Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc. et al v. Sackler et al
Plaintiff: Halifax Hospital Medical Center, Central Florida Health, Hialeah Hospital, Inc., St. Mary's Medical Center, Inc., North Shore Medical Center, Inc., Live Oak HMA, LLC, Larkin Community Hospital Behavioral Service, Inc., Crestview Hospital Corporation, Good Samaritan Medical Center, Inc., Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc., HMA Santa Rosa Medical Center, LLC, Lake Shore HMA, LLC, Lake Wales Hospital Corporation, Venice HMA, LLC, Lifemark Hospitals of Florida, Inc., Osceolasc LLC, Flagler Hospital, Inc., Palm Beach Gardens Community Hospital, Inc., Key West HMA, LLC, CGH Hospital, Ltd., Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, Naples HMA, LLC, Citrus HMA, LLC, Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, Port Charlotte HMA, LLC., North Broward Hospital District, Starke HMA, LLC.,, Larkin Community Hospital Palm Springs Campus, LLC, Larkin Community Hospital, Inc., The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc., Delray Medical Center, Inc., Haines City HMA, LLC., Hernando HMA, LLC and All Plaintiffs
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Anda, Inc., Barbara C. Miller, Damon Storhoff, Walgreen Co., Jonathan Sackler, Walmart Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Briann Parson-Barnes, Lindsey Bonifacio, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SPECGX, LLC, Draupadi Daley, Becca Beck Harville, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Theresa Sackler, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Actavis LLC, Henry Schein Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., John Stewart, Noramco, Inc., The Kroger Co., Allergan USA, Inc., Mark Timney, Mallinckrodt LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Ortho-McNeil-Jannssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Russell Gasdia, Par Pharmaceutical Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Depomed, Inc., Tammy Heyward, Beverly Sackler, Allergan Sales, LLC, Kathe Sackler, Richard Sackler, H.D. SMITH, LLC, Kroger Limited Partnership II, James Speed, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Craig Landau, Cephalon, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Pharmacy Inc., David Sackler, Dina C. Muller, Mallinckrodt PLC and Allergan PLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv62992
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 65 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order Granting Motion to Remand to: 17th Judicial Circuit Court. State Court Case Number: CACE-19-018882 (kpe)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Remand. Order denying #30 Motion to stay Proceedings. This case is Remanded to the Seventeenth Judicial Circuit, Broward County, Florida. This case CLOSED, and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 23, 2020 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer To Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC, SPECGX, LL. (Hearn, Robert) Modified filers on 1/23/2020 (mc).
January 15, 2020 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 01/13/2020 before Judge Jose E. Martinez, 1-23 pages, Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, 305-523-5178 / Patricia_Diaz@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2020. (pdz)
January 14, 2020 Filing 61 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jose E. Martinez: Motion Hearing held on 1/14/2020 re Plaintiffs' #13 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court. Total time in court: 40 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): William R. Scherer, Bruce S. Rogow, Ana Romes, Jonathan W. Cuneo, Conor B. O'Croinin, Joshua D. Lerner, Nelson Camilo Bellido, Evelyn Lee. The parties are directed to file proposed orders by the close of business Thursday, January 16, 2020. Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, 305-523-5178 / Patricia_Diaz@flsd.uscourts.gov. (kml)
January 8, 2020 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 1/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Scherer, William)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PAPERLESS ORDER denying Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s #39 Verified Motion to Continue January 13, 2020 Hearing Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Only counsel who is expected to, or wishes to, argue the Motion to Remand is required to attend. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/7/2020. (kml)
January 6, 2020 Filing 58 STATUS REPORT by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Berman, Nathan)
January 6, 2020 Filing 57 RESPONSE in Support re #39 MOTION to Continue January 13, 2020 Hearing Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re 15 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #30 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Mu filed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Berman, Nathan)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Conor B. O'Croinin. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
January 6, 2020 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum filed by All Plaintiffs. (Scherer, William)
January 3, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Conor B. O'Croinin. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12273686 by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy Inc.. Responses due by 1/17/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Nathan)
January 3, 2020 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Continue January 13, 2020 Hearing Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re 15 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #30 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Mu filed by All Plaintiffs. Replies due by 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Scherer, William)
January 3, 2020 Filing 52 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by All Plaintiffs (Scherer, William)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #50 Defendant Noramco, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendant Noramco shall file a response to the complaint on or before the later of either: (a) thirty (30) days after the Court's decision on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand; or (b) transfer of this action to the MDL pending in the Northern District of Ohio, In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, Case No.CV 17-2804. All other deadlines shall remain unaffected. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/3/2020. (kml)
January 3, 2020 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Noramco, Inc.. Attorney Christopher Carl Marquardt added to party Noramco, Inc.(pty:dft). (Marquardt, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Jonathan W. Cuneo. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (kml)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #45 Schein's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Schein shall file a response to the complaint on or before the later of either: (a) thirty (30) days after the Court's decision on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand; or (b) transfer of this action to the MDL pending in the Northern District of Ohio, In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, Case No.CV 17-2804. All other deadlines shall remain unaffected. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/2/2020. (kml)
January 2, 2020 Filing 47 Clerks Notice to Filer re #45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
January 2, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Roland Holt on behalf of H.D. SMITH, LLC. Attorney Michael Roland Holt added to party H.D. SMITH, LLC(pty:dft). (Holt, Michael)
December 31, 2019 Filing 45 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Henry Schein Inc. Responses due by 1/14/2020 (Cunningham, Thomas) Modified Relief on 1/2/2020 (ls).
