Mathis et al v. Darden Restaurants, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Alequin, All Plaintiffs, Teshiure Amos, Felicia Andrews, Alison Asa, Matthew Bogart, Elisa Byrne, Sharon Canteen, Christina Cardenas, Raylene Carlson, Jaclyn Cirillo, Stephen Doneth, Lashawn Edmonds, Amanda Emerson, Lisa Foster, Mary Gillespie, Penny Green, Tiffany Green, Darlene Hamilton, James Hamilton, Princess Heard, Brad Henry, David Juhasz, Jamie Kerr, Belinda Lacey Brown, Cynthia Lambert Ice, Brenda Lawson, Lisa Long, Amanda Mathis, Jennifer McDonald, Jonathan McDougal, Samantha Medina, Crystal Miller, Faye Miller, Rebeccah Moon, Brigett Nichols, Kimberly Palchick, Nikita Patrick, Jodie Pendley, Alaine Peters, Kathleen Phares, Rebecca Phillips, Christina Polk, Ralph Ragsdale, Jeanine Redmon, Nakeysha Robertson, James Rogers, Sarina Unangst, Natalie Vaccaro, Heath Vincent, Troy Vincent, Stasha White, Mary Williams, Antonio Wilson, Reginia Yolton and Edward Zilkey
Defendant: Capital Grille Holdings, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., Darden SW LLC, Florida SE, Inc., GMRI, Inc., N and D Restaurants, Inc., Rare Hospitality International, Inc. and Rare Hospitality Management, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2012cv61742
Filed: September 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft. Lauderdale Office
County: Broward
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1081 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation DE #1080 is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to DISMISS with prejudice claims by Named Plaintiffs Brad Henry, Rebecca Moon, Ralph Ragsdale, Jr., and Antonio Wilson against the Defendant. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1080 STIPULATION of Dismissal Brad Hentry, Rebecca Moon, Ralph Ragsdale Jr., and Antonio Wilson by Darden Restaurants, Inc. (Reed, Aaron)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1079 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration Proceedings by Darden Restaurants, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reed, Aaron)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1078 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation DE #1077 is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/15/2018. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1077 STIPULATION of Dismissal - SAMANATHA MEDINA, ALAINE PETERS, AND NAKEYSHA ROBERSON (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lichter, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1076 STATUS REPORT Joint regarding Arbitration Proceedings (Lichter, David)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Granting #1074 Stipulation of Dismissal. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that The Clerk is directed to DISMISS with prejudice claims by Named Plaintiffs Alison Asa, Belinda Lacey Bron, Elisa Byrne, Darlene Hamilton, Cynthia Lambert Ice, David Juhasz, Brenda Lawson, Kimberly Palchick, and Kathleen Phares Curry against the Defendant. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/12/2018. (gp)
June 12, 2018 Filing 1074 STIPULATION of Dismissal - Alison Asa, Belinda Lacey Brown, Elisa Byrne, Darlene Hamilton, Cynthia Lambert Ice, David Juhasz, Brenda Lawson, Kimberly Palchick and Kathleen Phares Curry (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Reed, Aaron)
June 12, 2018 Filing 1073 STATUS REPORT Regarding Arbitration Proceedings (Reed, Aaron)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1072 ORDER granting #1071 Withdrawal. Attorney Caitlin Duffy terminated. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/16/2018. (kpe)
February 16, 2018 Filing 1071 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Caitlin Duffy by Caitlin Duffy.. Responses due by 3/2/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 ORDER granting #1069 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Jessica Theresa Travers terminated. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/16/2018. (kpe)
February 15, 2018 Filing 1069 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Jessica T. Travers as Counsel of Record by Jessica T. Travers, Esq... Responses due by 3/1/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1068 STIPULATION of Dismissal JONATHAN MCDOUGAL, NIKITA PATRICK, AND TROY VINCENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lichter, David)
February 13, 2018 Filing 1067 STATUS REPORT Joint regarding Arbitration Proceedings (Lichter, David)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1066 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Named Plaintiffs Matthew Bogart, Princess Heard-Sims, Amanda Mathis, Crystal Miller, Sarina Unangst, and Felicia Andrews (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Matthew Bogart, #2 Exhibit B - Princess Heard, #3 Exhibit C - Amanda Mathis, #4 Exhibit D - Crystal Lynn Miller, #5 Exhibit E - Sarina Unangst, #6 Exhibit F - Felicia Andrews)(Lichter, David)
October 16, 2017 Filing 1065 STATUS REPORT Joint (Lichter, David)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1064 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation DE #1063 is hereby GRANTED; The Clerk is directed to DISMISS with prejudice claims by Named Plaintiffs Nicole Alequin, Sharon Canteen, Christina Cardenas, Stephen Doneth, Lisa Long, and Stasha White against the Defendant. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/27/2017. (jas)
June 20, 2017 Filing 1063 STIPULATION of Dismissal Nicole Alequin, Sharon Canteen, Christina Cardenas, Stephen Doneth, Lisa Long and Stasha White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Reed, Aaron)
June 20, 2017 Filing 1062 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration Proceedings (Reed, Aaron)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1061 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Stipulation DE #1060 is hereby GRANTED; The Clerk is directed to DISMISS with prejudice claims by Named Plaintiffs Teshiure Amos, Raylene Carlson, Amanda Emerson, Mary Gillespie, Tiffany Green, and James Rogers against the Defendant. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/28/2017. (jas)
February 20, 2017 Filing 1060 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Named Plaintiffs Teshiure Amos, Raylene Carlson, Amanda Emerson, Mary Gillespie, Tiffany Green, and James Rogers by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
February 20, 2017 Filing 1059 STATUS REPORT JOINT REGARDING ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS by All Plaintiffs (Lichter, David)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - GRANTING #1057 Stipulation of Dismissal. The above styled action is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to DISMISS claims by Named Plaintiffs Jaclyn Cirillo, Penny Green, Jamie Kerr, Faye Miller, Regina Yolton, Edward Zilkey, Jennifer McDonal, and Jodie Pendley against the Defendant and DENY any pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/24/2016. (gp)
October 21, 2016 Filing 1057 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Named Plaintiffs Jaclyn Cirillo, Penny Green, Jamie Kerr, Faye Miller, Regina Yolton, Edward Zilkey, Jennifer McDonald, and Jodie Pendley by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Lichter, David)
October 21, 2016 Filing 1056 STATUS REPORT Joint REGARDING ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS by All Plaintiffs (Lichter, David)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 ORDER granting in part #1054 Motion for Extension of Time for Status Reports. The parties shall file status reports every 120 days. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/23/2016. (pes)
June 23, 2016 Filing 1054 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time FOR STATUS REPORTS re #1025 Order on Motion to Stay by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 7/11/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
June 23, 2016 Filing 1053 STATUS REPORT Joint regarding Arbitration Proceedings by All Plaintiffs (Lichter, David)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1052 ORDER ON STATUS REPORT re #1051 Stipulation of Dismissal; The Stipulation is APPROVED; This action is DISMISSED with prejudice as to Plaintiff Natalie Vaccaro Lambert ONLY. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 4/14/2016. (jas)
April 8, 2016 Filing 1051 STIPULATION of Dismissal -Natalie Vaccaro Lambert by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Order Approving Settlement Natalie Vaccaro Lambert)(Reed, Aaron)
April 8, 2016 Filing 1050 STATUS REPORT /Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration Proceedings by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc. (Reed, Aaron)
February 5, 2016 Filing 1049 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration Proceedings by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc. (Reed, Aaron)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 ORDER on #1047 Status Report filed by All Plaintiffs Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/4/2015. (yha)
December 4, 2015 Filing 1047 STATUS REPORT Joint regarding Arbitration Proceedings by All Plaintiffs (Lichter, David)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1046 STATUS REPORT Joint regarding Arbitration Proceedings by All Plaintiffs (Lichter, David)
August 7, 2015 Filing 1045 STATUS REPORT Joint regarding Arbitration Proceedings by All Plaintiffs (Lichter, David)
June 5, 2015 Filing 1044 STATUS REPORT Joint regarding Arbitration Proceedings by All Plaintiffs (Lichter, David)
April 6, 2015 Filing 1043 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration Proceedings by All Plaintiffs (Lichter, David)
February 6, 2015 Filing 1042 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Arbitration Proceedings by All Plaintiffs (Lichter, David)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 ORDER granting # 1040 Motion to Set Aside as to Edward Zilkey # 1033 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Re: # 1033 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/21/2015. (yha)
January 21, 2015 Filing 1040 Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside # 1033 Order on Motion to Dismiss as to Former Named Plaintiff Edward Zilkey by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1039 NOTICE of Change of Address (Firm Name) by David Henry Lichter. See # 1038 for image. (yha)
December 22, 2014 Filing 1038 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Change of Firm Name (Lichter, David)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 Order Administratively Closing Case. Motions terminated: 1010 MOTION to Vacate # 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in, # 1000 MOTION for Extension of Time to align expert rebuttal deadlines :Unopposed Motion to Align Deadlines to Serve Rebuttal to Plaintiffs' Additional Expert Witness Reports filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 12/11/2014. (yha) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
December 8, 2014 Filing 1036 STATUS REPORT Defendant's Status Report #1 Regarding Arbitration Proceedings by Darden Restaurants, Inc. (Reed, Aaron)
December 8, 2014 Filing 1035 STATUS REPORT # 1 Regarding Arbitration Proceedings by All Plaintiffs (Lichter, David)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 ORDER denying as moot # 1028 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/19/2014. (yha)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 ORDER granting in part # 1024 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint with Respect to Five Remaining Named Plaintiffs Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/18/2014. (yha)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 ORDER granting # 1031 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration (extended to Plaintiff Christina Cardenas) Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/17/2014. (yha)
November 17, 2014 Filing 1031 MOTION to Stay -Joint Supplement to Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Responses due by 12/4/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 ORDER deferring ruling on # 1024 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/27/2014. (yha)
October 27, 2014 Filing 1029 RESPONSE to Motion re # 1024 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss # 937 Amended Complaint /DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND COMPEL DISPUTE RESOLUTION PROCESS filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 11/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Lichter, David)
October 20, 2014 Filing 1028 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery /Defendants' Alternative Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Reset the Remaining Schedule by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Amy S. Ramsey, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Draft Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 ORDER granting # 1026 JOINT SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/14/2014. (yha)
October 14, 2014 Filing 1026 SUPPLEMENT to # 1021 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration /Joint Supplement to Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc. (Reed, Aaron) Modified to convert document to motion on 10/15/2014 (yha).
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 ORDER granting # 1021 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/9/2014. (yha)
October 8, 2014 Filing 1024 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss # 937 Amended Complaint /DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO STAY PROCEEDINGS AND COMPEL DISPUTE RESOLUTION PROCESS by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Responses due by 10/27/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3/Email, Email, Declaration of Melissa Ingalsbe)(Reed, Aaron) Modified date terminated on 11/19/2014 (yha).
October 8, 2014 Filing 1023 RESPONSE in Support re # 1021 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Darden DRP April 2011)(Reed, Aaron)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE re # 1021 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., ( Responses due by 10/10/2014) Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 10/6/2014. (yha)
October 3, 2014 Filing 1021 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Responses due by 10/20/2014 (Reed, Aaron)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 ORDER granting in part # 1019 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Discovery due by 10/20/2014. Expert Discovery due by 10/20/2014. Substantive Motions due by 10/28/2014. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/26/2014. (yha)
September 25, 2014 Filing 1019 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery /Defendants' Motion to Extend Discovery and Substantive Pretrial Motion Deadlines by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Email with Attachment, # 2 Exhibit 2-Email, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 ORDER denying # 1017 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/22/2014. (yha)
September 19, 2014 Filing 1017 Joint MOTION to Stay -for 30-Day Stay to Assess Agreement to Pursue Arbitration and for Possible Subsequent Status Conference by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Responses due by 10/6/2014 (Reed, Aaron)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT DEFENDANTS MOTIONS denying as moot # 902 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot # 953 Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler ; denying as moot # 975 Motion to Strike ; denying as moot # 975 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/11/2014. (yha)
September 9, 2014 Filing 1015 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 8-14-14 before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas, 1-109 pages, Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5657 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter Francine Salopek before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter Francine Salopek or PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2014. (fs)
September 8, 2014 Filing 1014 RESPONSE/REPLY to # 1009 Notice (Other),, /Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Suggestion of Mootness (D.E. 1009) by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 ORDER denying without prejudice 958 Sealed Motion; granting # 1006 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/4/2014. (tpl)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 ORDER denying Without Prejudice 923 Sealed Motion. Cancelling Oral Argument. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/4/2014. (mg)
September 4, 2014 Filing 1009 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re # 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support , # 902 MOTION to Strike /Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky and Memorandum of Law , # 975 Defendant's MOTION to Strike The Declaration/Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (D.E. 962-1) Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Strike Notice of Suggestion of Mootness (Lichter, David)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 ORDER Requiring Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/3/2014. (tpl)
September 3, 2014 Filing 1010 MOTION to Vacate Oral Arguments on # 922 Motion to Strike and on # 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support . See # 1005 for image. Responses due by 9/22/2014(yha)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 ORDER granting # 1002 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/3/2014. (ls)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 ORDER denying as moot # 996 Motion for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Connection with Response to Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/3/2014. (ls)
September 3, 2014 Filing 1006 Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw Document MOTION for the Court to Determine That Defendants Have Committed Spoliation of Evidence and to Vacate Oral Argument on that Motion by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 9/22/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
September 3, 2014 Filing 1005 WITHDRAWAL of Motion /Joint Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Expert [D.E. 922] and to Vacate Oral Argument on that Motion and on Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Experts [D.E. 953] (Reed, Aaron)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 ORDER denying as moot # 982 Motion for Adverse Inference and to Dismiss Opt-in Plaintiffs for Failure to Participate in Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/3/2014. (yha)
September 2, 2014 Filing 1003 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 982 Defendant's MOTION Adverse Inference /Defs' Motion for Adverse Inference and to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs for Failure to Participate in Discovery and Memorandum in Support /Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Adverse Inference and to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs for Failure to Participate in Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron)
September 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 ORDER granting # 940 Motion. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/1/2014. (ces)
August 29, 2014 Filing 1000 MOTION for Extension of Time to align expert rebuttal deadlines :Unopposed Motion to Align Deadlines to Serve Rebuttal to Plaintiffs' Additional Expert Witness Reports by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Responses due by 9/15/2014 (Reed, Aaron)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 999 ORDER Granting # 994 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Aaron D. Crews terminated Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Aaron Crews. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/28/2014. (gp)
August 28, 2014 Filing 998 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support (Defendants' Reply In Support Of Motion To Exclude Opinions Of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William Cutler [D.E. 953]) filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Morrow v. Flowers Food, Inc., 3:07-cv-617-MHT (M.D. Ala. Apr. 27, 2009), # 2 Exhibit 2 - Morales v. Greater Omaha Packing Co., 8:08-CV-88, 8:08-CV-161 (D. Neb.))(Reed, Aaron)
August 28, 2014 Filing 997 RESPONSE in Support re # 957 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for the Court to Determine that Defendants Have Committed Spoliation of Evidence filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Lichter, David)
August 28, 2014 Filing 996 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Connection with Response to Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action (D.E. 992), and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron)
August 27, 2014 Filing 1002 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Paul Weiner. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 85477. (ksa)
August 27, 2014 Filing 995 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re # 988 Response in Opposition to Motion, Amended Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Amended Report, # 2 Appendix 1, # 3 Appendix 2, # 4 Appendix 3) (Lichter, David)
August 26, 2014 Filing 994 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Aaron Crews. by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Responses due by 9/12/2014 (Reed, Aaron)
August 21, 2014 Filing 993 RESPONSE to Motion re # 982 Defendant's MOTION Adverse Inference /Defs' Motion for Adverse Inference and to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs for Failure to Participate in Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 9/2/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(Lichter, David)
August 21, 2014 Filing 992 Notice of Supplemental Authority re # 974 Order on Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action by All Plaintiffs (Lichter, David)
August 21, 2014 Filing 991 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re # 990 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 3 Replacement) (Lichter, David)
August 20, 2014 Filing 990 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re # 988 Response in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Filing Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Appendix 1, # 3 Appendix 2, # 4 Appendix 3) (Lichter, David)
August 18, 2014 Filing 989 RESPONSE in Opposition re # 957 MOTION to Seal /Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Court to Determine that Defendnats Have Committed Spoliation of Evidence filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-8/Declarations and Deposition Excerpts)(Reed, Aaron)
August 18, 2014 Filing 988 RESPONSE in Opposition re # 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Lichter, David)
August 18, 2014 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 987 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (mg)
August 14, 2014 Filing 986 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas: Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2014 re # 940 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action And Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Argument heard. Written Order to enter. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 954-769-5657 / Francine_Salopek@flsd.uscourts.gov (kc)
August 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 985 ORDER REFERRING # 982 Defendant's MOTION Adverse Inference /Defs' Motion for Adverse Inference and to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs for Failure to Participate in Discovery and Memorandum in Support filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc. Motions referred to Judge Lurana S. Snow Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/8/2014. (yha)
August 7, 2014 Filing 984 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 940 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action And Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1:Table & exhbits A-O, # 2 Exhibit 2-15: Deposition excerpts & exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 16-25: Deposition excerpts & exhibits, # 4 Exhibit 26-36: Declaration of Amy Ramsey; Deposition excerpts)(Reed, Aaron)
August 5, 2014 Filing 983 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 922 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Darden's Expert Report of Ali Saad, Ph.D. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-13)(Lichter, David)
August 4, 2014 Filing 982 Defendant's MOTION Adverse Inference /Defs' Motion for Adverse Inference and to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiffs for Failure to Participate in Discovery and Memorandum in Support by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Amy Ramsey, # 2 Exhibit B-Chart on Failure to Respond, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
August 1, 2014 Filing 981 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 975 Defendant's MOTION to Strike The Declaration/Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (D.E. 962-1) Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Strike /Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Strike the Declaration/Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (D.E. 962-1) filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Amy Ramsey)(Reed, Aaron)
July 31, 2014 Filing 980 RESPONSE to Motion re # 975 Defendant's MOTION to Strike The Declaration/Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (D.E. 962-1) Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Strike filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 8/11/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 979 ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE re # 975 Defendant's MOTION to Strike The Declaration/Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (D.E. 962-1) Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Strike filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 975 Defendant's MOTION to Strike The Declaration/Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (D.E. 962-1) Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Strike .( Responses due by 7/31/2014, Replies due by 8/1/2014.) Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/30/2014. (yha)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 978 ORDER granting # 977 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/30/2014. (yha)
July 29, 2014 Filing 977 Unopposed MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom At Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Decertify the Collective Action by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/15/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 976 ORDER granting # 970 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/28/2014. (yha)
July 28, 2014 Filing 975 Defendant's MOTION to Strike The Declaration/Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (D.E. 962-1) ( Responses due by 8/14/2014), Defendant's MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Motion to Strike by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Defs' Second Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs, # 2 Exhibit 2-Pl Vaccaro's Objections to Defs' Second Set of Interrogatories)(Reed, Aaron)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 974 ORDER granting # 964 Motion to Seal. Re: 965 Sealed Document. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/25/2014. (mb)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 973 ORDER granting # 957 Motion to Temporarily File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Court to Determine that Defendants have Committed Spoliation of Evidence [ECF No. 958]. [ECF No. 958] shall remain under pending further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 7/25/2014. (mb)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 972 ORDER granting # 961 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 7/25/2014. (yha)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 971 ORDER granting # 959 Motion for Hearing on Motion for Court to Determine that Defendants have Committed Spoliation of Evidence Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 7/25/2014. (yha)
July 25, 2014 Filing 970 MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom -Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave of Court for Defense Counsel and Legal Staff to Utilize Electronic Device at Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Responses due by 8/11/2014 (Reed, Aaron)
July 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 969 ORDER REFERRING # 959 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing Oral Argument on Their Motion for Court to Determine that Defendants Have Committed Spoliation of Evidence filed by All Plaintiffs, 958 SEALED MOTION, # 957 MOTION to Seal. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for disposition or report and recommendation. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/24/2014. (tpl)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 968 ORDER granting # 956 Motion for Extension of Time. Re: # 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Responses due by 8/18/2014 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/24/2014. (yha)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 967 ORDER denying # 960 MOTION TO RESCHEDULE ORAL ARGUMENT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/24/2014. (yha)
July 24, 2014 Filing 966 RESPONSE in Support re # 960 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing to Reschedule Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action to Coincide with Oral Argument on Other Outstanding Motions filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lichter, David)
July 24, 2014 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 965 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (mg)
July 23, 2014 Filing 964 MOTION to Seal (Attachments: # 1 Sealed Document Tracking Form, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(mg)
July 23, 2014 Filing 963 RESPONSE to Motion re # 960 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing to Reschedule Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action to Coincide with Oral Argument on Other Outstanding Motions filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Replies due by 8/4/2014. (Reed, Aaron)
July 23, 2014 Filing 962 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re # 921 Response in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Filing Declaration/Supplemental Report of Dr. Albert Madansky (Attachments: # 1 Supplement) (Lichter, David)
July 23, 2014 Filing 961 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply /Defs' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Pls' Motion for Court to Determine that Defendants Have Committed Spoliation of Evidence (D.E. 958) by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron)
July 23, 2014 Filing 960 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing to Reschedule Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action to Coincide with Oral Argument on Other Outstanding Motions by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
July 23, 2014 Filing 959 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing Oral Argument on Their Motion for Court to Determine that Defendants Have Committed Spoliation of Evidence by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
July 23, 2014 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 958 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (mg)
July 23, 2014 Filing 957 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION to Temporily File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion for Court to Determine That Defendants Have Commmitted Spoliation of Evidence. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(mg)
July 22, 2014 Filing 956 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler re # 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 8/8/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 955 ORDER granting # 954 Motion for Hearing. Re: # 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2014 10:00 AM before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/18/2014. (yha)
July 18, 2014 Filing 954 Defendant's MOTION for Hearing re # 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support /Defs' Request for Oral Argument on Their Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron)
July 18, 2014 Filing 953 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Exclude Opinions of Expert Witnesses Madansky and Cutler /Defs' Motion to Exclude the Opinions of Expert Witnesses Dr. Albert Madansky and William J. Cutler and Memorandum of Law in Support by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5, Expert Rep. of Dr. Madansky, Excerpts of Madansky Dep., Expert Report of Cutler, Excerpts of Cutler Dep., Decl. of Wm. Cutler)(Reed, Aaron)
July 16, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing on Motion to Strike Expert Report [ECF 923] set for 9/5/2014 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. (mb)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 952 ORDER granting # 951 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/16/2014. (yha)
July 16, 2014 Filing 951 Defendant's MOTION for Hearing /Defendants' Request for Oral Argument on Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Dr. Ali Saad by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron)
July 15, 2014 Filing 950 RESPONSE/REPLY to # 922 MOTION to Seal /Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Dr. Ali Saad by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Part 1 Rebuttal Declaration of Dr. Ali Saad, # 2 Exhibit 1-Part 2 Rebuttal Declaration of Dr. Ali Saad, # 3 Exhibit 2-16/Expert Rep Dr. Madansky, Excerpts of Dep of Caswell, Morocco, Hohman, Decl. of Iaciofoli, Cancio, Keenan, Mannion, Andrews Answers to Defs' First Set of Interr., Sandefer Answers to Defs' First Set of Interr., Ruth's Answers to Defs' First Set of Interr., Excerpts of Dep of Ruth, Ex. 59 to Caswell Dep, Decl. of Corbett, Gervasi)(Reed, Aaron)
July 8, 2014 Filing 949 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiff Jason Hutches (DE 651 and DE 652) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
July 7, 2014 Filing 948 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint (Third Amended Collective Action Complaint) by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 947 ORDER granting in part # 945 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/3/2014. (yha)
July 3, 2014 Reset Deadlines as to # 940 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action And Incorporated Memorandum of Law .per # 946 Amended Order Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2014 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. (yha)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 946 AMENDED ORDER SETTING HEARING re # 944 Order on Motion for Hearing Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/3/2014. (yha)
July 3, 2014 Filing 945 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Marshall, J.)
July 2, 2014 Set Deadlines as to # 940 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action And Incorporated Memorandum of Law per # 944 Order. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2014 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. (yha)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 944 ORDER granting # 942 Motion for Hearing on Motion to Decertify Collective Action Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/2/2014. (yha)
June 30, 2014 Filing 943 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Produce Witness held on 5/28/2014 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer, 1-38 pages, Court Reporter: Carl Schanzleh, 954-769-5488 / Carl_Schanzleh@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/2/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Access Form)(amb)
June 27, 2014 Filing 942 MOTION for Hearing re # 940 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action And Incorporated Memorandum of Law , # 941 Notice (Other),, /Defendants' Request for Oral Argument on Its Motion to Decertify Collective Action by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron)
June 27, 2014 Filing 941 NOTICE by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc. re # 940 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action And Incorporated Memorandum of Law /Notice of Filing Additional Exhibits to D.E. 940 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 61-80/Dep Excerpts Middleton, Woernle, Spangler, Phillips, Steele, Pratt, Corren, Scott, Swenson, Fortner, Iavecchia, Breum, Nelson, Taplin, Foose, Dean, Gonzales, Makki, Chadwich, Beal, # 2 Exhibit 81/Declaration of Saad, # 3 Exhibit 82-84/Cutler Report, Cutler Declaration, Cutler Dep, # 4 Exhibit 85/Declaration of Ramsey, # 5 Exhibit 86-88/Madansky Report, Madansky Dep, Declaration of Williams, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
June 27, 2014 Filing 940 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Decertify Collective Action And Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-22/Declarations Burrowes, Iaciofoli, Kiernan, Norberg, Wilkerson, Babitt, O'Keefe, McCarty, Babitt (1st), Dep Excerpts Wilson, Livrieri, Wilkerson, Williams, Kiernan, Edwards, Iaciofoli, Norberg, Psaras, Clement, Davis, Sorensen, Cooper, # 2 Exhibit 23/Declaration of Gathers, # 3 Exhibit 24-32/Declarations Psaras, Willings, Defs' Objections, Dep Excerpts Gufford, Anderson, Hohman, Gathers, Willings, Caswell, # 4 Exhibit 33-42/In Sample WHISARD, Out of Sample WHISARD, Dep ExcerptsRabeneau, Serra, Andrews, Tigney, Bullerman, Dedeaux, Jones, Oikle, # 5 Exhibit 43-60/Dep Excerpts Stokes, Emerson, Long, Doneth, McNutt, Roberson, Rogers, Vaccaro, White, Stone, Mathis, Henry, Zilkey, Berg, Butler, Herrera, McCready, McDougal)(Reed, Aaron)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 939 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE REPLY granting # 938 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re # 902 MOTION to Strike /Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky and Memorandum of Law . Replies due by 8/5/2014. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/23/2014. (yha)
June 19, 2014 Filing 938 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to # 936 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,,,,,, by All Plaintiffs. (Lichter, David)
June 18, 2014 Filing 937 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Lichter, David)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 936 OMNIBUS ORDER denying as moot # 896 Motion for Extension of Time; granting # 904 Motion to Amend/Correct. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge ; granting # 922 Motion to Seal ; granting # 930 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs are authorized to file Motion 923 including exhibits under Seal, shall remain Sealed until futher order. Defendants may file response to Motion to Stike on or before 7/15/2014. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/17/2014. (jmd)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 935 ORDER granting in part # 934 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/16/2014. (yha)
June 13, 2014 Filing 934 UNOPPOSED MOTION To Exceed Page Limitation For Motion To Decertify Collective Action by Darden Restaurants, Inc., Darden SW LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron) Modified text on 6/16/2014 (jua).
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 933 ORDER granting # 929 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/13/2014. (ail)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 932 ORDER granting in part Unopposed Motion to Align Court's Scheduling Order of May 21, 2014 with Court's Amended Scheduling Order of April 25, 2014 re # 926 Motion to Amend/Correct. Discovery due by 10/1/2014. In Limine Motions due by 1/16/2015. Motions due by 10/9/2014. Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/16/2015. Calendar Call set for 1/30/2015 at 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Jury Trial set for 2/2/2015 at 9:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/13/2014. (ail)
June 12, 2014 Filing 931 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 902 MOTION to Strike /Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky and Memorandum of Law /Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8/2/13 Letter)(Reed, Aaron)
June 11, 2014 Filing 930 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply /Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Darden's Expert Report of Ali Saad, PHD. by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron)
June 10, 2014 Filing 928 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re # 922 MOTION to Seal Notice of Filing Exhibits to Declaration of Dr. Albert Madansky (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David)
June 9, 2014 Filing 929 Unopposed Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filing for Caitlin Duffy. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 5305. (ksa)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 927 ORDER denying # 924 Motion to Retain Magistrate Judge Seltzer. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 6/6/2014. (yha)
June 6, 2014 Filing 926 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct # 911 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Mediation, Order Referring Case to Judge,,,,,,,,, by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/23/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
June 4, 2014 Filing 925 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re # 912 Order Joint Notice of Filing of Agreement on Mediator (Lichter, David)
June 4, 2014 Filing 924 Defendant's MOTION Motion to Retain Magistrate Judge Seltzer Defendants' Motion to Retain Magistrate Judge Seltzer by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Reed, Aaron)
June 3, 2014 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 923 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (tpl)
June 3, 2014 Filing 922 Plaintiffs' Unopposed MOTION to File under Seal Motion to Strike Darden's Expert Report of Ali Saad, Ph.D. and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(tpl)
June 2, 2014 Filing 921 RESPONSE in Opposition re # 902 MOTION to Strike /Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky and Memorandum of Law filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Lichter, David)
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 920 ORDER granting # 917 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/30/2014. (yha)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 919 ORDER Granting in Part 892 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witnesses. Please see Order for details. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/28/2014. (ccy)
May 28, 2014 Filing 918 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2014 re 892 SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witness. Telephonic hearing not sealed. Order to follow. (Digital 10:08:13.) (dd)
May 27, 2014 Filing 916 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot # 246 Defendants' Motion to Drop Parties Under Rule 21, or in the Alternative to Either Defer Named Plaintiff's Depositions Until After Decertification, or Expand Deposition Limits to Include the Remaining Named Plaintiff. The Alternative Relief sought (deferring the depositions) was subsequently addressed by the Court in Paragraph G of the Discovery Plan and Order(DE 830). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/27/2014. (kas)
May 23, 2014 Filing 917 Unopposed Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filing for Erika R. Piccirillo. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 5239. (ksa)
May 22, 2014 Filing 915 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs for dates of August 15 - August 30, 2014 (Lichter, David)
May 22, 2014 Filing 914 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs for dates of August 15 - August 30, 2014 (Lichter, David)
May 21, 2014 Filing 913 PAPERLESS ORDER granting # 894 Defendant's Request for Hearing. The undersigned Magistrate Judge will conduct a telephonic hearing on 892 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and to Produce Witness on May 28, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for Defendants shall contact the undersigned chambers to arrange for the telephonic hearing. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/21/2014. (kas)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 912 GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 5/21/2014. (yha)
May 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 12/8/2014 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 12/5/2014 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2014., Discovery due by 8/13/2014., Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2014., In Limine Motions due by 11/21/2014., Dispositive Motions due by 9/12/2014., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/21/2014.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow for Discovery Matters Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 5/20/2014. (yha)
May 20, 2014 Filing 910 NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY by All Plaintiffs for dates of June 30-July 10, 2014 (Lichter, David)
May 20, 2014 Filing 909 CLERKS NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE pursuant to Administrative Order 2014-48. Case reassigned to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas for all further proceedings. Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum no longer assigned to case. (mb)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 908 ORDER granting # 903 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ronald J. Hedges is terminated from this matter. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 5/19/2014. (jsh)
May 19, 2014 Filing 907 RESPONSE in Support re # 891 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witness filed by All Plaintiffs. (Lichter, David)
May 16, 2014 Filing 906 STATUS REPORT /AMENDED JOINT STATUS REPORT by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc. (Reed, Aaron)
May 15, 2014 Filing 905 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Darden Restaurants, Inc. (DeBlasio, Patrick)
May 15, 2014 Filing 904 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct # 160 Amended Complaint,,,, by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/2/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
May 15, 2014 Filing 903 Plaintiff's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ronald J. Hedges. by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/2/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
May 14, 2014 Filing 902 MOTION to Strike /Defendants' Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky and Memorandum of Law by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. Responses due by 6/2/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Amy Ramsey, # 2 Exhibit 2-Deposition Transcript of Albert Madansky Ph.D, # 3 Exhibit 3-Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky, # 4 Exhibit 4-Excerpts of Declaration of Ali Saad, Ph.D)(Reed, Aaron)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 901 PAPERLESS ORDER granting # 900 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Motion to Strike Defendants' Expert Report. Plaintiffs may file their Motion to Strike on or before June 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 5/13/2014. (jsh)
May 13, 2014 Filing 900 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion to Strike Defendants Expert Report of Ali Saad, PH.D. by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 5/30/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
May 8, 2014 Set Deadlines per 899 Order. Status Report due by 5/15/2014. (asl)
May 8, 2014 Filing 899 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring that on or before May 13, 2014, counsel for the parties shall confer in person or by telephone and attempt in good faith to resolve all matters raised by 892 Plaintiff's SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witness. On or before May 15, 2014, the parties shall file a status report identifying the matters, if any, that remain for the Court's consideration and providing the Court with several potential dates for a hearing on the Motion. Defendant's time for filing a reply to Plaintiff's response to the Motion, if necessary, is extended until May 17, 2014. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 5/8/2014. (kas)
May 8, 2014 Filing 898 RESPONSE to Motion re # 891 MOTION to Seal Motion to Compel filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc.. Replies due by 5/19/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, 2 and 3)(Reed, Aaron)
May 1, 2014 Filing 897 NOTICE by Darden Restaurants, Inc. re # 896 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky Notice of Plaintiffs' Consent to Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky [D.E. 896] (Reed, Aaron)
April 30, 2014 Filing 896 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion to Strike Expert Report of Dr. Albert Madansky by Darden Restaurants, Inc.. Responses due by 5/19/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
April 30, 2014 Filing 895 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part # 894 Defendants' Motion for Leave to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witness. Defendants shall file their response on or before 4:00 p.m. on May 8, 2014, and if Plaintiffs wish to file a reply thereto, they shall do so on or before 4:00 p.m. on May 13, 2014; defering ruling on # 894 Defendants' Request for Hearing until such time as the Court has reviewed Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' Motion. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 4/30/2014. (kas)
April 29, 2014 Filing 894 MOTION for Leave to File TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY DEFENDANTS AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS, AND REQUEST FOR HEARING by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Reed, Aaron). Added MOTION for Hearing on 4/29/2014 (yha).
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 893 ORDER Granting # 891 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Temporarily File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witness. Please see Order for details. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 4/28/2014. (ccy)
April 25, 2014 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 892 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (mg)
April 25, 2014 Filing 891 Unopposed MOTION to Temporarily File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and to Produce Witness (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(mg)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 890 ORDER granting in part # 880 Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 6/12/2014. Expert Discovery due by 10/1/2014. Fact Discovery due by 9/22/2014. Mediation Deadline 10/14/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 10/9/2014. In Limine Motions due by 11/10/2014. Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/22/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2015 before Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/22/2014. (yha)
April 22, 2014 Filing 889 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 880 MOTION for Extension of Time to complete discovery related to decertification (Modify the Amended Scheduling Order) re # 817 Order on Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Marshall, J.)
April 17, 2014 Filing 888 RESPONSE to Motion re # 880 MOTION for Extension of Time to complete discovery related to decertification (Modify the Amended Scheduling Order) re # 817 Order on Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, filed by Darden Restaurants, Inc.. Replies due by 4/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Ramsey Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2- Crews Declaration)(Reed, Aaron) Modified Text on 4/18/2014 (ls).
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 887 ORDER granting # 886 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/17/2014. (jsh)
April 15, 2014 Filing 886 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jennifer Schilling, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 77434. (ksa)
April 11, 2014 Filing 885 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 884 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Nicole Dardano, Aimee James, Mitchell Jordan, Jillian McConnaughy and Nathalie Walsh. (Lichter, David)
April 11, 2014 Filing 884 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 883 ORDER granting # 882 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/11/2014. (jsh)
April 11, 2014 Reset Deadlines per 881 Order as to # 880 MOTION for Extension of Time to complete discovery related to decertification (Modify the Amended Scheduling Order) re # 817 Order on Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct. Responses due by 4/17/2014 (asl)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 881 PAPERLESS ORDER Expediting Response to # 880 Motion to Modify the Amended Scheduling Order. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Modify the Amended Scheduling Order on or before April 17, 2014. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/11/2014. (jsh)
April 10, 2014 Filing 880 MOTION for Extension of Time to complete discovery related to decertification (Modify the Amended Scheduling Order) re # 817 Order on Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,,, by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 4/28/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Lichter, David)
April 9, 2014 Filing 882 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Kevin Little, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 77055. (ksa)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 879 ORDER granting # 877 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/3/2014. (jsh)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 878 ORDER granting # 876 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/3/2014. (jsh)
April 3, 2014 Filing 875 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiff Michael Shuhart (DE 328 and DE 330) and Shawn Aceves (DE 334 and DE 335) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 874 ORDER overruling # 841 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 4/2/2014. (yha)
April 1, 2014 Filing 877 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Elizabeth Tempio Clement. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 76508. (ksa)
April 1, 2014 Filing 876 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Leigh Ann Bigley, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 76509. (ksa)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 873 ORDER granting # 870 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/27/2014. (jsh)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 872 ORDER granting # 869 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/27/2014. (jsh)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 871 ORDER granting # 868 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/27/2014. (jsh)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ORDER granting # 866 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/26/2014. (jsh)
March 25, 2014 Filing 870 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Addmission of Breanne M. Sheetz, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 76120. (ksa)
March 25, 2014 Filing 869 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Melissa L. McDonagh, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 76121. (ksa)
March 24, 2014 Filing 868 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Stephen B. Rotter, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 76060. (ksa)
March 21, 2014 Filing 866 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Holly E. Rich. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 75966. (ksa)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 865 ORDER granting # 864 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/20/2014. (jsh)
March 19, 2014 Filing 864 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Carlos Jimenez, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 75740. (ksa)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 863 ORDER granting # 862 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/19/2014. (jsh)
March 18, 2014 Filing 862 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Catherine S. Lindemann, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 75656. (ksa)
March 18, 2014 Filing 861 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Jessica Spoto (D.E. 748 and D.E. 749), Mike Sipich (D.E. 748 and D.E. 749), and Barbara Perry (D.E. 732 and D.E. 734) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lichter, David)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 860 ORDER granting # 859 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/18/2014. (jsh)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 858 ORDER granting # 857 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/18/2014. (jsh)
March 17, 2014 Filing 859 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Anne M. Mellen, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 75606. (ksa)
March 14, 2014 Filing 857 Defendants' Unopposed MOTION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of E. Ashley Sims, Esq. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 75534. (ksa)
March 13, 2014 Filing 856 RESPONSE/REPLY to # 830 Order Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Objections to the Discovery Plan and Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 855 ORDER granting # 854 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 3/5/2014. (jsh)
March 5, 2014 Filing 853 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Request for Withdrawal of Plaintiff Maureen McGlynn (DE 358 and DE 359) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
March 4, 2014 Filing 854 Unopposed Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notice of Electronic Filing for David Adelsberg. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 4890. (ksa)
March 3, 2014 Filing 852 RESPONSE/REPLY /DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO THE DISCOVERY PLAN AND ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE SELTZER by Darden Restaurants, Inc., GMRI, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Hearing Transcript 12/17/13, # 2 Exhibit 2-Hearing Transcript 10/28/13)(Reed, Aaron)
March 3, 2014 Filing 851 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 850 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Eric Solivan and Robert Sparks. (Marshall, J.)
March 3, 2014 Filing 850 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
February 27, 2014 Filing 849 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 848 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Crystal Bunggay and Josh Taylor Walters. (Marshall, J.)
February 27, 2014 Filing 848 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
February 25, 2014 Filing 847 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 846 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Carnarri Cofield and Emily Derra. (Marshall, J.)
February 25, 2014 Filing 846 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
February 20, 2014 Filing 845 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 844 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Christopher Babine, Kelsey Elrod, Eldon Fancher, III, Aaren Tinnen and Erik Woxland. (Marshall, J.)
February 20, 2014 Filing 844 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
February 19, 2014 Filing 843 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 842 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Madeleine Hale-Crane, Erin Reilly, Brittany Rondeau, Jamie Scarmack, Alisha Sellingham, Anthony Simmons and Eddie Williams. (Marshall, J.)
February 19, 2014 Filing 842 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
February 14, 2014 Filing 841 Plaintiff's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge # 830 Order to District Court (Lichter, David)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 840 PAPERLESS ORDER granting # 838 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Conor Crowley terminated from the case. Notice of Termination delivered by U.S. Mail to Conor Crowley. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 2/12/2014. (jsh)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 839 PAPERLESS ORDER granting # 837 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Wojtkowiak terminated from the case. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Matthew Wojtkowiak. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 2/12/2014. (jsh)
February 12, 2014 Filing 838 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Conor Crowley. by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/3/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Marshall, J.)
February 12, 2014 Filing 837 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matt Wojtkowiak. by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/3/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Marshall, J.)
February 10, 2014 Filing 836 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 835 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Melissa Curd and Amanda Sheron. (Marshall, J.)
February 10, 2014 Filing 835 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
February 10, 2014 Filing 834 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 833 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Beth Brugger, Barbara Bruker, Michael Capers, Jeremy Caplinger, Tracey Frazier, Brandy Greene, Christopher Grunfelder, Stacy Halverson, Daniel Harclerode, Daniel Hopcus, James Mcbride, Shannon Ontiveros, Joshua Rainey, Ventura Rangel, Diane Rossi, Mary Rothwell, Kirk Stewart, Shannon Sweeney, Willie Vaughn and Kiera Wagner. (Marshall, J.)
February 10, 2014 Filing 833 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 832 ORDER granting # 831 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 2/4/2014. (jsh)
February 4, 2014 Filing 831 Unopposed Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Shelly L. Friedland. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 4774. (ksa)
January 31, 2014 Filing 830 DISCOVERY PLAN AND ORDER. Please see Order for details. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 1/31/2014. (ccy)
January 27, 2014 Filing 829 NOTICE by Darden Restaurants, Inc. of Proposed Discovery Plans and Orders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Plaintiffs' Proposed Discovery Plan and Order, # 2 Exhibit 2: Defendants' Proposed Discovery Plan and Order, # 3 Exhibit 3: Transcript of December 17, 2013 Hearing)(Reed, Aaron)
January 22, 2014 Filing 828 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 827 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kenneth Barnett, Mary Bokenhagen, Michael Boyce, Clifford Boyd, Sandra Boykin, Lionel Brewer, Tanya Cagle, Emily Cain, Dian Clarke, Ladonna Coley, Susan Fields, Diana Fry, Kellie Hickenbottom, Zanita Holliman, Jonathan Jones, Wouseline Joseph, Michael Judd, Minden Luke, Douglas Magnusson, Latasha Mcclure, Brad Mccormack, Richelle Merrill, John Persons, Allison Rakay, Hamed Ranjbar, Alejandro Roldan, Joseph Russo-Tiesse, Jr., Dominique Schaffer, Barbara Steele, Autumn Strickland, Chris Teague and Michael Zach. (Lichter, David)
January 22, 2014 Filing 827 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
January 17, 2014 Filing 826 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiff Elena Stock (DE 560 and DE 561) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
January 15, 2014 Filing 825 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 824 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Victor Ayala, Keith Biancalana, John Bickelmann, Eric Blumhardt, Aspen Boyd, Chris Bucalo, Tabatha Casner, Bruce Chatenka, Gregory Cirillo, Jermaine Coleman, Steven Coleman, Jack Cooper, Mary Corona, Neil Cozart, Lisa Decola, Neva Eyres, Victoria Filshill, David Fischbach, Kari Gover, John Grace, Jeremy Grammer, Nicole Haas, Allison Hamilton, Dawnemarie Hansen-Rowe, Wayne Henderson, Charles Hewitt, Kendra Hilley, Quinten Hizey, Amanda Hoover, Christine Hueppchen, Eric Hulbert, Filomena Ilaria, Mitchell Jordan, Jillian Kallenbach, Timothy Kaufman, Phillip Matthew Kelley, Kathie Koester, Jean Kohn, Valerie Kouba, Stacey Kowalski, Dionne Lee, Kathleen Mack, Gina Mazzant, Katie Mechanick, Merrie Moore, Angie Morrow, Irene Munoz, Wayne Mutscheller, Israel Myers, Austyn Pace, Jaclyn Pari, Nathaniel Patton, Rachel Peown, Nick Perdomo, Richard Poole, Jarrett Pruitt, Stacy Rein, Daniel Rivera, Ernesto Rivera, Samantha Rodriguez, Jon Rohde, Meredith Rouse-Reilly, Ashleigh Sager, Kelly Sargeant, Robert Scarola, Brianna Shider, Kathryn Sigler, Heather Smith, Janiqua Smith, Eric Solivan, Robert Sparks, Kendrick Stennis, Deanna Supernor, Kelly Thompson, Katherine Torres, Sandra Tucker, Jennifer Tymula, Carla Waterston, Natalie Watkins, Lenell Watson, Erika Weisensel and Rasha Wyndsong. (Marshall, J.)
January 15, 2014 Filing 824 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 823 PAPERLESS ORDER granting # 822 Unopposed Motion to Allow Plaintiffs a Ten-Day Grace Period to Process and File Additional Consents Returned Within the Second Opt-In Period. The Plaintiffs shall file with the Court on or before March 3, 2013, any Consent Forms postmarked no later than February 20, 2014, and authorized by 778 The Court's Order Granting Additional Notice and Opt-In Period. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 1/14/2014. (jsh)
January 14, 2014 Filing 822 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Process and File Additional Consents Returned Within the Second Opt-In Period (Ten Day Grace Period) re 778 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/31/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Michael Dickstein. Mediation Hearing set for 6/25/2014 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 1/10/2014. (jsh)
January 10, 2014 Filing 820 NOTICE by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. re 816 Order, Joint Notice of Mediation Location and Amended Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
January 6, 2014 Filing 819 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Toni Graham (DE 699 & DE 700) and Trishia Kibling (DE 481 & DE 484) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 818 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot # 756 Request for Oral Argument, in light of entry of # 817 Order Overruling Plaintiffs' Objections to the Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer, and Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 1/6/2014. (jsh)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 817 ORDER overruling # 751 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court; and AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER granting in part and denying in part # 752 Motion to Amend/Correct ( Discovery due by 5/12/2014., Expert Discovery due by 9/1/2014., Fact Discovery due by 8/21/2014., Mediation Deadline 9/12/2014., Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2014., In Limine Motions due by 10/9/2014., Motions due by 5/27/2014., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/21/2014., Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 before Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum.). Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 1/3/2014. (yha)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 816 PAPERLESS ORDER directing the parties to notify the Court on or before January 10, 2014, of the location and address of the mediation conference that the parties propose in # 815 the Proposed Order Scheduling Meidation. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 1/3/2014. (jsh)
January 3, 2014 Filing 815 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re # 420 Scheduling Order,, Joint Notice of Filing Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
January 2, 2014 Filing 814 TRANSCRIPT of Joint Motion for In-Person Conference held on 12/17/2013 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer, 1-102 pages, Court Reporter: Jerald M. Meyers, 954-431-4757 / crjm@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/27/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Access Form)(amb)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 813 PAPERLESS ORDER granting # 812 Joint Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Expert Witness Summaries. Plaintiffs shall serve their expert witness summaries and reports on or before March 28, 2014. Defendants shall serve their expert witness summaries and reports on or before April 16, 2014. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 12/31/2013. (jsh)
December 27, 2013 Filing 812 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time In Which To Serve Expert Witness Summaries re # 420 Scheduling Order,, # 810 Response to Motion, # 752 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct # 420 Scheduling Order,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, Partially Unopposed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/13/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
December 24, 2013 Filing 811 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Stacie Nelson (D.E. 558 and D.E. 559), Nicole Blanchard (D.E. 693 and D.E. 694), and Ashley Blanchard (D.E. 272 and D.E. 273) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lichter, David)
December 20, 2013 Filing 810 RESPONSE to Motion re # 752 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct # 420 Scheduling Order,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, Partially Unopposed Defendants' Supplemental/Revised Response to Plaintiffs' Partially Unopposed Motion to Modify the Amended Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law [dkt. 752] filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. Replies due by 12/30/2013. (Reed, Aaron)
December 19, 2013 Filing 809 REPLY to Response to Motion re # 751 Plaintiff's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge # 717 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendan filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Marshall, J.)
December 19, 2013 Filing 808 RESPONSE in Support re # 752 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct # 420 Scheduling Order,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, Partially Unopposed filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 807 PAPERLESS ORDER granting # 806 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Page Limits. Plaintiffs may file a Reply in Support of their Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order that is up to 40 pages in length. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 12/19/2013. (jsh)
December 19, 2013 Filing 806 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Objections to the Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and for Related Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
December 17, 2013 Filing 805 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2013 re # 795 Joint MOTION FOR IN-PERSON CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SELTZER filed by All Plaintiffs. Counsel for the plaintiffs David H. Lichter and Peter S. Pearlman present in court. Counsel for the defendants John A. Ybarra and Michael J. Lehet present in court. Oral argument heard from both sides. Order to follow. (Digital 14:07:01Thru 15:46:19 Recalled 15:58:12 Thru 16:28:13.) (at)
December 17, 2013 Filing 804 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiffs Teliah Gienger (DE 538 & DE 539) and Abbigail Schneider (DE 598 & DE 599) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David)
December 17, 2013 Filing 803 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re # 799 Notice (Other) Notice of Filing Second Declaration of Stephen Schneider in Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Discovery Plan and Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
December 16, 2013 Filing 802 Statement of: In Support of Defendnats' Proposed Discovery Plan and Order by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc. re # 801 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit Exhibit B)(Reed, Aaron)
December 16, 2013 Filing 801 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
December 16, 2013 Filing 800 MEMORANDUM in Support re # 799 Notice (Other) of Plaintiffs' Proposed Discovery Plan and Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
December 16, 2013 Filing 799 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Declaration of Stephen Schneider in Support of Plaintiffs' Proposed Discovery Plan and Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Appendix A, # 3 Appendix B)(Lichter, David)
December 13, 2013 Filing 798 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 797 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Natalie Engle, Emily Falls, Lorraine Jones, Kristi Karkut, Lee Lukaszewski, Anthony Mosley, Jacqueline Muse, Stephanie Williams and Jose Zuniga. (Marshall, J.)
December 13, 2013 Filing 797 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
December 12, 2013 Set Hearing per # 796 Order. Discovery Hearing set for 12/17/2013 02:00 PM before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer. (asl)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 796 ORDER setting hearing on December 17, 2013, at 2:00 p.m. before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer. At the hearing, the Court will hear argument on the appropriate size of the opt-in discovery sample and the methodology to be employed for the sample's selection. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 12/12/2013. (kas)
December 11, 2013 Filing 795 Joint MOTION FOR IN-PERSON CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE SELTZER by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
December 9, 2013 Filing 794 RESPONSE to Motion re # 752 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct # 420 Scheduling Order,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, Partially Unopposed Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Partially Unopposed Motion to Modify the Amended Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law [D.E. 752] filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. Replies due by 12/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(Reed, Aaron)
December 9, 2013 Filing 793 RESPONSE to Motion re # 751 Plaintiff's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge # 717 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendan Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to the Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and for Related Relief filed by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. Replies due by 12/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Reed, Aaron)
December 6, 2013 Filing 792 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Kelly A. Davis (DE 564 & 565) and Alexandra Llanos (DE 554 & 555) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lichter, David)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 791 PAPERLESS ORDER granting # 790 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants may file a response to # 751 Plaintiffs' Objections to the Order of the Magistrate Judge that is up to 35 pages in length, not including the caption, document title, tables, signature pages, certificates, or exhibits. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 12/5/2013. (jsh)
December 5, 2013 Filing 790 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Defs' Unopposed Mt. to Exceed Page Limitation for Response to PLs' Objections to the Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer Denying PLs' Mt. to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and for Related Relief, and Incorporated Memornadum of Law by Darden Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
December 3, 2013 Filing 789 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 788 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Sheerice Alston, Miguel Bailey, Chris Barber, Kenzi Burnett, Brian Carney, Wilburn Chandler, Susan Durant, Stefanie Erschen, Allison Ferrara, Kymberly Gast, Amberly George, Michael Goodwin, William Granfield, Hayley Grohar, Kristal Gurgone, Gelinda Heller, Sheila Jeffcoat-Murray, Sharday Johnson, Ryan Leger, Sumer Leger, Elizabeth Martinez, Keisha Mcsween, Nicol Mellville, Christian Mendoza, Sauda Muhammad, Hannah Nicholas, Henry Oviedo, Lora Penn-Varga, Leonettza Powell, Anna Pulido, Catherine Reusser, Sara Senn, Christian Serafino, Kimberly Shapley, Sherman Sleuth, Erica Smith, Tiffany Webb and Abby Zehe. (Marshall, J.)
