Matey v. Crane Co., et al
Plaintiff: Irma Matey and Richard D. Matey
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Crane Co., Deming Pump Co., Cochrane Corporation, Chapman Valve Co., National-US Radiator Corp., Swartwout Co., Pacific Steel Boiler Corporation, General Electric Company, Viacom CBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Byron Jackson Pumps, Carrier Corporation, United Technologies Corp., Bryant Heating, Caterpillar, Inc., Derbyshire Machine & Tool Co., Flowserve US, Inc., Durametallic Corporation, Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valves, Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Vogt Valve Company, FMC Corporation, Chicago Pump Company, Northern Pump Company, Peerless Pump Company, Gardner Denver, Inc., Grinnell LLC, d/b/a Grinnell Corporation, Honeywell, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., f/k/a Delaval Turbine, Inc., ITT LLC, ITT Corporation, Bell & Gossett, Foster Engineering, James Walker MFG. Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance CO.;, Robertshaw Controls Company, Fulton Sylphon Company, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Strahman Valves, Inc., Tate, d/b/a Tes Corp., f/k/a Tate Engineering Systems, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Warren Pumps, Inc., Quimby Equipment Co., Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Viacom CBS Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Tate doing business as Tes Corp formerly known as Tate Engineering Systems, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., CBS Corporation, Grinnell LLC doing business as Grinnell Corporation, Delaval Turbine, Inc., James Walker Mfg., Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Tate Engineering Systems, Inc., Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Armstrong International, Inc. and Paramount Global
Not Classified By Court: Jonathan Hollingshead
Case Number: 8:2022cv00841
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2023 Filing 235 JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice as to Defendants Robertshaw Controls Co. and Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/11/2023. (ABC)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ENDORSED ORDER: In accordance with Plaintiff's #231 motion for voluntary dismissal with prejudice, which is agreed to by Defendants Robertshaw Controls Co., and Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., the Court dismisses this action with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) as to those defendants. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment as to those defendants, which shall read "This case is dismissed with prejudice," and to terminate Robertshaw and Metropolitan Life as parties. Plaintiff's motion is denied as to Flowserve US, Inc., because the Court has already directed entry of a judgment of dismissal without prejudice in Flowserve's favor. See (Docs. #133, 134, #137). Because all defendants are now subject to a Sixty-Day Order or have been properly dismissed, the Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 10/10/2023. (ZG)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. The Clerk is directed to terminate Redco Corp., f/k/a Crane Co., individually and as a successor in interest, as a defendant. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 10/10/2023. (ZG)
October 9, 2023 Filing 232 NOTICE of settlement by Irma Matey (Ostrowski, Mary)
October 9, 2023 Filing 231 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Robertshaw Controls Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Flowserve US Inc. by Irma Matey. (Ostrowski, Mary) Modified text on 10/10/2023 to remove all capitalization (LSS).
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ENDORSED ORDER: In the light of Plaintiff's representation that she has settled with or agreed to dismiss all remaining defendants, see (Doc. #228), the Court will cancel the pretrial conference scheduled for October 12, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. absent an objection from the Parties by October 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 10/5/2023. (ZG)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ENDORSED ORDER: On October 3, 2023, Plaintiff filed a "Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Against All Defendants of Record." See (Doc. #228). Because defendants have answered and moved for summary judgment, a notice of dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) is inappropriate. If Plaintiff wishes to move for the Court to approve dismissal of this action under Rule 41(a)(2) (either in whole or with respect to particular defendants) she is advised to file a motion to that effect. Any such motion should contain (1) a list of the defendants against which Plaintiff seeks to dismiss her claims; (2) an indication for each listed defendant whether Plaintiff seeks dismissal with or without prejudice; and (3) a certification that Plaintiff has conferred with each listed or remaining defendant regarding the motion advising the Court of those defendants' position with respect to the motion. See Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 10/4/2023. (ZG)
October 3, 2023 Filing 228 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Irma Matey (Ostrowski, Mary)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant Honeywell, Inc., as a party. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 10/2/2023. (ZG)
October 2, 2023 Filing 226 NOTICE of settlement by Irma Matey (Ostrowski, Mary)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendant General Electric Company as a party. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 9/21/2023. (ZG)
September 20, 2023 Filing 224 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of motion re #168 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by General Electric Company by General Electric Company (Collings, Christopher)
September 20, 2023 Filing 223 NOTICE of settlement by Irma Matey (Ostrowski, Mary)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER RE NOTICES OF SETTLEMENT. The Clerk is directed to terminate Defendants IMO Industries, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, and Caterpillar, Inc., as parties. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 9/18/2023. (ZG)
September 18, 2023 Filing 221 NOTICE of settlement by Irma Matey (Ostrowski, Mary)
September 15, 2023 Filing 220 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of motion re #195 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Caterpillar, Inc. by Caterpillar, Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy)
September 15, 2023 Filing 219 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL of motion re #177 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps, LLC by Warren Pumps, LLC (Melaragno, Peter)
September 15, 2023 Filing 218 NOTICE of settlement by Irma Matey (Ostrowski, Mary)
September 15, 2023 Filing 217 NOTICE of settlement by Irma Matey (Ostrowski, Mary)
August 29, 2023 Filing 216 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ostrowski on behalf of Irma Matey (Ostrowski, Mary)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ENDORSED ORDER: On August 25, 2023, Matey and Robertshaw Controls Company filed a stipulation of dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Because the stipulation is not signed by all parties who have appeared, dismissal is not appropriate under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Court directs the Clerk to STRIKE the #214 Stipulation. The parties may refile the stipulation with the requisite signatures or move for dismissal under Rule 41(a)(2). Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 8/29/2023. (ZG)
August 25, 2023 Filing 214 ***STRICKEN Pursuant to Endorsed Order 215. STIPULATION of Dismissal by Robertshaw Controls Company. (Reddin, John) Modified on 8/29/2023 to edit text per E.O. 215 (ABC).
