NESSMITH et al v. 3M COMPANY
Plaintiff: JAMES BOWLES, ALLAN EUROZA, DANIEL YOON, MICHAEL TARAKEGNE, JUAN CASTRO, BRIAN MACKEY, SAMMIE LYLES, RICHARD JARRIN, GARRETT CLISER, GARY CUNNINGHAM, SANDRO CARDENAS, BENJAMIN SPOONER, DAVID TUAZON, CHRISTOPHER TUNE, JASON CHILDERS, ROBBY SALLEE, RANDO ASH, TYLER BOGGS, NATHAN RUSSELL, SAULO CASTILLO, JASON LUKE, BAKER MALEK, JEREMIAH MCCARTHY, HERNAN OSORIO, JUSTIN JONES, JOSHUA STONE, MICHAEL NASH, ALEJANDRO BENITEZ, KYLE TURNER, KENDELL HARRY, MATTHEW CAST, RASHAD STATEN, DANIEL JOHNSON, NATHAN SRAMEK, JONATHAN SMALS, MAURICE TIPTON, JAMES MCCOLLUM, GARRET BRUNTON, JOSEPH TWADDELL, PATRICK KENNEDY, JESS RAMOS, BEUFORT NESSMITH, ANTHONY LOONEY, SANTOS ARANA, CORY VALENCIA, JACOB WOLAK, JOSE SANTIAGO LARALUJANO, STEVEN BARDONNER, ENRIQUE DURAN, NICHOLAS GOFF, BRIAN WILSON, FORREST LANG, SAYEDWAYNE COSBY, JASON SALVADOR, KODY CAIN, FABIAN RAMIREZ, AARON VILLALPANDO, JR, MATTHEW KONN, KEVIN FONSECA, JOSEPH BYHAM, ROLANDO UBALDO, JOSHUA SMITH, ANDREW KOZNA, MATT MCDONALD, PASCUAL SOLIS, JR, DOMINIC FRESCH, JOSEPH RINALDI, MICHAEL BELLINO, ANDRE MAJAK, RYAN DAVIS, RANDOLPH TYLER, JAMES BLAKE, KALEN HANSON, GABRIEL VASQUEZ, MOSES LIN, FRANK PALESTINI, JOSE QUIROS, CRAIG TOMLINSON, ADRIANO LAMBOGLIA, JERMIAH CAMPBELL, STEVEN GARNICA, DAVID BLOCH, DANIEL PECKHAM, DONACIANO DEL TORO CERVANTES, MANUEL PEREZ, JASON WRIGHT, ROBERTO LOPEZ, JEFFERY WARD, MATTHEW GIBBS, JAIME LONGORIA, RONNIE WALLES, SEAN CORNELIUS, ERNIE CASIANO, KIKU PARKER and MANUEL OLIVERA
Defendant: 3M COMPANY and AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03077
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION to Remand , #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, #16 Sealed Document - X, #19 Reply to Response to Motion (djb)
September 29, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #12 MOTION to Remand filed by SANTOS ARANA, RANDO ASH, STEVEN BARDONNER, MICHAEL BELLINO, ALEJANDRO BENITEZ, JAMES BLAKE, DAVID BLOCH, TYLER BOGGS, JAMES BOWLES, GARRET BRUNTON, JOSEPH BYHAM, KODY CAIN, JERMIAH CAMPBELL, SANDRO CARDENAS, ERNIE CASIANO, MATTHEW CAST, SAULO CASTILLO, JUAN CASTRO, DONACIANO DEL TORO CERVANTES, JASON CHILDERS, GARRETT CLISER, SEAN CORNELIUS, SAYEDWAYNE COSBY, GARY CUNNINGHAM, RYAN DAVIS, ENRIQUE DURAN, ALLAN EUROZA, KEVIN FONSECA, DOMINIC FRESCH, STEVEN GARNICA, MATTHEW GIBBS, NICHOLAS GOFF, KALEN HANSON, KENDELL HARRY, RICHARD JARRIN, DANIEL JOHNSON, JUSTIN JONES, PATRICK KENNEDY, MATTHEW KONN, ANDREW KOZNA, ADRIANO LAMBOGLIA, FORREST LANG, JOSE SANTIAGO LARALUJANO, MOSES LIN, JAIME LONGORIA, ANTHONY LOONEY, ROBERTO LOPEZ, JASON LUKE, SAMMIE LYLES, BRIAN MACKEY, ANDRE MAJAK, BAKER MALEK, JEREMIAH MCCARTHY, JAMES MCCOLLUM, MATT MCDONALD, MICHAEL NASH, BEUFORT NESSMITH, MANUEL OLIVERA, HERNAN OSORIO, FRANK PALESTINI, KIKU PARKER, DANIEL PECKHAM, MANUEL PEREZ, JOSE QUIROS, FABIAN RAMIREZ, JESS RAMOS, JOSEPH RINALDI, NATHAN RUSSELL, ROBBY SALLEE, JASON SALVADOR, JONATHAN SMALS, JOSHUA SMITH, PASCUAL SOLIS, JR, BENJAMIN SPOONER, NATHAN SRAMEK, RASHAD STATEN, JOSHUA STONE, MICHAEL TARAKEGNE, MAURICE TIPTON, CRAIG TOMLINSON, DAVID TUAZON, CHRISTOPHER TUNE, KYLE TURNER, JOSEPH TWADDELL, RANDOLPH TYLER, ROLANDO UBALDO, CORY VALENCIA, GABRIEL VASQUEZ, AARON VILLALPANDO, JR, RONNIE WALLES, JEFFERY WARD, BRIAN WILSON, JACOB WOLAK, JASON WRIGHT, DANIEL YOON. (WATTS, MIKAL)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Reply memoranda are due by September 30, 2019 and must not exceed 5,000 words. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/23/2019. (djb)
September 23, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #17 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support, re #16 Sealed Document - X, #12 MOTION to Remand , #14 Response in Opposition to Motion (djb)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File re #16 Sealed Document - X, #12 MOTION to Remand , #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, Reply Memorandum in Support by SANTOS ARANA, RANDO ASH, STEVEN BARDONNER, MICHAEL BELLINO, ALEJANDRO BENITEZ, JAMES BLAKE, DAVID BLOCH, TYLER BOGGS, JAMES BOWLES, GARRET BRUNTON, JOSEPH BYHAM, KODY CAIN, JERMIAH CAMPBELL, SANDRO CARDENAS, ERNIE CASIANO, MATTHEW CAST, SAULO CASTILLO, JUAN CASTRO, DONACIANO DEL TORO CERVANTES, JASON CHILDERS, GARRETT CLISER, SEAN CORNELIUS, SAYEDWAYNE COSBY, GARY CUNNINGHAM, RYAN DAVIS, ENRIQUE DURAN, ALLAN EUROZA, KEVIN FONSECA, DOMINIC FRESCH, STEVEN GARNICA, MATTHEW GIBBS, NICHOLAS GOFF, KALEN HANSON, KENDELL HARRY, RICHARD JARRIN, DANIEL JOHNSON, JUSTIN JONES, PATRICK KENNEDY, MATTHEW KONN, ANDREW KOZNA, ADRIANO LAMBOGLIA, FORREST LANG, JOSE SANTIAGO LARALUJANO, MOSES LIN, JAIME LONGORIA, ANTHONY LOONEY, ROBERTO LOPEZ, JASON LUKE, SAMMIE LYLES, BRIAN MACKEY, ANDRE MAJAK, BAKER MALEK, JEREMIAH MCCARTHY, JAMES MCCOLLUM, MATT MCDONALD, MICHAEL NASH, BEUFORT NESSMITH, MANUEL OLIVERA, HERNAN OSORIO, FRANK PALESTINI, KIKU PARKER, DANIEL PECKHAM, MANUEL PEREZ, JOSE QUIROS, FABIAN RAMIREZ, JESS RAMOS, JOSEPH RINALDI, NATHAN RUSSELL, ROBBY SALLEE, JASON SALVADOR, JONATHAN SMALS, JOSHUA SMITH, PASCUAL SOLIS, JR, BENJAMIN SPOONER, NATHAN SRAMEK, RASHAD STATEN, JOSHUA STONE, MICHAEL TARAKEGNE, MAURICE TIPTON, CRAIG TOMLINSON, DAVID TUAZON, CHRISTOPHER TUNE, KYLE TURNER, JOSEPH TWADDELL, RANDOLPH TYLER, ROLANDO UBALDO, CORY VALENCIA, GABRIEL VASQUEZ, AARON VILLALPANDO, JR, RONNIE WALLES, JEFFERY WARD, BRIAN WILSON, JACOB WOLAK, JASON WRIGHT, DANIEL YOON. (WATTS, MIKAL)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 Sealed Response. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (sdw)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. These matters are before the Court on Defendants' motions for leave to file under seal their responses to the motions to remand pending in the above- referenced cases. For good cause shown, Defendants' motions are GRANTED, as requested. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/12/2019. (sdw)