December 3, 2013 Filing 788 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 26, 2013 Filing 787 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re # 420 Scheduling Order,, Joint Notice of Filing of Agreement on Mediator (Lichter, David)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 786 PAPERLESS ORDER granting # 750 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Page Limits for Plaintiffs' Objections to the Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and for Related Relief. Plaintiffs' Objections may be up to 40 pages in length. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 11/25/2013. (jsh)
November 22, 2013 Filing 785 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 781 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Segand Alamdar, Kappotolia Anderson, Breana Baker, Staci Berry, Christina Bowley, Sheri Bradshaw, Judi Bragg, Melanie Cook, Chad D'aigle, William Dane, Kathryn Davies, Christopher Decker, Michael Delgado, Meave Deppeler, Cory Doucette, Karlyn Dozier, Manolo Espinoza, Sarah Falkner, Margie Flynn, Tiffany Garcia, Kimberly Gonzales, Rabije Hajdini, Cole Hancock, Christine Hayden, Michelle Holden, Kimberly Holt, Julie Humphrey, Erin Jessup, Rachel Johnson, Brittany Jordan, William Kloppe, Melinda Knerem, Kelley Lind, Uriel Lopez, Christina Maretich, Christine Martin, Sarah McKinstry, Carren Mccoy, Julia Mosley, Katie Myron, Deborah Oakes, Roshonda Poole, Kristen Poore, Erika Purdy, Maygin Rittinger, Sandra Salazar-Diaz, Leon Sam, Barbara Seltenreich, Dennis Shockley, Amanda Small, Hadassah Smuda, Emily Snyder, Rebecca Spencer, Latisha Spicer, Vicki Tryon, Diana Villegas, William Walker, Kimberly Wehrenberg, Percy White, Bryan Williams, Valarie Williams, Jennifer Worth, Terri Wright and Erin Zimmer. (Lichter, David)
November 22, 2013 Filing 784 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 783 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Nicole Apel, Kimberly Beckus, Tiffani Breeding, Muriel Butcher, Elizabeth Campbell, Rachel Carr, Sarah Carr, Rose Conforti, Shawn Cooper, Amanda DeMartino, Calli Fronk, Brittani Hooks-Royster, Michael Lewandowski, Brandee Lockhart, Marquis Lytch, Kasey Miller, Yanet Perez, Porsche Recknor, Porsche Recknor, Denae Reed, Christina Snyder, Laura Snyder, Kari Brice Strack, Jennifer Tobias, Brenda Williams and Anthony Wright. (Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 783 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 782 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 780 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Evan Belote, Danyl Broomfield, Sana Brown Jackson, Kele Cancilla, Barbara Chalkley, Kevin Choiniere, Shamequa Collins, Lawren Dampeer, Toni-Ann Darby, Ashdon Floyd, Ephrem Gebrekidan, Zack Goldrick, Hugo Gutierrez, Katherine Haley, Johannah Harman, Tionda Harrison-Hendrix, Kimberly Hirsch, Jennifer Holborn, Tiffany Johnson, Robyn Jones, Kolandria Joyner, Sam Kearney, Lascia Kelly, Cristian Lozano, Martin Mendoza, Lekendra Myles, Shayna Nesbit, Michael Ogden, Tanya Przybylski and Jose Vela. (Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 781 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
November 22, 2013 Filing 780 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 779 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 776 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Ahmad Al-Zear, Sogand Alamdar, Paul Amos, Mallorie Barshaw, Juanita Bell, Lisa Bell, Nicole Boleman-Ziemolozynski, Tandrine Bray, Erin Caplinger, Tich Chadyiwa, Brittany Cornell, Elizabeth Csiki, Michael Dale, Ashley Dunagin, Wesley Dyar, Jenny Ewalt, Philinese Fairley, Jacqueline Ferguson, Ilene Flores, Stephen Forbes, Kelly Fortel-Jaggie, Kevin Foster, Thomasene Goldman, Cristan Haynes, Cole Henry, Deborah Henry, Crystal Holton, Jacqueline Jolicoeur, Kristy Kohler, Jacob Korn, Miriam Krugliak, Maria Lane, Christy Laroche, Leslie Leonard, Angelique Levell, Sabrina Mccollum, Luz Melecio, Celia Crosby Moffett, Meghan Morris, Diego Ochoa, Somnuek Peterson, Holly Petta, Lananh Pham, Carlos Pizarro, Dale Poe, Kimberly Rickert, Rachael Riebe, Rashawn Robinson, Angelito Salazar, Ashley Schaffner-Mcnatt, Jacqueline Schmidt, Gina Seery, Gloria Sippel, Yvonne Smith, Michael Sudduth, Melissa Thompson, Sau Thong, Josie Turgean, Monica Vega, Lynda Victor, Mary Denise Weber, Thomas White, Tracie Williams and Tara Yuengert. (Lichter, David)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 778 PAPERLESS ORDER granting # 769 Joint Motion for Additional Notice and Opt-In Period. Plaintiffs may send Notice, in the form previously approved, to the 1,586 individuals inadvertently omitted from Defendant's list of putative class members. Plaintiffs shall file any Opt-In Consent Forms from these 1,586 individuals on or before February 20, 2014. This Order does not affect the filing deadline for consent forms from putative class members who were not among the 1,586 individuals inadvertently omitted from Defendant's list, nor does this Order affect any other deadline in the matter. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 11/22/2013. (jsh)
November 22, 2013 Filing 777 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 775 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Shannon Allen, Deark Bailey, Yassir Bennani, Andrea Bosley, Renee Case, Miguel Casillas, Drisel Clatterbuck, Jessica Cupp, Andrew Cypher, Cody Daigle, Shannon Debauch, Kevin Dignan, Kathryn Duffy, Cathy Eicher, Erin Emanuel, Chonsydne Fields, Ashley Gee, Amory Gerhard, Kwmane Gorins, Tanisha Hamlett, Tomiko Han-Suhara, Benisha Hill, Alicia Hoefler, Micholyn Holmes, Jasmine Houston, Kathleen Hurban, Elizabeth Keller, Christina Knouse, Carol Koester, Kimberly Lacey, Melissa Lauer, Aletha Laux, Courtney Lockley, Kent Mckee, Glenda Menefee, Tiffany Mezzanotti, Michael Milito, Emily Archer Miller, Chantell Mims-Penland, Brandi Owens, Staci Pearsall, Janet Phillips, Denise Prawl-Harrison, Bridget Prenatt, Bridget Ranney, Dana Reed, Jacqueline Rivera, Jazmin Rodriguez, Lolita Russell, Tricia Santiago, Bonnie Schrum, Maggie Schuler, Melissa Sewell, Kira Singh, Chrissy Spadaro, Gwendolyn Sterling, Cara Sweet, Terrie Trettenero, Jayna Trokey, Ethan Truitt, Chelsea Tutko, Jason Webb, Troyann Hobdy Wilkerson, Christine Wills, Zach Yanoff and Jacqueline Yoder. (Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 776 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
November 22, 2013 Filing 775 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 774 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 772 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Sonya Adams, Deborah Ajagbe, Michael Alford, Catherine Ammon, Andrew Annello, Delmarcus Boddie, Corey Bowling, Anna Boyd, Farren Brenner, Kari Curotto, Adrienne Darden, Jennifer Doan, Keisha Esteph, Jesus Garcia, Deavera Hicks, Elizabeth Hipol, Angela Hodge, Jeremy Marcus, Roberto Mendiola, Tierra Moore, Michael Morgan, Blake Moya, Jacob Newell, Aaron Ozment, James Peluso, Ryan Poore, Stephanie Puente, Katherine Ramirez, Dalia Roldan-Corral, Erika Ruiz, Jody Russell, Paul Schleicher, Karen Schrager, Gina Seery, Charles Sherman, Sonya Smith, Kelly Stancil, Toki Swan, Matthew Szaro, Dennisha Toliver, Zivorad Trbojevic, Karen Vansaghi, Michael Visconti and John Wolf. (Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 773 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 770 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kaleigh Anderson-Brown, Brittany Andres-Cabuno, Hector Aracena, Lisa Baker, Rachel Banks, Joni Baptiste, Rashad Boone, Sherrise Brandenburg, Causaundra Brooks, Katie Bykowski, Christopher Camino, Aimee Campbell, Juan Chambers, Wilburn Chandler, Jolee Chioe, Brenda Davis, Robin Demore, Nicholas Donchess, Shannon Douglas, Danielle Dowling, Christy Dufrene, Amy Euler, Erica Fairfield, Jessica Fine, Kristen Foor, Cheryl Fry-Banales, Brett Geoffrey, Leobardo Gonzalez, Sasha Green, Virginia Herbert, Alessandro Hernandez, Magdalena Hernandez-Rangel, Angela Hick, Emily Holbrook, Randa Hunt, James Hurtt, Thomas Irwin, Jennifer Justice, Sreikompearck Keat, Gary Kitchen, Ryan Leger, Sumer Leger, Kathryn Lindsey, Jaimie Long, Ashley Lour, Jaime Magana, Amanda Mason, Karen Mayer, Luiz Nunes, Rachel Oquinn, Chelsea Perkins, Amanda Pleshakov, Genesis Ramos, Rita Reasy, Tavaris Rowry, Liliana Salinas, Jennifer Scott, Stephen Short, Betty Springer, Sara Stein, Elvin Stewart, Roman Trejo, Cathy West and Dominique Williams. (Lichter, David)
November 22, 2013 Filing 772 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 771 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 768 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Christian Aldana, Lorena Ambriz, Ashley Archuleta, Deanna Arnold Amos, Jamica Banks, Brittany Barnett, Denise Bellardi, Paula Brown, Jodie Cardenas, Ruby Carter, Pamela Coleman, Danilo Dacanay, Patrick Debose, Marcanthony Dejesus, Cynthia Delatorre, Rachel Diaz, Samantha Duffy, Diane Ferraro, Karen Foote, Stacey Frisco, Pepa Gocheva, Elizabeth Gonzalez, Jaz Gray, Kee'shaun Haymon, Janice Helm, Deanna Hernandez, Hakimah Jabbar, Roger Jacobsen, Kevin Jaklich, Ashley Johnson, Michael Karabinus, Linda Khamsone, Laurie Kubelka, Raquel Ledford, Todd Lewis, Christy Long, Karen Lorgus, Juan Carlos Losoya, Swanzetta Mazetta Andrews, Katrina Mccartney, Roberto Mendoza, Katie Miller, Charter Moore, Jason Neal, Deborah Owen, Latisha Revell, Chelsey Rittgers-Rake, Trecha Robinson, Gissel Rodriguez, Alexander Rogers, Joshua Sachs, Justine Schember, Dionne Simpson, Michelle Solomon, Andrew Sparks, Marcia Spayer, Sawanda Stephenson, Joel Studer, Maricarmen Torres, Joseph Tucker, Diane Vera, Neshaun Walker, Brittney Westbrook and Earthalene Williams. (Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 770 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
November 22, 2013 Filing 769 Joint MOTION Additional Notice and Opt-In Period re # 211 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Order on Motion for Clarification,, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,, Order on Sealed Motion, # 228 Order by Darden Restaurants, Inc., Darden SW LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Reed, Aaron)
November 22, 2013 Filing 768 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 767 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 766 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kenneth Barnett, Clifford Boyd, Sandra Boykin, Kenzi Burnett, Christian Domingue-Harris, Lisa Fabiano, Kamberly George, Andre Griffin, Kellie Hickenbottom, Aimee James, Sharday Johnson, Michael Karabinus, Anna Manning, Kristin Mikula, Jessie Odonnell, Catherine Reusser and Bobbie Walker. (Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 766 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 765 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 764 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Ashley Barnes, Andrew Jackson, Jared Jezierski, Katie Jezierski, Carl Johns, Joshua Johnson, Aaron Joray, Ryan Karson, Samantha Kelly, Sarai Killby, Brianne Kingsbury, Chris Kopp, Veronica Kopronica, Kim Macko, Monica Malone, Christina Marzullo-Gonzalez, Courtney Massey, Monica Massey, Elisa Mccabe, Shawndra Mccracken, William Mcduffy, Jennifer Mcneely, Richard Mettke, Dwala Mosley, Correy Murchison, Jennifer Murray, Katherine Myers, Moises Nava, Jamaal Neal, Katherine Negley, Alisa Payton, Jill Petrosky, Martin Pineda, Sandra Pizano, Christina Pointinger, Bianca Ray, Chelsea Reedy, Victoria Ridella, Kelly Rodkey, Shane Rodkey, Alejandro Roldan, Teresa Rose, Margaret Roth, Kelly Rowe, Nicole Russo, Roxanne Sanders, Sandra Linger Santos, Matthew Seaman, Sarah Sendy, Katie Shepherd, Colin Simon, Juliana Solano, Donna Spagnolo, Matt Spanne, Jenna Springer, Bryan Taylor, Jazmine Tero, Julie Thomas, Heather Trevaskis, Kevin Udenberg, Desiree Ufford, Andrei Vass, Linnea Walstead, Kimberly Weaver, Kristy Wenner, Justin Wetzel, Mckenzee Wilkins, Ashley Williams, Sean Winkelmann, Tonia Yates and Dennis Yazdanpanah. (Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 764 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 763 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 762 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): La Erika Albritton, Jennifer Alicea, Jennifer Anderson, Jordan Anderson, Christian Banquera, Catherine Barnes, Rudy Bartolome, Marweda Belcher, Kristin Billich, Brittany Boat, Makita Bond, Erika Boozer, Patricia Boutell, Robin Brown, Jamie Calhoun, Cathy Caprio, Adrian Carroll, Shahnaz Chaudhry, Sean Clark, Monica Clay, Amanda Coates, Susan Cochran, Katherine Conlon, Alexandra Crook, Kevin Crook, Aislinn Currie Clapp, Christopher Darosa, Dante Davis, Lourdes De Leon, Maya De Leon, Brian Deskus, Justin Dickerson, Linda Diehl, Nicholas Dimodugno, Anthony Doerrer, Sarah Dolphin, Jones Douglas II, Michelle Dunlap, John Durnin, Larry Ellis II, Linda Farris, Susan Fields, Michael Flores, Glenda Garcia, Nathaniel Gerald, Siea Glover, Shakia Gross, Melissa Hall, Sandra Hangsleben, Linda Harding, Jamie Hayes, Alison Heidler, Komteria Herndon, Judy Hines, Barbara Hood, Letitia Jackson, Veronica James, Jeffrey Knapp, Katie Oslica Holt, Tekeyla Pennington, Rachel Stevens, Shauna Tinker, Krystal Williams, Rebecca Wilson, Vanessa Windsor, Courtney Wolf, Rose Wolfson, Cara York, Michael Zack, Christina Zarate, Jose Zarate, Jerry Zeigler and Mario A Zuniga. (Marshall, J.)
November 22, 2013 Filing 762 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 21, 2013 Filing 761 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 760 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Briana Marie Serio, Frank Mulvena IV, Jennifer Murray, Misty Norman, Debra Nunez, Devin Ortega, Ondie Otto, Leila Parisi, Corinne Patti, Aimee Pellitteri, Anjanette Perez, Mark Pezzuto, Nicole Phillips, Mike Pierson, Maria Policastro, Leslie Poole, Troy Reed, Phillip Regas, Amanda Rex, Stephanie Ricardi, Meghan Richardson, Brittany Roberts, Harvey Robertson, Barby Rodriguez, Syndol Rodriguez, Corina Rosales, Gary Roznowski Jr, Jennika Russell, Daniel Schepers Jr, Katelyn Scherer, Joe Schuelke, Lori Schuna, Destine Scott, Latanya Session-Lovett, Michael Shaw, Wilson Sheffield, Shannon Shelley, Shauna Shepard, Sonya Shirley, Deanna Shissias, Carmeleda Simmons, Nolanda Smiley, Robert J Smith, Sheila Spangler, Mary Spicer, Barbara Steele, Tim Stillman, Isaias Suarez, Julie Thomas, Ruth Thompson, Archie Thompson III, Elisa Vance, Tyler Veit, Jessica Velasquez, Miguel Vera, Yelena Walden, Matthew Wallace, Nathalie Walsh, Amy Jo Warsham, Ryan Wells, Leslie Wilkins, Tommy Wilkins, Marla Williams and Phoenicia Williams. (Marshall, J.)
November 21, 2013 Filing 760 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 21, 2013 Filing 759 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 758 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kelly Foster, Fernanda Franco, Shavon Fulton, Jennifer Ganz, Kaitlyn Gephart, Susan Giermann, John F Ginthner III, Oscar Gonzalez, Sara Gonzalez, Marshe Goodman, Angela Gordon, Angela Grguric, Samantha Guerrero, Chris Gundlach, Emily Gustafson, Danielle Gyles, Carolyn Haithcock, Matthew Hartwiger, Tahri Hatcher, Richard Hawkins, Andrea Hemminger, Joni Hice, Sumer Hill, Rachel Hoffpauir, Tracy Hubieres, Diane Hunt, Andrew Hunter, Elizabeth Immerman, Ashley Johnson, Eric Johnson, Nancy Johnson, Jillisa Jones, Kateri Jones, Wouseline Joseph, Brittany Kale, Shawn Kamp, Kelsey Keagle, Michael Kimble, Michael Klein, Sara Knieriem, Tiffany Knight-Bowers, Tara Kusky, Maureen Leonard, Andres Lesmes Reyes, Jessica Lewis, Annmarie Limon, Shelli Liverpool, Lemuel Luckett, Douglas Magnusson, Ronda Mahone, Cheryl Mahugh, Katie Malachinski, Bethany Marcum, Queen Martin, Latasha Mcclure, Brad Mccormack, John Mcdonald, Meeka Mcgee, Angela Melton, Rosetta Miller-Dobson, Tsvetomir Mitev, Cara Mizansky, Tiffany Monday, Daniel Moore and Jonathan Morrison. (Marshall, J.)
November 21, 2013 Filing 758 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 21, 2013 Filing 757 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 755 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kimberly Aguirre, Terrecco Arline II, Debra Atfield, Stephanie Austin, Amanda Avitable, Ashley Barnes, Janice Bennett, Kayla Benson, Gregory Bethea, Kerry Birner, Jennifer Blake, Keith Blanc, Phil Bochman, Sharon Bochman, Aliya Bond, Donald Bowers, Mike Boyce, Jaime Boyer, Brittany Boykin, Thomas Brady, Toots Brewer, Jasmyn Brinklin, Bianca Brown, Marion Bruno, Ian Buckman, Kristin Buhlert, Ricardo Burgos, Chelsey Cagle, Courtney Caisse, Efrain Cardona, Brittany Champ, Nicole Chipps, Jehremi Clavareza, Ethan Cline, Constance Collins, Erin Cooper, Taranita Costales, Leandrea Craig, Julie Crawford, Heidi Critchfield-Shelgrove, Eric Cuevas, Zachary Cunningham, Bruce Custer II, Monika Denner, Victoria Dettman, Annie Devlin, Matthew Duke, Roberto Duran, Heather Dutton, Mfon Edohoukhwa, Deanna Ellison, Joseph Ennis, Ekarette Etuk, April Fellinger, Luke Felsentreger, Joseph Fenton, Jessica Fitzgerald, Joseph Swickard, Lauren Thompson, Chanel Thorpe, Gustavo Urquieta, Russell Vanderlois, Ricky Vong, Mary Wardell and Danielle Wunstell. (Marshall, J.)
November 21, 2013 Filing 756 Plaintiff's MOTION for Hearing re # 751 Plaintiff's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge # 717 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendan, # 752 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct # 420 Scheduling Order,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, Partially Unopposed by All Plaintiffs. (Lichter, David)
November 21, 2013 Filing 755 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 21, 2013 Filing 754 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 753 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Joseph Amaradio, David Aveline, Christina Balke, Diane Beckley, Jason Berdik, Robin Bergens, Kerri Borstelmann, Heather Bourgoin, Mackenzie Bradley, Annmarie Cairns, Erica Canfield, Elaine Carr, James Chiaro, Erica Collins-Zamora, Lisa Coomer, Angela Crawford, Darin Creed, Alyse Deluca, Crystal Duarte-Allen, Ashleigh Dydo, Temia Eaton, Lori Eshelman, Justine Esquivel, Desiree Fitch, Jamie Fosdick, Breaunna Friels, Diana Fry, Amber Gardner, Ashley Guerra, Rebekah Gwynn, Margaret Harris, Kristina Heredia, Jesse Hernandez, Morgan Hilts, Laura Hinton, Nicole Jarvis, Britani Jaye, Carrie Johnson, Dustin Johnson, Paisley Johnson, Elizabeth Kirstein, David Kneeream, Jason Lacy, Shannon Lopez-Rosas, Trevor Manes, Eric Manuel, Arthur Melendez, Heather Meriedeth, Richelle Merrill, Shirley Morgan-Jordan, Robert Morton, Hanna Murrell, Jessica Neumann, Jennifer Paradise, Hector Prado, Francis Puglisi, Kelsey Quinnell, Holli Ragan, Julia Rascon, Becky Sawyers, Ken Schoendorf, Dyanne Schroeder, Sharen Simmons, Juliana Stevenson and Kevin Stone. (Marshall, J.)
November 21, 2013 Filing 753 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 21, 2013 Filing 752 Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend/Correct # 420 Scheduling Order,, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, Partially Unopposed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/9/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Lichter, David)
November 21, 2013 Filing 751 Plaintiff's OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge # 717 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, to District Court Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and for Related Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit AA, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit BB, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit CC, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit DD, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit EE, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit FF, # 13 Exhibit G, # 14 Exhibit GG, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit HH, # 17 Exhibit I, # 18 Exhibit II, # 19 Exhibit J, # 20 Exhibit JJ, # 21 Exhibit K, # 22 Exhibit KK, # 23 Exhibit L, # 24 Exhibit M, # 25 Exhibit N, # 26 Exhibit O, # 27 Exhibit P, # 28 Exhibit Q, # 29 Exhibit R, # 30 Exhibit S, # 31 Exhibit T, # 32 Exhibit U, # 33 Exhibit V, # 34 Exhibit W, # 35 Exhibit X, # 36 Exhibit Y, # 37 Exhibit Z)(Marshall, J.)
November 21, 2013 Filing 750 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Objections to the Order of Magistrate Judge Seltzer Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and For Related Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order for Page Limit Motion Objections - Appeal)(Lichter, David)
November 20, 2013 Filing 749 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 748 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Maria Garcia, Nicholas Hefling, Anthony Imburgia, Jesse Kadoun, Linda Marie Laurenzi-Lorenz, Jim Lewis, Kristin Lukasiak, Rachel Martin, Jennifer Martinez, Ryan McKenzie, Marshall Murdock, Iowa Pietrakiejew, Scott Powell, Michelle Quirk, Plezena Radford, Daniela Rocha, John P. Rosegay, Maria Ruiz, Christopher Sagan, Alicia Sage, Linda Ann Sanchez, Sara Sanchez, Choneteria Sanders, Ghazala Sanders, Cathy Sarosinski, Nina Sawhney, Brantley Sazera, Candace Schuetz, Diana Shields, Caitlyn Shoppell, Mike Sipich, Donnette Slattery, Ashlee Smith, Ryan Snodgrass, Toshia Snyder, Jessica Spoto, Jessica Statham, Renee Stephens, Samuel Stubbins, Diana Suarez, Collin Svereika, Brett Swinford, Jared Sykes, Randy Tarpley, Lucas Tate, Vanessa Tate, Antonio Tedeschi, Lynn Tedeschi-Burdack, Toni Therrell, Matthew Thomas, Donna Thompson, Keiko Tsuruda, Rafael Velarde, Reginald Walden, Roderick Walker, Sarah Wassil, Austin Welsch, Whitney White, Daniel Wilkens Jr, Donna Williamson, Bryan Wills, Walter Wilson and Shahnaz Zubair Ali. (Marshall, J.)
November 20, 2013 Filing 748 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 20, 2013 Filing 747 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 746 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rachael Heaton, Chance Hendershot, Ian Higginson, Brittany Higson, Holly Hill, Pearlette Hodge, Alisa Hogan, Isis Holloway, Kyle Hughes, Angela Hunter, Kimberly Insana, David Israel, Kendra Jackson, Nichole Jackson-White, Christine Jean-Baptiste, Susan Jensen, Carrie Johnson, Sarafino Jones, Michael Judd, Brian Kaplan, Cassandra Koster, Anthony Laino, Luke Livigni, Elizabeth Lorentz, Nicholas Luechtefeld, Brenda Lynch, Marianne Lynch-Henne, Shelah Mahan, Jacqueline Martin, Susan Martin-Anderson, Deana Martinez, Jamie Matera-Klettke, Gina Mattioli, Shawn Mcardle, Joshua Mcdade, Kevin Mcquitty, Samantha Meaux, Ashley Miller, Laneisha Miller, Ashley Mills, Laura Muro, Craig Noll, Jenna Oconnell, Theresa Ogrady, Sharon Orszulak, Taylor Owens, Marilynn Paine, Karen Palmer, Przemyslaw Panfil, Joseph Perry, James Plaster, Patricia Porter, Deanna Postlewaite Vaughn, Kayla Proffer, Charmaine Purnell, Kelly Regulski, Aiden Reidy, Sharon Richards, Jason Rinard, Nicole Ritza, Christopher Robertson, Alex Rodriguez, Carissa Rodriguez, Camille Rogers and Malina Rome. (Marshall, J.)
November 20, 2013 Filing 746 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 20, 2013 Filing 745 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 744 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jennifer Adams, Afsar Ahmed, Kelly Amundson, Jenna Antilla, Kimberli Applewhaite, Benjamin Baecher, Cheryl Bailey, Mary Bakhsheshe, Diana Baney, Gay Barbiaux, Sylvia Batten, Patricia Bazemore, Kacie Beagen, Ashley Bellerive, Christopher Bellin, Anthony Berkitt, Steven Bigger, Kaitlyn Black, Patricia Bojorquez, Germaine Brown, Michael Brown, Robert Burger, Ciera Burton, Monique Cadeau, Samuel Chatam Jr, Daniel Clausnitzer, Christopher Conn, Aeriel Conner, Amelia Cook, Jessica Coskrey, Shawne Cyphert, Jolynn Darling, Robert Davis, Geraldine Dawson, Jd Defranco, Nichole Dickstein, Neka Doe, Austin Dunston, Nancy Equitz, Candice Ezell, Patricia Fiedler, Kristy Firn, Teresa Flippen-Fultz, Alicia Foltz, Rieko Fratus-Rosenthal, Brenda Freeman, Edward Freid, Jessica Frick, Jacquelynn Friend, Karen Fuller, Temesgen Gebrekidan, Amanda Gerlach, Matt Gianini, Juan Gomez, Stephen Graf, Digna Grant, Demarcus Graves, Desiree Gray, Sarah Gress, Laurie Haas, Nicole Hall, Beth Hamilton, Joshua Hamilton, Jaslyn Hanson and Scott Hayashi. (Marshall, J.)
November 20, 2013 Filing 744 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 743 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 738 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Victor Romero Ortega, Carla Reid, Jeanette Renteria, Taneka Reynolds, James Rice, Lauren Richards-Turner, Tashiba Ricketts, Dennis Rico, Brandis Riggins, Kayla Riley, Lindsey Riley, Michelle Riley, Cliff Rivers, Rosalie Rivers, Brian Roakes, Nadrika Robertson, Debbie Robinson, Brandon Roccomckeel, Jillian Rodgers, Pierre Rodriguez, Marcy Rogers, Tabatha Ross, Jeanne-Marie Roush-Mayo, Ione Rousseau, Miranda Rovou, Mark Rush, Veronica Rushton, Clayton Russell, Duwan Russell, Susan Russo, Shelby Sacco, Brandon Salm, Michael Salter, George San Nicolas III, Ross Sandlas, Brittaney Santillo, Siobhan Sattora, Scott Schlusler, Julie Schroeder, Chanel Secreto, Emily Seeley, Elena Segura, Barbara Seltenreich, Alyssa Serrano, Richard Settles, Kimberly Shapley, Jonathon Sharg, Barbara Shaw, Matthew Sheehan, Joshua Shenigo, Dean Sheperd, Alisha Shepherd, Alisha Shepherd, Dean Shepherd, Winston Shepherd, Russell Siary, Russell Siary, Martima Sims, Martima Sims, Tramine Sims, Tramine Sims, Michelle Singer, Michelle Singer, Victoria Skarbinski, Victoria Skarbinski, Brent Smith, Brent Smith, Callista Smith, Callista Smith, Deaunte Smith, Deaunte Smith and jorge rivera. (Lichter, David)
November 19, 2013 Filing 742 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 741 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Nicole Snedden, Melanie Snyder, Aaron Solis, Perla Soriano, Melissa Soto, William Sowers, Grant Sparkes, Brooke Spotti, Justin Staker, Laura Stam, Michael Stamm, Steve Stampoulos, Michael Starace, Judy Starkey, Stephanie Stathis, Brittany Staub, Nick Stires, Jordan Strah, Jennifer Stupak, Stephanie Suggs, Michelle Sutton, Mandy Swagler, Lonnie Swift, Rodrigo Tasca, Megan Tate, Monica Tejeiro, Erika Testa, Jennifer Thibodeau, Jennifer Thomas, Ryan Thomas, Julie Thompson, Kadeidra Thompson, Lawrence Thompson, Melissa Thompson, Tracy Thornton, Michelle Tontlewicz, Tobey Torres, Christopher Tottser, Donielle Tourville-Lemm, Carrie Trefethen, Cindy Trotman, Wendy Truesdell, Jennifer Trujillo, Asa Ture, Jaimie Turner, Jennifer Turner, Melanie Turner, Drew Tyler, Justin Tyler, Tiffany Tyler, Shaka Tzul, Jose Valle, Ashley Van Leuven, Taylor Vaughan, Angela Vaughn, Jason Vaughn, Dahilil Vazquez, Adrian Vela, Ivon Vitela, Amanda Vokolek, Ken Vroman, Donna Walcott, Ryan Walker, Ashley Wall and Maranda Waller. (Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 741 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 740 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 739 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Lawrence Abeyta, Veronica Andrews, Heather Anthony, Kristy Antoine, Joseph Appello, Jose Areguin, Cheryl Austin, Shelby Bakersmall, Angela Beavers, Jennifer Becerril-Albino, Catherine Bernal, Joseph Biddle, Cher Bland, Reegan Blunt, Rudy Boston, Megan Bottoms, Christina Bowley, Austin Bradford, Anita Bradley, Matthew Brooks, Barbara Brown, Kateri Buccigrossi, Jason Burghorn, Matthew Campbell, Joanna Camper, Angela Cannon, Tracy Carpenter, Keisha Carter, Donny Carter Jr, Leton Cheatham, Michael Delgado, Jared Fidler, Bryan Hudson, Timothy Roy and Reginald Walden. (Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 739 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 738 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
November 19, 2013 Filing 737 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 735 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Christine Martin, Sarah Walters, Kate Wanke, Nicole Warren, Jennifer Watters, Amanda Weaver, Jessica Webster, Barry Welch, Carol Wells, Austin Welsch, Anthony Welsh, Kristianna Werner, Kevin West, Tara Whitaker, Adam White, Percy White, Amy Whitehouse, Ashli Whitley, Crystal Whitt, Brian Wilcken, Lyndsey Wilde, Delona Wiley III, Haley Willard, Amber Williams, Ginette Williams, Lynnette Williams, Sakaiya Williams, Toni Williams, Felecia Winchester, Lazarus Windham, Latora Wise, Crystal Wolfe, Daniel Wolfe, Gabby Wolosik, Tashayla Woodson, Holly Woolsey, Megan Wortman, Lisa Wynn, Joseph Wynne, Ashley Yachimski-Hnatyshak, Nathan Yardley, Lorrie Young, Nakita Young, Emily Yount, Jana Younts-Hinton, Natalie Yoviene, David Zallis, Tiffany Zaragoza, Ruth Zayas, Lawrence Zock, Derek Zumbrunnen and Jose Zuniga. (Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 736 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 733 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Emily Johnson, Jessica Johnson, Sheena Johnson, Ashley N. Jones, Ebonie Jones, Jonathan Jones, Kimberly Jones, Lorraine Jones, Maya Jones, Timothy Jones, Robert Jordan, Jr, Kristi Karkut, Joshua Karmecy, Veronica Kasper, Jordan Kaufman, Rachel Kelly, Hannah Kemmerer-Master, John Kerr, Dennis Kief, Michael Kilian, Bonnie Kilmer, Jessica Kite, Andrea Knight, Viviane Kobty, Elaine Koch, Melissa Koepke, Natalia Krajas, Aaron Krall, Gabrielle Krause, Kathleen Krewenka, Jamie Kuhn, Sohail Lakhani, Araceli Landeros, Orus Lane, Steven Lang, Steven Lang, Joann Lange, Cheryl Leclair, Cassandra Ledvina, Matthew Lemen, Luana Lemus, Robert Levesque, Tresa Lewis, Brianne Lilienthal, Shauna Linder-Noll, Orlan Lingad, Ebshonae Littleton, Josette Long, Lorell Lopez, Iris Love, Justin Love, Lindsay Lowe, Marja Lowery, Vicki Lowery, Jabari Luckett, Lacey Luker and Jessica Lutz. (Lichter, David)
November 19, 2013 Filing 735 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 734 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 732 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Phillip Mulder, Gilbert Muro, Jessica Murray, Jacqueline Muse, Lindsey Muse, Rebecca Nedeau, Heather Nelson, Tara Nelson, Brigette Newby, Cleophas Newton, Diana Nichols, Ryan Nicolai, Jonathan Noa, Rachael Noa, Lauren Nunn, Timothy Nydegger, Ann Obryan, Kandace Odom, Austin Olsen, Janina Oneil-Wilson, Lisa Ordaz, Edith Oregon, Tristan Ortiz, Morayo Ositelu, Emily Otero, Judy Overstreet, Juliana Pace, Ryan Pacheco, Marilane Palacios, Christoper Parks, Jessica Parnello, Jessica Parrish, Kristi Patterson, Wyatt Pawlik, Marta Pedrabissi, Alice Pel, Lora Penn-Varga, Kristen Pennington, Brooke Perdue, Selena Pereda, Juan Perez Jr, Barbara Perry, Sarah Pettiford, Ryan Phillips, Brennen Pickett, Rhonda Pigg, Lakieu Pinnick, John Plummer, Andrea Pollack, Margaret Porter, Naomi Porter, Samuel Porter, Leonettza Powell, Steve Pruett, Rachon Pulliam, Mac Quartarone, Courtney Rachal, Mary Raffauf, Allison Rakay, Khadejah Rawlings, Herman Ray, Mirda Raymond, Jessica Reep and Darian Reese. (Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 733 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
November 19, 2013 Filing 732 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 731 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 728 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Meredith Hausele, Chrissy Hawkins, Yolanda Hayden, Jennifer Hayes, Nicole Hayes, Harmony Hedger, Christina Helfer, Donna Hellmann, Brandon Herbert, Emiliano Hernandez, Lee Hicks, Tonya Hicks, John Hicks, III, Samuel Higdon, Denisha Hill, Heather Hill, Michelle A. Hill, Celeste Hilliker, Emily Hinson, Dawn Hitt, Sara Hoch, Amanda Hodges, Brittnie Hollis, Lori Hong, Ebony Horn, Richard Horn, Andrew Hornibrook, Amanda Horrocks, Neathasha Houghton, Richard House, Charles Howard, Ruba Hsen, Cheryl Hudson, Charlotte Huelsman, Hector Huerta, Michael Hull, Keishandria Humphreys-Diakite, Denise Hupp, Jessica Hupp, Sara Hypes, Linda Ignatius, Brandon Ikan, Erik Ingle, Jazzmine Ingram, Tiffany Inman-Brummett, Rocky Jablonowski, Corrina Jackson, Gene Jackson, Janet Jackson, Marion Jager, Katrina James, Kevin James, Jammie Janis, Danielle Jemison, Brittney Jenkins, Laura Jenkins, Elizabeth Jerome, Andrew Johnson, Candace Johnson and Janet Johnson. (Lichter, David)
November 19, 2013 Filing 730 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 729 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Robin Lyle, Bobby Lynch, Karen Macionski, Kim Madia, Kaitan Mahbubani, Dorothy Maher, Kathleen Maher, Ann Major, Jessica Malkin, Joanne Mangiamele, Charlene Marlow, David Marquez, Jami Marshall, Terry Martin, Juan Martin Del Campo, Carlos Martinez, Jonathan Martinez, Julie Martinez, Raylene Martinez, Pam Maslana, Brian Maxwell, Guendolyn May, Sean May, Serena Mcdermott, Celina Mchenry, Natalie Mckibben, Juliette Mckie, Cynthia Mcnelis, Keisha Mcsween, Daniel Mcvay, Luke Melillo, Lacey Melton, Victoria Mendoza, Daniel Meneses, Samuel Mentzer, Josh Mickley, Lula Middleton, Maria Mier, Joseph Mikuszewski, Alyse Milanowski-Howell, Caroline Millen, Aaron Miller, Jenna Miller, Steven Miller, Nathaniel Mills, Brian Mirth, Michelle Misinay, Goldie Mobley, Kalico Moffet, Christina Mongold, Mara Montague, Crystal Montanez, Nicolas Montemayor, Starlyn Montoya, Samantha Montuoro, Richard Moore, Keesha Moorer, Nancy Morales, Rebecca Morelos, Eduviges Moreno, Anna Morrice, Penny Moss, Lisa Mott and Jodi Mueller. (Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 729 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 728 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
November 19, 2013 Filing 727 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 725 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Amanda Fry-Smith, Sonia Fuentes, Teresa Furlow, Johnnie Gabel, Andre Gage, Beatrice Galindo, Stephen Gannon, Dayshima Gantt, David Garcia, David Garcia, Ines Garcia, Joseph Garcia, Karla Garcia, Noe Garcia, Alejandro Garibay, Geralyn Garner, Christina Garrett, Janelle Gauss, Albert Gayotin, Jason Giamanco, Melissa Gillmore, Jason Gilman, Claire Gilmore, Bennie Gipson, Teresa Gipson, Jon Gist, Deborah Glosser, Frederick Goeppinger, Angel Golden, Carlos Gomez, Joseph Gonzalez, Christopher Gordon, Jason Gordon, Mary Ruth Gose, Jennifer Gowen, Kerri Grafton, Angela Grant, Shannon Graves, Brittany Green, Cynthia Green, Dana Greenwood, Paul Griego, David Griswold, Miguel Guevara, Jonnie Gummo, Tahirah Gurley, Juan Guzman, Candice Hagan, Czarina Hagedorn, Kelley Haigh, Wendy Hall, Christine Halloran, Kyron Hamblet, Ivy Hamilton, Ada Hamilton-Taylor, Madison Hanson, Kelly Hardy, Rose Hardy, Susee Harkins, Emma-Leigh Harrington, William Harris, Cassie Harris-Mohr and Gary Harrison. (Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 726 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 723 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Patrick Carroll, William Carson, Cynthia Carter, Lori Carter, Viviana Casalles, Adam Casas, Angelica Casas, Nancy Castano, Brandon Castillo, Pattie Cervantes, Eric Chacon, Kayla Chambers, Johnny Chan, Samantha Chan, Melody Chapman, Tarah Chapman, Paul Chartier, Carolyn Chavez, Leton Cheatham, Jeremy Chesser, Benjamin Childs, Vickie Chlystun, Marie Cilius, Lorrie Clark, Aidan Clemente, Anastasha Coachman, Marisol Cole, Blake Collier, Chris Comrie, Adia Conliffe, Derek Connolly, John Connor, Sharon Connor, Kimberly Cooper, Carly Cope, Daisy Correa, Megan Coscia, Michaela Courson, Vireen Couser, Robert Couturier, Brandon Cox, Denise Crain, Jennifer Crawford, Kimberly Cunnungham, Lindsay Dahl, Tammy Dailey, Lam Dang, Benjamin Daniel, Victoria Daniels, Tonya Dantzler, Sarah Daugherty, Christopher Davila, Christi Davis, Gloria Davis, Lincoln Davis, Tabatha Davis, Shernette Davis-Davelus, Cathy Lyn Deguzman, Nicholas Delgiudice, Andreina Desousa, Dawn Dias, Alicia Dill and Lauren Dillon. (Lichter, David)
November 19, 2013 Filing 725 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 724 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 721 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Alyssa Diorio-Daniel, Paul Dobbs, Denise Dohm, Ann Donelson, Daniel Donlick II, Alison Donovan, Rolena Dotson, Ashley Dove, Lindsay Dow, Shannon Downar, Nicole Drucker, Candra Dufek, Orlandriana Dumas, Susan Durant, Amy Dwyer, Kina Eager, Susan Eckhardt, Michrisha Eddins, Micia Eddins, Denise Edwards, Dolores Edwards, Jimmie Edwards, Sarah Ehlers-Hernandez, Eden Ellis, Jessica Enright, Brittney Ericksen, Sandra Erickson, John Ericson, Debra Escobar, Tina Espinoza, Johnny Esposito, Nina Evans, Tamara Evans, Haddy Faal, Linda Faith, Latricia Falconer, Emily Falls, Stephanie Falls, Christine Farmer, Kenniesha Farquharson, Nancy Fehr, Damaris Felix, Elyssa Fernandes, Gabriel Fernandez, Allison Ferrara, Stacie Fesler, Veronica Figueroa Velazquez, Paul Fiorello, Danielle Flager, David Flores, Juan Flores, Janet Flores-Anticona, Ryan Forbes, Joshua Forbis, Kaleigh Ford, Rachael Fors, Christian Foster, Heather Foster, Sherman Foster, Robert Fouke, Rachel Franco, Tina Frederick, Claudia Fredriks and Melissa Froelick. (Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 723 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
November 19, 2013 Filing 722 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 720 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Zailyn Acevedo, Kathryn Adair, Amanda Adams, Jeannine Albano, Cynthia Albro, Catherine Alexander, Ramses Ali, Sharelle Allen, Desirae Alvarez, Efa Amamouche, Erin An, Michael Anzalone, Michael Ray Arizmendi, Matthew Arnold, Justin Arzoian, Chrystal Atkins, James Averett, Miguel Bailey, Anthony Baker, Danielle Baker, Sarah Ball, Mallory Barr, Mollee Barr, Juana Barrera, Christopher Bawa, Cassandra Bayes, Cynthia Beck, Karissa Bell, Tia Bennett, Erica Benson, Jeffery Benton, Staci Berry, Blake Biller, Danielle Birchler, Jennifer Bogausch, Laura Bonham, Bionca Boyd, Zachary Brandt, Emilee Branning, Lionel Brewer, Jaclyn Briand, Danyl Broomfield, Kelley Brown, Terri Brown, Kristie Buchert, Raven Buck, Rick Buckner, Matt Bujanowski, Shelby Bunch, Teresa Bunker, Shaola Burch, Chadd Burnside, Kevin Bush, Sandy Butler, Shauntay Bynum, Jeff Byrd, Kelli Cabuno, Shaute Caldwell, Javier Callejas, Bernardo Camacho, Paul Cano, Victor Cantu and Veronica Carlan-Mcmahon. (Lichter, David)
November 19, 2013 Filing 721 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 19, 2013 Filing 720 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
November 18, 2013 Filing 719 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Angela Tortorice (DE 558 & DE 559), Paul Jordan (DE 538 & DE 539), and Cindy Castillo (DE 554 & DE 555) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lichter, David)
November 18, 2013 Filing 718 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot # 227 Defendants' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Order of Referral to Mediation and Request for Scheduling and Discovery Conference. The undersigned Magistrate Judge conducted a Scheudling Conference on September 26, 2013, and the District Judge subsequently entered an Amended Scheduling Order (DE 420). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 11/18/2013. (kas)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER denying as moot # 245 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order as Defendants subsequently filed an Amended Motion for Protective Order [DE 625]; denying as moot # 304 Defendants' Motion to Compel as Defendants subsequently filed an Amended Motion to Compel [DE 626]; denying as moot the following motions to the extent not otherwise addressed by this Order: # 250 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Withdrawal of Defendants' 30(b)(6) Objections; # 608 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of ESI by Defendants and Related Relief; # 623 Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and for Related Relief; # 626 Defendants' Amended Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Documents Responsive to Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production and to Answer Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories. If the parties believe any issues raised by these motions are not moot, after meeting and conferring in a good faith effort to resolve them, the parties may renew their motions with respect to these issues. Please see Order for additional details. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 11/18/2013. (kas)
November 15, 2013 Filing 716 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 715 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Anglea Edleman. (Marshall, J.)
November 15, 2013 Filing 715 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 15, 2013 Filing 714 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 713 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Bonnie Gadsby, Brandon Harris, Katrina Miller, Brandi Powell, Amber Robinson, Christopher Slade, Amattalla Sloan, Desmond Smith, Kaylie Smith, Barry Smoot Jr, Ryan Snodgrass, Teresa Sparks, Natika Spaulding, Renee Stephens, Enrique Tabares, Diana Tabarez, Amanda Tapper, Tatiana Terzich, Taylor Vaughan, Joseph Vidaurri, Nicole Vokes, Donna Walcott, Danielle Walker, Yolanda Walker, Cody Weeks, Lisa Wholean, Chris Williams, Philip Williams, Alice Wilson, Wilton Wynn and Kelsie Yax. (Marshall, J.)
November 15, 2013 Filing 713 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 15, 2013 Filing 712 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 711 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Osama Afifi, Lorraine Anneken, Matthew Anneken, Sean Barthelmes, Angella Beavers, David Benton, David Bienkowski, Adam Blackwell, Kathryn Blais, Vojislav Brasnovic, Brandon Briggs, Adam Broome, Branden Brown, Stephanie Brown, Sana Brown Jackson, Ebonie Bullard, Moises Champo, Jaclyn Chopelas, Latoya Clark, Orlando Cobos, Trisha Cosper, Leonora Costello, Crystal Courtney, Valerie Cousino, Kimberly Davis, Jeff De Dios, Tammy Del Santo, Seminar Dixon-Thompson, Erin K. Donnelly, Azeema Ervin, Nelson Esquivel, Katherine Fredlund, Amber Galloway, Meron Gashu, Diane Gonzalez, Kiana Gray, Kirstin Grazulis, Joel Halstead, Seth Hardy, Gary Harrison, Sherry Haywood, Sheila Hess, Jennifer Hooper, Jayne Hulec, Michael Jewett, Eldica John, Cerra Johnson, Rachel Johnson, Scott Johnson, Matthew Jones, Joseph Keeton, Donna Kennon, Linda Laurenzi-Lorenz, Cameron Lewis, Christopher Macgibbon, Monika Marcum, Rachel Martin, Jennifer Martinez, Jesus Martinez, Xavier Martinez Jr, Elizabeth Mateo, Kelly Mcgrath, Lacey Mclear, Alan Mendoza, Matthew Meppiel, Andrea Moe, Marshall Murdock, Ashley Murphy, Kimberly Nixon, Kyle Oshea, Kyle Ostapiej, Jacob Pacheco, Emily Park, Casey Pennington, Rebecca Pennington, Paschelle Perryman, Alyse Petti, Anita Phillips, Iwona Pietrakiejew, Leonettza Powell, Scott Powell, Jessica Pysz, Debbie Quarles, Anthony Quezada, Taylor Quigley, Plezena Radford, Michael Randolph, Leslie Rietveld, Augustine Rodero, John Rosegay, Justin Ross, Anita Safo, Michael Salter, Tonya Samudio, Brianna Sanchez, Paul Sanders, Stephen Scheele, Sharon Scott, Rachael Searle and Rachel Seay. (Marshall, J.)
November 15, 2013 Filing 711 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 15, 2013 Filing 710 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 709 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jamaar Blanchard, Elizabeth Bowyer, Jessica Britton, Erick Hodges, Dana Hutzel, Donna McAlister, David Rubio, Hannah Saffle and Katie Wilbur. (Marshall, J.)
November 15, 2013 Filing 709 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 13, 2013 Filing 708 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 707 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jessica Allison, Kimberly Anderson, Steve Ayala, Danyl Broomfield, Ashley Brown, Jessica Brown, Patricia Brown, Kele Cancilla, William Dane, Patricia Davis, James Jones, Brandon King, Chris Lash, Karen Lorgus, John Martin, Kimberly Martin, Amber Miller, Jessica Miller, Katie Miller, Michael Miller, Jennifer Moore, Jessica Peterson, Adam Scott, Andrea Simmons, Michelle Smith, Robert Temples, Emily Thompson, Jose Vela, Michael Vice, Tamara Walker, Ashley Weaver, Jennifer Webb, Erica White and Tina White. (Marshall, J.)
November 13, 2013 Filing 707 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 13, 2013 Filing 706 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 705 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Carmel Mendoza, Mitch Weedn, Diamond Williams, Melody Williams, Robert Wilson, Randi Wittman, Samantha Wolf, Andrew Wood, Teresa Woodward, Porscha Wright, Aimee Yamabe, Francisca Yebesi, Linda York, Shaney Young and Karen Zgunda. (Marshall, J.)
November 13, 2013 Filing 705 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 13, 2013 Filing 704 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 703 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Shana Jones, Misael Juarez, Deangelo Kelly, Shaughn Kennedy, Melissa King, Carrey Knox, John Kusumi, Amber Lavail, Barbara Lewis, Jose Limon, Kathy Lister, Steven Macnulty, Clayton Martin, Elizabeth Martinez, Venus Mccary, Dot Mccombie, Shirley Mccoy-Melton, Alex Mcgrath, Laura Medina, Gloria Mervis, Ann Marie Middleton, Brandi Miller-Montgomery, Donna Mitteer, William Moffitt, Saren Moore, Dawn Morris, Lisa Mosconi, Doug Mueller, Jennifer Muir, Kevin Mullin, April Nelson, Brittany Nelson, Holly Nevala, Georgianna Nicolas, Idania Nomikos, Joann Nouri, Bobby Nutter, Stephanie Olson, Sharon Ouderkirk, Julie Palenscar, Shirley Pannucci, Laura Parks, Crystal Passmore, Benjamin Pedersen, Thanh Pham, Vachkianna Pierre, Athena Portwood, Katharine Quellette, Sergio Ramirez, Christine Rebmann, James Redmond, Gabrielle Reffuge, Richard Riddle, Garth Robillard, Tamara Robinson, Cristian Rodriguez, Natasha Rodriguez, Mirta Rosello, Nathan Russell, Marylou Sandefer, Tara Sargente, Alex Schultz, Christian Serafino, Roland Shanks, Alicia Silva, Jacob Snead, Jancarlos Soto, Lesly Soto, Dustin Stacy, Allison Stangel, Beverly Stapleton, Liz Steelman, Corinne Stein, Christopher Stewart, Helen Stewart, Sabrina Suaste, Bryson Taylor, Meghan Taylor, Shawn Taylor, Edward Tharp, Darius Todd, Jennifer Tonetti, Charlotte Tope, Kristen Tucker, Cindy Tumi, Judith Tyson-Miller, Lara Vanevery, Jessica Vlcek, Jeremy Wakefield, Caleb Washington, Aaron Watkins and Suzanna Watson. (Marshall, J.)
November 13, 2013 Filing 703 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 13, 2013 Filing 702 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 701 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Lorinne Adrineda, Adefemi Akingbade, Kristen Alshanski, Kelsey Anderson, Cory Arleth, Stacey Armenta, Christopher Arnold, Nuria Barajas, Melissa Berry, Suzanne Bevins, Martin Bockhold, Jennifer Border, Sausha Boyd, Tiffany Boyko, Alexander Bradford, Cassandra Branch, Curtis Brimer, Jacob Brinchi, Jeffrey Brink, Andrea Burris, Amber Butch, Brittany Carver, Carina Cedrechi, Miranda Chrastil, Dominique Christmas, James Cisneros, Matt Cobb, Guadalupe Correa, Robert Crowther, Melissa Curd, Nicole Dallman, Ashley Dargan, Leslie Deleon, Ashlee Denson-Holmes, Joni Devries-Missmer, Vivian Drescher, James Dunbar, Joshua Dupuy, Jaron Eaton, Ashley Elmore, David Evans, Jacqueline Evans, Kelly Fagundes, Christina Fitzgerald, Randi Flora, Mary Floyd, Lesley Forneron, Alecia Foster, April Frazier, Brian Freitag, Mandie Frias, Alaina Fugo, Melissa Gainer, Jerusha Garcia, Leticia Garcia, David Gehret, Michael Geraci, William Gile, Jamill Gilliam, Franklin Glen, Cynthia Gonsalez, Heather Greenblatt, Staci Grenz, Katherine Grey, Hayley Grohar, Jason Gunn, Kristal Gurgone, Katherine Gutierrez, Mayra Gutierrez, Renee Hale, Rachel Hardy, Joseph Harrington, Tara Hartso, Hillary Hatch, Craig Herbst, Ashley Hodge, Sean Holmes, Danielle Hough, Emmanuel Howell, Bobbie Howle, Amy Huang, Rosemary Hunt, Padhraig Hutchison, Pamela Iahn, Amindi Imoh, Jason Inouye, Hakimah Jabbar, Jessica Jackson, Kevin Jaklich, Charles Jerome, Ranelle Jerome, Chassie Johanson-Laval, Alex Johnson, Andrea Johnson, Stephanie Johnson and Coleen Jones. (Marshall, J.)
