SHEN et al v. SIMPSON et al
Plaintiff: YIFAN SHEN, ZHIMING XU, XINXI WANG, YONGXIN LIU and MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC
Defendant: WILTON SIMPSON, MEREDITH IVEY, PATRICIA FITZGERALD, R J LARIZZA, MONIQUE H WORRELL and KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE
Amicus Curiae: FRED T KOREMATSU CENTER FOR LAW AND EQUALITY AT SEATTLE UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW, CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION LAW POLICY AND JUSTICE AT RUTGERS LAW SCHOOL, AOKI CENTER FOR CRITICAL RACE AND NATION STUDIES AT UC DAVIS SCHOOL OF LAW, LLS ANTI-RACISM CENTER OF LMU LOYOLA LAW SCHOOL, CENTER ON RACE INEQUALITY AND THE LAW AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW, BOSTON UNIVERSITY CENTER FOR ANTIRACIST RESEARCH, CENTER FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND RACIAL JUSTICE AT THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH SCHOOL OF LAW, ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION OF TAMPA BAY, CONFERENCE OF ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN LAW FACULTY, HISPANIC NATIONAL BAR ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, SOUTH ASIAN BAR ASSOCIATION OF NORTH AMERICA, ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - ASIAN LAW CAUCUS, ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE ATLANTA, ASIAN AMERICAN WOMENS POLITICAL INITIATIVE, ASIAN LAW ALLIANCE, CHINESE FOR AFFIRMATIVE ACTION, JAPANESE AMERICAN CITIZENS LEAGUE, LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and STATE OF IDAHO
Case Number: 4:2023cv00208
Filed: May 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing Proceedings held on 7/18/2023, before Judge Allen Winsor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Snyder, Telephone number 850-567-1374. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/27/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2023. (ls)
July 18, 2023 Filing 67 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2023 re #21 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #22 MOTION for Expedited Briefing and Hearing Schedule re #21 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - written order to follow (Court Reporter Lisa Snyder (USDC-Tallahassee)) (tss)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REGARDING HEARING. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 7/17/2023. (vkm)
July 11, 2023 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to correct typographical error filed by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Jian Song) (GORSKI, ASHLEY)
July 7, 2023 Filing 64 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by STATE OF IDAHO Arkansas, Georgia, Indiana, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, New Hampshire, North Dakota, South Carolina, South Dakota and Utah. (TURNER, JOSHUA)
July 6, 2023 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA NATHANIEL TURNER on behalf of STATE OF IDAHO (TURNER, JOSHUA)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING #61 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED MEMORANDUM signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 7/5/23. The #60 amended document is accepted as a substitute for the original filing (ECF No. #56 ). (tss)
July 5, 2023 Filing 61 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #60 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by PATRICIA FITZGERALD, MEREDITH IVEY, WILTON SIMPSON. (FORRESTER, NATHAN)
July 5, 2023 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #23 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to correct typographical error filed by PATRICIA FITZGERALD, MEREDITH IVEY, WILTON SIMPSON. (FORRESTER, NATHAN)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING #55 MOTION TO STAY. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 7/5/2023. All deadlines are stayed as to the Defendant State Attorneys. (kdm)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING #57 MOTION FOR EXPANDED WORD LIMIT. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 7/5/2023. Defendants response (ECF No. #56 ) is accepted as filed. (kdm)
July 3, 2023 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by PATRICIA FITZGERALD, MEREDITH IVEY, WILTON SIMPSON. (FORRESTER, NATHAN)
July 3, 2023 Filing 56 ***ACCEPTED AS FILED PER #58 ORDER GRANTING #57 MOTION FOR EXPANDED WORD LIMIT*** --- RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to correct typographical error filed by PATRICIA FITZGERALD, MEREDITH IVEY, WILTON SIMPSON. (FORRESTER, NATHAN) Modified on 7/5/2023 to add text (kdm).
