Talarczyk et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: FRANCIS TALARCZYK and WANDA ALGARIN TALARCZYK
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, ALFA LAVAL INC., THE DELAVAL SEPARATOR COMPANY, SHARPLES CORP., Crane Co., DEMING PUMP CO.,, Cochrane Corporation, Chapman Valve Co., SWARTWOUT CO., ELLIOT COMPANY, a/k/a ELLIOT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, JOHN CRANE, INC., f/k/a CRANE PACKING, PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC., f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM, INC.,, BF Sturtevant Co., Velan Valve Corp., WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc;, Armstrong International, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, BIGELOW COMPANY (THE), Blackmer Pump Company, BW/IP, INC, BYRON JACKSON PUMPS, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar Inc., CINNCINNATTI INCORPORATED, CINCINNATI VALVE COMPANY, to LUNKENHEIMER VALVES, CLEAVER-BROOKS INC., f/k/a CLEAVER- BROOKS, AQUA-CHEM INC., Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc., MUNDET CORP, CUMMINS, INC., DOMCO PRODUCTS TEXAS, INC, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS, WHITE CONSOLIDATED INDUSTRIES, COPES VULCAN, INC, Flowserve US, Inc., Durametallic Corporation, ROCKWELL MANUFACTURING COMPANY, EDWARD VALVE, INC., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., EDWARD VOGT VALVE COMPANY, VOGT VALVE COMPANY, FMC Corporation, CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY, NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY,, Peerless Pump Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER (THE), GOULDS PUMP LLC, GREENE, TWEED NC, LLC, GRINNELL LLL, d/b/a GRINNELL CORPORATION, HEXAGON MANUFACTURING INTELLIGENCE INC, BROWN & SHARPE, INC, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC, ALLIED SIGNAL, INC, BENDIX CORPORATION, HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, BUFFALO FORGE COMPANY, INC, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC, DELAVAL TURBINE, INC, ITT LLC, ITT Corporation, BELL & GOSSETT and FOSTER ENGINEERING, LAMONS GASKET COMPANY, LAMONS METAL GASKET CO, METROLPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.;, MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY, WATTS WATER TECHNOLOGIES, INC, PERMATEX, INC, PNEUMO ABEX LLC, ABEX CORPORATION, RUGGLES KLINGEMANN MFG. CO., SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC, NORTON ABRASIVES, SPIRAX SARCO INC., TACO, INC, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, WARREN PUMPS, LLC, QUIMBY PUMP CO.;, WEIL-MCLAIN CO, THE MARLEY COMPANY, WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY (THE),, Cleaver-Brooks Inc., ABB Motors and Mechanical, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., John Crane, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Domco Products Texas, Inc., Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The), Greene Tweed NC, LLC, Grinnell LLC doing business as Grinnell Corporation, Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc. f/ka Brown & Sharpe, Inc. Honeywell International, Inc. as Sucesssor in Interest to Allied Signal, Inc., and Bendix Corporation, Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Lamons Metal Gasket Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Permatex, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Taco, Inc., Weil-McLain Co., William Powell Company (The), Baldor Electric Company, Eaton Corporation, Kohler Co., Square D Company, York International Corporation, Paramount Global, WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Elliott Company, Alfa Laval, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. doing business as Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc. and Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Jonathan C. Hollinshead
Case Number: 8:2022cv00836
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
2 Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Upon review of #452 the Stipulation of Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant HENKEL US OPERATIONS CORPORATION, incorrectly named as PERMATEX, INC. ONLY. In light of this dismissal without prejudice, the Clerk is DIRECTED to DENY AS MOOT #410 Defendant Henkel US Operations Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. The case shall proceed in the normal course as against the remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/7/2023. (KBC)
November 1, 2023 Filing 453 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of motion re #410 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Permatex, Inc. (Cunningham, Troy) Modified text on 11/2/2023 (KME).
November 1, 2023 Filing 452 STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a) by Permatex, Inc. (Cunningham, Troy) Modified text on 11/2/2023 (KME).
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #448 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline for Daubert Motions and Dispositive Motions. The deadline for Daubert Motions and Dispositive Motions shall be extended to December 4, 2023. All other deadlines in the Fourth Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/18/2023. (KBC)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #449 Defendant, Henkel US Operations Corporation's, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Further Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant shall have up to and including November 1, 2023, to file its reply in further support of its motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/18/2023. (KBC)
October 17, 2023 Filing 449 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #410 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Permatex, Inc.. (Cunningham, Troy)
October 17, 2023 Filing 448 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Daubert Motions and Dispositive Motions by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The), IMO Industries, Inc.. (Melaragno, Peter)
October 6, 2023 Filing 447 RESPONSE in Opposition re #441 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically To file a reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant Rockwell Automation Inc.'s Motion to Strike Addendum Report and Request for Sanctions filed by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey)
October 4, 2023 Filing 446 JOINT Stipulation of Agreed Material Facts re: #410 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Henkel US Operations Corporation, by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey) (Modified on 10/5/2023, to edit text) (BGR).
October 4, 2023 Filing 445 RESPONSE in Opposition re #410 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Henkel US Operations Corporation filed by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Early, Kelsey)
October 2, 2023 Filing 444 REPLY to Response to Motion re #397 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H-Captain Burger Deposition Testimony, #2 Exhibit I-Captain Burger Expert Designation Report)(Horn, Hanson)
September 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 3.09(b) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT BW/IP, INC. and ITS WHOLLY-OWNED SUBSIDIARIES, ONLY, subject to the right of the settling Parties, within sixty (60) calendar days from the date of this Order, to submit a final stipulation of dismissal, should they so choose, or for any party to reopen the case, upon good cause shown. After the sixty (60)-day period, the dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The case shall proceed in the normal course as against the remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/29/2023. (KBC)
September 25, 2023 Filing 442 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by BW/IP, Inc.. (Alley, Todd)
September 22, 2023 Filing 441 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically To file a reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant Rockwell Automation Inc.'s Motion to Strike Addendum Report and Request for Sanctions by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #438 the Parties' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Henkel US Operations Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including October 4, 2023, to file their response to Defendant Henkel US Operations Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/22/2023. (KBC)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #436 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel as to attorney Alexis B. Thomas and Plaintiffs' #437 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel as to attorney Madison M. McComas. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Ms. Thomas and Ms. McComas as Plaintiffs' counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/21/2023. (ACL)
September 20, 2023 Filing 438 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #410 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey)
September 19, 2023 Filing 437 Unopposed MOTION for Madison McComas to Withdraw as Attorney by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
September 19, 2023 Filing 436 Unopposed MOTION for Alexis B. Thomas to Withdraw as Attorney by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
September 18, 2023 Filing 435 RESPONSE in Opposition re #397 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Armstrong Int., filed by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9A, #10 Exhibit 9B)(Early, Kelsey). Modified on 9/19/2023 to edit duplicative text (ABC).
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 3.09(b) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT PARAMOUNT GLOBAL ONLY, subject to the right of the settling Parties, within sixty (60) calendar days from the date of this Order, to submit a final stipulation of dismissal, should they so choose, or for any party to reopen the case, upon good cause shown. After the sixty (60)-day period, the dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The case shall proceed in the normal course as against the remaining Defendants. In light of the Parties' Notice of Settlement, Counsel Lawrence D. Wilson is relieved from complying with the Court's Order to submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/14/2023. (KBC)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 3.09(b) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLC, ONLY, subject to the right of the settling Parties, within sixty (60) calendar days from the date of this Order, to submit a final stipulation of dismissal, should they so choose, or for any party to reopen the case, upon good cause shown. After the sixty (60)-day period, the dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The case shall proceed in the normal course as against the remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/14/2023. (KBC)
September 12, 2023 Filing 432 NOTICE of settlement of Paramount Global, only, by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk (Early, Kelsey)
September 12, 2023 Filing 431 NOTICE of settlement for Pneumo Abex, only, by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk (Early, Kelsey)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #401 Defendant Pneumo Abex LLC's Motion in Limine and Motion under Daubert and Rule 702 to Exclude [Allegedly] Flawed Data from a 1938 Saranac Laboratory Experiment. In light of Defendant's Notice to Withdraw Motion in Limine and Motion under Daubert and Rule 702 to Exclude the Data from a 1938 Saranac Laboratory Experiment #428 due to a pending settlement between the Parties, the Court denies without prejudice Defendant Penumo Abex LLC's Motion. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/11/2023. (KBC)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., ONLY. Each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs associated with the claims against Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc. The case shall proceed in the normal course as against the remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/11/2023. (KBC)
September 11, 2023 Filing 428 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of motion re #401 Motion In Limine filed by Pneumo Abex LLC by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Sturge, Clarke) Modified text on 9/12/2023 (GL).
September 7, 2023 Filing 427 JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Mason, W) Modified text on 9/7/2023 (JK).