September 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #13 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #12 MOTION to Remand , #14 Response in Opposition to Motion. (sdw)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Remand [Public Version] filed by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Simon Gottlieb, #2 Exhibits 1-10 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 11) (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (BRANSCOME, KIMBERLY)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by SANTOS ARANA, RANDO ASH, STEVEN BARDONNER, MICHAEL BELLINO, ALEJANDRO BENITEZ, JAMES BLAKE, DAVID BLOCH, TYLER BOGGS, JAMES BOWLES, GARRET BRUNTON, JOSEPH BYHAM, KODY CAIN, JERMIAH CAMPBELL, SANDRO CARDENAS, ERNIE CASIANO, MATTHEW CAST, SAULO CASTILLO, JUAN CASTRO, DONACIANO DEL TORO CERVANTES, JASON CHILDERS, GARRETT CLISER, SEAN CORNELIUS, SAYEDWAYNE COSBY, GARY CUNNINGHAM, RYAN DAVIS, ENRIQUE DURAN, ALLAN EUROZA, KEVIN FONSECA, DOMINIC FRESCH, STEVEN GARNICA, MATTHEW GIBBS, NICHOLAS GOFF, KALEN HANSON, KENDELL HARRY, RICHARD JARRIN, DANIEL JOHNSON, JUSTIN JONES, PATRICK KENNEDY, MATTHEW KONN, ANDREW KOZNA, ADRIANO LAMBOGLIA, FORREST LANG, JOSE SANTIAGO LARALUJANO, MOSES LIN, JAIME LONGORIA, ANTHONY LOONEY, ROBERTO LOPEZ, JASON LUKE, SAMMIE LYLES, BRIAN MACKEY, ANDRE MAJAK, BAKER MALEK, JEREMIAH MCCARTHY, JAMES MCCOLLUM, MATT MCDONALD, MICHAEL NASH, BEUFORT NESSMITH, MANUEL OLIVERA, HERNAN OSORIO, FRANK PALESTINI, KIKU PARKER, DANIEL PECKHAM, MANUEL PEREZ, JOSE QUIROS, FABIAN RAMIREZ, JESS RAMOS, JOSEPH RINALDI, NATHAN RUSSELL, ROBBY SALLEE, JASON SALVADOR, JONATHAN SMALS, JOSHUA SMITH, PASCUAL SOLIS, JR, BENJAMIN SPOONER, NATHAN SRAMEK, RASHAD STATEN, JOSHUA STONE, MICHAEL TARAKEGNE, MAURICE TIPTON, CRAIG TOMLINSON, DAVID TUAZON, CHRISTOPHER TUNE, KYLE TURNER, JOSEPH TWADDELL, RANDOLPH TYLER, ROLANDO UBALDO, CORY VALENCIA, GABRIEL VASQUEZ, AARON VILLALPANDO, JR, RONNIE WALLES, JEFFERY WARD, BRIAN WILSON, JACOB WOLAK, JASON WRIGHT, DANIEL YOON. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (WATTS, MIKAL)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MIKAL WATTS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (WATTS, MIKAL)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION to all counsel of record who are not admitted to the FLND. re #9 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (djb)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-02081. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-24) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Aearo LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. 3M Company is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Defendant Aearo Technologies, LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aearo Technologies, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Mikal C. Watts, Francisco Guerra IV, Erin Rogiers, Paul Danziger, Rodrigo R. de Llano as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-2081 (ECT-SER). (MKB) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7038324) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 8/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NESSMITH et al v. 3M COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BOWLES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLAN EUROZA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL YOON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL TARAKEGNE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN CASTRO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN MACKEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMMIE LYLES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD JARRIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRETT CLISER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRO CARDENAS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN SPOONER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID TUAZON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER TUNE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON CHILDERS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBBY SALLEE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDO ASH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYLER BOGGS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN RUSSELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAULO CASTILLO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON LUKE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAKER MALEK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEREMIAH MCCARTHY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HERNAN OSORIO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN JONES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA STONE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL NASH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEJANDRO BENITEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE TURNER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENDELL HARRY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW CAST