June 30, 2023 Filing 55 STIPULATION AMD JOINT MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT STATE ATTORNEYS FOR STAY by R J LARIZZA, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE. (JACOBS, ARTHUR) Modified on 7/3/2023 to clarify title (tss).
June 27, 2023 Filing 54 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 28 U.S.C. 517 Statement of Interest. (JARWALA, ALISHA)
June 27, 2023 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISHA JARWALA on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (JARWALA, ALISHA)
June 27, 2023 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK LOUIS SAYLER on behalf of PATRICIA FITZGERALD, MEREDITH IVEY, WILTON SIMPSON (SAYLER, ERIK)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motions for leave to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiffs, ECF No. #33 , #37 - #39 , are GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 06/27/2023. (rcb)
June 21, 2023 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZHIMING XU, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC. R J LARIZZA served on 6/14/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. (TOOMEY, PATRICK)
June 21, 2023 Filing 49 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Proceedings held on 6/9/2023, before Judge Allen Winsor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Snyder, Telephone number 850-567-1374. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/28/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2023. (ls)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING MOITON TO STAY re: #45 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines. All deadlines (other than those related to the preliminary injunctions briefing) are STAYED signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 6/15/23. (bkp)
June 15, 2023 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU re #44 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (WARREN, NICHOLAS)
June 14, 2023 Filing 45 Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines by PATRICIA FITZGERALD, MEREDITH IVEY, WILTON SIMPSON. (BELL, DANIEL)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE - The deadline for all Defendants to respond to the preliminary injunction motion is 7/3/2023. Plaintiffs may file a reply by 7/11/2023. The court will hold a hearing on the motion on 7/18/2023 01:30 PM at the United States Courthouse, Tallahassee. The motion to expedite (ECF No. #22 ) is GRANTED in part, to the extent set out above. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 6/14/2023. (erl)
June 14, 2023 Filing 43 AMICUS BRIEF OF RACIAL JUSTICE CENTERS, AFFINITY BAR AND PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATIONS, AND CIVIL RIGHTS ADVOCACY ORGANIZATIONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (erl)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING #36 LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF - The amicus brief (ECF No. 36-1) is accepted and deemed properly filed. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 6/14/2023. (erl)
June 14, 2023 Filing 41 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ZHIMING XU, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC. MONIQUE H WORRELL served on 6/13/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. (TOOMEY, PATRICK)
June 14, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert S. Chang.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7919584.), #39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7919596.), #37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rose C. Cuison-Villazor.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7919581.), #33 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7918978.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
June 13, 2023 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed on 6/13/2023 on Monique Worrell (see pdf #35 .) (atm)
June 13, 2023 Filing 40 STATUS REPORT re Service of Process by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (TOOMEY, PATRICK)
June 13, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7919596.) by AOKI CENTER FOR CRITICAL RACE AND NATION STUDIES AT UC DAVIS SCHOOL OF LAW. (CHIN, GABRIEL)
June 13, 2023 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert S. Chang.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7919584.) by FRED T. KOREMATSU CENTER FOR LAW AND EQUALITY AT SEATTLE UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (CHANG, ROBERT)
June 13, 2023 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rose C. Cuison-Villazor.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7919581.) by CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION LAW, POLICY, AND JUSTICE AT RUTGERS LAW SCHOOL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (CUISON-VILLAZOR, ROSE)