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon review of the record, the Court finds that Lawrence D. Wilson has not registered for CM/ECF access. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel to register for CM/ECF access by September 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/6/2023. (BCH)
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ENDORSED ORDER DIRECTING Counsel Lawrence D. Wilson to comply with the Court's Order #362 issued on June 21, 2023, and the Court's Notice to Counsel 383 issued on July 31, 2023, both of which directed Counsel to submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. Counsel Lawrence D. Wilson shall register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration form through PACER within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply will result in Counsel's permission to appear pro hac vice being rescinded. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/5/2023. (KBC)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' #414 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel as to attorney Madison M. McComas and #417 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel as to attorney Alexis B. Thomas. It appears the motions fail to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 9/1/2023. (ACL)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 421 FOURTH AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by May 10, 2024. Jury Trial set for June 2024 Trial Term, which commences on June 3, 2024, with a more precise date to follow. See Fourth Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order for further details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/1/2023. (KBC)
August 30, 2023 Filing 420 RESPONSE in Opposition re #392 MOTION to Strike the Addendum to the Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Candace Su-Jung Tsai, MS, ScD, CIH and Request for Sanctions filed by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24)(Early, Kelsey)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY LLC, ONLY. In light of this dismissal without prejudice, the Clerk is DIRECTED to DENY AS MOOT Defendant Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company's Motion for Summary Judgment #380. The case shall proceed in the normal course as against the remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/25/2023. (KBC)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ENDORSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 3.09(b) of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT ITT LLC, ONLY, subject to the right of the settling Parties, within sixty (60) calendar days from the date of this Order, to submit a final stipulation of dismissal, should they so choose, or for any party to reopen the case, upon good cause shown. After the sixty (60)-day period, the dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The case shall proceed in the normal course as against the remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/25/2023. (KBC)
August 25, 2023 Filing 417 MOTION for Alexis Thomas to Withdraw as Attorney by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Thomas, Alexis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER of DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT REDCO CORPORATION F/K/A CRANE CO. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/25/2023. (KBC)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/25/2023. (KBC)
August 25, 2023 Filing 414 MOTION for Madison McComas to Withdraw as Attorney by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (McComas, Madison) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #384 Opposed Motion for Extension to Complete Discovery. For the reasons discussed at the August 24, 2023, hearing on the matter, the discovery deadline is extended until October 2, 2023, and the deadline to file dispositive motions and Daubert motions is extended until November 4, 2023. The discovery deadline is extended solely to accommodate the continued deposition of Dr. Candace Su-Jung Tsai. For the reasons stated at the hearing, Dr. Tsai's deposition shall address her "Addendum Report," with the understanding that the Court will resolve at a later date whether the "Addendum Report" will be excluded. The Court will separately enter a Fourth Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order resetting the remaining deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/25/2023. (ACL)
August 24, 2023 Filing 422 Minute Entry. Virtual Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite: MOTION HEARING held on 8/24/2023 re #384 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Wanda Algarin Talarczyk, Francis Talarczyk. (Digital) (AMS) Modified on 9/1/2023 to correct date. (AMS)
August 24, 2023 Filing 412 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Hanson Horn on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc.. Lead Counsel: (Horn, Hanson)
August 22, 2023 Filing 411 NOTICE of settlement as to ITT Corporation, only by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk (Early, Kelsey) Modified on 8/23/2023 (JK).
August 21, 2023 Filing 410 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Permatex, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cunningham, Troy)
August 21, 2023 Filing 409 NOTICE of Non-Objection by Pneumo Abex LLC of Non-Objection (Sturge, Clarke) Modified to edit docket text on 8/22/2023 (HAI).
August 21, 2023 Filing 408 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
August 21, 2023 Filing 407 NOTICE of Non-Objection by Taco, Inc. (Medina, Eduardo) Modified on 8/22/2023 (HAI).
August 21, 2023 Filing 406 RESPONSE in Opposition re #384 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Horn, Hanson)
August 21, 2023 Filing 405 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of motion re #380 Motion for Summary Judgmentfiled by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC (Melaragno, Peter)
August 21, 2023 Filing 404 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC. (Melaragno, Peter) Modified to edit text on 8/22/2023 (HAI).
August 21, 2023 Filing 403 RESPONSE to Motion re #384 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by General Electric Company. (Collings, Christopher)
August 21, 2023 Filing 402 RESPONSE to Motion re #384 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Collings, Christopher)
August 21, 2023 Filing 401 MOTION In Limine and Motion Under Daubert and Rule 702 to Exclude Flawed Data from a 1938 Saranac Laboratory Experiment by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C, #4 Exhibit Attachment D, #5 Exhibit Attachment E, #6 Exhibit Attachment F, #7 Exhibit Attachment G, #8 Exhibit Attachment H, #9 Exhibit Attachment I, #10 Exhibit Attachment J, #11 Exhibit Attachment K, #12 Exhibit Attachment L, #13 Exhibit Attachment M, #14 Exhibit Attachment N, #15 Exhibit Attachment O, #16 Exhibit Attachment P, #17 Exhibit Attachment Q, #18 Exhibit Attachment R, #19 Exhibit Attachment S, #20 Exhibit Attachment T, #21 Exhibit Attachment U, #22 Exhibit Attachment V, #23 Exhibit Attachment W, #24 Exhibit Attachment X, #25 Exhibit Attachment Y, #26 Exhibit Attachment Z, #27 Exhibit Attachment AA, #28 Exhibit Attachment BB, #29 Exhibit AX 600, #30 Exhibit AX 600A, #31 Exhibit AX 601, #32 Exhibit AX 602, #33 Exhibit AX 603, #34 Exhibit AX 604, #35 Exhibit AX 605, #36 Exhibit AX 606, #37 Exhibit AX 607, #38 Exhibit AX 608, #39 Exhibit AX 611, #40 Exhibit AX 618, #41 Exhibit AX 632, #42 Exhibit AX 637, #43 Exhibit AX 638, #44 Exhibit AX 639, #45 Exhibit AX 639.1, #46 Exhibit AX 640, #47 Exhibit AX 640A, #48 Exhibit AX 640.1, #49 Exhibit AX 640.1A, #50 Exhibit AX 641, #51 Exhibit AX 642, #52 Exhibit AX 644, #53 Exhibit AX 652, #54 Exhibit AX 653, #55 Exhibit AX 681, #56 Exhibit AX 739, #57 Exhibit AX 739.1, #58 Exhibit AX 743, #59 Exhibit AX 746, #60 Exhibit AX 748, #61 Exhibit AX 783)(Sturge, Clarke) Modified on 8/21/2023 to edit docket text (AJS).
August 21, 2023 Filing 400 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Hanson Horn, Lucia Veronica Pazos, Melanie E. Chung-Tims and Melanie E. Chung-Tims for Armstrong International Inc. of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
August 21, 2023 Filing 399 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Edward J. Briscoe and Peter J. Melaragno for IMO Industries, Inc. of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
August 18, 2023 Filing 398 Joint STIPULATION of Agreed Material Fact re #397 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Armstrong International, Inc. (Horn, Hanson) Modified on 8/21/2023 to edit docket text (AJS).
August 18, 2023 Filing 397 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Armstrong International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Deposition Testimony, #2 Exhibit Carmen Favorito Deposition Testimony, #3 Exhibit Captain Burger Report, #4 Exhibit Candace Tsai Report, #5 Exhibit Dr, David Zhang Report, #6 Exhibit Dr, David Rosner Report)(Horn, Hanson) Modified on 8/21/2023 to edit docket text (AJS).
August 18, 2023 Filing 396 NOTICE of Non-Objection by IMO Industries, Inc. re 390 Order (Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 8/21/2023 to edit docket text (AJS).
August 18, 2023 Filing 395 NOTICE of Non-Objection by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The) re 390 Order (Melaragno, Peter) Modified on 8/21/2023 to edit docket text (AJS).
August 18, 2023 Filing 394 RESPONSE to Motion re #384 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by BW/IP, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Alley, Todd) Modified on 8/21/2023 to edit docket text (BCB).
August 17, 2023 Filing 393 RESPONSE to Motion re #384 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Chung-Tims, Melanie) Modified text on 8/21/2023 (GL).
August 16, 2023 Filing 392 MOTION to Strike the Addendum to the Report of Plaintiffs' Expert Candace Su-Jung Tsai, MS, ScD, CIH and Request for Sanctions by Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Candance Tsai - Industrial Hygiene Report, #2 Exhibit B - Candance Tsai - Continued Deposition - 07-28-23, #3 Exhibit C - Case IH report with Addendum)(Chung-Tims, Melanie)
August 16, 2023 Filing 391 NOTICE OF HEARING re: Plaintiffs' #384 Opposed Motion for Extension to Complete Discovery. Oral argument on this motion is set for August 24, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite via Zoom videoconference. All pertinent parties will receive a Zoom videoconference invitation by separate email. Each person who participates in the proceeding must attend using his or her own device so that he or she appears on a separate screen during the videoconference.(ACL)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ENDORSED ORDER re: Plaintiffs' #384 Opposed Motion for Extension to Complete Discovery. Although Plaintiffs designate the motion as contested, no Defendant has filed a response to the motion, which allows the Court to deem the motion as unopposed. M.D. Fla. R. 3.01(c). Out of an abundance of caution, however, no later than August 21, 2023, each Defendant shall file either a response in opposition to the motion or a notice stating that it does not object to the requested relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/16/2023. (ACL)
August 14, 2023 Filing 389 NOTICE of settlement for Redco Corporation, only, by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk (Early, Kelsey)
August 14, 2023 Filing 388 NOTICE of settlement for Union Carbide Corporation, only, by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk (Early, Kelsey)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUIDCE as to Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/10/2023. (KBC)
August 4, 2023 Filing 386 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal for Honeywell INT. by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey) (Modified on 8/4/2023 to edit docket text) (JDR).
