Westley v. Alberto et al
Plaintiff: Westley and JOHN D. WESTLEY
Defendant: Alberto, Thomas Walsh, GLEN RIVERA, Albertelli Law, RE/MAX LLC, JOSE L. ALBERTO, MICHAEL GANS, MortgageIT Inc., Paul A. Magnuson, MIAMI DADE COUNTY COURTS, LOURDES SANCHEZ BARCIA, David Gutierrez, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP, Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, SUZANNE RUIZ, CHRIS CONNELLY, JACQUELYN PLASNER NEEDELMAN, Amanda Karyn Hersem, JP Morgan Chase, PABITREE GOOLCHARRAN, Process Server Service of Los Angeles County, CHARLES PIERCE MATTHEWS, Verona Condominium Association Inc., DMLMR HOLDINGS LLC and Process Server Service of Los Angeles County doing business as PSSLAC
Case Number: 1:2016cv20283
Filed: January 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2018 Filing 60 MANDATE of USCA (certified copy). AFFIRM Order of the district court with court's opinion re #54 Notice of Appeal, filed by JOHN D. WESTLEY, #53 Notice of Appeal, filed by JOHN D. WESTLEY; Date Issued: 1/24/2018; USCA Case Number: 16-10666-BB. (apz)
October 5, 2016 Filing 59 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #54 Notice of Appeal, #53 Notice of Appeal,, Appeal No. 16-10666-BB. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (apz)
March 4, 2016 Filing 57 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number FLS100118324 re #53 Notice of Appeal,, filed by JOHN D. WESTLEY (amb)
February 26, 2016 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by JOHN D. WESTLEY re #53 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (amb)
February 25, 2016 Filing 55 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #54 Notice of Appeal, filed by JOHN D. WESTLEY, #53 Notice of Appeal,, filed by JOHN D. WESTLEY. Date received by USCA: 2/16/2016. USCA Case Number: 16-10666-B. (amb)
February 17, 2016 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order Under Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #54 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (amb)
February 17, 2016 Filing 54 Duplicate Notice of Appeal as to #46 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, by JOHN D. WESTLEY. Filing fee $ 505.00. No Filing Fee Required. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (amb)
February 16, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE of filing Letter to the Court by JOHN D. WESTLEY (ail)
February 16, 2016 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #53 Notice of Appeal,, Notice has been electronically mailed. (hh)
February 16, 2016 Filing 53 Notice of Appeal by JOHN D. WESTLEY as to #46 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,, #51 Administrative Order. Filing fee $ 505.00. Receipt#: FEE NOT PAID. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (hh)
February 16, 2016 Filing 52 NOTICE of Change of Address by JOHN D. WESTLEY (systems updated) (hh)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/28/2016. (ail) NOTICE: If there are sealed documents in this case, they may be unsealed after 1 year or as directed by Court Order, unless they have been designated to be permanently sealed. See Local Rule 5.4 and Administrative Order 2014-69.
January 25, 2016 Filing 50 Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrea M. Simonton is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (bb)
January 25, 2016 Filing 49 Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams (bb)
January 25, 2016 Filing 48 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 6:15-cv-01948. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
January 25, 2016 Filing 47 TRANSFER to the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division. (LMM) Modified on 1/25/2016 (LMM).
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying #38 Motion for Relief from Show Cause Order; denying #39 Motion to Extend Time to Show Cause; directing Clerk to transfer case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division for all further proceedings and to close this file. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 1/22/2016. (KMS)
January 19, 2016 Filing 45 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Pabitree Goolcharran (EJS)
January 19, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Pabitree Goolcharran by John D. Westley. (Attachment: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Clerk's Default)(EJS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
January 19, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicola Gelormino on behalf of JP Morgan Chase (Gelormino, Nicola)
January 12, 2016 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint AND TO PROHIBIT PLAINTIFF FROM FURTHER PRO SE FILINGS WITHOUT LEAVE OF COURT OR CO-COUNSEL by Miami Dade County Courts. (McClain, David)
January 11, 2016 Filing 41 RETURN of service executed on 12/23/15 by John D. Westley as to Miami Dade County Courts. (EJS)
January 11, 2016 Filing 40 RETURN of service executed on 12/22/15 by John D. Westley as to Pabitree Goolcharran. (EJS)
January 11, 2016 Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of 21 Days Time to File Response to Show Cause Order by John D. Westley. (EJS)
January 11, 2016 Filing 38 MOTION for Relief from Show Cause Order by John D. Westley. (EJS)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #34 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and to prohibit Plaintiff from further pro se filings without leave of Court. Responses due by 1/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/29/2015. (ECJ)
December 28, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of 21 Days Time to File Response as to #34 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and to prohibit Plaintiff from further pro se filings without leave of Court by John D. Westley. (EJS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding.