June 13, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION to File Amicus Brief by FRED T. KOREMATSU CENTER FOR LAW AND EQUALITY AT SEATTLE UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW, CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION LAW, POLICY, AND JUSTICE AT RUTGERS LAW SCHOOL, AOKI CENTER FOR CRITICAL RACE AND NATION STUDIES AT UC DAVIS SCHOOL OF LAW, LLS ANTI-RACISM CENTER OF LMU LOYOLA LAW SCHOOL, CENTER ON RACE, INEQUALITY, AND THE LAW AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW, BOSTON UNIVERSITY CENTER FOR ANTIRACIST RESEARCH, CENTER FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND RACIAL JUSTICE AT THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH SCHOOL OF LAW, ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION OF TAMPA BAY, CONFERENCE OF ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN LAW FACULTY, HISPANIC NATIONAL BAR ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, SOUTH ASIAN BAR ASSOCIATION OF NORTH AMERICA, ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - ASIAN LAW CAUCUS, ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE ATLANTA, ASIAN AMERICAN WOMENS POLITICAL INITIATIVE, ASIAN LAW ALLIANCE, CHINESE FOR AFFIRMATIVE ACTION, JAPANESE AMERICAN CITIZENS LEAGUE, LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/27/2023). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amici Curiae Brief for Racial Justice Centers, Affinity Bar and Professional Associations, and Civil Rights Advocacy Organizations, #2 Exhibit B - Corporate Disclosures) (RODRIGUEZ, MADELEINE)
June 13, 2023 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, First Amended Complaint, Plaintiff's Corrected Emergency Motion For Preliminary Injunction, Order Setting Hearing, Plaintiff's Motion For Expedited Briefing & Hearing On Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction, Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Emergency Motion For Preliminary Injunction, Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction, Declaration Of Zhiming XU, Exhibit "1", Declaration Of Yifan Shen, Exhibit "1", Declaration Of XinXi Wang, Declaration Of Yongxin Liu, Declaration Of Jian Song, Declaration Of Keliang Zhu and Exhibits served on MONIQUE WORRELL on 06/13/2023, filed by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (TOOMEY, PATRICK) Modified on 6/15/2023 using correct docketing event (atm).
June 13, 2023 Filing 33 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7918978.) by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (ZAMAN, RAZEEN)
June 9, 2023 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR:Telephonic Hearing held on 6/9/2023. (Court Reporter Lisa Snyder (USDC-Tallahassee)) (tss)
June 9, 2023 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU, YONGXIN LIU, YIFAN SHEN, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC. KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE served on 6/9/2023, answer due 6/30/2023. (WARREN, NICHOLAS)
June 9, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY on behalf of YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU (TILLEY, DANIEL)
June 9, 2023 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to R J LARIZZA, KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE, MONIQUE H WORRELL. (Attachments: #1 sm worrell, #2 sm rundle) (atm)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiffs, ECF No. #27 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 06/08/2023. (rcb)
June 8, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL ELDEN NORDBY on behalf of WILTON SIMPSON (NORDBY, DANIEL)
June 8, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Haiyan Tang.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7909234.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
June 7, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Haiyan Tang.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7909234.) by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (TANG, HAIYAN)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiffs, ECF No. #13 , is GRANTED. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiffs, ECF No. #14 , is GRANTED. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiffs, ECF No. #16 , is GRANTED. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiffs, ECF No. #19 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 6/7/2023. (rcb)
