BASKIN v. CLEMMONS
Plaintiff: EDWARD L BASKIN
Defendant: W CLEMMONS, MASTERS, AARON LEAVINS, PRATT and JACKSON
Case Number: 3:2021cv00711
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must show cause, if any, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with an order of the court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 6/4/2021. Show Cause Response due by 7/6/2021. (alb) (Main Document 6 replaced on 6/4/2021) (alb).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to STRIKE Plaintiff's "Motion to Access to Courts Without Sale, Denial or Delay" (ECF No. #4 ) from the docket. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 5/10/2021. (alb)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 Stricken per #4 Order. MOTION TO ACCESS TO COURTS WITHOUT SALE, DENIAL OR DELAY by EDWARD L BASKIN. (alb) Modified on 5/10/2021 (alb).
May 5, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION TO ACCESS TO COURTS WITHOUT SALE, DENIAL OR DELAY. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb) Modified on 5/6/2021 to correct date (alb).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The clerk of court is directed to send Plaintiff a civil rights complaint form for use by prisoners, a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, and a prisoner consent form and financial certificate. Within thirty days of the date of this order, Plaintiff must either pay the $402.00 filing fee or file a fully completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis and an amended civil rights complaint. ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/26/2021. Fee due by 5/26/2021.)(Order and form mailed.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 4/26/2021. (alb)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
April 23, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. (alb)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against W CLEMMONS, JACKSON, AARON LEAVINS, MASTERS, PRATT, filed by EDWARD L BASKIN. (No service copies, IFP motion or fee.) (alb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BASKIN v. CLEMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W CLEMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON LEAVINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD L BASKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?