August 3, 2023 Filing 385 RESPONSE to Motion re #378 MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie) (Modified on 8/4/2023 to edit docket text) (JDR).
July 31, 2023 Filing 384 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
July 31, 2023 Filing 383 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Lawrence D. Wilson of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JNB)
July 31, 2023 Filing 382 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:22-cv-836-MSS-UAM. Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy no longer assigned to the case. (JNB)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT JOHN CRANE, INC. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/31/2023. (KBC) Modified on 7/31/2023 (KBC).
July 28, 2023 Filing 380 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1-Declaration of Paul Callow in Support of Chicago Pneumatic's Motion for Summary Judgment (Talarczyk), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2-Plaintiff's Handwritten Product List (produced by Pltfs), #3 Exhibit Ex. 3-Report (#2) of Dr. David Zhang (dated 5-8-23), #4 Exhibit Ex. 4-Zhang, David MD Deposition 6-22-23 MINI)(Briscoe, Edward)
July 24, 2023 Filing 379 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to John Crane Inc. by John Crane, Inc. (Selman, Stephanie) Modified on 7/25/2023 to remove duplicate punctuation. (LD).
July 20, 2023 Filing 378 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Early, Kelsey)
July 17, 2023 Filing 377 REPLY to Response to Motion re #373 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #363 Response in Opposition to Motion #329 Final MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #373 Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to its Motion for Final Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Defendant shall have up to and including July 20, 2023, to file its Reply. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/6/2023. (KBC)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 375 THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 12/15/2023. Jury Trial set for March 2024 Trial Term, which commences on 3/4/2024, with a more precise date to follow. See Case Management and Scheduling Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/3/2023. (CM)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ENDORSED ORDER granting #372 Joint Motion for Extension to Complete Discovery and File Dispositive or Daubert Motions. The Court finds good cause to grant the requested extensions and to sua sponte extend all subsequent deadlines by a period of at least 30 days. The Court will enter a Third Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order resetting the remaining deadlines by a period of 30 days, subject to the Court's calendar. All other provisions of the Court's prior scheduling orders remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/3/2023. (CM)
July 3, 2023 Filing 373 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #363 Response in Opposition to Motion #329 Final MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
June 30, 2023 Filing 372 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 30, 2023 Filing 371 REPLY to Response to Motion re #325 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The). (Briscoe, Edward)
June 29, 2023 Filing 370 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Ferguson on behalf of Taco, Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy)
June 29, 2023 Filing 369 REPLY to Response to Motion re #322 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Taco, Inc.. (Medina, Eduardo)
June 28, 2023 Filing 368 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernardo Pimentel, II on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Pimentel, Bernardo)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting #366 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Written Designations and Consent to Act. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Brian J. Schneider to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Brian J. Schneider must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Brian J. Schneider must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/26/2023. (CBB)
June 25, 2023 Filing 366 Unopposed MOTION for Brian J. Schneider to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20975679 for $150 Written Designations and Consent to Act by John Crane, Inc.. (Selman, Stephanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 22, 2023 Filing 365 STATEMENT of undisputed facts re: #1 Notice of Removal Parties' Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts by Rockwell Automation, Inc... (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
June 22, 2023 Filing 364 NOTICE of Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Notice of Designation and Appearance of Counsel and Designation of Email Addresses Appearance by Erik David Nadolink on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Nadolink, Erik)
June 22, 2023 Filing 363 RESPONSE in Opposition re #329 Final MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law for Rockwell Automation filed by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Early, Kelsey)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER granting #360 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lawrence D. Wilson, Jr., Esq., Designation of Local Counsel, and Consent to Act. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Lawrence D. Wilson, Jr. to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Lawrence D. Wilson, Jr. must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Lawrence D. Wilson, Jr. must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/21/2023. (CBB)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting #359 Defendant's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Philip J. O'Rourke to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Philip J. O'Rourke must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Philip J. O'Rourke must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/21/2023. (CBB)
June 20, 2023 Filing 360 Unopposed MOTION for Lawrence D. Wilson, Jr. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20958987 for $150 by Paramount Global. (Collings, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 20, 2023 Filing 359 Consent MOTION for Philip J. O'Rourke to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20957204 for $150 by Permatex, Inc.. (Cunningham, Troy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 20, 2023 Filing 358 RESPONSE in Opposition re #342 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #337 Reply to affirmative defenses nos. 10-11 and 63-66 filed by John Crane, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A - Francis Talarczyk Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit B - Carmen Favorito Deposition Transcript)(Selman, Stephanie) Modified on 6/21/2023 (LD).
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER granting #354 The Renewed Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Speziali, Esq., Designation of Local Counsel, and Consent to Act. The Clerk of Court is directed to add David Speziali to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, David Speziali must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, David Speziali must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/20/2023. (CBB)
June 16, 2023 Filing 356 RESPONSE in Opposition re #322 MOTION for Summary Judgment For Taco, Inc., filed by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Early, Kelsey)
June 16, 2023 Filing 355 RESPONSE in Opposition re #325 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law Statement of "Undisputed" Facts, filed by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey)
June 16, 2023 Filing 354 Unopposed MOTION for David Speziali to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20952633 for $150 (Renewed Motion) by General Electric Company. (Collings, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 16, 2023 Filing 353 RESPONSE in Opposition re #325 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law For Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., filed by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Early, Kelsey) Modified on 6/20/2023 (LD).
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant ABB MOTORS and MECHANICAL INC., f/k/a BALDOR ELECTRIC COMPANY, ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/16/2023. (KBC)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC, ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/16/2023. (KBC)
June 16, 2023 Filing 350 STATEMENT of undisputed facts re: #325 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk.. (Early, Kelsey)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 349 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #346 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Speziali, Esq., Designation of Local Counsel, and Consent to Act. Local Rule 2.01(c)(2) requires that a lawyer moving for special admission be "a member in good standing of the bar of a United States district court." Based on the representations in the motion, Mr. Sepziali appears to be only a member of the state bar of New Jersey. (Doc. 346 at 5). Counsel may renew the motion to provide additional information that would bring the request into full compliance with the Local Rules. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/16/2023. (CBB)
June 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting #347 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Erik D. Nadolink, Esq., Designation of Local Counsel, and Consent to Act. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Erik D. Nadolink to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Erik D. Nadolink must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Erik D. Nadolink must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/16/2023. (CBB)
June 16, 2023 Filing 347 Unopposed MOTION for Erik D. Nadolink to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20951505 for $150 by General Electric Company. (Collings, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 16, 2023 Filing 346 MOTION for David Speziali to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20951399 for $150 by General Electric Company. (Collings, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 14, 2023 Filing 345 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Goulds Pump LLC. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #342 Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike John Crane Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses Nos. 10-11 and 63-66. Defendant John Crane Inc. shall have up to and including June 20, 2023, to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/13/2023. (KBC)
June 13, 2023 Filing 343 STIPULATION of Agreed Material Facts by Taco, Inc. (Medina, Eduardo)
June 12, 2023 Filing 342 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #337 Reply to affirmative defenses nos. 10-11 and 63-66 by John Crane, Inc.. (Selman, Stephanie)
June 12, 2023 Filing 341 NOTICE of Appearance by Madison McComas on behalf of Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk (McComas, Madison)
June 9, 2023 Filing 340 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) Without Prejudice as to ABB Motors and Mechanical, Inc. f/k/a Baldor Electric Company by ABB Motors and Mechanical, Inc.. (Cunningham, Troy)
June 8, 2023 Filing 339 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis Thomas on behalf of Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk (Thomas, Alexis)
May 31, 2023 Filing 338 MEDIATION report Hearing held on May 24, 2023. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Hollingshead, Jonathan)
May 30, 2023 Filing 337 REPLY to affirmative defenses by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Early, Kelsey)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc. f/k/a Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/30/2023. (KBC)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Grinnell LLC ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/30/2023. (KBC)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Flowserve US, Inc. (as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation) ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/30/2023. (KBC)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Elliot Company ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/30/2023. (KBC)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/30/2023. (KBC)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/30/2023. (KBC)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Howden North America Inc. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/30/2023. (KBC)
May 23, 2023 Filing 329 Final MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A - Deposition Transcript of Francis Talarczyk)(Chung-Tims, Melanie)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #327 Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Written Designations and Consent to Act. The Clerk of Court is directed to add J. Yasmin Simon to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, J. Yasmin Simon must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, J. Yasmin Simon must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/22/2023. (CBB)
May 22, 2023 Filing 327 Unopposed MOTION for J. Yasmin Simon to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20861409 for $150 by Goulds Pump LLC, ITT LLC. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
May 19, 2023 Filing 326 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant FLOWSERVE US, INC., (as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation) by Flowserve US, Inc. (Alley, Todd) Modified on 5/22/2023 (LD).