June 7, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING Telephonic Hearing set for 6/9/2023 at 11:00 AM Eastern Time before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 877 873 8018 When prompted for an access code, enter: 6109198# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 7020# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel try NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audioconnection is compromised by these devices. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/TiAnn Stark Courtroom Deputy Clerk (tss)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING HEARING signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 6/7/23. The clerk will set a telephonic scheduling conference for June 9 at 11:00 a.m. The purpose of the hearing will be to address timing and procedure, not the substance of Plaintiffs #21 request for an injunction. If the parties all agree, the clerk will reset the hearing for any other time available on the courts calendar. (tss)
June 7, 2023 Filing 23 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to correct typographical error by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (GORSKI, ASHLEY)
June 7, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Koo.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7905249.), #20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7905269.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
June 6, 2023 Filing 22 MOTION for Expedited Briefing and Hearing Schedule re #21 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (WARREN, NICHOLAS)
June 6, 2023 Filing 21 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Shen Declaration, #3 Xu Declaration, #4 Wang Declaration, #5 Liu Declaration, #6 Song Declaration, #7 Zhu Declaration, #8 Ex. 1 to Zhu Decl., #9 Ex. 2 to Zhu Decl., #10 Ex. 3 to Zhu Decl., #11 Ex. 4 to Zhu Decl., #12 Ex. 5 to Zhu Decl., #13 Ex. 6 to Zhu Decl., #14 Ex. 7 to Zhu Decl., #15 Ex. 8 to Zhu Decl., #16 Ex. 9 to Zhu Decl., #17 Ex. 10 to Zhu Decl., #18 Ex. 11 to Zhu Decl., #19 Ex. 12 to Zhu Decl., #20 Ex. 13 to Zhu Decl., #21 Ex. 14 to Zhu Decl., #22 Ex. 15 to Zhu Decl., #23 Ex. 16 to Zhu Decl., #24 Ex. 17 to Zhu Decl., #25 Ex. 18 to Zhu Decl., #26 Ex. 19 to Zhu Decl., #27 Ex. 20 to Zhu Decl., #28 Ex. 21 to Zhu Decl., #29 Ex. 22 to Zhu Decl., #30 Ex. 23 to Zhu Decl., #31 Ex. 24 to Zhu Decl., #32 Ex. 25 to Zhu Decl., #33 Ex. 26 to Zhu Decl., #34 Ex. 27 to Zhu Decl., #35 Ex. 28 to Zhu Decl., #36 Ex. 29 to Zhu Decl., #37 Ex. 30 to Zhu Decl., #38 Ex. 31 to Zhu Decl., #39 Ex. 32 to Zhu Decl., #40 Ex. 33 to Zhu Decl., #41 Ex. 34 to Zhu Decl., #42 Ex. 35 to Zhu Decl., #43 Ex. 36 to Zhu Decl., #44 Ex. 37 to Zhu Decl., #45 Ex. 38 to Zhu Decl., #46 Ex. 39 to Zhu Decl., #47 Ex. 40 to Zhu Decl., #48 Ex. 41 to Zhu Decl., #49 Ex. 42 to Zhu Decl., #50 Ex. 43 to Zhu Decl., #51 Ex. 44 to Zhu Decl., #52 Ex. 45 to Zhu Decl., #53 Ex. 46 to Zhu Decl., #54 Ex. 47 to Zhu Decl., #55 Ex. 48 to Zhu Decl., #56 Ex. 49 to Zhu Decl., #57 Ex. 50 to Zhu Decl., #58 Ex. 51 to Zhu Decl., #59 Ex. 52 to Zhu Decl., #60 Ex. 53 to Zhu Decl., #61 Ex. 54 to Zhu Decl., #62 Ex. 55 to Zhu Decl., #63 Ex. 56 to Zhu Decl., #64 Ex. 57 to Zhu Decl.) (WARREN, NICHOLAS)
June 5, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7905269.) by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (LI, BETHANY)
June 5, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Koo.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7905249.) by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (KOO, ELIZABETH)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION FOR EXPANDED WORD LIMIT. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 6/5/2023. (atm)
June 5, 2023 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU, YONGXIN LIU, YIFAN SHEN, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Larizza, #2 Summons - Worrell, #3 Summons - Rundle) (WARREN, NICHOLAS)
June 5, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Derek L. Shaffer.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7903752.) by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (SHAFFER, DEREK)
June 5, 2023 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Leave to File a Memorandum that Exceeds the Word Limit by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (WARREN, NICHOLAS)
June 5, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Keliang Zhu.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7900984.), #14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cody Wofsy.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7902088.), #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Derek L. Shaffer.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7903752.), #12 Summons Returned Executed. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (bkp)
