MORRIS v. GEO et al
Plaintiff: AREALEUS K MORRIS
Defendant: GEO, MEDICAL PROVIDER AT BLACKWATER, L BERRIOS, MS NICHOLS, MS DIRRICK, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6 and MS SIMPSON / SIMMONS
Case Number: 3:2023cv24757
Filed: December 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to assess Plaintiff an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $143.09 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The total filing fee for this case is $350.00. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order with the appropriate cover letter to the Florida Department of Corrections. (Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 2/22/2024.) (Cover letter w/ORDER sent to FDOC). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 1/23/2024. (mb)
January 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order, by AREALEUS K MORRIS. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction.) (alb)
January 22, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by AREALEUS K MORRIS. (alb)
January 22, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (alb)
January 22, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (alb)
January 8, 2024 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #6 Order. Fee or form due by 2/7/2024. (alb)
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #5 Motion to Compel. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate approved for use in the Northern District. Within thirty days of the date of docketing of this order Plaintiff must either (1) pay the $405.00 filing fee, or (2) file a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 01/08/2024. (Order and form mailed.) (alb)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel, by AREALEUS K MORRIS. (mb)
January 4, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION to Compel. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (mb)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a motion to proceed in forma pauperis and a Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate approved for use in the Northern District. This case number should be written on the forms. Within thirty days of the date of docketing of this order Plaintiff must either (1) pay the $405.00 filing fee, or (2) file a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis with the requisite Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate.(Fee or form due by 1/18/2024.) (Order and form mailed.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 12/19/2023. (alb)
December 19, 2023 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb)
December 19, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (alb)
December 18, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by AREALEUS K MORRIS. (alb)
December 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L BERRIOS, DIRRICK, JANE DOE 1, JANE DOE 2, JANE DOE 3, JANE DOE 4, JANE DOE 5, JANE DOE 6, GEO, MEDICAL PROVIDER AT BLACKWATER, NICHOLS, SIMPSON / SIMMONS, filed by AREALEUS K MORRIS. (No service copies.) (alb) (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/14/2024) (alb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORRIS v. GEO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AREALEUS K MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL PROVIDER AT BLACKWATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L BERRIOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS NICHOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS DIRRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS SIMPSON / SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?