November 13, 2013 Filing 701 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 13, 2013 Filing 700 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 699 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Eric Feinberg, Shantell Ferguson, Kim Ferrari, Andrew Floren, Pablo Flores, Shelden Flowers, Brandon Forte, Summer Francois, Toni Galeti, Lindsay Galusha, Jennifer Gamble, Maria Garcia, Tiffany Geiger, Chelsey Gisler, Maureen Goodell, Lalaenya Grace, Toni Graham, Leah Granwehr, Melissa Gray, Rocio Guerrero, David Guillory, Cory Gullatt, Zyteal Harmon, Brian Hartwell, Kristie Hawkins, Karen Hawley, Amanda Hayden, Amanda Henri, Sarah Hentges, Katelin Hess, Bryan Hill, Kimberly Hodges, Lauren Hopkins, Angela Horadam, Linda Hoskins, Tessio Howell, Jennifer Hulett, Gregory Jackson, Linex Jackson, Mohamed Jalloh, Quinci Jenkins, Kayla Johnson-Stubbs, Victoria Juillerat, Malissa Kane, Tiffany Kelemen, Cristina Kemp, Kathy Kessel, Deborah Key, Karen Kimmich, Joyce Klochaney, Virginia Knuth, Victoria LaCourse, Mary Langendorfer, Amanda Lastort, Alicia Lee, Erica Lee, Margaret Lewis, Jessica Lilley, Todd Lilley, Hilary Linderman, Juan Lopez, Connie Lungaro, Jaime Madewell, Tyrone Maloney, John Marszal, Jessica Martin, Leona Martin, Nima Mashhoon, Susan Matthews, Katherine Maul, Byron Mayo, Michael McClellan, Andrew McGowan, Colleen McHugh, Mary Jo McIntyre, Michelle McNew, Miriam Meyer, Casey Meyers, Ryan Minnix, Danielle Moeser, Denise Mohelnitzky, Jonathon Monroe, Jami Montgomery, Bruno Moore, Cindy Moore, Danny Morales, Pamela Mosbarger, Kaleemah Mott, Sarah Mungia, Angelica Munoz, Mandi Neal, Tabatha Newton, Quyen Nguyen, Meghan Nieznanski, Jack Oakes, Angela Oates, Maria Obugene, Elaine Ortez, Lisa Overholser and Van Overton. (Lichter, David)
November 13, 2013 Filing 699 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
November 12, 2013 Filing 698 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 697 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Lee Lukaszewski. (Marshall, J.)
November 12, 2013 Filing 697 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 12, 2013 Filing 696 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 695 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Margaret Bonilla, Nicole Bradbury-Nascimento, Donald Brandon, Julie Budke, Danielle Butler, Christina Carrano, Patricia Chan-Miller, Arianna Dorf, Derrick Dowling, Jacquelyn Esry, Kymberly Gast, Erika Goudeau, Cynthia Groves, Edward Hanania, Gary Jones, Guy Jones, Susan Kidd-Bodres, Benjamin Kill, Jacqueline Larson, Stephen Mackey, David Malek, Kym Marchell-Spurgin, Charles Mccarley, Brittney Montgomery, Scott Musser, Hannah Nicholas, Sierra Rank, Donielle Sandoval, Connie Sotomayor, Christina Stansberry, Judas Villanueva, Justin Walker, Amanda Watkins, Matthew S Williams and Katie Yohnke. (Marshall, J.)
November 12, 2013 Filing 695 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 694 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 693 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Denise Ashcraft, Jose Balandrano, Patrick Baxter Jr, Angela Blakney, Nicole Blanchard, Craig Bloomfield, Tammy Bonnell, Lisa Boulet, Isaac Brooks, Stacie Brooks, Kristina Brown, Brandi Brown-Houston, Lorissa Busico Neuroth, Alissa Calderon, Nicholas Calicchia, Rhory Carlson, Mikhail Chalov, Kimberly Conner, Kayla Cooner, Amanda Coplan, Kelly Cotton, Jonathan Crowley, Spencer Cuffman, Tamara Dallas, Crystal Deguire, Guy Elmine, Erik Flores-Alatorre, Anitra Freeman, Ladona Frink, Jeffery Gaines, Ashlee Garcia, Laura Gay, Crystal Gerber-Parker, Christian Gomez, Jasmine Gray, Amy Greene, Kelly Grennan, Kathy Hains, Dustin Henry, Steven Henry, Karah Hitchcock, Matthew Hofbauer, Anita Huber Scott, Kate R Hunter, Sharika Ja'londa Cherry, Brittany Jackson, Roger Jacobsen, Chris Johnson, Diane Kennedy, Donielle Maki, Tayler Marshall, Rachal Mercurio, Sauda Muhammad, Daniel Ness, Ciara Norris, Deborah Oakes, Alexandria Obrien, Nathaniel Parker, Zachary Payne, Ashley Picard-Wentz, Cody Porter, Kathleen Puwal, Andrea Rawson, Latricia Reid, Tracy Rink, Anna Rodisel, Bernardo Rosas, Athena Rowe, Niklas Sauer, Blair Savage, Michael Shimko, Islom Shoev, Stephanie Slater, Alisha Smith, Carmen Smith, Jennifer Smith, Natasha Smith, Tinica Smith, Carylyn Smith Miles, Bridgett Smith-Applin, Diana Soehngen, Joseph Stone, Lauren Swails, Steven Thompson, Diana Thruman, David Vanek, Lauren Walker-Akins, Patricia Wetzel, Alyson Wilk, Larry Williams, Kathleen Wolsic, Jon Wright and Ashley Zander-Mcdonell. (Marshall, J.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 693 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 692 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 691 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Tia Sokol, Octavio Vigil, Jesus Vitocruz, Aaron Webb, Scott Wetzstein, Destiny Wheeler, Amy Yarger and Tara Yates. (Marshall, J.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 691 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 690 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 689 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Amy Adams, Phil Agard, Sheerice Alston, Jennifer Amos, Ashley Archuleta, Erin Bachini, Celverjohn Baino, Anel Ballesteros, Martha Bareis, Kimberly Boboris, Adriana Borbon, Charles Austin Bradley, Aisha Bradley Mahdi, Kelle Brenneman, Sean Breum, Garett Brown, Tara Browning, Roxanne Bustamante, Cynthia Carelli, Paris Carr, Suzanne Casale, Mandy Caudill, Courtney Cunningham, Pamela Dehoyos, Markeita Dillard-Holley, Shayna Domingo, Sean Durbin, Amanda Edmands, Gautham Elango, Fernando Farfan, Christina Finan, Scott Fraley, Kenira Franklin, Glenda Gamble Ramirez, Natalie Garcia, Janessa Garrido, Jovonis Gore, John Graves III, Daryl Griffin, Alison Groves, Christopher Hall, Chris Harless, Jordan Hawkins, Oriel Henry, Blake Hill, Richard Hunter Jr, Surayya Ibrahim, Shannon Jackson, Brittney Jones, Joann Jones, Theresa Jones, Melody Karch-Zotovich, Tyler Kayton, Afzol Kazi, Alex Kelley, Suzanne Kerrigan, Ara Klyce-Curtis, Susan Kroswek-Gillette, Kelly Laluz, Ruth Lesse, Daniel Livingston, Norman Mackinnon, Desiree Marlett, Maureen Martz, Kevin Mccarthy, Cherice Mcclain, Kellie Mckissick, Andrew Mendez, Katherine Messier, Sara Michalski, Jorge Mujica, Patric Nelson, Jennifer Nichols, Lacie Norris, Crystal Omogrosso, Monica Oseguera, Katie Parvey, James Price, Janine Rapka, Jordan Rodriguez, Jacqueline Ross, Jessica Rossi, Peter Ruccius, Heather Sandfort, Brittany Scardino, Brandi Schaeffer, Melanie Shipp-Landry, Quansa Thompson, John Tiet, Patricia Toland, Joshua Torres, Norma Torres, Soleil Totchum, Gabriela Towns, Angela Tubbs, Joanna Velasco and Darryl Verhey. (Marshall, J.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 689 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 688 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 687 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rosanne Bialecki-Zakrewski, Megan D. Brown, Michael Sullivan, Linda Swanson, Michelle Thew, Shantel Thilman, Amy Thompson, Kara Thorn, Breanna Tomlinson, Kimberly Trueblood, Samantha Vahldick, Nadia Valladares, Tracey Vance, Benjamin Volen, Darryl Watson, Michael Wheeler, Juronda White, Kassandra Willey, Jennifer Wilson, Quinn Winsheimer, Charles Wolfe, Jaye Wright, Brittney Wright-Watson, Diana Young, Richard Zamarron, Patsy Zamudio and Nicole Zevgolis. (Marshall, J.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 687 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 686 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 685 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rebecca Johnson, Leslie Jones, Megan Jones, Caryl Jones-Duck, Jackie Kasztelan, Christine Kelly, James Kelly, Samantha Kiepprien, Troy Kirkpatrick, Dillon Krenz, Anna Kuc, Doreen Kudla, Justin Labruzzo, Catherine Lafferty, Jade Lambert, Sharon Langlois-Turner, Aaron Lappe, Sarah Latham, Bernadette Lester, Brandon Leyva, Julie Liberty, Melanie Lipman, Cortney Lukehart, Dawn Lyle, Kayla Makepeace, Joseph Manetta, Zachary Manor, Jenn Martin, Claudia Mayol, Teri McGreevy, Lucas McGuffin, Nate Mckenzie, Courteney Medina, Gena Mendez, Chris Merritt, Cheryl L. Miller, Marly Miller-Sherbutt, Debbie Mitchell, Priscilla Molina, Aleida Montes De Oca, Leonard Moody, Robert Morrison, Bryan Nails, Charlie Nguyen, Bridget Null, Brandon Ousley, Kayla Owens, Collyn Pankratz, Ashley Parker, Seaton Parker, Alexis Parsons, Virginia Paul, Steven Pointdexter, Candace Pomtree-Young, Jessica Presley, Mary Price, Anna Pulido, Amanda Ramon, Patty Ransom, Ciera Rash, Laurie Reese, Karri Repak, Ashley Rice, Robert Rodriguez, Henry Romero, Summer Rose-Burruss, Amy Ross, Michelle Rowe, Lori Ruiz, Radis Russeau, Apollo Russell, Alejandra Sanchez, Cajsa Savard, Breanna Sieloff, Michele Sivard, William Sizer III, Laura Slanaker, Timothy Smallwood, Elizabeth Smith, Judith Smith, Leslie Smith, William Smith, Armando Soto, Elaine Southerland, Barbara Spano, Armeda Spencer-Kuntz, Michele Stepter and Nicholas Story. (Marshall, J.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 685 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 684 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 683 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Sean Ables, Stephanie Agius, Shanna Aldrich, Angela Alexander, Jared Allman, Theresa Anguiano, Darrell Archie, Alexandria Ard, Heriberto Arraut, Tiffany Arvest, Sonia Averett, Tayrone Avila, Brenda Aviles, Johnathon Balogh, Clara Batten, Brian Beemer, Shane Bell, Alicia Beltsios, Denise Bergmeier, Amy Bevis, Jenna Blaya, George Bolovis, Brittani Booker, Rachel Brewer, Childs Brian, Marcia Briscoe, Kristine Brown, Kevin Bunetic, Julie Burke, Melissa Burleson, Jeremy Burnett, Stacy Burnett, June Burrage, Kayleigh Bush, Mary Carter, Caitlin Casar, Brittany Casey, Lakeyva Catala, Freddy Challo, Christie Chatman, Dani Cleaves, Angela Coddington, Juan Cruz, Amy Dalton, Lawren Dampeer, Amanda Daoud, Tanya Delahoussaye, Kelly Denoon, David Diaz, Rachel Diaz, Jessica Dickerson, Beth Dockery, Debra Dvorcek, Amber Federschnieder, Lorraine Feltman, Jacqueline Ferguson, Patricia Figueroa, Linda Fitts, Ana Flores, Kendra Foster, Michael Friedman, Dina Gaines, Ryan Gallmann, Adrian Garcia, Elliot Garner, Dorothea Garrett, Stephanie Geidel, Rohnald Genot, Haeli Gerardy, Tiffany Gipson, Kelsey Glaser, Kimberly Gonzales, Marina Gonzales, Vanessa Gonzales, Sarah Goodin, Sarah Goodnough, Chelsea Gottleib, Tommy Grubaugh, Enjoli Hall, Michael Harper, Lori Harris, Janet Hart, Claudia Hennebry, Jose Holder, Tina Holguin, Shatavia Holmes, Rachael Huff-Ellison, Darrell Hunt, Cheryl Hunter, Bryan Hurdle, Jasmine Ingram, Khalil Issa and Katie Ivins. (Marshall, J.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 683 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 7, 2013 Filing 682 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 681 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Ebony Lawrence, Jennifer Marshall, Christopher Martin, Nenada Maslovaric, Kayleigh Mast, Lisa Maue, Stephanie Mayne, Saralynne Mcgrogan, Holly Mcomber, Sandra Merritt, Jeffrey Miller, Lela Mitchell, Sheryl Morgan, Michele Mott, Jaime Murillo, Aeriale Myers, Kassandra Neisen, Christoph Niver, Meagan Osman, Eileen Otwell, Macy Paladino, Antionette Papucci, Katie Paquette, Makalah Percell, Ronald Perez, Judith Peterson, Twalla Phillips, Sara Ponemon, Karen Postula, James Pyle, Ryan Raitzyk, Gregory Reina, Amberlyn Reisenauer, Katherine Richardson, Richard Rivera, Teresa Rodriguez, Denise Roll, Adriana Rubio, Ryan Sant, Kelly Santen, Gail Santos, Nicholas Sardoni, Jocelyne Schneider, Lauren Schuler, Sylvia Seideman, Jacqueline Semeniuk, Heather Shermer, Kiel Shuey, Konstantino Simotas, Erica Smith, Renee Smith, Sarah L Smith, Shazli Smith, William Smith, Chad Stewart, Brandon Stumpf, Amanda Taft, Desiree Tesoriero, Cherita Thomas-Mcelveen, Donna Thorsey, Tiffany Webb, Amy Webster, Julie Wells, Jolanda Wesley, Angela White, Mallory Windham, Toni Yannarilli, Walter Young, Milen Zemiceal and Lilah Zohar. (Marshall, J.)
November 7, 2013 Filing 681 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 7, 2013 Filing 680 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 679 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Carla Alexander, Justin Allred, Aurora Andrews, Shanera Andrews, Stephanie Armstrong, Blanchie Asberry, Jamaal Banks, Kim Barella, Dominic Barilla, Dahlia Bates, Doris Baxter, Justin Beukemann, Lindsay Boggs, Shaderick Boggs, Mark Bricker, Erica Bridges, Scott Budach, Jorge Calderon, Kayla Canfield-Stevenson, Michael Cardamone, Vincent Carranco, Natalie Casimir, Scott Catrone, Amy Cerulli, Alex Chen, Megan Contino, Shannon Couey, Beth Coultas, Mandy Curtis, Terrilyn Cwiok, Cassandra Dahman, Kelsea Dance, Jessica Davis, Seth Davis, Harmonie Davis-Brown, Kristi Debrincat, Brandi Derby, William Diggs IV, Lucia Dipasquale, Marley Donner, Bridget Downing, Bernard Eafrati, Sara Early, Aren Ehrhart, Julia Ek-Howard, Tiffany Evans, Robert Fortner, Robert Frantz, Ashlee Gagnon, Michael Galluzzo, Dustin Gann, Adam Garcia, Monique Garcia, Rebecca Garrett, Danielle Gerald, Stephen Gizzi, Jeramie Grattenthaler, Duane Gross, Scott Hand, Daphne Hanse, Wendy Haucke, Jessica Hawk, Phuong Hoang, Michelle Hoeft, John Hoeft II, Sierra Holmes, Warren Holmes, Alexander Hoyt, Gavin Huling, Ross Hurley, Angelica Ibarra, Michael Iwabuchi, Princess Johnson, Crystal Jones, Owen Joseph, Ebone Joyner, Korey Kelly, Jordan Kendrick, Alan Kerber, Breyshawn King, Danielle Knight, Patrick Landis, Edward Ledesma II, Amanda Lentz, Erin Leon, Arielle Levy, Bonnie Lillis, Heather Lobello, Quadrair Long, Emily Manning, Rebecca Mares and Ashlie Marler. (Marshall, J.)
November 7, 2013 Filing 679 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 6, 2013 Filing 678 NOTICE by Darden Restaurants, Inc. Of Proposed Orders (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs' Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
November 6, 2013 Filing 677 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 676 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Patrick Driscoll, Tiffany Garcia, Michael Goodwin, Stephanie Gray, Ashley Jones, Ronald Kubicki, Sarah Matthews, Briana Mcfadgen, Marina Mcgourty, Theresa Mcguire, Molly Mckinney, Amanda Moore, Alese Mueller, Keith R Murray, Charles Oconnor III, Thomas Pare, Victoria Patti, Norka Perdomo, Dina Perez, Tanya Pettite, Allison Pezzuto, Darby Poynter, Corri Priebe, Alejandra Puertas, Katherine Ramirez, Taran Ramtahal, Joelyne Rapos, Justin Rice, Brittany Robinson, Joshua Robinson, Devon Robson, Crystal Ruffino, Flora Russell, Brett Sanders, Lisa Santiago, John Schoenbeck, Brian Schwarz, Adam Showers, Ashley Sirmon, Anne Marie Sirois, Angela Sisson, Stephanie Skrant, Jan Slatton, Lakeisha Smith, John Smyers, Angela Studer-Mcdonald, Corey Sullivan, Erika Sykes, Antron Taylor, Charlotte Thompson, Tomislav Tomov, Lisa Turner, Sams Uddin, Kerri Unger-Gibson, Marcelo Vargas-Fernandez, Amber Walker, Bryce Wall, Malerie Walters, Chris Watford, Jennifer Welter, Christopher West, Brittney White, Hillarie Whitehorn, Nicole Williams, Kirsten Witsman, Beverly Workman and Tiffany Yerkes. (Marshall, J.)
November 6, 2013 Filing 676 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 6, 2013 Filing 675 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 674 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Amy Adair, Elizabeth Adair, Antonia Adams, Jessica Adams, Maria Isabel Alcantara, Shanita Allen, Janett Amare, Jeffrey Angsman, Sara Angsman, Maureen Arbuthnot, Laura Atkinson, Heather Austin, Livy Bales, Bernadine Balko, Michael Barber, Stephen Barton, Pamela Battaglia, Lauren Baumbach, Lauren Benjamin, Jessica Berry, Tiffany Boyle, Ivan Bravo, Christina Brunck, Colby Bruton, Lance Bubash, Laura Cardello, Leesha Chaffin, Ly Chamberland, Autumn Chapoff, Kariim Chiles, Ashley Chudzik, Cynthia Cicero, Brenda Cimbaljevich, Angela Clark, Julianne Clopp, Brittany Collantes, Dana Conzo, Martin Cortez, Mika Crawford, Toni-Ann Darby, Elasia Dean, Caley Degroote, Jessica Depontbriand, Eddy Derosier, Chris Doerr, Kathryn Doty, Jayne Edwards, Tara Elnitski, Shonta Evans, Amanda Felker, Amy Fisher, Catina Fisher, William Flax, Leilani Foerster, Dena Fortner, Danielle Foster, Morgann Freeman, Megan Frye, Rebecca Frye, Monica Gallegos, Lorie Garza-Debaca, Arthur Gelly, Lauren George, Heather Giuliano, Nefertiti Gomaa, Allen Gooden Iv, Christina Grigsby, Brandon Gunsaules, Tamara Gwynn, Kassie Haberlog, Michelle Hagenbaugh, Victoria Holoka, Bethany Howard, Hannah Hurla, Jessica Jackson-Denman, Jill Jiovanazzo, Melissa Kerns, Andrea Kimball, Michelle Knievel, Nancy Knight, Kym Knoxson, Jill Kurpenski, Adrian Lara, Jennifer Lauer, John Leone, Ebony Lomax, Ngoua Lor, Nou Lor, Ashley Ludwick, Kimberly Mahony, Rhonda Makki, Lisa Martens, Ryan Matchey and Hunter Matlock. (Marshall, J.)
November 6, 2013 Filing 674 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 5, 2013 Filing 673 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 672 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Gayle Barron, Jasmine Houston, Jeremy Marcus, Wilfredo Rivera, Cassandra Robles, Jenna Rush, Kathleen Ruttan-Hyde, Sandra Santiago, Christine Sass, Tara Sassani, Alicia Scarborge, Kimberly Serros, Alyssa Shoemaker, Katie Shoemaker, Nikolas Slattery, Jacob Smith, Karen Smith, Aline Souza, Brianna Spanier, Thomas Sparks, Travis Stoner, Jennifer Strovilas, Phillip Stuart, Wendy Swanson, Mark Talbert, Deanna Towe, Aimee Tu, Jeff Varney, Monica Vergato, Bianca Villarini, John Wallace, Christy Walther, M Walther, April Watkins, Jerrod Williams and Samantha York. (Marshall, J.)
November 5, 2013 Filing 672 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 5, 2013 Filing 671 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 670 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Joseph Banks, Jodie Beasley, Nisha Blackford, Bret Bonner, Curtis Borns, Erin Brett, Marchelle Brown, Stephanie Brown, Dakota Bryant, Emily Cain, Penny Cardiff, Stephen Carter, Jesse Chapnick, Cynthia Charriez, Douglas Cheung, Michael Choquette, Kira Copley, Myron Cowen, Elisha Cripe, Andrew Dahl, Jonathan Davis, Marcanthony Dejesus, Jennifer Doan, Ryan Domek-Hernandez, Erin Donnelly, Beverly Eskridge, Jose Felix, Patricia Fesperman, Matthew Fields, Allison Fisher-Smiley, Lorena Flores, Tina Foxx, Allison Garcia, Kelly Gause, Stephanie Giza, Amanda Gotshall, Nancy Grant, Karen Green, Kevin Gribble, Laura Habisreitinger, Laura Haire, Brittany Hall, Rebecca Hall, Ian Halseth, Bridget Hartman, Rhonda Hathaway, Nicole Havill, Kathleen Heishman, Heidi Hernandez, Mitchell Heurtelou, Christina Hoolahan, Donna Houston, Corey Howery, Shawn Hughes, Julia Hunter, Terry Hunter-Traice, Raymond Hyde, Perla Ibarra, Amanda Iglesias, Joseph Jackson, Aaron Jamison, Amanda Kelley, Carol Kumbier, Tanya Legg, Alycia Lewis, Jason Linder, Cassandra Locke, Elizabeth Logsdon, Jonathon Looney, Tony Lowe, Sylvarius Luke, Mimi Luna, Jennifer Mahn, Lauren Marz, Jodi Mashak, Leslie Mayberry, Jeynelle Mc Gann, Michael Mcdade, Nicole Mctiernan, Cheyenne Menking-Hoggatt, Nancy Middleton, Arnita Mitchell, Lamar Munze-Long, Katie Myron, Julie Nowell-Brazee, Zizika Odukwe, John Oliver, Leah Olsieski, Megan Pawlowski, Rita Pennington, Dawn Perkins, Kevin Pikkel, Shalini Randall, Jenna Reasons and Michael Reed. (Marshall, J.)
November 5, 2013 Filing 670 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 4, 2013 Filing 669 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 668 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jessica Hall, Becca Lanahan, Kathleen Lasinski, Rebecca Martin, Isaac Porter, Brandon Rodriquez and Benjamin Smith. (Marshall, J.)
November 4, 2013 Filing 668 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 667 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 666 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Bianca Bogdan, Mary Bokenhagen, Christina Bowley, Angela Carnaggio, Kathleen Heishman, Sam Kearney, Gary Kitchen, Regis Morris, Adrienne Newton, Brenda Oden, Laquana Perry, Betty Pierce, Teairra Portis, Megan Rojas, Rebecca Spencer, Kelly Stancil, Toki Swan and Diane Vera. (Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 666 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 665 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 664 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Heather Hartless, Nicole Sommmers, Aarion Sorrells, Erica Starnes, Adam Swindell, Deborah Thompson, Joey Thompson, Philip Todt, Chadwick Tripp, Sade Vargas, Aaron Villegas, Paul Vonbernewitz, Taylor Weaver, Tiffany Williams, James Williams III, Anibal Zapata and Ericka Zaremba. (Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 664 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 663 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 662 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Alexis Abushawareb, Christopher Aguirre, Andrea Alsawi, Tara Amaral, Pamela Anderson, Christina Andoloro, Tiffany Ard, David Aronstam, Erin Averill, Thomas Avila, Pamela Baeza, Carol Beauchamp-Randolph, Sharleisha Bolton, Joe Bonomo, Samantha Botnick, Jeffery Bozzelli, Laurel Brewer, Beth Broadnax, Angelia Brown, Jordan Bruns, Eliner Carrasquillo-Rivera, Jade Choyce, Steven Conrad, Timmyra Daniel, Elizabeth Davenport, Maria Dibartolo, Cassandra Dorantes, Blake Doud, Katherine Dueno, Stephanie Ellenberg, Jared Evaneski, Dianne Finke, Jessica Formica, Nicole Garitano, Katherine Gill-Nunes, Christian Graham, Sandra Han, Reinhold Heinrich, Jessica Herbert, Cheyenne Hill, Toni Jackson, Christine Jenkins, Desmond Johnson, Suter Johnson, Dennis Kelehar, Devin Kemp, Erica Kinkaid, Annie Klark, Daniel Klark, Caryl Kornek, Soraya Kranwinkel, Rebecca Kremer, Jane Kuhlman, Amy Kwasniewski, Eric Lamar, Aletha Laux, Elizabeth Lipsey, Abigail Lodes, Daphne Lowery, Kim Mahler, Jasmine Massingill, Darin Maund, Kyle Mccarthy, Crystal Mcclure, Laura Mcginty, Tara Mead, Michael Medina, Natalie Middleton, Mary Mosqueda, Clarissa Neil, Kelly Norton, Brian Pachin, Aaron Paradie, William Pass, Arthur Phelan, Amber Plummer, Samantha Pospisil, Tiayahakia Presley, Theresa Pressley, Maria Repetti, Kcee Richardson, Lindsey Robinson-Smith, Leticia Rodriguez, Justin Roman, Ronique Rose, Karessa Ruffu, Kristina Rutjes, Leaundra Singleton-Rudow, Melanie Smiley, Brandy Smith, Cynthia Smith and Kimberly Smith. (Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 662 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 661 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 660 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Irene Duncan, Lisa Johnson, Nicole Merrel, Danielle Mitchell, Victoria Mitchell, Danielle Monteleone, Kristine Moran, Adam Muehl, Megan Munoz, Scott Murdock, Ingrid Nesti-Baker, Cheryl Newton, Nicole Newton, Jennifer Nowak, Roberto Nunez, William Ogle, Rory Oxton, Ulato Page, Tiffany Patterson, Manuel Perez, Isaac Porter, Carmen Prather, Holly Prescott, Juliana Quiroz, Kathleen Reardon, Stephanie Rechtorovic, Vicky Reha, Shelby Ridner, Heather Rios, Julian Rodriguez Ortiz, Jill Rossi, Dee Sanchez, Dwight Saylor, Kathleen Schmidt, Stephanie Scholtes-Pederson, Samantha Schweihofer, Laura Scott, Kimberley Selert, Susan Sharples-Zito, Kyle Shipley, Shakiscia Short, Marlene Skinner, Ashley Slaughter, Jeffrey Smith, Latisha Spicer, Tristan Stone, Angela Strickland, Michael Sulik, Cherish Lakin Tate, Francisco Tello Torres, Lauren Theobald, Elisheva Throgmorton, Taniqua Tobias, Brianna Vinson-Allen, Alex Vonfeldt, Peter Vottis, Megan Wager, Alejandra Wang-Jinright, Halle Weber, Victoria Weems, Ashley Weimer, Jamie West, William White, Natalie Williams, Andre Wilson, Jennifer Worth and Evan Wright. (Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 660 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 659 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 658 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rachel Adame - Avila, Lynn Adelson, Rita Aguilera, Yousef Al-Haymi, Ludivina Alaniz, Lorena Ambriz, Tiffany Amory, Kathleen Annis, Michael Arnold, Ashle Baker, Emily Baker, William Baltz, Denise Bellardi, Donnell Berry, Alicia Billings, Paul Bitts, Darci Blake, Devon Bourne, Carissa Bower, Dallas Bower, Devin Braud, Rachel Brewer-Slabaugh, Angela Bricks, Kimberly Brown, Mary Burke, Jamie Callison, Shawn Campbell, Travis Church, Lindsey Collins-Smith, Kristine Conyers, Matthew Corsaro, Kelly Coville, Toni Crain, Crystal Davis, Mwaurayeni Davis, Karen Delage, Sally Dunkin, Lisa Dyer, Barbara Earls, Yvonne Ehrhardt, Kali Engster, Barbara Espinosa, Danyell Fabre, Ryan Fell, Kathryn Finnegan, Mark Fontan, Elliot Fox, Katheryn Friesen, Justin Fulks, Midori Fuller, Katelyn Gadzia, Ephrem Gebrekidan, Ileah Glenn, Molly Godfrey, Michael Goodwin, Blane Gordon Jr, Joseph Grantham, Kristina Grigutis, Denelle Hale, Melinda Hammalian, Jamie Hans, Ron Harlan Lewallen, Kenneth Harvey Jr, Ronnie Hayford, Bruce Head Jr, Tonie Hernandez, Raquel Hindsman-Isabell, Travis Holland, Monique Jackson, Robin James, Jesse Jenkins, Ashleigh Joesten, Kaitlin Johnson, Jessica Kelley, Marci Kiczan, Jennifer Knightly, Nicole Kustkova, Brittney Kyle, Jessica Lafave, Kathleen Lasinski, Marsha Lay, Richard Le Blanc, Kierstan Leather-Rice, Thomas Legacy, Erica Lepak-Delong, David Lingle, Devin Lloyd, Heather Long, Victoria Lyell, Cassandra Mack, Natasha Malone, Lakrista-Shonte Marshall, Shaday Martin, Nancy Martin-Kindler and Christopher Mcneill. (Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 658 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 657 TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference & Discovery Motion Hearing held on 10/28/2013 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer, 1-140 pages, Court Reporter: Jerald M. Meyers, 954-431-4757 / crjm@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Access Form)(amb)
November 1, 2013 Filing 656 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 655 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Emily Archer-Miller, Jamaal Jordan, Christopher Mills, Jacqueline Schmidt, Daniel Weiss, Warren Wells, Diana West, Brittney Westbrook, Lauren Wethers, Aleshia White, Kedaga White, Chris Wideman, Jacob Wilson, Zachary Wilson, John Windley, Cynthia Wiskus, Tanya Woods, Tres Wright, Michelle Wyatt and Sasha Zwetzig. (Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 655 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 654 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 653 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kelly Musshafen, Salvador Navarroa, Kathy New, Jessica Nowack, Lavina Oltman, Haley Orthel, Jasmine Ortiz, Mollie Owen, Shae Owens, Andrew Ozbun, Jennifer Page, Samuel Page, Brenda Paniagua, Patricia Parrino, Amy Parsons-Gentile, Joseph Peeler, Vanessa Penalba, Danielle Perlin, Krista Perry, Marissa Peters, Tommie Peterson, Nada Petrovic, Joshua Pickett, Melody Plastow, Rebecca Pollard, Destiny Portillo, Alex Potale, Phillip Poulakis, Anne Prather, Barbara Prescott, Clare Prichard, Mistie Priddy, Valerie Provine, Jennifer Puckett, David Ramos, Thomas Rapp, Helen Ravelo, Michelle Reeder, Rebecca Reidlinger, Heather Revels, Shelley Reynolds, Samantha Rhoads, Melinda Riff, Brezy Rivas, Nakima Rivas, Jeanine Rivituso, Latoshia Robinson, Matthew Rodiek, Kimberly Rodriguez, Shannon Roe, Lindsey Rollins, Franklin Rosario, Avery Roundtree, Enrico Roybal, Irma Rubio-Laughary, Jody Russell, Kirsten Ryel-Cohen, Chameira Salcedo, Ryan Salinas, Dawn Sapp, Lauren Scarpiello, Karen Schrager, Kristin Schramel, Megan Schroeder, Kristine Sepe, Zahirah Sharif, Dana Shea, Megan Short-Lee, Jewel Sidberry, Karan Sluhocki, Elisa Smul, Rene Sotuyo, Jarrod Squires, Gina Steele, Patrick Stevens, Syrina Stradley, Stephanie Sutherland, Brandie Szymanski, Kellinah Thomas, Kinyonna Tilmon, Jorge Tiscareno, Kristin Todd, Kevin Tracy, Marty Tracy, Lauren Turnquist, Ross Tweedie, Suzanne Upchurch, Bryan Valdez, Lizeth Valencia, Amber Van Houten, Clayton Vanderwal, Corey Vandeweg, Anne Vandongen, Michael Visconti, Drew Vogel, Courtney Vonderohe-Wollam and Stephanie Vore. (Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 653 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 652 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 651 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Brady Floyd, Laura Fortune, Joel Fralick Jr, Stephanie Frame, Marlena Frazier, Diego Garcia, Kerri Garcia, Andrew Gardineer, Laura Garza, Alicia Gasparini, Abby George, William Georgen, Leobardo Gonzalez, Scott Green, Audrey Guinn, Susan Hanger, Delayna Harden, Laura Harper, Roxanne Harris, Kareem Harrison, Joanna Hartzog, Lauren Heberer, Nancy Herrera, Chadwick Hill, Gabrielle Hills, Seth Hite, Angela Hodge, Jackie Holland, Nicole Holmquist, Jessica Horton, Kaitlyn Hudd, Savannah Huffman, Jason Hutches, Leo Hutton, Leah Jai, Elizabeth Jewell, Quentin Jiles, Merary Jimenez, Crystal Jimerson, Reginald Johnson, Yvette Johnson, Devon Jones, Jeffery Jones, Lisa Kalish, Mark Keffer, Kim Kepner, Caitlin Kingsley, Candace Klein, Elizabeth Kotul, Joanne Lacrete, Merritt Lambert, Becca Lanahan, Hope Lattof, Shelby Lawrence, Leticia Leigh, Jiran Lindsay, Brittany Lokar, Brannon Luscombe, Cacia Lyon, Matthew Maddox, Kimberly Maddox-Smith, Chad Mallard, Jessica Mantegna, Mariah Manuel, Jeniffer Marcus, Alexander Marley, Alexander Marshall, Melissa Martinez, Omar Martinez, Zachary Mayfield, Cindy Mcclimans, Alex Mccutcheon, Rhea Mcgibbon, Elizabeth Mcinnish, Kelly Mckay, Robin Mckinstry, Christina Mcmaster, Mark Mcmurdie, Melissa Meider, Stephanie Meier, Alissa Mercado, Jared Milaskey, Robert J. Miller, Karmen Miller-Mackey, Ashley Milliner, Katherine Mills, Rosario Miranda, Desmond Mitchell, Rhula Mitcheltree, Nicole Mobley, Kahlie Mooney, Jill Moore, Regis Morris and Jamie Munger-Trost. (Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 651 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 650 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 649 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Stephen Adams, Tissy Adwell, Aaron Albert, Nicholas Allen, Kris Allred, Amanda Angerbrandt, Fariba Arabghani, Miriam Arriaga, John Ashley, Peter Augustyniak, Tiffany Bachand, Melissa Baggett, Michelle Bane, Valencia Bankston, Austin Barker, Melinda Barnhart, James Barnwell, Humberto Barroso Jr, Kaitlin Beasley, Robbyn Beck, Mariah Becker, Laura Benavides, Derek Berkheiser, Christopher Bertrand, Amber Bettes, Brandi Bilderback, Mindy Bloomfield, Jordan Bonner, Suzanne Borchek Edwards, Tami Boys, Roderick Bradley, Chelsea Braeseker, Erin Brager, Jason Briggs, Linda Brooks, Matt Browder, Chandra Brown, Justin Bryant, Aleisha Bullock, Eric Burnett, Jared Burns-Martin, Aubrie Bynum, Katrice Byrd, Jorge Caceres, Jamie Carioggia, Troy Carpenter, Kasheim Castillo, Christine Castro, Emily Celichowski, Briana Chute, Dwight Clark, Tamara Clark, Michelle Clarke, Danielle Clifton, Sarah Cochran, Anda Coggins, Anthony Colavita, Sonya Collins, Krista Colon, Jeremiah Conley, Nataly Conners, Meghan Cook, Jessica Cooley, Shannon Corder, Joel Covey, Chelsea Crain, Shirley Crane, Michael Crockett, Michaela Crooke, Charles Cruz, Matthew Cuffe, Diana Curry, Lashanda Dailey, Michael De-Santiago, Alessandra Dejesus, Rashyda Dejesus, Chistrian Delgado, Allison Deruyter, Kris Dewer, Wanda Dixon, Monica Drexel, Sean Dreyer, Kathryn Dunn, Janice Ellixson, Michael Emerson, Andres Enriquez, Gabriela Escalante, Nicole Esdaile, Candy Evans, Jennifer Evans, Sara Ezinne-Ramsey, Jakki Fargnoli, Schaela Fleming, Ben Flowers and Tarvaris Flowers. (Marshall, J.)
November 1, 2013 Filing 649 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 30, 2013 Filing 648 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 647 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Virginia Herbert, Karah Hitchcock, Cristian Lozano, Erik Mckee, Stephen Mckee, Samantha Mckinney-Mech, Cynthia Meister, Chad Antonio Michaels, Linda Miller, Evelyn Moore-Breedy, Roman Moreno, John Morosky II, Joshua Moton, Mary Mudd, Emily Myers, Frank Nelldell, Ashley Nelson, Kelsie Norcross, Brittany Nordick, Ciara Norris, Gabrielle Nuriddin, Letitia Oakley, Tatashi Oates, Melody Olinger, Lauren Otto, Holly Palmer, Carlos Paz, Jorge Peraza, Alicia Perez, Michele Peterson, Theodore Prassinos, Robin Prather, Annique Pratt, Ruth Rinne, Ashley Ritzert, Janine Robinson, Diana Rodriguez, Mandy Rolstad, Torie Sandland, Kimberly Semetis, George Sherman, Lisa Skinner, Miranda Slobecheski, Tiffany Smith, Charles Snyder, Jeffrey Snyder, Jessica Spaid, Lacey Stefenel, Kimberli Stilson, Shawn Styles, Stephanie Tate, Bianca Tesauro, Justin Truesell, Tracey Waddy, Liz Whitt-Rich, Cody Wilcox, Laurie Wiley, Tiara Williams, Wendie Willner, Brian Woods and Aida Xhomara. (Marshall, J.)
October 30, 2013 Filing 647 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 30, 2013 Filing 646 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 645 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Regina Ani, Nick Asprooth, Christina Atkins, Bryan Barrar, Cannie Belgrave, Christina Benedetti, Michelle Bieren, Nichole Bondy, Myra Boykins, Antwennette Brady, Erika Brenkus, Lauren Bridges, Michelle Broeker, Jonathan Buchtel, Ian Byerly, Roxana Callejas, Rick Carl, Sarah Chandler, Shawna Chavez, Jaquiela Chester, Natasha Christian, Amanda Clark, Alia Clay, Carole Comeaux, Eriesha Coney, Laura Cooper, Elizabeth Coqueran, Leandra Cordova-Long, Jennifer Cortina, Daphne Crawford, Elise Cruz, Melissa Dahud, Amber Dalton, Jennifer Davies, Bronson Dickerson, Anna Donelson-Nuby, Romulo Dos Santos, Tiffini Dowdell, Ashton Dunn, El Lana Edwards, Shannan Eifort, Sasha Elliot, Chelsea Engel, Stefanie Erschen, Katie Fahrenbruch, Hazel Figueroa, Marta Fish, Elizabeth Flora, Nicole Flowerdew, Rodney Foxworth-Hill, Kimberly Frech, Pete Frech, Marnie Frechette, Racquel Fritz, Stephanie Gentry, Tamara George, Amber Golembiewski, Marlon Gutierrez, Judy Haynes-Wadley, Alicia Henderson, Tosha Henderson, Aaron Henry, Alexandra Hernandez, Krizia Hernandez-Rodriguez, Joshua Hinckley, Vincent Huynh, Amanda Hyde, Rachel Jacobs-Kellenberger, Alanda Johnson, Shirhonda Jones, Maritza Juarez, Carmen Karasch, Eenyie Ken-Piaro, Aaron Kennedy, Josh Klink, Kimberlee Kracke, Kayla Kreklau, Penny Kreklau, Deborah Krupp, Nathan Kunst, Veronique Larue-Shelly, Lauren Laws, Charles Lee, Silvia Lemos, Juan Lerma, Sabrina Levin, Nikisha Limbachia, Louis Lopez, Joann Lusetich, Justine Luzzi, Larissa Macchesney-Carmon, Jillian Malbrough, Jennifer Marcus, Jennifer Marozas-Boyce and Julia Martinez. (Marshall, J.)
October 30, 2013 Filing 645 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ORDER granting # 642 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 10/28/2013. (jsh)
October 28, 2013 Filing 643 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer: Scheduling Conference and Discovery Motions held on 10/28/2013. Oral Argument heard from both sides. Order to follow. (Digital 10:01:47-12:10:32 recalled 12:30:23-13:21:40.) (at)
October 28, 2013 Filing 641 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 640 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Huy Nguyen, Franklin Njogu, Kayla Norman, Alicia Ofelt, Lauri Paul, Gillian Peterson, Kristin Pett, Warren Phillips, Judith Pierce, Andrew Plotz, Danielle Rachal-Dormand, Zachary Repp, Herbert Rock, Jessica Rodriguez, Roxana Rojo-Cruz Gonzalez, Harrison Ross, Joshua Sachs, James Salisbury III, Daniel Santos, Daniela Saunders, Victoria Scheer-Mathers, Colin Schulte, Kari Seams, Kirk Searcy, Ashley Shaver, Thomas Snyder, Olga Solodkaya, Cassie Sweet, Brittany Sweetin-Hess, Jessa Taylor, Corie Tinnon, Kimberly Trepte, Eithen Valdes, Consuelo Valdez, Elizabeth Van Wormer, Joseph Vereen, Raveon Walker, Elizabeth Walters, Theresa Wehrman, Shannon Wieczorek, Christopher Wiley, Denise Williams, Kimberly Wright and Rachelle Young. (Marshall, J.)
October 28, 2013 Filing 640 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 28, 2013 Filing 639 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 638 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Joel Adame, Steven Adams, Deborah Allen, Brittany Andres-Cabuno, Khrister-Nikka Aquino, Dawn Arkinson, Ricardo Azambuja, Holly Bachmeier, Chris Barber, Gibioola Barero Gaitan, Leslie Barton, Joyce Bassel, James Bellman, Stacie Berberich, Agnes Bilecki, Justin Bollman, Travis Breese, Connie Bryant, Ester Cancho, Jay Cantor, Michael Castillo, Tiara Chambers, Melissa Chevres, Brittany Christopher, Amy Clemmer, Jhante Coburn, Kaden Coil, Elizabeth Conn, Jenifer Cooey, Lisa Cooper, Kristina Crossen, Sara Cummings, Collin Cushing, Cassie Dahlquist, Kimberly Daniels, Jamie Davidson, Falonn Delacruz, Ryan Dexter, Kimberly Duncan, Christina Eaton, Cynthia Esmundo, Breanna Fields, Ricardo Fierro, Lenard Fisher, Christopher Fleegle, Eric Floyhar, Ashley Frey, Michelle Fridley, Donald Garhart, Laura Geter, Lauder Gonzalez, Megan Gregory, Alexander Hahn, Erica Hamm, Frances Hargadon, Cody Hoke, Jefferson Horwath, Amy Howard, Samantha Hoyos, Jeniffer Huitron, Lawson Hyles, Katie Iannuzzi, Jackie Jackson, Latasha Jamison, Reanna Jefferson, Natalie Johnell, Greg Joseph, Lori Kearnes, Blake Kimzey, Courtney Kline, Amanda Lamb-Senecal, Tamsie Lamoreaux, Jared Lane, Tori Lawther, Adam Leonard, Connor Levy, Darren Levy, Alice Lively, Shaun Long, Talia Love, Eric Lover II, Shante Lyerly, Cynthia Mallas, Marci Mallis, Jacqueline Maloney, Shelly Marquis, Susan Mayer, Zachery Meade, Nicol Mellville, Julius Merchant IV, Lydia Montgomery, Tammy Mooney, Dion Moore, Ryan Moore, Ashley Multon, Marcus Mundy, Barbara Muscarella and Gabrielle Myers. (Marshall, J.)
October 28, 2013 Filing 638 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 25, 2013 Filing 642 Unopposed Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Conor Cowley. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 449. (ksa)
October 25, 2013 Filing 637 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 636 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kyle Adriance, Jennifer Bonesteel, Kaneisha Bragg, Kristy Brooks, Nancy Bryant, Lisa Bush, Sarah Busson-Engle, Nicole Cadena-Ruebenson, Victoria Carter, Olivia Castaneda, Stephanie Centeno, Rachael Cooper, Jasmine Crawford, Patricia Downing, Natalie Engle, Patricia Estey, Ana Estrada, Linda Everington, Christopher Iglehart, Tarik Jackson, Mohamad Jomaa, Tessa Kinser-Williams, Casey Kirkpatrick, Samantha Mckenzie, Adriana Medina, Donnel Mercer III, Robert Miller, Susan Navalle, Robin Noto, Michael Paluch, Linda Snyder, Amber Solberg, Jessica Taylor and Shani Varghese. (Marshall, J.)
October 25, 2013 Filing 636 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 25, 2013 Filing 635 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 634 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Macylane Becker, Kelly Fortel-Jaggie, Elizabeth Gonzalez, Jessica Thomas, Shatara Todd-Williamson, Kimberly Toyas, David Trollinger, Amanda Turowski, Severa Tuthill, Valentine Valdez, Heather Valvona, Karen Vannaman-Sorge, Claudia Velez, Natalia Velez, Sarah Vigliotti, Jezekiel Vitaliz, Elissa Walker, Essence Walker, Monique Washington, Jason Webb, Aaron Webster, Marvin Webster, Heather Whitaker, Joshua Whitaker, Britney White, Kimberley White, Nathandra White, Sheneisha White, Monique Wickenhagen, Gloria Williams, Elizabeth Wolfe, Michael Woods, Ashley Yancey-Carter, Sean Yost, Angela Zimmerman and Samuel Zozaya III. (Marshall, J.)
October 25, 2013 Filing 634 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 25, 2013 Filing 633 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 632 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Neysa Nerich, Starla Nevins, Sierra Niemann-Hoskins, Sarah Noel, William Norris, Jake Norwood, Britny Novacek, Luiz Nunes, Jhonnatan Ocampo, Kimberly Oldfield, Elizabeth Palazzolo, Michael Perkins, Danielle Pestka, Michael Pickett, Heather Pierce, Magen Pinette, Kendra Pittman, Clinton Plenert, Danielle Pomeroy, Nakieta Porter, Michca Provencio-Dailey, Krystle Putnam, Lisa Quenzler, Alexander Radusin, Michael Rand, Robert Randall, Andrew Ratliff, Brandi Reed, Jamie Reynolds, Shanna Rhoades, Bridget Rich, Calvin Richter, Jeremy Riley, Michelle Roche, Sade Rochester, Kimberly Rochette, Jennifer Rodriguez-Shoaf, Brandy Rogers, Tina Rosenberger, Sarah Rossey, Yasmine Ruffin, Grace Ruggiero-Burton, Michelle Dennielle Ruiz, Jeffrey Russell, Maryna Ryklina, Gino Saada, Nicole Sadowski-Shradnick, Ernesto Salazar, Connie Salimabadi, Elizabeth Sanborn, Stephanie Sanchez, Shaketa Sanders, Jennifer Sangrey, Cesar Santizo, Gabrielle Santora, Deborah Sauer, Karen Saunders, Kristi Scheible, Lacey Schneider, Michelle Schniepp, Frank Schoenfuss Jr, Gina Sciongay, Pamela Scott, Jeremy Scurlock, Jamie Seawright, Lydia Seekings, Jennifer Seevers, Jason Settlecowski, Alex Sforza, Yvonne Sheffield, Tiffany Shifflett, Matthew Shine, Christopher Shoaf, Alla Sibirtseva, Monica Sierra, Kevin Skinner, Melissa Small, Danielle Smallwood, Beverly Smith, Bonnie Smith, Dana Smith, Delores Smith, Leasha Smith, Curley Sneed, Debbie Sparks, Martin Spurlock, Jeffrey Stein, Sawanda Stephenson, Davaughn Stewert, Rebecca Strack, James Suer, Elizabeth Sweetman, Matthew Szaro, Kristen Tesoriero, Allen Thomas and Maria Thomas. (Marshall, J.)
October 25, 2013 Filing 632 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 25, 2013 Filing 631 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 628 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Michael Hogwood, Richard Holland, Ashley Holmes, Jason Horsley, Alicia Hubmaster, Elizabeth Hughes, Amanda Hutchinson, Thomas Irwin, Beatriz Izquierdo, Mary Jacobs, Jason Jarrell, Naomi Johnson, Stephen Jones, Therese Jones, Briana Jourgensen, Brandon Julien, Hanna Kahhat, Alex Kahn, Tammy Kapla, Megan Kendall, Erika King, Randy Kirk, Dorothy Kline, Valbona Kokoshi, Josh Kolarski, Ryan Kutzner, Adrian Lamb, Candice Lamb, Erin Lancaster, Benjamin Landes, Rachel Lashinsky, Felicia Lastra, Deborah Lauer, Sherry Laughlin, Angela Lauro, Katherine Lebard, Carl Lee, Dustin Lemasters, Stephanie Leonard, Benjamin Lerma, Carol Lewis, Darlene Limberis, Ebonie Linder-Johnson, Jaime Linney, Jimmie Little, Kathryn Lloyd, Mary Lomeli, Lorraine Loren, Deanna Lorenzo, Andrea Love-Sumbry, Brandy Lowery, Alisia Lowry-Engelhard, Ranada Lucas-Hankins, Anastasia Lucero-Appelt, Nikolas Lunsford, Holly Lykens, Joseph Lynch, Natalie Lynch, Clorista Lytle, Jackilyn Lytle-Biggs, Melissa Lytton, Kellie Macdonald-Evoy, Dianne Macmorris-Coffin, Desiree Malave, Ashley Malcomson, Anna Maldonado, Wilberto Maldonado, Ginger Marks, Samantha Marx, Nicole Massey, Nicholas Matheu, Genevieve Mattson, Cara Maxwell, Megan Mc Intosh, Alithia Mcdaniel, Christopher Mcintosh, Christine Mcintyre, Kelly Mcmahon, Carolyn Mcnabb, Anna Mekeel, Courtney Mierez, Tara Milano-Wickers, Annie Miller, Jill Miller, Jamal Mills, Santerio Mitchell, Darlene Montani, Damon Moore, Todd Moore, Lia Morell, Eneida Moreno, Gail Morris, Beverly Morton, Mary Moss and Lekendra Myles. (Marshall, J.)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER denying without prejudice # 244 Defendants' Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Complete Written Responses to Their First Requests for Production and to Produce All Responsive Documents in Proper Form. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 10/25/2013. (kas)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 629 ORDER denying without prejudice # 243 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and for Related Relief. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 10/25/2013. (kas)
October 25, 2013 Filing 628 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 25, 2013 Filing 627 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 624 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): John Dell, Ann Marie Depierro-Olson, Lauren Devries, Adam Dimuzio, Brittany Dishman, Kristin Donnelly, Katie Dostal, Brianna Dotson, Matthew Douglas, Brittany Draper-Thorpe, Deborah Drescher, Beckie Dryer, Ashley Dull, Lara Dye, Tara Dymond, Kyera Edmondson, Matthew Edwards, Kristine Eisler, Patryce Ely, Susan Engel, Patricia Erdman, Michael Fagan, Olivia Farmer-Farris, Kelly Fasig, Jessica Feliciano, Karen Ferguson, Andrew Fisher, Josue Flanquin, Julie Flick, Erika Flores, Fabian Flores, Michelle Fontinell, Bethany Forsythe, Ryon Frank, Elke Froehlich, Jacob Fry, Miranda Fuentes, Robin Fuller, Zantavius Fuller, Tiara Gaither, Guillermo Galvan, Taylor Gammon, Danielle Garcia, Kennie Garcia, Kayla Gardner, Emily Gaudier, Lisa Gaume, Justin Gensimore, Brandy Gilbo, Ryan Gilley, Sasha Gipson, Cedric Gladney, Barbara Glenn, Crystal Goering, Adam Goodvin, Omar Goswami, Cameron Grant, Kellie Grant, Mary Gregg, Thomas Grigsby, Amanda Grisenti, Kandi Gross, Kelly Gross, Teri Gugliero, Timothy Gunnell, Samantha Gust, Kelly Guthrie, Daric Gutierrez, Chelsea Haines-Lebron, Lindsay Halko, Kara Hamilton-Jones, Autumn Hammer, Erica Hancock, Virginia Hanna, Courtney Harms, Tatiana Harper, Donshae Harris, Edmond Harrison III, David Hart, Desna Hart, Mark Hayden, Donna Hayes, Taylor Hayes, Alexis Haywood, Rachel Head, Erin Heaney-Adkins, Lee Hefter, Chad Heilemn, Henry Henson, Stacie Hentschel, David Hernandez, Jessica Hernandez, Jillian Hill, Tona Hill, Matthew Hislop, Lauren Hodge, Nicholas Hodson and Justin Hoffman. (Marshall, J.)