June 3, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Cody Wofsy.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7902088.) by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (WOFSY, CODY)
June 2, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Keliang Zhu.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7900984.) by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (ZHU, KELIANG)
June 1, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU, YONGXIN LIU, YIFAN SHEN, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC. PATRICIA FITZGERALD served on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/13/2023. (WARREN, NICHOLAS)
May 31, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT SCOTT SCHENCK on behalf of All Defendants (SCHENCK, ROBERT)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiffs, ECF No. #7 , is GRANTED. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiffs, ECF No. #8 , is GRANTED. The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice for Plaintiffs, ECF No. #9 , is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK on 05/26/2023. (rcb)
May 25, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Toomey.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7886497.), #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ashley Gorski.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7886489.), #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Taitz.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7886506.). Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (rcb)
May 24, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Taitz.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7886506.) by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (TAITZ, SARAH)
May 24, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Toomey.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7886497.) by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (TOOMEY, PATRICK)
May 24, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ashley Gorski.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-7886489.) by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing) (GORSKI, ASHLEY)
May 23, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU, YONGXIN LIU, YIFAN SHEN, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC. MEREDITH IVEY served on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/13/2023. (WARREN, NICHOLAS)
May 23, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU, YONGXIN LIU, YIFAN SHEN, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC. WILTON SIMPSON served on 5/23/2023, answer due 6/13/2023. (WARREN, NICHOLAS)
May 23, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Chair, #2 Acting Secretary) (bkp)
May 22, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by YONGXIN LIU, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC, YIFAN SHEN, XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU. (WARREN, NICHOLAS)
May 22, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WARREN, NICHOLAS)
May 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7879853.), filed by XINXI WANG, ZHIMING XU, YONGXIN LIU, YIFAN SHEN, MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Simpson, #2 Summons - Ivey, #3 Summons - Fitzgerald) (WARREN, NICHOLAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHEN et al v. SIMPSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YIFAN SHEN
Represented By: NICHOLAS WARREN
Represented By: GABRIEL J CHIN
Represented By: ROBERT SEUNGCHUL CHANG
Represented By: ROSE CUISON-VILLAZOR
Represented By: ASHLEY MARIE GORSKI
Represented By: BETHANY YUE-PING LI
Represented By: CODY H WOFSY
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: DEREK LAWRENCE SHAFFER
Represented By: ELIZABETH L KOO
Represented By: HAIYAN TANG
Represented By: KELIANG ZHU
Represented By: PATRICK CHRISTOPHER TOOMEY
Represented By: RAZEEN J ZAMAN
Represented By: SARAH MICHELLE TAITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZHIMING XU
Represented By: NICHOLAS WARREN
Represented By: GABRIEL J CHIN
Represented By: ROBERT SEUNGCHUL CHANG
Represented By: ROSE CUISON-VILLAZOR
Represented By: ASHLEY MARIE GORSKI
Represented By: BETHANY YUE-PING LI
Represented By: CODY H WOFSY
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: DEREK LAWRENCE SHAFFER
Represented By: ELIZABETH L KOO
Represented By: HAIYAN TANG
Represented By: KELIANG ZHU
Represented By: PATRICK CHRISTOPHER TOOMEY
Represented By: RAZEEN J ZAMAN
Represented By: SARAH MICHELLE TAITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XINXI WANG
Represented By: NICHOLAS WARREN
Represented By: GABRIEL J CHIN
Represented By: ROBERT SEUNGCHUL CHANG
