BRETZ et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: CONRAD MOORE, SETH WILLFORD, BENJAMIN PRICE, HERIBERTO GRACIA-CHAVEZ, BRENT BRETZ, CHRISTOPHER DELWISCH, DANIEL GONZALEZ, MATTHEW GOMES, AARON FOOTE, GREGORY CULLISON, JON CRUMP, WILLIAM CLARK, JAMES HAMM, MARK ABRAHAMS, BRANDON LAYMAN, JESSE VELASQUEZ, JUSTIN ROBINSON, TODD JACOBS, WILLIAM WADE, CHRISTOPHER COOPER, JEREMY MOORE, CHAD HOTCHKISS, ONUR ONCER, JERRY HARTSOCK, BRANDON BOYER, VINCENT MUNOZ, JUSTIN GORMAN, ISRAEL GOMEZ, STEPHEN ROHN, SEAN BRANNAN, JOHN MCCORMICK, JOSE RUIZ, MATHEW WATSON, RICHARD CHARLESWORTH, CURTIS MCGREW, JUSTIN SHED, LONNIE SPARKMAN, BRANDON NELSON, KEITH NELSON, RASHON ELLINGTON, TIMOTHY POLLARD, TIMOTHY COLON, RYAN DAY, KEVIN HOEY, DENNIS BRENNAN, DOUG BIZJAK, ANTHONY MCLEAN, TYRONE REID, DANIEL MAYBERRY, JAMES LEISINGER, CHRISTOPHER THORSON, JULIO REIMERS, JASON YATES, JAMES GREEN, AARON PARKER, SEAN JENNINGS, DENNIS MCNAMARA, CHRISTOPHER FRIEBERG, RYAN ANDERSON, ERIC ELLITHORPE, SALTHANIEL HALL, EDWARD MOTT, JARED DOSS, JUSTIN ANDERSON, JAMES KINSEY, RYAN TAIT, RICHARD CODY, RYAN CANNON, JAMES EYLER, MATHEW MUELLER, DAVID OJEDA, JOSE HERNANDEZ ARROYO, ADRIAN APONTE, EDGARD BONILLAS, THOMAS WRIGHT, JUSTIN BRUETT, MICHAEL SANCHEZ, JEREMY SPRUCE, THOMAS MOORE, JOHN MCENEANEY, DALLAS LEVERONI, ANTHONY HYDE, CHRISTABOL MIRANDA, JOB LISMA, JERMAINE NORMAN, DAVID BAKER, CRYSTAL COOPER, JAMIE LEWIS, LUKE SCHWEE, BRIAN WESTER, MICHAEL FENNER and JON RITZHEIMER
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02964
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #11 MOTION to Remand , #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, #15 Sealed Document - X, #18 Reply to Response to Motion (djb)
September 29, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Seal Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand, #11 MOTION to Remand filed by MARK ABRAHAMS, JUSTIN ANDERSON, RYAN ANDERSON, ADRIAN APONTE, JOSE HERNANDEZ ARROYO, DAVID BAKER, DOUG BIZJAK, EDGARD BONILLAS, BRANDON BOYER, SEAN BRANNAN, DENNIS BRENNAN, BRENT BRETZ, JUSTIN BRUETT, RYAN CANNON, RICHARD CHARLESWORTH, WILLIAM CLARK, RICHARD CODY, TIMOTHY COLON, CHRISTOPHER COOPER, CRYSTAL COOPER, JON CRUMP, GREGORY CULLISON, RYAN DAY, CHRISTOPHER DELWISCH, JARED DOSS, RASHON ELLINGTON, ERIC ELLITHORPE, JAMES EYLER, MICHAEL FENNER, AARON FOOTE, CHRISTOPHER FRIEBERG, MATTHEW GOMES, ISRAEL GOMEZ, DANIEL GONZALEZ, JUSTIN GORMAN, HERIBERTO GRACIA-CHAVEZ, JAMES GREEN, SALTHANIEL HALL, JAMES HAMM, JERRY HARTSOCK, KEVIN HOEY, CHAD HOTCHKISS, ANTHONY HYDE, TODD JACOBS, SEAN JENNINGS, JAMES KINSEY, BRANDON LAYMAN, JAMES LEISINGER, DALLAS LEVERONI, JAMIE LEWIS, JOB LISMA, DANIEL MAYBERRY, JOHN MCCORMICK, JOHN MCENEANEY, CURTIS MCGREW, ANTHONY MCLEAN, DENNIS MCNAMARA, CHRISTABOL MIRANDA, CONRAD MOORE, JEREMY MOORE, THOMAS MOORE, EDWARD MOTT, MATHEW MUELLER, VINCENT MUNOZ, BRANDON NELSON, KEITH NELSON, JERMAINE NORMAN, DAVID OJEDA, ONUR ONCER, AARON PARKER, TIMOTHY POLLARD, BENJAMIN PRICE, TYRONE REID, JULIO REIMERS, JON RITZHEIMER, JUSTIN ROBINSON, STEPHEN ROHN, JOSE RUIZ, MICHAEL SANCHEZ, LUKE SCHWEE, JUSTIN SHED, LONNIE SPARKMAN, JEREMY SPRUCE, RYAN TAIT, CHRISTOPHER THORSON, JESSE VELASQUEZ, WILLIAM WADE, MATHEW WATSON, BRIAN WESTER, SETH WILLFORD, THOMAS WRIGHT, JASON YATES. (WATTS, MIKAL)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Reply memoranda are due by September 30, 2019 and must not exceed 5,000 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/23/2019. (djb)
September 20, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #11 MOTION to Remand and, In the Alternative, Objections to Exhibits Appended to Defendants' #13 Response in Opposition to Motion (djb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File re #15 Sealed Document - X, #11 MOTION to Remand , #13 Response in Opposition to Motion, Reply Memorandum in Support by MARK ABRAHAMS, JUSTIN ANDERSON, RYAN ANDERSON, ADRIAN APONTE, JOSE HERNANDEZ ARROYO, DAVID BAKER, DOUG BIZJAK, EDGARD BONILLAS, BRANDON BOYER, SEAN BRANNAN, DENNIS BRENNAN, BRENT BRETZ, JUSTIN BRUETT, RYAN CANNON, RICHARD CHARLESWORTH, WILLIAM CLARK, RICHARD CODY, TIMOTHY COLON, CHRISTOPHER COOPER, CRYSTAL COOPER, JON CRUMP, GREGORY CULLISON, RYAN DAY, CHRISTOPHER DELWISCH, JARED DOSS, RASHON ELLINGTON, ERIC ELLITHORPE, JAMES EYLER, MICHAEL FENNER, AARON FOOTE, CHRISTOPHER FRIEBERG, MATTHEW GOMES, ISRAEL GOMEZ, DANIEL GONZALEZ, JUSTIN GORMAN, HERIBERTO GRACIA-CHAVEZ, JAMES GREEN, SALTHANIEL HALL, JAMES HAMM, JERRY HARTSOCK, KEVIN HOEY, CHAD HOTCHKISS, ANTHONY HYDE, TODD JACOBS, SEAN JENNINGS, JAMES KINSEY, BRANDON LAYMAN, JAMES LEISINGER, DALLAS LEVERONI, JAMIE LEWIS, JOB LISMA, DANIEL MAYBERRY, JOHN MCCORMICK, JOHN MCENEANEY, CURTIS MCGREW, ANTHONY MCLEAN, DENNIS MCNAMARA, CHRISTABOL MIRANDA, CONRAD MOORE, JEREMY MOORE, THOMAS MOORE, EDWARD MOTT, MATHEW MUELLER, VINCENT MUNOZ, BRANDON NELSON, KEITH NELSON, JERMAINE NORMAN, DAVID OJEDA, ONUR ONCER, AARON PARKER, TIMOTHY POLLARD, BENJAMIN PRICE, TYRONE REID, JULIO REIMERS, JON RITZHEIMER, JUSTIN ROBINSON, STEPHEN ROHN, JOSE RUIZ, MICHAEL SANCHEZ, LUKE SCHWEE, JUSTIN SHED, LONNIE SPARKMAN, JEREMY SPRUCE, RYAN TAIT, CHRISTOPHER THORSON, JESSE VELASQUEZ, WILLIAM WADE, MATHEW WATSON, BRIAN WESTER, SETH WILLFORD, THOMAS WRIGHT, JASON YATES. (WATTS, MIKAL)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 Sealed Response. