DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE et al v. DETZNER et al
Plaintiff: BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE and DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE
Defendant: RICK SCOTT, FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION, PAMELA BONDI, KENNETH W DETZNER and JIMMY PATRONIS
Intervenor: RON DESANTIS FOR GOVERNOR CAMPAIGN
Intervenor Defendant: NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE
Case Number: 4:2018cv00528
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 51 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #50 ORDER CLOSING FILE. (kjw) 90 Day Exhibit Return Deadline set for 3/18/2019.
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER CLOSING FILE. Plaintiffs have filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal dismissing without prejudice this action. ECF No. #49 . The Clerk must enter judgment stating, "This case is dismissed without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)." The Clerk must close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/17/2018. (kjw)
December 14, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE (NKWONTA, UZOMA)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING INTERVENOR'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW. This Court has considered, without hearing, The Ron DeSantis for Governor Campaign's unopposed motion to withdraw as intervenor. ECF No. #47 . This motion is GRANTED. The Clerk shall disconnect the notice of electronic filing for withdrawing counsel, William Dean Hall, III. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/6/2018. (kjw)
December 5, 2018 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw the RON DESANTIS FOR GOVERNOR CAMPAIGN as Intervenor. (HALL, WILLIAM) Modified on 12/6/2018 to reflect that this is unopposed and to correct the document title. (kjw)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. This Court has considered, without hearing, Defendant Secretary of State Detzner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings in All Pending Cases. ECF No. #45 . This motion is GRANTED IN PART, as it relates to this case. This Court directs Defendant and Intervenors to file responsive pleadings on or before 12/21/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/29/2018. (kjw)
November 29, 2018 Filing 45 Secretary's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings in All Pending Cases by KENNETH W DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD) Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct document title. (kjw)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' CONSENT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. This Court has considered, without hearing, Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's Second Supplemental Order. ECF No. #43 . This motion is GRANTED. The parties are directed to confer and file a notice indicating how they intend to proceed in this action on or before 12/14/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/29/2018. (kjw)
November 28, 2018 Filing 43 Plaintiff's Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Court's #42 SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE. (NKWONTA, UZOMA) Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct document title. (kjw)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SECOND SUPPLEMENT TO ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: This Court directs the parties to confer and file indication of how they intend to proceed on or before 11/30/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/19/18. (amm)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SUPPLEMENT TO #36 ORDER DENYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/15/2018. (kjw)
November 15, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of telephonic status and motion hearing held on 11/15/2018, before Judge Mark E. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan A. Hague, Telephone number 850-422-0011. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2019. (mah)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING EMERGENCY MOTION TO INTERVENE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Ron DeSantis for Governor Campaign's Emergency Motion to Intervene. ECF No. #37 . The motion is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/15/2018. (kjw)
November 15, 2018 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Ron DeSantis Campaign for Governor. (HALL, WILLIAM)
November 15, 2018 Filing 37 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by Ron DeSantis Campaign for Governor. (HALL, WILLIAM) Modified on 11/15/2018 to reflect that it is an emergency motion. (kjw)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #3 , is DENIED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/15/2018. (kjw)
November 15, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY LEE BAJOCZKY, JR on behalf of KENNETH W DETZNER (BAJOCZKY, ANTHONY)
November 15, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK MATTHEW FIGLIO on behalf of KENNETH W DETZNER (FIGLIO, ERIK)
November 15, 2018 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Status Conference held on 11/15/2018. Parties discussed status of case. Court hears argument from both sides regarding #3 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Order to follow (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (vkm)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER PROVISIONALLY GRANTING MOTIONS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Emergency Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice of John D. Adams, ECF No. #28 , Jonathan F. Cohn, ECF No. #29 , and Eric D. McArthur, ECF No. #30 . The motions are provisionally GRANTED. Mr. Adams, Mr. Cohn, and Mr. McArthur shall expeditiously complete the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and are provisionally admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Intervenor Defendant National Republican Senatorial Committee. The lawyers shall note they cannot be added to the electronic notification system by the Clerk until admission requirements have been meet. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/15/2018. (kjw)
November 15, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE ALLISON DANIEL on behalf of PAMELA BONDI (DANIEL, STEPHANIE)
November 15, 2018 Filing 30 Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric D. McArthur.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4335255.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 15, 2018 Filing 29 Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan F. Cohn.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4335250.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 15, 2018 Filing 28 Emergency MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John D. Adams.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4335247.) by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 14, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by PAMELA BONDI, FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION. (WENGER, EDWARD)
November 14, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by KENNETH W DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
November 14, 2018 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 14, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE TY LEVESQUE on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (LEVESQUE, GEORGE)
November 14, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD M WENGER on behalf of FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION (WENGER, EDWARD)
