Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. BERTHA ROXANA KAHN et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Bertha Roxana Kahn, PERU GROUP, INC., PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT, Ernesto Javier Servat, Cesar Castro and Renzo Javier Salini
Case Number: 0:2019cv60769
Filed: March 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
2 Judge: Barry S Seltzer
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0501
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION for January 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 7/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (fc)
June 28, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Added Mark E. Stein. (Barimo, Elise)
June 17, 2019 Filing 32 Initial Disclosure(s) by Cesar Castro, Bertha Roxana Kahn, PERU GROUP, INC., PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT, Renzo Javier Salini, Ernesto Javier Servat (Barimo, Elise)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. No discovery motions shall be filed with the Court unless specifically authorized by Order. In the event a discovery dispute does arise, counsel are instructed to meet and confer in a good faith attempt to resolve the dispute. If, after conferring, the parties cannot resolve their discovery dispute, the movant must seek relief within 14 days after the grounds for relief occur by contacting the undersigneds Chambers (954-769-5450) and scheduling a discovery hearing. The movant shall have first conferred with opposing counsel and obtained three alternative dates and times that both counsel are available for a hearing. The attorney or other person with knowledge who telephones the Court shall have the following information: (a) the nature of the discovery dispute; (b) the efforts made to confer with opposing counsel; and (c) three agreed upon dates for a hearing. The Court will then set the matter for hearing and order the parties to submit a joint status report on the issues. Where there has been a complete failure to respond to discovery, and where good faith efforts have been made (without success) to obtain that discovery, counsel need not obtain agreed upon dates, but shall so inform the Court telephonically of the issue, and the Court will set the matter for hearing. Finally, when the parties have stipulated to the entry of an order, such as stipulated confidentiality order, the parties shall not file a motion for entry of the stipulated order. Instead, counsel shall email to Chambers (seltzer@flsd.uscourts.gov) a copy of the proposed stipulated order in Word or WordPerfect format, with a statement that the parties have agreed to entry of the proposed order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer on 6/13/2019. (mws)
June 11, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc.. (Danz, Alan)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, Requiring Mediation, and Referring Certain Matters to Magistrate Judge: (Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz, Calendar Call set for 6/2/2020 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz, Amended Pleadings due by 7/19/2019, All Discovery due by 2/10/2020, Expert Discovery due by 2/10/2020, Mediation Deadline 2/17/2020, In Limine Motions due by 3/24/2020, All pre-trial Motions due by 2/25/2020, Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/24/2020.) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer for Discovery matters. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 2/17/2020.) Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 SUPPLEMENT to #27 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 by Cesar Castro, Bertha Roxana Kahn, PERU GROUP, INC., PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT, Renzo Javier Salini, Ernesto Javier Servat (Barimo, Elise)
June 7, 2019 Filing 27 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Cesar Castro, Bertha Roxana Kahn, PERU GROUP, INC., PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT, Renzo Javier Salini, Ernesto Javier Servat (Barimo, Elise)
June 7, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cesar Castro, Bertha Roxana Kahn, PERU GROUP, INC., PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT, Renzo Javier Salini, Ernesto Javier Servat (Barimo, Elise)
June 6, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elise Belen Barimo on behalf of Cesar Castro, Bertha Roxana Kahn, PERU GROUP, INC., PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT, Renzo Javier Salini, Ernesto Javier Servat. Attorney Elise Belen Barimo added to party Cesar Castro(pty:dft), Attorney Elise Belen Barimo added to party Bertha Roxana Kahn(pty:dft), Attorney Elise Belen Barimo added to party PERU GROUP, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Elise Belen Barimo added to party PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT(pty:dft), Attorney Elise Belen Barimo added to party Renzo Javier Salini(pty:dft), Attorney Elise Belen Barimo added to party Ernesto Javier Servat(pty:dft). (Barimo, Elise)
June 6, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Cesar Castro, Bertha Roxana Kahn, PERU GROUP, INC., PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT, Renzo Javier Salini, Ernesto Javier Servat (Strems, Scot)
June 5, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT signed by : GEORGE HANZIMANOLIS. AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WITH SUMMONS by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Danz, Alan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT signed by : GEORGE HANZIMANOLIS. AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Danz, Alan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Cesar Castro, Bertha Roxana Kahn, PERU GROUP, INC., PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT, Renzo Javier Salini, Ernesto Javier Servat. (Strems, Scot)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT signed by : GEORGE HANZIMANOLIS. AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WITH SUMMONS by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Danz, Alan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Doug Nelson. AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Danz, Alan)
May 28, 2019 Reset Deadlines Cesar Castro answer due 5/29/2019; Bertha Roxana Kahn answerdue 5/29/2019; PERU GROUP, INC. answer due 5/29/2019; PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT answer due 5/29/2019; Renzo Javier Salini answer due 5/29/2019; Ernesto Javier Servat answer due 5/29/2019 Per DE#16. (cqs)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Show Cause Response due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificate of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 5/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (gp)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER DENYING #15 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint by no later than May 29, 2019. Signed by Judge Rodolfo Ruiz on 5/24/2019. (fc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Cesar Castro, Bertha Roxana Kahn, PERU GROUP, INC., PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT, Renzo Javier Salini, Ernesto Javier Servat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Strems, Scot)
May 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scot Strems on behalf of Cesar Castro, Bertha Roxana Kahn, PERU GROUP, INC., PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT, Renzo Javier Salini, Ernesto Javier Servat. Attorney Scot Strems added to party Cesar Castro(pty:dft), Attorney Scot Strems added to party Bertha Roxana Kahn(pty:dft), Attorney Scot Strems added to party PERU GROUP, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Scot Strems added to party PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT(pty:dft), Attorney Scot Strems added to party Renzo Javier Salini(pty:dft), Attorney Scot Strems added to party Ernesto Javier Servat(pty:dft). (Strems, Scot)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer added. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 5/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (bms)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz for all further proceedings, Judge Jose E. Martinez no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (yar)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Cesar Castro, Bertha Roxana Kahn, PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT, Renzo Javier Salini, Ernesto Javier Servat. (lbc)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Peru Group Inc., #2 Summon(s) Renzo Javier Servat, #3 Summon(s) Bertha Roxana Kahn, #4 Summon(s) Cesar Castro, #5 Summon(s) Ernesto Javier Servat) (Danz, Alan)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 3/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Renzo Javier Salini, Cesar Castro, Ernesto Javier Servat, PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT and PERU GROUP, INC.. (Danz, Alan)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance of Filing Fees $400.00, receipt number 113C-11502132 re 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Danz, Alan)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The filing fee has not been paid and all parties have not been added. (cds)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $400.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (cds)
March 25, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (cds)
March 25, 2019 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (cds)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
March 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Bertha Roxana Kahn et al against Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summon(s) Cesar Castro, #3 Summon(s) Ernesto Javier Servat, #4 Summon(s) Peru Group Inc., #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s) Bertha Rocana Kahn, #7 Certification Certificate of Interested Parties)(Danz, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. BERTHA ROXANA KAHN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertha Roxana Kahn
Represented By: Scot Strems
Represented By: Elise Belen Barimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERU GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Scot Strems
Represented By: Elise Belen Barimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERU GROUP, INC., d/b/a SAXSAY RESTAURANT
Represented By: Scot Strems
Represented By: Elise Belen Barimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto Javier Servat
Represented By: Scot Strems
Represented By: Elise Belen Barimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Castro
Represented By: Scot Strems
Represented By: Elise Belen Barimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renzo Javier Salini
Represented By: Scot Strems
Represented By: Elise Belen Barimo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Alan David Danz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?