immediate administrative stay; scheduling for March 10, 2022, an evidentiary hearing on the motion (Doc. #118) to stay. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/2/2022. (DAS)
March 2, 2022 Filing 121 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Decision on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Plaintiff USMC Captain in Support of TRO)(Gannam, Roger)
March 2, 2022 Filing 120 NOTICE by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth re #118 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #111 Order of Filing Declaration of William Merz (Powell, Amy)
March 1, 2022 Filing 119 RESPONSE in Opposition re #118 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #111 Order (Preliminary Response) filed by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
February 28, 2022 Filing 118 Emergency MOTION to Stay re #111 Order by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Email from Plaintiffs Counsel to A Powell, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Admiral Daryl Caudle, #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Admiral Michael M. Gilday, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of General Eric M. Smith, #6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Vice Admiral Daniel Dwyer, #7 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Lieutenant General William M. Jurney)(Powell, Amy)
February 28, 2022 Filing 117 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #93 Motion to Intervene filed by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Yang, Catherine)
February 28, 2022 Filing 116 TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #115 Notice of Appeal. Eleventh Circuit Transcript information form forwarded to pro se litigants and available to counsel at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under Forms and Publications/General. (CTR)
February 25, 2022 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #111 Order by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. Filing fee not paid. (Avallone, Zach)
February 23, 2022 Filing 114 NOTICE by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth re #113 Notice (Other) of Intent to Respond (Enlow, Courtney)
February 22, 2022 Filing 113 NOTICE by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #51 Memorandum in support, #35 MOTION to Certify Class (NOTICE OF FILING SECOND DECLARATION OF RICHARD L. MAST SHOWING 131 FINAL DENIALS OF RELIGIOUS ACCOMMODATION APPEALS IN SUPPORT OF IMMEDIATE CLASS WIDE RELIEF) (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Richard L. Mast in Support of Motion to Certify Class and Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Gannam, Roger)
February 22, 2022 Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT of preliminary injunction held on 2/10/22 before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rebecca Sabo,Telephone number (406) 855-6410. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 3/15/2022 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/25/2022 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2022. (RMS)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER resolving motion (Doc. #60) by Navy Commander and Lieutenant Colonel 2. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/18/2022. (KRM)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER resolving #55--motion to proceed under pseudonym. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/18/2022. (GG)
February 18, 2022 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Proceed Pseudonymously filed by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
February 18, 2022 Filing 105 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth filed by Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, LCDR Pilot, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Technical Sergeant, Navy Seal 2, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Navy Seal 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Cadet, Captain 3, Captain, Army Ranger, Chief Warrant Officer 3, Captain 2, Lance Corporal 2, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Lieutenant Colonel 1, EOD Officer, Pilot, Second Lieutenant, Lance Corporal 1, National Guardsman, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, First Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Colonel, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Chaplain(United States Navy).(Gannam, Roger)
February 17, 2022 Filing 104 Second Supplemental MEMORANDUM in support of Preliminary Injunction re #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #60 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #51 Memorandum in support filed by Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger) Modified text on 2/18/2022 (MCB).
February 17, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth re #90 Order directing compliance (Attachments: #1 Johnson Decl (USAF), #2 Katson Decl (USN), #3 McCarthy Decl (USMC))(Powell, Amy)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ENDORSED ORDER granting #101 the defendants' motion for an extension until 11:00 a.m. tomorrow to file the information requested in Doc. 90. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/16/2022.
February 16, 2022 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File information directed in ECF No. 90 by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
February 16, 2022 Filing 100 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #51 Memorandum in support , and #60 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
February 16, 2022 Filing 99 NOTICE of Statement of Assistance of Counsel by Thomas More Macik (BD)
February 15, 2022 Filing 98 REPLY in Support of #94 Application for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order filed by Thomas More Macik. (BD)
February 15, 2022 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #94 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lloyd J. Austin, III, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Powell, Amy)
February 15, 2022 Filing 96 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION of Thomas More Macik re #94 APPLICATION for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order by Thomas More Macik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J)(BD)
February 15, 2022 Filing 95 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #51 Memorandum in support by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, EOD Officer, First Lieutenant, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1, Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
February 14, 2022 Filing 94 APPLICATION for Emergency Temporary Restraining Order by Thomas More Macik. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(BD)
February 14, 2022 Filing 93 MOTION to Intervene by Thomas More Macik. (BD)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ENDORSED ORDER granting #88--unopposed motion for an extension of time; extending until March 18, 2022, the time within which the defendants must respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/14/2022. (DAS)
February 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER concerning supplemental information. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/13/2022.