May 19, 2023 Filing 325 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Talarczyk, Francis Discovery Deposition 10-06-22 Vol. I, #2 Exhibit Talarczyk, Francis Discovery Deposition 10-07-22 Vol. II, #3 Exhibit Talarczyk, Francis Deposition 10-19-22, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Handwritten Product List, #5 Exhibit Favorito, Carmen deposition 3-2-23, #6 Exhibit 2012-07-26 Pantaleoni, Anthony-CA-Kent, #7 Exhibit 2006-01-26 Pantaleoni, Anthony - Riggle, 2003-03-11 Pantaleoni, Anthony - Barletta, #8 Exhibit Report of John Spencer, CIH (for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company), #9 Exhibit Report of Dr. Candace Tsai, #10 Exhibit Report of Dr. Zhang, #11 Exhibit Report of Capt. Francis Burger)(Melaragno, Peter)
May 18, 2023 Filing 324 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Melaragno, Peter)
May 18, 2023 Filing 323 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Valves and Controls US, Inc. by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. (Melaragno, Peter)
May 18, 2023 Filing 322 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Taco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Talarcyzk - Depos vol 1-vol 3, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Favorito Carmen deposition, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Burger Expert Report, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Tsai - Industrial Hygiene Report 1-10-23, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Dr. David Zhang Report 11-15-22, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Dr. Rosner Expert Report - 11-9-11)(Medina, Eduardo)
May 17, 2023 Filing 321 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Grinnell LLC. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
May 17, 2023 Filing 320 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Elliott Company. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
May 17, 2023 Filing 319 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Cleaver-Brooks Inc.. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
May 16, 2023 Filing 318 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Howden North America. (Lehner, Steven)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendant RUGGLES KLINGEMANN MANUFACTURING, CO. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/10/2023. (KBC)
May 8, 2023 Filing 316 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ruggles Klingemann MFG. CO.. (Garcia, Daniel)
May 8, 2023 Filing 315 JOHN CRANE INC.'S AMENDED ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by John Crane, Inc..(Selman, Stephanie)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER granting #270 Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File its Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant shall file its Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses as a separate document on or before Tuesday, May 9, 2023. Plaintiffs shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Answer within 21 days of its filing. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/5/2023. (KBC)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #310 Defendant Redco Corp.'s Unopposed Motion Extending Expert Disclosure Deadlines. Defendant Redco Corp. shall have up to and including May 5, 2023, to serve its expert witness disclosures and provide expert witness reports. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including May 19, 2023 to serve their expert rebuttal reports, if any. All other deadlines in the Second Amended Case Management Scheduling Order shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/26/2023. (KBC)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #306 Defendant Armstrong International Inc.'s Unopposed Motion Extending Expert Disclosure Deadlines. Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. shall have up to and including May 5, 2023, to serve its expert witness disclosures and provide expert witness reports. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including May 19, 2023 to provide their expert rebuttal reports, if any. All other deadlines in the Second Amended Case Management Scheduling Order shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/26/2023. (KBC)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #305 Defendant Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., F/K/A Norton Company's Partially Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Disclose Expert Reports. Pursuant to the Court's Second Amended Case Management Scheduling Order, Plaintiffs completed their expert witness disclosures and expert witness reports as of January 27, 2023. Defendant shall have up to and including May 5, 2023, to serve its expert witness disclosures and provide expert witness reports. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including May 19, 2023 to provide their expert rebuttal reports, if any. All other deadlines in the Second Amended Case Management Scheduling Order shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/26/2023. (KBC)
April 21, 2023 Filing 310 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Reports and Disclosure by Crane Co.. (Johnson, Rasheem)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant The William Powell Company ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/21/2023. (KBC)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/21/2023. (KBC)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Kohler Co. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/21/2023. (KBC)
April 21, 2023 Filing 306 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Disclosure Deadlines by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Horn, Hanson)
April 21, 2023 Filing 305 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Reports Disclosure by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc.. (Alley, Todd)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Eaton Corporation ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/21/2023. (KBC) Modified text on 4/24/2023 (LSS).
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Flowserve US, Inc. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/21/2023. (KBC) Modified text on 4/24/2023 (LSS).
April 20, 2023 Filing 302 REPLY to Response to Motion re #271 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File Its Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by John Crane, Inc.. (Selman, Stephanie)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #300 Defendant John Crane, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion Extending Expert Disclosure Deadlines. Defendant John Crane, Inc. shall have up to and including May 5, 2023, to serve its expert witness disclosures and provide expert witness reports. All other deadlines in the Second Amended Case Management Scheduling Order shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/20/2023. (KBC)
April 19, 2023 Filing 300 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Disclosure Deadlines by John Crane, Inc.. (Selman, Stephanie)
April 18, 2023 Filing 299 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant The William Powell Company by William Powell Company (The). (Melaragno, Peter)
April 18, 2023 Filing 298 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc. by Spirax Sarco Inc.. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 18, 2023 Filing 297 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Eaton Corporation by Eaton Corporation. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 18, 2023 Filing 296 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Kohler Co.. (Medina, Eduardo)
April 17, 2023 Filing 295 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Flowserve, only, by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey)
April 10, 2023 Filing 294 NOTICE of change of address by Melanie E. Chung-Tims (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 10, 2023 Filing 293 NOTICE of change of address by Amanda Rae Cachaldora (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 10, 2023 Filing 292 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 10, 2023 Filing 291 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant VELAN VALVE, CORP. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/7/2023. (KBC)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting #285 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and #286 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Amanda Cachaldora and Melanie Chung-Tims as counsel of record for Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. and to remove them from the electronic service list in CM/ECF for this case. Additionally, the Clerk of Court is directed to add Edward J. Briscoe and Peter J. Melaragno of Fowler White Burnett, P.A. to the service list as counsel of record for Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/7/2023. (CBB)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #284 Defendant John Crane, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File A Reply to Plaintiffs' Response In Opposition to John Crane, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Its Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including April 20, 2023 to file its reply memorandum not to exceed (10) pages. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/6/2023. (KBC)
April 5, 2023 Filing 287 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Velan Valve Corp.. (Garcia, Daniel)
April 5, 2023 Filing 286 MOTION for Melanie Chung-Tims to Withdraw as Attorney by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
April 5, 2023 Filing 285 MOTION for Amanda Cachaldora to Withdraw as Attorney by IMO Industries, Inc.. (Cachaldora, Amanda) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
April 4, 2023 Filing 284 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :John Crane Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to John Crane Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File its Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint by John Crane, Inc.. (Selman, Stephanie)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/3/2023. (KBC)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/3/2023. (KBC)
March 28, 2023 Filing 281 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Mueller Steam Specialty only, by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey)
March 28, 2023 Filing 280 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Blackmer Pump Company. (Alley, Todd)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting #278 Unopposed Motion for Admission of Pro Hac Vice, Written Designations and Consent to Act. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Kathryn Skagerberg to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Kathryn Skagerberg must send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Kathryn Skagerberg must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/24/2023. (CBB)
March 24, 2023 Filing 278 Unopposed MOTION for Kathryn Skagerberg to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20647687 for $150 by John Crane, Inc.. (Selman, Stephanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/23/2023. (KBC)
March 20, 2023 Filing 276 RESPONSE in Opposition re #270 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to Amend its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Early, Kelsey) Modified on 3/21/2023 to modify text. (LD).
March 20, 2023 Filing 275 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Francis Talarczyk (Early, Kelsey)
March 16, 2023 Filing 274 NOTICE by Gardner Denver, Inc. of amended local rule 3.01(g) certificate regarding its motion for leave to file its amended answer and affirmative defenses to plaintiff's first amended complaint (Kibbe, Rebecca)
March 16, 2023 Filing 273 NOTICE by John Crane, Inc. re #270 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to Amend its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Selman, Stephanie)
March 15, 2023 Filing 272 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 5/15/23 and 5/24/23 before John Hollingshead. (Early, Kelsey)
March 6, 2023 Filing 271 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to File Its Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Kibbe, Rebecca)
March 6, 2023 Filing 270 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Leave to Amend its Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint by John Crane, Inc.. (Selman, Stephanie)
February 15, 2023 Filing 269 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 5/24/2023 at 10 AM EST before John Hollingshead. (Early, Kelsey)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 268 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 11/15/2023. Jury Trial set for FEBRUARY 2024 Trial Term, which commences on January 29, 2024, with a more precise date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 5/26/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/27/2023. (EOJ)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Marley-Wylain. This case shall continue in the normal course as to all remaining defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/27/2023. (EOJ)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Caterpillar Inc. This case shall continue in the normal course as to all remaining defendants. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/27/2023. (EOJ)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #264 the Parties' Joint Motion to Amend the Case Management and Scheduling Order. An Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order will be issued by separate notice. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/27/2023. (EOJ)
January 26, 2023 Filing 264 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certain Deadlines and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Plaintiffs and by All Defendants. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
January 26, 2023 Filing 263 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Caterpillar Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy)
January 26, 2023 Filing 262 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Caterpillar Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting #259 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Timothy Clark as counsel of record for Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. and to remove him from the electronic service list in CM/ECF for this case. Additionally, the Clerk of Court is directed to add Caitlyn R. McCutcheon of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP to the service list as counsel of record for Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/9/2023. (CBB)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 260 AMENDED ORDER granting #257 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant, Gardner Denver, Inc. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Todd C. Alley as counsel of record for Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. The Clerk of Court also is directed to add Rebecca C. Kibbe to the service list as counsel of record for Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. See Amended Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/6/2023. (CBB)
January 6, 2023 Filing 259 MOTION for Timothy Clark to Withdraw as Attorney by Cleaver-Brooks Inc.. (Clark, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting #257 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant, Gardner Denver, Inc. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Rebecca C. Kibbe as counsel of record for Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. The Clerk of Court also is directed to add Todd C. Alley to the service list as counsel of record for Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/6/2023. (CBB)
January 4, 2023 Filing 257 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kibbe, Rebecca) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
January 3, 2023 Filing 256 ***TERMINATED, INCORRECT EVENT CODE, COUNSEL NOTIFIED. CORRECT CODE; MOTION*** STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant, Gardner Denver, Inc. by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kibbe, Rebecca) Modified on 1/4/2023 (LD).
