United States Of America v. Cerejo
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Emilio Mendes Dias Cerejo
Case Number: 0:2019cv62268
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States Of America. Emilio Mendes Dias Cerejo served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Murphy, Lynne)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Adam Neiman on behalf of Emilio Mendes Dias Cerejo (Neiman, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derick Roberson Vollrath on behalf of Emilio Mendes Dias Cerejo (Vollrath, Derick)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Adam Neiman on behalf of Emilio Mendes Dias Cerejo. Attorney Jeffrey Adam Neiman added to party Emilio Mendes Dias Cerejo(pty:dft). (Neiman, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derick Roberson Vollrath on behalf of Emilio Mendes Dias Cerejo. Attorney Derick Roberson Vollrath added to party Emilio Mendes Dias Cerejo(pty:dft). (Vollrath, Derick)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Emilio Mendes Dias Cerejo. (lbc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Emilio Mendes Dias Cerejo by United States Of America (Murphy, Lynne)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Emilio Mendes Dias Cerejo on 9/18/2019 by United States Of America. Waiver of Service due by 10/18/2019. (Murphy, Lynne)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Emilio Mendes Dias Cerejo. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Lynne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Cerejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilio Mendes Dias Cerejo
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Neiman
Represented By: Derick Roberson Vollrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Lynne M. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?