February 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER severing the non-service member plaintiffs and their claims; instructing the clerk; requiring amendment of the complaint in 8:21-cv-2429 and each new case; denying-in-part certain motions as moot. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/12/2022. (DAS)
February 11, 2022 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #75 Amended Complaint or Otherwise Respond by All Defendants. (Merritt, Robert)
February 11, 2022 Filing 87 NOTICE by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, David H. Berger, Mathew C. Blum, Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, Lesley A. Field, Frank Kendall, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth re #85 Order on Motion to Seal Notice of Documents Filed Under Seal (Avallone, Zach)
February 11, 2022 Filing 86 NOTICE to counsel Richard L. Mast of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #81--motion to seal; requiring items filed under seal not later than today; extending the present interim injunctive relief (Doc. 67) through February 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/11/2022. (DAS)
February 10, 2022 Filing 84 Minute Entry: In-Person Proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Merryday: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 2/10/2022. Court Reporter: Rebecca Sabo (DAY)
February 10, 2022 Filing 83 NOTICE by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, David H. Berger, Mathew C. Blum, Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, Lesley A. Field, Frank Kendall, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth re #81 MOTION to Seal Exhibits pursuant to Doc Nos. 77, 80 , #74 Response in Opposition to Motion Notice of Additional Information in Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Executive Officer)(Enlow, Courtney) Modified on 2/11/2022 (CTR).
February 9, 2022 Filing 82 DECLARATION of Richard L. Mast re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #51 Memorandum in support by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Cadet, Captain, Captain 2, Captain 3, Chaplain(United States Air Force), Chaplain(United States Navy), Chief Warrant Officer 3, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Colonel Financial Management Officer, Commander Surface Warfare Officer, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, EOD Officer, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, First Lieutenant, Andrew L. Guthart, LCDR Pilot, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, Management and Program Analyst, Master Sergeant Sere Specialist, National Guardsman, Navy Chief Warrant Officer, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Pilot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Additional Plaintiff Class Members Facing Immediate Harm)(Schmid, Daniel)
February 9, 2022 Filing 81 MOTION to Seal Exhibits pursuant to Doc Nos. 77, 80 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Captain Frank Brandon (redacted), #2 Exhibits to Brandon Declaration (redacted))(Enlow, Courtney) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER resolving #78--motion to proceed pseudonymously during the February 10, 2022 hearing. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/9/2022. (DAS)
February 9, 2022 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Proceed Pseudonymously , #78 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to testify using pseudonyms at preliminary injunction hearing filed by Kiran Ahuja, Lloyd Austin, David H. Berger, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Mathew C. Blum, Robin Carnahan, Carlos Del Toro, Lesley A. Field, Frank Kendall, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Coker Order, #2 Ex. B - Oklahoma Order)(Avallone, Zach)
February 9, 2022 Filing 78 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to testify using pseudonyms at preliminary injunction hearing by All Plaintiffs. (Mihet, Horatio)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #59--motion for protective order; requiring parties to comply with the terms of the proposed order [59-1]. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/9/2022. (DAS)
February 8, 2022 Filing 76 NOTICE by Lloyd Austin, David H. Berger, Carlos Del Toro, Frank Kendall, Alejandro Mayorkas, Christine Wormuth re #73 Notice (Other) of Errata (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Holbrook Decl. with CORRECTED data exhibit)(Powell, Amy)
February 7, 2022 Filing 75 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lloyd Austin, Alejandro Mayorkas filed by Army Ranger, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Technical Sergeant, Navy Seal 2, Navy Seal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Lieutenant Colonel 1, EOD Officer, Second Lieutenant, Lance Corporal 1, Air Force Major, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, National Guardsman, Major, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Colonel, Captain, Chaplain.(Gannam, Roger)
