Telcy v. United States Of America
Plaintiff: Jacques Hernes Telcy
Defendant: United States Of America
Case Number: 0:2019cv61715
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William P Dimitrouleas
Referring Judge: Lurana S Snow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Jacques Hernes Telcy re #9 Notice of Appeal. No Transcript Requested. (apz)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #9 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jacques Hernes Telcy. Date received by USCA: 8/9/19. USCA Case Number: 19-13028-F. (hh)
August 9, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #9 Notice of Appeal. Notice has been electronically mailed. (hh)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appeal by Jacques Hernes Telcy as to #8 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Filing fee $ 505.00 Receipt#: FEE NOT PAID. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (COA denied see de# {6]) (hh)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Reconsideration. Case remains closed, all pending Motions are Denied as Moot. The Court denies a certificate of appealability Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to Fed.R.CIV.R. 59(e) re #6 Judgment, #5 Order Dismissing Case by Jacques Hernes Telcy. (jao)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 FINAL JUDGMENT for Respondent in favor of United States Of America against Jacques Hernes Telcy; Any pending Motions are Denied as Moot and the Court denies a certificate of appealability, Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 07/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER DISMISSING MOTION TO VACATE; Any pending Motions are Denied as Moot, Closing Case. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of Law and Argument In Support re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Jacques Hernes Telcy. (cds)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Jacques Hernes Telcy. re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Jacques Hernes Telcy (cds)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. (cds)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate, Set Aside Or Correct Sentence (2255). NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 0:08-cr-60207-WPD), filed by Jacques Hernes Telcy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(cds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telcy v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacques Hernes Telcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?