July 21, 2023 Filing 213 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Stuart L. Cohen and John C. Reddin of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER denying #205 Defendant General Electric's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 7/20/2023. (ACS)
June 29, 2023 Filing 211 RESPONSE in Opposition re #205 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Plaintiff's Experts filed by Irma Matey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thomas, Alexis)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ENDORSED ORDER: On June 19, 2023, Plaintiff responded #206 to this Court's Order 204 to show cause why the action against Defendants Crane Co. and Derbyshire Machine & Tool Co. should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute diligently. On review of Plaintiff's response, Plaintiff's claims against Derbyshire are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute. See Local Rule 3.10. The Court's show-cause Order is DISCHARGED as to Crane. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 6/21/2023. (ZG)
June 20, 2023 Filing 209 REPLY to Response to Motion re #177 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Melaragno, Peter)
June 20, 2023 Filing 208 REPLY to Response to Motion re #195 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Ferguson, Timothy)
June 19, 2023 Filing 207 REPLY to Response to Motion re #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Honeywell, Inc. (Cunningham, Troy)
June 16, 2023 Filing 206 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 204 Order filed by Irma Matey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Crane Co.'s Answer)(Thomas, Alexis)
June 15, 2023 Filing 205 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Plaintiff's Experts by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence dated 3.24.23, #2 Exhibit Email dated 3.29.23, #3 Exhibit Email dated 4.27.23, #4 Exhibit Email dated 5.4.23, #5 Exhibit Email chain dated 5.15.23, #6 Exhibit Email chain with emails dated 5.25.23 and 6.5.23)(Collings, Christopher) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant Derbyshire Machine & Tool Co. has failed to appear, file a corporate disclosure statement, or otherwise defend this action since it began over a year ago. Defendant Crane Co. has failed to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Plaintiff has failed to move for a clerk's default within the time prescribed by the Local Rules and has failed to show good cause for her failure to do so. Plaintiff attempted to dismiss Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (see doc. 74) but failed to comply with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), see 86. If Plaintiff would like to voluntarily dismiss her claims against Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., she must re-file her notice of voluntary dismissal in compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Additionally, by June 16, 2023, Plaintiff must show cause why the action against Defendants Crane Co. and Derbyshire Machine & Tool Co. should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute diligently. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 6/12/2023. (RLD)
June 9, 2023 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to Motion re #168 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by General Electric Company. (Collings, Christopher)
June 5, 2023 Filing 202 RESPONSE in Opposition re #177 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Irma Matey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conner Depo, #2 Exhibit B - Ship Records, #3 Exhibit C - Burger Report, #4 Exhibit D - Warren Invoice, #5 Exhibit E - Staggs Report, #6 Exhibit F - Tsai Report, #7 Exhibit G - Doktor Depo)(Thomas, Alexis)
June 5, 2023 Filing 201 RESPONSE in Opposition re #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Irma Matey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conner Depo, #2 Exhibit B - Ship Records, #3 Exhibit C - Capt Burger Report, #4 Exhibit D - Corp Rep Dep, #5 Exhibit E - Staggs Report, #6 Exhibit F - Tsai Report)(Thomas, Alexis)
June 5, 2023 Filing 200 RESPONSE in Opposition re #195 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Irma Matey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conner Depo Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Caterpillar Ship Recs attached as composite exhibit, #3 Exhibit C - Burger Report, #4 Exhibit D - Ratzlaff Affidavit, #5 Exhibit E - Staggs Report, #6 Exhibit F - Tsai Report)(Thomas, Alexis)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant James Walker Manufacturing Co. has failed to appear, file a corporate disclosure statement, or otherwise defend this action since it began over a year ago. Plaintiff has failed to move for a clerk's default within the time prescribed by the Local Rules and has failed to show good cause for her failure to do so. Plaintiff's lack of diligence in the prosecution of her claims and refusal to comply with court orders and local rules is a clear pattern of delay that warrants dismissal of this defendant. Defendant James Walker Manufacturing Co. is therefore dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/31/2023. (RLD)
May 31, 2023 Filing 198 MEDIATION report Hearing held on May 23,2023. Hearing outcome: Impasse. (Hollingshead, Jonathan)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ENDORSED ORDER: Lead Counsel did not file the mediation report that was due May 30, 2023. Lead Counsel must do so by June 6, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/31/2023. (RLD)
May 26, 2023 Filing 196 RESPONSE in Opposition re #168 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Irma Matey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Conner Depo, #2 Exhibit B - Suribachi Ship Recs, #3 Exhibit C - Burger Report, #4 Exhibit D - GEI-19320 instructions, #5 Exhibit E - Banaszewski Dep, #6 Exhibit F - Staggs Report, #7 Exhibit G - Tsai Report, #8 Exhibit H - Interrogatories)(Thomas, Alexis)
May 26, 2023 Filing 195 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ferguson, Timothy)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.'s motion to file an amended motion for summary judgment #193 is granted. Caterpillar is directed to file an amended version of its motion for summary judgment and the Clerk is directed to strike Caterpillar's original motion #175. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/26/2023. (RLD)
May 25, 2023 Filing 193 MOTION to Amend #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Caterpillar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibits to Caterpillar's MSJ)(Ferguson, Timothy)
May 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ENDORSED ORDER granting #189, #190, #191, Motions for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff must respond to the motions for summary judgment by Defendants Honeywell, Caterpillar, and Warren Pumps by June 5, 2023. These Defendants may then file a reply no later than June 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/25/2023. (RLD)
May 24, 2023 Filing 191 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #177 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #178 Statement of undisputed facts by Irma Matey. (Thomas, Alexis)