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Lamons Gasket Company ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/20/2022. (MTP)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 9/25/2023. Jury Trial set for the November 2023 Trial Term, which commences October 30, 2023, with a more precise date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by February 27, 2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/6/2022. (MTP)
December 5, 2022 Filing 253 NOTICE by Armstrong International, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Caterpillar Inc., Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC, Cleaver-Brooks Inc., Eaton Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc.(solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valve, Inc, Nordstrom Valves, Inc, Edward Vogt Valve Company and Vogt Valve Company), Goulds Pump LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. Defendants' Amended Notice of Reservation of Rights Pending Entry of Amended Case Mangement and Scheduling Order Pursuant to Endorsed Order from the Court (Selman, Stephanie) Modified on 12/6/2022 to modify text. (LD).
December 5, 2022 Filing 252 NOTICE by Armstrong International, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Caterpillar Inc., Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC, Cleaver-Brooks Inc., Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Flowserve US, Inc.(solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valve, Inc, Nordstrom Valves, Inc, Edward Vogt Valve Company and Vogt Valve Company), Flowserve US, Inc., John Crane, Inc. Of Reservation of Rights Pending Entry of Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order pursuant to endorsed Order from the Court (Selman, Stephanie)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #240 [Plaintiffs'] [Unopposed] Motion for Extension of Disclosure of Expert Witness Reports. Defendants have informed the Court that they have now conferred and come to an agreement to a modified CMSO. #250 As such, Plaintiffs' new deadline is January, 19 2023 to disclose expert witnesses and reports; Defendants' new deadline is February 20, 2023 to disclose expert witnesses and reports; and the rebuttal expert report deadline is March 6, 2023. An amended CMSO will be entered via separate order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/22/2022. (MTP)
November 22, 2022 Filing 250 RESPONSE to Motion re #240 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Reports Amended Response and Notice of Agreement Between the Parties as to a Modified Case Management and Scheduling Order filed by Armstrong International, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC, Cleaver-Brooks Inc., Crane Co., Electrolux Home Products, Inc., FMC Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc.(solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valve, Inc, Nordstrom Valves, Inc, Edward Vogt Valve Company and Vogt Valve Company), Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The), IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Kohler Co., Mueller Steam Specialty, Paramount Global, Pneumo Abex LLC, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Spirax Sarco Inc., Taco, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., Weil-McLain Co., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., William Powell Company (The). (Kibbe, Rebecca)
November 22, 2022 Filing 249 NOTICE by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk (Early, Kelsey)
November 18, 2022 Filing 248 RESPONSE to Motion re #240 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Reports filed by Armstrong International, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC, Cleaver-Brooks Inc., Crane Co., Electrolux Home Products, Inc., FMC Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc.(solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valve, Inc, Nordstrom Valves, Inc, Edward Vogt Valve Company and Vogt Valve Company), Flowserve US, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The), IMO Industries, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Kohler Co., Mueller Steam Specialty, Paramount Global, Pneumo Abex LLC, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc., Spirax Sarco Inc., Taco, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., Weil-McLain Co., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., William Powell Company (The). (Kibbe, Rebecca)
November 16, 2022 Filing 247 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Lamons Gasket Company by Lamons Gasket Company. (Yount, Scott)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER OF DISMISSAL without PREJUDICE as to Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/15/2022. (MTP)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER OF DISMISSAL without PREJUDICE as to Defendant Aurora Pump Company ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/15/2022. (MTP)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER OF DISMISSAL without PREJUDICE as to Defendant Warren Pumps LLC ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/15/2022. (MTP)
November 10, 2022 Filing 243 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Aurora Pump Company. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
November 10, 2022 Filing 242 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
November 10, 2022 Filing 241 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
November 4, 2022 Filing 240 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Expert Reports by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Cummins, Inc. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/4/2022. (MTP)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Cincinnati, Inc. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/4/2022. (MTP)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #199 Defendants' Motion for Limited Modification of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order to Permit All Defendants Additional Time to Seek Leave to Amend Affirmative Defenses Regarding Non-Party Liability (Fabre Defendants); DENYING AS MOOT #211 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Limited Modification of the Court's Management and Scheduling Order; GRANTING #235 the Joint Motion for Extension of Mediation Deadline. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/2/2022. (MTP)
October 25, 2022 Filing 236 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Cummins, Inc.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
October 24, 2022 Filing 235 Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Joint Motion for Extension of Mediation Deadline and Supporting Memorandum of Law by John Crane, Inc.. (Pazos, Lucia)
October 20, 2022 Filing 234 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Cinncinnatti Incorporated. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #47 Defendant Alfa Laval Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. The Court previously dismissed without prejudice Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc. from this matter. #163 Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 10/14/2022. (MTP)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 232 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #231 Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.'s Request for Copies for failure to comply with this Court's Local Rules. Most significantly, the motion fails to comply with M.D. Fla. R. 3.01(a), which requires that a motion include "a concise statement of the precise relief requested, a statement of the basis for the request, and a legal memorandum supporting the request," and M.D. Fla. R. 3.01(g), which requires a movant to "confer with the opposing party in a good faith effort to resolve the motion" and include in the motion a certification stating inter alia whether the parties agree to the resolution of the motion. The motion also fails to comply with the Court's typography requirements. See M.D. Fla. R. 1.08. Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. may renew its motion in full compliance with the Local Rules, including M.D. Fla. Rs. 1.08 and 3.01. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/13/2022. (CM)
October 13, 2022 Filing 231 MOTION for Copies by Cleaver-Brooks Inc.. (Clark, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
October 6, 2022 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy P. Cunningham on behalf of ABB Motors and Mechanical, Inc. (Cunningham, Troy)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 229 AMENDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/22/2022. (MTP)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting #227 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, Written Designations and Consent to Act. The Clerk of Court is directed to add Eric G. Reeves to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Eric G. Reeves must complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/9/2022. (WJF)
September 8, 2022 Filing 227 Unopposed MOTION for Eric G. Reeves to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-19976441 for $150 by John Crane, Inc.. (Selman, Stephanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
September 8, 2022 Filing 226 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand re Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Howden North America.(Lehner, Steven)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/7/2022. (MTP)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to DEFENDANT RUGGLES KLINGEMANN MFG. CO. ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 9/7/2022. (MTP)
September 7, 2022 Filing 223 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand re Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Flowserve US, Inc..(Alley, Todd)
September 6, 2022 Filing 222 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand re Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Mueller Steam Specialty.(Alley, Todd)
September 6, 2022 Filing 221 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand re Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Alley, Todd)
September 6, 2022 Filing 220 AMENDED document by Gardner Denver, Inc.. Amendment to #212 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Alley, Todd)
September 6, 2022 Filing 219 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand re Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by BW/IP, Inc..(Alley, Todd)
September 6, 2022 Filing 218 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand re Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Blackmer Pump Company.(Alley, Todd)
September 6, 2022 Filing 217 ***TERMINATED, INCORRECT CAPTION, COUNSEL NOTIFIED*** ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand re Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Flowserve US, Inc..(Alley, Todd) Modified on 9/7/2022 (LD).
