MURZIKE v. GIELOW et al
Plaintiff: JAMES T. MURZIKE
Defendant: K PERKINS, A ALIGOOD, W GIELOW, J STREIT, BARKER, C GRAY, J JONES, MANNERS, J WHITE, MCMATH, C PUGH, COATES, JERNIGAN, JOHNSON and B WENTZ
Case Number: 3:2024cv00221
Filed: May 20, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2024 Filing 11 USCA Case Number 24-12239-J as to JAMES T. MURZIKE for #8 NOTICE OF APPEAL, by JAMES T. MURZIKE. USCA PROCEDURAL LETTER re USCA Appeal # 24-12239-J. (mb)
July 11, 2024 Filing 10 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #8 Notice of Appeal. (mb)
July 11, 2024 Filing 9 Appeal Instructions re: #8 Notice of Appeal : The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at https://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/form/eleventh-circuit-transcript-information-form **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter in both the district court and the appeals court. Transcript Order Form due by 7/25/2024. (mb)
July 8, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Clerk's Judgment, #6 Order on Report and Recommendation, by JAMES T. MURZIKE. (Fee not paid/no IFP Motion). (mb)
June 5, 2024 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #6 Order on Report and Recommendation. (90 Day Deadline set for 9/3/2024 to dispose working file pursuant to retention policy). (mb)
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's #4 Report and Recommendations. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice as malicious and anabuse of the judicial process, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1); All pending motions are DENIED as moot; and The Clerk of Court must enter judgment in accordance with this orderand close this case. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 6/5/2024. (mb)
June 3, 2024 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Report and Recommendations by JAMES T. MURZIKE. (mb)
June 3, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed Re: #5 Objection to #4 Report and Recommendations. (mb)
May 22, 2024 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint. Accordingly, it is respectfully RECOMMENDED: That this case be DISMISSED without prejudice as malicious and an abuse of the judicial process, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1); All pending motions be DENIED as moot; and The Clerk of Court be directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 6/20/2024.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO on 5/22/2024. (jcw)
May 21, 2024 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (jcw)
May 21, 2024 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ZACHARY C BOLITHO notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ZACHARY C BOLITHO. (jcw)
May 20, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES T. MURZIKE. (jcw)
May 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A ALIGOOD, BARKER, COATES, W GIELOW, C GRAY, JERNIGAN, JOHNSON, J JONES, MANNERS, MCMATH, K PERKINS, C PUGH, J STREIT, B WENTZ, J WHITE, filed by JAMES T. MURZIKE. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MURZIKE v. GIELOW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K PERKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A ALIGOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W GIELOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J STREIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C GRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANNERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCMATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C PUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERNIGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B WENTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES T. MURZIKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?