May 24, 2023 Filing 190 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #176 Statement of undisputed facts, #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Irma Matey. (Thomas, Alexis)
May 24, 2023 Filing 189 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #174 Statement of undisputed facts, #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Irma Matey. (Thomas, Alexis)
May 23, 2023 Filing 188 JUDGMENT entered as dismissed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to ITT LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/23/2023. (SET)
May 23, 2023 Filing 187 JUDGMENT entered as dismissed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to Grinnell LLC. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/23/2023. (SET)
May 23, 2023 Filing 186 JUDGMENT entered as dismissed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to Carrier Corporation. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/23/2023. (SET)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ENDORSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant James Walker Manufacturing Co. has failed to appear, file a corporate disclosure statement, or otherwise defend against this action. To date, Plaintiff has not moved for a Clerk's Default against Defendant James Walker Manufacturing Co. By May 30, 2023, Plaintiff must show cause why the action against this Defendant should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute diligently. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/23/2023. (RLD)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff has filed #181, #182, and #183, Stipulations of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendants Carrier Corp., Grinnell, LLC, and ITT, LLC. Because the stipulations have been signed by all parties who have appeared, these stipulations are self-executing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012); see also Plains Growers By & Through Florists' Mut. Ins. Co. v. Ickes-Braun Glasshouses, Inc., 474 F.2d 250, 255 (5th Cir. 1974) (permitting dismissal of less than all defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)). The Clerk is directed to terminate any deadlines and pending motions as to these Defendants and to enter judgment as dismissed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to these defendants only. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/23/2023. (RLD)
May 22, 2023 Filing 183 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by ITT LLC. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
May 22, 2023 Filing 182 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Grinnell LLC. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
May 22, 2023 Filing 181 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Carrier Corporation. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
May 8, 2023 Filing 180 JUDGMENT is entered as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Paramount Global/Viacom CBS. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 5/8/2023. (LNR)
May 5, 2023 Filing 179 CERTIFICATE of compliance re #178 Statement of undisputed facts Certificate of Good Faith Conferral with Regard to its Motion for Summary Judgment by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Melaragno, Peter)
May 5, 2023 Filing 178 STATEMENT of undisputed facts re: #177 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Warren Pumps, LLC.. (Melaragno, Peter)
May 5, 2023 Filing 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Answers to Master Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit Partial VA Medical Records for Richard Matey, #4 Exhibit Deposition of Urgentine Connor 11-30-22, #5 Exhibit Report of Capt. Francis Burger, #6 Exhibit DD-214 for Richard Matey, #7 Exhibit Report of Brent Staggs, MD, #8 Exhibit Report of Candace Tsai, Sc.D, CIH)(Melaragno, Peter)
May 5, 2023 Filing 176 STATEMENT of undisputed facts re: #175 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Caterpillar, Inc... (Ferguson, Timothy)
May 5, 2023 Filing 175 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Caterpillar, Inc.. (Ferguson, Timothy)
May 5, 2023 Filing 174 STATEMENT of undisputed facts re: #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Honeywell, Inc... (Cunningham, Troy)
May 5, 2023 Filing 173 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Honeywell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cunningham, Troy)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff has filed 171 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Paramount Global/Viacom CBS. Because it has been signed by all parties who have appeared, this stipulation is self-executing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012); see also Plains Growers By & Through Florists' Mut. Ins. Co. v. Ickes-Braun Glasshouses, Inc., 474 F.2d 250, 255 (5th Cir. 1974) (permitting dismissal of less than all defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)). The Clerk is directed to terminate any deadlines and pending motions as to this Defendant and to enter judgment as dismissed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to this defendant only. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/5/2023. (RLD)
May 5, 2023 Filing 171 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Paramount Global by Paramount Global. (Collings, Christopher)
May 5, 2023 Filing 170 CERTIFICATE of compliance (Certificate of Good Faith Conferral) re #168 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #169 Statement of undisputed facts, by General Electric Company. (Collings, Christopher)
May 5, 2023 Filing 169 STATEMENT of undisputed facts re: #168 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts) by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Urgentine Conner, #2 Exhibit Captain Francis J. Burger (Plaintiff expert) report, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff Responses to Defendant Standard Interrogatories)(Collings, Christopher)
May 5, 2023 Filing 168 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by General Electric Company. (Collings, Christopher)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ENDORSED ORDER: The parties are reminded that prior to the filing of a motion for summary judgment, the moving party must confer in good faith with the opposing party to narrow factual issues in dispute, and that the moving party must file a separate "Joint Statement of Undisputed Facts" agreed upon by all parties. See Doc. #90 at 4-5. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/28/2023. (RLD)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff has filed #165 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Weir Valves & Controls, USA. Because it has been signed by all parties who have appeared, this stipulation is self-executing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC , 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012); see also Plains Growers By & Through Florists' Mut. Ins. Co. v. Ickes-Braun Glasshouses, Inc., 474 F.2d 250, 255 (5th Cir. 1974) (permitting dismissal of less than all defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)). The Clerk is directed to terminate this defendant in this action. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/14/2023. (RLD)
April 14, 2023 Filing 165 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 10, 2023 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Briscoe, Edward)
