WILLIAMS v. CULPEPPER
Plaintiff: HENRY WILLIAMS
Defendant: CULPEPPER, SIMMONS and SINCLAIR
Case Number: 5:2011cv00378
Filed: November 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Panama City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER ADOPTING 92 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, granting 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by SIMMONS, SINCLAIR and directing Clerk to close file; signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 4/24/14. (tss)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion for Sanctions, construed as a Motion to Compel and granting 79 Request to Withdraw the Admissions, signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/2/13. (tss)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - all claims against defendant Culpepper are DISMISSED, official capacity claims against defendant Sinclair are DISMISSED, and the only claims remaining are the individual capacity claims against defendants Simmons and Sinclair; signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 3/27/13. (tss)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING 36 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Official Capacity claims filed by SIMMONS be granted - the official capacity claim against Sgt. Simmons is dismissed with prejudice, the individual capacity claims against Sgt. Simmons and the other claims in the case remain unaffected; signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 12/18/12. (tss)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by HENRY WILLIAMS is DENIED. Defendants, CULPEPPER and SINCLAIR's 13 FIRST MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to 13 First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. (Answer/Response due by 4/9/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/5/2012. (jws)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re 5 First Amended Complaint filed by HENRY WILLIAMS: Clerk to prepare and issue summonses, indicating Defendants have 21 days following service to file a response to amended complaint and refer summonses to USMS for ser ve. Clerk to forward form consenting to trial by Magistrate Judge to Plaintiff. (Notify Chambers on 3/12/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/25/2012. (Summonses referred to USMS. Consent form w/copy of order sent to Plaintiff. ) (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. CULPEPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CULPEPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMMONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SINCLAIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?