October 25, 2013 Filing 626 Defendant's AMENDED Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Produce Documents Responsive to Defendants' Second Set of Requests for Production and to Answer Defendants' Second Set of Interrogatories by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 11/12/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Lehet Decl., # 2 Affidavit Exhibits to Lehet Decl.)(Reed, Aaron) Modified relief and text on 10/28/2013 (yha).
October 25, 2013 Filing 625 Defendant's AMENDED Motion for Protective Order in Connection with Plaintiffs' First SEt of Requests for Production, Second Set of Requests for Production, First Set of Interrogatories, and Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition Notice by Capital Grille Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 11/12/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Lehet Decl., # 2 Affidavit Exhibits to Lehet Decl., # 3 Affidavit McCarty Decl.)(Reed, Aaron) Modified relief and text on 10/28/2013 (yha).
October 25, 2013 Filing 624 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 24, 2013 Filing 623 Renewed MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants and for Related Relief by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 11/12/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q)(Lichter, David)
October 24, 2013 Filing 622 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 621 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kimberly Abner, Heather Adair, Carlos Aguilar, Cordero Agwuh, Leonela Alberto, Shelly Alexander, Henderson Alleyne, Lauren Ames, Danika Andrews, Annie Aranda, Laura Ashley, Cami Asman, Peter Averill, Judith Avrilien, Brenda Babcock, Halley Badeaux, Jessica Baisa, Edward Ball, Kimberly Bamba, Gabrielle Bastion, Jesse Bastion, Larry Bates, Anne Battaglia, Dwayne Bayne, April Bean, Rebecca Behr, Evan Belote, Eddie Bennett, Kristina Berrig, Korinda Berry, Devaughn Best, Gerard Bingham II, Delmarcus Boddie, Tristessa Boggus, Danielle Bookter, Tara Bowers, Beth Bowser, Deanna Boyer, Seth Brahin, Anna Brandi-Hutton, April Brandin, Myrtle Brosious, Ashley Brown, Kalee Brown, Melani Brown, Roslynn Brown, Swannice Brown, William Bryant, Elmo Buchanan, Michelle Buhrandt, Jessica Bundy-Vangel, Crystal Burgess, Tiffany Burke, Philip Burnett, Marie Burns, Elizabeth Burrill, Ashley Butler, Brian Buzard, Sanja Calic, Lisa Campbell, Lisa Campbell, Nathan Campbell, Michael Campinell, Ericka Cannon, Joshua Carothers, Andres Carrion, Grant Casler, Terry Cave, Suzane Chaves, Robert Christensen, Nadia Christenson, Richard Clark, Kheshon Cochran, Victoria Cochrane, Gail Coker, Belinda Coleman, Shannon Coleman, Brooke Collins-Schnorr, Victoria Cortez, Viridiana Coss Yleon, Robert Cotter, Frances Couch, Brandon Cox, Jaleesa Cox, Jennifer Cox, William Croissant, Taylor Cronin, Julia Cruz, Winfred Curtis II, Robbie Cushing, Danilo Dacanay, Nicole Dascoli, Amy Davis, Jessica Davis, Jeremy Dayton, Robert Deaton, Kiersten Degraff and Luis Dejesus. (Marshall, J.)
October 24, 2013 Filing 621 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 23, 2013 Filing 620 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 619 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Tracy Murray, Darryl Myers, Angela Myers, Elia Najera, Lyndsey Nelson, Michael Nelson, Kathryn Neville, Barbara Newhouse, Deborah Nunnally, Carissa Owens, Kathy Oxner, Aaron Padgett, Edwin Pangilinan, Susan Pensack-Skae, Chantelle Perez, Angela Perrone, Angela Peska-Blankenship, Sharon Petrick, Solyana Phillips, Ryan Pickett, Ryan Picone, Serina Pinon, Oscar Price, Christopher Pyawasit, Brandy Queen, Brittney Ramsey, Jennifer Raposo, Alisha Reams-Smallwood, Dexter Reaves, Stephanie Richards, Matthew Roberts, Ebonny Robinson, Kelly Robinson, Suwanant Roehrich, Mallory Rossi, Nicole Ruiz, Melissa Sabo, Vanessa Sanchez, Carolyn Schaeffer, Elizabeth Schlueter, Sandy Scruggs, Samantha Semenkow, Ariel Sequeira, Lori Shadduck, Philip Sheward, Ralana Shrader, Desiree Siebert, Donny Simpson, Roy Smith, Lauren Smith-Steffy, Robertta Soares, Denise Squires, David Steele, Melissa Steinke, James Stevenson, Casandra Story, Wesley Swartout, Amanda Sweed-Marionneaux, Victoria Tasker, Julie Taverna, William Thoma, Shavomeishia Thompson, Shelley Thompson, Amber Tippy, Brandon Todd, Geoffrey Travis, Christopher Trimble, Alexis Vanderberg, Michael Venters, James Walker III, Jennifer Walton, Jacqueline Watkins, Kelly Weiland, Chris Wells, Jessica Wells, Stacey Westfahl, Garth Whitaker, Sandra White, Latoya Whitfield, Amy Wilkins, Jennifer Willette, Shawn Willis, Carol Wilson, Angela Wilson, Angel Wimperis, Stephanie Wright, Valarie Williams, Ashley Newman-Warren, Michael Parker, Michael Johnson, Rachel Johnson, Patrick Jackson Sr and Trisha Anway. (Marshall, J.)
October 23, 2013 Filing 619 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 23, 2013 Filing 618 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 617 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Mark Gilbert, Shari Gilley, Pepa Gocheva, David Gonzalez, Christina Gorchos, Connie Gotway, Zach Grabot, Erin Greeley, Amanda Grennell-Thomas, Chelsea Griffith, Toby Grimm, Josie Grogg, Refugio Guevera, Howard Dewayne Gunn, Latoya Gwess-Coats, Samantha Hallberg-Whippo, Robin Hamilton, Jeffrey Hamilton, Lyndsie Harris, Kevin Harvey, Marsha Haughton, Sara Hayes, Brandon Haynes, Jon-Michael Helms, Roxanne Henderson, Derrick Henning, Deanna Hernandez, Shawn Hettesheimer, Dan Heyen, Lauren Hicks, James Hicks, John Hicks, Jennifer Holborn, Mark Holden, Jerry Hopper Jr, Lori Howard, Lamont Howard, Kara Howard, R Hubbell, Tosha Huffman, Kenneth Hurt, Michael A. James, Gina Jenkins, Abraham Jimenez, Patrick Johnson, Sandra Johnston, Rashawna Jones, Emily Joswiak, Evelyn Kallas, Austin Kasper, Sivan Katz, Iryna Kavalskaya, Sagan King, Samuel Kistner, Grace Knight, Amy Krugler, Ivonne Kruse, Kord Laughlin, Katharine Law, Ji Lee, Kerry Littreal, Karenann Lollis, Jaimie Long, Monica Lopez, Carol Love, Jena Luttrell, Kyle Mackay, Jeffrey Madsen, Steven Maffucci, Jennifer Malaga, Alex Malkin, Tasha Mallory, Whitney Mann, Melanie Martin, Kristi Martin, Larry Martin, Erica Martinez, Deirdre Max Varliere, Dayvea Mays, Ashly Mccants, Brittney Mcdowell Chance, Kirsten Mcelmurry, Brian Mclanahan, Kylie Mclane, Christen Mcnew, Holly Mcphail, Aneeta Merritt, Kenneth Miles, April Minette, Lindsey Mirmina, Cheryl Monette, Jeremy Montemayor, Bathundria Morris, Dekescia Moss, Katherine Mueller and Ramon Munoz. (Marshall, J.)
October 23, 2013 Filing 617 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 23, 2013 Filing 616 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 615 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Cassandra Addington, Anthony Aguilar, Deborah Ajagbe, Luis Alcocer, Jered Almeida, Mary Archuleta, Becky Arguello-Morales, Andrea Arvin, Cameron Ashe, Teresa Asher, Ashley Aughton, Rachel Axelrod, Diane Bailey, Angel Banda, Nadine Bannard, Roger Beahm III, William Beard, Colin Beauregard, Beth Beckett, Daytina Begay, Heather Bell, Curtis Bendler, Thomas Bias, Kristina Bird, Howard Bivens Jr, Jessica Blaszak, Ladank Boley, Amanda Borders, Jacqui Boswell, Brent Boyd, Jennifer Brabham, Anne Bradshaw, Kevin Breeding, Candice Brierley, Stacie Brodsky, Jody Brooks, Briana Bulinski, Rachel Burdette, Asheena Burke, Crystal-Lynn Byrd, Lena Byrd, Raul Cabral, Princess Caldwell-Warren, Erin Campbell, Geraldine Cancel, David Capone, Jenneffer Carrillo, Rebecca Cason, Alicia Caver, Beatrice Chavez, Melissa Chinnici, Jolee Chioe, Alexandria Chowdhury, Ashley Cicoria, Danielle Clarke, Hailey Cochran-Avila, Melonie Coley, Brian Colon, Pamela Conrey, Nickolas Contreras, Amber Cornell, Charles Crnkovic III, Karen Crouch, Ryan Cruice, Laura Dalpini, Brandi Danford, Lindsay Danoian, Racheal Davis, Angelo Davis, Alex Deatrick, Carly Demoss, Donna Dodge, Misty Dolla Laboy, Charles Douglas, Dastassia Dowdell-Bailey, Cahla Downs, Jesse Duke, Tanya Duren, Sandra Eaglin, Andrew Eickhof, Angela Eskew, Alejandro Esparza, Manolo Espinoza, Jeff Farmer, Jennifer Field, Sherri Finkbeiner, Nina Forst, Barry Fraley, Amanda Frische, Alexis Gant, Elisa Garcia, Michael Geiger, Rachel Gershon, Jason Ghan and Kelsy Gibbs. (Marshall, J.)
October 23, 2013 Filing 615 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 22, 2013 Filing 614 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 613 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Karen Olinger, Lenisha Oliver, Tonya Opalka, Kimberly Oravec, Brandon Orgill, Jennifer Ortega, Cynthia Otis, Jesse Otts, Sarah Ines Overeen, James Page, Leslie Palmer, Krischiann Paschal, Toni Pasion, Josh Passiotti, Christine Pawelak, Michael Pechacek, Jenniferlee Pelech, Jessica Penny, Regina Perez, Nicole Perrot, Briana Perry, Karen Phillips, Jamaine Pike, Amanda Pilkington, Stanley Pinkney, Jr., Mekesha Pittman, Phoebe Plummer-Bener, Jennifer Plunk-Turner, David Poe, Mycha Poling-Kolar, Christen Powell, Melissa Poynter, Heather Prince, Andrea Pun, Samantha Puruczky, Precious Putnam, Jennifer Quattrone, Rachel Ques, Adam Rafferty, Karen Rans, Marcie Ray, Samantha Ray-Matarosk-Komar, Kenneth Redelman, Pearl Reed, Trenda Renegar, Keelan Rich, Althea Rios, Juan Rivera, Angel Rivere-Diaz, Renee Roberts, Jamie Roman, Elizabeth Rosenberg-Marleot, Brandon Ross, Joe Rossi, Donalda Rowe, Justin Ruiz, Caleb Ryan, Sharika Ryan, Leon Sam, Lucero Sanchez, Randall Sansom, Lisa Schaefer, Kim Schnell, Dawn Schwartz, Steven Scofield, Brianne Scott, Martina Scott, Cheyenne Scott, Kassandra Seylar, Hilary Shaffer, Phyllis Shankle, Nicole Sharp, Teresa Sharp-Miller, Benjamin Sherman, Ravshan Shukurov, Borislava Shull, Joey Simmons, Danielle Simons, Michael Simonson, Shaila Sisler, Carole Slayter, Johnell Smalls, Beth Smith, Jaci Smith, Tasha Smith, Jaida Smith, Chrystle Snider-Fleck, Lakisha Snipes-Bowne, James Spears, Sean Spence, Ashley Stabile and Vanessa Stephens. (Lichter, David)
October 22, 2013 Filing 613 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 22, 2013 Filing 612 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 611 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Shane Kennedy, Sylvia Killie-Peters, Debbie Kimball, Brandi Kimmett, Mandi Kimsey, Desiree Kindley-Walczak, Crystal King, Sabrina King, Franklin Kirk, Jane Klungvedt, Cameron Knaebel, Jeffrey Kneipp, Christine Koehler, Jaime Korwin, Margaret Kramer, Brittany Kramer, Tracee Kranen, Michelle Krause, Thomas Kruth, Joseph Laboy, Megan Lane, John Larrahona, Denise Lavoie, Kenneth Lear, Christopher Lee, Debray Legrand, Michael Leslie, Jameson Lewis, Aleshia Lewis, Brandan Lewis, Jesse Lippi, Steven Livasy, Jose Lopez, III, Bihla Lopezhaya, Jason Lorenzen, Brandi Lorrey, Brandy Lott, Eddie Lovato, Floyd Lucas, Michael Luciani, Zachary Luhr, Andrea Luttrell-Hendricks, Tracy Lyle, Timothy Lynch, Rebecca Mallonee, Greg Maloney, Gillian Marchan, Jeremy Martin, Johnnie Martin, Rebecca Maston, Crystal Maxwell-Simmons, Cheba Mboma, Lisa McKenna, Charis McArthur-Barrins, Carren McCoy, Lakeidah McCurry, Lindsey McDowell, Amanda McFarland, Kelly McIntyre, Joshua McLain, Dan McNally, Teresa Medlen, Timothy Mendoza, Valika Memendez, Amanda Menzel, Kayla Messer, Richard Mick, Cheryl Miller, Melinda Miller, Florence Ann Millhouse, Micah Millis, Kelly Mirra, Sandra Mitchell, Pasha Mitchell, Chaustine Mokosak, Sonya Montcastle, Leah Moore-Agee, Tianne Morre, Amanda Morrison, Jacob Morrow, Nicholas Mueller, Lisa Muir, Stephanie Mullinux, Shannon Murphy, Cherish Murphy, Kateri Murray-Solberg, Colleen Murtagh, David Nathanson, Lucas Nelson, Reskey Neth, Christine Nguyen, Michelle Nguyen, Nancy Norman, Ryan Norris, Courtney Odonnell and Andrew Okabe. (Lichter, David)
October 22, 2013 Filing 611 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 22, 2013 Filing 610 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 609 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Victoria Gatica, Jeremy Gaunt, Crystal Gay-Binnell, Brett Geoffrey, Liza George, Kelley Gerritsen, Matthew Gettinger, Anya Gill, Brad Gilmore, Sheila Givens, Chris Golden, Maryann Golubski, Rafael Gomez, Wendy Gordon, Kwmane Gorins, Oscar Granados, Sheila Graves, Carol Gray, Jessica Gray, Joshua Green, Ryan Gregg, Timothy Griffin, Almi Grishaj, Tamara Guillen, Stephanie Guillen, Nicholas Gullo, Andrew Gunia, Jason Gunnoe, Hugo Gutierrez, Vanessa Gutierrez, Maggie Guy, Tierra Gwaltney, Kayla Hass, Rachael Hagan, Michael Hamilton, Jeff Hamilton, Keith Hamilton, Leslie Harbin, Lauren Hatchcock, Tara Hawkins, Katherine Hayes, Mary A Hayes, Nathan Head, John Healey, Andrew Herendeen, Brittany Herman, Alessandro Hernandez, Francis Herrera, Jacinta Herrera, Melissa Hetrick, Deavera Hicks, Rebecca Hill, Robert Hilton, Elizabeth Hipol, Emily Holbrook, Grace Holmes, Rahnesha Holmes, Melissa Holmes, Brian Homer, Michael Howlett, Joseph Hroch, Janiece Hubbard, Raisa Hudak, Brian Humphrey, Johnston Hurd, Joseph Huskey, Brittany Husnander, Affiong Hyacinthe, Monique Iverson, Jasmine Jacks, Lesley Jackson, Kristen Jackson, Heidi Jackson, Brian Jackson, Lawrence Jackson, Beverly Jacobson, Michael James, Brian Janz, Luc Jean-Philippe, Tracie Johnson, Jerry Johnson, James Johnson, Marcus Johnson, Derrick Jones, Linda Jones, Brandy Jones, Kristi Jones, Shonda Jones, Melinda Jordan, Seygbai Kai, Brian Kalar, Anna Karcher, Kimberly Keenan and Penelope Kellogg. (Lichter, David)
October 22, 2013 Filing 609 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 22, 2013 Filing 608 Renewed MOTION to Compel Production of ESI by Defendant's and for Related Relief by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 11/8/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I)(Marshall, J.)
October 22, 2013 Filing 607 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 606 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Peter Steszewski, Rhonda Stevens-Kerns, Shayne Storey, Janice Stretz, Karen Sybert, Adam Tarvin, Larissa Taylor, Candace Taylor, Jonathan Taylor, Daria Terrell, Kara Thomas, Jacob Thompson, Heidi Tiihonen, Temika Tinson, Skai Tower, Jena Townes, Sean Townsend, Kristin Trammell, Nghi Tran, Justine Traver, Migdalia Vaca-Torres, Guillermo Valencia, Rachel Valint, Veronica Vanlandingham, Roberto Vasquez, Adrian Vasquez, Jose Velazquez, Erika Vickers, Bambi Vigil, Virginia Villar Paredes, Amanda Viney, Julie Wall, Jody Wallene, Katherine Walsh, Brandy Warner, Deborah Watts, Maegan Webb, Chris Weister, Nequitta Wesley, Tracy West, Kenya Weston-Beale, Jessica Wheeler, Ann White, Anna Wiesenberg, Ishimaur Wilkes, Delaney Wilkinson, Conan Williams, Cassidy Williams, Devon Williams, Jade Wilson, Brett Windecker, Sascha Winter, Candace Wood, Cheryl Woods, Deneen Wortham, Sadot Yescas, Christine York, Ariel Yost, Cassie Young, Briana Young, Roel Zamora, Susan Zeitler and Malory Zertche. (Marshall, J.)
October 22, 2013 Filing 606 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 22, 2013 Filing 605 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 604 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kadie Rowe, Cienna Sajady, Collin Schlicht, Laura Schlobach-Pomponio, Melanie Sexton, Joshua Sexton, Tyler Shuman, Sally Stebbins, Rachel Steenbergen-Jones, Mary Takemura, Tim Tanner, Kyle Teevens, Heather Tolson, Christopher Toolis, Joseph Tucker, Nick Varesi, Jonathan Vavala, Elyse Wachendorf, Donna Wafford, Caleb Webb, Jaime Weidner, Michael Westcott, Nicole White and Mustafa Yasin. (Marshall, J.)
October 22, 2013 Filing 604 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 22, 2013 Filing 603 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 600 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Chris Clarner, Drisel Clatterbuck, Gregory Cohen, Colleen Colbert, Stephanie Cole, Ashley Cole, Ashley Cole, Ladonna Coley, Orathai Compton, Rachel Conti-Fiedler, Christina Conway, Dana Cook, Deborah Cooney, Darrie Cooper, Katrina Cooper, Hailey Cooper-Kislinger, Terianne Cox, Louise Cox, Martin Cox, Brennan Cox, Leigh Crawford, Chelsea Crespo-Primeau, Kasie Cripe, Ann Crouch, Shontalee Cruz, Jarel Culley, Jason Cumming, Terrell Curry, Marc Daigneault, Nicole Dardano, Adrienne Darden, Elana Davis, Ovida Davis, Martin De La Torre, Kimberly Degrandpre-Tweet, Eric Deleon, Kaitlin Delk, Cory Despain, Omayra Di Russo, Molly Dietz, Thomas Docter, Melissa Dolan, Casron Donnard, Cory Doucette, Melissa Dowgal, Jeffrey Downs, Melody Draeger, Robin Drake Wilson, Daphne Draughon, Tina Drobilek, Cassie Dube-Fostun, Trisha Duey, Kathryn Duffy, Alison Duggan, Jenny Duong, Whitney Duran, Steven Durso, Syble Edgett, Tracey Edmonds, Brendon Edwards, Brittany Edwards, Jaclyn Eichas-Ralbovsky, Molly Elliott, Anais Elliott, Toby Elliott, Jesse Ells, Victoria Elmer, Adrienne Englund, Anne Erdelen, Susana Esquivel, Citlally Esquivel, Julia Luz Estrada, Keenan Eudy, Osayuwame Eweka, Jason Farrell, Maria Fatemi-Wittenberger, Carmen Fernandez, Reinaldo Fernandez, Alison Finch, Amin Finch, Bryan Fishburne, Rory Fleck, Sabrina Ford, Alyssa Forde, Melanie Forster-Wood, Anne Fowler, Ronald Frates, Jennifer Fratto, Kimberly Fryling, Elizabeth Fuentes, James Gabenski, Jessie Gallet, Jessica Gamel, Kaylie Gannon, Priscyla Garcia, Christopher Garcia, Elsa Garcia and Jennifer Garcowski. (Lichter, David)
October 22, 2013 Filing 602 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 601 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Dianna Allen, Sarah Amundsen, Rebekah Aungst, Erin Baker, Selamawit Baraki, Daniel Bazan, Laura Benoit, April Bensinger, Laura Berger, Debbie Berry, Katherine Boes-Chojnacki, Brittany Butler, Chadd Carr, Lisa Cash-Anderson, Keung Chan, Joseph Chojnacki, Brittany Christopherson, Stephanie Clemons, Loretta Coaty, Catherine Cosentino, Cherrie Cox, Monique Cross, Nicole Cruz, Carolina Cuellar, Erica Czerniejewski, Danielle Dagit, Caitlin Davis, Elizabeth Davis-Lench, Chelsea Deaver, Amanda Dennler, Kristi Desantis, Jessica Diaz, Teresa Dobson, Ashley Durham, Danielle Elkin, Cristina Fallen, Omar Feliciano, Steven Felton, Nadine Ferrin, Sam Francis, Roel Garza Jr, Allison Gill, Yamil Girald, Jaime Green, Tony Grisham, Cally Guyer, Ashley Harper-Rix, Mary E Higgs, Michelle Hill, Elizabeth Holl, April Howerton, Yotam Israeli, Donna Chamanne Jackson, Miguel Jimenez, Mario Juarez, Nickolas Kallas, Stephanie Kallner, Kelly King, Patti Larson-Rios, Alicia Love, Taissa Lytchenko, Kasha Malone, Melissa Mann, Heather Marr, Kassandra Martinez, April Matthews, Jasmine Mayes, William McDougall, Meighan Mcdonough, Jodi Mcmurtry, Jessica Meyer-Gilroy, Amanda Moore-Hall, Alma Morgan, Andrea Morris, Dekoven Myers Jr, Matthew Myhan, Justin Nakamura, Kylie Norwood, Kathryn Oberbroeckling, Patrick Okeeffe, Nina Ortore, Johnathan Padilla, Christopher Palmer, Brandon Peir, Beckie Pelton, Benjamin Perez, Christine Phillips-Wilson, Stephen Pierce, Megan Prestebak, Dalila Ramee, Amanda Ransford, Kevin Reeves, Jennifer Rischling, Julia Roberto and Lavonne Roberts. (Marshall, J.)
October 22, 2013 Filing 601 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 22, 2013 Filing 600 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 22, 2013 Filing 599 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 598 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Tasha Butler, David Cabanas, Michelle Conoyer, Daniel Davis, Demetrius Dixon, Kimberly Engelman, Eric Fajardo, Kristie Falls, John Fincannon, Katie Fry, Brittney General, Elisha Gibson, Horacio Gonzalez, Margaret Katherine Heath, Evan Holmes, Kydriana Hunter, Barry Johnson, Tara Jones Remley, Rachel Karshner, Stephanie Knight, Lauren Lavine, Jordan Long, Alexander Marin, Che Mays, Ryan Neuendorff, Mitchell Niemi, Margaret Provenzano, Caleb Ritter, Stephanie Russell, Jennifer Scott, Craig Sherman, Shelley Short, Jennifer Siegel, Brock Snider, Jeffrey Tinsley, Jesse Wakefield, Farrel Zotto-Davis, Tanisha Hamlett, Chelsea Perkins, Tiffany Johnson, Matthew Williams, Elizabeth Keller, Paul Rodriguez, Benett Coker, Ashleigh Prather and Kevin Dignan. (Marshall, J.)
October 22, 2013 Filing 598 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 22, 2013 Filing 597 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 596 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rachell Acevedo, Lindsay Adams, Mindy Aiken, Brandie Albert, Elke Alexander, Jennifer Allard, Taisha Allen, Laura Allen, Renae Anderson, Lauren Anderson, Michele Anderson, Darlene Antal, Leonard Aragon, Jessica Arceo, Gerardo Arguello, J Sacramento Arvizu, Angel Assi, Kalani Austin, Erin Austin, Carrie Baca-Gjevre, India Bailey, Jessica Baker, Amanda Ball, Adrian Banda, Lidia Banda, Joni Baptiste, Anthony Barker, Jonathan Barnes, Kimberly Barton, Maria Basilio, Randy Bates, Sarah Bauer, Carlos Bautista, Ann Bazemore, Kevin Beakes, Kelli Becki, Kayla Beckner Post, Evan Bekasi, Loren Belton, Rebecca Berry, Herbert Bethay, Carl Bienz, Timothy Billings, Michel Bishop, June Blackwell, Lynne Blankenship, Dya Bono, Donna Bonomi, Andrea Bosley, Timothy Boston, Jeffery Bowen, Angela Boyd, Calvin Boyd, Anna Boyd, Jullian Breyley, Justin Bridges, Danielle Briscoe, Petersen Brody, Maurice Brooks, Paula Brown, Joantae Brown, Keenan Browne, Greg Bryant, Blair Brzana, Susan Bulova, Erick Burrel, Sandra Bush, Lauren Bush-Simmons, Katie Bykowski, Nora Cacho, Tanisha Cain, Brian Calhoun, Crystal Calvert-Bienz, Terry Cameron, Lamorvielle Campbell, Candice Canalda, Freddie Cannon Jr, Amanda Caputo, Phyliss Carbone, Chad Carnes, Saira Carpenter, Charles Carrocetto, Amy Carson, James Casey, Tia Ceesay, Derek Chambers, Christina Chancey, Wilburn Chandler, Mikaela Chandler, Isaiah Chavan, Daniel Chavez, Sarah Cheers, Randy Cheng, Jasmine Christian, Heather Cladas-Wyatt and 96. Karminque Clark. (Lichter, David)
October 22, 2013 Filing 596 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 21, 2013 Filing 595 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 594 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Nicole Stiles, Betty Stratton Cuddeford, Angela Stults, Joshua Swanson, Stephen Sweet, Alicia Swinton, Antoine Taliaferro, Ariana Taylor, Kenna Teiberis, Ariel Tester-Starke, Tah-Nee Thompson, Nicole Thompson, James Thompson, Laurie Tintle, Cristal Torres, Anthony Tran, Megan Trevino, Ricardo Turbay, Deborah Turner, Pamela Vangyija, Glenn Vazquez, Vanessa Vega, Rafael Ventura, Gertrude Villaverde, Anissa Walker, Valerie Walker, Kadiann Walker, Tiffany Wallace, Jennifer Warner, Jeffery Weber, Jennifer Weister, Steve Welch, Talisha Wesley, Eva Whorley, Tyronda Wilkerson, Amy Williams, Jeremiah Willies, Tara Wilson, Nanci Wilt, Maria Wolfe, Mistilynn Woolsey, Thomas Wooten, Herman Wrenn, Mary Yarborough and Brandelyn Zuber. (Marshall, J.)
October 21, 2013 Filing 594 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 21, 2013 Filing 593 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 592 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Amanda Newman, Peter Nguyen, Anna Nguyenvo, Asmar Nixon, Kellie Noble-Anys, Mikala Norgaard, Lindsey Norris, Jonathan Oberbeck, Cynthia Oconnell, Sam Oechslin, Jillian Ortiz, Karen Osullivan, Eunice Padilla, Jessica Palmer, Rebbeca Palmer, Jessica Paul, Rachael Peck, Josh Pendley, Roxanne Perez, Bonnie Phifer, Christopher Phillips, Lacie Pidgeon, Cherryl Pierce, Eileen Pierson, Wendy Pippin, Courtney Poe, Kristen Poe, Miguel Ponguta, Taylor Porter, Linda Porter, Kimberly Powell, Jill Predragovich-Stromeyer, Adam Prenatt, Erica Price, Krista Pronge, Fernanda Pulliam, Nicole Puntini, Megan Raile, Cristina Ramos, Eric Ramsey, Jaclyn Randolph, Mary Rapp, Lindsay Rash, Amanda Rempe, Monica Rhoades, Rebecca Rhodes-Weinreich, Nikki Ricci, John Rice, Whitney Rice, Trena Riggs, Laura Rivera, Julia Rivers, Domenica Rodriguez, Sean Rowser, Melissa Roy, Whitney Rozzano, Sharon Rud, Susan Runnels, Jessica Rusk, Kristin Russell, Melanie Russell, Angela Russell, Brisa Sainz Rodriguez, Geanita Saley, Jeana Santos, Krystal Sauve, Lacey Schichi, Mona Schmersal Wirebaugh, Eric Schmidt, Gary Schneider, Jennifer Schroader, Scott Schwartz, Keli Scott, Amanda Seibert, Jennie Shaffer Friedel, Randall Sharp, Deanna Shelton, Jacob Shepard, Allison Siglock, Dale Silver, Amber Simmers, Rochelle Simpson, Sarah Skie, James Smith, Georgette Smith, Tyrone Smith, Shawn Smith, Sarina Stacho, Sable Stallworth, Craig Stephan, Bradly Stephens, Amanda Stevens, Crystal Stewart and Garrett Stewart. (Marshall, J.)
October 21, 2013 Filing 592 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 21, 2013 Filing 591 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 590 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kimberly Foster-Chatman, Jena Fox, Joseph Frimpong, Seth Gallagher, Carlos Garcia, Maria Garin, Tiffany Gillette, Noland Gipe, Anthony Gomez, Joelle Gonzales, Keith Grace, Edward Hajek, Shawna Hansberry, Nicholas Hansen, Theresa Helseth, Tammera Henderson, Angela Hick, Kenneth Hicks, Mark Hill, Toy Himes, Sheila Hodge, Leshawna Howard, Twila Howard, Dacey Hughes, Rodney Hughley, James Hultberg, Tina Hulvey-Kendall, Richard Hunter, Nicholos Hurlock, Sheree Ingelido-Key, Desmond Ishola, Brandy Jacoby, Valerie Jacyno, Shannon Jennings, Courtney Jensen, Rachael Jeter, Alden Johnson, Joey Johnson, Pamela Jolly, Melissa Jones, Heather Junkins-Bartol, James Kaiser, Keena Kang, Danica Kelley, Robert Kerns, Kaleb Keter, Amanda Kirby, Jamie Kirk, Levi Kohavi, Audrey Lamb, Alex Latorre, Cameron Leach, Ileen Leau, Melissa Leverknight, Lakeysha Levert, Deborah Levi, Anthony Lewis, Jeffrey Liskey, Jay Lofland, Donald Long, Jacqueline Loonsfoot, Jejorne Lowe, Steven Lowrance, Amy Luitze, Katie Maggio, Jenifer Maher, Tiffani Markey, Wendy Masur, Patricia Matos, Shamica Mcallister, Lindsey Mccrady, Samuel Mcfarlane, Jessica Mcghee, Stephanie Mcintosh, Andrew Mcintyre, Alma Janie Mcwhirter, Kristina Meiners, Melody Miller, Yailen Miranda, Kelly Mohr, Nicole Montanaro, Emmett Moore, Maria Morgan, Jamie Morgan Csezak, Tasha Moseley, Ariel Mosley, Giveus Mudau, Shane Muller, Ashley Mullins, Samuel Murray, Brittanie Myers and William Neely. (Marshall, J.)
October 21, 2013 Filing 590 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 21, 2013 Filing 589 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 588 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Angel Abrahamson, Courtney Achimon, Louis Adam, Jennifer Agro, William Aichholz, Robin Akers, Kazi Akhter, Jerad Akin, Sennie Allen, Waikiki Alston, Rachelle Arnold, Kathryne Bailey, Rachel Bailey, Ammber Bancroft, Kristin Bane Huntley, Christie Banyas, Heather Barber, Christopher Baroulette, Nichole Batts Benson, Kristine Beattie, Laine Benthall, Jacob Beuchert, Elton Binkley, Jody Blake, Krista Bordeaux-Graham Payton, Paul Boren, Lauren Bourgeois, Sheri Bradshaw, Kim Brechler, Chris Browning, Brenda Buentello, Angela Burciaga-Rogers, Brooke Burden-Joyce, Anissa Burgess, Shavonne Burks, Brandon Burleson, Alyssa Burney, Elizabeth Burnfield, Deborah Burnham, Edward Burnside, Kelly Burr, Karissa Byrd, Jessica Callahan, Heather Campbell, Cameron Carletti, Pollyanna Carrico, Rodrigo Cesar, Jamie Chambliss, Candace Chapman, Carlos Chatman, Steve Chuchvara, Aubrey Chynoweth Evans, Lauren Ciccarella, Sean Ciccione, Shaletha Clair, Craig Clark, David Clay, Vanessa Cobb, Nicholas Cocchetto, Jessica Cohen, Courtney Coleman, Tabitha Conner, Lyndon Copeland, Tiffany Cordova, Sean Craven, Bart Croker, Brandon Cuffe, Craig Curry II, Isis Dailey Pounds, David Dausch, Eric Davis, Alyssa Deandrade, Brock Deland, Isha Desbin, Lori Desmarteau, Velentino Diaz, Emily Dibb, Pamela Duncan, Kazi Duza, Evelyn Ellefsen, Cathy Elliott, Arnuld Encinia, Stacy Ennis, Jakob Enzminger, Miyoko Esco, Amy Euler, Alyssa Evans, Zachary Evans, Julita Everly Moorman, Ashley Falco, Dustin Farberg, Aimee Feagin, Olga Feige, Holly Felmlee, Tabbatha Felton, Sean Fitzsimons, Allison Flippin and Tracy Fonville. (Marshall, J.)
October 21, 2013 Filing 588 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 21, 2013 Filing 587 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 586 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Hadassah Smuda, Emily Snyder, Cameron Snyder-Mitchell, Katie Suggs, Holly Sullivan, Allen Taylor, Joseph Urbina, Arlab Veracruz, Diana Villegas, Malissa Walker, William Walker, Carolyn Washington, Michael Weber, Kimberly Wehrenberg, Keith Weller, Bryan Williams, Terri Wright, Erin Zimmer, Dominique Williams, London Miller and Ryan Wright. (Marshall, J.)
October 21, 2013 Filing 586 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 21, 2013 Filing 585 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 584 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Matthew Allgood, Michael Angelo Jr, Ashley Archuleta, Jessica Atristain, Breana Baker, Deanna Beddingfield, Tara Binetti, Michael Bloom, Justine Booker, Farren Brenner, Stacey Brin, Kevin Burks, Heather Cain, Gregory Callaway, Michael Carter, Terra Christ, Sierra Claybaker, Hailey Cochran, Dominique Crumidy, Bruce Custer, Laura Elaine Dabney, Chad D'aigle, Sarah Daniel, Debora Dasilva, Elizabeth Daubenmire, Kathryn Davies, Heather Davies, Christopher Decker, Christina Delaney, Michael Delgado, William Diggs, Samantha Duffy, Spencer Ely, Daniel Epstein, Demian Finkle, Jacinda Fleming, Gina Flores, Stephanie Freedman, Stacey Garland, Whitney Gast, Jonathan Guarracino, Rabije Hajdini, Nykeara Hakeem, Katherine Haley, Cole Hancock, Christine Hayden, Petra Hernandez, Erin Hobson Jessup, Tara Hoffmaster, Michelle Holden, Brittany Jordan, Kolandria Joyner, William Kloppe, Carla Kurczewski, Sulema Limon, Monica Lindsay, Kathryn Lindsey, Olanrewaju Litan, Amanda Loconsole, Brittany Lynch, Michael Marciante, Christina Maretich, Diana Marquez, Amber Mcbride, Melodie Mccracken, Kristina Mcmichael, Brooke Miller, Alyxandria Montoya, Tabitha Moreno, Yashika Morris, Julia Mosley, Jeffrey Nicholson, Lauren Ogrosky, Janina O'neil, Stefanie Osborn, Henry Oviedo, Anthony Palombo, James Peluso, Leticia Penha, Jordan Pickens, Roshonda Poole, Shekenya Power, Maygin Rittinger, Kyle Rodewald, Megan Rojas, Tavaris Rowry, Dorothy Sanders, Deena Schwoeppe, Jason Scott, Briana Sementilli, Patrick Shamy, Elizabeth Shaw, Dennis Shockley, Walter Simmons, Amanda Small and Phillip Smith. (Marshall, J.)
October 21, 2013 Filing 584 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 19, 2013 Filing 583 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 582 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Tiana Hawkins, Matthew Heck, Kathleen Hlinka, Ceana Hoburn, Kelly Hoit, Pamela Holland-Knowles, Jamie Hoy, Nicholas Humphrey, Aretha Huskey, Nicholas Jacinto, Aaron Jackson, Mandi Jackson, Lisa Jarvis, Kevin Jones, Shawn Jones, Ashley Kares, Brianna Kehoe Chandler, Brenda Kelehar, Russell Kemp, Nicholas Kirby, Victoria Klauer, Adam Klorer, Alla Kovalenko, Barbara Lance, Lisa Lanning, Jeffrey Latimore, Sophia Lawson, Melinda Leach, Nathan Leazer, Allen Lee, Barett Lee, Brianna Lennert-Morales, Meilin Leong, Ana Leos, Katie Licharowicz-Taylor, Michael Lipka, Michelle Liposky, Shelby Lloyd, Ashley Loree, Shawnda Lucas, Destiny Lutz, Troy Maertz, Jennifer Maes, Miranda Malbrough, Stephanie Malbrough-Parisi, Jennifer Maples, Anthony Margo, Kendra Marshall, Pamela Martin, Chanda Martin, Robert Mattscheck, Megan Mbadugha, Shanice Mcclendon, Rapheal Mccoy, Aaron Mccracken, Sherry Mccune, Samantha Mendlen, Christen Miles, Katherine Miller, Samantha Minarcik, Jasmine Mitchell, Christina Mitchell, Joy Monroe, Roberta Moore, Whitney Moore, Andrea Morales, Jaclyn Morehead, Hendrix Moss, Marie-Claire Muhimpundu, Natthanicha Napier-Chimphanao, Jessica Negron, Zoe Newland, Jennifer Noel, Lindsey Noyes, Omotayo Olowolayemo, Kendra Omark, Charles Onwuegbusi, Deborah Orlandi, Lauren Oswalt, Renee Owens, Jason Paquette, Brittany Parbs, Charlene Perez, Lydia Pinaire, Ronald Pittman, Abbigale Porter, Jamilah Presley, Lori Prince, Krista Proffit, Michelle Quarles, Jennifer Ramirez and Shae Reid. (Marshall, J.)
October 19, 2013 Filing 582 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 18, 2013 Filing 581 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 580 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rachel Allison, Francisco Anguiano, Deanna Arnold Amos, Bertha Arroyo, Aida Askarynasab, Lindsay Audin, Jacklyn Bajc, Holly Baker, Rosemary Banos, Jeffery Bartlett, Crystal Becker, Josh Belbot, Christie Blair, Jessica Blais, Christine Blier Charleson, Jamie Boinski, Britni Bolden, Shavontia Bolden, Jennifer Bononno, Chris Borger, Randall Bracewell, Adrienne Braudis, Joseph Brooks, Kathryn Brown, Shuron Brown, Carmen Burkhead, Paula Burns, Carmon Burton, Jason Bussiere, Stephanie Calhoun, Desiree Carr, Robert Carter, Alejandra Casillas, Nakia Celistan, Diane Chapman, Angela Childress, Jenna Cizmar, Caprisa Clowney, Joshua Clowney, Danielle Condon, Kathy Conner, Sarah Cook, Shelley Cottrill, Sarah Cowart, Robert Cowels, Pansy Cress, Jessica Croft, Andre Cunningham, Crystal Curto, Danyell Dagostino, Michael D'amico, Annamarie Deloyd-Corfey, Brittany Deplitch, Courtney Desmarais, Meghan Devlin, Daniel Diliberto, Janice Dillard, Thomas Dilley, Aaron Dixon, Shelby Dolan, Ashley Downing, Cheryl Drangstveit, Denise Eadie, Cortets Edwards, Laurie Egglezos, Cassandra Egler Ridge, Tiffany Enbody, Jarrod Estabrooks, Wendy Evans, Wendi Fernandez-Solomon, Martin Fishkind, Morgan Forbes, Wendy Fore-Bowman, Taylor Formico, Tabitha Fox, Lori Gallman, Ashley Gamble, Exor Garcia, Aislinn Gibson, Jessica Gibson, Jana Gibson, Jacob Gill, Tonia Gilmore, Zack Goldrick, Nicole Gomes, Alec Gonzalez, Marin Grover, Ashley Guest, Carolyn Guth-Hudspeth, Renee Hackett, Eric Halprin, Erica Hanks, Kimberly Hardiman, Brett Harmeling, Michael Harris, Antione Harris and Autumn Hart. (Marshall, J.)
October 18, 2013 Filing 580 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 18, 2013 Filing 579 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 578 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Stephen Rice, Jason Rich, Meagan Richard, Thomas Richardson, Robin Riel-Hayward, Michael Rini, Sylvia Ritter, Lucia Roberts, Dena Roberts, Melissa Roe, Nicole Rozier, Sean Rudge, Victoria Rugen, Ronald Russeau, Kristina Saeger, Erica Sams, Joshua Sawaya, Lindsey Schultz, Andrea Schyljuk, Denise Scraggs, Travis Shane, Charles Shepardson, Nataliya Shkinder, Ashley Shumpert, John Simpson, Kira Singh, Stephanie Smith, Rastafari Smith, Miranda Smith, Heather Smith, Joshua Snyder, Meghan Sorrentino, Susan Southern, Kayla Speakman, Adam Steglich, Chris Suarez, Adele Takesky-Fogle, Summer Tate, Nathaniel Taylor, Julianne Taylor, Lisa Teece, Dan Thompson, Teresa Timmerman, Matthew Tomasone, Maxi Torrey, April Trevino, Samantha Tucker, Samantha Turman-Baker, Saturn Turner-Moriarty, Ashley Uhlman, Kimberly Vail, Kevin Vanry, Britney Vela, Mike Ventrello, Marisa Villescas, Sarah Waltz, Nicholas Waltz, Lisa Wang, Sky Webb, Kristen Wellman, Christopher Whitney, Megan Williams, Marla Williams, Darin Williams, Seth Williams, Melinda Wilson, Stromi Winters, Melissa Wood, Sherri Wyatt-Welch, Arthur Yanez, Darcy Yliniemi, Julianne Zuniga and Kristin Frisby. (Lichter, David)
October 18, 2013 Filing 578 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 17, 2013 Filing 577 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 576 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Sara Landy, John Lane, Brittany Lebo, Doenika Lilienthal, Yolanda Lopez, Teresa Lund, Jamia Madden, Debra Mancini, Gary Marble, Anita Marguriet, Fransisco Marquez, Caroline Marra, Brian Martin, Collyn Mashek, Danielle Matthews, Brianne Mcadam, Robert Mcbride, Charee Mccain, Alissa Merchie, Kelly Mesaros, Allan Meza, Delvin Miller, Kristi Miller-Pencille, Aaron Mills, Michael Molina, Joseph Molina, Jameka Monroe, Crystal Montgomery, Jalyn Moore, Dolly Mott, Megan Moyer, Catherine Murphy, Derrick Myers, Jaclyn Natale, Spencer Nelson, Justin Newark, Racheall Newman, Kamesha Newton, Kristen Nunnally, Jessica O Hern, Lindsey Oevermeyer, Lindsay Okenka, Araceli Olivas, Nathan Olsen, Sarah Olson, Miranda Olson, Jennifer Osborne, Jodi Osborne, Vanessa Osorio, Alyssa Palmer, Sarah Parke-Haidle, Pamela Parra, Anastasia Pena, Travis Pencille, Maria Perez, Jorge Perez, Shallece Peters, Cindy Pierce, Lisa Pierce, Brittney Ping, Rachida Porter, Nicole Potucek, Dante Raines, Tammy Reynolds, Tajoun Richardson, Matthew Richerson, Morgan Roach, Desiree Rosa, Jason Rosenthal, Whitney Ruffin, David Salinas, July Sanchez-Sadowski, Ladarrius Sanders, Scott Sanders, Nicole Sargent, Jason Scheffer, Michael Schoiber, Stephanie Schumann, Leeann Seger-Steele, Lindsey Semonski, John Servey, Trinity Sharpe, Casey Shelton, William Shrader, Kasandra Simon, Ryan Sked, Shawnice Smith, Deborah Solen, John Soto, Crystal Spear, Jack Stanton, Jenna Steen, Theresa Stewart, Shelby Strickland, Sandra Tatum-Durso, Lakitha Thomas and Jasmin Torres. (Lichter, David)
October 17, 2013 Filing 576 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 17, 2013 Filing 575 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 573 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Lanston Fennell, Danielle Gartley-San Miguel, Adam Shields, Donnis Moore, Sara Emerling, Ashley Mason, Tracy Williams, Gail Davis, Linda Williams, Michael Williams, Gina Roberts, Danielle Morgan, Jennifer Martin, Kimberly Johnson, Michael Jones, Brandi Rogers, William White, Tiffany Jones, Kimberly Anderson, Tammy Greer, Michael Hill, Michael Parker, Melissa Allen, Jasmine Clark, Jennifer Kuhn, Jeremy Cook, Crystal Carter, Courtney Craft, Brandon Davis, Jennifer Gonzalez, Danielle Walker, Jennifer Edwards, Bethany Gray, Jessica Hall, Stephanie Roberts, Jamie Ross, Jessica Morgan, Jake Richmond, Eric Sorensen, Rebecca Smith, Jessica Smith, Rebecca Phillips, Michael Myers, Ryan Miller, Christopher Scott, Erin Smith, Valerie Jones, Jessica Jones, Jennifer Jones, Amy Harris, Amy Wilson, Shana Smith, Shannon Smith, Amanda Thompson, Jeff Turner, Michelle Smith, Jessica Collins, Heather Silva, Jennifer Poe, Lisa Myers, Samantha Johnson, Sarah Tucker, Russell Smith, Jessica Smith, Ashley Smith, Brandon Davis, Michelle Smith, Danielle Walker, Amanda Smith, Benjamin Smith, Brandi Smith, Mary Smith, Kimberly Weaver, Jeremy Cook, Latonya Davis, Amber Hall, Alex Johnson, Kimberly Johnson, Jennifer Moore, Tina Miller, Sophia Smith, Lauren Smith, Jonathan Smith, Jennifer Smith, Jessica Bailey, Monica Anderson, Kimberly Johnson, Cynthia Jackson, Jennifer Hernandez, Tammy Thomas, Jonathan Wilson, Ashley Moore, Sarah Morris, Josh White, Ashley Wilson, Nicole Johnson, Julie Smith, James Berry, Kevin Kelly and Jose Balandrano. (Marshall, J.)
October 17, 2013 Filing 574 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 570 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Carolyn Alexander, Jarrett Anderson, Chelsie Apker, Jennifer Avery, Caio Azevedo, Angelique Badgett, Elizabeth Barriento, Alan Bermudez, Tanisha Billy, Anne Blossick, Victor Bohlman, Shanda Bowser, Corey Brooks, Nelson Brooks, Jr., Lewis Brown, Carla Brown, Glenda Bunner, Dianne Burton, Messina Byers, Tammy Calabrese, Colleen Campbell, Joanne Cardin, Sabrina Carmichael, Jennifer Case, Sarah Cazares, Kiersten Carminara, Dena Chappell, Christopher Charizopoulos, Allison Clark, Lakisha Coleman, Kayla Connor, Teresa Cook, Hurann Cooper, Zundria Crawford, Tara Crozier-Rodda, Tim Cunningham, Felicia Cusic, Melissa Davis, Hashim Davis, Alan Delmastro, Jacqueline Devries, Jena Dines, Nicole Dixon, Megan Donahue-Owens, Jessie Dupre, Christiane Ebert, Heather Eicher, Lauren Elder, Michael Ellard, Christy Embry-Corbett, John Ennis, Courtney Everett, Kathleen Farah, April Farris, Garrett Foster, Tameka Fox, Reisha Fregoe, Brandy Fritz, Heather Gagnon, Erika Garcia, Aglacia Gardner, Kwame Gardour, Genevieve Gibson, Christa Gilmore, Justin Godfrey, Kristin Gorsuch, Blair Gosche, Michaela Greene, Marsha Griego, Tiffany Grimm, Aaron Grunwald, Franklin Hafner, Matthew Hanline, Colin Hayes, Carrie Hensley, Joan Hess, Amelia Hirrschoff, Marianne Holzkamper, Kenneth Hunter, Jr., Mary Hurd, Mallory Jaremko, Enyinnah Johnson, Jessica Johnson, Dana Johnson, Corey Johnson, Jennifer Johnson, Benjamin Jordan, Gabriel Kaminsky, Jamie Kammer, Jacquelyn Kearney, Anthony Kelly, Cindy Kendra, Stan Kenny, Stacey Kenny, Elizabeth Kern, Barbara Knecht, Kimberly Krause and Cymande Lackland. (Lichter, David)
October 17, 2013 Filing 573 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 17, 2013 Filing 572 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 571 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Christopher Trani, Brett Urban, Yamaris Vaillant, Marci Valenzuala, Mary Wallace, Kara Walz, Dorotheia Webb, Angela Weber, Christina Weldy, Lauren Welker, Amanda Widman, Randi Williams, Holly Williams, Raysean Williams, Kodiak Winesette, Niesha Winfield, Jon Wisch, Shamya Wright, Latasha Wright, Abel Zamora, Abby Zehe, Tiffanie Zingrebe, Michael Jones, Lauren Walker-Akins, Alejandra Lamardo, Ronika Hickey, John Conley, Melody Easterling, Jennifer Field, Mike Simms, Jody Walls, Brittney Brown, Jennifer Call, Donielle Sandoval, James Mallen, Ryan Parker Minor, Miriam Alger, Crystal Hitchcock, Karen Witham, David Brad Smith, Tracy Snead and Susan Bodros. (Marshall, J.)
October 17, 2013 Filing 571 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 17, 2013 Filing 570 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 17, 2013 Filing 569 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 568 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jessica Rama, Joshua Raymond, Anthony Re, Miguel Rico, Lilia Robles, Jose Rodriguez, Janine Ryans, Denise Salinas, Christine Sarmiento, Jessica Sawders, Mallory Schweitzer, Richard Scott, Alicia Shaver, Joe Shaver Jr, Stephanie Sherman, Susan Shulthise, Michelle Solomon, Sondra Stacey, Stacy Stallworth, Tricia Stedner, Christen Stout, John Strickland, Rayna Tam, Kylie Jo Taylor, Leeann Thacker, Sau Thong, Tonya Todd, Samantha Upshaw-Maxey, Robert Van Orden, Benjamin VanWart, Franky Vassor, Shaena Waasdorp, Kathryn Wallis-Bradshaw, Shindena Widby, Sean Woodward, Rosa Wright and Tracy Wyman. (Marshall, J.)