April 10, 2023 Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 10, 2023 Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Melaragno, Peter)
April 10, 2023 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ENDORSED ORDER granting [156, 158] Defendant Warren Pumps LLC's Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Amanda Rae Cachaldora and Melanie E. Chung-Tims are terminated as counsel of record for Defendant Warren Pumps LLC and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Attorneys Edward Briscoe and Peter Melaragno are substituted as counsel for Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/4/2023. (ACS)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ENDORSED ORDER granting [155, 157] Defendant IMO Industries, Inc.'s Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Amanda Rae Cachaldora and Melanie E. Chung-Tims are terminated as counsel of record for Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Attorneys Edward Briscoe and Peter Melaragno are substituted as counsel for Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 4/4/2023. (ACS)
April 3, 2023 Filing 158 MOTION for Melanie Chung-Tims to Withdraw as Attorney by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Chung-Tims, Melanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 3, 2023 Filing 157 MOTION for Melanie Chung-Tims to Withdraw as Attorney by IMO Industries, Inc. (Chung-Tims, Melanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 3, 2023 Filing 156 MOTION for Amanda Cachaldora to Withdraw as Attorney by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Cachaldora, Amanda) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 3, 2023 Filing 155 MOTION for Amanda Cachaldora to Withdraw as Attorney by IMO Industries, Inc. (Cachaldora, Amanda) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 29, 2023 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lanier Luck on behalf of Honeywell, Inc. (Luck, David)
March 29, 2023 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by Troy P. Cunningham on behalf of Honeywell, Inc. (Cunningham, Troy)
March 29, 2023 Filing 152 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Todd R. Ehrenreich on behalf of Honeywell, Inc. Lead Counsel: Todd Ehrenreich. (Ehrenreich, Todd)
March 23, 2023 Filing 151 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Troy P. Cunningham and Todd R. Ehrenreich of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LNR)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ENDORSED ORDER granting #149 Defendant Honeywell, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eduardo J. Medina terminated as counsel of record for Defendant Honeywell, Inc. and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Attorneys Troy Cunningham and Todd Ehrenreich are substituted as counsel for Defendant Honeywell, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/22/2023. (ACS)
March 22, 2023 Filing 149 MOTION for Eduardo J. Medina to Withdraw as Attorney by Honeywell, Inc. (Medina, Eduardo) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 16, 2023 Filing 148 JUDGMENT is entered as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. only. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/16/2023. (LNR)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. has filed #146 Stipulation of Dismissal. Because it has been signed by all parties who have appeared, this stipulation is self-executing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012); see also Plains Growers By & Through Florists' Mut. Ins. Co. v. Ickes-Braun Glasshouses, Inc., 474 F.2d 250, 255 (5th Cir. 1974) (permitting dismissal of less than all defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)). The Clerk is directed to terminate any deadlines and pending motions, and enter judgment as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/15/2023. (RLD)
March 14, 2023 Filing 146 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Gardner Denver, Inc. (Kibbe, Rebecca)
March 14, 2023 Filing 145 JUDGMENT is entered as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Strahman Valves, Inc. only. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/14/2023. (LNR)
March 14, 2023 Filing 144 JUDGMENT is entered as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Tate Engineering Systems, Inc. only. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/14/2023. (LNR)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant Strahman Valves, Inc. has filed #142 Stipulation of Dismissal. Because it has been signed by all parties who have appeared, this stipulation is self-executing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012); see also Plains Growers By & Through Florists' Mut. Ins. Co. v. Ickes-Braun Glasshouses, Inc., 474 F.2d 250, 255 (5th Cir. 1974) (permitting dismissal of less than all defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)). The Clerk is directed to terminate any deadlines and pending motions, and enter judgment as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Strahman Valves, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/13/2023. (RLD)
March 13, 2023 Filing 142 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Strahman Valves, Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant Tate Engineering Sytems, Inc. has filed #140 Stipulation of Dismissal. Because it has been signed by all parties who have appeared, this stipulation is self-executing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012); see also Plains Growers By & Through Florists' Mut. Ins. Co. v. Ickes-Braun Glasshouses, Inc., 474 F.2d 250, 255 (5th Cir. 1974) (permitting dismissal of less than all defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)). The Clerk is directed to terminate any deadlines and pending motions, and enter judgment as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Tate Engineering Systems, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/13/2023. (RLD)
March 10, 2023 Filing 140 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tate. (Perotti, Albert)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff Matey and Defendant Strahman Valves, Inc. have filed a stipulation of dismissal under Rule 41. Since other defendants have filed an answer, dismissal is not allowed under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). And since not all parties who have appeared have signed the stipulation, dismissal is not appropriate under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). See Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1277 (11th Cir. 2012). Accordingly, this dismissal is invalid. The Court directs the Clerk to STRIKE the #136 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/10/2023. (RLD)
March 10, 2023 Filing 138 JUDGMENT is entered as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant BW/IP, Inc. only. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/10/2023. (LNR)
March 10, 2023 Filing 137 JUDGMENT is entered as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Flowserve US, Inc. only. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/10/2023. (LNR)
March 10, 2023 Filing 136 ***STRICKEN; pursuant to court's endorsed order 139.*** STIPULATION of Dismissal by Strahman Valves, Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy) Modified text on 3/13/2023 (LNR).