February 4, 2022 Filing 74 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and in Response to Pls. Supplemental Brief ECF No. 51 filed by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Department of Defense Instruction ("DoDI") 1332.45, Retention Determination for Non-Deployable Service Members, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Captain Lanny F. Littlejohn, filed in Navy SEALs 1-26 v. Biden, 21-cv-01236 (N.D. Tex.), #4 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Colonel Tonya Rans, #5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Major Scott Stanley, #6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Colonel Artemio Chapa, #7 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Major General Telita Crosland, #8 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Rear Admiral Gayle D. Shaffer, #9 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Rear Admiral Dana Thomas, #10 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Captain Joon Yun, #11 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Colonel Eric N. Thompson, #12 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Captain Frank Brandon)(Enlow, Courtney)
February 4, 2022 Filing 73 NOTICE by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas re #40 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Mahoney Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 - Katson Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 - Reid Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 - Holbrook Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 - Grant Decl.)(Powell, Amy)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #54 plaintiffs' Motion for Richard L. Mast to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/3/2022. (DMS)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ENDORSED ORDER: The defendants' #70 motion for leave to file a forty-page response to the plaintiffs' renewed motion for preliminary injunction is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/4/2022.
February 4, 2022 Filing 70 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages by All Defendants. (Merritt, Robert)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #49--motion to amend complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/3/2022. (DAS)
February 3, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE of hearing: re: #60 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Decision on Preliminary Injunction Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. (DAY)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #60--motion for temporary injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/2/2022. (DAS)
February 2, 2022 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #60 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Appeal Decision - Commander Surface Warfare Officer, #3 Exhibit 2 - Appeal Decision LTC2, #4 Exhibit 3 - Lescher Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 - Rans Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 - Stanley Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 - Poel Decl.)(Powell, Amy)
February 2, 2022 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
February 2, 2022 Filing 64 RESPONSE re #61 Notice (Other) filed by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Captain, Chaplain, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, EOD Officer, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, National Guardsman, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Gannam, Roger)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER appointing Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli as the mediator in this action. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/2/2022. (DAS)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order permitting the defendants to respond to the motion (Doc. #60) for a temporary restraining order not later than 5:00 p.m. Today, February 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/2/2022. (DAS)
February 1, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas re #60 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Decision on Preliminary Injunction Intent to Respond (Powell, Amy)
February 1, 2022 Filing 60 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Pending Decision on Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Navy Commander Surface Warfare Officer, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Marine Lieutenant Colonel 2)(Gannam, Roger)
February 1, 2022 Filing 59 Joint MOTION for Protective Order for Plaintiffs' Identities (Interim) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Interim Protective Order, #2 Appendix to Proposed Protective Order)(Powell, Amy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
January 31, 2022 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #51 Memorandum in support filed by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Captain, Chaplain, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, EOD Officer, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpted Counsel E-mails)(Gannam, Roger)
January 28, 2022 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #49 Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement filed by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Powell, Amy)
January 28, 2022 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #51 Memorandum in support by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
January 26, 2022 Filing 55 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Proceed Pseudonymously by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Richard L. Mast)(Gannam, Roger)
January 24, 2022 Filing 54 Unopposed MOTION for Richard L. Mast to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19152784 for $150 by All Plaintiffs. (Gannam, Roger) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
January 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ENDORSED ORDER: The plaintiffs move #49 to amend the complaint. The defendants must respond to the motion no later than noon on January 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/22/2022.