December 31, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Justin Cunningham on behalf of Henry Schein Inc. Attorney Thomas Justin Cunningham added to party Henry Schein Inc(pty:dft). (Cunningham, Thomas)
December 31, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jonathan W. Cuneo. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-113C-12266224. Filing Fee $ 75.00 by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scherer, William)
December 31, 2019 Filing 42 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Herrera, Sujey)
December 30, 2019 Filing 41 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anda, Inc. (Romes, Ana)
December 30, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc.. Replies due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Berman, Nathan)
December 30, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Continue January 13, 2020 Hearing Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re 15 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #30 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc. by CVS Pharmacy Inc.. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Hasbun, Marcos)
December 30, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by CVS Pharmacy Inc. re #30 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Incorporated Memorandum of Law OF CORRECTION. Attorney Marcos E. Hasbun added to party CVS Pharmacy Inc.(pty:dft). (Hasbun, Marcos)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file a response to the motion to dismiss on or before the earlier of either: (a) thirty (30) days after the Court's decision on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand; or (b) transfer of this action to the MDL pending in the Northern District of Ohio, In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, Case No.CV 17-2804. All other deadlines shall remain unaffected. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/27/2019. (kml)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, and Assertio Therapeutic, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; granting #9 Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; granting #11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint; granting #35 Defendant H.D. Smith, LLC's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. The foregoing Defendants shall file a response to the complaint on or before the later of either: (a) thirty (30) days after the Court's decision on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand; or (b) transfer of this action to the MDL pending in the Northern District of Ohio, In re National Prescription Opiate Litigation, Case No.CV 17-2804. All other deadlines shall remain unaffected. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/27/2019. (kml)
December 27, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by H.D. SMITH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Conditional Transfer Order)(Lerner, Joshua)
December 27, 2019 Filing 34 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by H.D. SMITH, LLC (Lerner, Joshua)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #31 Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay the Filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Plaintiffs shall file the required corporate disclosure statements on or before January 3, 2020. No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/27/2019. (kml)
December 26, 2019 Filing 32 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, SPECGX, LLC (Hearn, Robert)
December 26, 2019 Filing 31 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay re #3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Deadlines for Submission of Corporate Disclosure Statements by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/9/2020 (Scherer, William)
December 26, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by CVS Pharmacy Inc.. Responses due by 1/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Berman, Nathan)
December 24, 2019 Filing 29 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Berman, Nathan)
December 23, 2019 Filing 28 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent WSE Management, LLC, Corporate Parent WSE Investment, LLC, Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Lomax, Christopher)
December 23, 2019 Filing 27 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Walmart Inc. (Lomax, Christopher)
December 23, 2019 Filing 26 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (McMahon, Paul)
December 23, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Joseph McMahon on behalf of Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. (McMahon, Paul)
December 23, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lena Marguerite Mirilovic on behalf of H.D. SMITH, LLC. Attorney Lena Marguerite Mirilovic added to party H.D. SMITH, LLC(pty:dft). (Mirilovic, Lena)
December 23, 2019 Filing 23 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Gross, Michael)
December 23, 2019 Filing 22 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Gross, Michael)
December 23, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Adam Gross on behalf of Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Gross, Michael)
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Lindsey Bonifacio, Draupadi Daley, Becca Beck Harville, Tammy Heyward, Dina C. Muller, Briann Parson-Barnes, James Speed, Damon Storhoff of Fourth Amended Bankruptcy Court Order Extending Injunction Against Continuation of These Proceedings. Attorney Kathleen Suzanne Phang added to party Lindsey Bonifacio(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Suzanne Phang added to party Draupadi Daley(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Suzanne Phang added to party Becca Beck Harville(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Suzanne Phang added to party Tammy Heyward(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Suzanne Phang added to party Dina C. Muller(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Suzanne Phang added to party Briann Parson-Barnes(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Suzanne Phang added to party James Speed(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen Suzanne Phang added to party Damon Storhoff(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Phang, Kathleen)
