MAGWOOD v. CREWS et al
Plaintiff: BOBBY L MAGWOOD
Defendant: MICHAEL D CREWS, MARSHA NICHOLS, RICHARD COMERFORD, OLUGBENGA OQUNSANWO, RUMMEL and J HAAS
Case Number: 4:2014cv00313
Filed: June 25, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Tallahassee Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: MARK E WALKER
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The report and recommendation is accepted and adopted as this Court's opinion. The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, "Defendant's motion to dismiss, ECF No . 78 , is GRANTED due to Plaintiff's refusal to comply with court orders and permit discovery. Defendant's motions for payment of costs, ECF Nos. 78 and 79 , are DENIED inasmuch as Plaintiff lacks funds with which to do so and the imposition of additional liens would be of no benefit." The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/31/2017. (cle)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ACCEPTING 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, "Plaintiff has failed to prosecute this case by refusing to file an amended complaint as previously ordered by this Court. ECF No. [3 4]. Plaintiff's remaining claim against Defendant Nichols is DISMISSED without prejudice. All other claims are dismissed for failure to state a claim as explained by prior order, ECF No. 34 ." The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/18/2015. (tdl)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The Report and Recommendation ECF No. 32 , is accepted and adopted. The motion to dismiss, ECF No. 29 isGRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. 7 , is DISMISSED as to Defendant s Haas, Oqunsanwo, and Rummel for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Further, the motion to dismiss,ECF No. 11 is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's complaint, ECF No. 7 , is DISMISSED as to Defendants Crews, Comerford, and Nichols, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). J HAAS, OLUGBENGA OQUNSANWO (MD), RUMMEL (DR), RICHARD COMERFORD and MICHAEL D CREWS (SECRETARY FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS) terminated. Plaintiff is permitted to submit an amended complaint limited only to Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim against Defendant Nichols. This case is REMANDED for further proceedings. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/30/2015. (sac)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAGWOOD v. CREWS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBBY L MAGWOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL D CREWS
Represented By: ERIC GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSHA NICHOLS
Represented By: ERIC GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD COMERFORD
Represented By: ERIC GONZALEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLUGBENGA OQUNSANWO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUMMEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J HAAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?