January 21, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas re #40 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Mahoney Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 - Katson Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 - Reid Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 - Holbrook Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 - Grant Decl.)(Powell, Amy)
January 21, 2022 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in support re #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Captain, Chaplain, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, EOD Officer, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, National Guardsman, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Feds for Med. Freedom v. Biden)(Gannam, Roger)
January 21, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas re #49 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint Notice of Intent to Respond (Powell, Amy)
January 20, 2022 Filing 49 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint)(Gannam, Roger)
January 7, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE by Andrew L. Guthart (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)
January 7, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas re #40 Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Decl. of Col. Mahoney, #3 Exhibit 2 - Decl. of Capt. Katson, #4 Exhibit 3 - Decl. of Col. Reid, #5 Exhibit 4 - Decl. of Col. Holbrook, #6 Exhibit 5 - Decl. of Maj. Streett, #7 Exhibit 6 - Decl. of Col. Chapa, #8 Exhibit 7 - Decl. of Commander Grant)(Powell, Amy)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45--motion for an extension of time. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/16/2021. (GG)
December 16, 2021 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Powell, Amy)
December 15, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: Bill Jones. (HWJ)
December 15, 2021 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on November 15, 2021 before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bill Jones,Telephone number 813-301-6158. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 1/5/2022 Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2022 Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2022. (HWJ)
December 3, 2021 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Decl. of Maj. Gen. S. Bannister, #2 Ex. B - Decl. of Comm. B. Grant, #3 Ex. C - Decl. of Col. A. Jeppe, #4 Ex. D - Decl. of Capt. M. Katson, #5 Ex. E - Decl. of L. Bazer, #6 Ed. F - Decl. of Maj. Gen. T. Crosland)(Avallone, Zach)
November 30, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Captain, Chaplain, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, EOD Officer, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, National Guardsman, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant re #39 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint filed by Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Technical Sergeant, Air Force Major, Navy Seal 1, Colonel, National Guardsman, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Major, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, EOD Officer, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, Chaplain, Navy Seal 2, Captain, Second Lieutenant, Army Ranger, Lance Corporal 1, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor (Schmid, Daniel)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER on motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/22/2021. (DAS)
November 18, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redline Comparison of Proposed First Amended Verified Complaint)(Schmid, Daniel)
November 15, 2021 Filing 38 Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Steven D. Merryday: MOTION HEARING held on 11/15/2021 re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Navy Seal 1, et al. Court Reporter: Bill Jones (DAY)
November 14, 2021 Filing 37 The motion (Doc. #31) to appear pro hac vice is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/14/2021. (DAS)
November 13, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #23 Response to motion by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Powell, Amy)
November 12, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Certify Class by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Horatio G. Mihet In Support of Motion to Certify Class)(Gannam, Roger)
November 12, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of compliance re #19 Order by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Brigadier General Matthew Smith, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Captain Mary-Angela Sanabria Katson, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Colonel Mark Reid, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Colonel Jason Holbrook, #5 Exhibit Air Force Policy Directive 52-2, #6 Affidavit Declaration of Commander Sharon Russell)(Enlow, Courtney)
November 12, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #23 Response to motion by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Merritt, Robert)
November 12, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Merritt on behalf of Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas (Merritt, Robert)
November 11, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Daniel J. Schmid to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Schmid, Daniel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
November 10, 2021 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Captain, Chaplain, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, EOD Officer, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, National Guardsman, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lieutenant Colonel, USMC, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Federal Contractor Employee, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Field Test Technician, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Network Services Level 3, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Air Force Civilian Registered Nurse, #6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Dr. Robert Malone)(Gannam, Roger)
November 10, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Captain, Chaplain, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, EOD Officer, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, National Guardsman, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant of JOINT STATEMENT for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction (Mihet, Horatio)
November 10, 2021 Filing 28 The plaintiffs' unopposed motion (Doc. #26) to extend by two days the time within which to move for class certification is GRANTED. Not later than NOVEMBER 12, 2021, the plaintiffs may move for class certification. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/10/2021. (DAS) Modified (DAS).