September 6, 2022 Filing 216 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand re Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc..(Alley, Todd)
September 6, 2022 Filing 215 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of motion re #205 Motion to Strike filed by Ruggles Klingemann MFG. CO. by Ruggles Klingemann MFG. CO. (Beck, Christopher)
September 6, 2022 Filing 214 NOTICE of settlement of Ruggles Klingemann Mfg. Co., by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk (Early, Kelsey)
August 31, 2022 Filing 213 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Tacktill, Scott)
August 29, 2022 Filing 212 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand, Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Gardner Denver, Inc... (Alley, Todd)
August 23, 2022 Filing 211 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :A Reply To Plaintiffs' Response In Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Limited Modification Of The Court's Management And Scheduling Order by ABB Motors and Mechanical, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Blackmer Pump Company, Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC, Cleaver-Brooks Inc., Eaton Corporation, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc.(solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valve, Inc, Nordstrom Valves, Inc, Edward Vogt Valve Company and Vogt Valve Company), Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Howden North America, John Crane, Inc., Lamons Gasket Company, Mueller Steam Specialty, Pneumo Abex LLC, Ruggles Klingemann MFG. CO., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corp.. (Pazos, Lucia)
August 22, 2022 Filing 210 RESPONSE to Motion re #205 MOTION to Strike Extraneous Plaintiff and Motion to Dismiss filed by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Second Amended Complaint)(Early, Kelsey)
August 22, 2022 Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by Hanson Horn on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Horn, Hanson)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting #206 Joint Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel, which the Court construes as a motion for Charles E. Reynolds and the Law Firm Tyson & Mendes, LLP to withdraw as counsel of record. Charles E. Reynolds and the Law Firm Tyson & Mendes, LLP have no further responsibility in this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Charles E. Reynolds as counsel of record for Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. and to remove him from the electronic service list in CM/ECF for this case. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/12/2022. (WJF)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 207 OMNIBUS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #179 Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to Take Plaintiff, Francis Talarczyk's Deposition and Request for Additional Relief and Supporting Memorandum of Law and granting in part and denying in part #182 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Protective Order and Response to Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to Take Plaintiff, Francis Talarczyk's Deposition and Request for Additional Relief and Supporting Memorandum of Law. The parties' motions are granted to the extent that the Court finds good cause to set the deposition procedures articulated herein. Additionally, the parties' motions are denied to the extent they seek any greater or different relief. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/11/2022. (WJF)
August 10, 2022 Filing 206 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Horn, Hanson) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
August 1, 2022 Filing 205 MOTION to Strike Extraneous Plaintiff and Motion to Dismiss by Ruggles Klingemann MFG. CO.. (Shapiro, Ari)
July 29, 2022 Filing 204 RESPONSE in Opposition re #199 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Limited Modification of Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order to Permit All Defendants Additional Time to Seek Leave to Amend Affirmative Defenses Regarding Non-Party Liability (Fabre Defendant filed by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey)
July 28, 2022 Filing 203 NOTICE by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk re #182 MOTION for Protective Order AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO TAKE PLAINTIFF, FRANCIS TALARCZYK'S DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL RELIEF AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW, #185 Notice (Other), of Supplemental Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Early, Kelsey)
July 19, 2022 Filing 202 First ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Sturge, Clarke) Modified as to docket text and spacing on 7/20/2022 (JK).
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant York International Corporation ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/18/2022. (MTP)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Carrier Corporation ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/18/2022. (MTP)
July 15, 2022 Filing 199 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Limited Modification of Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order to Permit All Defendants Additional Time to Seek Leave to Amend Affirmative Defenses Regarding Non-Party Liability (Fabre Defendants) by Armstrong International, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Blackmer Pump Company, Caterpillar Inc., Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC, Cleaver-Brooks Inc., Flowserve US, Inc.(solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valve, Inc, Nordstrom Valves, Inc, Edward Vogt Valve Company and Vogt Valve Company), Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Honeywell International, Inc., Howden North America, John Crane, Inc., Lamons Gasket Company, Mueller Steam Specialty, Paramount Global, Pneumo Abex LLC. (Kibbe, Rebecca)
July 15, 2022 Filing 198 NOTICE of settlement of York International by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk (Early, Kelsey)
July 15, 2022 Filing 197 NOTICE of settlement of Carrier Corporation by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk (Early, Kelsey)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #195 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Paige Wojdyla has no further responsibility in this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Paige Wojdyla as counsel of record for Plaintiffs, Francis Talarczyk and Wanda Algarin Talarczyk, and to remove her from the electronic service list in CM/ECF for this case. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/13/2022. (WJF)
July 12, 2022 Filing 195 MOTION for Paige Wojdyla to Withdraw as Attorney by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Wojdyla, Paige) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
July 7, 2022 Filing 194 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Jonathan Hollingshead as mediator by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Early, Kelsey)
July 7, 2022 Filing 193 NOTICE of Lead Appearance by Kelsey A. Early on behalf of Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk (Early, Kelsey)
July 1, 2022 Filing 192 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 8:22-cv-00836-MSS-MRM. Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed no longer assigned to the case. Motions REFERRED: #179 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief; and #182 MOTION for Protective Order AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO TAKE PLAINTIFF, FRANCIS TALARCZYK'S DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL RELIEF AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM OF LAW referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (SAO)
June 28, 2022 Filing 191 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Reynolds, Charles)
June 24, 2022 Filing 190 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T Beck on behalf of Ruggles Klingemann MFG. CO. (Beck, Christopher)
June 24, 2022 Filing 189 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Crane Co. identifying Corporate Parent Crane Holdings, Co. for Crane Co.. (Johnson, Rasheem)
June 24, 2022 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Rasheem Malik Johnson on behalf of Crane Co. (Johnson, Rasheem)
June 24, 2022 Filing 187 RESPONSE to Motion re #185 Notice and #182 MOTION for Protective Order and Response to Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to Take Plaintiff, Francis Talarczyk's Deposition and Request for Additional Relief and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by John Crane, Inc. (Kibbe, Rebecca) Modified on 6/24/2022 (LD).
June 23, 2022 Filing 186 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Tacktill, Scott)
June 22, 2022 Filing 185 NOTICE by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk re #182 MOTION for Protective Order and Response to Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to Take Plaintiff, Francis Talarczyk's Deposition and Request for Additional Relief and Supporting Memorandum of Law Emergency/Time-Sensitive Motion (Wojdyla, Paige) Modified on 6/23/2022 (LD).
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ENDORSED ORDER The Clerk is directed to terminate #178 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time, as it appears identical to #179 Defendants' Motion for Miscellaneous Relief and seeks the same relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on June 22, 2022. (TLM)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ENDORSED ORDER In light of #182 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Protective Order, the deposition of Francis Talarczyk set to begin on June 27, 2022 is STAYED pending resolution of the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on June 22, 2022. (TLM)
June 17, 2022 Filing 182 MOTION for Protective Order and Response to Defendants' Motion to Enlarge Time to Take Plaintiff, Francis Talarczyk's Deposition and Request for Additional Relief and Supporting Memorandum of Law A by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wojdyla, Paige) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Modified on 6/17/2022 (LD).
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 6/22/2023. Jury Trial set for the AUGUST 2023 Trial Term, which commences July 31, 2023, with a more precise trial date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 11/9/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/16/2022. (MEJ)
June 15, 2022 Filing 180 NOTICE of change of address by Charles Edward Reynolds, II (Reynolds, Charles)
June 15, 2022 Filing 179 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically by All Defendants. (Kibbe, Rebecca)
June 15, 2022 Filing 178 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by All Defendants. (Kibbe, Rebecca)
June 13, 2022 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Alberto Garcia on behalf of Ruggles Klingemann MFG. CO. (Garcia, Daniel)
June 13, 2022 Filing 176 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Ruggles Klingemann MFG. CO.. (Shapiro, Ari)
June 13, 2022 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Shapiro on behalf of Ruggles Klingemann MFG. CO. (Shapiro, Ari)
June 13, 2022 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Ari Shapiro on behalf of Velan Valve Corp. (Shapiro, Ari)
June 13, 2022 Filing 173 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Velan Valve Corp.. (Garcia, Daniel)
June 13, 2022 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Alberto Garcia on behalf of Velan Valve Corp. (Garcia, Daniel)
June 8, 2022 Filing 171 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, Corporate Parent Schneider Electric SE for Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Mason, W)
June 8, 2022 Filing 170 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by W Scott Mason on behalf of Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. Lead Counsel: W Mason. (Mason, W)
May 31, 2022 Filing 169 NOTICE by Armstrong International, Inc. of Unavailability (Reynolds, Charles)
May 24, 2022 Filing 168 NOTICE of change of address by Christopher J. M. Collings (Collings, Christopher)
May 24, 2022 Filing 167 NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS by ABB Motors and Mechanical, Inc. (Rine, John)
May 24, 2022 Filing 166 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by ABB Motors and Mechanical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Reliance Electric Company for ABB Motors and Mechanical, Inc. (Rine, John)
May 23, 2022 Filing 165 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Howden North America.(Lehner, Steven)
May 17, 2022 Filing 164 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Collings, Christopher)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendant Alfa Laval Inc., ONLY. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/16/2022. (MTP)
May 12, 2022 Filing 162 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC.(Melaragno, Peter)
May 11, 2022 Filing 161 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Cleaver-Brooks Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Clark, Timothy)
May 9, 2022 Filing 160 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Howden North America. Related case(s): Yes (Lehner, Steven)
May 9, 2022 Filing 159 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Howden North America identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Howden North America. (Lehner, Steven)
May 9, 2022 Filing 158 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Steven D. Lehner on behalf of Howden North America. Lead Counsel: Steven D. Lehner. (Lehner, Steven)
May 9, 2022 Filing 157 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.. (Tacktill, Scott)
May 5, 2022 Filing 156 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk (Wojdyla, Paige)
May 2, 2022 Filing 155 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Medina, Eduardo)
May 2, 2022 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Weil-McLain Co.. (Medina, Eduardo)
May 2, 2022 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Caterpillar Inc.. (Ferguson, Timothy)
May 2, 2022 Filing 152 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Cleaver-Brooks Inc.. (Clark, Timothy)
April 29, 2022 Filing 151 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cleaver-Brooks Inc..(Clark, Timothy)
April 29, 2022 Filing 150 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC identifying Other Affiliate Atlas Copco North America, LLC, Other Affiliate Atlas Copco USA Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Atlas Copco Airpower n.v., Other Affiliate Atlas Copco AB for Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 28, 2022 Filing 149 SUMMONS reissued as to Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. (LD)
April 28, 2022 Filing 148 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation.(Donet, Brianna)
April 27, 2022 Filing 147 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Wojdyla, Paige)
April 27, 2022 Filing 146 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Timothy Clark on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks Inc.. Lead Counsel: Timothy Clark, P.A.. (Clark, Timothy)
April 27, 2022 Filing 145 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by ABB Motors and Mechanical, Inc..(Rine, John)
