SHERMAN v. BURLESON et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN DOUGLAS SHERMAN
Defendant: JANE DOE, J D HOLLAND, CASTRO, CENTURION REGIONAL MEDICAL DIRECTOR, A RALPH, MARK S INCH, A BURLESON, B BOTTOMS, PULLEY, K RICE and E HERNANDEZ-PEREZ
Case Number: 3:2021cv00537
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #6 ) is GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff may proceed with this case without prepaying the entire filing fee. Because Plaintiff has no funds accrued in his prison trust fund account, the court will not assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee. The clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to the Florida Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun St., Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis (Order and letter mailed.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 4/23/2021. (alb)
April 16, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge re #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEVEN DOUGLAS SHERMAN. (alb)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against B BOTTOMS, A BURLESON, CASTRO, CENTURION REGIONAL MEDICAL DIRECTOR, E HERNANDEZ-PEREZ, J D HOLLAND, MARK S INCH, PULLEY, A RALPH, K RICE, filed by STEVEN DOUGLAS SHERMAN. (No service copies.) (alb)
April 14, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #5 Amended Complaint, #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (alb)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners in the Northern District, along with the complete set of forms required for filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Within thirty days of the date of docketing of this order Plaintiff must either (1) pay the $402.00 filing fee, or (2) file a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the requisite Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate. Additionally within that time, Plaintiff must file an amended complaint on the court-approved form. (Orders and forms mailed.)( Fee due by 5/3/2021.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 4/2/2021. (alb)
March 31, 2021 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
March 31, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEVEN DOUGLAS SHERMAN. (alb)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B BOTTOMS, A BURLESON, CASTRO, CENTURION REGIONAL MEDICAL DIRECTOR, JANE DOE, E HERNANDEZ-PEREZ, J D HOLLAND, MARK S INCH, PULLEY, A RALPH, K RICE, filed by STEVEN DOUGLAS SHERMAN. (No service copies.) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHERMAN v. BURLESON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J D HOLLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASTRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURION REGIONAL MEDICAL DIRECTOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A RALPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK S INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A BURLESON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B BOTTOMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PULLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K RICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E HERNANDEZ-PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN DOUGLAS SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?