March 9, 2023 Filing 135 JUDGMENT is entered as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant FMC Corp. only. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/9/2023. (LNR)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendants BW/IP Inc. and Flowserve US have filed #132 and #133 Stipulations of Dismissal. Because both documents have been signed by all parties who have appeared, these stipulations are self-executing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012); see also Plains Growers By & Through Florists' Mut. Ins. Co. v. Ickes-Braun Glasshouses, Inc., 474 F.2d 250, 255 (5th Cir. 1974) (permitting dismissal of less than all defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)). The Clerk is directed to terminate any deadlines and pending motions, and enter judgment as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendants BW/IP, Inc. and Flowserve US only. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/9/2023. (RLD)
March 8, 2023 Filing 133 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Flowserve US, Inc. by Flowserve US, Inc.(solely as successor to Durametallic Corporation) (Alley, Todd)
March 8, 2023 Filing 132 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant BWIP, Inc. by BW/IP, Inc. (Alley, Todd)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant FMC Corp. has filed #130 Stipulation of Dismissal. Because it has been signed by all parties who have appeared, this stipulation is self-executing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012); see also Plains Growers By & Through Florists' Mut. Ins. Co. v. Ickes-Braun Glasshouses, Inc., 474 F.2d 250, 255 (5th Cir. 1974) (permitting dismissal of less than all defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)). The Clerk is directed to terminate any deadlines and pending motions, and enter judgment as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant FMC Corp. only. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/8/2023. (RLD)
March 8, 2023 Filing 130 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant FMC Corporation by FMC Corporation. (Reddin, John)
March 6, 2023 Filing 129 JUDGMENT is entered as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc. only. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/6/2023. (SET)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc. has filed 127 Stipulation of Dismissal. Because it has been signed by all parties who have appeared, this stipulation is self-executing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012); see also Plains Growers By & Through Florists' Mut. Ins. Co. v. Ickes-Braun Glasshouses, Inc., 474 F.2d 250, 255 (5th Cir. 1974) (permitting dismissal of less than all defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)). The Clerk is directed to terminate any deadlines and pending motions, and enter judgment as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 3/6/2023. (RLD)
March 3, 2023 Filing 127 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc. by Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Melaragno, Peter) Modified text on 3/6/2023 (SET).
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #121 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. The case management deadlines are extended as follows: Plaintiff's expert disclosure deadline is extended to Feb. 17, 2023; Defendants' Expert Disclosures are due by March 14, 2023; the parties' deadline for disclosing rebuttal experts is March 28, 2023 and the deadline for deposing damage witnesses is April 28, 2023. The deadline for filing Daubert and dispositive motions is extended to May 5, 2023. All other case management deadlines remain the same.Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/30/2023. (ACS)
January 24, 2023 Filing 125 JUDGMENT entered as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Armstrong International, Inc. only. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/24/2023. (LNR)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff has filed #123 Stipulation of Dismissal. Because it has been signed by all parties who have appeared, this stipulation is self-executing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012); see also Plains Growers By & Through Florists' Mut. Ins. Co. v. Ickes-Braun Glasshouses, Inc., 474 F.2d 250, 255 (5th Cir. 1974) (permitting dismissal of less than all defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)). The Clerk is directed to terminate any deadlines and pending motions, and enter judgment as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Armstrong International, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/23/2023. (RLD)
January 23, 2023 Filing 123 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Armstrong International, Inc. by Irma Matey. (Thomas, Alexis)
January 18, 2023 Filing 122 NOTICE of Reservation of Rights by Irma Matey (Thomas, Alexis) Modified text on 1/19/2023 (SET).
January 13, 2023 Filing 121 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Irma Matey. (Thomas, Alexis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text on 1/17/2023 (MCB).
January 12, 2023 Filing 120 JUDGMENT entered as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corp. only. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/12/2023. (LNR)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff has filed #118 Joint Stipulation and Order of Dismissal. Because it has been signed by all parties who have appeared, this stipulation is self-executing. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC , 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012); see also Plains Growers By & Through Florists' Mut. Ins. Co. v. Ickes-Braun Glasshouses, Inc., 474 F.2d 250, 255 (5th Cir. 1974) (permitting dismissal of less than all defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)). The Clerk is directed to terminate any deadlines and pending motions, and enter judgment as dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) as to defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corp. only. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/11/2023. (RLD)
January 11, 2023 Filing 118 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Irma Matey. (Thomas, Alexis)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff Matey and Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. have filed a stipulation of dismissal under Rule 41. Since other defendants have filed an answer, dismissal is not allowed under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). And since not all parties who have appeared have signed the stipulation, dismissal is not appropriate under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). See Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1277 (11th Cir. 2012). Accordingly, this dismissal is invalid. The Court directs the Clerk to STRIKE the #116 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/5/2023. (RLD)
January 4, 2023 Filing 116 ***STRICKEN; pursuant to court's endorsed order 117.*** STIPULATION of Dismissal by Armstrong International, Inc. (Horn, Hanson) Modified text on 1/6/2023 (LNR).
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ENDORSED ORDER granting #112 Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.'s Notice of Substitution, which the Court construes as a Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Todd Carlton Alley is terminated as counsel of record for Gardner Denver, Inc. and relieved of any further responsibility as to Gardner Denver, Inc. in this matter. Attorney Rebecca Kibbe is substituted as counsel of record for Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/4/2023. (ACS)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff Matey and Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation have filed a stipulation of dismissal under Rule 41. Since other defendants have filed an answer, dismissal is not allowed under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). And since not all parties who have appeared have signed the stipulation, dismissal is not appropriate under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). See Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1277 (11th Cir. 2012). Accordingly, this dismissal is invalid. The Court directs the Clerk to STRIKE the #113 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 1/4/2023. (RLD)
January 4, 2023 Filing 113 ***STRICKEN; pursuant to court's endorsed order 114.*** STIPULATION of Dismissal by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Cachaldora, Amanda) Modified text on 1/5/2023 (LNR).
January 3, 2023 Filing 112 MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. by Gardner Denver, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kibbe, Rebecca) Modified text on 1/4/2023 (LNR).