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (sdw)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. These matters are before the Court on Defendants' motions for leave to file under seal their responses to the motions to remand pending in the above- referenced cases. For good cause shown, Defendants' motions are GRANTED, as requested. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/12/2019. (sdw)
September 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Seal Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand, #11 MOTION to Remand , #13 Response in Opposition to Motion (MB)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand [PUBLIC VERSION] filed by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simon Gottlieb, #2 Exhibits 1-10 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 11) (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Seal Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
August 28, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Remand . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/11/2019). (djb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by MARK ABRAHAMS, JUSTIN ANDERSON, RYAN ANDERSON, ADRIAN APONTE, JOSE HERNANDEZ ARROYO, DAVID BAKER, DOUG BIZJAK, EDGARD BONILLAS, BRANDON BOYER, SEAN BRANNAN, DENNIS BRENNAN, BRENT BRETZ, JUSTIN BRUETT, RYAN CANNON, RICHARD CHARLESWORTH, WILLIAM CLARK, RICHARD CODY, TIMOTHY COLON, CHRISTOPHER COOPER, CRYSTAL COOPER, JON CRUMP, GREGORY CULLISON, RYAN DAY, CHRISTOPHER DELWISCH, JARED DOSS, RASHON ELLINGTON, ERIC ELLITHORPE, JAMES EYLER, MICHAEL FENNER, AARON FOOTE, CHRISTOPHER FRIEBERG, MATTHEW GOMES, ISRAEL GOMEZ, DANIEL GONZALEZ, JUSTIN GORMAN, HERIBERTO GRACIA-CHAVEZ, JAMES GREEN, SALTHANIEL HALL, JAMES HAMM, JERRY HARTSOCK, KEVIN HOEY, CHAD HOTCHKISS, ANTHONY HYDE, TODD JACOBS, SEAN JENNINGS, JAMES KINSEY, BRANDON LAYMAN, JAMES LEISINGER, DALLAS LEVERONI, JAMIE LEWIS, JOB LISMA, DANIEL MAYBERRY, JOHN MCCORMICK, JOHN MCENEANEY, CURTIS MCGREW, ANTHONY MCLEAN, DENNIS MCNAMARA, CHRISTABOL MIRANDA, CONRAD MOORE, JEREMY MOORE, THOMAS MOORE, EDWARD MOTT, MATHEW MUELLER, VINCENT MUNOZ, BRANDON NELSON, KEITH NELSON, JERMAINE NORMAN, DAVID OJEDA, ONUR ONCER, AARON PARKER, TIMOTHY POLLARD, BENJAMIN PRICE, TYRONE REID, JULIO REIMERS, JON RITZHEIMER, JUSTIN ROBINSON, STEPHEN ROHN, JOSE RUIZ, MICHAEL SANCHEZ, LUKE SCHWEE, JUSTIN SHED, LONNIE SPARKMAN, JEREMY SPRUCE, RYAN TAIT, CHRISTOPHER THORSON, JESSE VELASQUEZ, WILLIAM WADE, MATHEW WATSON, BRIAN WESTER, SETH WILLFORD, THOMAS WRIGHT, JASON YATES. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (WATTS, MIKAL)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WATTS, MIKAL)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-01996. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-22) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1996 SRN/BRT. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District, Hennepin County, case number 27-cv-19-12508 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7026110) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on 3M, #3 Exhibit(s) State Notice of Service of Process on Aearo Technologies, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRETZ et al v 3M COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONRAD MOORE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SETH WILLFORD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN PRICE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERIBERTO GRACIA-CHAVEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENT BRETZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER DELWISCH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL GONZALEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW GOMES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON FOOTE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY CULLISON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON CRUMP
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM CLARK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HAMM