April 27, 2022 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Clark on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks Inc. (Clark, Timothy)
April 27, 2022 Filing 143 SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Wanda Algarin Talarczyk, Francis Talarczyk as to Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Wojdyla, Paige)
April 26, 2022 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC (Melaragno, Peter)
April 26, 2022 Filing 141 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Briscoe, Edward)
April 26, 2022 Filing 140 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 26, 2022 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Madeline St. Claire Villani on behalf of Lamons Gasket Company (Villani, Madeline)
April 26, 2022 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Brianna Elizabeth Donet on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Donet, Brianna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 137 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Eaton Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Melaragno, Peter)
April 26, 2022 Filing 136 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Eaton Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Eaton Corporation, PLC for Eaton Corporation. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 25, 2022 Filing 135 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Flowserve US, Inc.(solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valve, Inc, Nordstrom Valves, Inc, Edward Vogt Valve Company and Vogt Valve Company). Related case(s): Yes (Reddin, John)
April 25, 2022 Filing 134 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by FMC Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Reddin, John)
April 25, 2022 Filing 133 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. Related case(s): Yes (Wojdyla, Paige)
April 25, 2022 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan S. Cobbs on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Cobbs, Ryan)
April 22, 2022 Filing 131 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by York International Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 130 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by ITT LLC. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 129 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Grinnell LLC. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 128 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Goulds Pump LLC. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 127 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Elliott Company. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 126 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Carrier Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 125 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by FMC Corporation. (Reddin, John)
April 22, 2022 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Reddin on behalf of FMC Corporation (Reddin, John)
April 22, 2022 Filing 123 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Mueller Steam Specialty. (Lopez, Frances)
April 22, 2022 Filing 122 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Mueller Steam Specialty. Related case(s): Yes (Lopez, Frances)
April 22, 2022 Filing 121 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Permatex, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Cunningham, Troy)
April 22, 2022 Filing 120 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent The Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation. (Drumm, Ashley Christina)
April 21, 2022 Filing 119 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Pneumo Abex LLC. (Sturge, Clarke)
April 21, 2022 Filing 118 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Pneumo Abex LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Sturge, Clarke)
April 21, 2022 Filing 117 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Lamons Gasket Company. (Yount, Scott)
April 21, 2022 Filing 116 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lamons Gasket Company. Related case(s): Yes (Yount, Scott)
April 21, 2022 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Parker Yount on behalf of Lamons Gasket Company (Yount, Scott)
April 21, 2022 Filing 114 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #10 Notice of appearance of Troy P. Cunningham by Permatex, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Henkel US Operations Corporation, Other Affiliate Henkel AG & Co. KGaA for Permatex, Inc.. (Cunningham, Troy)
April 21, 2022 Filing 113 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by IMO Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for IMO Industries, Inc.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 21, 2022 Filing 112 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Clarke S. Sturge on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC. Lead Counsel: Clarke Sturge. (Sturge, Clarke)
April 21, 2022 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Salas on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Salas, Henry)
April 21, 2022 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Aurora Pump Company identifying Corporate Parent Pentair, Inc. for Aurora Pump Company. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 21, 2022 Filing 109 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 21, 2022 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Clarke S. Sturge on behalf of Pneumo Abex LLC (Sturge, Clarke)
April 21, 2022 Filing 107 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Related case(s): No (Collings, Christopher)
April 21, 2022 Filing 106 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation identifying Other Affiliate John Wood Group plc for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Collings, Christopher)
April 21, 2022 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Flowserve US, Inc.(solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valve, Inc, Nordstrom Valves, Inc, Edward Vogt Valve Company and Vogt Valve Company). (Reddin, John)
April 21, 2022 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Reddin on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc.(solely as Successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valve, Inc, Nordstrom Valves, Inc, Edward Vogt Valve Company and Vogt Valve Company) (Reddin, John)
April 21, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Christina Pearson Drumm on behalf of Union Carbide Corporation (Drumm, Ashley Christina)
April 21, 2022 Filing 102 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by John Crane, Inc.. (Selman, Stephanie)
April 21, 2022 Filing 101 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by William Powell Company (The). Related case(s): Yes (Melaragno, Peter)
April 21, 2022 Filing 100 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by William Powell Company (The). (Melaragno, Peter)
April 21, 2022 Filing 99 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The). Related case(s): Yes (Melaragno, Peter)
April 21, 2022 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The) identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The). (Melaragno, Peter)
April 20, 2022 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 20, 2022 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Chung-Tims on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 20, 2022 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Cinncinnatti Incorporated. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 20, 2022 Filing 94 SUMMONS issued as to Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. (LD)
April 19, 2022 Filing 93 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Charles Edward Reynolds, II on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Charles E. Reynolds. (Reynolds, Charles)
April 19, 2022 Filing 92 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Armstrong International, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Reynolds, Charles)
April 19, 2022 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Armstrong International, Inc.. (Reynolds, Charles)
April 19, 2022 Filing 90 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for Warren Pumps, LLC.. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 19, 2022 Filing 89 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. (Wojdyla, Paige)
April 19, 2022 Filing 88 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Alley, Todd)
April 19, 2022 Filing 87 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Gardner Denver, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Alley, Todd)
April 19, 2022 Filing 86 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Flowserve US, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Alley, Todd)
April 19, 2022 Filing 85 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by BW/IP, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Alley, Todd)
April 19, 2022 Filing 84 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Blackmer Pump Company. Related case(s): No (Alley, Todd)
April 19, 2022 Filing 83 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by General Electric Company identifying Corporate Parent T-Rowe Price Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate GE Capital, Other Affiliate General Electric Credit Corporation of Tennessee, Inc., Other Affiliate GE Capital Equity, Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Company, Other Affiliate GE Power India Limited, Other Affiliate GE T&D India Limited, Other Affiliate Indo Tech Transformers Limited, Other Affiliate Wuhan Boiler Company Ltd., Other Affiliate GE Capital European Funding Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital International Funding Company Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate Security Capital Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate AerCap Holdings N.V., Other Affiliate GE Capital Australia Funding Pty. Ltd, Other Affiliate GE Capital Canada Funding Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital Funding, LLC, Other Affiliate GE Capital UK Funding Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate GE SCF Societe En Commandite Par Actions for General Electric Company. (Collings, Christopher)
April 19, 2022 Filing 82 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Paramount Global identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements Inc. for Paramount Global. (Collings, Christopher)
April 19, 2022 Filing 81 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Paramount Global. Related case(s): No (Collings, Christopher)
April 19, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by General Electric Company. Related case(s): No (Collings, Christopher)
April 18, 2022 Filing 79 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Kohler Co.. (Medina, Eduardo)
April 18, 2022 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Taco, Inc.. (Medina, Eduardo)
April 18, 2022 Filing 77 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Saint-Gobain Delaware Corporation for Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc... (Alley, Todd)
April 18, 2022 Filing 76 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Alley, Todd)
April 18, 2022 Filing 75 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Flowserve US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US, Inc... (Alley, Todd)
April 18, 2022 Filing 74 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by BW/IP, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for BW/IP, Inc... (Alley, Todd)
April 18, 2022 Filing 73 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Blackmer Pump Company identifying Corporate Parent Dover Corporation for Blackmer Pump Company.. (Alley, Todd)
April 18, 2022 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Ferguson on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy)
April 18, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Ferguson on behalf of Caterpillar Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy)
April 18, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo J. Medina on behalf of Weil-McLain Co. (Medina, Eduardo)
April 18, 2022 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo J. Medina on behalf of Taco, Inc. (Medina, Eduardo)
April 18, 2022 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo J. Medina on behalf of Kohler Co. (Medina, Eduardo)
April 15, 2022 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by ITT LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for ITT LLC. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Goulds Pump LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for Goulds Pump LLC. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Elliott Company identifying Corporate Parent EBARA CORPORATION, Corporate Parent Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliott Company. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by York International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for York International Corporation. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Carrier Corporation. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls plc f/k/a Tyco International plc for Grinnell LLC. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of York International Corporation. Lead Counsel: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of Grinnell LLC. Lead Counsel: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 59 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of Goulds Pump LLC. Lead Counsel: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of Carrier Corporation. Lead Counsel: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 57 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Elliott Company.(McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of Elliott Company. Lead Counsel: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 15, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Melaragno, Peter)
April 15, 2022 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 15, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Spirax Sarco Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Melaragno, Peter)
April 15, 2022 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Spirax Sarco Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Spirax-Sarco Engineering, PLC, Other Affiliate Spirax-Sarco Investments, LTD, Other Affiliate Sarco International Corporation for Spirax Sarco Inc.. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 15, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Melaragno, Peter)
April 15, 2022 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AB Electrolux, Other Affiliate Electrolux Holdings, Inc. for Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 14, 2022 Filing 49 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cinncinnatti Incorporated.(Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 14, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE by ALFA LAVAL INC. re #47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Kolos, Chris)
April 13, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ALFA LAVAL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Robert Madison, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Fla. Stat. 47.16 (1951))(Kolos, Chris)