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEDIATION ORDER: This case is set for mediation on May 23, 2023. Within seven days following the mediation conference, Lead Counsel shall file a Mediation Report. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 12/16/2022. (RLD)
December 16, 2022 Filing 110 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on May 23rd, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. EST before Jonathan Hollingshead. (Thomas, Alexis)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon review of the Notice of Selection of Designation of Mediator, the Court finds that it fails to provide the proposed time or location for mediation. The Case Management and Scheduling Order requires the time and location of mediation be provided. Lead counsel is directed to provide the proposed time and location of mediation to the Court by December 19, 2022, so that the Court can enter a complete mediation order. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 12/12/2022. (RLD)
December 9, 2022 Filing 108 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Jonathan Hollingshead as mediator by Irma Matey. (Thomas, Alexis)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ENDORSED ORDER: No later than December 16, 2022, Plaintiff must show cause for her failure to timely file a Mediation Notice. (See Doc. [#90].) Alternatively, she may file the notice by December 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 12/9/2022. (RLD)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part #104 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time.The Court notes that Defendants have not responded to the motion, and the time to do so has passed. Plaintiff's product identification witness deadline is extended to December 12, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/21/2022. (ACS)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ENDORSED ORDER withdrawing #102 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; granting #103 Motion to Withdraw Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 10/4/2022. (ACS)
October 4, 2022 Filing 104 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deposition by All Plaintiffs. (Thomas, Alexis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
October 4, 2022 Filing 103 First MOTION to Withdraw #102 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deposition by All Plaintiffs. (Thomas, Alexis)
October 4, 2022 Filing 102 ***WITHDRAWN; pursuant to court's endorsed order 105.*** First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deposition by All Plaintiffs. (Thomas, Alexis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified text on 10/5/2022 (LNR).
September 27, 2022 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Hanson Horn on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Horn, Hanson)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ENDORSED ORDER granting #99 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Charles Edward Reynolds, II terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 9/19/2022. (Flynn, Sean)
September 19, 2022 Filing 99 MOTION for Charles Reynolds to Withdraw as Attorney by Armstrong International, Inc. (Reynolds, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #97 Joint Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. The Court denied without prejudice the same filing on August 12, 2022 (see Doc. 95) (the only difference is the docketing attorney). Counsel is again directed to comply with Local Rule 2.02 (c) when moving to withdraw, which requires the withdrawing attorney (not a law firm) to file a motion rather than a stipulation. The movant is also advised that individual attorneys, not law firms, represent clients. Finally, the re-filed motion should state that the withdrawing attorney has complied with the notice requirements of Local Rule 2.02(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/31/2022. (ACS)
August 30, 2022 Filing 97 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Armstrong International, Inc. (Reynolds, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 29, 2022 Filing 96 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand, Corporate Parent T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Gardner Denver, Inc. (Alley, Todd) Modified on 8/30/2022 (SET).
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #94 Joint Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel, which the Court construes as a motion to substitute attorney. The motion does not comply with Local Rule 2.02(c), which requires a certification of notice to the client and also requires "[t]he withdrawing lawyer -- not the lawyer's present or former or another firm" to file the motion. The movant is advised that individual attorneys, not a law firm, represent clients. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/12/2022. (ACS)
August 10, 2022 Filing 94 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Armstrong International, Inc. (Horn, Hanson) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
June 15, 2022 Filing 93 NOTICE of change of address by Charles Edward Reynolds, II (Reynolds, Charles)
June 10, 2022 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Tate. (Perotti, Albert)
June 10, 2022 Filing 91 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Tate. Related case(s): Yes (Perotti, Albert)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by January 9, 2023. Dispositive motions due by April 21, 2023. Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 12, 2023 at 1:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Jury Trial scheduled for the November 2023 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 13B before Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle. Conduct mediation by June 2, 2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 6/9/2022. (GSO)
June 2, 2022 Filing 89 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Tate.(Perotti, Albert)
June 2, 2022 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Albert Michael Perotti on behalf of Tate (Perotti, Albert)
May 31, 2022 Filing 87 NOTICE by Armstrong International, Inc. of Unavailability (Reynolds, Charles)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court vacates its earlier 74 endorsed order, directs the Clerk to reinstate Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance as a party, and directs the Clerk to strike Plaintiff's and Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance's #73 notice of voluntary dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) because the stipulation was not signed by all parties who have appeared as required by the rule for dismissal of any party under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The parties may refile the stipulation with the requisite signatures or move for dismissal under Rule 41(a)(2). Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/24/2022. (JMB)
May 24, 2022 Filing 85 NOTICE of change of address by Christopher J. M. Collings (Collings, Christopher)
May 18, 2022 Filing 84 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ENDORSED ORDER granting #82 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lydia A. Plotz terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/16/2022. (Flynn, Sean)
May 16, 2022 Filing 82 MOTION for Lydia Plotz to Withdraw as Attorney by Irma Matey. (Thomas, Alexis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ENDORSED ORDER: Attorney Lydia Plotz is directed to comply with Local Rule 2.01(b)(G) governing Practice in the Middle District. By May 16, 2022, Attorney Plotz must register with the Middle District's CM/ECF system. Failure to comply with this order may result in the Court striking Attorney Plotz's appearance from the record. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/9/2022. (JMB)
May 4, 2022 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Crane Co. (Johnson, Rasheem) Modified text on 5/5/2022 (AG).
May 4, 2022 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Rasheem Malik Johnson on behalf of Crane Co. (Johnson, Rasheem)
May 2, 2022 Filing 78 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Caterpillar, Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy) Modified on 5/2/2022 (AG).
May 2, 2022 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Honeywell, Inc. (Medina, Eduardo) Modified text on 5/2/2022 (AG).
May 2, 2022 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strahman Valves, Inc. (Medina, Eduardo) Modified text on 5/2/2022 (AG).