October 17, 2013 Filing 568 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 17, 2013 Filing 567 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 566 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Felix Amato, Terrell Anderson, Michelle Armenteros, Charmaine Banayat, Micheal Barbera, Bryan Barker, Sarah Barker, Marie Becker, Andrea Belasco, Alex Binek, Sarah Blackerby, William Blair, Justin Boswell, Renita Boylan, Daniel Brake Jr, Ashley Brannan, Heather Brooks, Nicole Buffone, Anna Cantore, Jessica Cantway, Deanna Celaya, Lindsey Check, Michael Chuba, Katherine Clark, Grant Cloud, Justin Crowell, Heather Cupp, Paul Cupp, Reva Dallo, Timothy Davis, Dessiree DeLaFe, Erin Doherty, Briana Domke, Ellen Eckert, Nivian Edwards, Robert Elkins, Lilia Espinoza, Nancy Freligh, Amanda Gonzalez, Patricia Gorbet, Alyssa Gouvea, David Guyton II, Taisha Harewood, Carmen Harper, Vida Harper, Christopher Hartley, Samantha Harvey, James Hawley, Marena Heine, Cassandra Hickson, Luke Holt, Tobias Hubbard, Bernard Hudgins, Dawn Hudspeth, Brenda Ingram, Erica Jackson, Rebecca Jackson, Michelle Jerve, Katie Johnson, Felina Johnson, Shannon Jonas, Kathy Jones, Carly Kemper, Katie Kilmartin, Kyle King, Jeremy Kovacs, Jennifer Kullen, Casie Langlois, Buffy Larson, Maggie Lavelle, Taneshia Lawrence, Leila Lent, Megan Lilja, Jacquelyn Lopez, Minden Luke, Beth Lutz, Pamela Marcellino, Kyle Margentina, Samantha Mayle, Sara Mcguire, Marquita Mcswain, Julia Messercola, Noelle Miller, Danielle Miller, Sunny Millett-Collins, Ashlee Mingo, Keri Missigman, Walter Glenn Mueller, Amanda Murphy, Adena Newbery, Kaitlyn Odonnell, Alicia Pallotta, Brittany Patterson, Julie Patterson, David Petersen, Sarah Pleshakov and Amber Poma. (Marshall, J.)
October 17, 2013 Filing 566 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 16, 2013 Filing 565 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 564 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Elizabeth Csiki, Cody Daigle, Mirella Demma, Lucy Diaz, Jean Eckert, Karen Foote, Kevin Foster, Joyce Frommert, Dawit Gebrekidan, Amory Gerhard, Jacqueline Hock-Yoder, Ruby Hollie, Glenda Jones, Lashonda Kennedy, Kristopher Kozusko, Maureen Larocca, Raquel Ledford, Melanie Matta, Karen Mayer, Kent Mckee, Todd Mclean, Angela Perales, Jennifer Perez, Rita Reasy, Dalia Roldan-Corral, Joseph Schmitt, Lorraine Seekford, Jaime Solorzano, Marcia Spayer, Cara Sweet, Megan Thrift, Devin Wiggins, Nancy Wingate, Rashad Boone, Amanda Garabato-Ruiz, Kofi Jenkins, Jacilyn Pierce, Pamela Primaky, Scotty Stout, Lawrence Shoot, Shameika Taylor, Tyler Williams, Andrew Annello, Ayanna Casey, Nicolas Duff, Zachary Husek, Lizzett Landa, Marina Melachrinos, Kristin Poore, Johnathan Rodriguez, Justine Schember, Annette White, Jolynn Yurcho, Nelly Bueso, Melanie Cook, Danielle Dowling, Lori Flowers, Ryan Leger, Sumer Leger, Katrina Mccartney, Krystal Mitchell, Bridget Prenatt, Michael Thibedeau, Matthew Tyska, Lorena Williams, Sergio Lopez, Amber Hayes, Suzanne Hager, Alexandra Jones, Danielle Mccalla, Kelly Davis, Amanda Sheron, Benjamin Chilmonik and Jordan Julian. (Marshall, J.)
October 16, 2013 Filing 564 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 16, 2013 Filing 563 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 562 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Shannon Johnson, Sarah Falkner, Stacey Frisco, Christopher Camino, Armando Cardenas, Rhonda Carter-Brigman, Miguel Casillas, Stacey Cherney, Luis Chillogalli, Tsedonia Abay, Christopher Addison, Rene Arroyo, Renee Balqar, Mallorie Barshaw, Ashlen Battistelli, Cindy Bekkach, Gloria Sippel, Sherman Sleuth, Betty Springer, Kristina Teague, Troy Tenace Jr, Roman Trejo, Hassan Tyler, Amy Washington, Carlos Pizarro, Erika Purdy, Lucy Ramirez, Joseph Russo-Tiesse Jr, Richard Sackse, Susette Sengilla-Enright, John Hall, Tionda Harrison-Hendrix, Leann Havlik, Colby Hawley, Cathy Hillyer, Micholyn Holmes, Kimberly Holt, James Hurtt, Pierre Julien Iteprat, Sogand Alamdar, Levi Almonte, Sonia Avera, Lisa Baker, Vanessa Barrera, Lourdes Boehm, Ayashia Duckworth, Jenny Ewalt, Jacqueline Ferguson, Ashdon Floyd, Cruz A Gatica, Kaleb Gibson, Thomasene Goldman, Chris Medley, Roberto Mendoza, Jacob Newell, Adali Nolasco-Barrera, Rachel Oquinn, Linda Khamsone, Kristy Kohler, John Lampkin, Sarah Law, Amanda Marchese, Jillian Mcconnaughy, Aimee Campbell, Roxanne Centera, Dasira Cook-Jackson, Margarita Degollado-Flores, Jayne Adams, Jessica Cupp, Kari Curotto, Miroslava Dimitrova, Alisha Gallardo, Danielle Hicks, Meagan Holcomb, Aj Kendall, Christina Knouse, Shayna Nesbit, Michael Ogden, Noel Pangilinan, Rebecca Rainville, Sandra Salazar-Diaz, Andrew Sparks, Stephanie Wimberly, Joel Studer, Jason Turner, Xiaoyu Wang, Krystal Williams, Kappotolia Anderson, Christy Dufrene, Philinese Fairley, Chonsydne Fields, Erik Hooper, Adrian Lopez, Tiffany Alberty, Ameara Alleyne, Hector Aracena, Yassir Bennani, Maryn Bradbury, Nicole Clark and Carole Cremeans. (Marshall, J.)
October 16, 2013 Filing 562 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 16, 2013 Filing 561 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 560 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Tran Ly, Elliot Maldonado, Alissa Abitante, Rita Adamo, Kaleigh Anderson-Brown, Heather Anderson, Lauren Aucoin, Stephanie Barba, Xavier Barba, Brittany Barnett, Terri Blume, Corey Bowling, Tanya Cagle, Victoria Carter- Seymore, Ihisha Cherenfant, Tyler Clark, Katoya Collier, Dion Fulwood, Kelsey Galloway, Tracey Golden, Grisel Guijarro, Suzanne Hager, Emily Hall, Amy Hargrove, Johannah Harman, James Helmig, Cindy Henry, Tamario Holland, Malaivan Hollingsworth, Falon Ortman-Palmer, Heather Pappas, John Persons, Janet Phillips, Porcha Pigadiotis, Ashley Purvis, Iris Reynoso, Jacqueline Rivera, Gissel Rodriguez, Odis Ross, Erika Ruiz, Gerarda Santiago, Bonnie Schrum, Gina Seery, Sara Senn, Melissa Sewell, Elizabeth Seymour, Stephen Short, Gennifer Silva, Dionne Simpson, Jarett Snyder, Nicole Spahn, Margaret Steger, Elena Stock, Cameron Traeger, Terrie Trettenero, Gena Tucker, Maria Tugultschinow, Tiffany Ward, Pam Willingham, Sharde Wilson, Zach Yanoff, Cody Bonham, Jamie Bratcher, Joshua Buck, Rebecca Croghan, Robin Demore, Andrea Ekis, Lori Kline, Carol Koester, Laurie Kubelka, Edward Laing, Christy Laroche, Melissa Lauer, Regina Givi, Kristal Gocmez, Anita Gonzalez, Lindsy Harris, Crystal Hayden, Cristan Haynes, Gelinda Heller, Janice Helm, Gesenia Llorentis, Katie Maccallum, Melissa Mccauley, Tonya Mckee, Brian Mckinnell, Shanna Meller, Charter Moore, Blake Moya, Kaitlyn Nikodem, Dahlia Oliver, Julia Oliver, Katja Hodnett, Alicia Hoefler, Zanita Holliman, Randa Hunt, Kathleen Hurban, Kelton Ireland, Sheila Jeffcoat-Murray and Lisa Jett. (Marshall, J.)
October 16, 2013 Filing 560 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 16, 2013 Filing 559 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 558 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Anny Le, Katherine Lobb, Uriel Lopez, Ashley Lour, Anthony Lowe, Jaime Magana, Evette Marroquin, Anna Lauren Masangcay, Brooke Mastroluca-Birdsall, Lisa Matolka, Keren Mendez, Martin Mendoza, Selena Mercer, Katie Miller, Byron Mills, Michael Morgan, Andrea Niotta, Erika Nunez, Stacie Nelson, Aaron Ozment, Gary Pochette, Kristal Poore, Terri Riker, Gilbert Samaniego, Tricia Santiago, Scott Schoonover, Robert Schramm, Tamara Schwab, Malinda Seamons, Laura Staunton, Gwendolyn Sterling, Michelle Stoelton, Shayna Strumph, Chelsea Tutko, Jayna Trokey, Angela Tortorice, Maricarmen Torres, Melissa Thompson, Carla Teixeira, Jessica Duke, Julie Ehrhart, Diane Ferraro, Stephen Forbes, Mark Franklin, Juan Frias, Scorpio Martinez, Roberto Mendiola, Michael Milito, Lawrence Mouton, Brittany Pike, Amanda Pleshakov, Denise Prawl-Harrison, Latisha Revell, Kimberly Rickert, Brooke Riley, Michael Rocha, Jazmin Rodriguez, Tammy Rouse-Yoder, Sonya Smith, John Stanley, Nicole Staton, Ruth Stefanidis, Deneca Stewart, Na Toya Stone, Karma Stroup, Heather Theard, Ethan Truitt, Carol Valentine, Mina Vargas, Monica Vega, Lynda Victor, Jessica Viramontez, Harvey Whatley, Brittany Word, Janae Worden-Jackson, Jason Crawford, Camerlee Crokaerts, Brittany Davis-Somes, Dawn Davis, Shannon Debauch, Benette Devera, Mary Kay Dicecca, Allyson Rush, Angelito Salazar, Valerie Serna, Amanda Shepherd, Kelly Shipley, Diego Ochoa, Carlos Olvera, Rosario Palacios, Holly Petta, Stacey James, Michelle Kandt, Kimberly Kelly, Kaitlyn Klinzing, Allecia Kruser, Maria Lane, Donald Lee, Les Leonard and Courtney Lockley. (Marshall, J.)
October 16, 2013 Filing 558 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 16, 2013 Filing 557 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 556 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Magdalena Hernandez-Rangel, Matt Callaghan, Michael Alford, Michelle Albertson, Nathalie Ramirez, Nicole Boleman, Nicole Rode, Paul Amos, Porfirio Anaya, Randy Bauer, Robyn Jones, Ryan Poore, Sabrina Mccollum, Sade Jordan, Seth Hefner, Shawn Rogers, Sherrise Brandenburg, Sonya Adams, Sora Matsunaga, Sreikompearck Keat, Stacy Firks, Stephanie Duffy, Stephanie Puente, Stephanie Shaw, Tauhid Price, Terri Smith, Tich Chadyiwa, Tierra Moore, Tina Charles, Todd Lewis, Tomiko Han-Suhara, Zulma Hertzog, Michele Soniat, Chrissy Spadaro, Megan Stowell, Joshua Szpyrka, Vicki Tryon, Zivorad Trbojevic, John Wolf, Lori Winkelholz, Thema Wilson, Christine Wills, Megan Watkins, Tara Yuengert, Samantha Zalewski, Earthalene Williams, Mary Denise Weber, Bertune Vireus, Karen Vansaghi, Michael Allen, Shannon Allen, Jade Antonelli, Phyllis Antonelli, Elia Apodaca, Shyllorie Ard, Adrienne Ash, Rachel Banks, Stephanie Bauer, Patricia Blankenburg, Vickie Bonior, Causaundra Brooks, Anita Brown, Anita Brown, Tabatha Bundesen, Ruby Carter, Jorge Cavazos, Stephanie Celtrick, Juan Chambers, Alexis Charles, Erin Emanuel, Melonie Elder, Diane Dripps, Karlyn Dozier, Nicholas Donchess, Diego Deleon, Patrick Debose, Brenda Davis, Slavica Cvijanovic, Keisha Esteph, Charnette Estes, Jody Evans, Erica Fairfield, Hannah Fisher-Arlinghaus, Ilene Flores, Margie Flynn, Rita Foster, Lynne Galante, Anthony Goin, Joseph Gonzales, Giomara Gonzalez, Kee'shaun Haymon, Cassie Hewitt, Kimberly Hirsch, Tiffany Ireland, Jennifer James, Sheri Jayne, William Jennings, Sandra Kelly, Terra Klein and Donna Lamb. (Marshall, J.)
October 16, 2013 Filing 556 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 16, 2013 Filing 555 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 554 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Amy Starkey Branch, Angelina Barnes, Kelli Brooks, Robert Gilstrap, Michael Fortner, Alexander Rogers, Anthony Mosley, Barbie Carrico, Brittney Wilhite, Cathy West, Dennisha Toliver, Julie Villanveva-Kor, Tammy Thomas, Crystal Williams, Tenille Willis-Cleftenant, Tracie Williams, Brian Carney, Nicole Bryant, Gwen Hall, Jamie Haase, Lisa Gill, Samantha Gilbert, William Granfield, Dawn Kramer, Deborah Henry, Enesia Jackson, Jacqueline Jolicoeur, Julie Humphrey, Bobbie Lagarde, Kimberly Lacey, Paul Newman, Demi Moore, Kimberly Nogales, Rebecca Nahay, Chelsey Rittgers-Rake, Jason Rosner, Lynn Santos, Patricia Pryjma, Stephen Rue, Trecha Robinson, Zoe Ralston, Charles Sherman, David Strollo, Latrice Savannah, Naticia Simon, Nicholas Seidel, Paul Schieicher, Jamica Banks, Jodi Alexander, Lascia Kelly, Alexandra Llanos, Angelique Levell, Benjamin Lockley, Chad Landells, Davidson Louis, Janelle Lucas, Karan Lovett, Amanda Mason, Alex Myers, Chantell Mims-Penland, Christian Mendoza, Antoinette Neal, Brandi Owens, Deborah Owen, Jason Neal, Brad Perry, Brandy Power, Bridget Ranney, Hamed Ranjbar, Lananh Pham, Ashtyn Rodriguez, Danielle Scicluna, Fendy Saget, Jasmine Rodriguez, Kane Shaffner, Katya Reed, Kayla Rubio, Lauren Smith, Kelli Brooks, Cindy Castillo, Dian Clarke, Chantez Diggs, Ayoniyi Fakorede, Cathy Eicher, Dawn Evans, Joseph Eurell, Ashley Gee, Catherine Gable, Cheryl Fry-Banales, Jesus Garcia, Alicia Hassan, Cole Henry, Jacob Henry, Ashley Jablonski, Benisha Hill, Crystal Holton, Glee Hobbs, Laneika Howell, Lolita Russell and Luz Melecio. (Marshall, J.)
October 16, 2013 Filing 554 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 553 PAPERLESS ORDER granting # 551 Unopposed Motion to Allow Plaintiffs a Ten-Day Grace Period to Process and File Consents Returned Within the Opt-In Period. Plaintiffs shall have until November 22, 2013 to file any Consent Forms which are postmarked, faxed, emailed, or delivered to the Third-Party Administrator no later than November 12, 2013. Plaintiffs shall provide Defendants with supporting documentation by December 4, 2013, with regard to those Consent Forms filed with the Court after November 12, 2013. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 10/15/2013. (jsh)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER granting # 542 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 10/15/2013. (jsh)
October 14, 2013 Filing 551 Unopposed MOTION Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Allow Plaintiffs a Ten Day Grace Period to Process and File Consents Returned within the Opt-In Period re # 228 Order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lichter, David)
October 11, 2013 Filing 550 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 549 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Timothy Owens, Annessa Pace, Dean Pagonakis, Roberta Panosh, Thomas Parker, Melinda Patrick, Nikole Perez, Kiara Perry, Lauren Phagan, Samantha Pierce, Brenda Portillo, Sara Pownell, Ehsan Razi, Tuesdi Reaves, Ranae Rice, Starr Richardson, Cynthia Rivera, Victor Rivero, Gay Roberts, Laura Romero, Jill Ruiz-Plowman, Monica Ryun, Sherry Sabo, Stephen Sacco, Tonishia Scott, David Sears, George Shackett, Pietra Shartle, Tia Siler, Tara Simms, Nina Sittler, Courtney Snell, Diana Sochalski, Guy Sperlazzo, Shirley Stadtmueller, Andrea Stankus, Lori Stanton, Cynthia Stark-Weir, Michael Stickney, Kymberly Talley, Heather Taylor, Mahikol Torres, Christopher Turner, Sherrie Uplinger, Charles Van Order, Cheryl Vilela, Julio Vivas, Zachary Voller, Kenesha Wadsworth, Stephanie Watro, Mara Welch, Angelica Will, Felishia Williams, Lacey Williford, Natalia Wood, Ryan Woodward, Sarah Woudenberg, Michael Ybarra, Damon Yee and Christopher Zoog. (Marshall, J.)
October 11, 2013 Filing 549 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 11, 2013 Filing 548 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 547 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Sasha Green, Ramon Grijalva, Matthew Guidotti, Daniel Guillotte, Sonya Habinek, Kristy Hadley, Pepper Hahn, Holly Hale, Tawanna Hall, Diane Hamilton, Alicia Handville, Alisha Hardester, Celeste Hardin, Amanda Harris, Barbara Harris, Sam Hart, Cassandra Hatfield, Nichole Hawley, Shawn Helvey, Briana Hente, Andre Hicks, Crystal Hill, Santisha Hill, Louis Holmes, Kyle Hovasse, Sharon Hunter, Kassandra Jackson, Patrick Jackson Sr, Kristin Jacob, Danielle Jacobs, Imia Johnson, Robert Johnson, Brandon Johnson, Jenna Johnston, Jonette Jones, Jennifer Justice, Taylor Kelly, Jillian Kelm, Linda Kinne, Adam Kittredge, Adria Kling, Cynthia Knight, Miriam Krugliak, Ronda Labier, Branden Lamb, Destiny Landi, Kristen Lenz, Kelly Lesniak, Rachel Lewis, Sandy Love, Melissa Luciano, Ashley Ludlam, Sonny Luka, Mija Maiorano, Jennifer Manes, Julia Markey, Michael Martin, Fayette Martin, Cyrinda Martucci, Farrouk Masri, Stephanie Mcdonald-Ball, Andew Mcgarr, Jacqueline Mcgrath, Erica Mckee, Rebecca Mcpherson, Jeanne Meadows, John Mehler, Nicole Mejia, Ginger Melchor, Tracy Metivier, Melinda Meyer, Ashley Miller, Melanie Miller, Shelley Mitchell, Richard Montie, Sarah Moore-Carlysle, Lori Morgan, Emily Morrow, Deborah Mosley, Melissa Munguia, Heather Murphy, Kevon Murray, Elizabeth Nava, Kortorcha Nelson, Kara Noesen, Matt Nonemacher and Paul Norris. (Marshall, J.)
October 11, 2013 Filing 547 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 11, 2013 Filing 546 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 545 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Danielle Abbott, Aryana Abbott, Charkara Abron, Gina Adams, Yanet Albisu, Janelle Albitz, Mercedes Altpeter, Orietta Amarillo, Fabio Amarillo, Natalie Arista, Talisa Arnold, Lashaunda Atkins, Joell Austin, Amy Baldy, Felicia Banks, Sarah Beachy, Zachary Bell, Ryan Bellomo, Lisa Benavidez, Brooke Benhayon, Michelle Bisaillon, Casey Blount, Mary Board, Kera Bogel, April Bolden, Anthony Bolton, Jennifer Bousquet, Derek Boutin, Megan Boyce, David Brooks, Jamie Brown, Ashley Burger, Andrew Burgess, Martha Burton, Ricardo Cabrera, Ashley Campbell, Theresa Campbell, Jennifer Carnes, Jessica Casares, Gabriela Casiano, Preston Cassio, Vanessa Castro, Richard Cathey, Michelle Chagnon, Stephanee Chilcote, Roger Coe, Keenan Cole, Jessica Coleman, Latasha Coley, Shamequa Collins, Tasha Cook, Chelsea Cornelious-Brown, Mary Cowser, Vickie Crawford, Lisa Crawford, Berni Cuellar, Timothy Cupit, Lauren Daniels, Andrew Deleon, Jana Dixon-Valentine, Heather Doherty-Musto, Suzanne Dolce, Mary Downs, John Dushame, Joshua Eanes, Roli-Amelia Edun, Angela Eggerstedt, Melissa Ehman, Jordan Elliott, Justin Evans, Regina Ezell, Nina Ferranti, Quinn Filtzer, Donald Finnegan, Shanerika Flemings, Melissa Forbes, Arin Forbes, Serita Forehand, Tatiana Franco, Christine Frazier, Omar Freitekh, Heather Friday, Jennifer Garant, Genesis Garcia, Katelyn Garcia, Jenna Rae Gazzola, Marilou Genovese, Lauren Genovese, Peter Gieseke, Matthew Giunta and Amanda Grayson. (Marshall, J.)
October 11, 2013 Filing 545 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 11, 2013 Filing 544 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 543 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jazmine Stronks, Paul Szebin, Brenda Tapia, Sabrina Taylor, Scott Thomas, Jess Thomas, Kelsey Thompson, Chelsey Towns, Loc Tran, Melanee Turner, Kellie Turner, Cassidy Upp, Alan Vallee, Andrea Van Heeswyk, Devan Walker, Alekzondra Waller, Natasha Watkins-Prandy, Patty Watson, Brett Weister, Beau Welsh, Rebecca Wheeling, Claire White, Erin Williams, Misty Williams, Adrian Wizes, Russell Wolf, Sierra Wolman, Vickie Wright and Seth Yankee. (Marshall, J.)
October 11, 2013 Filing 543 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 11, 2013 Filing 541 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 540 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Lavoris Fair, Dishan Farmer, Kaitlyn Farrelly, Jennifer Fenstermacher, Andre Fiddler, Jason Fleming, Darius Florence, Dannica Forward, Renee Frick, Donna Frye, Scott Gagliardi, Jessica Garabedian, Danielle Gierloff, Carla Giordano, Courtney Glass, Christine Glowacki, Joshua Goudreau, Stacie Gravelle, Nicki Green, Angela Greene, Kymberly Grove, John Gutjahr, Carol Halloran, Andrew Helton, Heather Helton, Roderick Henderson, Devenni Hernandez, Melanie Hewitt, Matt Hintereder, Jenna Iavecchia, Alicia Jachim, Kenyatta James, Matthew Jarke, Taylor Johnson, Keri Johnson, Precious Johnson, Darci Johnson, Connie Jones, Stephanie Jordan, Kimberly Jordan, Molly Kelly, Dawnah Kent, Jaclyn Kessler, Eric Kilgore, Robert King, Tyler Lee, Daniel Levingston, Kimberly Lewis, Kelley Lind, Katrina Linkevich, Sadie Marshall, Sarah Mccarney, Amanda Mccarney, Darren Mccrate, Candace Mcculley, Jamie Mcgruder, Dominique Mcwhorter, Jeffrey Mealy, Derek Miller, Erica Moody, Tina Moore, Christina Moriarty, Hillary Moyer, Amber Murphy, Tandiwe Myambo, Alan Naples, Tina Neilson, Samantha Nicoll, Gregory Norman, Alejandro Osorio-Diezmo, Rossie Patterson, David Paxton, Kathleen Pegram, Kimberly Pendleton, Aaron Pillette, Keith Prandy, Stacie Pratt, Amanda Ramirez, Theresa Reid-Sutphin, Brittany Repici, Toccara Rich-Robinson, Melissa Ripley, Emily Roland-Wolford, Darby Ross, Jeremy Saldana, Nicolette Salitrik, Ramon Sanchez III, Chandra Sanders, Sonia Santoyo, Cynthia Saunders, Robert Schmit, Brianna Schneider, Stephen Seeley, Eduardo Seguen, Kelly Sheen, Ritzi Shelton, Emma Solitaire, Shalyne Stafford-Young, Felicity Staggs and Jade Startzman. (Marshall, J.)
October 11, 2013 Filing 540 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 11, 2013 Filing 539 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 538 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Chris Ahnen, Anisa Allad, Jonathan Andrade, Swanzetta Mazetta Andrews, Blake Atwater, Hamlet Autman, Matthew Baker, Brea Batman, Keri Battles, Destiny Bell, Joann Benison, Redeat Berhanu, Bryan Bianconi, David Binkley, Anthony Bivone, Brittany Bone, Maxine Bunn, Megan Burdette, Cheri Burkhard, Terri Burleson, Dianna Bush, Joseph Cannon III, Christopher Cappe, Penny Casey, Melinda Chan, Anthony Cocciolone, Malissa Combs-Clark, Jocelyn Connelly, Megan Cook, Joel Correa, Ashley Cowart, Krystal Crabtree, Melissa Craig, Jerren Cropps, Rhiannon Cunningham, Jauna Curp, Elizabeth Dalilak, Pamela Daugherty-Smith, Ashley Dean, Christopher Dellis, Ryan Demers, Brenda Diaz, Mallory Duborg, Kyle Duckett, Anthony Eckert, Lisa Edens, Rosemarie Edwards, Diane Escarcega, Leonel Escarcega, Mario Escobar, Nune Demiryan, Pamela Coleman, Paul Jordan, Rachel Bemis, Rachel Riebe, Rashawn Robinson, Renee Case, Ronald Wright, Sara Stein, Sarah Graham, Sarah McKinstry, Sarah Ohringer, Scott Augustine, Scott Campbell, Scott Watson, Shameake Gamble, Shannon Austin-York, Shannon Douglas, Somuek Peterson, Staci Pearsall, Tandrine Bray, Tanya Przybylski, Tearia Boyd, Teliah Gienger, Thomas White, Tiffany Mezzanotti, Tina Tang, Troyann Hobdy-Wilkerson, Tyler Robinson, Wendy Monseur, Wesley Dyar, Whitney Whiting and Yvonne Smith. (Marshall, J.)
October 11, 2013 Filing 538 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 10, 2013 Filing 542 Unopposed Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ronald J. Hedges. Filing Fee $ 75.00. Receipt # 4389. (ksa)
October 10, 2013 Filing 537 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 536 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Colleen Toma, Sarah Tschiggfrie, Lydia Turner, Jolie Uzarewicz, Barbara Van, Dominique Veloz, Aileen Ventura, Roderick Vincent, Amy Vorhees, Daniel Wade, Paul Wagner, Jamie Wallace-Blum, Amanda Weisman, Andrea Wells, Jeremy Westmoreland, Nadiyah Wigfall, Hannah Willhoite, Eric Williams, Shelley Willis, Janice Wilton, Melissa Woldt, Seblehiwat Worku, Antoinette Wysocki, Jordan Young Chapman, Michael Zapata, Rachel Pezzetta, Deidra Pierce, Michelle Polk, Rebecca Pontbriand, Jennifer Premo, Kristen Pryor, Christina Ragusa, James Regelin, Laura Riedmiller, Lewie Robinson, Katie Robyn, Alexander Roeber, Tracey Rogers, Christian Ross, Paul Ross, Joesph Rowley, Lisa Rudolph, Lindsey Ruffner, Sarah Santos, Denise Sawyer, Rob Schwindler, Breck Shoemaker, Jody Short, Andrea Siegfried, Kayla Skinner, Vernon Slade, Regina Gwendolyn Sparks, Nicole St Jean, Shandora Stebbins, Kelley Stewart, Kristin Stirling, Kelsey Stirling, Juliza Suero, Shelbie Summers, Kelley Swann, Emily Swartz, Alycia Taczanowsky, Andres Tascon, Chris Teague, Nicholas Theno, Talia Thomas, Jessica Lehman, Jessica Maggard, Jessica Peppers, Jodie Cardenas, John Forte, Jose Ponce, Joseph Germany, Josie Turgean, Juancarlos Losoya, Juanita Bell, Judith Bragg, Kaili Ogeto, Kelsey Kuppinger, Kevin Choiniere, Kevin Dignan, Kimberly Johnson, Kristen Foor, Kyle Bagley, Laneicha Fountain, Lauren DeGeer, Leslie Marquez, Liliana Salinas, Lisa Bell, Maggie Schuler, Mark Barnett, Meave Deppeler, Meghan Morris, Melinda Knerem, Michael Dale, Michael Herrington, Michael Phelps, Nathan Platter, Nathaniel Armolt and Nicholas Berweiler. (Marshall, J.)
October 10, 2013 Filing 536 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 10, 2013 Filing 535 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 534 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kathy Jamison, Sommar Jastorff-Nelson, Chelsea Jones, Gena Jones, Nicole Kelly, Samantha Kirk, Emily Klug, Deborah Korth, Zakaria Lagdim, Josiah Larsen, Janice Lauderbaugh, Chelsea Lebrun, Erica LeComte, Shanta Lewis, Anita Ligocki, Jessica Linz, Chad Loughran, Dana Ludwig, Laura Maggio, Kathryn Manning, Graciela Mata, Lisa Mather, Heather Mayer, Sarah McElroy, Darla McGinnis, Emily McGuire, Marvin Meriweather, Brittney Mettke, Dwight Miller, Jennifer Miller, Dominique Miller, Auburn Miller, Rhianna Missman, Karen Monroy, Donnis Moore, Braden Myers, David Nabors Jr, Justin Ogborn, Kenneth Oldham, Jennifer Omarah, Angela Overton, Sofya Panteleimonov, Sharain Parker, Dana Parr, Mileidy Paulino, James Paulk III, Cindy Pedrosa, Chris Pena, Jose Perez, Abbigail Schneider, Adnan Sakiri, Ahmad Al-Zear, Alma Lozano, Amber Palmer, Andrew Cypher, April Woods, Ashleigh Prather, Ashley Dunagin, Ashley Johnson, Ashley Schaffner-McNatt, Barbara Chalkley, Brittany Cornell, Brittany Denhoff, Candace Hill, Candice Clark, Catherine Ammon, Celia Crosby Moffett, Christian Aldana, Christina Drummond, Christina Gevas, Christy Long, Cody Rager, Cynthia Delatorre, Dale Poe, Dana Reed, Danielle Burggraff, Deanna Sinoski, Deark Bailey, Dominique Schaffer, Doris Kimball, Elvin Stewart, Emily Dayfield, Emily Goodhart, Emily Megyes, Erin Caplinger, Gabriella Melendez, Genesis Ramos, Glenda Menefee, Hannah Nicolas, Heather Childs, Heidi Lesley, Hugo Rodriguez, Jacob Korn, Jacqueline Visaggio, Jaime Coccaro, Jaz Gray, Jefanie O Dailey, Jessica Fine and Jessica Kindred. (Marshall, J.)
October 10, 2013 Filing 534 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 9, 2013 Filing 533 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 532 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Ramon Amador, Langston Aples, Crystal Arellano, Holly Ayres-Stanley, Lauren Bader, Melody Baker, Joseph Barbee, David Barbet, Dustin Barlow, Trisha Bergmeier, Ashleigh Bertram-Bell, Amy Bialahoski, Carol Bigam, Kelly Bigfire, Ana Blaser, Lucia Bobadilla-Maravalli, Diamond Bonner, Robert Boyd, Clifford Boykin, Shur-Ron Boykins, Therese Brannin, Sophronia Brewton, Ginger Breyfogle, Rebecca Brierley-Smith, Heather Bronson, Mary Brooks, Leo Brown, Frances Butler, Rebecca Cairns, Kevin Campbell, Jaclyn Canto, Daniel Carr, Kristen Carter, Nicolas Castro, Talina Chartier, Amy Christensen, Virginia Cisneros, Dashawn Clem, Aaron Clough, Cory Clugston, Tina Conway, Haley Cowan, Andrea Cox, Mary Crocker, Levi Cromer, Tiffany Crum, Ian Cyrus Jr, Hong Davis, Jenny Davis-Gernhart, Maria Del Carmen Moreno, Juan Demedicis, Stephanie Denzik, Hantzcy Desamours, Emanuele Dinunzio, Julissa Dole, Tiffany Dollier-Gallagher, Resheika Drakeford, Casaundra Driver, Kevin Duddy, Darnell Elam, Heather Elmasri, Laura Fawcett, Bianca Fazzina, Christina Fields, Jacob Fischer, Bobby Flegel, Lafayette Fredrick, Gabriel Fuerte, Javier Garcia, Cindy Garrett, Makensie Gentry, Kathryn Gesford, Derek Gonzales, Karina Gonzales-Verde, Jaclyn Gonzalez, Kimberly Grimes, Justin Grimm, Natalie Grinvalds, Erin Halterman, Jesse Hammond, Gregory Hanley, Dennine Harper, Susan Harris, Christopher Harris, Brianne Hawks, Raeann Heitman, Jose Hernandez, Elliott Hines, Mark Howell, Kathryn Hummel, Richard Ishmael, Jocelyn Ives and Lori Jacobs. (Marshall, J.)
October 9, 2013 Filing 532 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 8, 2013 Filing 531 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 530 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Melynda Klein, Sarah Kolar, Melissa Lien, Marie Luciano, Justin Lutz, Christian Machado, Tim Marcinek, Sandy Marino, Kimberly Marone, Kara Masek, Desdemona Mazzeo, Kwantia McClain, Vincent Meads, Monica Mejia, Kari Metzka, Chanel Millington, Lauren Montiel, Samantha Nilsen, Jessica Norris, Amanda Nunez, Rebecca Ooms, Joshua Ortiz, Chris Owens, Matthew Passmore, Tammilin Pawlak, Trinidad Perez, Justin Perrotta, Hue Pham, Ava Platt, Abdul Popal, Amber Porter-Goodloe, Natasha Prado, Emily Ragan, Larry Rapier, Maribel Real, Lyndsay Reeves, Theresa Reinken, Talitha Robertson, Kathleen Rybarczyk, Jason Sanchez, Jason Sanders, Jennifer Sawyer, Robert Sestito, Shannon Shields, Haley Sickles, Jeffrey Siefert, David Small, Justin Smith, Nancy Smith, Tamara Stevens, Alyssa Stoddard, Cindy Stroerger, Jessica Swayne, Lawrence Talamante, Kristina Thomas, Joan Thornton, Jennifer Todd-McFarland, Tania Torres, Kristine Toyas, Chris Turley, Charlotte Van Den Hout, Susan Veldman, Kristin Vinson, Jonathan Vu, Alexander Vu, Zach Vucic, Andrew Wallace, Jason Wallace, Lori West, Helena Whitfield, Latonya Whittington, Lana Wilke, Allison Williams, Binh Wilson, Brandin Wilson, Henry Woodard, Jeremy Wright, Anastasia Wright, Laura Yocum, Jane Youmans, Kristal Young, Valeria Zepeda, Qi Zhong and Juan Zuniga. (Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 530 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 529 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 528 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Michelle Adams, Zack Adelhelm, Jessica Allen, Laurie Ashcroft, Vanessa Baechtel, Leanne Bain, Casey Bastin, Elizabeth Baumgartner, Sherry Beaty, Austin Bell, Kendrick Benally, Kevin Berkavich, Kaleena Bluemer, Andrea Bockart, Aleah Boulay, Andrea Brubach-Silver, Cierra Burns, Paula Butler, Christie Cabreja, Paige Calhoun, Kellie Cannon, Lisa Carroll, Jacob Casas, Lesa Cash, David Castillo, Corina Chambers, Chelsea Chavarria, Tammy Childress, Crystal Clark, Andrea Cloutier, Chris Coffman, Christa Coins, James Combs, Natasha Cotto, Stacey Crawford, Drew Creel, Brandon Crosby, Stephen Daniels, Talitha Dasher, Robert Davis, Roger Del Prince, Luisana Delgado, Tanya Deveau, Tory Dotson, Michelle Driver, Jillian Duenskie, Brian Duraetz, Gloria Ealey, Derrick Edmond, Joshua Edwards, Lauren Enderle, Jill Estrada, Kelly Ethington, Chelsea Felton, Christopher Fiore, Lauren Fleming, Alaina Fleming, Jameka Floyd, Carrie Ford, Michael Garcia-Cuervo, Kimberly Gonzalez, Marieo Goodloe, Matthew Goodnature, Leanne Gordon, Cynthia Gulotta, Nazira Hadad, Jake Hajer, Danielle Hardie, Erin Harris, Dionne Harris, Robin Hart, Teresa Hartlove, Alexis Haynie, Eugene Hendrix, Jr., Roxanne Hensley, Brittany Hernandez, Kimberly Hernandez, Ashleigh Higgins, Karyn Hodge, curtis Holland, Rodney Holman, Nicholas Hou, Alyssa Houston, Christina Hunter, Angela Jarrett, Jessica Jensen, Kemal Johnson, Lisa Jones, kayla Jones, Timothy Jones, Jr., Anthony Joseph, Lisa Keys, Xavier Kimble, Stephanie Kirkendall and Ernest Kiszivath. (Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 528 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 527 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 526 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Elisha Alexander-Blank, Sara Artz, Maribel Baro, Kali Bauer, Jessica Blaha, Brittney Blevins, Austin Boone, Patrick Brown, Aquandalla Burden, Ashley Burr, Natalie Callender, Rebecca Dieken-Horwath, Jon Duerler, Casandra Durbin, Harold Evans, Samantha Firchau, Teresa Garcia, Brian Garrett, Delisa Glasco, Sarah Goree, Tina Gumm, Shannon Gutman, Laurie Hartley-Thompson, Edward Hatcher, Amunique Henderson, Joel Johnston, Jr., David Long, Dean Longway, Anjole McDermott, Marie McDonald, Johnnie Myatt, Ngocky Nguyen, Jamie Nicholas, Jessica Nix, Meghan Ohanlon, Stephanie O'Sullivan, Eric Potter, Debbie Sennett, Jared Singh, Ester Strezenec, Sarah Stromberg, Benjamin Stuck, Pernell Taylor, Brianne Thompson, Joel Thompson, Jr., Rasheed Underwood, Brian Vargas, Venina Vialpando, Kiersten Watkins, Marissa Williams, Lasherraneta Williamson and Debbie Yerkes. (Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 526 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 525 PAPERLESS ORDER granting # 519 Plaintiff's Consented-To Motion to Continue October 17, 2013 Hearing. The hearing set for October 17, 2013, is CANCELED and is reset for October 28, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. in Fort Lauderdale Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 10/8/2013. (kas)
October 8, 2013 Filing 524 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 522 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Reginald Scales, Missy Schaapman, Lea Ann Schreiber, Ruth Scott, Debra Semple, Jacqueline Simon, Amanda Skilton, Helen Smith, Jeffrey Spears, Lyndsey Stanton, Melissa Stephens, Anne Stitt, Matthew Surine, Matthew Sweeney, Epithany Taylor, Lindsey Teague-Ghiultu, Kelsi Thieroff, Spenser Tuzzo, Clifford Vanderpool, Amber Walker, Amber Weeks, Renee Wheeler, Zerrick Williams, Kameela Williams, Janet Wittbrodt-Skinner, Brittney Wright and Matthew Yardley. (Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 523 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re # 519 MOTION to Continue October 17, 2013 Hearing submitting proposed order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshall, J.)
October 8, 2013 Filing 522 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 521 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 520 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 518 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jo Ann Aguirre, Zuri Alig-Chaney, Stephanie Arbogast, Jenae Asire, Darlene Audy, Allison Bacorn-Ester, Tazebachew Baheru, Alfredo Barragan, Theresa Barrios, Beth Bessler, Megan Bracher, Leah Bragg, Gabrielle Breeding, Jason Briscoe, Jasmine Brothers, Felisha Bush, Patricia Caron, Phillip Carr, Nicholas Chatham, Samantha Chudy, Donnell Clinton, Kristina Connors, Crystal Corso, Tonya Cosper, Lisa Courtemanche, Angela Curry, James Cusic, Melissa Deal, Helcia Dorman, Sara Dowler, Vanesa Duarte, Casey Dyke-Holley, Danielle Eifler, Stephanie Fagan, Deven Fomby, Amanda Garabato-Ruiz, Michael Giacobbe, Clint Gillespie, Judith Gilliland, Julonda Gonzales, Sergio Gonzalez-Varela, Carlee Greenslit, Lisa Gregoire, Ellen Haggerty, Laurie Harrison, Jennifer Hartlep-Pruitt, Tiffany Hasamear, Tara Hicks, Belinda Hodler, Dan Hoger, Alexis Holmes, Tina Horton, Taaliba Hull, Paul Iancu, Mihai Iancu, Lisa Jaroscak, Josephine Jenkins, Tierra Jones, Elizabeth Kennedy, Felicia King, Jannelyn Lat, Sherri Lopez, Anita Lopez, Amesa Lundy, Jessica Marks, Amanda Maynard, Rachael McWilliams, Laura Metcalf, Effie Millie, Cassandra Miller, Melanie Milliner, Jennifer Mills, Tynecia Mitchell, Misty Morin, Jessica Mullins, Mariangela Munoz, Garrett Muston, Katlin Nordland, Erik Nordquist, Eugene Olivarez, Daniel Olson, Jamie Palagruto, Mindie Parks, Lucy Patterson, Tracey Peyster, Delcie Pham, Elicia Phillips, Cathy Picken, Ivan Pino, Pamela Primaky, Nicholas Ray, Bryan Roy and Ramiro Ruiz. (Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 519 MOTION to Continue October 17, 2013 Hearing by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 10/25/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 8, 2013 Filing 518 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 517 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 516 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Ashley Watson, Kelsea Watts, Ashlee Waugh, Heather Weaver, Danielle Weisse, Nicole Welt, James Werndli, Rachel Wheatman, Seka White, Anika White, Terence Wilder, Tiffany Williams, Tarez Williams, Brandon Williams, Bonita Williams, Starlett Williams, Fred Williams, Nicole Williams, Erica Williams, Byron Williams, Steve Williams, Shawn Wilson, Cole Wilson, Brienna Wilson-Thompson, Dartanion Winstead, Nicole Winston, Timothy Witherow, Candy Wolfe, Eleanor Woods, Rachel Yankee, Ashley Yates, Richard Yow, Cesar Zamora, Mark Zinn, Robert Zuniga and Sonja Zuniga. (Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 516 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 515 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 513 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jinda Rodriguez, Marcos Rodriguez, Hugo Rodriguez, Laura Rogers, Tiffany Roman, Lauren Roman, Kasie Rosenberg, Erica Rossi, Jesse Rubly, Amanda Russell, David Ryan, Khaled Saber, Cindy Salvio, Irene Sanders, Shanna Sanhueza, Autumn Sauseda, Jonathan Savage, Mary Savage, Diane Sayegh, Amy Schroeder, Angelique Scott, Gwendolyn Scrutchins, Jill Sears, Kenneth Seminuk, Blake Serrano, Tayler Sheffield, Leah Shockley, Krysteena Sibley, Delaney Siegert, Nicholle Signorini, Beth Silvestrucci, Courtney Sims, Rebecca Sinclair, Caren Sinclair, Tanisha Singleton, Rebecca Siracuse, Tracy Skryzmoski, Saimir Skuqi, Tamikia Smile, Johnathon Smith, Ardelia Smith, Diane Snyder, Jacqueline Sookradge, Allan Spagnardi, Sherry Speed, David Stagg, Jenny Staton, Tara Stiehl, Chris Stine, Nadia Stokeling, Brooke Stone, Michelle Streisand, Robert Strohl, Jeremy Suges, Lindsey Swinson, Jasmine Talley, Darla Tang, Nichole Taylor, Matthew Taylor, Shelley Taylor, Sheila Tenn, Michael Tersigni, Linda Thomas, Janice Thompson, David Thompson, Brittany Tiani, Jacob Tidwell, Jacob Tidwell, Kristen Titiriga-Anderson, Drew Tolson, Shanira Torres, Jorge Trujillo, Juan-Carlos Trujillo, Ashlie Uhlman, William Valentine, Gregory Vambell, Hilaria Vasquez, Karissa Voulgaris, James Waldock, Betty Walker, Shane Walker, Christopher Walls, Erika Walton, Felicia Watchowski, Kimberlin Waters and Karen Wathen. (Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 514 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 511 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Matthew Futter, Cheryl Galindo, Alisha Gallegos, Joanna Garcia, Lisa Garvin-Trimbur, Janine Gerald, Bridgett Gibson, Shane Gibson, Greg Gidden, Susan Gillenwaters, Wendell Gin, Kristy Glahn, Nicole Glasgow, Cathy Glick, Jason Glover, Jason Goffin, Brian Golde, Denise Gonzalez, Samuel Gonzalez, Chrystina Gonzalez, Rachael Goodrow, Trista Goodwin, Reginald Gordon, Esther Goris, Gustavo Gracia, Tiola Graham, Ryan Grant, Nicole Graves, Alishia Green, Marion Green, Michael Green, Ladonna Grisham, Scott Guillette, Joanne Gunderson-Wintermute, Robert Gusman, Nicole Guttormsen, Tikel Habte, Sigourney Hall, Dan Hallowell, Victoria Handel, Nancy Hanna, Daniel Hantack, Chauntel Hardy, Janet Hargraves, Kelly Harmon, Edith Haro, Jessica Harrity, David Harshbarger, Kariann Hatmaker-Kinamon, Amie Haught, Jennifer Hawkins, Bridget Hayes, Latoya Headen, Shirley Heath, Stephen Heckman, Nicole Heinz, Danielle Henderson, Joelle Henderson, Morgan Henry, Brian Henry, Joseph Hernandez, Raul Herrera, Lillian Herrera, Monique Hess, Jermaine Hines, Velva Hockley, Jessica Hodge, Joshua Hodges, Ashley Hohensee, Kelly Holmes, Nichole Horner, Bradley Hugg, Katie Hughes, Jessica Huizenga, Myra Hummel, Chris Humphreys, Tatiana Iacob Mcteique, Jaime Ivy, Kimberly Jablonowski, Rachel Jackson, Taniesha Jackson, Alexandria Jacukowicz-Ratay, Joan Jaklevic, Shelby James, Janelle Jarvis, Amanda Jeakle, Taryme Jefferson, Dustin Jenkins, Jennifer Jensen, Patrice Johnson, Dylan Johnson, Loretta Johnson, Katherine Johnson, Crystal Johnson, Elana Johnson, Sarah Johnson and Katherine Johnston. (Marshall, J.)
October 8, 2013 Filing 513 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 512 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 510 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Pamela Miller, Jason Miller, Fredrick Miller, Alyssa Miller-Abraham, Katrina Mitchell, Kahlil Mohammad, Tanner Montoya, Kelli Moore, Charity Moran, Maria Moreno, Angelica Moreno, Kathleen Morgan, Brooke Morris, Curis Morton, Randi Moseley, Destiny Moten, Courtney Mulkins, Judy Murphy, Carol Murray, Juli Murray, Stuart Myers, Luke Mytych, Jessica Navarrete, Sheri Nefulda, Sarah Nelson-Rainey, Jeanette Nevarez-Ayala, Michelle Newman, Annette Newton, Chyla Nichols, Michael Nicholson, Jacob Norris, Donna Nowicki, Heather Nute, Kristen O'Brian, Megan O'Brien, Paul O'Brien, Raychel Ogletree, Aleesha Oleskie, Moneka Oliver, Max Ottman, Javona Overton, Humberto Paiz, Sharon Palmer, Abbie Pane, Nancy Paramanandam-Haag, Tina Parker, Karessa Patterson, Clarisse Pauling, Michael Pederson, Vickie Peduto, Jennifer Penna, Emily Pepper, Matthew Perkins, Caitlin Perry, Krystal Person, Jeferson Pessoa, Annelise Phelan, Misty Phillips, Sherrie Phillips, Tianna Picazo, Michel Pickard, Ciar Pickett, Natalie Pierson, Ralph Pipkins, Amanda Platt, Keith Poor, Katrina Pope, Keri Potter, Crystal Preiksaitis, Nicholas Puccio, Denise Pukas, Peter Pusateri, Angela Puskar, Rocio Ramirez, Ludmilla Ramos, Salvador Ramos, Lauren Rawlings, Liza Ray, Charlotte Ray, Misty Reach, Keren Redondo, Candance Redwine-Walker, Cytina Reinecke, Andrea Renguette, Joseph Reynolds, Jason Riddel, Becky Riedberger, Jill Riley, Tanna Riley, Adianez Rivera-Ramos, Aaron Robbins, Christopher Roberts, Kristi Robertson, Ryan Robertson and Winter Robinson. (Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 511 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 8, 2013 Filing 510 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 509 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 508 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Talbert Jones, Sharunda Jones, Joanne Jones, Clinton Jones, Lindsay Jones, Ronield Kaldani, Michael Keener, Jerrad Keith, Sherriann Kelley, Bobbi Kelsey, Rachelle Kennedy, Jonathan Kennon, Justeen Kent, Aaron Kepley, Shawna Kimber, Jessica Kinde, Pamela King, Alexandra Kingsley, Rolland Kiroloss, Quenesha Knight-Lowery, Michael Kocholek, Leanna Krejci, Nicole Krieg, Charleen Krol, Anna Ksenzenko, Melissa Kunes, Ryan Kupka, Tammy Kvapil, Jessie Lambert, Zachary Lang, Kyle Langlois, Soumia Larhtami, Danielle Larson, Chalace Lauria, Meggan Lawson, Emilee Leerskov, Michelle Lemaster, Amanda Lester, Richard Leveque, Aubry Likens, Robert Linder, Kevin Lindquist, Ashley Lingg, Katherine Lizardo, Shantoria Love, Cheryl Lowe, Cheryl Luizzi, Tina Luna, Kim Lupo, Kirbie Maddocks, Amanda Madrid, Jordan Mahoney, Sara Maida, Sean Major, Nadja Makara, Monica Maldonado, Nicole Marion, Michele Marrero, Pamela Marsh, Paul Martinez-Avalos, Christian Marton, Jerry Mason, Carrie Massey, Kent Mastainich, Erin Mathews, Laura May, Steven Mazur, Kristina Mazur, Rene McCauslin, Anika McCoy, Herman McDonald, Chelsie McKee, Lonzetta McKennie, Sarah McLain, Derek McQuade, Robert Meehan, Sanaz Mehdizadeh, Tina Melvin, Shane Mendonca, Matthew Michalsen, Melissa Michalski and Bryan Mikolajczyk. (Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 508 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 8, 2013 Filing 507 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 506 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Samantha Chambers, Jessica Chandler, Brittanee Cho, Susan Chojnacki, Roni Cindrich, Tara Cirigliano, Maura Clawson, Heather Cloonan, Kasey Clow, Carrie Cobb, David Coffin, Karen Cogswell, Nikki Coleman, Shena Coleman, Erin Collins, Megan Collins, Kristen Collins, Max Comer, Pamela Conigliaro-Perrin, Michael Connelly, Dyamond Cooper, Jasmine Cooper, Anjail Coppage, Laura Cortes, Brenda Courson, Amanda Crawford, Matthew Crawford, Elizabeth Cregg, Crystal Crumpler, Jeri Cullen, Julie Cummings, Mariah Cunningham, Shekita Cureton, Ashton D Silva-Grayson, Courtnei Daniel, Danielle Darby, Echo Davis, Shane Davis, Kenneth Davis, Linda Deak, Denise Deanovich, Stephanie Delcorvo, Phat Diec, Alicia Diez, Nicole Diver-Hornburger, Eric Dlubala, Jamie Douglas, Jessica Downey, Taylor Drennan, Kali Drewes, Joanna Driggers, Ashley Dudley-Tackett, Russell Duke, Adrienne Duran, Brandon Edwards, Donald Ehie, Tina Ellis, Terri Emmons, Brian Enix, Jennel Entwistle, Mardene Esparza, Carol Evans, Andrea Evans, Shelby Facenda, Christopher Fairbanks, Carroll Fairchild, Melissa Fairchild, Cari Falbo, Deborah Farmer, Dawn Farrell, Corinne Fassett, Adrianne Fedyna, Hillary Feierstein, Melissa Figliolino, Christopher Firey, Annastasia Fisher, Jamey Fisk, Sarah Fleishel, Joshua Floyd, Shaniece Ford, Katie Foster, Heather Fowler, Alexandria Fraijo, Blisse Frazier, Neil Freeman, Patrick French, Polly Frey and Kristen Frisk. (Marshall, J.)
