SCOTT v. HOLDER
Petitioner: RAYMOND SCOTT
Respondent: ERIC H HOLDER, JR
Case Number: 4:2010cv00228
Filed: June 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Wakulla
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION dismissing the petition as moot signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 9/29/10. (tss)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Stephan P Mickle on 3/10/2010. (jws)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting deadline for petitioner to pay filing fee or file motion for ifp by 7/30/2010; setting deadline for respondent to file answer by 8/30/2010 and deadline for reply by 9/20/2010; signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 7/9/10. (tss)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOTT v. HOLDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RAYMOND SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ERIC H HOLDER, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?