April 13, 2022 Filing 46 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by ITT LLC.(McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 13, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of ITT LLC (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 13, 2022 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by ALFA LAVAL INC. identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval AB for ALFA LAVAL INC.. (Kolos, Chris)
April 13, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by ALFA LAVAL INC.. Related case(s): Yes (Kolos, Chris)
April 13, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Paige Wojdyla on behalf of Francis Talarczyk, Wanda Algarin Talarczyk. Lead Counsel: Paige Wojdyla. (Wojdyla, Paige)
April 12, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Cinncinnatti Incorporated (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 12, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 12, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 12, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Cummins, Inc. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 12, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 12, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Chung-Tims on behalf of Cinncinnatti Incorporated (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 12, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Chung-Tims on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 12, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Chung-Tims on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 12, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Chung-Tims on behalf of Cummins, Inc. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 12, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Chung-Tims on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 12, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CRB)
April 12, 2022 Filing 30 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Armstrong International, Inc..(Reynolds, Charles)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #14 Defendant Mueller Steam Specialty's Request for Copies. The Motion does not include a request for relief from the court or a certification pursuant to Middle District of Florida Local Rule 3.01(g). The parties are encouraged to meet and confer regarding Defendant's motion and to seek the court's intervention only if they are unable to resolve their dispute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on April 12, 2022. (TLM)
April 11, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Eaton Corporation. Lead Counsel: Peter J. Melaragno. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 11, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of William Powell Company (The) (Melaragno, Peter)
April 11, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 11, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Spirax Sarco Inc. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 11, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The) (Melaragno, Peter)
April 11, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 11, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of William Powell Company (The). Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 11, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Spirax Sarco Inc.. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 11, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The). Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 11, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 11, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 11, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Carlton Alley on behalf of Blackmer Pump Company (Alley, Todd)
April 11, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Carlton Alley on behalf of BW/IP, Inc., Flowserve US, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc. (Alley, Todd)
April 11, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Rebecca C. Kibbe on behalf of John Crane, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Rebecca C. Kibbe. (Kibbe, Rebecca)
April 11, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Copies Directed to Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by Mueller Steam Specialty. (Lopez, Frances) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
April 11, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Frances Lopez on behalf of Mueller Steam Specialty (Lopez, Frances)
April 8, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Martin Kocse on behalf of ALFA LAVAL INC. (Kocse, Ryan)
April 8, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Chris Nick Kolos on behalf of ALFA LAVAL INC. (Kolos, Chris)
April 8, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy P. Cunningham on behalf of Permatex, Inc. (Cunningham, Troy)
April 8, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of Paramount Global. Lead Counsel: Christopher J.M. Collings. (Collings, Christopher)
April 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of General Electric Company. Lead Counsel: Christopher J.M. Collings. (Collings, Christopher)
April 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Lead Counsel: Christopher J.M. Collings. (Collings, Christopher)
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
April 8, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by John Crane, Inc. of Joinder in Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint and Exhibits, #2 Exhibit B - Military Specification MIL-A-17472B, #3 Exhibit C - Military Specification MIL-P-17303C, #4 Exhibit D - Navy Department Specification ND-SPEC-33-P-25, #5 Exhibit E - QPL-17303-21)(Pazos, Lucia)
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:22-cv-0836-MSS-JSS. (SJB)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC., f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM, INC., of Joinder in Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Notice of Removal (Collings, Christopher)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by General Electric Company of Joinder in Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation's Notice of Removal (Collings, Christopher)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19437308 filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Filed in both State Court Actions, #2 State Court ANSWER Filed in Case No. 22-CA-001680, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E to Notice of Removal)(Collings, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talarczyk et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCIS TALARCZYK
Represented By: Mark A. Alonzo
Represented By: Paige Wojdyla
Represented By: Kelsey A. Early
Represented By: Alexis Thomas
Represented By: Madison McComas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA ALGARIN TALARCZYK
Represented By: Paige Wojdyla
Represented By: Mark A. Alonzo
Represented By: Kelsey A. Early
Represented By: Alexis Thomas
Represented By: Madison McComas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALFA LAVAL INC.
Represented By: Chris Nick Kolos
Represented By: Ryan Martin Kocse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DELAVAL SEPARATOR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHARPLES CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Rasheem Malik Johnson
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEMING PUMP CO.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochrane Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman Valve Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWARTWOUT CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLIOT COMPANY, a/k/a ELLIOT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Erik David Nadolink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: David Speziali
Represented By: Erik David Nadolink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN CRANE, INC., f/k/a CRANE PACKING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARAMOUNT GLOBAL, f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC., f/k/a CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM, INC.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BF Sturtevant Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Daniel Alberto Garcia
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Edward Reynolds, II
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Hanson Horn
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIGELOW COMPANY (THE)
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BYRON JACKSON PUMPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Ferguson
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINNCINNATTI INCORPORATED
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CINCINNATI VALVE COMPANY
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: to LUNKENHEIMER VALVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS INC., f/k/a CLEAVER- BROOKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQUA-CHEM INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Co., Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUNDET CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CUMMINS, INC.
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOMCO PRODUCTS TEXAS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITE CONSOLIDATED INDUSTRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COPES VULCAN, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: John Charles Reddin
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durametallic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKWELL MANUFACTURING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD VALVE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom Valves, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD VOGT VALVE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOGT VALVE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: John Charles Reddin
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHERN PUMP COMPANY,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER (THE)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMP LLC
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: J. Yasmin Simon
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE, TWEED NC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLL, d/b/a GRINNELL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEXAGON MANUFACTURING INTELLIGENCE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BROWN & SHARPE, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED SIGNAL, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENDIX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Steven D. Lehner
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO FORGE COMPANY, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAVAL TURBINE, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: J. Yasmin Simon
Represented By: Julia Yasmin Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL & GOSSETT and FOSTER ENGINEERING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAMONS GASKET COMPANY
Represented By: Scott Parker Yount
Represented By: Madeline St. Claire Villani
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAMONS METAL GASKET CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROLPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY
Represented By: Frances Lopez
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATTS WATER TECHNOLOGIES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERMATEX, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX LLC
Represented By: Clarke S. Sturge
Represented By: Henry Salas
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Bernardo Pimentel, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABEX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUGGLES KLINGEMANN MFG. CO.
Represented By: Ari Shapiro
Represented By: Christopher T Beck
Represented By: Daniel Alberto Garcia
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTON ABRASIVES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO INC.
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TACO, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: Ashley Christina Pearson Drumm
Represented By: Ryan S. Cobbs
Represented By: Brianna Elizabeth Donet
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUIMBY PUMP CO.;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL-MCLAIN CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MARLEY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY (THE),
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Clark
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Motors and Mechanical, Inc.
Represented By: John Austin Rine
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Troy P. Cunningham
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: W Scott Mason
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Stephanie Margarita Selman
Represented By: Eric G. Reeves
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Kathryn Skagerberg
Represented By: Kathryn J. Skagerberg
Represented By: Brian J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks
Represented By: Timothy Clark
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domco Products Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co. (The)
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed NC, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC doing business as Grinnell Corporation, Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc. f/ka Brown & Sharpe, Inc. Honeywell International, Inc. as Sucesssor in Interest to Allied Signal, Inc., and Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hexagon Manufacturing Intelligence Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Eduardo J. Medina
Represented By: Timothy J. Ferguson
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamons Metal Gasket Co.
Represented By: Scott Parker Yount
Represented By: Madeline St. Claire Villani
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Scott A. Tacktill
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Permatex, Inc.
Represented By: Troy P. Cunningham
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Philip J. O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint-Gobain Abrasives, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Represented By: Eduardo J. Medina
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Timothy J. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-McLain Co.
Represented By: Eduardo J. Medina
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company (The)
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldor Electric Company
Represented By: John Austin Rine
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Troy P. Cunningham
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohler Co.
Represented By: Eduardo J. Medina
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square D Company
Represented By: W Scott Mason
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Lucia Veronica Pazos
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Lawrence D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfa Laval, Inc.
Represented By: Chris Nick Kolos
Represented By: Ryan Martin Kocse
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. doing business as Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jonathan C. Hollinshead
Represented By: Jonathan C. Hollingshead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?