October 8, 2013 Filing 506 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 8, 2013 Filing 505 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 504 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Alex Abernathy, Jose Abraham, Kristin Adam-Bosiljevac, Stephanie Adams, Mary Adams, Mackenzie Alexander, Whitney Allard, Christopher Allen, Kerry Allen, Shanesha Allen, Cecilia Allison, Jody Anderson, Tasaundra Andrews, Katie Armillie, Michael Armstrong, Katelyn Arnane, Kristy Arnold, Justin Arrington, Lauren Arutoff, Menyaebe Attipoe, Allison Augusta, Christine Bagala, Johnna Bailey, Dani Baker, Darren Ball, Kelsey Barfield, Andrew Barlowe, Abby Bartell, Mark Bateman, Eric Bays, Kimberly Beach-Thorne, Holli Beaulieu, Andrea Becerra, Hillary Beck, Michelle Benson, Matthew Berg, Jeffrey Berger, Jessica Bernstein, Jason Berry, Kayla Berry, James Berry Jr, Stephanie Bertrand, Anthony Bigby Jr, Anna Birta, Amanda Bitsoli, Christopher Blackwell, Eric Blaine, Kimberly Blanchard, Deana Blausen, Pamela Blazer, Shawn Blessing, Dusty Blevins, Philip Blocker, Jacqueline Bloom, Kenneth Blue, David Bluhm, Laura Boling, Gisela Borja, Blake Bouknight, Jade Bowe, Tilda Boyd, Mallory Boyle, Dwan Brandon, Jessica Brewi, Shannon Broadwell, Katie Brogan, Cassondra Brown, Megan Brown, Becky Brown, Amanda Bryant, Jennifer Bucci, John Buida, Jeff Bullerman, Kristen Bumbaca, Christina Buonocore, Natalie Burke, Julie Burnett, Sanela Burzic, David Bush, Caleb Buxton, Zakary Byrd, Andrew Caille, Derrick Calzada, Jovanka Campbell, Herman Canup, Ashley Capranica, Nicole Cardascia, Benjamin Carlson, Justin Caruthers, Rachel Cash, Brenda Casson, Angela Cataldi, Paola Cavaliere and Jacqueline Cerda. (Marshall, J.)
October 8, 2013 Filing 504 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 503 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 502 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jonathan Stanley, Breanne Steadman, Ailene Steenrod, Lauren Steffero, Melinda Stockton, Valerie Stow, Ashley Strahan, Joyce Swann, Maria Targarao, Brent Takaki, Sakura Takeda, Dottie Taylor, Carrie Taylor-Lloyd, Chasity Tharpe, Christopher Thibodeaux, Alice Thomas, Joshua Thompson, Jonathan Thompson, Jarrett Toth, Carisa Trousdale, Joshua Tucker, Tiffani Tucker, Shannon Tyler-Garces, James Tyson, Cassidy Valenzuela, Zachary Vargo, Jose Vigil, III, Robert Wachob, Bob Walkingstick, Nikki Walser, Sarah Walsh, Lola Wester, Lisa Wilber, Weston Williams, Kenneth Williams, Annette Williams, Amanda Womack, Nicholas Wood, Jeffrey Yannarell, Justin Yetzer and Richard Zuidema. (Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 502 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 501 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 500 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Alison Kirk-Peacher, Angela Klick, Michael Krauter, Steve Ladson, Brittany Lanphear-Odell, Laura Lee, Eleanor Leenman, Josh Lentz, Jared Lepic, Johnathan Lewis, Kimberly Lewis, Jennifer Lopez, Amanda Lopp-Buell, Amber Louis, Jessica Lowe-Howell, Thomas Lugo, Taajussir Lundy, Denise Makepeace, Kara Manchester, Nicole Monsour, Lisa Mari, Chester Marshall, Tracy Martin, Laura Martin, Sigourney Martin, George Mastrosavas, Carmen Mattson, Christov McCauley, Lauren McClure, Kaitlyn McCarroll, Denise Mckenzie, Courtney McLaurin, Drew McLendon, Sheri Meinhart, Kristy Melander, Debora Meyers, David Michalski, Joye Miller, Beth Moore, Laura Moreno, Ashley Morosini-Osterman, Talibah Morris, Jesse Murphy, Liana Nelson, Lanse Nicholas, Lynn Nixon, Alexandra Nowak, Christy Nucaste-Hernandez, Thuy Olbert, Sujunun Ovathanasin, Kevin Owens, Nicole Palchanis, Laura Papadopulos, Carleen Parasiso, Cristina Paterno, Katelin Peak, Ray Pearson, Jennifer Perez, Scott Peterson, David Pfister, Alexis Plofchan, Jack Porter, Cynthia Potts, Stephanie Prado, Jessica Ragsdale, Ryan Ransdell, Aundrea Rayford, Samantha Reisman, Bradley Reysz, Douglas Rice, Roxanne Rieber, David Rios, Phillip Roberts, Lauren Rodgers-Myhand, Tyrone Rowe, Michelle Sabo, Beatriz Salinas, Laura Samples, Christina Samuels, Shyleesha Sanders, Ryan Sansevero, Azadeh Sarsepar, Jody Secaur, Wendy Seyfang, Thomas Shenk, Brandon Silva, Carol Siwek, Toby Sloan, Chasen Smith, Julia Snedigar, Corey Staffeld and Rebecca Staley. (Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 500 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 499 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 498 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Roxanne Acosta, Jessica Aimers, Anthony Albaugh, John Andersen, Cory Anderson, Brittany Armstrong, Stephanie Asher, Amanda Ayers, Fersilena Bacallan, Cathryn Ball, Brandi Barahona, Jeanine Bargmann, Lauren Basista, Kiersten Batch, Larry Bates, Leslie Benoit, Christopher Berrellesa, Ivy Billups, Stacey Bolton, Heidi Bounphithack, Jacquelyn Boyle, Kevin Broadhead, Erica Brooks, Stephanie Brown, Michelle Brown, Ronald Brown, Jr., Lee Buck, Darrell Bunch, Sokha Bunly, Christopher Bush, Keely Butler, Heidi Buxton, Heather Cabral-Haynes, Nikita Carter, Martha Casas, Daryl Cheatham, Shawn Chiroff, Brandon Cole, Michael Corbo, Annette Cordova, Caryl Costello, Conor Coyle, Jeremy Crawford, Michelle Creasy, Barbara Cushman, Natalie Czerwinski, Matthew Debonis, Glenn Dells, Jr., Tracey Diuguid, Jessica Donnelly, Lindly Durbin, Kathy Egleton-Williams, Karyn Ellsworth, Sandra Fonseca, Robyn Foshee, Paulette Fridman, Bradley Frock, Amy Frost, Rafael Garces, Kayla Geist, Herb Gentle, Ruth Ann Gerna, Brian Gerrits, Sara Giannasca, Aaron Gochenaur, Victoria Goldwasser, Johnny Gonzalez, Zachary Gordon, Shemeka Gosha-Gaye, Nickolas Green, Rebecca Gunset, Ashley Gutierrez, Courtney Hairston, Tina Hancock-Roberts, Holli Ann Hartman, Katherine Hosemann, Angela Hunter, Robert Huntington, Jacquelyn Infante, Amanda Isaacson, Gary Israelson, Melissa Jeffery, Nicole Johnston, Cesar Justiniano, James Kay, Jennifer Keith, Amanda Kettman and Elissa Kinyo-McCarty. (Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 498 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 497 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 496 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Daniella Sedlak, Kandi Shape, Brian Sharpe, Kevin Sheehan, Natalie Shelton, Darya Sheyn, Kelsey Shields, Katy Shovlin, Denise Siefers, Nicole Skeen, Jared Smith, Annette Smith, Whitney Smith, Sarah Smith, Elizabeth Smithler-Laforce, Stacy Souer, Jennifer Spiller-Frey, Jemps St. Fleur, Nicholas Stacey, Marisa Stafford, Shelia Stafford, Mason Stanke, Andrea Star, Victoria Stevens, Rachel Stevens, Ashley Stoneman, Jaclyn Stoval, Lanie Stowe, Kathryn Streeter, John Sullivan, Les Swain, Virginia Swartz, Kathryn Swenson, Mara Talaga, Bree Talley, Robric Talton, Stevie Taylor, Linda Thornell, James Tilton, Kate Trentacoste, Jeremy Trickey, Richard Trim, Tiana Tufts, Justin Turner, Janelle Valencia, Luke Vammen, Michael Vargas, Kristy Venckus, Kerine Verne, Laura Villamaino, Shannon Viola, Kimberly Vroegindewey, Paulina Wagner, Amy Waits, Stephen Walker, Ladonna Washington, Nathan Watrous, Britt Whitchurch, Ryan White, Heather Whited, Gail White-Sim, Allen Wiley, Tyler Williams, Jazmin Williams, Stephanie Williams, Kristen Wirth, Kristen Woltkamp, Cody Woolard, Candice Wright, Meghan Wright, Camille Wright, Jamel Yates and Peggy Young. (Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 496 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 495 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 494 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kathryn Lawless-Bastinelli, Jade Lees, Jamie Lemaster, Geuris Lene, Selina Lidestri, Beth Ann Lindsay, Mark Lindsay, Jr., Julius Livingston, Julie Ludwig, Lisa Lyman, Catherine Macdonald, Robert Maestas, Jeffrey Maier, Brittiany Maine, Danna Malmos-Mann, Michael Mammoliti, Joshua Mann, Sonia Marques, Clair Martin, Jillian Marty, Daniel Masters, Terry Maxwell, Joseph Mays, Colleen Mcaloon-Derin, Michael Mcauliffe, Charles McCarley, Audra McDermott, Tracy McFadden, Randall McFarland, Abigail McGuire, Ryanah McLeod, Steve Meyer, Aaron Middleton, Terry Miles, Jr., Randie Modin, Cynthia Moe, Scottie Montgomery, Adam Morris, Marilyn Murray, Tiana Murray-Bancroft, Darlene Niknam, Lisa Noran, Kourtnee O Donnell, Patrick O Brien, Jazmine Olson, Samantha Orozco, Perla Ortega, Natasha Osborne-Ankrom, Joseph Palacios, Priscilla Panaro, Angela Parks, Kimberly Parra, Heidi Pepper, Devananda Peruman, Nikolaos Petrakis, Brenda Pettipiece, Cynthia Phelps, Mark Phelps, Jennifer Placencia, Justin Politte, Amber Posey-Alexander, Kimberly Postier, Michelle Purcell, Stephen Quiery, Jenifer Quigley, Ellen Quinn, Sarah Rainey, Amanda Ramos, Dusan Rancic, Patricia Randels, Valerie Ranieri, Sherri Reirdon, Nina Riggles, Angela Riojas, Bobbi Rivera, Heather Rivero, Miranda Roach, Kathleen Robinson, Gregory Roehrick, Steve Roseman, Michael Rosen, Stephanie Roy, Michele Sabella-Geiger, Keira Sadowitz, Brenda Samuels, Catherine Sanita, Margie Saucedo, Janet Saul-Taylor, Elizabeth Schmidt and Nicole Schubert. (Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 494 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 493 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 492 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Nicholas England, Christina Esposito, Denise Espy, Charla Eubanks, Kelsey Evans, Vincent Famiglietti, Ashley Fansler, Michelle Farrington, Jennifer Fisher, Timothy Fortin, Heather Foster, Aaron Fuller, Ramon Gallegos, Alecia Gatewood, Sarah Gaugler, Natasha Gibson, Frederick Gibson, Beverly Gilbert, Jerrika Givens, Nikki Goeddeke, Mary Gojkovich, Sherry Gomez, Robin Goodrick, Darrel Gordon, Jessica Goulding, Antonio Goulding, Devin Grady, Ashley Graser, Cameron Griffith, Shannon Groff, Jeff Gross, Colleen Guebara, Israel Gutierrez, Roberto Guzman, Sonia Guzzetta, Cory Hale, Andrew Haley, Jaron Hammons, Dakota Hampton, Chantal Harper, Michelle Hawks, Brielle Henry, Jack Herber, Kim Hernandez, Steven Hernandez, Erin Herndon, Michelle Hiering-Colton, Adrianne Hill, Shane Hilton, Michelle Hodges, Nicole Hogenson, Jennifer Hollis, Heather Holmes, John Hopkins, Betsy Horton, Matthew Houston, Sheri Howard, Lisa Howe, Linda Hyde, Danis Imamovic, Jason Ishola, Kay Istvanyi, Robert Jackson, Kristine Jasinski, Theia Jeko-Ross, Jessica Jenkins-Carpenter, Kirsten Jensen-Langerman, Chanta Johnson, Jerome Johnson, Anthony Johnson, Tammy Jonas, Darryl Jones, Whitney Jude, Doreen Kee, Courtney King, Douglas Kirk, Kristie Kirsch, Frank Kliesrath, Matt Kochersperger, Brandon Kovacic, Paulette Krist, Kimberly Kruppa, Jamelle Lacey, Laura Lakawskas, Darshay Lakey, Gabrielle Larson, Alexia Latka and Jaime Lauchner-Hauglid. (Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 492 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 491 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 489 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kerry Aberle, Santiago Aguirre, Danae Alexander, Wadeea Alkassir, Teresa Allen, Dawn Allgaier, Kevin Alvarez, David Angel-Bello, Vianey Arana, Brandy Archuleta-Talamante, Carol Arnette, Sheila Ashwood, Jeff Bagsby, Jr., Daniel Baldigowski, Tammy Bales, Jamie Balistreri-Denafo, Josh Bancroft, James Banks, Mark Bankston, Jessica Banton, Laura Barnes, Katherine Batten, Krista Beaney, Sonja Beck, Katrina Bergunder, Lenny Berkovich, Carl Bishop, Chantal Bjorklund, Danyel Boughner, Lisa Boyd, Terra Boyed, Chelsea Boyer, Jaquetta Bratley, Joanie Breeding, Gene Brock, Melanie Brooks, Lashell Broomfield, Jared Brown, Erica Brown, Christina Brown, Tara Brown, Samantha Brown, Evin Brutus, Nathan Burgman, Melissa Burns, Lily Calavitta, Corey Callahan, Shelby Calliste, Ja Leesa Caradine, Chynna Carritue, Ashley Carter, Jessica Carvajal, Clinton Causey, Crystal Chabes, Andrea Chevalier, Jaeshaun Christopher, Jonathan Ciarpelli, Heather Clay, Emily Cochran, Catharine Coleman-Cargan, Tom Collingsworth, Michelle Colwell, Angela Contee, Kylie Cooper, Barbara Cordaro, John Costello, Colin Crawford, Jennifer Crill, Janet Crocket, Caitlin Cronin, Taylor Crum, Johnny Cuautle, Rhonda Dansby, Caitlin Davis, Christian Davis, Ashley Davis, Charvi Dawson, Lisa Defiore, Javier Del Rosario, Jeffrey Denunzio, Ariel Dillon-Basden, Eboney Dixon, Cindy Dowers, Shaina Druker, Crystal Duey, Brian Dunn, Karen Dunnigan, Kimberly Dworak, Amanda Eagle, London Edwards, Lindsey Ehlert-Griffin and Ashley Ehrhardt. (Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 490 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 487 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Lisa Mcdermott, Donna Mcgeary, Joseph Mcgill, Colleen Mcgrath, Marie Mcguire, Lucas Mckee, Meghan Mckenna, Shareese Mclemore, Tiffany Mcmillan, Alisha Mcnaughton, Rene Mcneil, Steven Mcquade, Corey Mcquay, Christopher Medeiros, Melody Medina, Amanda Meier-Scruggs, Adam Melhorn, Kara Mendez, Elisa Mercado, Lauren Mercer, Vandelle Meredith-Dowell, Caroline Merne, Johnny Messimer, Carrie Meyers, Ronald Middlebrooks Jr, Heidi Middleton, Athenea Athenea Mikalatos, Nancy Miller, Charlotte Miller, Benjamin Miller, Michael K Miller, Tasha Mims, Daniel Minkel, Philip Minutolo, William Mitchell, Melissa Mize, Mindi Mize, Wahida Mohammed, Christina Moloney, Sabrina Moltke, Jean Monahan, Latoya Moore, Auburn Moore, Manika Moore, Kevin Moran, Carla Moreno, Jessica Moreno, Chantel Morgan, Marie Mortenson, Kristen Muehlenfeld, Kathie Mularczyk, Ryan Mullen, Maria Mullins, Mary Munnell, Scott Munson, Crystal Namphy, Megan Napierkowski, Conor Nelson, Jason Newell, Tiah Nichols, Robert Nickerson, Torrey Nielsen, Susan Niemoth, Sarah Novacek, Kimberly Nuss, Kevin O Brien, Ashleigh O Keefe, Colin Odonnell, Andrew Ohl, Kayla Oliverio, Delianise Olivo, Stacy Ollech, Nancy Olson-Jewell, Dina Oneil, Dana Onofre, Kathleen Orona Abarca, Jesse Ortega, Ashlee Osborne, Sara Osman, Geoffrey Overfield, Laura Ovsak, Alexis Owens, Laura Pacheco, Cory Palumbo, Jacqueline Paris, Ernesqueshia Parker, Monica Pasantes, Shirley Peet, Laura Pelfrey, Dana Penaherrera and Marcus Peppers. (Marshall, J.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 489 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 488 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 486 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Josh Wein, Brittney Weston, Marion Whatley, Earl White, Kelly Whitlock, Martin Wilbur, Sharece Willcoxon, Linda Willett, Christina Willingham, Shawna Willis, Amanda Willls, Stephanie Wilson, Alexandra Windle, Marquisha Winfrey, Noah Winkler, Donovan Winter, Natasha Wiscombe, Milisa Wise, Christie Witstyn-McCormick, Bethany Woernle, Melissa Wolfer, Karen Wolfolk, Carol Womack, Allison Womack, Noah Wyche, Christopher Wylde, Mika Yoder, Kristian Young, Brittany Young, Emma Zaldivar, Maria Zavala, Morgan Zigler and Melissa Zimmerman-Rawson. (Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 487 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 486 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 485 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 483 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Ebony Simpson, Karen Skupnik, Tammy Smith, Nick Smith, Eric Smith, Joel Smith, Isabella Somers, Charlene Spiry, High Spurgin, Colleen Stanard, Michelle Stankey, Jeffery Stanley, Rebeccah Stanley, Jordan Stanley, Jessica Stanley, Christie Steelman, Jennifer Stephens, Amy Stevens, Janet Stevens, Candace Stewart, Marty Stone, Nicholas Stone, Cory Sullivan, Jodi Suttle, Kathleen Svinning, Nathan Swanson, Teresa Switzer, Heather Tate, Tracee Taylor, Mary Taylor, Crystal Taylor, Matthew Telford, Jennifer Temchack, Jonathan Tenant, Courtney Terpening, Rosah Terrell, Stephanie Terrell-Gandy, Angellina Terry, Shannon Thivierge, Christine Thomas, Kate Thompson, Kristen Thompson, Claire Thompson, Emily Thrift, Mykayla Thurston-Householder, Emily Tipton, Caitlin Toedt, Stephanie Tonnon, Brenda Torero-Quesada, Isiah Torres, Jennifer Tricca, Sarah Trimble, Jon Trott, Kyle Truman, Candice Trusty, Sara Turrentine, Chelsie Udager, Sarah Urquiza, David Utrup, Kirsten Valdez, Edgar Valdivia, Ariel Valenzuela, Verga Valincento, Scott Van Horn, Lindsey Van Zee, Robin Vandenakker, Laura Vanyur, Brenda Vaughn, Sumika Vickers, Catherine Vicknair, Cheryl Vitale, Tracee Vogel, Kyle Wagner, Laurin Walczyk, Barbara Walker, Kellie Wall, Rolando Wallace, Richard Wallach, Kenneth Wallington, Eric Wang, Harrison Wardwell, Cortney Wayman, Kate Webb and Amelia Webster. (Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 484 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 481 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kitora Jones, Valerie Jones, Kortnie Jones, Hope Jones, Amy Jones-Baskin, Kandy Jones-Smith, Peter Jorgenson, Jeanette Joseph, Christopher Juarez, Patricia Justiniano, Jessica Kamay, Todd Kauffman, Dashleen Kaur, Salinda Kay, Rebecca Keeton, Christopher Kelly, Alicia Khan, Trishia Kibling, Kelly Kiggans, Bridgette Kimball, Debra King, Melinda Kohls, Valerie Kolbush, Troy Kowatch, Jessica Kranson, Gregg Kreischer, Laura Kuhn, Katelyn Kumorek, Cassandra Lacayo, Christina Ladd, Krista Lagamba, Michael Lamon, Kurt Landgren, Michelle Lang-Gough, Savannah Lankford, Benjamin Latham, Arlene Lawton, Jay Layton, Samantha Layton, Amy Lee, Parker Lefevre, Christina Leszcynski, Ashleigh Lewis, Stacey Lilly, Robert Limkemann Jr, Cristy Livramento, Jennifer Lizon-Kearney, Bryan Llanos, Bradley Logan, Gesche Lombard, Nichole Lombardo, Kathy Loomis, Eduardo Lopez, Freddy Lopez, Christina Lopez, Jessica Lopez, Carlton Lowe Jr, Rhonda Lowe-Chin, Julie Lowther, Tracee Lundeen, Kevin Lynch, Giovanni Maccagno, Kimberly Mackie, Jamie Maese, Maleko Mahinay, Cristian Maldonado, Heather Mandrell, Paul Manis, Ciera Maples, Robin Martin, Melinda Martinez, Liam Marucci, Erin Mascher, Shani Mason, Veronica Mason, Lynnette Matheny, Doug Matheny II, Lesley Mathews, Karen Matishen, Steven Matthews, Alicia May, Olivia Mayer, Marilyn Mcbride, Amanda Mccall, Joseph Mccarthy, Dwayne Mcclendon, Lisa Mccluskey, Shauna Mccullough and Marymargaret Mccullough. (Marshall, J.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 483 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 482 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 480 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Christina Perpich, Jamella Person, Shanna Peterson-Reeves, Rebecca Petrich, Kyle Pfeiffer, Amanda Pham, Brenda Phang, Matthew Phoenix, Charles Pickett, Patricia Pietz, Jason Pine, Thomas Piper, Justin Pitman, Sonja Pittman, Ciara Pitts, Dave Plisko, Scott Polito, Amber Ponce, Soyla Portillo, Dee Powell, Brooke Powers, James Pritchard, Patricia Puckett, Nakia Quattlebaum, Tracey Quay, Marco Quinhoes, Rudy Quintanilla, Heather Raczynski, Divya Radhakrishnan, Stacy Raleigh, Kimberly Rape, Margaret Ray, Rodell Ray, II, Tina Ream, Lavon Redlin, Sarah Reinert, Nicole Renard, Christian Reyes, Maia Reynolds, Anna Reynolds, Kim Richardson, Maegan Ring, Kendell Rivera, Angel Rivere, Tammy Roach, Darriel Robinson, Derek Robinson, Lisa Robinson, Jessica Rocco, Diane Rodgers, Lydia Rodriguez, Kipp Rogers, Mia Rogers, Debbie Rojas, Nancy Romero, Lizbett Romero, Carrie Roper, Erik Rosas, Hailey Rosenblum, Esther Ross, Jessica Rouse, Rebecca Rouseff, Amber Rumberger, Taquetta Russ, Michael Saechao, Lori Saguil, Paul Salazar, Seyed Salimabadi, Ryan Sambuco, Dredarius Sampson, Rachel Sanchez, Nathelia Sanders, Sherrie Santaniello, Oscar Saravia, Amy Savage, Brandi Schaub, Jessica Schmidle, Jennifer Schnidt-Redmond, Kimberly Schouten, Kirstie Schroeder, Nancy Schulze, Crystal Scott, Elizabeth Selby, Drew Senior, Edward Shea, Shyla Shelton, Laura Shupe, Jonathan Sikora, Cassandra Silva, Sheryl Silvers and Chalmers Simpson, Jr.. (Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 481 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 480 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 7, 2013 Filing 479 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 478 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Johnnie Grant, Christie Greene, Sherette Gregory, Stuart Grey, Keegan Griffin, Richelle Griffiths, Barbara Renee Grindle, Susan Grindle-Sanders, Jamie Groff, Aneta Grzejka, Deniece Guerrero, Chae Guillot, Erin Gyorkos, Kimberly Gyselinck, Danielle Hall, Morgun Hall, Heather Hall, Hanif Hamid, Rachel Haner, Whitney Hardeman, Anthony Hardy, Michelle Hardy, Tammy Harless, Jessica Harned, Julia Harris, Jasmine Harris, Brooke Harrison, Amber Hashimoto, Katelyn Haugen, Jeremy Havard, Ryan Haynam, Jacinta Haynes, Courtney Heavner, Christopher Hefner, Charlene Hemphill-Bowman, Kacee Henderson, Ashley Hendricks, Ladonna Hennig, Kelly Henzlik, Julie Hernandez, Ryan Hess, Krystal Hessberger, Faalafua Hicks, Tatiana Hill, Gina Hines, Danielle Hinson, Michael Hitt, Kelley Hodge, Kristina Holgersen, Gabrielle Holik, Kyle Holmes, Gabriel Hopper, Diondra Horsey, Nancy Hotopp, Mandi Howard, Andrea Howell, Janet Howell, Jessica Hudock, Jessica Humphrey, Sheena Hunt, Jacques Hunter, Chelsea Ice, Hugh Ifill, Erika Ingebo, Patricia Irick, Janelle Isaac, Tyshaun Jackson, Christopher Jackson, Jamie Jackson, Eric Jacquez, Lori James, Tiffany Jamison, Shanesia Jaudon, Frantzy Jean-Pierre, Lacey Jelle, Billyesha Jenkins, William Johnson, Stephanie Johnson, Eric Johnson, Alex Johnson, Cortney Johnson, Jada Johnson, Meshelle Johnson, Amanda Johnson-Moore and Susan Johnston. (Marshall, J.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 478 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 477 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 476 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jeaneen Dewitt, Daniel Diaz, Damien Diederich, Tara Digiacomo, Crystal Dilley, Jessie Dinkel, Robert Dix Jr, Melanie Dodson, Douglas Dohr, Javier Dominguez, Marie Donahue, Sharon Donaldson, Natasha Donaldson, Hector Done, Sheena Donorovich, Amanda Doss, Corey Douglas, Amanda Downs, Josh Drinko, Amelia Duarte, Kevin Duclos, Ashley Duenos-Henry, Courtney Duncan, Kaitlyn Dupuy, Katie Dysinger, Taylor Eades, Jessica Ederle, Ken Edler, Amy Ehrhardt, Patricia Ellis, Kellye Eng, Emily Erakovich, Samantha Eskuchen, Cynthia Eslinger, Michelle Esparza, Travis Estes, Sassan Estrada, Norma Estrada, Greg Eswine, Kaitlyn Eubanks, Russell Eugenio, Crystal Evans, Kaili Evans, Chelsea Eytcheson, Christine Fairchild, Andrea Falcon, Joshua Falk, Razieh Farniam, Lynn Favreau, Katrina Feeney, Alexis Fergusson, Brian Fernandez, James Ferretti, Sue Findo, Beverly Fisher, Shelby Fisk, Ryan Foray, Joy Fordham, Cassandra Foster, Joseph Franta, Annie Fredericks, Melanie Fusco, Michelle Gaffney, Bobby Gaffney, Tammy Gaines, Kristi Galek, Blake Gallison, Richard Galvan, Benjamin Gandy, Daniel Garcia, Andy Garcia, Paula Garcia, Ricardo Garcia, Janelle Garneau, Jennifer Garrison, Violeta Gates, Ashley Gearhart, Stephany Geng, Jennifer Ghegan, Mercaidez Gillem, Kim Giovanni, Peter Giove II, Janett Glasgow-Hill, Kelly Glass, Stephen Gledhill, Holly Godwin, Ashley Goge, Rebecca Goldsmith, Gwendolyn Gomez, Erin Gonzales and Rachel Gossett. (Marshall, J.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 476 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 475 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 474 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rachael Bulter, Brandon Burgie, Laura Burkett, Lindsay Burns, Lauren Burns, Alysha Burton-Bakanoff, Laurie Caballero, Lisa Cabrera, Ryan Campbell, Christine Campbell, Rachel Campbell, Yvette Campbell, Barb Campbell-Hone, Nicole Cannon, Yerlenis Carabantes, Jasmine Carino, Carmen Carley, Jessica Carlson, Kelly Carnes, Lisa-Marie Carr, Cherryl Carrillo, Rosalie Carroll, Kelsey Cassidy, Sarah Cassidy, Sierra Castaneda-Garcia, Brenda Castro, Nicollette Celeste, Kevin Charles, Todd Chasse, Katheryn Chilsted, Lisa Christensen, Julie Christensen, Danielle Cipolla, Melissa Clawson, Vanessa Clayton, Nicolas Clements, Derek Clinton, Garrett Cohen, Ashley Cole-Thomas, Nancy Colvin, Adam Combs, Amanda Cook, Shawn Corcoran, Leilani Cordova, Amber Corner, Shalind Cottey, Melissa Cottrell, Leah Coughlin, Matthew Counts, Jordan Cox, Susan Cox, Shatara Cox-Wyatt, Brandy Crady-Coble, Jeraldine Crawford, Marquita Crew, Emily Crichton, Justin Crist, George Crutcher III, Juan Cuevas, Julie Cummins-Johnson, Lauren Curtis, Jessica Cuscino, Erin Dade, Audrey Dades-Reed, Kari Dahlgren, Priscilla Dalton, Stephen Daly, Kelly Damelio-Ziemski, Alfred Daniels, Leslie Dastnai, Ashton Davis, Wendy Davis, Christina Davis-Castle, Helen De La Hunt, William De La Pena, Philip Dean, Lindsey Dearmond, Jeannine Debnar, Kristopher Decker, Cory Dedual, Salvatore Degrazia, Ellen Deible-Stachurski, Lane Dekorte, Christopher Delany, Christina Delaportiller, Ruth Delgado, Joseph Delgado, Barbara Demedio, Chaz Demeere, Brooke Desforges-Carmack, Korey Devaughn and Megan Devencenzi. (Marshall, J.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 474 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 473 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 472 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Brittany Abajian, Paul Acerno, Brian Ackerson, Brittany Adam, Ryan Adame, Nichole Adderley, Maricella Aguirre, Rachel Albert, Giovanni Albertolli, Laura Alexander, Lewis Allen IV, Bert Allsbrook, Tiffany Amato, Tyler Anderson, India Anderson, Cameron Anderson, Krista Anderson, Macrina Aquino-Venegas, Joshua Aranda, Celina Arbelaez, Terri Archambault, Kelsie Archer, Jahn Arndt, Jackie Arnold, Alyssa Arroyo, Katie Asare, Carly Atkinson, Katherine Atwell, Kelly Ayala-Chicas, Vicki Baney, Cathryn Banuelos, Katherine Barber, Tanesha Barnes, Alissa Barnett, Meagan Barron-Starks, Dean Bartlett, Enrique Batallas, Valerie Bateman, Mary Batson, Daniel Battle, Mequaita Battle, Bianca Bauer, Melissa Bax, Kari Becker, Alice Ben-Harush, Jessica Bennett, Mandy Benton, Sarah Berndt, Joseph Bertram, Lauren Bewley, Randy Bill, Nathan Blackwell, Ashley Blakley, Lisa Blilie, Christine Bliven, Taylor Boccella, Mandy Bohlken, Lindsey Boike, Fernando Bolanos, Donna Bonanno, Leslie Bonner, Katie Booth, Susan Booth, Cynthia Boston, Dawn Bosworth, Cullen Boudreaux, Paula Bowlin, Leteah Bowman, Mitch Bracke, Allen Bradby, Sarah Branche, Sabrina Brazle, Brian Brekke, Melissa Brewer, Patricia Bridge, Krystal Bridgewater, Todd Briglin, John Brogna, Stefanie Brotherton-Spaulding, Hagen Broussard, Devon Brown, Tiffany Brown, Alice Brown, Sharea Brown, Janie Brown, Elizabeth Bruman, Christa Bryan, Candice Bryson, Nathan Buchholz and Sarah Bullis. (Marshall, J.)
October 7, 2013 Filing 472 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 5, 2013 Filing 471 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 470 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Isaac Ward, Mike Warden, Elizabeth Warren, Stephanie Waters, Latoya Watford, Angela Watkins, Gavin Watkis, Alexander Watson, Tarcha Watson, Rhonda Watts, Amelia Watts, Shawnta Weathers, Maunel Weatherspoon, Michael Weaver, Israel Weaver, Jason Webb, Cassie Webb, Courtney Webb, Danielle Weckop, Robert Weinsteiger, Lisa Wells, Kimberly Wendowski, Michelle Wertman, James Westberry, Amelia Wheeler, Mireya White, Tyler White, Julie White-Vanhoose, Karen Whitman, Karen R. Whitman, Johnny Whittwell, Lindsey Wichern, Steven Wichern, Shannon Wiehe-Ratterman, Kristina Wilcox, Jesse Wiley, Sarah Wilkerson, Robert Williams, Sharon Williams, Rachel Williams, Deshawn Williams, Victoria Williams, Brooklyn Williams, Jocelyn Williams, Janerrial Williams, Gina Williams, John Williams, Gilberto Williams, Joshua Willing, Jaime Willis, M. Trevor Willobee, Tawny Wilson, Arielle Wilson, Amanda Wingerd, Whitney Wininger-Kinhead, Kara Wolfe, Megan Wolle, Enissa Wood, Amber Woodruff, Ryan Woods, Jennifer Woodward, Jennifer Wooldridge, Aleesia Worden, Eric Woullard, Elizabeth Wright, Celina Wright, Cynthia Wszalek, Whitney Wudell, Laura Wyman, Robert Wynns, Cassandra Wysocki, Chris Yancey, Brittany Yensel, Tiffanie Young, Cora Young, Christine Young, Andrea Young, Nancy Youngeberg, Anthony Younger, Sr., Lindsey Zajac, Carlos Zambrano, Matthew Zanfagna, Elaine Zarr, Lindsey Zavzitz, Alex Zemanek and Jason Zimolong. (Lichter, David)
October 5, 2013 Filing 470 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 5, 2013 Filing 469 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 468 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Melissa Taylor, Roger Telesford, Jennifer Tennant, Anthony Terpstra, Jodi Terri, Teverrah Thomas, Jordan Thomas, Lakenda Thomas, Derick Thomas, Sr., Dana Thomas-Savoroski, Tonetta Thompson, Anndrea Thompson, Arthur Thompson, Amanda Thompson, Marcus Thompson, Shannon Thompson, Karly Thornton, Jenny Thorpe, Bobby Threnhauser, III, Stephanie Tibbs, John Tiemeyer, Kimberly Tigner, Molly Tilleson, Kristina Tinoco, Audrey Tjalsma, Tarah Tobolski, Anthony Tomei, Amanda Tomeldan, Roger Tomlinson, Cheryl Tori, Genry Tornes, Angela Torrence, Bethany Torres, Luis Torres, Brittany Torstrup, David Tramontana, Nia Travis, Jennifer Treat, Kailey Trent, Melody Truitt, Chris Truslow, Andrew Tschudy, Joesph Tuite, Kemal Turgut, Shayla Turner, Kenneth Tuy, Betty Tyler, Erica Tyler, Sarah Tyler, Lisa Uliasz, Joshua Umo, Christian Unger, Jillian Ungrey, Brianna Upp-Vanden Heuvel, Alexis Upton, Ryan Uran, Chris Uziemblo, Allison Vaill, Nathaniel Valenzuela, Jennifer Vallor, Sharon Vance, Michelle Vance, Kimberly Vandergriff, Angela Vandyk-Drown, Meagan Vanpelt, Christina Vansickle, Cesar Vasquez, Chantyl Vasquez, Kenon Veals, Christine Veard, Elizabeth Vera, Miranda Vesey, Heather Vickers-Henson, Rebecca Victoria, Melissa Villa, Jessica Villela-Clark, Amber Visak, Meghan Voelz-Schmitt, Lori Vorachek, Patty Vorwerk, Teresa Vulysteke, Troy Wachob, Nicole Wade, Donald Wahl, Ben Wakild, London Waldon, Nancy Walker, Susan Waller, Samantha Walsh, Laura Walton, Tyler Wann and Devin Ward. (Lichter, David)
October 5, 2013 Filing 468 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 5, 2013 Filing 467 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 466 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Dillon Shanks, Leanne Sharpenter, Chantel Shaw, Lawanda Shaw, Victoria Shea, Kyle Shea, Michael Shearer, Danielle Sheehan, Beau Shelton, Ryan Shibley, Ryan Shook, Kevin Showley, Sara Shrader, Amethyst Shrum, Billy Shue, Derrick Shuler, Virginia Shy, Suzanne Silvers, Tracy Simino, Michael Simmen, Jumario Simmons, Willie Singleton, Sarah Sinopoli, Gary Sixkiller, Jean Skillington, Liz Skokowski, Butch Skradis, Jason Small, Jamie Smith, Kendra Smith, Morgan Smith, Emily Smith, Benjamin Smith, Abigail Smith, Jamel Smith, Nicki Smith, Natalie Smits, Ashley Smoot, Marcia Snyder, Julie Sobania, Jaclyn Solarski, Kristie Solomon, Samantha Soltys, Samantha Somerville, Kevin Sorenson, Troy Sousa, Tracy Sowell, Ryan Spagnola, Lucas Sparrow, Shannon Spatz, Katelyn Spiel, Hillary Spradlin-Storey, Kay Spychalla, Tracey St. Pierre, Stacy Stafford, Aaron Stanley, Darryl Staples, Brittany Steadman, Jennifer Steele, Kyle Steele, Kelly Steen, Donetta Stegall, Maya Stephenson, Jared Stevick, Richard Stewart, Jennifer Stiles, Pam Stillson, Sharon Stinnette, Steven Stoltz, Stoner Stoner, Katrina Stoutmire, Mark Strauchman, Curt Strodtbeck, Barbara Stroyne, Nicole Stumph, Israel Sullivan, Melissa Sullo, Harold Suminguit, III, Michael Sunseri, Kelly Suratt, Randy Swafford, Stacy Swatsworth, Michael Taad, Cecelia Tankersley, Charlene Tanner, Keri Tate, Jennifer Taylor, Carrie Taylor and Jennifer Taylor. (Lichter, David)
October 5, 2013 Filing 466 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 5, 2013 Filing 465 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 464 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Cheryl Ricketts, Cathy Riddle, Maria Riegelmann, Samuel Rinehart, Steven Ring, Kendra Ringer, David Rissanen, Danielle Ritchie, Marcos Rivas, Belen Rivera, Lucy Rivera, Kristie Rivera, Jesseca Rivers, David Roberts, Jacqueline Roberts-Sabo, Debrah Robey, Tanika Robins, Bridgett Robinson, Kimberley Robinson, Gusta Robinson, Katelyn Roche, Carrie Rockwood, Joel Rodgers, Jonathan Rodosevich, Rachel Rodriguez, Julianne Rodriguez, Ryan Rodriguez, Kimberly Roebuck, Michael Rogers, Leslie Rogers, Amber Rogerson, Tiffany Root, Tonya Rose, Stephanie Rubago, Judith Rubio, Cristina Rubio, Ashley Rucks, Christina Ruiz, Maria Ruiz, Samantha Ryan, Peter Ryckebosch, Tyler Rydberg, Elizabeth Sabic, Marritsa Saldana, Leslee Salzman, Ashley Samuel, Jesse Sanchez, Hugo Sanchez-Martinez, Anjeanette Sandoval, Carlos Santos, Audrey Sargent, Buna Sath, Belkys Savinovich, Michael Sawicki, Ashley Saxton, Nancy Sayers, Simona Scalisi, Juanita Schill, Brelynn Schloo, Brianna Schmidt, Megan Schmitt, Katherine Schmitt, Alexis Schneider, Maria Schroeder, Stephanie Schultz, Maranda Schultz, Allison Scigalski, Carol Scofield, Haley Scott, Charmaine Scott, Anthony Scott, Brittany Seaborn, Tina Seabury, Lisa Seery, Halley Seibel, Derrick Seitz, Jaclyn Sellars-Weber, Jamie Sellmeyer, Adam Senicka, Megan Sergeichik, Sandra Serrano, Luz Sesmas and Amy Sexton. (Lichter, David)
October 5, 2013 Filing 464 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 5, 2013 Filing 463 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 462 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Samuel Ordonez, Jake Orona, Randi Ortelli, Antonio Ortiz, Penny Ostrander, Kevin Oswald, Roberto Otero, Linda Owens, Matt Owens, Katie Owens, Ashley Pagaduan-Crespo, Ashley Page, Alecia Page, Jason Palank, Jeremy Palmer, Angela Pardi, Patricia Parisi, Diane Parker, Jeremiah Parker, Ian Parker, Ramona Parks, Camille Parsons, Natalie Pascolla, Brandon Patrock, Steph Pavlick, Sarah Payette, Jaqueline Payne, Melissa Payton, Mark Peace, David Pecora, Britany Peek, Michael Pellegrini, Tracy Pellerin, Kristol Pelletier, Robert Pensanti, Maria Perry, Shalena Peterson, Kaitlin Peterson, Tyesha Peterson, Janet Phang, Ciena Phillips, Paul Phillips, Antonio Pietrolungo, Tyler Pilkington, Hector Pineda, Ryan Plowman, Angelena Plummer, Jennifer Poe, Laurie Pohlman, Carla Polchin, Vanona Pope, Venetia Portillo, Emily Postell, Carsin Powell, Jennifer Price, Anne Prideaux, Tonya Pruett-Fargnoli, Jevaye Pugh-Sanders, Brenda Punteney, James Purdon, Joshua Putnam, Michael Quiery, Elizabeth Rabius, Amy Ragin, Dana Rajnys, Benjamin Ramos, Jazmin Rangel, Tera Ratti, Brandi Raupers, Karen Ray, Lydia Ray, Laura Raysor, Robert Rector, Kelly Redding, Brianna Reed, Heather Reitz, Susi Rentzsch, Stephanie Reome, Jayne Repp, Eva Reynolds, Priscilla Reynoso, Savannah Rezarch-Bird, Trista Rhoads, Keith Rhodes, Molly Rich, Kimberly Richards, Daniell Richardson, Jason Richman and Jolanda Richmond. (Lichter, David)
October 5, 2013 Filing 462 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 4, 2013 Filing 461 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 460 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Heather Lindmeier, Rebecca Lindsey, Brad Lindsey, Princess Littleton, Cassi Long, Jaime Longever, Leslie Longo, Mariah Longoria, Aurelio Lopez, Christine Lough, Margaret Loughman, Heather Love, Rebecca Lovitch, Jonathan Lowery, Alisha Lucas, Jennifer Lucero, Rebecca Lucey, Kaitlin Lugos, Amanda Luna, Daniel Luna, Michelle Lund, Raymond Lunsford, Aryale Mahan, Marcos Malianos-Moran, Christina Mallory, Ashley Malone, Emily Mangin, Joyce Mangum, Jason Mann, Amber Mann, Stephanie Mann, Amanda Marks, Kristina Marquette, Holly Marski, Rebecca Martin, Catherine Martin, Amy Martin, Krista Martin, Tanya Martinez, Angel Martinez, Candice Marx, Renee Masse, Gerald Massie, John Mata, Jennifer Mathias, Chelsea Matthews, Stephanie Mattock, Matthew Mattson, Shanice Maughmer, Ronica Maxner, Robyn Mayo, Destiny Mcburney, April Mccall-Ehrhardt, Heather Mccallister, Jade Mcclane, Maxine Mccoy, Patrick Mcfarland, Wendy Mcglinchy, Ashley Mcgoveran, Alexias Mckenny, Jessica Mckenzie, Ashley Mcmahan, Sarah Mcmahon, Jessica Mcmullen, Heather Mcmurrin, Shauna Mcnally, Colleen Mcnamara, Jaime Mcneil, Clariese Mcqueen, Ryan Mcreynolds, Paul Mcwilliams, Jilian Meadows-Allen, Riel Medrano, Carita Meeks, Rey Mendoza, Morgan Merwin-Picard, Troy Metcalf, Sara Metro, Cortney Meza, Judith Meza, Kirsten Michener, Carol Miller, Carl Miller, Brittney Milo, Lauren Miluszusky, Daniel Minckler, Wes Minnich and Nicolas Miramontes. (Marshall, J.)
October 4, 2013 Filing 460 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 4, 2013 Filing 459 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 458 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jessica Miranda, Zahirah Miranda Perez, Joseph Miriani, Tracy Mischke, Latrice Mitchell, La Teria Moch-Haney, Adel Mohamed, Jason Mohr, Melissa Mominee, Cassandra Monin-Rudewicz, Julie Monsen, Karla Montenegro, Christopher Montes, Heather Moody, Leonard Moore, Leah Moore, Lisa Moore, Zach Moore, Tacarra Moore, Roberta Morales, Claudia Morales, Kevin Morales, Jonathan Morgan, Charlie Morgan, Kathryn Morgan-Siegle, Tara Morningstar, Chelsey Morris, Trena Morris, Stephanie Morrison-Turner, Tracy Moskaloff, Kiara Mosley, Maria-Victoria Moss, Chris Mossbarger, Cheryl Moulton, Michael Moyer, Geraldine Mozeleski, John Mueller, Zaahir Muhammad, Khadijh Muhammad, Katie Mullins, Kristina Mummert, Elisa Munley, Mari Munro, Kevin Murchison, Taj Murphy, Maribel Murphy, Jonathan Murphy, Rachael Musacchia, Angie Myers, Roosevelt Myers III, Heissen Nakasone, Jasmine Navarrete, Elizabeth Navarro, Whitney Neal, Brooke Negron, Gaelen Nelson, Allison Nelson, Amy Newman, Cindy Newman, Marie Newman, Kien Nguyen, Nicholas Nguyen, Deanna Nicholas, Thomas Nichols, Nena Nicholson, Mirhi Nicholson, Lou Ann Nicholson, Aliea Niehaus, Leanne Nilsen, Alicia Noonan, Melissa Norman, Amanda North, Veronica Nunez, Kaylee O'brien, Paul Ochoa, Sara Ochs, Ashley Oconnell, Elizabeth Oconnor, Nathan Oddo, Edith Oden, Hanna Odom, Catherine Odonnell, Justin Ohlson, Brad Okelly, Jamie Olinger, Alixandra Olitzky, Kelly Olivanti-Solorino, Lilian Oliveira, Amy Oliver, Kristine Olsen, Jerry Omiagbo, Alexis Operle and Lorrie Orange. (Marshall, J.)
October 4, 2013 Filing 458 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 4, 2013 Filing 457 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 456 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Meghen Jones, Racheal Jones, Michael Jordan, Brandon Jurasevich, Millie Kahla, Cheryl Kaminer, Matthew Kaney, Matt Karam, Mavis Kari, Katherine Karpel, Justina Kates, Apryl Keene, Kindel Keener, Devin Keith, Kimberly Kelley, Kathryn Kelly, Stephanie Kelly, Christina Kemp, Lauren Kennedy, John Ketch, Kamille Ketema, Alexander Khattab, Kevin Kidney Jr, David Kilborn, Sabrina Killian, Ryan Kimbrough, Adam King, Carolyn King-Turen, Rachel Kinsman, Emily Kirkstadt, Desirae Kissell, Christin Klausman, Lauren Klofft, Bonita Knowell, Jennifer Knutson, Gabrielle Kocienski, Kayla Koczka, Lindsay Koehler, Breanna Konrade-Helm, Elaine Kornokovich, Bobbijo Kosko, Melissa Kramer, Mark Kreft, Ashley Kroll, Rita Kucirek, Sulena Kumnertsena, Cassandra Kupniewski, Katie Kypros, Wendy Laber-Hardy, Desiree Lacey, Andre Lackey, Stacy Lafargue, Matthew Lafeir, Ashley Lafever, Cody Laframboise, Matthew Lally, Thomas Lambert, Regina Lamson, Jessica Landwert-Ashmore, Jamie Lane, Bonnie Lane, Mary-Michael Langlitz, Amanda Langston, Pamela Lapinson, Jamaal Larry, Joshua Larue, Christopher Lasch, Jeremy Latshaw, Melissa Lauer, Kelly Lavallee, Jared Lawrence, Beverly Lawrence, Alexandra Layne, Michelle Lee, Shirly Lee, Jennifer Legins, Karen Leich, Christy Lejkowski, Lisa Lenoci, Kirby Lenox-Moss, Nancy Lentz, Jaclyn Lepird, Alanna Leslie, Penny Lester, Emma Lezak, Maleia Liddell, Meagan Lignar, Margaret Ligon-Manning, Laura Likens, Kristina Lilly, Ana Luiza Lima and Marion Lind. (Lichter, David)
October 4, 2013 Filing 456 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 4, 2013 Filing 455 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 451 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Regina Henderson, Theresa Henige, Sophia Henriquez, Jose Henriquez, Benjamin Henry, Steven Henson, Elizabeth Herman, Ronald Hernandez, Tanya Hernandez, Mariluz Hernandez, Carolina Hernandez, David Herrera, Amanda Hewitt, Hope Heyward, Shannon Higgins, Genelle Hill, Cameron Hill, Matthew Hill, Jenna Hill, April Hines, Angela Hinshaw, Mandy Hinson, Jaime Hinson, Tiffany Hinton-Johnson, Melissa Hoang, Brittany Hoch, Jared Hockman, Rhonda Hodges, Laura Hodges-Kinsel, Shane Hoffman, Kathleen Hoffmann, Erin Hogan, Mari Holland, Cigi Hollingsworth, Desiree Holman, Brenda Holt, Rebecca Homza, Clarisa Honn, Brian Hoppel, Adam Hostetler, Casey House, Andrea Householder, Anny Howard, Anitra Howard, Erica Hubble, Mark Huber, Larry Huddleston, Kathy Hughes, Nicole Hunt, Alicia L. Hunter, Alicia Hunter, Ziaul Huq, Anthony Husar, Heidi Hutchinson, Carrie Hutchinson, Guinevere Hutchko, Kevin Imler, Cathie Infranca, Kyle Ingraham, Heather Ingram, Meherzad Irani, Rangel Irias, Stephanie Isaac, Endika Iturburu, Maggie Ivy, Keri Jackson, Rita Jacob, Alyse Jacobi, Christina Jaouen, Sally Jarvis, Michael Jefferson, Ryan Jeffries, Ryan Jenkins, Ryan Jensen, Shawn Jensen-Spain, Janee Jessup, Casey Jimenez, Nancy John, Betty Johnson, Brittany Johnson, Jayme Johnson, Fred Johnson, Teri Johnson, Christopher Johnson, Audrey Johntony, Todd Jones and Amanda Jones. (Lichter, David)
October 4, 2013 Filing 454 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 453 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Lisa Glasgow, Kristin Glinko, Amelia Glymph, Cameron Godwin, Jessica Goeser, Gretchen Goetz, Exiomara Goins, Brad Gold, Dorothy Golden, Barbara Golinski, Josh Gonzales, Chantille Gooding, Susan Gorney, Matthew Gorr, Jenny Goschke, Rhonda Granger, Jacob Grant, Yolanda Grant, Corey Grant, Kimberly Grassano, Deborah Gray, Dawn Gray, Ryan Gray, Rachel Gray, Sean Green, Josh Green, Jon Erik Greene, Tammy Greer, Leah Greif, Tara Grieb, Lynn Griffin, Amy Grist, Tommie Grochoske, Elizabeth Gruen, Courtney Grumney, Raquel Guadarrama-Ramirez, Jennifer Gude, Jessica Guffey-Sickles, Colleen Guilfoyle, Jamie Gundlach, Julie Guy, Jennifer Guyer, Stephanie Guyette, Megan Guzman, Matthew Haag, Krystine Hagen, Anne-Marie Hager, Carrie Hagopian, Stephanie Hairston, Cassandra Halchak, Richard Hale, Gina Hale, Natasha Haley, Jonathan Hall, Maria Hall, Cameron Hallacy, Johann Hamilton, Ashley Hamilton, Diana Hamilton, Amy Hamilton, Marie Hammond, James Hampton, Nicole Hannah, Elizabeth Hansen, Heidi-Jo Hanson, Lacie Hardie, Angela Hardt, Brandi Harnish, Cherish Harrell, Brandon Harris, Ameris Harris, Patrice Harris Powell, Jennay Harrison, Anna Hartman, Eboni Hatchet, Kelley Hauk, Leeanna Haycox, Chanda Hayes, Destiny Head, Stephanie Heatherly-Mcdaniel, Elizabeth Heaton, Breana Heckenlively, Clifford Heir, Evan Helams, John Henderson and Lauren Henderson. (Marshall, J.)
October 4, 2013 Filing 453 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 4, 2013 Filing 452 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 450 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Juan Escriva De Romani, Sophia Eszes, Leslie Eutsler, Carrie Evans, Stacy Eyre, Jacquelyn Faidiga, Aubrey Fairbairn, Norberto Falcon, Sarah Falkner, Lauren Falkowski, Abdul Farhat, Jessie Farinholt, Marcela Fedulo, Joseph Feig, Erica Feige, Jill Felts, Anna Ferguson, Francesca Ferrante, Jamie Figueroa, Diego Figueroa, Nicole Filian, Joseph Finigan, Robyn Firmani, Michelle Fischer, Suzanne Fischer, Amanda Flack-Payne, Kaitlyn Flaherty, Rachel Fleckinger, Tywanisha Fleming, Samantha Fletch, Alexandra Fletch, Skylar Flinn, Daniel Flora, Esperanza Flores, Susan Flores, Melanie Foiles, Patricia Ford, Myeshia Ford, Sharon Fortier-Odea, Erin Fossa, Alexis Foster, Chris Fowler, Brandenn Fowler, Rhonda Fowler, Pamela Fowler Lonergan, Amayrani Franco, Cesar Franco Orostico, Mitchell Frazer, Amber Frazier, Taiquisha Freemon, Kendra Friel, Vanessa Frietsch-Bristol, Amanda Frost, Christopher Gadson, Heather Gaither, Nichole Galacki, Roger Galan, Cassie Galarneau, Elaine Gallardo, Erin Gallashaw, Paula Gallo, Jose Galvan, Catherine Galvin, Travis Gann, Melissa Gannon, Patti Garay, Michael Garbarini, Eric Garcia, Annie Garcia, Susan Garcia, Marilyn Garza, Jordan Gasbarra, Ryan Gash, Shinise Gaskins-Singletary, Nicole Gauthier, George Gazzola, Lance Geary, Alek Geho, Cynthia Gehring, Amanda Gemas, Arianna Genovesi, Reema George, Michael George, Amanda George-Sharp, Tiffany Gerde, Kelley Gerics, Michael Getsee, Danielle Gilbert, David Giles, Jamie Gillespie, Sondra Gillespie, Simone Gilpin, Ashlei Gingrich, Dennis Girard and Rachel Giron. (Marshall, J.)