November 10, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of a related action and Agreement with Defendants' Notice per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Captain, Chaplain, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, EOD Officer, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, National Guardsman, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. Related case(s): Yes (Mihet, Horatio)
November 10, 2021 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Certify Class by All Plaintiffs. (Mihet, Horatio)
November 8, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #23 Response to motion by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Opinion in Church v. Biden, No. 21-cv-2815 (D.D.C.))(Enlow, Courtney)
November 6, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #23 Response to motion by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Powell, Amy)
November 3, 2021 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Secretary of Defense Message to the Force (Aug. 9, 2021), #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Secretary of Defense Memorandum (Aug. 24, 2021), #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Acting Assistant Secretary of Defense for Health Affairs Memorandum (Sept. 14, 2021), #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 - DoDI 6205.02, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5 - AR 40-562, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Army FRAGO 5, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7 - ALNAV 062/21, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8 - NAVADMIN 190/21, NAVADMIN 225/21, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9 - MARADMIN 462/21, MARADMIN 533/21, #11 Exhibit Ex. 10 - Secretary of Air Force Memorandum for Air Force Commanders (Sept. 3, 2021), #12 Exhibit Ex. 11 - Dep't of the Air Force COVID-19 Vaccine Implementation Guidance (Sept. 3, 2021), #13 Exhibit Ex. 12 - CRS Report Defense Health Primer: Military Vaccines, #14 Exhibit Ex. 13 - Declaration of Peter Marks, M.D., Ph.D., #15 Exhibit Ex. 14 - Declaration of Colonel Tonya Rans, M.D., #16 Exhibit Ex. 15 - Declaration of Major Scott Stanley, #17 Exhibit Ex. 16 - Declaration of Colonel Michele Soltis, #18 Exhibit Ex. 17 - Declaration of Vice Admiral William Merz, #19 Exhibit Ex. 18 - Declaration of Lieutenant General David J. Furness, #20 Exhibit Ex. 19 - Declaration of Lieutenant Colonel Nekitha M. Little, #21 Exhibit Ex. 20 - Declaration of Colonel Artemio C. Chapa, #22 Exhibit Ex. 21 - Declaration of Chaplain, Major Matthew J. Streett, #23 Exhibit Ex. 22 - Declaration of Colonel Elizabeth M. Hernandez, #24 Exhibit Ex. 23 - ALCOAST 305/21, ALCOAST 315/21, ALCOAST 352/21, #25 Exhibit Ex. 24 - Declaration of Rear Admiral Shannon Gilreath, #26 Exhibit Ex. 25 - Declaration of Captain Timothy J. Buchanan)(Avallone, Zach)
November 3, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas. Related case(s): Yes (Enlow, Courtney)
November 3, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Evan Carmichael on behalf of Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas (Carmichael, Andrew)
November 2, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Zach A. Avallone on behalf of Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas (Avallone, Zach)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER requiring the defendants to provide specified information on dates certain before the hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/29/2021. (DAS)
October 29, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Powell on behalf of Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr (Powell, Amy)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER: The defendants' unopposed motion #16 to exceed the governing page limitation is GRANTED. The defendants may respond to the motion for preliminary injunction in a paper not exceeding forty pages, inclusive of all parts. Counsel is CAUTIONED to use the allotted space wisely. See Belli v. Hedden Enterprises, 2012 WL 3255086 (M. D. Fla. 2012). Granting this motion is not a precedent for, and creates no entitlement to, expand any other paper in this action beyond the limitation prescribed in the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/29/2021.
October 29, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to File Excess Pages by All Defendants. (Enlow, Courtney)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER fixing the deadline for any motion for class certification and for compliance with Local Rule 1.07(c). Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/27/2021. (DAS)
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Enlow on behalf of Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Jr, Alejandro Mayorkas (Enlow, Courtney)
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Captain, Chaplain, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, EOD Officer, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, National Guardsman, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant re #9 Order Requiring Email Notice and Service upon Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Notice to AUSA)(Mihet, Horatio)
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Captain, Chaplain, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, EOD Officer, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, National Guardsman, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant (Mihet, Horatio)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Captain, Chaplain, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, EOD Officer, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, National Guardsman, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant (Mihet, Horatio)
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Captain, Chaplain, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, EOD Officer, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, National Guardsman, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant (Mihet, Horatio)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order requiring e-mail notice; requiring service; scheduling briefing; scheduling a hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction; requiring a list of witnesses and exhibits; maintaining the motion for temporary restraining order under advisement. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/18/2021. (DAS)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk).