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK ABRAHAMS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON LAYMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE VELASQUEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN ROBINSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD JACOBS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM WADE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER COOPER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY MOORE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD HOTCHKISS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONUR ONCER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY HARTSOCK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON BOYER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT MUNOZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN GORMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISRAEL GOMEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN ROHN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN BRANNAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MCCORMICK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE RUIZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATHEW WATSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD CHARLESWORTH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS MCGREW
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN SHED
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONNIE SPARKMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON NELSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH NELSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RASHON ELLINGTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY POLLARD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY COLON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN DAY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN HOEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS BRENNAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUG BIZJAK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MCLEAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRONE REID
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL MAYBERRY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LEISINGER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER THORSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIO REIMERS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON YATES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES GREEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON PARKER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN JENNINGS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS MCNAMARA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER FRIEBERG
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN ANDERSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC ELLITHORPE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALTHANIEL HALL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD MOTT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARED DOSS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN ANDERSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES KINSEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN TAIT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD CODY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN CANNON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES EYLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATHEW MUELLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID OJEDA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE HERNANDEZ ARROYO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIAN APONTE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDGARD BONILLAS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS WRIGHT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN BRUETT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SANCHEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMY SPRUCE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS MOORE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MCENEANEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DALLAS LEVERONI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY HYDE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTABOL MIRANDA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOB LISMA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERMAINE NORMAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BAKER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL COOPER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMIE LEWIS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUKE SCHWEE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN WESTER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL FENNER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON RITZHEIMER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?