Ramos et al v. Hoyle et al
Plaintiff: Alejandro Ramos and Maria Onelia Maco Castro
Defendant: Javier Hoyle and Patricia Perales
Case Number: 1:2008cv21809
Filed: June 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: Miami-Dade
Presiding Judge: Jose E. Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 118 Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/16/2009. (ajs)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion to Compel. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 5/15/2009. (sl)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 SECOND ORDER denying 81 amended Motion to Compel. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Stephen T. Brown on 5/8/2009. (sl)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/19/2008. (lc1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos et al v. Hoyle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Ramos
Represented By: Erika Deutsch Rotbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Onelia Maco Castro
Represented By: Erika Deutsch Rotbart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Hoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?