November 14, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD M WENGER on behalf of PAMELA BONDI (WENGER, EDWARD)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADMITTING UZOMA N. NKWONTA PRO HAC VICE. This Court has considered, without hearing, the Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Uzoma N. Nkwonta. ECF No. #19 . The motion is GRANTED. Mr. Nkwonta has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for admission and is admitted pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/14/2018. (kjw)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER. This Court enters a Modified Scheduling Order to explain that if either party seeks an evidentiary hearing then this Court will entertain argument on the motions during the status conference set for 9:00 a.m. on November 15, 2018, but will continue the hearing, as necessary, for the presentation of evidence. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/14/2018. (kjw)
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Uzoma N. Nkwonta.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4334315.) by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE. (NKWONTA, UZOMA)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiffs have filed a motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. ECF No. #3 . No responses have been filed by any of the Defendants or the Intervenor-Defendant. Any responses from Defendants or Intervenor-Defendant are due by tonight 11/14/2018 at 10 p.m. This Court will hear argument on the motions during the status conference set for tomorrow, Thursday, November 15, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. Time is of the essence inresolving this matter. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/14/2018. (kjw)
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiffs Memo of Law in Support of Their Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, Plaintiffs Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Appearance- Elias, Notice of Appearance Meyer Vause's Process Service served on Pamela Bondi on 11/14/2018, filed by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 14, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiffs Memo of Law in Support of Their Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, Plaintiffs Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Appearance- Elias, Notice of Appearance Meyer Vause's Process Service served on Jimmy Patronis on 11/14/2018, filed by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 14, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiffs Memo of Law in Support of Their Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, Plaintiffs Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Appearance- Elias, Notice of Appearance Meyer Vause's Process Service served on Florida Elections Canvassing Commission by Serving its CEO Gov. Rick Scott on 11/14/2018, filed by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 14, 2018 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiffs Memo of Law in Support of Their Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, Plaintiffs Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Appearance- Elias, Notice of Appearance Meyer Vause's Process Service served on Rick Scott on 11/14/2018, filed by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 14, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiffs Memo of Law in Support of Their Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause, Plaintiffs Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Appearance- Elias, Notice of Appearance Meyer Vause's Process Service served on Detzner, Kenneth on 11/14/2018, filed by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON BRETT TORCHINSKY on behalf of NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE (TORCHINSKY, JASON)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION to Intervene by NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE. (BARDOS, ANDY)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE - The National Republican Senatorial Committee's motion to intervene, ECF No. #10 , is GRANTED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/13/2018. (cle) Modified on 11/26/2018 to correct the filed date. (kjw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/15/2018 09:00 AM EDT before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is comprised by these devices. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Victoria Milton McGee Courtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO SET STATUS CONFERENCE. The Clerk is directed to set this matter for a telephonic status conference on Thursday, November 15, 2018, at 9:00 am. EDT. The hearing notice shall be served with the Complaint on the Defendants to provide notice of the telephonic status conference. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/13/2018. (kjw) (Status Conference set for 11/15/2018 09:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to PAMELA BONDI, KENNETH W DETZNER, FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION, JIMMY PATRONIS, RICK SCOTT. (Attachments: #1 Summons - FECC, #2 Summons - Scott, #3 Summons - Bondi, #4 Summons - Patronis) (kjw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance as to Attorney Marc E. Elias, filed by JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM on behalf of BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE (BLOHM, JENNIFER) Modified on 11/13/2018 to correct the document title. (kjw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance as to Attorney Ronald G. Meyer, filed by JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM on behalf of BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE (BLOHM, JENNIFER) Modified on 11/13/2018 to correct document title. (kjw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE, DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause) (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BLOHM, JENNIFER)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against PAMELA BONDI, KENNETH W DETZNER, FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION, JIMMY PATRONIS, RICK SCOTT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4333231.), filed by DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE, BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE. (Attachments: #1 Summons Detzner, #2 Summons Florida Elections Canvassing Commission, #3 Summons Scott, #4 Summons Bondi, #5 Summons Patronis) (BLOHM, JENNIFER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE et al v. DETZNER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILL NELSON FOR U S SENATE
Represented By: RONALD G MEYER
Represented By: MARC E ELIAS
Represented By: JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM
Represented By: UZOMA NKEM NKWONTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMOCRATIC SENATORIAL CAMPAIGN COMMITTEE
Represented By: RONALD G MEYER
Represented By: MARC E ELIAS
Represented By: JENNIFER SUZANNE BLOHM
Represented By: UZOMA NKEM NKWONTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICK SCOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA ELECTIONS CANVASSING COMMISSION
Represented By: EDWARD M WENGER
Represented By: BLAINE H WINSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAMELA BONDI
Represented By: EDWARD M WENGER
Represented By: BLAINE H WINSHIP
Represented By: STEPHANIE ALLISON DANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH W DETZNER
Represented By: MALCOLM NOBLE MEANS
Represented By: ASHLEY E DAVIS
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: BRADLEY ROBERT MCVAY
Represented By: ANTHONY LEE BAJOCZKY, JR
Represented By: ERIK MATTHEW FIGLIO
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIMMY PATRONIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: RON DESANTIS FOR GOVERNOR CAMPAIGN
Represented By: WILLIAM DEAN HALL, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: NATIONAL REPUBLICAN SENATORIAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: ROBERT ERIC BILIK
Represented By: ANDY V BARDOS
Represented By: GEORGE TY LEVESQUE
Represented By: JASON BRETT TORCHINSKY
Represented By: KIMBERLY TOLLAND MYDOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?