Scotton v. United States Of America

Plaintiff: Rogerio Chaves Scotton
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 0:2019cv60745
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
2 Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. In light of the report recommending that this case be closed and the pending Section 2255 motion pending in case number 17-62428-CV-Williams the instant motion is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/4/2019. (jb01)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #11 Motion Transfer of Exhibits. In light of the report recommending that this case be dismissed as duplicative, this motion is denied as moot. The exhibits in case number 17-62428-CV-Williams need not be transferred to the instant case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/4/2019. (jb01)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #7 Motion Disclosure of CJA Vouchers. The motion is duplicative of a motion filed in case number 17-62428-CV-Williams which should be the operative case. The instant motion is denied and the motion in the other case will be addressed by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/4/2019. (jb01)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #3 Motion for Leave to File. In light of the Report and Recommendations directing that this case be closed and the movant file an amended motion in case number 17-62428-CV-Williams the motion to file an amended motion in this case is denied, however the movant may file an amended motion in case number 17-62428-CV-Williams subject to any procedural bars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/4/2019. (jb01)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Combine Both Civil Cases by Rogerio Chaves Scotton. Responses due by 5/21/2019 (pes)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Request the Transfer of the Exhibits from the Previous 2255 to the Current 2255 by Rogerio Chaves Scotton. (pes)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION Requesting Release Pending Resolution to His Section 2255 or Alternative to Home Confinment for Good Cause by Rogerio Chaves Scotton. (drz)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS DISMISSAL AS DUPLICATIVE on 28 USC 2255 case re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Rogerio Chaves Scotton ; Recommending that this higher numbered case be dismissed as duplicative. Objections to R&R due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 4/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Rogerio Chaves Scotton. (drz)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 Movant's Motion to Request all Attorney's CJA Vouchers Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3006(a)(B) Through(E) by Rogerio Chaves Scotton. (drz)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 PETITIONER'S MOTION TO REQUEST THE Recusal OF JUDGE FEDERICO A. MORENO FROM THIS CASE FOR ACTUAL AND APPARENT BIAS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 144 AND 455 IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE by Rogerio Chaves Scotton. (drz)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Federico A. Moreno recused. Case reassigned to Judge Kathleen M. Williams for all further proceedings (12cr60049-FAM) Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 3/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (mr1)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Petitioner's MOTION to Leave to File his Memorandum of Law in Regarding the Movant's 2255 by Rogerio Chaves Scotton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mee)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (mee)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 12CR60049), filed by Rogerio Chaves Scotton.(mee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scotton v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogerio Chaves Scotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?