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bruce S. Rogow on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney Bruce S. Rogow added to party All Plaintiffs(pty:pla). (Rogow, Bruce)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua D. Lerner on behalf of H.D. SMITH, LLC. Attorney Joshua D. Lerner added to party H.D. SMITH, LLC(pty:dft). (Lerner, Joshua)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 CVS Pharmacy, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Stay the Deadlines Set Forth in the Order Requiring Parties to Meet and File Conference Report. The parties shall file such report within 10 days of the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' Remand Motion, unless such ruling is deemed moot by order of the JPML. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/20/2019. (kml)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by CVS Pharmacy Inc.. Responses due by 1/3/2020 (Berman, Nathan)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #13 Plaintiff's Expedited Supplemental MOTION to Remand to and Supporting Memorandum: Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2020 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/19/2019. (kml)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #10 Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Remand and Supporting Memorandum. Plaintiffs have filed a #13 Supplemental Expedited Motion to Remand and Supporting Memorandum, which the Court will construe as an Amended Motion. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/19/2019. (kml)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, CGH Hospital, Ltd., Central Florida Health, Citrus HMA, LLC, Crestview Hospital Corporation, Delray Medical Center, Inc., Flagler Hospital, Inc., Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc., Good Samaritan Medical Center, Inc., HMA Santa Rosa Medical Center, LLC, Haines City HMA, LLC., Halifax Hospital Medical Center, Hernando HMA, LLC, Hialeah Hospital, Inc., Key West HMA, LLC, Lake Shore HMA, LLC, Lake Wales Hospital Corporation, Larkin Community Hospital Behavioral Service, Inc., Larkin Community Hospital Palm Springs Campus, LLC, Larkin Community Hospital, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc., Lifemark Hospitals of Florida, Inc., Live Oak HMA, LLC, Naples HMA, LLC, North Broward Hospital District, North Shore Medical Center, Inc., Osceolasc LLC, Palm Beach Gardens Community Hospital, Inc., Port Charlotte HMA, LLC., Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, St. Mary's Medical Center, Inc., Starke HMA, LLC.,, The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc., Venice HMA, LLC, All Plaintiffs. Attorney William R. Scherer added to party All Plaintiffs(pty:pla). (Scherer, William)
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, CGH Hospital, Ltd., Central Florida Health, Citrus HMA, LLC, Crestview Hospital Corporation, Delray Medical Center, Inc., Flagler Hospital, Inc., Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc., Good Samaritan Medical Center, Inc., HMA Santa Rosa Medical Center, LLC, Haines City HMA, LLC., Halifax Hospital Medical Center, Hernando HMA, LLC, Hialeah Hospital, Inc., Key West HMA, LLC, Lake Shore HMA, LLC, Lake Wales Hospital Corporation, Larkin Community Hospital Behavioral Service, Inc., Larkin Community Hospital Palm Springs Campus, LLC, Larkin Community Hospital, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc., Lifemark Hospitals of Florida, Inc., Live Oak HMA, LLC, Naples HMA, LLC, North Broward Hospital District, North Shore Medical Center, Inc., Osceolasc LLC, Palm Beach Gardens Community Hospital, Inc., Port Charlotte HMA, LLC., Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, St. Mary's Medical Center, Inc., Starke HMA, LLC.,, The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc., Venice HMA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scherer, William)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Pharmacy Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership II, The Kroger Co., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Nathan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum by Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC, CGH Hospital, Ltd., Central Florida Health, Citrus HMA, LLC, Crestview Hospital Corporation, Delray Medical Center, Inc., Flagler Hospital, Inc., Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc., Good Samaritan Medical Center, Inc., HMA Santa Rosa Medical Center, LLC, Haines City HMA, LLC., Halifax Hospital Medical Center, Hernando HMA, LLC, Hialeah Hospital, Inc., Key West HMA, LLC, Lake Shore HMA, LLC, Lake Wales Hospital Corporation, Larkin Community Hospital Behavioral Service, Inc., Larkin Community Hospital Palm Springs Campus, LLC, Larkin Community Hospital, Inc., Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc., Lifemark Hospitals of Florida, Inc., Live Oak HMA, LLC, Naples HMA, LLC, North Broward Hospital District, North Shore Medical Center, Inc., Osceolasc LLC, Palm Beach Gardens Community Hospital, Inc., Port Charlotte HMA, LLC., Punta Gorda HMA, LLC, St. Mary's Medical Center, Inc., Starke HMA, LLC.,, The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc., Venice HMA, LLC. (Scherer, William)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. Attorney Sujey Scarlett Herrera added to party AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation(pty:dft). (Herrera, Sujey)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Mallinckrodt LLC Notice of Circuit Court Order Enlarging Time to Respond to Complaint Until January 31, 2020. Attorney Robert R. Hearn added to party Mallinckrodt LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hearn, Robert)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Memorandum of Law by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 12/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Spitser Affidavit)(Gross, Michael)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Responses due by 12/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - API's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint as filed with state court)(Gross, Michael)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. Attorney Theodore Benson Randles added to party Abbott Laboratories(pty:dft), Attorney Theodore Benson Randles added to party Abbott Laboratories Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Randles, Theodore)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12202223, filed by CVS Indiana, L.L.C., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berman, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc. et al v. Sackler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Theodore Benson Randles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Michael Adam Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Joseph McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Ana Romes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Storhoff