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RASHAD STATEN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL JOHNSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN SRAMEK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN SMALS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURICE TIPTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MCCOLLUM
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRET BRUNTON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH TWADDELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK KENNEDY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESS RAMOS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEUFORT NESSMITH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY LOONEY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANTOS ARANA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CORY VALENCIA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB WOLAK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE SANTIAGO LARALUJANO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN BARDONNER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ENRIQUE DURAN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS GOFF
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN WILSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORREST LANG
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAYEDWAYNE COSBY
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON SALVADOR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KODY CAIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FABIAN RAMIREZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON VILLALPANDO, JR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW KONN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN FONSECA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH BYHAM
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROLANDO UBALDO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA SMITH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW KOZNA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATT MCDONALD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PASCUAL SOLIS, JR
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIC FRESCH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH RINALDI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL BELLINO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE MAJAK
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN DAVIS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDOLPH TYLER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES BLAKE
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KALEN HANSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GABRIEL VASQUEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOSES LIN
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK PALESTINI
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE QUIROS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG TOMLINSON
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADRIANO LAMBOGLIA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERMIAH CAMPBELL
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN GARNICA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BLOCH
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL PECKHAM
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONACIANO DEL TORO CERVANTES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL PEREZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON WRIGHT
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTO LOPEZ
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERY WARD
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW GIBBS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAIME LONGORIA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONNIE WALLES
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN CORNELIUS
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNIE CASIANO
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIKU PARKER
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL OLIVERA
Represented By: Casey D Marshall
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: Aram V. Desteian
Represented By: Lewis A Remele, Jr
Represented By: ARAM V DESTEIAN
Represented By: MIKAL WATTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M COMPANY
Represented By: BENJAMIN W HULSE
Represented By: JERRY W BLACKWELL
Represented By: S Jamal Faleel
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: Faris Rashid
Represented By: KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?