October 4, 2013 Filing 451 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 4, 2013 Filing 450 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 3, 2013 Filing 449 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 448 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Christopher Crouch, Dorothy Crow, James Csonka, Lance Culver, Raymond Cureton, Corinthia Custard, Katie Cuthbert, Norman Cutler, Goran Cvetic, Hala Dabbous, Mickie Daniels, Juliana Dauth, Patricia Davis, Carmen Davis, Courtney Davis, Heather Davis, Cori Davis, Ruby Davis, Jayna Davis, Terisha Davis, Steffani Davis-Murphy, Joyce Dawson, Jonathan Day, Gina De La Meza, Patricia Dean, Tami Deangelis-Hahn, Nicole Decker, Nicole Dee, Jared Defrancis, Dianna Deguardia, Leana Dehoyos, Lisa Deis, Agne Delabar, Stacy Delaney, Jennifer Deleon, Amanda Deleva, Ryan Delong, Noelle Delorme, Maegan Delvalle, Richard Dempsey, Callie Denham, Travis Depugh, Honeyetta Derouen, Casey Detterbeck, Andrew Detterbeck, Audrey Devictor, Kristen Deviliss, Audrey Diaz, Kristy Diggs, Sarah Diggs, Lashanna Dillard, John Dinan, Samantha Dion, Zachary Diviney, Elizabeth Doerr, Kristen Doherty, Vanessa Dohner, Charmaine Dollesin, Meghan Donohue, Shannon Dooley, James Downing, Christopher Drake, Rachel Driscoll, Bethany Dubois, James Duffey, Bianca Dujour, Chris Duncan, David Dunnigan, Monica Duque, Jaclyn Duvall, Valerie Dymer, Teresa Eads-Wiggins, Cynthia Eckert, Taylor Eckroth, Sherry Edwards, Kyle Edwards, Rhonda Efthim, Edward Ehlers, Alexis Eichenlaub, Joelle Eid, Megan Eiesland, Kevin Elder, Ethan Ellis, Colleen Ellis, Amber Ellis, Tyler Elvey, Laurie Emma-Gizzi, Lauren Epler, Justin Epting, Paula Erdman, Clifton Erikson and Jamie Ernesto. (Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 448 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 447 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 446 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jessica Cadena, Kezi Cadenhead, Sarah Cain, Guadalupe Calderon, Breanna Campbell, Christina Campion, Ruby Canela, Francisco Cardenas, Heidi Cardinal, Stephanie Carissimi, Peter Carlson, Holly Carr, Josh Carr, Tiffany Carrillo, Jenal Carrington, Jessica Carrozzelli, Madonna Cartwright, Andrea Casella, Linda Cashdollar, Detelin Cashman, Zachary Cassini, Rebecca Castaneda, Chelsea Casterline, Brennon Castillo, Derek Casto, Jessica Castro, Cristina Cawlfield, Angela Cerniglia, Bethany Chabot, Joshua Chace, Jessica Chapman, Sharon Chapman, Lindsey Chapman, Laura Chapman, Timothy Chartrand, Sara Cheshire, Manuel Chico, Johnnie Chum, Tamera Church, Aaron Ciappara, Kristie Cisneros, Jonika Clanton, Melba Claro-Coto, Melissa Clauson, Vishena Clay, Brittany Climer, Ross Coapstick, Wynde Coats, Keyna Cobb, Mike Coburn, Antonio Coburn, Meghan Cockrell, Brittany Coe, Stacie Coen, Amy Cohoon, Ashley Cole, Zachary Cole, Adam Coley, Maria Coley, Tiara Collins, Christina Colucci, Jason Colwell, Jana Compton, Michelle Conaway, Crystal Conklin, Robyn Conn, Nicole Conroy, Jennifer Contois, Deborah Cook, Rachel Corbly, Rebecca Corcoran, Gina Cordan, Joylene Corse, Joshua Cortes, Karla Coss, Adam Cotellessa, Courtney Coughlin, Robyn Couillard, Linzi Coursey, Larrilyn Coward-Demy, Schneal Crain, Lindsey Crane, Sandra Crannell, Sophia Crawford, Susan Creasey, Jeremy Crnkovich, Rebekah Crockatt and Nicole Croft. (Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 446 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 445 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 443 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jennifer Bennett, Erica Benticuaba, Jillian Berezo, Ashley Berg, Katie Bergjord, Penny Bergschneider, Daniel Bevacqua, Nathan Beyer, Melissa Bianco, Natasha Biles, Deborah Billings, Kristy Billups, Alyssa Binder, Anna Birrueta, Lindsey Blackard, Henry Blackledge, Sarah Blagdon, Jennifer Blizzard-Wachob, Melissa Blohowiak-Campbell, Braylin Bloise, Janixa Bogan, Erin Bogenberger, Matthew Boggs, David Bolding, Stefanie Bolyard, William Bond, Susan Bonfiglio, Eileen Bonfiglio, Kristy Bonk, Matt Bonnau, Raisa Boone, Josbany Borrego, Allison Boston, Connie Botello, Mark Bouse, Karen Boutwell, Benjamin Bowen, John Bowers, Brenda Boyd, Michaelan Boyd, Cinnamon Boyd, Kelley Boyette, Nicholas Braccini, Ariel Bradley, Ben Brand, Amanda Branyon, Brenda Bravo, Linsey Breen, Mary Breen, Kristen Breen-Stokes, Teressa Brett, Michelle Brinkley, Haley Brinkley, Juan Briones, Frances Brito, Marianne Britt, Mandy Brooks, Jessica Brown, Andrea Brown, Lauren Brown, Kenyatta Brown, Phillip Brown, Erik Brown, Wendy Broxson, Jennifer Brueckner, Vincent Bruno, Maureen Bruno, Mary Bruno, Bradley Bruton, Stephanie Brynes, Diane Buchheim, Stephanie Buczek, Jennifer Buehler, Aaron Buehrer, Patrick Buhr, Robert Bullion, Ashley Burgett, Anneri Burgos, Krystal Burke, Megan Burkhardt, Joseph Burmeister, Jaxmyne Burnett, Melanie Burnette-Middleton, Betina Burris, Zachary Burris, Heather Burton, Debbie Burton, Ernesto Bustillos, Graf Butler, Kiara Butler, Aaron Byerly, Melanie Byers, Megan Byrd-Bullard and Laurin Cable-Holguin. (Marshall, J.)
October 3, 2013 Filing 444 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 442 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Debbi Smallwood, Timothy Smeja, Christa Smith, Zakari Smith, Lisa Smith, Shay Smith, Aimee Smith, Victoria Smith, Trisha Smith, Akira Smith, Tara Smith, Brian Smith, Reginald Smith, Zachary Smith, Jasmine Smith, Shantrell Smith, Katelyn Smith-Norman, Paul Snay, Patricia Snell, Jenna Snider, Stephanie Snyder, Alicia Solano, Kirsten Soloniewicz, Patrick Sosman, Debra Souza, J Matthew Sowell, Rosa Sowulewski, Michael Spanos, Tabitha Spencer, Sarah Springer, Kathryn Springfield, Teri St Clair, Amy Stacy, Jennifer Staleny, Jesse Stallsmith, Jason Staloski, Janet Staub, Toni Steen, Heather Steinbacher, Amber Steinhour, Kati Stephens, Meaghan Stevens, Braden Stevens, Zachary Stevenson, Joseph Stewart, Ashina Stillis, Nathan Stimson, Nathanial Stokes, Cindy Stone, Tamara Stottlemyer, Nicole Strayve, Nicole Street, Julie Strickland, Rebecca Strowd-Smoker, Melissa Strozyk-McMillian, Katie Stuart, Jason Stuhldreher, Courtney Styles, Shawna Suarez, Brenda Suits, Heather Sullivan, Elizabeth Sullivan, Leella Summerlin, Sarah Summey, Jeremy Sumrall, Chad Sustello, Connie Sutter-White, Kimberly Suttles, Sandra Svoboda, James Swakow, Ayeisha Swan, Charles Swanigon, Aaron Sawyne, Mary Sweeney, Elizabeth Sykes, Kim Szkudlarek, Robert Talbot, Cristian Tamay, Jessie Tapio, Dustin Tate, Joshua Tate, Tony Taylor, Michelle Taylor, Jason Taylor and Sabrina Teeter. (Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 443 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 3, 2013 Filing 442 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 441 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 439 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Melody Rubio, Susan Rud, Donald Rudd, Katherine Rugge, Jemario Rugley, Jenna Russ, Jessica Russell, Kimberly Ruyle, Matthew Ryun, Marko Saad, Monica Sachdev, Allesandra Salazar, Amanda Salazar, Heidi Salisbury, Chayne Saltzman, Sophia Sam, Amanda Samis, Michelle Sampson, Lauren San-Felice, Jennifer Sadlin, Veronica Sandoval, Aja Sanford-Dugan, Elena Santamaria, Lauren Sarricks, Miriam Satossky, Katie Satterfield, Miles Satterfield, Gary Saunders, Jr., Amanda Scappa, Jennifer Scharmen, Tara Schaub, Megan Schery, Samantha Schiller, Ben Schillmoeller, Lori Schmid, Crystal Schmiel, Stephany Schmitt, Paul Schofield, Shayna Schramm, Jennifer Schreiber, Joseph Schroeder, Christal Schroth, Shelly Schultz, Meagan Schwartz, Keanakay Scott, Dana Scott, Kristofer Scull, Victoria Sentz-Hughes, Joshua Serra, Shannon Shafer, Naveed Shahid, Lauren Shaubach, Megan Shay, Veronica Sheehan, Spencer Shelton, Marisa Sherwood, Nadia Shike, Diana Shin, Rachael Shippen, Christina Shively, Lisa Shively, Karisa Shoun, Michelle Shouse, Alexandria Showell, Jason Shudrowitz, Tracy Shupe, Ashley Shy, Al Sibby, Jared Siemers, Darryl Siler, Jeremy Silva, Sergio Silva, Ruth Silver, Andrea Simmons, Tyler Simmons, Christopher Simon, Sasha Simpson, Tazmon Sims, Jody Sinclair, Becky Sinette, Bruce Singletary, Laura Sinks, Kim Skipper, Forest Skufca, Steven Slack, Nisa Slade, Richard Slaten, Shannon Slattery, Kelly Sleezer and Katie Sloan-Carr. (Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 440 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 438 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Katelyn Ackley, Dalton Adams, Sherry Adams, Christy Adams, Tammy Albertsman, Gerardo Alejandro, Rodia Alexander, Stacey Alexander, Michael Alfarone, Shealyn Allen, Melissa Allen, Lori Allen, Shakera Allen-White, Patricia Aloisi, Alia Alsaif, Brittany Altenbach, Alicia Ancel, Shaina Anderson, Kimberly Anderson, Jess Anderson, Deborah Ando, Brooke Andrew, Lindsey Andrews, De Navard Antoine, Amanda Aponte, Christina Aragon, Deirdre Aragon, Dale Aragon, Ana Araujo-Szazepanski, Mallory Ardoin, Christopher Arentz, Eduardo Arevalo, Krista Areyan, Adrian Armstrong, Corey Armstrong, Christine Arnold, Carlos Arredondo, Robert Arthurs, Stephen Asbury, Heather Ashley, Heather Ater, Brittni Auch, Melissa Avery, Brian Avila, Alejandro Baez, Douglas Bailey, Patrick Bailey, Wendy Bailey-Odonnell, Kimberly Baker, Tammy Bakken, Brett Balach, Randy Baldazo, Brian Baliles, Maggie Ball, Halla Banafa, Sarah Banville-Lenbo, Timothy Barker, Maranda Barker-Jones, Jerry Barnes, Brandon Barnes, Tia Barnes, Mitchell Barnes, Brooker Barnes, Shaina Barrett, Chelsey Barrett, Malorie Barstrom, Dennis Barta, Cieamber Bartell, C Alex Baskerville, Rhett Bass, Bobbie Bateman, Tara Battaglia, David Batten, Jordan Baudendistel, Loretta Bayless, Christine Beach, Jennifer Beal, Trenton Beaufeaux, Pale Becerra, Becky Beck, Beau Beckham, Erin Beinstingel-Mcgowan, Jillian Belanger-Davis, Tonya Belger, Sergey Belikov, Leah Bellanca, Jozenia Bello, Beth Bellucci, Patrick Bemis, Kathleen Benally and Bobby-Joe Bendersky. (Marshall, J.)
October 3, 2013 Filing 439 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 438 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 3, 2013 Filing 437 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 435 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kristin Piatt-Rangel, Kari Piccirilli-Zeliff, Amos Pierre, Erin Pijuan, Sandra Pike, April Pirky, Rebecca Pittman, Kamila Podolecki, Brittany Polizzi, Heather Polson, Jordan Porcher, Darrell Porter, Casey Posada, Jennifer Potter, Anna Potter, Traci Powell, Terri Powers, Donna Prejean, Tabitha Presnell-Whitlock, Nathanael Proffitt, Rebecca Prost, Aleksis Pugh, Cheryl Putney, Samantha Quast, Raeanna Quiroz, Andrew Quist, Krista Raaf, James Rafko, Chasta Rafter, Heather Rambo, Brandy Ramer, Ruby Ramirez, Graciela Ramirez, Lindsay Ramsey, Aaron Ravak, Eric Ray, Alexa Reale, Lori Redman, Candice Reed, Kelly Reed, Darren Reese, Calan Reichel, Jazmine Reyes, Andre Reyes, Crystal Reyes, Raschelle Reynolds, Shawn Reznik, Carlene Rice, Alyncia Rice, Joshua Richard, Tokay Richardson, Robert Richmond, Dorothy Rilley, Candace Rimes, Michelle Rios, Rebecca Risko, Ruben Rivas, Bruce Roberts, Kristy Roberts, Shakira Roberts, Kolby Robertson, Renee Robinson, Corey Robinson, Rashawn Robinson, Shandeah Robison, Stephanie Rocha-Ibarra, Jessica Rochelle, Jacqueline Rockey, Luis Rodriguez, Michael Rodriguez, Valeria Rodriguez, Marcus Roeder, Dale Rogalski, Vanessa Roman, Alexander Romani, Amela Romanic, Donna Romine, Jessica Rooney, Juan Rosa, Axel Rosa, Jessica Rosales, Tavia Rose, Rosemarie Roseman, Michelle Ross, Jamie Ross, Kija Ross, Tim Rossell, Ianya Rowland-Bayo and Megan Roy. (Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER setting hearing for October 17, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. in Fort Lauderdale Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer. At the hearing, the Court will hear argument on all discovery motions pending as of the date of this Order. Counsel shall also be prepared to discuss a discovery plan and their proposed method for determining the number of opt-in plaintiff's in the representative sample and their proposed method for selecting the particular representatives. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 10/3/2013. (kas)
October 3, 2013 Filing 435 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 434 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 433 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Olivia Murphy, Courtney Myrick, Marylee Nagy, Jason Nahorney, Antonio Navarro, Lindsay Nelson, Tavon Nelson, Amanda Nelson, Denise Neppl, Ambrosia Nester, Ann Neugent, Ashley Newman, Thao Nguyen-Brandt, Tamara Nichols, Brenda Nichols, Sara Nickell, Carla Nicolet, Loretta Niemiec, Kristen Nolan, Rebecca Norcross, Nico Novelli, Urszula Nowak, Alexis Nuffer, Amber O Ross, Justin Oakes, Diane Oborne-Kosylo, Lewyn Obryant, Dianne Ochoa, Josiah O'Connell, Kayla O'Conner, Shawna O'Connell-Wood, Alyssa Olding, Lucas Oliva, Brian Oliva, Courtney Oliver, Michelle Oliver, Steve Ornest, Rebecca Orosz, Rebecca Orr-McGlothlen, Ruby Ortega, Michelle Orzel, Steven Osgood, Morgane Otayek, Nichole Ott-Mills, George Outlaw,IV, Samantha Overmyer, Thomas Owens, Layne Pachico, Brittania Pack, Sarah Pagesy, Shervin Pajouhandeh, Luis Palacios, Joseph Pantaleo, Jorden Paparazzo, Olivia Pappas, Crystal Pardieck, William Parks, Elias Parra, Matthew Parrish, Christina Parrish, Eric Parsons, Jose Patino-Delgado, Lori Patitz, Tracy Patrick, Melanie Patterson, Te-Ericka Patterson, Joyce Paxton, Christi Payeur, Joy Pazin, Rebecca Pearce-Smolin, Pam Peerless, Katelyn Peery, Brittany Peet, Abraham Peinado, J Refugio Pena, Tristan Pepin, Alisha Perdomo, Andrew Perez, Ashley Perez, Dakota Perez, Christy Perrien, David Perry, Liane Peters, Brad Peterson, Amber Peterson, Timur Petrishin, Dexter Pettis, Justin Petty, Misty Petty, Jonathan Pfeiffer, Cameron Pfohl, Alyssa Phillips, Robin Phillips and Steven Phillips. (Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 433 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 432 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 430 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Larry Martinez, Karon Mason, Loren Massengale, Emily Mathes, Michael Matthews, Kristina Mathieu, Tore Matson, Jason Matthews, Heather Maurer, Melissa Mayberry-Spence, Marquita Mayhall, Shana Mazzola, Hayley McBride, Heidi McBride, Shuntae McCants, Steve McClanahan, Mario McDaniel, Chereen McDonald, Lisa McDonald, Kaitlin McEachin, Heather McFadden, Ryan McGee, Bo McGinnis, Christopher McGlynn, Chris McGowan, Catherine McGrath, Donna McGrew, Aziza McKnight, Jennifer McKnight, Thomas McLean, David McManus, Heather McMullen, Marcus McNall, Jamie McNamee, Jill McNulty, Dianna Meadows, Melissa Medeiros, Chase Medford, Laura Megale, Nicholas Mehle, Heather Meinert-Cook, Carolina Melendez, Wenona Mellott, Cassandra Mendoza, Christine Mercer, Terance Merrell, Christina Messina, Danielle Meyer, Brianne Mickee-Delaney, Breanna Miller, Jesse Miller, Michael Miller, Freddie Miller, Brandon Milsaps, John Milton, Erin Milz, Deborah Mimms, David Mingo, Vittoria Miranda, Alex Mistretta, Amy Mitchell, Peggy Mitchell, Cynthia Mixon, Ali Montasseri, Jolene Monteilh, Cherelle Moody, William Moody, Bridget Mooney, Bobbie Moore, Brittany Moore, Jessica Morales, Desiree Morales, Ashley Morales, Fatima Moreno, Justin Morgan, Rebecca Moriarty-Smart, Katie Morlan, Katie Morris, Curtis Morris, Samantha Morris, Chelsea Morton, Melody Mosley, Trisha Motley, Sarah Mullen, Gina Muller, Sarah Mullins, Mary Murdy, Donald Murphy and Lisa Murphy. (Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 431 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 428 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Marjorie Webster, Kelly Welch, Cory Welky, Katrina Wenzl-Hudson, Tiffany West, Katherine Wetmore, Mary Wheeler, Sarah Whitaker, Vanessa White, William White, Dale Whitehead, James Whitehead III, Yovonna Wiegand, Lisa Wik, Allison Wildman, Volando Wiley, J Wiley, Sharon Wilk, Sherry Wilk, Chelsy Wilkerson, Randy Williams, Doris Williams, Vanessa Williams, Earlvin Williams, Paul Williams, Jasmine Wilson, Hillary Wilson, Amanda Wilson, Jonathan Wilson, Sherry Wilt, Abby Winkler, Koketha Winston, Jennifer Winters, Stephanie Wirthwein, Mary Wise, Cali Wolfe, Porschia Wong, Lauren Wood, Kenneth Woodley, Breona Woods, Brandie Woods, Kelsey Woods, Dana Woods, Mary Worch, George Worrell, Cristy Worsham, Carrie Woughter, Melvin Wright, Orlando Yactayo, Kelly Yahn, Donna Yasko, Adeline Yates, Bridget Yoas, Regina Yolton, Beth York, Anthony Youmans, Chelsea Young, Jae Yu, Natalie Yvorra, Laura Zakar, Holly Zamora-Balser, Stacie Zanetell, Shelly Zeimet, Mayra Zesati, Ryan Zimmer, Jean Zimmerly, Matthew Ziontz, Ellen Zovne and Maria Zurla. (Marshall, J.)
October 3, 2013 Filing 430 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 429 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 426 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Adam Kvanli, Jerrod Lacaze, Patricia Laconte, Karine Lamy, Stephen Langley, Denny Lantz, Rachel Larm, Rachael Larson, Donald Larson, Ginger Larson, Matt Larson, Leslie Lastfogel, Amber Lastra, Jessica Laur, Darlena Lawrason, Casey Learch, Jaren Leatherman, Katelyn Lebeau, Joanne Lee, Siew Lee, Jeffrey Lees, Philip Legg, Christy Leh, Justin Lehman, Barbara Leonard, Jeremy Lett, Tracey Levitt, Eric Levy, Ashley Lewallen-Earner, Jacob Lewis, Keith Lewis, James Lewis, Catherine Lindhorst, Michelle Lipscomb, Michelle Lisa, Lisa Little, Victor Llaguno, Elisabeth Lloren, Rolland Lloren, Marianna Loeper, Destiny Logan, Jaime Loiselle-Bank, Lura Lomsdale, Jerimiah Lomsdale, Kristina London, Joann Longoria, David Loos, II, Alyssa Lopez, Pamela Lopez, Priscilla Lopez-Cruz, Genevieve Lorensen-Courtney, Adam Lorenz, Corey Loveless, Geanice Lowder, Steffany Lucas, Jessica Lucia, Amelia Ludwig, Angela Lyn-Blankenship, Erin MacDonald, Bret MacDonald, Leah Macerelli, Luis Macias, Carlos Macias, Dawnielle Mack, Bailey Macleod, Debroah Macnamara, Lori MacPherson-Robb, Maria Magee, Heather Maguire, Brittany Mahoney, Michael Mahoney, Karl Major, Cathy Makarenko, Elizabeth Malone, Sopana Mam, Natalie Mance, Justin Mann, Tenny Mannino, Charlene Manuel, Erica Marens, Mike Marino, Erika Marion, Chelsea Marion, Amanda Maris, Virginia Marks, Michelle Marone, Glynis Marrero, Tanya Marshall, Jose Martinez, Kayla Martinez and Nathan Martinez. (Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 428 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 3, 2013 Filing 427 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 424 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Ann Terpstra, Glen Terrell, William Terry, Sandra Testa, Bernadette Thomas, Kimberly Thomas, Joshua Thomas, Chad Thomas, Chad Thomas, Michael Thomas, Crystal Thomas, Heather Thomas, Jessica Thomas, Valorie Thomas, Billy Thomas II, Brandi Thompson, Duandale Thompson, Emily Thompson, Marijo Thompson, Derrick Tims, Andrew Tobias, Jacqueline Tokich, Tracee Tolhurst, Megan Toolan, Ausencio Torres, Monique Torres, Shannon M Torres, Phyllicia Townsend, Valerie Traylor, Kevin Trimper, Heidi Triska, Jason Truelove, Brenda Trylch, Cameron Tucker, Linda Tucker, Carla Tumbleson, Gabrielle Turco, Kayleigh Turner, Steven Kayleigh, Brian Turner, Michael Turner, Lasonia Turner, Regina Twidwell, Jennifer Uhden, Joanna Vague, Michelle Valencia, Lucia Valencia, Nina Vallad, Rebekah Van Goor, Jacob Van Lent, Mike Vanbaaren, Andrea Vandevelde, Daniel Vandeyar, Casey Vandiford, Lauren Vasquez, Vince Vaughn Jr, Mitchell Veal, Christina Venglik, Victoria Venth, Samuel Vera, Joshua Vercher, Michael Vercillo, Virgina Vernimo, Cheryl Vickers, Blanca Vides, Coryn Viera, Danielle Vincej, Danielle Waag, Travis Wachendorf, Todd Wagner, Shelley Wajer, Adarius Waldon, Raashan Walker, Sasha Wall, Samantha Wall, Beth Wallace, Rebecca Wallace, Angela Wallisch-Thomas, Shannon Ward-Nickey, Michael Ware, Marie Ware, Wade Warman, Matthew Warren, Amanda Warren, Lynne Wasney-Severns, Casey Waters, Carolyn Waters, Nikki Watson, Carol Weaver, Ashley Weaver, Ashley Weber and Amanda Webster. (Marshall, J.)
October 3, 2013 Filing 426 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 425 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 423 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Susan Iavolo, Cynthia Ibarra, Franklyn Ihuoma, Nicholas Ihuoma, Jacquelyn Imel, Patricia Infanti, Miah Ivery, Michelle Jackson, Jason Jacobson, Raymond Jalufka, Katarina James, Heather Jemkort, Octavia Jenkins-Coleman, Laura Jensen, Billy Jernigan, Jr., Marie Jeudy, Julie Jewel, Samantha Johnson, Jaime Johnson, Brandi Johnson, Myron Johnson, Ryan Johnson, Anita Johnson, Dakota Joint, Rush Jolly, Tracy Jones, Jessica Jones, Alex Jones, Eric Jones, Laurel Jones, Justin Jones, Arielle Jones, Delje Jordan, Amy Joyce, Stephanie Juarez, Caley Judge, Katherine Kaepernick, Michael Kahovec, Kelly Kant, Julianne Karica, Danielle Karns, Joshua Karpoff, Heather Kassha, Eric Kassim, Trisha Katcher, John Keel, Cassie Keller, Amanda Kelly, Brad Kelly, Rebecca Kendall, Julie Kennedy, Deborah Kennedy, Kelsey Kesler, Angela Ketcherside, Jana Ketchum, Keith Kettmann, John Keyes, Zaibi Khan, Lamiae Khiat, Bethelhem Kibret, Joy Kiefer, Jennifer Kilgore, Nicole Kimball, Elizabeth Kinder, Rachel King, Sarah Kirk, Cassandra Kirk, Stefanie Kirkhart, Jenna Kissel, Elizabeth Kitahara, Michael Kivitz, Tom Kleckner, James Kloos, Rebecca Knabenshue, Kayla Knight, Michael Knotts, Holly Koch, Hannah Kocks, Kristen Kohanik, Kathryn Kohler, Daniel Kohout, Jr., Keenan Koizumi, Michael Komm, Jonathan Koops, John Koors, Susan Korchak, Lori Koss, Stephanie Krautheim, Tonya Kroon, Anthony Krznaric, David Kuchurivskyy, Kathy Kuehner, Caroline Kujawa and Devin Kulla. (Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 424 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 3, 2013 Filing 423 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 422 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 418 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Karen Hannawi, Sarah Hannon, Nathan Hanovich, Keith Hanson, Sasha Harbour, Tiffany Hardaway, Sucena Hardy, Terrill Hare, Michael Harrington, Valerie Harris, Thomas Harris, Daniel Harris, David Harrison, Kristy Harris-Tisdale, Jonathan Hartz, Jessica Harvey, Alyssa Harvey, Lisa Hatt, Christina Hawkins, Kaylee Hawley, Sheri Hayes, Kyahna Haynie, Rachael Hazelbaker, Krystle Hebert, Michael Heeg, Mary Helgerman, Melissa Heller, Melanie Hemphill, Stephanie Henault, Rachel Henershott-Owen, Jamel Hendley, Tara Henry, Mary Henry, Sarah Henry, John Henry, Dennis Henry, Megan Henshaw-Long, Jerry Hensley, Margaret Henson-Pomerantz, Justin Herbst, Wendy Herdegen, Tianna Hernandez, Miranda Hernandez, Alexis Herrmann, Mystique Hewitt, Chrisaundra Heywood, Alison Hibbs, Stephanie Hicks, Veronica Hickson, Billy Higeons, James Hinds, Ronald Hines, Ashley Hobgood, Thomas Hodde, Andrew Hodge, Meghan Hodges, Kelsey Hoffert, Aimee Holder, Nathan Holfelner, Jordan Holland, Michelle Holley, Kayla Hollifield, Alexander Holm, Crystal Holmes, Bertha Hooker, Kristin Hooper, Thomas Hoose, Nick Hopkins, Ronda Horton, Jimmeia Horton, Wakia Horton, Dawn Houle, Alexis Howard, Skyler Howell, Flamur Hoxha, Katherine Hubble, Rachel Huebner, Shana Huerta, Andrew Hughes, Holly Hughes, Ania Hughes, Charles Huhn, Kerri Hujsak, Deniece Hummel, Micah Humphries, Desiree Hunter, Carolina Hurtado, Sommer Hutson, Joanna Hyatt-Uribe and John Hysell. (Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 421 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 419 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Ashlee Cox, Dana Cox, Fredrica Coyne, Layla Crabtree, Chris Craig, Steve Creeron, John Cress, Stacey Creswell, Carla Criswell, Jenna Cross, Elizabeth Csonka, Teresa Cuevas, David Cullen, Deborah Cullen, William Custer, Jane Cyr, Beth Czaplicki, Heather D Angelo, Courtney Dahl, Nicholas Dahl, Victoria Daigle, Michael Daigle, Ashley Dalton, Maria Damey, Tommy Danaher, Laura Danaher, Julie Dancik, Anna Dandrade, Jason Daniels, Kenny Daniels Sr, Thomas Darby, John Dasilva, Grace Daugherty, Brittany Davideit, Damari Davila, Maureen Davis, Kristina Davis, Emily Davis, Keiasha Davis, Cory Davis, Elizabeth De Buono, Aidanette De Guzman, Jenette Deans, Elizabeth Deas, Maura Deegan, Bladen Defoor, Jennifer Deist, Timothy Delaney, Lisa Dellget, Romeo Deluca, Anthony Delucia, Bryce Dennis, Aaron Dennis, Maureen Derosier, Marc Derouin, Crystal Desselle, Teresa Devitt, Isaac Dewispelaere, Melissa Dewitt, Donnelle Dews, Kelle Diaz, Rhonda Dickerson, Evelyn Dickey, Ascha Dickey-Nickell, Dwayne Dickson, Arielle Diedrich, Lorraine Diehl, Brittany Dietz, Christine Dilallo, Catreena Diltz, Charlotte Dimarcantonio, Cory Dittenhauser, Tina Doherty, Jeffrey Dolden, Nicolas Dominguez, Marie Dominique, Bridget Donohue, Lisa Donohue, Gina Doran, Jennifer Dorman, Rodney Dorsey, Latasha Dorsey, Michael Dorsey, Tonisha Dorsey, Alycia Dortch, Jessica Dotson, Heather Dotter, Christine Dougherty, Frances Doyle, Michelle Drake and Anita Drum. (Marshall, J.)
October 3, 2013 Filing 419 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 3, 2013 Filing 418 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 417 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 416 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jonathan Frye, Patricia Fuentes, April Fullwood, Rosalina Gabay-Townsend, Jessica Gabbard, Amanda Galasti, Henry Gallagher, William Gallant, Aston Galloway, Fallon Gammo, Lilia Garcia, Rosanne Garcia, Shannon Garczynski, Ashley Garner, Samantha Garrett, Mary Garrison, Sergio Gavidia, Paige Gayle-Williams, Stephanie George-Streit, Audrey Gerson, Maria Geschwill, Jennifer Gifford, Gina Gile, Brandon Gileau, Carlos Giles, Julie Gilhooley-Kelly, Leah Gillett, Logan Gilliland, Anna Gitskij, Dustin Glidewell, Leticia Goebel, Stephen Gole, Lisa Goletz, Reshmi Gomes, Steve Gomez, Vanessa Gonzalez, Richard Gonzalez, Aurora Gonzalez, Debora Good, Matt Goodell, Olivia Goodloe, Jasmine Goodwin, Carol Gordon, Cristy Gordon, Raeanne Gould, Jaida Grace, Richard Graffius, Michael Graham, Tonya Grammer, Terrance Grant, Laura Graves, Ashley Gray-Schreiber, Tara Gray, Frances Gray, Chelsey Green, Gary Greenburg, Casey Greene, Steve Greenmyer, Troy Greensfelder, Elias Gregory, Kimberly Griesel, Gary Griffin, Danielle Griffin, Monica Grimaldo, Hillary Groth, Gene Gruver, Daniel Gruzwalski, Patrick Guerrera, Chris Guiral, Kenneth Gunn, Adam Gutbezahl, Hermenegildo Gutierrez, Love Guysick, Perla Guzman, Sal Guzzardi, Tina Hackley, Hailey Hafner, Lindsey Hageman, Ronald Hahn, Bishoy Haleem, Chelsea Halko, Zac Hall, Luanne Hall, Theodore Hamczyk, Traci Hamilton-Harrison, Gary Hancock, Clarence Handy, Angelika Hanlon, Michael Hanna and Sara Hanna. (Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 416 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 415 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 414 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Diane Drumm, Kristen Dubois, Jasmine Duckett, Michelle Dunham, Krystle Dunn, Lawanda Dunn, Debra Durst, Timothy Dutton, Allison Dyer, Ashley Easters, Bobby Eatmon, Michele Ebersole, Samantha Edema, Angela Edleman, Traci Edwards, Samantha Egolf, Dawn Eikenbary, Brenda Eley, Adam Elgin, Jessica Ellett, Amaris Ellis, Rachel Ellsworth, Casey Ely, Michael Elzouki, Penny Englert, Marvin Erazo, Marcela Erben, Braden Erickson, Ruth Escamilla, Conni Esch, Crystal Escobar, Lilianna Escobar, Javier Escobar, Annmarie Escoffery, Ashley Esparza, Natasha Eubanks-Dec, Silena Evans, Brandon Everett, Diana Everett, Nichole Ezell, Brent Ezzell, Bryan Ezzell, Vanessa Facciola, Isaac Falcon, Anthony Faria, Traci Farina, Nathan Farley, Lauren Faulknor, Dione Favors, Brandon Featherly, Tricia Federico-Huth, Kelli Fedewa, Cory Fee, Londin Fenner, Simone Fernandes, Ashley Ferrell, Lindsey Ferrell, Jessica Ferro, Stefanie Fitzpatrick, Angel Flint, Lauren Flood, Omar Flores, Lisa Flowers, Tori Fluegge, Toni Flynn, Derrek Fogal, Krystal Fondren, Emma Fontana-Cain, Christopher Foose, Nicole Formica, Stephanie Forystek, Amanda Foster, Nicole Fowler, Sherri Fox, Hannah Frame, Jason Francis, Maritza Francisco, Camilo Franco, Michelle Frankovich-Anaya, Natalie Franks, Michael Fratea, Brandon Frazier, Delora Frazier, Rebecca Frechette, Jacob Freedlund, Kyle French, Jillian French, Elizabeth Frieler, Curt Froman and James Fromm. (Lichter, David)
October 3, 2013 Filing 414 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 420 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 before Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2014 before Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum. Calendar Call set for 12/4/2014 01:00 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum. Discovery due by 2/14/2014. Expert Discovery due by 6/6/2014. Fact Discovery due by 5/23/2014. Mediation Deadline 7/25/2014. In Limine Motions due by 10/9/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 7/7/2014. Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/21/2014. Signed by Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum on 10/2/2013. (yha)
October 2, 2013 Filing 413 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 412 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Robin Butillo, Adriel Butler, Teresa Buzzard, Gary Byrd, Gabriela Cabrera, Rachel Caffrey, Stephen Cagle, Lisa Cagno, Cheyanne Caines, Dominica Calandra, Teresa Calkins, Jennifer K. Call, Cassandra Camacho, Jacqueline Campbell, William Canady, Samantha Cangialosi, Lucille Cannon, Jeffery Cantave, Michelle Cantlay, Sheena Cantu, R Kenneth Capps, Corina Card, Kimberly Carlile, Amber Carlton, Briana Carmen, Craig Carrigan, Robert Carswell, Keren Carter, Edward Carver, Krystal Casas, Kimberly Caseres, Elizabeth Castaneda, Rebecca Castaneda-Schieck, Dariel Castille, Kristal Castillo, Jaime Cepeda, Jessica Cermely-Petersen, Allison Chan, James Chandler, Whitney Charlton, Chelsie Charnet, Adam Chartrand, Robin Chatham, Frances Chavarria, Debbie Chavez, Tamaiera Cheek, Michael Cheesebrough, Sunni Christensen, Nicole Church, Ryan Cirac, Andreale Claiborne, Aubrey Clair, Erica Clark, Jean Clark, Jasmine Clark, Caitlin Clark, Walter Clark, Cody Clarke, Loralea Clay, Jennifer Clifton-Martin, Alicia Clinton-Slater, Jessica Clour, Brenda Coats, Erin Cofield-Lightner, Shammu-A Coggins, Ricky Coleman, Jessica Collins, James Collins, Rosemary Comage, Rachael Connolly, Lauren Connors, Crystal Contreras, James Conway, Ben Cook, Ronald Cook, Ashley Cook, Judy Cooper, Jennifer Cooper, Carla Cooper, Antionette Cooper, Bethany Cordell, Andrea Cordell, Pamela Cornell, Stephen Corren, Seth Costa, Michael Cote, Celeste Cotton, Daniel Couey, Curran Coughlin and Shannon Coursey. (Marshall, J.)
October 2, 2013 Filing 412 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 2, 2013 Filing 411 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 410 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Nicholas Beatrice, Katie Beaupre, Heather Beehler, Danielle Behun, Joshua Beitel, Desirae Belcher, Mark Belculfine, Jenica Bendixen, Ariel Benites, Shaina Benjamin, Cassie Benna, Brian Benna, Cheryl Bennett, Diana Benzo, Joanne Bernard, Ashley Berry, Jamie Best, Ashley Beverly, Dana Biebel, Jonathan Biffer, Jaqueline Billelo, Candace Billy, Brittany Black, Katie Blackmon, Shalonda Blackston, Alonzo Blair Jr, Caleb Blake, Elizabeth Blalock-Jones, Jennifer Blanchard, Deondria Bland, Alisa Blankenship, Ashley Blizzard, Gavin Bockhaus, Irene Bocz, Trevor Bode, Joshua Bodi, Steven Bohner, Latesha Booker, Kaitlynn Boose-Vassalle, Elizabeth Booth, Kedesha Boothe, Mindy Boso, Kirstan Bosquez, Sabrina Boucher, Dustin Boulet, Angela Bounds-Barnes, Cortney Bowen, Kia Bowles, Merry Bradley, Amanda Brady, Olivia Brannum, Erik Bravo, Audra Brazell, Bridgette Breeze, William Brewer, Kim Brewster, George Bridgers, Briana Bridges, Nicole Briggs, Darlene Bright, Rachel Bright, Wendy Brindle, Jordan Broderick, James Brouillet, Kristin Brown, Kasey Brown, Nissa Brown, Ashley Brown, Jennifer Brown, Teresa Brown, Zachary Brown, Cynthia Brunk, Robert Bruno, Latoya Bruns, Rebecca Bryce, Ivory Buchanan, Andrew Buchko, Kacie Buck, Brian Buckley, Amanda Buell-Stout, Erica Buitrago, Sheena Bunger, Victoria Bunton, Jeffrey Burden, Lashunda Burgy, Jaunce Burkhart, Paula Burnett, Michelle Burney, Holly Burris, Jason Burris, Peggi Bush and Sonya Bustos. (Marshall, J.)
October 2, 2013 Filing 410 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 2, 2013 Filing 409 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 408 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Billie Abbit, Rae Ablan, Chelisa Abney, Robert Abrams, Christina Accardo, Courtney Ackerman, Donna Adams, Carlos Adams, Irina Adams, Keri Adams, Shane Adams, Arah Adams, Stefanie Adams, Matthew Adams, Virginia Addis, Max Adgate, Sonja Adkison, Amanda Affeldt, Aaron Agresta, Jordan Aguilar, Michelle Albert, Nicole Alberti, Jacob Albright, Loren Alexander, Lisa Alexander, Clyde Alexander IV, Taher Ali, Marjorie Aliomar, Rachel Allen-Trent, Jessica Almquist, Dorian Alphin, Justin Amerson, Sarah Ames, Gaynell Ammons, Andrea Amos, Brittany Amtsberg, Samantha Anderson, Gabriel Anderson, Tina Anderson, Gregory Anderson, Courtney Anderson, Jason Anderson, Trinity Anderson, Eric Andrade, Elizabeth Andres, Arnette Aoun, Cecilia Aranda-Gabriel, Lakia Arceneaux, Derek Archer, Andres Archuleta, Janet Armstrong, Heather Arnett, Teresa Arth, David Ashby III, Kim Asher, April Askew, Shelley Asprion, Miranda Atchley, Naeemah Atkins, Taylor Aubin, Laura Audije, Michael Ault, Joshua Austin, Miranda Avina, Aekeam Awad, Amanda Aylsworth-Yeltman, Brittny Baechel-Adams, Daniel Bailey, Jenniffer Bair, Carol Baitinger, Wendy Baker, Jenny Baker, Christine Baldwin, Monique Ballard, Karli Balogh, Marcus Banks, Latoya Banks, Kevin Bardwell, Georgia Barham, Ashley Baribeault, Gabrael Barnes, Michael Barnes, Kelly Barnes, Todd Barrett, Amber Barton, Rebecca Bauer, Zechariah Bauer, Joshua Baugh, Laura Baur and Gina Beardsley. (Marshall, J.)