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER to show cause as to whether this case should be either dismissed for improper venue or transferred to the Southern District of Florida, Miami Division as to John D. Westley. Show Cause Response due by 1/11/2016. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/28/2015. (DJD)
December 18, 2015 Filing 34 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and to prohibit Plaintiff from further pro se filings without leave of Court by Jacquelyn Plasner Needelman. (Moody, Michael)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #30 Motion for electronic service; Plaintiff's request that the Court take judicial notice is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 12/9/2015. (LAK)
December 7, 2015 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by John D. Westley. (EJS)
December 7, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by John D. Westley. Related case(s): Yes (EJS)
December 7, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION for Electronic Email Service by John D. Westley. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 29 SUMMONS issued as to Amanda Karyn Hersem. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 28 SUMMONS issued as to Albertelli Law. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 27 SUMMONS issued as to Cecilia M. Altonaga. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 26 SUMMONS issued as to Paul A. Magnuson. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 25 SUMMONS issued as to JP Morgan Chase. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 24 SUMMONS issued as to MortgageIT Inc. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 23 SUMMONS issued as to Stinson Leonard Street LLP. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 22 SUMMONS issued as to Process Server Service of Los Angeles County. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 21 SUMMONS issued as to Suzanne Ruiz. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 20 SUMMONS issued as to Michael Gans. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 19 SUMMONS issued as to Chris Connelly. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 18 SUMMONS issued as to Thomas Walsh. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 17 SUMMONS issued as to Glen Rivera. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 16 SUMMONS issued as to Miami Dade County Courts. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 15 SUMMONS issued as to Pabitree Goolcharran. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued as to DMLMR Holdings LLC. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued as to Jacquelyn Plasner Needelman. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 12 SUMMONS issued as to Lourdes Sanchez Barcia. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued as to David Gutierrez. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued as to Charles Pierce Matthews. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Verona Condominium Association Inc. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to RE/MAX, LLC. (EJS)
November 25, 2015 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Jose L. Alberto. (EJS)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/7/2015. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/23/2015. ctp(DJD)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/7/2015. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/23/2015. ctp(DJD)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for electronic case filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karla R. Spaulding on 11/18/2015. (LAK)
November 16, 2015 Filing 2 MOTION for Electronic Case Filing by John D. Westley. (EJS)
November 16, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albertelli Law, Jose L. Alberto, Cecilia M. Altonaga, Lourdes Sanchez Barcia, Chris Connelly, DMLMR Holdings LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Michael Gans, David Gutierrez, Amanda Karyn Hersem, JP Morgan Chase, Paul A. Magnuson, Charles Pierce Matthews, Miami Dade County Courts, MortgageIT Inc., Jacquelyn Plasner Needelman, Pabitree Goolcharran, Process Server Service of Los Angeles County, RE/MAX, LLC, Glen Rivera, Suzanne Ruiz, Stinson Leonard Street LLP, Verona Condominium Association Inc., Thomas Walsh with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $400 Receipt Number ORL48831) filed by John D. Westley. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(EJS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westley v. Alberto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN D. WESTLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLEN RIVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertelli Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RE/MAX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE L. ALBERTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL GANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MortgageIT Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A. Magnuson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIAMI DADE COUNTY COURTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOURDES SANCHEZ BARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STINSON LEONARD STREET LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUZANNE RUIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS CONNELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACQUELYN PLASNER NEEDELMAN
Represented By: Michael Howard Moody
Represented By: Barry Scott Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Karyn Hersem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase
Represented By: Nicola Andrea Gelormino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PABITREE GOOLCHARRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Process Server Service of Los Angeles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES PIERCE MATTHEWS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verona Condominium Association Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMLMR HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Process Server Service of Los Angeles County doing business as PSSLAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?