FRANCO COA v. U S ATTORNEY OFFICE
Petitioner: YOALBERT DANIEL FRANCO COA
Respondent: U S ATTORNEY OFFICE
Case Number: 4:2020cv00297
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to strike, ECF No. #7 , is construed as a notice of voluntary dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and is ACCEPTED. The Clerk of Court shall administratively close this case. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 7/14/20. (blb)
July 1, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION to Strike. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (blb)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike by YOALBERT DANIEL FRANCO COA. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/15/2020). (blb)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall send this Order, along with the prior Order, ECF No. #3 , and the notice to pro se parties, ECF No. 2 , to Petitioner at the Wakulla County Detention Facility, not the state Correctional Institution. The Clerk of Court shall provide Petitioner with a 2241 petition form so that a proper "amended petition" can be filed by 7/30/2020. Petitioner has until 7/30/2020, to file an amended petition and either pay the filing fee or file a properly supported in forma pauperis motion. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon compliance with this Order, or no later than 7/30/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/22/20. (blb)
June 21, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed re: #4 Mail Returned and #5 Mail Returned. (cle)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Yoalbert Daniel Franco Coa and returned #3 ORDER. The Court is uable to find a better address for the Petitioner. (cle)
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 Mail Returned to Sender Unable to Forward Re: #3 ORDER sent to 110 Melaleuca Drive, Crawfordville, Fl 32327. Resent to WAKULLA COUNTY DETENTION CENTER, 15 OAK STREET, CRAWFORDVILLE, FL 32327. (blb)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall send this Order to Petitioner's wife who sought to initiate this case on behalf of her husband. A proper "amended petition" must be filed by 7/13/2020, along with payment of the filing fee or submission of a properly supported in forma pauperis motion. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of an amended petition or no later than 7/13/2020. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/8/20. (blb)
June 8, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (blb)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (blb)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by YOALBERT DANIEL FRANCO COA. (blb) *No copies, No fee*

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRANCO COA v. U S ATTORNEY OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: YOALBERT DANIEL FRANCO COA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U S ATTORNEY OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?