Represented By: ROSE CUISON-VILLAZOR
Represented By: ASHLEY MARIE GORSKI
Represented By: BETHANY YUE-PING LI
Represented By: CODY H WOFSY
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: DEREK LAWRENCE SHAFFER
Represented By: ELIZABETH L KOO
Represented By: HAIYAN TANG
Represented By: KELIANG ZHU
Represented By: PATRICK CHRISTOPHER TOOMEY
Represented By: RAZEEN J ZAMAN
Represented By: SARAH MICHELLE TAITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YONGXIN LIU
Represented By: NICHOLAS WARREN
Represented By: ROBERT SEUNGCHUL CHANG
Represented By: ROSE CUISON-VILLAZOR
Represented By: ASHLEY MARIE GORSKI
Represented By: BETHANY YUE-PING LI
Represented By: CODY H WOFSY
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: DEREK LAWRENCE SHAFFER
Represented By: ELIZABETH L KOO
Represented By: HAIYAN TANG
Represented By: KELIANG ZHU
Represented By: PATRICK CHRISTOPHER TOOMEY
Represented By: RAZEEN J ZAMAN
Represented By: SARAH MICHELLE TAITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MULTI-CHOICE REALTY LLC
Represented By: NICHOLAS WARREN
Represented By: GABRIEL J CHIN
Represented By: ROBERT SEUNGCHUL CHANG
Represented By: ROSE CUISON-VILLAZOR
Represented By: ASHLEY MARIE GORSKI
Represented By: BETHANY YUE-PING LI
Represented By: DANIEL BOAZ TILLEY
Represented By: CODY H WOFSY
Represented By: DEREK LAWRENCE SHAFFER
Represented By: ELIZABETH L KOO
Represented By: HAIYAN TANG
Represented By: KELIANG ZHU
Represented By: PATRICK CHRISTOPHER TOOMEY
Represented By: RAZEEN J ZAMAN
Represented By: SARAH MICHELLE TAITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILTON SIMPSON
Represented By: DANIEL WILLIAM BELL
Represented By: DANIEL ELDEN NORDBY
Represented By: ERIK LOUIS SAYLER
Represented By: HENRY CHARLES WHITAKER
Represented By: NATHAN ANDREW FORRESTER
Represented By: ROBERT SCOTT SCHENCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEREDITH IVEY
Represented By: DANIEL WILLIAM BELL
Represented By: ERIK LOUIS SAYLER
Represented By: HENRY CHARLES WHITAKER
Represented By: NATHAN ANDREW FORRESTER
Represented By: ROBERT SCOTT SCHENCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA FITZGERALD
Represented By: DANIEL WILLIAM BELL
Represented By: ERIK LOUIS SAYLER
Represented By: HENRY CHARLES WHITAKER
Represented By: NATHAN ANDREW FORRESTER
Represented By: ROBERT SCOTT SCHENCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R J LARIZZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONIQUE H WORRELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE FERNANDEZ RUNDLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FRED T KOREMATSU CENTER FOR LAW AND EQUALITY AT SEATTLE UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: ROBERT SEUNGCHUL CHANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION LAW POLICY AND JUSTICE AT RUTGERS LAW SCHOOL
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: ROSE CUISON-VILLAZOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AOKI CENTER FOR CRITICAL RACE AND NATION STUDIES AT UC DAVIS SCHOOL OF LAW
Represented By: GABRIEL J CHIN
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LLS ANTI-RACISM CENTER OF LMU LOYOLA LAW SCHOOL
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER ON RACE INEQUALITY AND THE LAW AT NEW YORK UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BOSTON UNIVERSITY CENTER FOR ANTIRACIST RESEARCH
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND RACIAL JUSTICE AT THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH SCHOOL OF LAW
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION OF TAMPA BAY
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CONFERENCE OF ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN LAW FACULTY
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HISPANIC NATIONAL BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTH ASIAN BAR ASSOCIATION OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE - ASIAN LAW CAUCUS
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASIAN AMERICANS ADVANCING JUSTICE ATLANTA
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASIAN AMERICAN WOMENS POLITICAL INITIATIVE
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASIAN LAW ALLIANCE
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHINESE FOR AFFIRMATIVE ACTION
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAPANESE AMERICAN CITIZENS LEAGUE
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LATINOJUSTICE PRLDEF
Represented By: MADELEINE KRISTINE RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ALISHA JARWALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF IDAHO
Represented By: JOSHUA NATHANIEL TURNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?