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Roger K. Gannam on behalf of Air Force Major, Army Ranger, Captain, Chaplain, Coast Guard Lieutenant, Colonel, Defense Department Contractor, Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech, EOD Officer, Federal Civilian Contractor Employer, Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor, Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee, Lance Corporal 1, Lance Corporal 2, Lieutenant Colonel 1, Lieutenant Colonel 2, Major, National Guardsman, Navy Seal 1, Navy Seal 2, Second Lieutenant, Senior Chief Petty Officer, Technical Sergeant. Lead Counsel: Mathew D. Staver. (Gannam, Roger)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel Roger K. Gannam of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Lloyd Austin, Joseph R. Biden, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney. (CTR) Modified entry to correct image on 10/15/2021 (AG).
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-2429-SDM-TGW. (MLJ)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Gannam, Roger)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18822073) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executive Order Requiring Covid-19 Vaccinations for Federal Employees, #2 Exhibit B - Executive Order Requiring Covid-19 Vaccinations for Federal Contractors, #3 Exhibit C - Covid-19 Safer Workforce Guidance, #4 Exhibit D - Secretary of Defense Memorandum, #5 Exhibit E - FDA BionTech Letter, #6 Exhibit F - FDA Pfizer-BioNTech EUA Letter, #7 Exhibit G - Defense Department Memorandum, #8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Dr. Peter McCullough, #9 Exhibit I - Declaration of Navy Chaplain, #10 Exhibit J - Declaration of Coast Guard Lieutenant, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Proposed Summons Defendant Biden, #13 Proposed Summons Defendant Austin, #14 Proposed Summons Defendant Mayorkas)(Gannam, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navy Seal 1 et al v. Austin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navy Seal 1
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navy Seal 2
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EOD Officer
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Senior Chief Petty Officer
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaplain
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lieutenant Colonel 1
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lieutenant Colonel 2
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Lieutenant
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Captain
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Army Ranger
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Corporal 1
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Corporal 2
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Air Force Major
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Guardsman
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coast Guard Lieutenant
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technical Sergeant
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defense Department Contractor
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Civilian Engineer Contractor
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Civilian Contractor Employer
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Nuclear Contractor Employee
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Department of Energy Civilian Nuclear Tech
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colonel
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Richard L. Mast, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commander Surface Warfare Officer
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navy Chief Warrant Officer
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colonel Financial Management Officer
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reserve Lieutenant Colonel
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Captain 2
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Captain 3
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Lieutenant
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chief Warrant Officer 3
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 1
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reserve Lieutenant Colonel 2
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Master Sergeant Sere Specialist
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cadet
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilot
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LCDR Pilot
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Management and Program Analyst
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Department Employee 1
Represented By: Horatio G. Mihet
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Schmid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Biden, Jr.
Represented By: Amy Powell
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Austin
Represented By: Amy Powell
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: Amy Powell
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd J. Austin, III
Represented By: Amy Powell
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Catherine Yang
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro N. Mayorkas
Represented By: Amy Powell
Represented By: Andrew Evan Carmichael
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Catherine Yang
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Wormuth
Represented By: Amy Powell
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Catherine Yang
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Del Toro
Represented By: Amy Powell
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Catherine Yang
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H. Berger
Represented By: Amy Powell
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Catherine Yang
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Kendall
Represented By: Amy Powell
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Catherine Yang
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Carnahan
Represented By: Amy Powell
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiran Ahuja
Represented By: Amy Powell
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesley A. Field
Represented By: Amy Powell
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew C. Blum
Represented By: Amy Powell
Represented By: Cassie Snyder
Represented By: Courtney Enlow
Represented By: Robert Charles Merritt
Represented By: Zach A. Avallone
Represented By: Liam Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Andrew L. Guthart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Anthony E. Porcelli
Represented By: Anthony E. Porcelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas More Macik
Represented By: Roger K. Gannam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?