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne Phang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Martin Lomax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Sujey Scarlett Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briann Parson-Barnes
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne Phang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Bonifacio
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne Phang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Adam Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECGX, LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Draupadi Daley
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne Phang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becca Beck Harville
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne Phang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
Represented By: Marcos E. Hasbun
Represented By: Nathan Michael Berman
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc
Represented By: Thomas Justin Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: Joshua D. Lerner
Represented By: Lena Marguerite Mirilovic
Represented By: Michael Roland Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Carl Marquardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Nelson Camilo Bellido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Timney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Robert R. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Christopher Martin Lomax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Jannssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Vitale
Represented By: Lindy Kathryn Keown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Gasdia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Marcos E. Hasbun
Represented By: Nathan Michael Berman
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Joseph McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Heyward
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne Phang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. SMITH, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Jay Gerber
Represented By: Joshua D. Lerner
Represented By: Lena Marguerite Mirilovic
Represented By: Michael Roland Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Nelson Camilo Bellido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Speed
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne Phang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Michael Ercole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Theodore Benson Randles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Michael Berman
Represented By: Marcos E. Hasbun
Represented By: Conor B. O'Croinin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dina C. Muller
Represented By: Kathleen Suzanne Phang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Robert R. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halifax Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Florida Health
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hialeah Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Mary's Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Shore Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Live Oak HMA, LLC
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larkin Community Hospital Behavioral Service, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crestview Hospital Corporation
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Good Samaritan Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Health Sciences Center, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMA Santa Rosa Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Shore HMA, LLC
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Wales Hospital Corporation
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venice HMA, LLC
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifemark Hospitals of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osceolasc LLC
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flagler Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palm Beach Gardens Community Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Key West HMA, LLC
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CGH Hospital, Ltd.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Punta Gorda HMA, LLC
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naples HMA, LLC
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citrus HMA, LLC
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayfront HMA Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Port Charlotte HMA, LLC.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Broward Hospital District
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starke HMA, LLC.,
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larkin Community Hospital Palm Springs Campus, LLC
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larkin Community Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Villages Tri-County Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leesburg Regional Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delray Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haines City HMA, LLC.
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hernando HMA, LLC
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Jonathan W. Cuneo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Represented By: William R. Scherer
Represented By: Bruce S. Rogow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?