May 2, 2022 Filing 75 NOTICE to counsel Lydia A. Plotz of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AG)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 (VACATED pursuant to the Court's 86 Order.) ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff filed a #73 Joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance. Because it has been signed by both parties, this stipulation is self-executing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Anago Franchising, Inc. v. Shaz, LLC, 677 F.3d 1272, 1278 (11th Cir. 2012) ("[T]he plain language of Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) requires that a stipulation filed pursuant to that subsection is self-executing and dismisses the case upon its becoming effective."); see also Plains Growers By & Through Florists' Mut. Ins. Co. v. Ickes-Braun Glasshouses, Inc., 474 F.2d 250, 255 (5th Cir. 1974) (permitting dismissal of less than all defendants under Rule 41(a)(1)). The Clerk is directed to terminate this defendant to this action. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/29/2022. (JMB) Modified on 5/25/2022 (AG).
April 28, 2022 Filing 73 (STRICKEN pursuant to the Court's 86 Endorsed Order.) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Irma Matey (Thomas, Alexis) Modified on 5/25/2022 (AG).
April 25, 2022 Filing 72 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Robertshaw Controls Company. Related case(s): Yes (Reddin, John)
April 25, 2022 Filing 71 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Flowserve US, Inc.(as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Vogt Valve Company). Related case(s): Yes (Reddin, John)
April 25, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by FMC Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (Reddin, John)
April 25, 2022 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Robertshaw Controls Company. (Cohen, Stuart)
April 25, 2022 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Civil Action Order by ITT LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sapphire Topco Inc. for ITT LLC. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 25, 2022 Filing 67 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Civil Action Order by Grinnell LLC identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls plc f/k/a Tyco International PLC for Grinnell LLC. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn) Modified text on 4/26/2022 (AG).
April 25, 2022 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Civil Action Order by Carrier Corporation. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 65 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by ITT LLC. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 64 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Grinnell LLC. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Carrier Corporation. Related case(s): Yes (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 62 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by FMC Corporation. (Reddin, John)
April 22, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Reddin on behalf of FMC Corporation (Reddin, John)
April 22, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Irma Matey. Related case(s): Yes (Thomas, Alexis)
April 22, 2022 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Irma Matey. (Thomas, Alexis)
April 21, 2022 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by IMO Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for IMO Industries, Inc. (Cachaldora, Amanda) Modified text on 4/22/2022 (AG).
April 21, 2022 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Warren Pumps, LLC identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for Warren Pumps, LLC. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 21, 2022 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by IMO Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ESAB Corporation for IMO Industries, Inc. (Cachaldora, Amanda) Modified text on 4/22/2022 (AG).
April 21, 2022 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Flowserve US, Inc.(as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Vogt Valve Company). (Reddin, John)
April 21, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Reddin on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc.(as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Vogt Valve Company) (Reddin, John) Modified text on 4/22/2022 (AG).
April 20, 2022 Filing 53 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Metropolitan Life Insurance Co. (Tacktill, Scott) Modified text on 4/20/2022 (AG).
April 20, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Melaragno, Peter) Modified text on 4/20/2022 (AG).
April 20, 2022 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Melaragno, Peter) Modified text on 4/20/2022 (AG).
April 20, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Spirax Sarco, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Melaragno, Peter) Modified text on 4/20/2022 (AG).
April 20, 2022 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Spirax Sarco, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Spirax-Sarco Engineering, PLC, Other Affiliate Spirax-Sarco Investments, LTD, Other Affiliate Sarco International Corporation for Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Melaragno, Peter) Modified text on 4/20/2022 (AG).
April 19, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Armstrong International, Inc. Related case(s): Yes (Reynolds, Charles) Modified text on 4/19/2022 (AG).
April 19, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Charles Edward Reynolds, II on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. Lead Counsel: Charles E. Reynolds. (Reynolds, Charles) Modified text on 4/19/2022. (AG)
April 19, 2022 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Armstrong International, Inc. (Reynolds, Charles) Modified text on 4/19/2022 (AG).
April 19, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Gardner Denver, Inc. Related case(s): No (Alley, Todd) Modified text on 4/19/2022 (AG).
April 19, 2022 Filing 44 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Flowserve US, Inc.(solely as successor to Durametallic Corporation). Related case(s): No (Alley, Todd)
April 19, 2022 Filing 43 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by BW/IP, Inc. Related case(s): No (Alley, Todd) Modified text on 4/19/2022 (AG).
April 18, 2022 Filing 42 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to First Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Cachaldora, Amanda) Modified text on 4/19/2022 (AG).
April 18, 2022 Filing 41 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to First Amended Complaint by IMO Industries, Inc. (Cachaldora, Amanda) Modified text on 4/19/2022 (AG).
April 18, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Chung-Tims on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC. (Chung-Tims, Melanie) Modified text on 4/19/2022 (AG).
April 18, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie E. Chung-Tims on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Chung-Tims, Melanie)
April 18, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC. (Cachaldora, Amanda) Modified text on 4/19/2022 (AG).
April 18, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Rae Cachaldora on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Cachaldora, Amanda)
April 18, 2022 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Civil Action Order by General Electric Company identifying Other Affiliate GE Capital, Other Affiliate GE Capital Franchise Finance Corporation, Other Affiliate General Electric Credit Corporation of Tennessee, Other Affiliate GE Capital Equity, Other Affiliate Baker Hughes Company, Other Affiliate Aer Caps Holdings N.V., Other Affiliate GE Power India Limited, Other Affiliate GE T&D India Limited, Other Affiliate Indo Tech Transformers Limited, Other Affiliate Wuhan Boiler Company Ltd., Other Affiliate GE Capital Australia Funding Pty Ltd., Other Affiliate GE Capital Canda Funding Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital European Funding Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital Funding LLC, Other Affiliate GE Capital International Funding Company Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate GE Capital U.K.Funding Unlimited Company, Other Affiliate G E S C F Societe En Commandite Par Actions, Other Affiliate Security Capital Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate SUSA Partnership L.P. for General Electric Company. (Collings, Christopher)
April 18, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by General Electric Company. Related case(s): No (Collings, Christopher)
April 18, 2022 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Civil Action Order by Paramount Global identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements Inc. for Paramount Global. (Collings, Christopher)
April 18, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Paramount Global. Related case(s): No (Collings, Christopher)
April 18, 2022 Filing 32 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Gardner Denver, Inc. (Alley, Todd) Modified text on 4/19/2022 (AG).