October 2, 2013 Filing 408 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 407 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 406 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Aaron Tuttle, Bryce Tyner, Amber Upton, Jessica Urbaniak, Michelle Valadez, Greisha Valderrama, Tiffany Valentin, Karen Valentin-Harshman, Andrea Valk, Jose Valverde, Patrick Vandiver, Nathan Vanhouten, Teri Vaughan, Victor Vazquez, Amanda Vega, Pablo Velasquez, Drew Verhaar, Vestonia Viddy, Laurie Vider, Matthew Vines, Jon Visintainer, Andrew Viti, Brandon Vitola, Corey Viveiros, John Vlahos, Charity Vogt, Chanthy Vong, Cynthia Voyard, Ashley Waack, Nicole Wagner, Kelly Wagner-Voges, Eric Waiters, Dennis Wakefield, Kara Wakefield, Taylor Walker, Daniel Walker, Danielle Waller, Richard Walrath, Katherine Walters, Katherine Wampach, Michael Wan, Rachael Wannigman, Debora Ward, Rodric Ward, Ryan Waters, Tercell Waters, Julia Watkins-Hill, Erin Watson, Jacob Watson, Kyle Watson, Margaret Watson, Sherita Watt, Nancy Wayne, Zachary Webb, Masada Webber, David Weber, Elizabeth Wedin-Dishong, Whitney Weinstein, Cassandra Westergard, Laura Wheatley-Hemp, Scott Whitaker, Briana White, Jourdan White, Bridget White-Cook, Crystal Whited, Nicole Whitfield, Danielle Whitman, Cassandra Widlak, Tracy Wilkins, Malica Wilkins, Courtney Williams, Jeremy Williams, Leah Williams, Sara Williams, Jason Williams, Gwendolyn Williams, Darnell Williams, Nickera Williams, Amelia Williams, Dionne Williams, Kendra Williams, Felicia Williamson, Kelly Willson, Amber Wilson, Latasha Wilson, Shantoya Wilson, Ashley Wilson, Qiana Wilson, Brenda Wilson, Andrew Wilson, Julian Wilson-Hyman and Kerry Winsett. (Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 406 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 405 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 404 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Donna Mastrorio, Kiyoko Masuoka, Michelle Matarese, Paige Mathews, Jill Matteson, Tim Matthews, Jill Matteson, Jamie Matzdorff, Timothy Maupin, Kitilsha Maxie, Brandon May, Karina May-Nutt, Loranne Maze, Isaac McElheny, Whitney McBride, Samantha McBride, Molly McCormack, Karie McCoy, Casey McCoy, Mark McCready, Ashley McCoullough, Angela McDade-Morton, Ashley McDermott, Donna McElheny, David McFarlin, Constance McGuire, Kristina McGuire, Britanny McHale-Weiler, Ashlee McKay, Megan McMullen, George McNamee, Connie McNelis, Joshua McOwen, Juanita Mech, Michelle Medrano, Kimberly Meinkey, Lynn Melograna, Kandi Mendoza, Michael Mendoza, Yuri Mercado, Nichelle Meredith, Kevin Meriweather, Dustin Merrell, Max Christopher Metzger, Jennifer Middleton, Kendall Miedema, Marsha Mikulec-Duncan, Courtney Miller, Brittany Miller, Ryan Miller, Thomas Miller, Donna Miller, Tracy Miller, Kristen Miller, Cristy Miller, Eric Miller, Katerina Minadakis, Liza Miranda, Jean Mitchell, Michelle Mitchell, Nelson Mix, Nicole Moceri, David Moersch, Samya Mohamed, Nichole Mohlenhoff, Leisa Monroe, Michelle Monsivais, Lindsay Montgomery, Shawniece Montgomery, Stephanie Montgomery-Rodriguez, Joshua Moore, Michelle Moore, Gerald Moore, Jeffery Moran, Valerie Morency, Victor Moreno, Germaine Morgan, Ashley Morgan, Kayla Morris, Sarah Morris, Ryan Marrow, Barbara Moser, Karen Moskalczyn and E Shane Mosser. (Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 404 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 403 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 402 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Moose Leighton, Jameson Lemire, Karleigh Lenker-Delgado, Christina Leonard, Elsa Leonardo, Christie Lerum, Tyler Lesko, David Lessler, Dakota Lessnau, Crystal Lester, Barbara Lestrange, Robert Levy, Jessica Lewellen-Day, Jacian Lewis, Kevin Liddie, Lauren Lieberstein, Ginette Lietuvninkas, Kayla Lindsey, Debra Linnard, Jordan Littlefield, Lori Loccarini, Nelson Locher, Jenny Lockhart, Bonnie Loescher, Larry Logan, Josh Loll, Robert Lombardo, Samantha Long, Ashley Long, Jessica Long, Kelly Lonski, Kirstie Lopez, Melanie Lopez, Krystal Lopez, Francisco Lopez, Anna Lopez-Thompson, Amanda Lopez-Gonzales, Kathryn Loree, Joseph Lorman, Russell Lortz, Kyle Love, Tonya Love, Paul Loverme, Daniel Lozano, Louise Lucero, Taylor Lucyk, Delisa Lugo, Nannette Lugo, Desiree Luker, Brittny Lunger, Shannon Lurvey, Renee Lust, Donna Luttrull, Jarrod Lyells, Korann Lynch, Kevin Lynch, Hana Maazaoui, Brittany Mabrey, Daveen Macsata, Carmen Macvivar, Raven Maddox, Ricky Maddox, Leah Madison, Akari Maezono, Tammy Magaro, Nicole Magill, Cynthia Major, Lidia Malave, Morgan Maly, Serena Mann, Jaclyn Mantooth, Alicia Manzello, Anthony Marcial, Samuel Marco, Sarah Marcolini, Barbara Marcum, Rebecca Marek, Rachel Marfield, Verna Marinelli, Andrea Marino, Jeneva Marmolejo, Gabriel Marrero, Kimberly Martin, Schalan Martin, David Martin, David Martis and Michele Marzullo. (Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 402 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 401 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 400 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Arnique Joiner, Latrice Jones, Quinten Jones, Tiffany Jones, John Jones, Dawn Jones, Kristy Jopek, Patricia Jordan, Tiffanie Jordan, Lauren Jourden, Tyler Kaczmarek, Kanene Kadir, Christine Kaepplinger, Tracey Kagey, Shleby Kahn, Thomas Kalnik, Kristy Kalvestran, Christine Kane-Wilson, Debra Kearney, Mary Keith, Shannon Kellett, Bridget Kellett, Kristen Kelley-Bell, Jessica Kelson, Jacqueline Kenerva, William Kennedy, Karen Kepner-Murdock, Bethany Keskitalo, Ashley Kester-Friedman, Caleb Kevwitch, Karley Kilgore-Whenham, John Killeen, Clifton Killings, Elaine Killion, Kathy Kimura, Natalie Kindree, Zaffron King, Brandon King, Taylor King, Ashley Kish, April Kite, Malissa Kittelson, Kerrie Kline, Danielle Knaley, Delsi Knighten, Melissa Kniss, Jameson Knowles, Hadi Koleilat, Erin Korbel, Kristin Kowalski, Chad Kozloski, Sherri Krantz, Vilma Krashefski, Aaron Krook, Stephanie Kruvelis, Julia Kuhn, Stephen La Carra, Deborah Labadie, Joshua Labar, Antoinette Lafashia, Melone Lafreniere, Michelle Lagreca, Nick Lamanna, Melissa Lambert, Tameka Lamug, Kaitlyn Landfield, Katherine Lang, Jeanette Langford, Myra Langston-Grainger, Jennifer Lappe, Jordan Larkin, Dawn Lato, Ellen Lavery, Erin Lawson, John Lawson, Carrie Lawson, Monique Lawson, Adriana Layne, Roy Layne, Michael Leach, Aubree Leader, Eimile Leathers, Jessica Lee, Danielle Lee and Satori Lee. (Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 400 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 399 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 397 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Nicole Healy, Marshall Heath, Nancy Hebda, Amanda Heinz, Beth Hejza, Lisa Helmer, Sheila Hemmingway, Daniel Hendrickson, Kevin Henry, Nicholas Herman, Laritza Hernandez, Amanda Herold-Mahncke, Pamela Herrington, Joyce Herrington, Joshua Herron, Jodie Hertle, Josh Heskamp, Gwen Hester, Rosaleen Hever, Crystal Hickman, May Hier, Jewel Higashi, Nadia Higgins, Kayla Highberger, Whitnie Hightower, Brian Hilak, Bridget Hill, Kendra Hill, Lee Hill, Gabrielle Hill, Ashley Hillion, Alexandra Hillman, Angela Hill-Wilson, Kerri Hiner, Alicia Hines, Melissa Hinkle, Brandon Hinojos, Maegen Hisle, Joel Hisle, Derek Hobart, Kristianna Hoffman, Sarah Hoffman, Brandy Hogan, Cherie Holland, Brieanne Hollis, Amanda Hollis-Sampson, Jered Hook, Tiffany Hooper, Allison Hoopenjan, James Hord, Brian Horn, Jordan Horn, Katie Horob, Brent Horvath, Brandon Howard, Erika Hoyos, Marietta Hrach, Christian Hudson, Shannon Huerta, Alina Huerta, Alexandra Hull, Tressa Humann, Rukayya Humphrey, Alicia Humphries, Michele Hunsucker, Matthew Hunt, Kayla Hunter, Christine Huxley, Amanda Inda, Melissa Ingram, Savannah Irwin, Dwayne Jackson, Andrew Jackson, Derek Jaeger, Maria Jaime, Dustin Jakub, Rebecca James, Anne James, Stephanie Jaskot, Sarah Jaycox, Brittany Jimenez, Jair Jimenez, Angelica Jimenez, Veronica Jimenez-Plummer, Joy Johnason, Karen Johnson, Eve Johnson, Asha Johnson, Jordan Johnson, Karolyn Johnson, Stacey Johnson, Shantel Johnson, Amanda Johnson, Tiffani Johnson and Elaina Johns-Wolfe. (Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 398 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 395 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Sarah Womack, Whitney Wood, Ashton Wood, Thomas Wood, Amy Woodall, Loren Woodcock, Sonya Wooddell, Alexa Wooderson, Eric Woodruff, Averette Woodson, Theresa Wooten, Elaine Worley, Brandon Wray, Mckinda Wright, Jennie Wright, Keith Wright, Stephanie Wrisley, Jonell Yablonski, Tracy Yakimowicz, Joe Yanez, Rima Yarushyavichute, Jamie Yates, Rhonda Yawn, Sarah Young, Lynda Young, Kevin Yu, Melissa Zacarias, Frank Zaccherio, Paige Zahaba, Arturs Zaharovs, Bridgette Zakar, Debra Zallar, Amanda Zart, Sara Zavitz, Elizaveta Zaychenko, Samantha Ziegel, Hannah Zielinski, Laura Zier, Charles Zimmerman, Jose Zivec and Aaron Zuniga. (Marshall, J.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 397 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 396 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 392 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Rebecca Gines, Michael Glass, Sr., Sharde glore, David Glotfelty, April Godfrey, Rachael Goehring, Laura Golden, Stephanie Golden, Shaun Golden, Scott Goldman, Connie Gomer-Zielinski, Lourdes Goncalves, Evian Goode, Barbara Goodin, Lora Goodman, Nikki Goodnature, Ellen Gorski, Stacy Gower, Rebecca Goyke, Heather Grabowski, Austin Graff, Colleen Graham, Ryan Graley, Timothy Grandon, Patricia Grant, Steffanie Graves, Joshua Gray, Kyler Gray, Philip Green, Alphonso Green, Jessica Green, Alan Green, David Greenbaum, Tasha Greenwood, Claire Gregory, Nicole Gregson, Elisa Griffin, Kristie Grignani, Jeanie Grim, Rebekah Grimes, Katherine Grimm-Riao, Shelley Grubb, Kerri Grzywa, Anthony Guido, Carla Gunn, Tisha Gunn, Lisa Guzman, Regina Guzman, Mark Guzman, Helen Ha, Erica Haas, Taryn Hagan, Justin Hager, David Hagestad, Kimberly Haines, Nicholas Hale, Diana Hale, Lindsay Hall, Stefani Hall, Paula Hall, Kirk Halley, Neal Hallihan, Talour Hamby, Charlotte Hamilton, Darlene Hamman, Deborah Hammett, George Hammonds, Stacey Hamrick, John Hancock, Jessica Hancock-Mauro, Judy Haney, Curtis Hannah, Andrea Hardee, Stephanie Hardesty, Lauren Harmon, Heather Haro, Jairus Harper, Rachel Harper, Marcia Harpole, Amy Harris, Alyssa Harris, Artheia Harris, Selena Harris, Chauncey Harris, Sr., Lyndsie Hartman, Jeffrey Hasty, Courtney Hayden, Jazalyn Hayes, Myiesha Hayes, Sakira Haynes, Talitha Haynes and Evelyn Haynes-Wilson. (Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 395 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 394 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 393 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Brittney Starnes-Stacey, Grace Steineger, Angelina Stella, Ashley Stephens, Matthew Stephenson, Samantha Sterner, Charissa Stettler, Ashley Stevenson, Ryan Stiles, Katrina Stimson, Lindsay Stokes, Ashley Stokes, Brittany Stokes, Timothy Stout, Lauren Stout, Amanda Stout, Ashley Sturm, Lauren Sturycz, Ferry Subaya, Scott Suire, Regina Suitt, Kirsten Sullivan, Brendan Sullivan, Caitlyn Summers, Kim Summersgill, Julie Sumner, Justin Sur, Trevor Surgener, Teri Susak, Jeannine Swart, Paul Swearengin, Linda Swing, Samantha Symington, Mark Tadiello, Amber Taft, Carolina Tangarife, Jamie Tapia, Ariel Tarawally, Christine Tatum, Madia Taylor, Alexandra Taylor, Krissy Taylor, Eboni Teasley, Tiffany Teasley-Kuzio, Celia Tellado, Sacha Themelis, Tamea Thomas, Sarah Thomas, Grace Thomas, Noah Thomas, Diangelo Thomas, Andrea Thompson, Tamika Thompson, Keith Thorburn, Troy Thornton, Andrew Thornton, Diamond Thornton, Julia Thrift, Nicole Tienda, Jason Tighe, Scott Tigney, Gozde Tiknaz Green, Katie Tipton, Christine Tirado, Brandy Tobias, Dawn Todd, Chasity Tomer, Jessica Tomlin, Danyelle Toombs, Neita Toombs-Baker, Miglay Toro Elias, Kevin Torresan, Danielle Toscano, Jessica Tovar, Brandon Toynbee, Thuy Tran, Kelly Tratthen, Becky Travis, Kayla Treick, Betty Truett, John Tuchek, William Tuon, Kimberley Turgeon, Emily Turner, Jonathan Turner and Daniel Tutko. (Marshall, J.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 393 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 392 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 391 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 389 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kaitlyn Espada, Alberto Esquer, Isias Esquivel, Evelyn Evanisko, Carrie Evans-Brown, Lisa Fallon, Amber Farley, James Farmer, Virginia Fauth, Laura Fay, Kelley Featherstone, Rebecca Feliciano, Jennifer Fenton, Bernadine Ference, Eduardo Fernandez, Brigitte Ferrante, Anthony Ferrara, Kalina Fields, Cathy Fiene, Chayanne Figueroa, Breanne Finagan, Nathan Fincher, Carrie Findley, Emily Finegan, Justin Finnerty, Regina Fitzgerald, Breanne Flener, Danielle Fleury, Jonathan Flick, Ericka Flores, Jason Fluharty, Rebecca Folds-Hamilton, Tina Foley, Jillian Forbes, Rachel Ford, Alyssa Fortner, Kim Fortner, Josh Foster, William Fox, Niccolo Francisco, Aubery Frank, Cameron Franklin, Lametrius Frazier, Stephanie Freeman, Amy Freimann, Mary Frey, Andrew Friedman, Scott Frost, David Frye, Tracey Frye, Francis Fu, Kelly Fulkerson, Amanda Fuller, Forrest Funk, Dolandra Fuqua, Temerous Gadsden, Sandy Gaeta, Andrea Gagner, Jefferey Gajda, Bernadette Galiza, Gloria Gambino, Nakeisha Gamble, Leslie Gandy, Jennifer Gannuscio, Shane Garcia, Kaitlin Garcia, Aegean Garner, Lani Gary, Aaron Garza, Sarah Garza, Angela Gau, Kelsey Gauder, Monika Gayed, Heather Gaylord, Janine Geer, Brandon Genette, Matthew George, Alexander George, John Georgopoulos, Belinda Gerlach, Marvin German, Jr., Kelly Gerner, Elizabeth Gibb, Tiffany Gibbons, Rhonda Gibson, Lauren Gilkison, Michell Gillespie, Lyndsey Gillis and Mario Gimma. (Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 390 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 386 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Karen Schaff, William Schatz III, Sydni Schieber, Chelsi Schroeder, Ryan Schuh, Lynne Schultz, Lenise Scott, Yolanda Scott, Lacey Scott, Brandi Scott, John Scott, Eleanor Scott, Jennifer Scott Wall, Sydney Seguin, Jamie Seguin, Phillip Segura, Tim Seidel, Justin Seigler, Joseph Selman-Neville, Barbara Setchel, Jennifer Shafner, Monica Shampine, Rochelle Shannon, Emily Shapiro, Alexandra Sharp, Sarah Shaw, Miles Shaw, Nicholas Shay, Stephanie Shay, Michael Sheehan, Elizabeth Shek, Henry Sheppard, Rhonda Shields, Crystal Shinault, Lori Shiner, Melody Shipman, Shannon Shrader, Devin Siebold, Adam Simao, Miranda Simmons, Ruth Simpson, Kristal Sims, Derthra Sims, Kelly Singleton Headd, Brittany Sisco, Angela Sisko, Kathleen Slattery, Lauren Slemmer, Susan Sloan, Sandra Sloniker, Josh Smaglick, Dayna Small, Donna Smith, Destiny Smith, Ryan Smith, Desiree Smith, Virginia Smith, Amanda Smith, Alexis Smith, Alex Smith, Natalia Smith, Mary Smith, Josie Smith, Rebecca Smith, Deven Smith, Kim Smith, Anthony Smith Simino, Katherine Sneider-Wright, Rudy Snipes, Morgan Snyder, Amanda Soohoo, Robert Sorensen, Elizabeth Sorrell, Claudette Sosnoski, Kelly Soto, Jeri Souliere, Amanda Sowers, Morrisa Sowers, Dorothy Span, Melina Spanos, Chonda Spaulding, Kathy Spielman, Steve Spigelmyer, Ashley Spradlin, Christopher St. Germain, Carol Stackhouse, Angela Stanley, Christina Stanton, Amanda Stanton Newkirk, Ryan Stapp, Perry Starbuck and Jarice Starbuck. (Marshall, J.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 389 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 388 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 384 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Abigail Coyle, Shannon Coyle, Ashley Crane, Michael Cranston, Tiffany Creighton, Carol Croft, Alicia Crook-Cramp, Chelsea Cross, Carla Crouch, Casey Cruikshank, Krystle Cruthers, Sandra Cruz, Morgan Cuaderes, Rachel Culak, Rebecca Cullam, Amanda Cumby-Sparkman, Jessica Cummings, Whitney Cunningham, Lindsay Curley, Azaria Dagenais, Kristin Dagostino, Ronald Daigle, Erin Dalton-Morris, Wotchilat Damier, Patricia D'annunzio, Qiana Danridge, Ty Darden, Holli Davania, Brittney Davidson, Bridgett Davis, Jessica Dawley, William Day, Jennifer Day, Andrea De Souza, Kristen Debs-Wyrick, Matthew Degarmo, Laura Deily, April Dela-Pena, Aimee Delorme, Ryan Denissoff, Stephanie Derico, Chelsea Detweiler, Kimberly Dexter, Carolina Diaz, Lisa Dicecco, Chelsea Dickerson, Ken Dienna, Molly Defiore, Leslie Diggins, Dawn Dildine, Kristan Dinkins, Dani Dixon, Ian Dixon, Samantha Dixon-Elmore, Bradley Dizonne, Bess Dobransky, Madeline Dodson, Erin Donahue, Natasha Douglas, Patrick Driscoll, Pamela Driver, Catherine Duerr, Martha Dugazon, Christine Duncan, Kristin Duncan, Allison Dunn, Matthew Duthie, Daquon Dyer, Jonathan Easley, Kyle Eason, Geneva Eason, Leeanne Eaton, Tiffany Eaves, Allison Eden, Chase Edmunds, Jennifer Edwards, Meagan Edwards, Nichole Edwards, Mark Eisler, Sean Eley, Stefanie Ellis-Dunn, Sarah Ellithorpe, John Enders, Nathan Englis, Dayjia English, Shauna Erickson, Lidia Erives, Kathie Ermeling, Nikki Erenwein and Frances Escobar. (Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 387 TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference and Discovery Motions held on September 26, 2013, before Ch. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer, 1-164 pages, Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards, 305-523-5499 / Lisa_Edwards@flsd.uscourts.gov. (Digital 14:11:22-17:35:41.) Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2014. (le)
October 1, 2013 Filing 386 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 385 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 380 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): James Renuad, Nadezhda Repina, Rebecca Reutenauer, Stanley Reyes, Miguel Reyes, Anthony Reynell, Craig Riccelli, Nicholas Rice, Jarret Rice, Anthony Richards, Rebecca Richardson, Jacquelyn Richardson, Preshay Richardson, Kate Richter, Terri Ricks, Sarah Riddle-Tipton, Ana Riggs, Joyell Riley, Barbara Riley, Mellissa Ring, Maeve Rios, Erick Rios, Sara Ritchie, Kathleen Ritter-Swartz, Kelshall Rivas, Diana Rivas, Doug Roberts, Theresa Roberts, Betsy Robertson, Becki Robertson-Feiock, Faith Robinson, Matthew Robinson, Alexis Robinson, Christian Rodriguez, Reba Rodriguez, Amber Rodriguez, Jennifer Rodzinka, Megan Roe, Kaitlin Roepke, Lavant Roey, Shuntiria Rogers, Patricia Rohde, Taylor Rohe, Sarah Rohlf, Elizabeth Rondepierre, Vanessa Rosasco, Caroline Rose, Daniel Rosenberger, Lisa Rose-Sang, Courtney Ross, Deana Rossi, Gabrielle Rossmiller, David Roth, Haley Roth, Corey Rothchild, Tina Rothove, Melinda Rothrock, Caitlynn Rouse, Sarah Rowe-Doans, Jamie Ruperti, Tyler Rushton, Taylor Rusich, Theodore Rusomanis, Sheri Russell, Beth Rywelski, Kelly Saari, Candace Sabine, Hannah Sabine, Mohammed Saghir, Amy Salas, Alejandra Sales-Nata, Alex Salgado, Candice Samples, Kimberly Sampson, Melinda Sampson, Eddy Sanchez, Pamela Sanchez, Adrian Sanchez, Jason Sandene, Regina Sanders, Roseanna Sanderson, Heather Sanger, Massiel Santana, Jessica Santiago, Marilin Santiago, Arcenio Santos, NIcholas Sappah, Tony Sarfo, Clifford Saxton, Garrett Scanland, Holden Scarbrough, Rainer Scarton and Margaret Schaad. (Marshall, J.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 384 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 383 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 382 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Angela Calderone, Nicole Calderone, Kristen Calhoun, Jessica Calloway, Juan Camacho, Chris Camargo, Bennett Campbell, Antonil Campbell, Chynna Canevari, Jennifer Cao, Guthrie Capossela, Jessica Cardenas, Jessica Carey, Cinnamon Carley, Jason Carpenter, Kristi Carroll, Jason Cassara, Yuri Castaneda, Brenda Castellon, Victor Castillo, Martha Castle, Mindy Catron, Nicholas Catterson, James Caudill, Trey Caudle, Linda Cefalo, Valerie Chacon, Kellie Chandler, Ashley Chandler, Brad Chapin, Stacey Charles, Brenda Chase, Rachael Chatwin, Misha Chavez, Crystal Cherrington, Shelby Chessman, Daniel Chevillot, Elizabeth Childers, Jessica Chittim, Britain Christiansen, Spring Christl, Corrin Church, Timothy Ciechorski, Tina Cinderella-Campbell, Nicholas Cirillo, Tammy Citi, Kimberly Clark, Jason Clark, Rebecca Clark, Kayla Clarke, Jane Claspell, Damien Clayton, Felicia Cleaver, Mark Clegg, Amanda Clelland, Jennifer Clementson, Meloney Clemons, Carl Clewis, Jeri Cobia, Audrey Coburn, Desiree Coday, Stacie Coggins, Colleen Cohan, Clarissa Cohan, Cameron Cole, Jamie Coleman, Michael Collins, John Collora, Melody Colon, Kathy Columbis, Carlos Colunga, Sheri Cone, Kathleen Conley, Adam Conley, John Conley, John Connell, Anne Connely, Bryan Conover, Andrea Contreras, Nicole Cook, Renee Cook, April Cook, Marlisa Cooper, Josephine Cooper, Darcy Corbin, Carol Cormier, Matthew Cornillie, Amanda Cote, Daniel Coviello and Kimberly Cox. (Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 382 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 381 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 379 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): David Batson, Adrianna Beal, Theodore Beaupre, Thomas Beblo, Janette Becigneul, Jason Becker, Amanda Becker, Laura Becker, Nicole Beckett, Kerri Beckman, Shonneen Behymer, Jeffrey Beisly, Matt Belculfine, James Belisle, Angela Bell, Abbigail Benavidez, Jesus Benavidez, Abbigail Bennett, Katie Benoit, Shana Benscoter, Kristine Benyamin, Casandra Berger, Patricia Berlin, Alyssa Berman, Rebecca Bernard, Jordan Bernardes, Gail Bernt, Jordan Berry, Auburn Berry, Joseph Besciglia, Jamonte Bethea, Melissa Bethune, Simmie Betts, David Billar, Rosheen Bishop, Marci Black, Andrea Blahyj, Courtney Blair, Nicole Blais, Julie Blake, Jessica Bliss, Ann Blue, Steven Bobinski, Carly Bodnar, John Bohun, Lateash Boisseau, Star Bolda, Valerie Bolton, David Bombard, Carrie Bond-Gibson, Mysti Bonello, Megan Bonem, Jon Bongard, Deena Bonitatis, Jacqueline Boone, Anjeanette Boozer, Jacquelyn Borello, Ronnie Borowski, Cindy Bortz, Caitlin Bos, Adam Bossert, Katherine Bower, Michelle Boxx-Stansbury, Derrick Boyd, Dawn Bradbury, Deborah Bradosky, Dianne Brangaitis, Erika Brashear, Elizabeth Braswell, Dace Bregantini, Anna Brenich, Julie Briggeman, Jeannie Brin, Tabitha Bronsburg, Kyle Brown, Bentley Brown, Linell Brown, Britney Brown, Chris Brown, Brittney Brown, Jeremy Browning, Christopher Bruno, Michelle Bryson, Vanessa Buda, Laura Budke, Julie Budke, Nicole Budney, Sjade Burns, Samuel Burrell, III, Joshua Burroughs, Chris Burton, Andrew Byers and Shaylyn Cadorette. (Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 380 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 379 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 378 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 376 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Arturo Abeja, Jennifer Acevedo, David Ackermann, Jessenia Acosta, Rene Adame, Samantha Adams, Joseph Adams, Shelli Adams-Carl, Robert Adamson, Pamela Aguirre, Kelley Akers, Lisa Akin, Amber Akins, Mathew Akre, Alfred Alanis, Vanessa Alarcon, Lamanda Albergottie, Robert Albers, Jilleen Alessi, Jon Alessi, Durrell Alexander, Tracy Alexander, Kaylee Alexander, Allison Alexander, William Alford, Annas Al-Kanawi, Janet Allen, Exa Allinder, Jessica Allison, Rosa Alvarez, Dawn Alvey, Sagrario Amaral, Ariel Amison-Kelly, Jessica Amoroso, George Anagnostou, Sophia Ance, Kalie Anders-Kjerstad, Karen Anderson, Brooke Anderson, Dane Anderson, Monica Anderson, Shoneika Anderson, Katherine Ange, Kenley Anglade, Joshua Ansari, Shaquela Anthony, David Aponte, Jr., Joan Aquitato, Jeanmarie Arce, Robin Archer-McMahon, Janet Argenziano, Lauren Arndt-Garden, Wanda Arroyo, Jasmine Arroyo, Brandon Asplund, Amber Augustyniak, Daniel Aupperle, Brenda Austin, Aubrey Averette, Brynan Avery, Nicole Avila, Odi Awad, Edward Ayala, Brandius Bachman, Miguel Baez, Jolene Bagaglio, Della Bagsby, Robert Bahr, Jamie Bailey, Connie Bailey, Jessica Bailey, Allison Baker, Sarah Baker, Jon Baker, Brittany Baker, Cindi Ballard, Jess Bandini, Barbara Banuelos, Jason Barbish, Ruth Barnes, Zachary Barnette, Leslee Baron, Andrea Baron-Scott, Sean Barr, Kim Barrett, Susan Bartkowicz, Lindsay Barton, Emily Bartsch and Kayla Bastedo. (Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 377 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 375 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Bryan Parkinson, Tiarra Parler, Blake Parrish, Diana Parsons, Dawneshia Patterson, Terri Patterson, Scott Pauciello, Kelsey Paul, Christie Pauley, Sara Paxston, Melissa Payne, Kiara Paz, Amanda Pearce, Charlie Pederson, Joseph Peguero, Christopher Penney, Holly Pennington-Lewis, Vyanell Peraza, Christina Perez, Sonia Perez, Mihaela Perez, John Perillo, Lauren Perry, Christopher Perry, Mark Person, Michelle Pertzborn, Christine Peters, Christina Petersen, Cody Peterson, Kristin Peterson, Jessica Petryshyn, Kacey Pflasterer, Ashley Pfoutz-Vidale, Lisa Pierzchala, Joshua Pinkerton, Caitlin Poe-Mcelroy, Megan Polcher, Julie Politi, Phillip Ponder, Christopher Poole, Kyle Poole, Leslie Pope, Porscha Porcher, Brandon Porter, Joseph Pospiech, Kristina Post, Adam Powell, Palani Powell, Amanda Powers, Eliezer Pozo, Tori Prater, Destiny Preitz, Jose Prendes, Joshua Pressel, Erin Price, Evan Prince, Elizabeth Pristas, Donna Propri, Rhiannon Pruitt, Vicki Przybylo, Judy Pudup, Ellen Pufahl, Alaina Pupo, Nader Qassim, Reanna Rabeneau, Allison Rager, Sara Rahe, Kaitlyn Ralph, Staci Ralston, Anthony Ramirez, Desiree Ramirez-Vidal, Sarah Randall, Summer Randolph, Anton Rank, Rosalee Rank, Julianna Rann, Camille Rapacon, Nicole Rash, Kathleen Rasmussen, Messina Ratcliff-Blakely, Ivy Rawson Torrance, Samantha Raymond, Ashley Raymond, Eric Rebilas, Cierra Redfield, Brittany Reed-Allen, Erica Reems, Lisa Reid, Kimberly Reinhardt, Katharine Reinhart, Kelsey Reinking, Adrienne Reitano and Jordan Renfroe. (Marshall, J.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 376 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
October 1, 2013 Filing 375 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 374 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 373 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Kendra Moulthrop-Davis, Georgianna Moyer, Jordan Mozdzen, Sherrie Muasau, Charlene Mugica, Haroon Mujadidy, Billy Muncey, Jennifer Mundy, Sundae Mundy, Janet Munger, Kevin Murillo, Jason Murphy, Susan Murphy, Jennifer Murray, Dawnna Murrell, Leah Myers, Debbie Nanez, Andrea Neeranjan, Yolanda Negron, Farhang Nejad, Jayne Nelson, Wynter Nelson, Jowana Nelson, Linda Newbury, Laura Newcomb, Jennifer Newell, Tiffany Newman, Layla Neyman, Judy Neyman, Ashley Nguyen, Jennifer Nguyen, Nancy Nguyen, Melanie Nickelson, Jennifer Nicolini, Jessica Nicotra, Phyllis Nieves-Drennan, Chris Niloff, Heather Noe, Spenser Noffsinger, Sarah Nolan, Christopher Nolfo, Diane Nordstrom, Christopher Norman, Nada Nsheiwat, Alejandro Nunez, Mark Nyikos, Kyle Oberlin, Nathan Obermark, Liza Occhio, Shannon Oconner, Giulietta Oda, Malissa Odell, Ashley Odom, Tiyana Odom, Jessica Ogrady, Karen Olds, Daniel Oleary, Denise Olesen, Michael Olivas, Kraig Oliver, Jorge Olivos, Dale Ololade, Jessica Olsson, Judith Omalley, Stephanie Onkst, Tomas Ooka, Jacquelyn Oppler, Maria Oreilly, Bobbie Ortega, Sarah Ortiz, Melody Ortloff, Anna Osborne, Lacey Osteen, Kurt Oster, Samir Othman, Tanja Owens, Idara Oyekanmi, Christine Pabreza, Anne Pachetti, Miguel Padilla, David Padilla, Lynn Painter, Alfonso Palacios, Stephanie Palmer, Maxwell Palmer, Krystal Palos, Sara Pampinto Boscaino, Laura Pano, Jamie-Lee Paquette, Jennifer Paraday-Karninski, Christina Park, Joey Parker, Matt Parker, Jessica Parker, Michael Parker and Lisa Parker. (Marshall, J.)
October 1, 2013 Filing 373 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
September 28, 2013 Filing 372 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 371 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Keesha Roberts, Fina Robertson, Linda Robertson, Jonathan Robicheau, Kelly Robillard, Kimberly Robinson, Kayla Robinson, Anne Robinson-Long, James Robson, Rebecca Rocchi, Alexis Rocha, Ayana Rochee, Sarah Rochester, Loretta Rodman, Yanira Rodriguez, Daniella Rodriguez, Deangelo Rodriguez, Natasha Rodriguez-Davila, Brandi Rogers, Thomas Rogers, Megan Rogers, Sandy Rogers, Tony Rogers, Jessica Rojo, Izaleen Roman, Rebecca Romano, Jennifer Romero, Fallon Rorie, Jeffrey Rose, Jennifer Ross, Amanda Rossi, Peggy Rostad, Candice Rote, Tina Rotolo, Stephanie Rucker, Adam Ruff, Robert Rumnock, William Russell, Jenny Russo, Dana Rutter, Pamela Ryan, Jonathan Rysdon, Alyssa Saabye, Ben Saenz, Paul Saigeon, Christine Sailer, Victor Salazar, Amber Salazar, Nikki Saleeba, Dominick Salois, Leah Salsman, Roger Salter, Jonathan Sanabria, George Sanchez, Xae Sanchez, Bobby Sanders, Brian Sanders, Dianna Sanders, Nickkia Sansbury, Stacey Santos, Michael Sarmiento, Angela Scaffidi, James Scarbrough, Kevin Schacht, Concetta Schafer, Meg Schlemmer, Natalie Schlosser, Sarah Schmidt, Maryann Schmoll, Stacie Schonfeld, Alysha Schoonmaker, Faith Schoovaerts, Kaye Schrank, Randy Schryer, Sharon Schuler, Juliana Schull, Larry Schulman, Heather Schwab, Raul Sciaky, Margaret Sciales, Melissa Scofield, Shawna Scott, Vanessa Scott, Sean Scott, Tricia Scott, Stephanie Scott, Alyse Scott, Carla Scott Buzzard, Karen Self, Kyle Sellers, Crystal Senter, Isaiah Senyak, Steve Shand, Joellen Shannon, Richie Shannon II, Amanda Sharp, Kelli Shaver, James Shay, Brittany Shealy and Doreen Sheehan. (Lichter, David)
September 28, 2013 Filing 371 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
September 28, 2013 Filing 370 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 369 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Crystal Pilcher, Jessica Pineda, Spencer Pingitore, Tammie Pink, Ambry Pinkston, Avalon Pino, Brian Pino, Monica Pinto, Diane Pipher, Philip Pipitone, Daniel Pitta, Christina Pitman, Jodi Plank, Michelle Poggensee, Michael Pollack, Mark Pollard, Vinnie Pollastrini, Racheal Ponak, Alyssa Pool, Maxine Popa, Sheila Porter, Charles Porter, Sara Potts, Andrea Powell, Brandy Power, Amanda Prater, Gregory Pratt, Tanya Pressl, Kimberly Price, Chance Pridgeon, Shannon Proch, Autumn Pulvermacher, Justin Puroll, Luke Putrament, Audrey Pye, Abigail Pyles, Phat Quach, Danielle Quattrone, Carlos Quezada, Heather Quiles, Jeffrey Quinn, James Raber, Theresa Rafford, Kiera Rain, Jenna Ralston, Stephany Ramos, Anna Ranallo, Jenna Ranaudo, Tyler Ranck, Edward Randall, Tawanna Rankin, Kyle Raper, Raheel Rashid, Candis Ratcliff, Elizabeth Ratzlaff, Tyler Ratzlaff, Kenneth Rauld, Rachel Raup, Courtney Ray, Daniel Raybon, Sharin Raymo, Heather Raymond, Matthew Rebholz, Megan Redd, Lauren Redenius, Gina Reed, Joseph Reed, Kathern Reeder, Stefanie Refsnider, Ariel Regenburg, Kevin Reigel, Eileen Reinoso, Jeffrey Remaley, Megan Remer, Mattie Render, Heriberto Rendon, Amber Restrepo, Molly Reyes, Cristal Reznicek, Christy Rhykerd, Eliza Richards, Heather Richards, Kate Richardson, Allyssa Richardson, Rachel Richardson-Handl, Jake Richmond, Tyler Rick, Ryan Riley, Diane Rinella, Jeanna Rittenbaugh, Carolina Rivas, Jasmine Rivera, Joann Rizzitiello, Sean Rizzo, Hafid Rkiki, Nakeysha Roberson, Ana Roberto, Kirsten Roberts and Jesse Roberts. (Lichter, David)
September 28, 2013 Filing 369 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
September 28, 2013 Filing 368 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 367 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Jeremy Newell, Barbara Newport, Candace Nicholson, Martha Nicol, Ashley Nicoli, Teresa Noakes, Shay Nolan, Desiree Nolan, Michelle Noonan, Lawrence Norkunas, Mari-Lyn Normando, Cassandra Noviello, Egon Nowicki, Kailin Null, Nikky Nwambokobia, Jenna Oberman, James Obrien, Alexandra Ochoa, Andrew Oconnell, Elizabeth Ocque, Rita Odowd, Kayleigh Oflynn, Joshua Ogg, Stasha Ogletree, Linda Olinger, Vernon Oliver, Rebecca Oneill, Jamal Onley, Katie Oreilly, Rockford Oriley, Lydia Ortega, Angel Ortiz, Sherri Orzech, Jason Osborne, Chun Ou, Christina Oubre, Harold Ouimette, Charla Owens, Russell Oxley, Yavuz Ozturk, Virginia Pabon, Miguel Pacheco, Katelyn Paci, Jami Padden, Joseph Padgitt, Jessica Padilla, Pamela Pagleno, Vincier Paige, Mary Painter, Rita Pal, Lindsey Paladino, Dawn Palance, Jennifer Palazzolo, Ellen Palczyk, Elizabeth Paradiso, Pamela Park, Sara Parker, Cynthia Parks, Matthew Parodi, Jasmine Paroongsup, Christopher Parsons, Jerry Patrick, Andrea Patterson, James Paul, Larry Paurowski, Rachael Pavlisin, Del Payan, Laurie Payne, Johanna Pearce, Mary Pearce, Nicole Pearon, Alexandria Pearon, Tanya Pearson-Pate, Lisa Peden, Tracy Peebles, Brian Pekich, April Pellegrino, Jessica Pennington, Jill Pennington, Ronshulay Pennington, Erica Penson, Michael Penu, Krista Percy, Erik Perez, Tyronica Perez, Kimberly Perez, Marisela Perez, Erin Perry, Kristen Peters, Jennifer Peterson, Lisa Peterson, Brett Peterson, Lindsay Peterson, Michael Petisco, Alicia Pettyjohn, Amanda Pfaffenbach, Laura Phelps, John Phipps, Marie Pierre and Misty Pierre. (Lichter, David)
September 28, 2013 Filing 367 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
September 28, 2013 Filing 366 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 362 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Felix A Mendiela, Kristin Menefee, Stella Mercer, Patricia Merliss, Ryan Merritt, Kevin Mette, Samantha Meyers, April Michaels, Nicole Michaels, Jamese Middleton, Kailyn Milam, Susan Milbrandt, Stella Miles, Lisa Miller, Myles Miller, Deanna Miller, Kayleigh Miller, Sara Miller, Richard Miller, John Miller, Tina Miller, Danali Miller, Joe Miller, Samantha Mills, Gina Mills, Sarah Mills-Gittings, Donetta Milner, Theresa Milner-Johnson, Melissa Mineard, Alexandra Minotis, Alexis Miranda, Teresa Mirisola, Madison Misener, Keelan Miskel, Rusty Mitchell, Sherry Mitchell, Amanda Mitchell, Shamieka Mitchell, Robyn Mitchell, Gabriel Miter, Debra Moats, Jennifer Moats-Cunningham, Amy Modrow, James Mohamdein, Janelle Molakides, Laurie Molina, Christina Moll-Carter, Cori Mollus, Lakeisha Mondrey, Heidi Monk, Kendra Monroe, Roseanna Montez, Susan Moody, Elizabeth Moody, Maria Moore, Ashley Moore, Barbara Moore, Donna Moore, January Morales, Christine Morgan, Cameron Morgan, Kenisha Morgan, Melissa Morgan, Kalena Moriarty, Tamera Morris, Lisa Morris-Novak, John Morrissey, Marsha Moss, Christine Moss, Rafael Motta, Michele Mowery, Vanessa Moxley, Holly Mudlock, Jacqueline Mullen, April Munselle, Alexandra Munsey, Tara Murphee, Kristy Murphy, Devin Murphy, Britney Musick, Michael Myers, Brad Myers, Jolynn Myers, Amy Myers, Alan Nalley, Michelle Naparalla, Afton Nartker, Shay Nartker, Vanessa Neal, Angelica Neal, Noah Neat, Jessica Neibauer, Thomas Neill, Erin Neisler, Richard Nelson, Lynn Nemes, Jason Nesbit, Joe Nesbitt, Josh Newberry and Kaila Newcomb. (Lichter, David)
September 28, 2013 Filing 365 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 364 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Emily Wong, Chelsea Wood, Walter Wood, Virginia Woodall-Blakeney, Dennis Woods, Sharon Woodward-Wills, Cheryl Woolf, Tiffany Worsham, Dana Worstall, Cheryl Wright, Derick Wright, Deanna Wright, Sarah Wright, Alicia Wright-Meyers, Colleen Wynne, Anthony Wyrick, Dmitriy Yakovlev, Kailey Yeager, Beverly Yocom, Ashley Yoder, Kim Yori, Konnie Young, Jeffrey Young, Jennifer Young, Heather Yurek, Chelsea Yvon, Jamie Zammit, Jordan Zarcone, Jasmine Zavaleta, Neida Zayas, Jeanette Ziegler, Laura Zimmer-Reihert, Melissa Ziolkowski, Joshua Zmuda, Eric Zostant and Kristine Zostant. (Marshall, J.)
September 28, 2013 Filing 364 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
September 28, 2013 Filing 363 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 361 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): John Vena, Breanna Venable, Wendy Vennera, Bonita Vercellino, Phillip Vereen, Nicholas Verstraete, Morriah Vickrey, Brian Viglielmo, Theresa Viglione, Kindlyne Vilcant, Brian Villarreal, Alicia Villegas, Rachel Vincent, Jennie Viner, Tabetha Voltz, Phyllis Vukelich, Megan Wages-Clay, Michael Wagner, James Wahl, Vince Waite, Amber Wakelin-Mcdaniel, Brienne Walker, Neshaun Walker, Tamara Walker, Chad Walker, Jeffrey Walker, Briana Wallace, Jennifer Walters, Joyce Walton, Veronica Walton, Kim Walz, Elaine Wanker, Jason Ward, Raynard Ward, Brittany Ward, Lauren Wargacki, Dianna Warren, Taniqua Warren, Parker Warren, Whitney Washington, Heidii Wasserburger, Lee Anna Watson, Angela Waugh, Teresa Way, Jana Weatherman, Angela Weaver, Jennifer Webb, Jessica Weber, Elizabeth Weekley, Shannon Weekley, Murielle Weeks, Trevor Wehner, Jessica Weibler, Jen Weiss, Linda Wells, Eric Wells, Amy Wells-Bewer, Joseph Wendel, Laura Wendel, Megan West, Dalton West, Adrian Westhof, Christine Whalen, Tausha Wharton, Deborah Wheat, John Whetton, Devin Whitaker, Marti Whitcomb, Tim White, Tavner White, Paul White, Richard White, Jr., Brittany Whitehead, Sarah Whitfield, Jonathon Wian, Lydia Willekens, Bryce Williams, Wayne Williams, Cali Williams, Sema Williams, Laquita Williams, Darryl Williams, Ashlea Williams, Michelle Williams-Derosa, Teresa Willoughby, Trisha Willoughby, Cheryl Wilson, Robert Casey Wilson, Amy Wilson, Victoria Wilson, Timothy Wilson, Alexandra Wingfield, Dawn Winters, Dawn Wisch, Nikita Wise, Marie Wise, Christina Wish, Jesse Witmier and Katherine Witzman. (Marshall, J.)
September 28, 2013 Filing 362 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
September 28, 2013 Filing 361 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
September 28, 2013 Filing 360 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 357 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Debra Strickland, Justine Strinz, Jonathan Stump, Leslie Suarez, Cari Suhr, Sarah Sullivan, Dawn Sullivan, Brenna Surdahl, Marcia Sutton, Adam Swecker, Kristin Swinford, Colin Sydejko, Victoria Symmonds, Robyn Tackebury, Saskia Takacova, Anthony Talir, Vickie Tangeman, Shannon Tanguay, Ashley Tanner, Lora Tarleton, Amanda Tarver, Jonathan Tatro, Ryan Tauzin, Amanda Taylor, Tania Taylor, Lauren Taylor, Jennifer Taylor, Joseph Tecson, Jaxon Teig, Calvin Temple, Will Tenbrook, Cherish Tenpenny, Michael Terzo, Jennifer Thames, Louann Thibault, Dustin Thomas, Amber Thomas, Stephanie Thomas, Monique Thomas, Rich Thomas, Jennifer Thomas, Julie Thomas, Nicole Thomas, Katherine Thompkins, Meghan Thornton, Maria Threadgill, Holly Tiller, James Tisdale, Jill Titus, Samuel Tjalsma, Larry Tobias, Christine Tokich, Angel Toler Piper, Tara Tollefson, Eryn Tolley, Joseph Tompkins, Taylor Tonkovich, Mercedes Torres, Jose Tovar, Bryan Traughber, Christy Traughber, Farran Travers, Pamela Traylor, Robert Triano, Sierra Trigueiro, Robert Trim, James Truckenbrod, Zach Trueblood, Sarah Tucker, Jennifer Tufano, Meghan Tuma, Craig Tyler, Ijeoma Uchegbuo, Melissa Udvardy, Margarita Uk, Amber Urias-England, Jennifer Usquiano, Jennifer Valdez, Lisa Valentino, Myra Valero, William Van Kley, Christina Vance, Kari Vanderweit, Katie Vanlokeren, Tyler Vanmeter, Wongsar Vann, Frank Vannoni, Aaron Vanpelt, Charis Vansingel, Enrique Vargas, Elizabeth Varholy, Melissa Vasquez, Viviana Vasquez, Vanessa Vaughan, Samantha Vasquez, Adriana Vasquez-Velasquez, Joshua Velasquez, Wendy Velasquez, Tiffany Velkovich and Teresa Veltri. (Marshall, J.)
September 28, 2013 Filing 359 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 358 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Felicia Lynch, Matt Lynch, Brett Lyons, Montonio Mackell, Ervin Mackey, Kayla Mackiewicz, Victoria Madan, Tabitha Maevers, Eric Magee, Christopher Magnuson, Tara Maharowski, Anastasia Maher, Deborah Maher, Roger Main Iii, Jarek Main, Sherry Maio, Shariyon Major, Monecke Major, Juliana Makedonski, Simona Malinauskaite, Casey Malinowski, Annie Malka, Edward Malo, Tyrell Malone, Richard Maloney, Albert Mangiacapra III, Annette Mangrum, Jessica Manley, Joe Manns, Cameron Mansfield, Melissa Mansker, Danielle Marcum-Mercado, Cynthia Marcus-Simmons, Brianna Marganti, Elyssa Markle, Firmina Marques, Andrea Marsh, Linda Marston, Silvio Martelli, Latisha Martin, Toccara Martin, Taquetta Martin, Kathy Martin, Erika Martindale, Stephanie Martinez-Saenz, Darya Martynenka, Jessica Martz, Sandra Mason, Ashley Mason, Brooke Massie, Ashley Masteller, Cody Mathis, Atmar Matthews, Rachel Matthews, Genesis Matthiesen, Latasha Mayers, Rebecca Mayo, Tamara Mayo-Murrell, Laura Mc Namara, Hazel Mcandrew, Lisa Mccarthy, Marc Mcclure, Lynette Mcclurg-Corcoran, Kasarah Mcconnie, Ebonie Mccord, Marie Mccravey, Megan Mcdonald, Ashley Mcdonald, Sharon Mcdonald, Evan Mcdonald, Irene Mcdonough, dawn Mcfarland, Alicia Mcgaughey, Jacqueline Mcgill-Osborn, Avery Mcginnis, Maureen Mcglynn, Mark Mcgowan, Jeremy Mcgregor, Robert Mcgrew, Bryce Mcintosh, Cynthia Mcintosh, Amanda Mckenna, John Mckenzie, Jared McKinney, Marlena Mclaughlin, Angela Mclemore, Patrick McLeod, Rudolph Mclemore, Connor Mclendon, Molly Mcmakin, Malia Mcmanus, Michael Mcnally, William Mcnamara, Jennifer Mcpherson, Kristen Mcqueen, Gina Meconi, Kaitlyn Meehan, Alesha Melbourne and Robert Meluch. (Lichter, David)
September 28, 2013 Filing 358 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
September 28, 2013 Filing 357 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
September 28, 2013 Filing 356 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 355 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Alyssa Kitsmiller, Michael Kalde, Jr., Ashley Kleamenakis, Theresa Klein, Sara Klug, Donna Kluka, Donna Knake, Shari Knechel-Jones, Ashlei Kniep, Jessica Knutowski, Yamesha Kocatas, Patricia Koehler, Tricia Kokoszka, Michael Kolb, Melanie Kollmeyer, Jennifer Kormos, Christian Kostyo, Nicole Kovalcin, Brandy Kreider, Nicole Kruzik, Ira Kubowski, Kaitlin Kuhnhoff, Brad Kurtz, Kristine Kuta, Cory Laatsch, Leah Lacour, Liana Laddaga, Jesse Laflair, Katy Laforce, Henri Laguerre, David Laird, Kimberly Lamar, Lisa Lambirth, Donald Lander, Jr., Patrick Landru, Jolene Langford, Levi Langston, Stacey Lape-Imler, Angel Laporta, Ashly Lariviere-Kihlmire, Grant Larson, Lynnsey Larson, Larissa Lasher, Richard Laskowich, Kimberly Lathem, Diane Lattari, Sharon Lauer, Allison Lawless, Eric Lawlyes, Chasaty Lawson-Stelmach, Matthew Layden, Alyssa Layman, Amy Leao, Chris Leclerq, Charity Lee-Veal, Hannah Legg, Katasha Leggett, Sundee Leiby, Maegan Lemons, Neeka Lepage, Ebony Lester, Lauren Letizio, Deborah Lewis, William Lewis, Kylene Ley, Hui Li, Morgan Lilly, Kimmie Linder, Julia Lipowitch, Christina Lipski, Kristyn Lisius, Lauren Little, Alison Littlejohn, Zachary Litwin, William Livingston, Stephanie Lober, Jeanette Loera, Brittany Lohse, Bonnie Lombardi, Tammy Longo, Brian Lopez, Ray Lopez, Michael Lopez, Gabriela Lorelli-Firmenich, Amber Lorey, Kelly Loss, Erin Lowe, Lora Lowe, Diana Lowe, Amanda Lowie, Carey Lowther, Linda Lucas, Bethany Lucas, Vickie Lucas-Cervenec, Melody Luchuck, David Ludwig, Marcos Lugo-Busanet, Nisha Luka, Danielle Lupardus and Trevor Lyman. (Lichter, David)
September 28, 2013 Filing 355 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
September 28, 2013 Filing 354 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 353 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Paris Irby, Randi Irwin, Johnny Irwin, Ruth Jackson, Kate Jackson, Kimberly Jackson, Toni Jacobs, Stephanie Johoda, Margaret Jakubicek, Camilo Jalil, Ann Jallos-Kammerer, Tammy James, Leslie Ann James, Veronica Jamison, Anna Janik, Lindzee Januszewski, Melissa Jaquay, Beverly Jarosz, Heather Jarrard, Anita Jarrett, Brian Jaynes, Franklin Jefferson, Susan Jeffrey, William Jenkins, Ricky Jenkins, Diane Jennings, Cody Jennison, Jordan Jensen, Cory Jessup, Alexis Jiminez, Antonio Jiminez, Jerome John, Nicole Johnson, Tim Johnson, Alex Johnson, Lora Johnson, Joshua Johnson, Syrena Johnson, Demitris Johnson, Martin Johnson, Alisha Johnson, Susan Johnson, Dallas Johnson, Travis Johnson, Bonnie Johnson, Brock Johnson, Carissa Johnson, Angela Jolliff, Serenity Jones, Desiree Jones, Leah Jones, Shelby Jones, Katrina Jones, Kenyatta Jones, Willie Jordan, Leah Joyce, Ashley Joynes, Anthony Juaire, Jonathan Juarbe, Ashley Juarbe, Jeffrey Jurist, Anna Kaczor, Mark Kahley, Jennifer Kahn, Jamie Karwowski, Nathan Katt, Jasmine Kearney, Tracy Keating, Matthias Keck, Stephanie Kecskes, Maureen Kedra, Michelle Keeper, Debbie Keidel, Sophia Keithley, Lisa Kelley, Pamela Kelley, Andrea Kelley, Shadia Kemper, Emily Kendall, Stephanie Kennedy, Autumn Keplar, Anna Kerr, Donna Kersch, Matthew Kesler, Pamela Kessler, Joseph Khammash, Elizabeth Khan, Pasha Khayyam, Stephen Kidney, Kearsi Kiefer-Gordon, Heather Kilbourne, Melissa Kimmons, Hollie King, Miesha King, Demetra King, Tiffany King, Kevin King, John Kirkpatrick and Arthur Kitchen. (Lichter, David)
September 28, 2013 Filing 353 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
September 27, 2013 Filing 352 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 351 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Shauna Sheets, Christopher Sheffield, Nanette Shekell, Leila Shoukry, Cherisy Showalter, Richard Siar, Alicia Sibley, Jennifer Sides, Phyllis Silenzi, Kelly Sillanpaa, Heather Silva, Cerrissa Simmons, Ashley Simon, Melika Simpson, Angela Simpson, Ellen Sipes, Maria Sipes, William Sipes, Toni Sisamuth, Diane Sitts, Renee Skalecki, Matthew Skelton, Chandra Skeoch, James Skinner, Kathleen Slade, Roben Slade, Heather Slater, Katelyn Slawkawski, Matthew Sleight, Lisa Smallridge-Sorron, Daryl Smart, Joseph Smedo, Melody Smith, Julie Smith, Shannon Smith, Matthew Smith, Candyce Smith, Earl Smith, Kyle Smith, Meagan Smith, Nicholas Smith, Kathleen Smith, Ingram Smith, Kennith Smith, Jessica Smith, Amanda Smith-Hogue, Covington Smith-Muir, Molly Smoot, Whitney Snyder, Halea Solano, Jenn Sommer, Teresa Songer, Michael Sosa, Kenneth Sosnicki, Leticia Soto, Teresa Soto, Robert Soucie, Johnathan Spann, Kathryn Speer, Harrisena Speights, Keinya Speigner-Eichhorn, Christine Spence, Renee Sperring, Nikki Spiess, Colby Spooner, Tyler Spresser, Laurelie Sproule, Amanda Spry, Leo St. Pierre, Brittney Stabile-Dillander, Rebecca Stabler, Terry Staffiero, Kelly Stafford, Maegan Staggs, Eric Stanczak, Tia Stanfield, Renae Stansell, Amy Starett-Ontiveros, Heather Steff, Sandra Steigelman, Brittani Steward, Lisette Stewart, Michael Stewart, Semon Stewart, Meredith Stewart, David Stewart, Stephen Stiles, Amber Stoerrle, Beverly Stokes, Shannon Stokes, Kristina Stoll, James Stone, Tamara Stoner, Maureen Stout, Kyle Stout, Erica Straccamore, Michael Stradone, Marissa Stramiello, Cindy Strawser and Michelle Strickland. (Marshall, J.)
September 27, 2013 Filing 351 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by J. Paxton Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marshall, J.)
September 27, 2013 Filing 350 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 349 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Heather Harter, Rose Harting-Hoskins, Adel Hartnett, Felecia Harvey, Ashraf Hasan, Rikki Hatfield, Robert Hawkins, Ashley Haynes, Cassandra Haynes, Bevan Haynes, Candice Healey, Leticia Heard, Angelia Heckman, Jacob Hedrick, Dennis Heeke, Katherine Hefley, Zach Heikes, Kimberly Held, Schuyler Helm, Melissa Hemler-Hunter, Talia Hender, Stephanie Henderson, Marian Henderson, Sarah Henderson-Meyers, Victoria Hendricks, Logan Henke, Rachel Henneberger, Rhonda Henry, David Herbermann, Jeanett Hernandez, Diana Hernandez, Melissa Herold, Catherine Herrick, Chris Herrick, Domonic Herring, Alexis Herrington, Kelly Herrington, Kelsey Hess, Courtney Hickman, Gary Hicks, Eoin Higgins, Mary Higgs, Tyaisha Hill, Ashley Hines, Dustin Hitt, Caralyn Hockman, Craig Hodek, Destinee Hodges, Jeffrey Hoeger, Terra Hoesman, Joseph Hoffine, Reed Hofmann, Darren Hogg, Michael Hogue, Kristen Holcomb, Carole Holder, Michael Holguin, Vanessa Holguin, Kyle Hollering, Michael Holliday, Alicia Hollingsworth, Desiree Holm, Tamara Holmes, Donya Holt, Latrice Hopper, Hannah Hopper, Schyler Horne, Lorraine Horner, Lesli Horton, Karen Horvat, Kristine Hosterman, Melissa Houghton, Corrine House, Lynette Howard, Lorraine Howard, Kathleen Howard, Victoria Howard, Sandra Howard, Kristopher Howe, Phillip Hoyos, Kristina Hradsky, Kaitlyn Hron, Sergio Huapaya, Amanda Huber, Samantha Huber, Kristapher Hudson, Joyewel Hudson, Kathleen Hughes, Kelly Hughes-Veith, Joy Hughes-White, Dustin Hull, Heather Hummel, Ashley Humphrey, Kenneth Hunley, Amanda Huntsucker, Erikka Hurd, Angela Hurley, Angela Hutzel, Ashley Ince and Dennis Ingram. (Lichter, David)
September 27, 2013 Filing 349 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by David Henry Lichter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lichter, David)
September 27, 2013 Filing 348 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 346 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Melissa Gilbert, Lorraine Giroux, Elizabeth Gish, Tiffani Given, Angela Glasscock, Adaryll Glover, Alexndra Goldbach, Casey Golden, Wanda Golden, Libby Golding, Dmitry Goldman, Stephen Goldman, Leigh Golson, Solomon Gomez, Joseph Gomez, Rosita Gomez-Guis, Matthew Gompf, Stephanie Goncalves, Sara Goncalves, Joel Gonzalez, Dalia Gonzalez, Hope Gonzalez, Kyle Good, Nicole Goods, Michele Goodwin, Danielle Goodwin, Tracey Gosselin, Orion Gosselin, Stephen Graham, Devin Graham, Jabbar Graham, Denah Gramolino, Penny Grampton, Kristine Grams-Rodriguez, Diamond Graves, Bethany Gray, Luke Gray, Eric Gray, Jason Gray, Maureen Greco, Robyn Green, Monalethia Green, Tamara Green, Tawana Green, Sharda Green, Pandora Green, Dawn Green, Paul Gribble, Rebecca Griffin, Sandra Griffitts, Misty Grimard, Carey Grimes, Martha Grimes, Noel Gruber, Tammie Guerra, Rhodeney Guerrier, Amanda Guest-Lower, Manda Guidry, Kendra Guilfoyle, Mohammad Gulljee, Patricia Gurrister, Eden Gustin, Enrioue Guzman, Seth Haber, Yiota Haddock, Kathleen Hafer, Jennifer Hafner, Erynn Hagerthey, Leah Hahn, Tera Haines, David Hall, Bryan Hall, Amber Hall, Aimee Hall, Jessica Hall, Penelope Hall, Caltlin Hallett, Andrew Hamaday, Shamia Hamilton, Latosha Hamilton, Dekauda Hamilton, Sarah Hamilton, River Hammons, Daniel Handa, Bentley Hanna, Todd Hanson, Brandi Harbour, Evelyn Hardley, Derek Hardman, Kaitlyn Harmon, Suzette Harned, Monica Harner-Pereschuk, Lisa Harris, Priscilla Harris, Patrick Harris, Tarabey Harris, Kimberly Harrison, Jessica Harrison-Dunn, Kathleen Hart and Sherry Hart. (Lichter, David)
September 27, 2013 Filing 347 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on # 344 Notice of Consent to Join into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Tina England, Keldrick Engram, Diana Engstrom, Kayla Enright, Kevin Esancy, Katelyn Eshelman, Carlos Espinoza, Derrick Evans, Tabatha Evans, Laura Everett, Brandon Exum, Anthony Faccinto, Sheila Fahey, Susan Fahnestock, Miranda Faiivae, Pamela Fain, Kayla Fairchild, Cierra Farkas, Damion Farrow, Shawna Fellegi, Joseph Feltz, Jin Feng, Steven Fiano, Ruth Fields, Jonathan Fil, Donna Fink, Chris Fisher, Carla Fisher, Stephanie Fisher, Chelsea Fisher, Robin Fisher-Jordan, Morgan Fitzgerald, Chantelle Fizz, Dana Flansburg, Scott Flarity, Ron Flaugher, Barbara Fleming, Christine Fletcher, Candace Fleurent, Jennifer Flieger, Keith Flieger, Lisa Flockhart-Lewis, Krystal Floret, Theresa Flournoy, Bernice Fogle, Anthony Fontan, Joshua Forcier, Jessica Ford, Dedria Ford, Tynisha Foster-Bey, Christopher Francisco, Jazmin Franklin, Christina Frazier, Meghan Frechette, Hannah Free, Marsalis Freeman, Tiffany Freeman, Bethany French, Amanda French, Kevin French, Myia Frick, Ryan Friday, Kelly Friel, Yvette Friesenhahn, Korie Fritzinger, Matthew Frometa, Annalys Fuentes, Kari Gable, James Gaine, Eric Gaiser, Donna Galauskas, Desiree Gale, Angelica Galicia, Nathan Galiyas, Christopher Gallo, Nicole Gallo, Alishia Gambino, Laurie Ganey, Mary Garcia, Tara Garcia, Keisha Garcia, Genevieve Gardella, Nicole Gardner, Elizabeth Garlick, Robin Garrett, Lynn Gasco, Natalie Gass, Jeanette Gates, Kandice Gause, Jamie Gavens, Danielle Genberg, Donnie Gentry, Rebecca Geraci, Erica Germini, Nathan Geschke, Tracie Gibson, Peggy Gibson, Russell Gibson, Heather Gibson and Kalin Gilbert. (Marshall, J.)
September 27, 2013 Filing 346