April 18, 2022 Filing 31 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Flowserve US, Inc. (solely as successor to Durametallic Corporation) identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for Flowserve US, Inc. (Alley, Todd) Modified text on 4/19/2022 (AG).
April 18, 2022 Filing 30 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by BW/IP, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Flowserve Corporation for BW/IP, Inc. (Alley, Todd) Modified text on 4/19/2022 (AG).
April 18, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo J. Medina on behalf of Honeywell, Inc. (Medina, Eduardo)
April 18, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Ferguson on behalf of Strahman Valves, Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy)
April 18, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Ferguson on behalf of Caterpillar, Inc. (Ferguson, Timothy)
April 15, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Grinnell LLC.(McCutcheon, Caitlyn) Modified text on 4/20/2022 (AG).
April 15, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of Grinnell LLC. Lead Counsel: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 13, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by ITT LLC.(McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 13, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of ITT LLC (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 13, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by FMC Corporation.(Reddin, John) Modified text on 4/13/2022 (MCB).
April 13, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Reddin on behalf of FMC Corporation (Reddin, John)
April 12, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Armstrong International, Inc.(Reynolds, Charles) Modified text on 4/13/2022 (MCB).
April 12, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis Thomas on behalf of Irma Matey (Thomas, Alexis)
April 11, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Carrier Corporation.(McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 11, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Caitlyn R. McCutcheon on behalf of Carrier Corporation. Lead Counsel: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon. (McCutcheon, Caitlyn)
April 11, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Carlton Alley on behalf of BW/IP, Inc., Flowserve US, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc. (Alley, Todd)
April 11, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Flowserve US, Inc Appearance by John Charles Reddin on behalf of Flowserve US, Inc. (Reddin, John)
April 11, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John Charles Reddin on behalf of Robertshaw Controls Company (Reddin, John)
April 11, 2022 Filing 13 ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY'S ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Robertshaw Controls Company.(Reddin, John)
April 11, 2022 Filing 12 Flowserve US, Inc. ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Flowserve US, Inc..(Reddin, John)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CIVIL CASE ORDER. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within forty days after the case was removed for the purposes of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 4/11/2022. (JMB)
April 11, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of Paramount Global. Lead Counsel: Christopher J.M. Collings. (Collings, Christopher)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Christopher J. M. Collings on behalf of General Electric Company. Lead Counsel: Christopher J.M. Collings. (Collings, Christopher)
April 11, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc..(Melaragno, Peter)
April 11, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Spirax Sarco, Inc..(Melaragno, Peter)
April 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Melaragno on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Melaragno, Peter)
April 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 11, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of Spirax Sarco, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Edward J. Briscoe. (Briscoe, Edward)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-0841-KKM-SPF. (SJB)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 13th Judicial Circuit, Hillsborough County, case number 22-CA-001775 filed in State Court 3/2/22. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AFLMDC-19440711 filed by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT; Combined State Court Complaints, #2 State Court ANSWER; GE Answer to Complaint, #3 State Court Docket Sheet; Combined Dockets, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal)(Collings, Christopher) Modified on 4/11/2022 (LNR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matey v. Crane Co., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Matey
Represented By: Lydia A. Plotz
Represented By: Alexis Thomas
Represented By: Mary Ostrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard D. Matey
Represented By: Lydia A. Plotz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Rasheem Malik Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deming Pump Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochrane Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman Valve Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National-US Radiator Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swartwout Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Steel Boiler Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Represented By: Erin Dardis
Represented By: Erin E. Dardis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom CBS Inc. f/k/a CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Jackson Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Heating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derbyshire Machine & Tool Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Represented By: John Charles Reddin
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durametallic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Valves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom Valves, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vogt Valve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: John Charles Reddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Carlton Alley
Represented By: Rebecca C. Kibbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC, d/b/a Grinnell Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell, Inc.
Represented By: Eduardo J. Medina
Represented By: Todd R. Ehrenreich
Represented By: Troy P. Cunningham
Represented By: David Lanier Luck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc., f/k/a Delaval Turbine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell & Gossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Engineering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walker MFG. Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance CO.;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertshaw Controls Company
Represented By: John Charles Reddin
Represented By: Stuart L. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton Sylphon Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strahman Valves, Inc.
Represented By: Eduardo J. Medina
Represented By: Timothy J. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate, d/b/a Tes Corp., f/k/a Tate Engineering Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quimby Equipment Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom CBS Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate doing business as Tes Corp formerly known as Tate Engineering Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Albert Michael Perotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC doing business as Grinnell Corporation
Represented By: Caitlyn R. McCutcheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delaval Turbine, Inc.
Represented By: Amanda Rae Cachaldora
Represented By: Melanie E. Chung-Tims
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walker Mfg., Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Scott A. Tacktill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Engineering Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Albert Michael Perotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Represented By: Peter J. Melaragno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Edward Reynolds, II
Represented By: Hanson Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Christopher J. M. Collings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Jonathan Hollingshead
Represented By: Jonathan C. Hollingshead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?